USA v. Milton
Criminal Case New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:21-cr-00478-ER

Tags
Last Updated December 1, 2021 at 3:57 PM EST (6.4 days ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jordan Lancaster Estes +1 212 637 2543 +1 212 637 2527 jordan.estes@usdoj.gov
Space Nicolas Tyler Landsman-Roos +1 212 637 2421 nicolas.roos@usdoj.gov
Space Matthew D Podolsky +1 212 637 1947 matthew.podolsky@usdoj.gov
v.
Milton, Trevor Robert Milton, Trevor Robert, Defendant
Officially listed as "Trevor Milton"
Officer/Director, VectoIQ Acquisition Corp.
Officer/Director, M&M Residual, LLC
Nikola Corporation Officer/Director, Nikola Corporation

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Terence Healy +1 202 779 0890 terence.healy@hugheshubbard.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cahill Gordon & Reindell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bradley Joseph Bondi +1 212 701 3000 +1 212 269 5420 bbondi@cahill.com

Toggle Switch Represented by mfsllp.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marc Lee Mukasey +1 212 466 6400 marc.mukasey@mfsllp.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Trevor Milton (1)
Office Foley Square
Filed 7/28/2021
County NewYork
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78J.F
Offense Level 4
1578J.F SECURITIES FRAUD
Count 2
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1348.F
Offense Level 4
181348.F SECURITIES FRAUD
Count 3
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1343.F
Offense Level 4
181343.F WIRE FRAUD
Defendant Custody Status
Flag ECF
  Entries (39) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/1/2021, Entered: None Internet Citation
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/1/2021, Entered: None Internet Citation
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/1/2021, Entered: None Internet Citation
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/29/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document 32 Filed: 11/15/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/11/2021, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/11/2021, Entered: None Transcript
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/13/2021, Entered: None Notice of Hearing
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document 28 Filed: 9/13/2021, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/8/2021, Entered: 9/8/2021 Declaration in Support of Motion
                    DECLARATION of Bradley Bondi in Support as to Trevor Milton re: [11] MOTION to Dismiss Indictment or, in the Alternative, Transfer Venue.. (Healy, Terence)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/10/2021, Entered: None Letter Motion
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/8/2021, Entered: 9/8/2021 memorandum in support of motion
                        MEMORANDUM in Support by Trevor Milton re [23] MOTION to Seal Document in Support of Motion to Dismiss Indictment or Transfer Venue.. (Healy, Terence)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document 26 Filed: 9/10/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal Document
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/8/2021, Entered: 9/8/2021 motion to seal document
                            MOTION to Seal Document in Support of Motion to Dismiss Indictment or Transfer Venue. Document filed by Trevor Milton. (Healy, Terence)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document 22 Filed: 9/8/2021, Entered: 9/8/2021 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                              REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support as to Trevor Milton re: [11] MOTION to Dismiss Indictment or, in the Alternative, Transfer Venue. . (Healy, Terence)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/4/2021, Entered: 9/4/2021 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Trevor Milton. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 8/13/21 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (Moya, Goretti)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/4/2021, Entered: 9/4/2021 transcriptCourt Filing
                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Trevor Milton re: Conference held on 8/13/21 before Judge Edgardo Ramos. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kristen Carannante, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/27/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/5/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/3/2021. (Moya, Goretti)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document 15 Filed: 9/1/2021, Entered: 9/1/2021 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition by USA as to Trevor Milton re [11] MOTION to Dismiss Indictment or, in the Alternative, Transfer Venue.. (Podolsky, Matthew)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 14 Filed: 8/18/2021, Entered: 8/18/2021 protective orderCourt Filing
                                      PROTECTIVE ORDER as to Trevor Milton...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion. Doc. 13. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 8/18/2021) (ap)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 13 Filed: 8/17/2021, Entered: 8/17/2021, Terminated: 8/18/2021 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                        LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from the Government dated August 17, 2021 re: Proposed Protective Order . Document filed by USA as to Trevor Milton. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Podolsky, Matthew)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank  Telephone Conference
                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edgardo Ramos: Telephone Conference as to Trevor Milton held on 8/13/2021. Defendant Trevor Milton appeared with counsel Bradley Bondi and Marc Mukasey. AUSA Jordan Estes, Matthew Podolsky, and Nicolas Roos. Discovery should be produced in a few weeks. A conference is scheduled for September 15, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. Speedy trial time is excluded from today, August 13, 202, until September 15, 2021, in the interests of justice. Bail continued. (jbo)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank  set/reset hearings
                                            Set/Reset Hearings as to Trevor Milton: Pretrial Conference set for 8/13/2021 at 02:00 PM before Judge Edgardo Ramos. (jar)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank  Docket Annotation
