Normande v. Innovative, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-07441-JSR-THK

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Marcia B. Normande, Plaintiff
No Logo Innovative Imprinting Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kurzman Eisenberg Corbin Lever & Goodman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Fred David Weinstein +1 914 285 9800 +1 914 285 9855 fweinstein@kelaw.com
No Logo Innovative More Balls, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kurzman Eisenberg Corbin Lever & Goodman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Fred David Weinstein +1 914 285 9800 +1 914 285 9855 fweinstein@kelaw.com
No Logo Robert Grippo, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kurzman Eisenberg Corbin Lever & Goodman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Fred David Weinstein +1 914 285 9800 +1 914 285 9855 fweinstein@kelaw.com
No Logo Sherin Sabek, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kurzman Eisenberg Corbin Lever & Goodman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Fred David Weinstein +1 914 285 9800 +1 914 285 9855 fweinstein@kelaw.com
v.
No Logo Innovative Imprinting Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kurzman Eisenberg Corbin Lever & Goodman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Fred David Weinstein +1 914 285 9800 +1 914 285 9855 fweinstein@kelaw.com
No Logo Innovative More Balls, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kurzman Eisenberg Corbin Lever & Goodman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Fred David Weinstein +1 914 285 9800 +1 914 285 9855 fweinstein@kelaw.com
No Logo Robert Grippo, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kurzman Eisenberg Corbin Lever & Goodman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Fred David Weinstein +1 914 285 9800 +1 914 285 9855 fweinstein@kelaw.com
No Logo Sherin Sabek, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kurzman Eisenberg Corbin Lever & Goodman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Fred David Weinstein +1 914 285 9800 +1 914 285 9855 fweinstein@kelaw.com
No Logo Marcia B. Normande, Counter-Defendant
Office Foley Square
Filed 8/10/2001
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County XX Out of U.S.
Terminated 6/3/2008
Origin 4
Reopened 4/30/2008
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CASREF, CLOSED, PRO-SE
  Entries (75) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 61 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: 6/3/2008 Order of DismissalCourt Filing
ORDER: In a joint telephone conference held by United States Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz on May 27, 2008, plaintiff consented to this case being dismissed with prejudice. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 6/2/2008) (jpo)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: 6/4/2008 Telephone Conference
    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz: Telephone Conference held on 5/27/2008 @ 10:00 a.m. TO 10:30 a.m. (ja)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: 5/8/2008 Received Return Receipt of Order by Certified Mail
      Received Return Receipt as to Marcia B. Normand, which was served by Certified Mail # 7002 0860 0002 8332 1510, on 4/15/08. (ama)
        LREF
        Legal Document 59 Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: 4/30/2008 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
        ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 4/29/2008) (jpo)
          LREF
          Legal Document 58 Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: 4/30/2008 Order Reopening CaseCourt Filing
          ORDER: The Court is in receipt of a letter from plaintiff dated April 22, 2008, which indicates that she does in fact intend to prosecute this case. Therefore, the case is re-opened and re-referred to Magistrate Judge Katz, who is instructed to give it his expeditious attention. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 4/29/2008) (jpo)
            LREF
            Blank 60 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: 5/7/2008 LetterCourt Filing
            LETTER addressed to Judge Jed S. Rakoff from Marcia Normande dated 4/22/08 re: plaintiff request leave of the Court to file a motion to amend the complaint. Document filed by Marcia B. Normande.(pl)
              LREF
              Legal Document 57 Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: 3/31/2008 Order of DismissalCourt Filing
              ORDER: the Court hereby dismisses this case without prejudice to the plaintiff notifying the Court in writing by no later than April 30, 2008 as to whether she intends to prosecute this case. A copy of this order will be mailed to both addresses that the Court has for the plaintiff, one in the United Kingdom and one in Brazil. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 3/27/08) (tro)
                LREF
                Blank 56 Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: 8/5/2005 Order on Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                ORDER denying [45] Motion for Summary Judgment, denying [46] Motion for Summary Judgment, denying [47] Motion for Summary Judgment, denying [49] Motion for Reconsideration, denying [51] Motion for Summary Judgment, denying [53] Motion to Amend/Correct. All these motions are DENIED without prejudice to their being refiled at the time the case is placed back on the Court's active docket. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 8/4/05) (db, )
