USA v. Mompremier et al
Criminal Case Florida Southern District Court, Case No. 0:21-cr-60215

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 15, 2021 at 4:15 PM DT (1.4 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/15/2021, Entered: None Order to Continue - Ends of Justice
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/1/2021, Entered: None Continue Trial
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/1/2021, Entered: None Continue
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/30/2021, Entered: None Protective/Confidentiality Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/21/2021, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document 15 Filed: 8/12/2021, Entered: None Order of Detention
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/12/2021, Entered: None Arraignment (Select as last hrg for OPT WVR/DPPA/SDO)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/10/2021, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/6/2021, Entered: None Initial Appearance (WITH OPTIONAL DPPA ORDER)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/6/2021, Entered: None Notice of Temporary Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/29/2021, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/28/2021, Entered: None Indictment
                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 164 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?