                                              Docket Annotation as to Trevor Milton: An initial pretrial conference will be held on August 13, 2021 at 2:00 p.m. before the Hon. Edgardo Ramos, U.S.D.J., at the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York 10007, Courtroom 619. The public and the press may access the conference remotely by dialing (877) 411-9748 and entering access code 3029857# when prompted. All of those accessing the conference are reminded that recording or rebroadcasting of the proceeding is prohibited by law. (jar)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 12 Filed: 8/11/2021, Entered: 8/11/2021 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Trevor Milton on re: [11] MOTION to Dismiss Indictment or, in the Alternative, Transfer Venue...ENDORSEMENT...The Government is directed to file its opposition to Defendant's motion by September 1, 2021, and Defendant is directed to file a reply by September 8, 2021 (Defendant Replies due by 9/8/2021., Government Responses due by 9/1/2021) (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 8/11/21)(jw)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 11 Filed: 8/10/2021, Entered: 8/10/2021 Motion to Dismiss
                                                  MOTION to Dismiss Indictment or, in the Alternative, Transfer Venue. Document filed by Trevor Milton. (Healy, Terence)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 10 Filed: 7/29/2021, Entered: 7/29/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    RULE 5(F) ORDER as to Trevor Milton. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 7/29/2021) (ap)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/29/2021, Entered: 7/29/2021 bond
                                                      Appearance Bond Entered as to Trevor Milton: $100,000,000 Personal recognizance bond; To be cosigned by two financially responsible persons; Secured by two properties; Additional conditions.... [**Advice of Penalties and Sanctions attached.] (jbo) (Main Document 9 replaced on 8/17/2021) (jbo).
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document 8 Filed: 7/29/2021, Entered: 7/29/2021 initial appearanceCourt Filing
                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn: Initial Appearance as to Trevor Milton held on 7/29/2021. Defendant present with retained counsel Marc Mukasey. AUSA Jordan Estes present for the government. Voluntary surrender. BAIL DISPOSITION: Agreed conditions ore release; $100,000,000.00 Personal recognizance bond; To be cosigned by two financially responsible persons; Secured by two properties: One in Morgan, UT and one in Coatsville, UT; Travel restricted to SDNY/EDNY/Utah/Wyoming/Arizona/Washington DC/Idaho/Virginia and points in between; Surrender travel documents and no new applications; Pretrial supervision as directed by PTS; Deft not to possess firearms, destructive device, other weapon; Deft to be released on own signature; Remaining conditions to be met by 8/5/21; Defendant is to be supervised in his district of residence (Utah.) Defendant is not to have contact with any investors except individuals the defendant has an independent relationship with. Defendant is to surrender any and all firearms. Control date set for 8/12/2021. Defendant arraigned and pleads Not Guilty. Speedy trial time excluded until 8/12/21. (jbo)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/29/2021, Entered: 7/29/2021 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Terence Healy appearing for Trevor Milton. (jbo)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/29/2021, Entered: 7/29/2021 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                            NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Bradley Joseph Bondi appearing for Trevor Milton. (jbo)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/29/2021, Entered: 7/29/2021 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Marc Lee Mukasey appearing for Trevor Milton. (jbo)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document 4 Filed: 7/29/2021, Entered: 7/29/2021 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                LETTER by USA as to Trevor Milton addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from AUSA Jordan Estes/Matthew Podolsky/Nicolas Roos dated 7/29/21 re: The defendant in the above-captioned matter surrendered this morning. The Indictment was thus unsealed pursuant to the Court's order of July 28, 2021. We respectfully request that this case be wheeled out to a District Judge in Wheel C. Document filed by USA. (jbo)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank  arraignment
                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn: Arraignment as to Trevor Milton (1) Count 1,2,3 held on 7/29/2021. Plea entered by Trevor Milton Not Guilty. (jbo)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank  arrest
                                                                    Arrest of Trevor Milton. (jbo)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank  Indictment Unsealed
                                                                      INDICTMENT UNSEALED as to Trevor Milton. (jbo)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank  Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                        Case as to Trevor Milton ASSIGNED to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Judge Unassigned no longer assigned to the case. (jbo)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank  Case Designated ECF.
                                                                          Case Designated ECF as to Trevor Milton. (jbo)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 2 Filed: 7/28/2021, Entered: 7/29/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER as to Trevor Milton. Upon the application of the United States, by the United States Attorney for the Southern District of New York, Audrey Strauss, by Assistant United States Attorneys Jordan Estes, Matthew Podolsky, and Nicolas Roos; It is found that the Indictment in the above-captioned action, 21 Cr. 478 is currently sealed and the United States Attorney's Office has applied to have that Indictment unsealed upon the arrest or surrender of the defendant, it is therefore ORDERED that the Indictment, 21 Cr. 478 in the above-captioned action be unsealed upon the arrest or surrender of the defendant, and, upon unsealing, shall remain unsealed pending further order of the Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the above-captioned Indictment be assigned to a District Court Judge upon its unsealing. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 7/28/21)(jbo)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/28/2021, Entered: 7/29/2021 indictment
                                                                              SEALED INDICTMENT FILED as to Trevor Milton (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3. (jbo)
                                                                                LREF

                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                This case has been viewed 124 times.

                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                Space
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                 
                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                Need Password Help?