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: 7/8/2005 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                  Court document number 44 granted [42] Motion to reopen case.(Landers, Rigoberto)
                    LREF
                    Blank 55 Filed: 5/25/2005, Entered: 5/27/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER The Clerk of the Court is hereby directed to place this case on the suspense calendar. Counsel for Innovative Imprinting, Inc. is directed to notify the Court in writing, with a copy to plaintiff, of the status of the bankruptcy proceedings every six months, starting on 11/1/05. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 5/24/05) (jco, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 54 Filed: 2/17/2005, Entered: 3/8/2005 Answer
                      PLAINTIFF ANSWERING PAPERS TO THE DEFENACE'S REQUEST TO RECONSIDER THE COURT'S RULING TO DIMISS DEFENCE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT. Document filed by Marcia B. Normande.(jmi, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 53 Filed: 2/15/2005, Entered: 3/2/2005 Motion to Amend/Correct
                        MOTION to Amend [1] Complaint. Document filed by Marcia B. Normande. (cd, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 52 Filed: 2/7/2005, Entered: 2/11/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER; because of the delay, defendants' time to submit opposition papers to plaintiff's summary judgment motion is extended to 2/16/05, and plaintiff's time to submit reply papers on that motion is extended to 2/23/05. Finally, with respect to defendants' motion for reconsideration of the Court's prior partial denial of summary judgment, plaintiff's date to submit answering papers remains 2/7/05 and defendants' date to submit reply papers remains 2/14/05. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 2/6/05) (sac, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 50 Filed: 1/24/2005, Entered: 2/7/2005 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [49] MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) for Reconsideration of its motion for summary judgment. Document filed by Innovative Imprinting Inc. (rw, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 49 Filed: 1/24/2005, Entered: 2/7/2005 Motion for Reconsideration
                              MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) for Reconsideration of its earlier motion for summary judgment. Document filed by Innovative Imprinting Inc.. (rw, )
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 47 Filed: 1/24/2005, Entered: 1/24/2005, Terminated: 8/5/2005 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                SECOND MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Innovative Imprinting Inc.. Responses due by 1/24/2005 Return Date set for 2/14/2005 05:00 PM. (Weinstein, Fred)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 46 Filed: 1/24/2005, Entered: 1/24/2005, Terminated: 8/5/2005 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                  SECOND MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Innovative Imprinting Inc.. Responses due by 1/24/2005 Return Date set for 2/14/2005 05:00 PM. (Weinstein, Fred)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 45 Filed: 1/24/2005, Entered: 1/24/2005, Terminated: 8/5/2005 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                    SECOND MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Innovative Imprinting Inc.. Responses due by 1/24/2005 Return Date set for 2/14/2005 05:00 PM. (Weinstein, Fred)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 48 Filed: 1/19/2005, Entered: 1/25/2005 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Jed S. Rakoff from Marcia Normande dated 1/3/05 re: requesting permission to include an audio tape with motion for summary judgment. Permission granted. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 1/14/05) (kw, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 51 Filed: 1/17/2005, Entered: 2/9/2005 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                        MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Marcia B. Normande. (kw, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 44 Filed: 12/27/2004, Entered: 12/28/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER; the Clerk of the Court is directed to vacate the Court's Order dated 9/23/2004 dismissing this matter; this Order is also regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of this action. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 12/22/2004) (jp, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 43 Filed: 12/8/2004, Entered: 12/8/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                            TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 11/18/04 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff.(Gonzalez, Jose)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 11/18/2004, Entered: 11/23/2004 Status Conference
                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff : Status Conference held on 11/18/2004. Plaintiff requests to have case reopened. (pl, ) Modified on 11/23/2004 (pl, ).
