Vitale, Ronald v. Telsa, Inc.
State Civil Lawsuit Middlesex County Superior Court, Case No. 2081CV01580

Tags
Last Updated August 2, 2021 at 10:50 AM DT (2.8 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Vitale, Ronald, Plaintiff
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Telsa, Inc."
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 22 Filed: 3/10/2021, Entered: None
Event Result:: Conference to Review Status scheduled on: 03/10/2021 10:00 AM Has been: Rescheduled For the following reason: Joint request of parties Hon. Patrick Haggan, Presiding Staff: Maria Pantos, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
    Legal Document 21 Filed: 3/10/2021, Entered: None Court Filing
    Endorsement on Motion to continue Status Conference (#10.0): ALLOWED Status Conference continued to 8/9-21 @2PM. Dated: March 10, 2021 and notices mailed Judge: Haggan, Hon. Patrick
      Blank 20 Filed: 2/22/2021, Entered: None
      Event Result:: Conference to Review Status scheduled on: 02/22/2021 10:00 AM Has been: Rescheduled For the following reason: Joint request of parties Hon. Patrick Haggan, Presiding Staff: Maria Pantos, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
        Legal Document 19 Filed: 2/19/2021, Entered: None
        Plaintiff, Defendant Ronald Vitale, Telsa, Inc.'s Joint Motion to continue status conference
          Blank 18 Filed: 1/5/2021, Entered: None
          Event Result:: Conference to Review Status scheduled on: 02/16/2021 09:00 AM Has been: Rescheduled For the following reason: By Court prior to date Hon. Patrick Haggan, Presiding Staff: Maria Pantos, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
            Blank 17 Filed: 11/4/2020, Entered: None
            The following form was generated: Notice to Appear Sent On: 11/04/2020 16:26:32 Notice Sent To: Seldon Eugene Nason, Esq. The Law Office of S.E. Nason, PLLC 117 Brockway Rd, Hopkinton, NH 03229 Notice Sent To: William Joseph Flanagan, Esq. Morrison Mahoney LLP 250 Summer St, Boston, MA 02210 Notice Sent To: Matthew Riordan, Esq. Morrison Mahoney LLP 250 Summer St, Boston, MA 02210
              Blank 16 Filed: 11/4/2020, Entered: None
              Event Result:: Conference to Review Status scheduled on: 02/15/2021 02:00 PM Has been: Not Held For the following reason: By Court prior to date Hon. Jackie Cowin, Presiding
                Blank 15 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: None
                Attorney appearance On this date Matthew Riordan, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Defendant Telsa, Inc.
                  Blank 14 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: None
                  Attorney appearance On this date Seldon Eugene Nason, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Plaintiff Ronald Vitale
                    Legal Document 13 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: None Court Filing
                    MEMORANDUM & ORDER: MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION: (which see 6 pages) ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, Defendant's application for an order to compel arbitration (Socket #3) is ALLOWED. The parties are hereby ordered to submit their disputes to arbitration in accordance with Section 18 of the Lease. Under G.L.c.251, section2(d), this action and the District Court action must be stayed pending arbitration. SO ORDERED: Dated: August 7, 2020 and copies mailed 8/10/2020 Judge: White, Jr., Hon. William M
                      Blank 12 Filed: 8/7/2020, Entered: None
                      The following form was generated: Notice to Appear Sent On: 08/07/2020 14:19:43 Notice Sent To: Matthew Riordan, Esq. Morrison Mahoney LLP 250 Summer St, Boston, MA 02210 Notice Sent To: William Joseph Flanagan, Esq. Morrison Mahoney LLP 250 Summer St, Boston, MA 02210
                        Blank 11 Filed: 8/7/2020, Entered: None
                        Attorney appearance On this date William Joseph Flanagan, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Defendant Telsa, Inc.
                          Legal Document 10 Filed: 7/3/2020, Entered: None
                          General correspondence regarding Defendant Telsa Inc. request a hearing on its Application for Order Directing Parties to Arbitration
                            Legal Document 9 Filed: 7/3/2020, Entered: None
                            General correspondence regarding Request for hearing
                              Legal Document 8 Filed: 7/3/2020, Entered: None
                              General correspondence regarding certification pursuant to Superior Court Rule 9A(B)(2)
                                Legal Document 7 Filed: 7/3/2020, Entered: None
                                Ronald Vitale's Memorandum in support of opposition to defendant's application for order directing parties to arbitration
                                  Legal Document 6 Filed: 7/3/2020, Entered: None
                                  Opposition to by Plaintiff's to defendant's application for order Directing Parties to arbitration filed by
                                    Legal Document 5 Filed: 7/3/2020, Entered: None
                                    Telsa, Inc.'s Memorandum in support of Application For Order To Compel Arbitration
                                      Legal Document 4 Filed: 7/3/2020, Entered: None
                                      Civil action cover sheet filed.
                                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 7/3/2020, Entered: None
                                        Original civil complaint filed. Defendant, Telsa, Inc.'s Application For Order Directing Parties To Arbitration
                                          Legal Document 2 Filed: 7/3/2020, Entered: None
                                          Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 07/03/2020
                                            Blank 1 Filed: 7/3/2020, Entered: None
                                            Attorney appearance On this date Matthew Riordan, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Plaintiff Ronald Vitale

                                              Space Space

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 42 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?