Zormati v. Mukasey et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-02959-JES

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Bedis Zormati, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Walter Drobenko +1 718 721 2000 +1 718 721 8812 wdrobenko@cs.com
v.
No Logo Andrea J. Quarantillo, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kirti Vaidya Reddy +1 212 637 2751 +1 212 637 2786 kirti.reddy@usdoj.gov
No Logo Eduardo Aguirre, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kirti Vaidya Reddy +1 212 637 2751 +1 212 637 2786 kirti.reddy@usdoj.gov
No Logo Michael Chertoff, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kirti Vaidya Reddy +1 212 637 2751 +1 212 637 2786 kirti.reddy@usdoj.gov
No Logo Michael Mukasey, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kirti Vaidya Reddy +1 212 637 2751 +1 212 637 2786 kirti.reddy@usdoj.gov
No Logo Ruth Dorochoff, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kirti Vaidya Reddy +1 212 637 2751 +1 212 637 2786 kirti.reddy@usdoj.gov
Office Foley Square
Filed 3/21/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Westchester
Terminated 6/25/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 4 Filed: 6/25/2008, Entered: 6/25/2008 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER; the action, shall be and hereby is, dismissed w/ prejudice and w/out costs or attorneys' fees to either party. (Signed by Judge Peter K. Leisure, Part I on 6/25/08) (ae)
    LREF
    Legal Document 3 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: 5/16/2008 Order for Initial Pretrial ConferenceCourt Filing
    LETTER:Pretrial Conference set for 6/24/2008 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 21C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge John E. Sprizzo. (Signed by Judge John E. Sprizzo on 5/16/2008) (tve)
      LREF
      Legal Document 2 Filed: 3/28/2008, Entered: 3/28/2008 Notice of Appearance/
      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kirti Vaidya Reddy on behalf of Michael Mukasey, Michael Chertoff, Eduardo Aguirre, Andrea J. Quarantillo, Ruth Dorochoff (Reddy, Kirti)
        LREF
        Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: 3/24/2008 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus
        COMPLAINT IN THE NATURE OF MANDAMUS against Michael Mukasey, Michael Chertoff, Eduardo Aguirre, Andrea J. Quarantillo, Ruth Dorochoff (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 645575).Document filed by Bedis Zormati.(rdz) (rdz).
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: 3/24/2008 Summons Issued as to USA
          SUMMONS ISSUED as to Michael Mukasey, Michael Chertoff, Eduardo Aguirre, Andrea J. Quarantillo, Ruth Dorochoff, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (rdz)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: 3/24/2008 Case Designated ECF.
            Case Designated ECF. (rdz)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: 3/24/2008 Case Designation
              Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger is so designated. (rdz)
                LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 177 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?