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 42 Filed: 11/10/2004, Entered: 11/23/2004 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) for an order, that the previous Motion to consider re-opening this action and a pre-trial conference be held consecutively. Document filed by Marcia B. Normande. (sac, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 41 Filed: 10/22/2004, Entered: 10/26/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER the Court will hold an in-court conference on 11/18/04 at 5 PM. If plaintiff appears in person at that conference, the Court will consider re-opening the case. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 10/18/04) (dfe, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: 10/18/2004 Telephone Conference
                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff : Telephone Conference held on 10/12/2004. (jco, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: 10/12/2004 Mail Notice of Right to Appeal
                                                      Mailed notice of Right to Appeal to Attorney(s) of Record: Fred David Weinstein. (snu, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 40 Filed: 9/29/2004, Entered: 9/29/2004 Clerks Judgment
                                                        CLERK'S JUDGMENT dismissing the action with prejudice. (Signed by J. Michael McMahon, clerk on 9/29/04) (ml, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 39 Filed: 9/27/2004, Entered: 9/28/2004 Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER OF DISMISSAL, plntf having abandoned what is left of the case, the case is therefore dismissed with prejudice. Clerk to enter judgment. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 9/23/04) (cd, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 9/27/2004, Entered: 9/28/2004 Transmission to Judgments and Orders Clerk
                                                            Transmission to Judgments and Orders Clerk. Transmitted re: [39] Order of Dismissal, to the Judgments and Orders Clerk for preparation of Judgment. (cd, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 38 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 2/2/2004 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz from Michael F. Schwartz dated 1/23/04 re: Mr. Zimmerman's deposition may be continued on or before 2/20/04. (Signed by Judge Theodore H. Katz on 1/23/04) Copies Mailed By Chambers.(sac, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 37 Filed: 4/1/2003, Entered: 4/3/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER; that for the reasons stated in the Report and Recommendation, defendants' motion for summary judgment is hereby granted in part and denied in part . ( signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff ); (pl)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 36 Filed: 3/24/2003, Entered: 3/31/2003 Objection to Report and Recommendations
                                                                  OBJECTION(S) by Marcia B. Normande to [35-1] report and recommendations . (db)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 35 Filed: 3/10/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003, Terminated: 3/31/2003 Report and RecommendationsCourt Filing
                                                                    REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz Re: for reasons further set forth in said R&R, this Court recommends that dfts [20-1] motion for summary judgment be granted in favor of defendants Grippo, Sabek, and Innovative More Balls, as well as on pltff's cause of action for fraud. The Court further recommends that on all other claims, dft's motion for summary judgment should be denied. Objections to R and R due by 3/20/03 . (db) Modified on 03/11/2003
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 33 Filed: 9/6/2002, Entered: 9/10/2002 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                      Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Judge Katz from Marcia Normande, dated 9/2/02. Re: plaintiff writes that the Pro Se Office returned a document titled "Material Fact which is contended that there exists a geniune issue to be tried". The Cour will direct that plaintiff's " Material Facts upon which It is contended that there exists a geniune issue to be tried, " shall be docketed. The Court will not consider any further requests from plaintiff that are not sent in the mails and, as to which, there is no evidence of service on defendants . ( signed by Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz ); Copies mailed. (kw)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 34 Filed: 9/2/2002, Entered: 9/17/2002 Remark
                                                                        Material Facts Upon Which It Is Contended That There Exists A Genuine Issue to be Tried by Marcia B. Normande. (pl)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 32 Filed: 8/12/2002, Entered: 8/14/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER, plaintiff shall not be permitted to file her motion for summary judgment, and Defendants need not respond to the motion that was faxed to them. If any such motion is filed, it shall be stricken. The Court will address Defendants' motion for summary judgment, taking into consideration Plaintiff's opposition, in a Report and Recommendation to Judge Rakoff . ( signed by Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz ); Copies mailed. (kw)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 31 Filed: 8/5/2002, Entered: 8/7/2002 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                            Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Magistrate Judge Katz from Fred D. Weinstein, dated 7/26/02. Re: Mr. Weinstein writes requesting that the Court should deny the plaintiff's request and award the defendants such other and further relief as may be deemed just and proper. Defendants' submission shall be considered as a Reoly with respect to its motion for summary judgment . ( signed by Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz ); Copies mailed. (tp)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 30 Filed: 7/29/2002, Entered: 7/31/2002 Reply Memorandum of Law in Oppisition
                                                                              REPLY MEMORANDUM by Innovative, Innovative More, Robert Grippo, Sherin Sabek in opposition to [26-1] miscellaneous . (sb)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 29 Filed: 7/25/2002, Entered: 7/29/2002 Reply Memorandum of Law
                                                                                REPLY MEMORANDUM by Innovative, Innovative More, Robert Grippo, Sherin Sabek re: [26-1] miscellaneous . (dle)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 28 Filed: 7/24/2002, Entered: 7/29/2002 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                  SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIDAVIT of Fred D. Weinstein by Innovative, Innovative More, Robert Grippo, Sherin Sabek in support of [20-1] motion for an order pursuant to Rule 56 of the fRCP granting defendant's summary judgment, dismissing plaintiff's compaint . (dle)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 27 Filed: 7/24/2002, Entered: 7/29/2002 Counterclaim
                                                                                    COUNTERCLAIM by Innovative, Innovative More, Robert Grippo, Sherin Sabek against Marcia B. Normande (dle)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 27 Filed: 7/24/2002, Entered: 7/29/2002 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                      ANSWER by Innovative, Innovative More, Robert Grippo, Sherin Sabek to [18-1] second amended complaint . (Attorney Fred D. Weinstein from the Firm: Kurzman, Eisenberg, Corbin). (dle)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 26 Filed: 7/22/2002, Entered: 7/26/2002 Objection (non-motion)
                                                                                        Objection(s) and Reply by Marcia B. Normande to [20-1] motion for an order pursuant to Rule 56 of the fRCP granting defendant's summary judgment, dismissing plaintiff's compaint . (db)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 25 Filed: 7/15/2002, Entered: 7/16/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                          ORDER; the 2nd amended complaint, which pltff was granted permission to file, and which deft has received, is deemed to be the operative complaint in this action . For the reasons stated herein, pltff's motion for summary judgment shall be stricken . Pltff is granted leave to refile her motion for summary judgment, by 8/2/02. Any such motion must provide proof of service on defts' must be accompanied by a Rule 56.1 Statement; must be supported with competent evidence; and must, if including deposition transcripts, make reference to specific testimony and pages in the transcripts that pltff relies upon in support of her motion . ( signed by Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz ); Copies mailed. (sn)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 7/15/2002, Entered: 7/16/2002 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                            Deadline(s) updated: set motion filing deadline for 8/2/02 . (sn)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 24 Filed: 7/11/2002, Entered: 7/16/2002 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Marcia B. Normande in support of motion for summary judgment. (sb)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 19 Filed: 6/17/2002, Entered: 6/21/2002 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Robert Grippo, Sherin Sabek in support of motion for summary judgment. (yv)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 23 Filed: 6/14/2002, Entered: 6/21/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Notice to Pro-Se litigant opposing motion for summary judgement by Innovative, Innovative More, Robert Grippo, Sherin Sabek. (db)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 22 Filed: 6/14/2002, Entered: 6/21/2002 Rule 56.1 Statement
                                                                                                    RULE 56.1 STATEMENT filed by Innovative, Innovative More, Robert Grippo, Sherin Sabek (db)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 21 Filed: 6/14/2002, Entered: 6/21/2002 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Innovative, Innovative More, Robert Grippo, Sherin Sabek in support of [20-1] motion for an order pursuant to Rule 56 of the fRCP granting defendant's summary judgment, dismissing plaintiff's compaint . (db)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 20 Filed: 6/14/2002, Entered: 6/21/2002 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                        NOTICE OF MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) by Innovative, Innovative More, Robert Grippo, Sherin Sabek for an order pursuant to Rule 56 of the fRCP granting defendant's summary judgment, dismissing plaintiff's compaint . Affidavit of Fred D. Weinstein in support of motion attached. Return Date 7/24/02 at 9:30. (db)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 18 Filed: 6/13/2002, Entered: 6/13/2002 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                          SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Marcia B. Normande (Answer due 7/3/02 for Sherin Sabek, for Robert Grippo, for Innovative More, for Innovative ) amending [6-1] amended complaint. Summons issued. (tp)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 17 Filed: 5/23/2002, Entered: 5/23/2002 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                            Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Mag. Judge Katz from Marcia Normande, dated 5/17/02. Re: Pltff requests that the Court rule that the sales literature indicated herein be provided, and if the Court rules against this, that the complaint is noted and can be referred to at a later date. The Court agrees with deft that the document request issued on the eve of the deposition was untimely and inconsistent with the resolution of earlier discovery disputes, that is, that pltff agreed to simply depose deft . Defts' anticipated motion for summary judgment shall be briefed on the following schedule: Motion to be served and filed by 6/14/02; response to be served and filed by 7/12/02; reply to be served and filed by 7/24/02 . Pltff is once again advised that procedural advise is available from this Court's Pro Se Office. In responding to the motion, she should refer to Local Civil Rules 56.1 and 56.2 of this Court and Rule 56 of the F.R.C.P . ( signed by Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz ); Copies mailed. (sn)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 16 Filed: 5/9/2002, Entered: 5/10/2002 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                              Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Judge Katz from Marcia Normande, dated 5/3/02, plntf's request for an extension of the discovery deadline and for additional discovery is denied. Defts' production of documents is consistent with plntf's request and this Court's order at the 4/18th conference...The discovery deadline remains 5/17 ( signed by Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz ); Copies mailed. (cd)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 15 Filed: 4/26/2002, Entered: 5/1/2002 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Magistrate Judge Katz from Fred D. Weinstein, dated 4/25/02. Re: defendants object to Ms. Normande's husband conducting deposition on her behalf. The Court agrees with Defendants' position. Ms. Normande's husband, a non-attorney, may not conduct deposition on her behalf . ( signed by Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz ); Copies mailed. (kw)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 14 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: 4/26/2002 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Magistrate Judge Katz from Marcia Normande, dated 4/17/02. The discovery deadline shall be extended to 5/17/02. Plaintiff and Defendants shall promptly schedule the two remaining depositions by 5/15/02. The parties shall advice the Court of whether they have made settlement efforts and whether they believe the Court can be of assistance with settlement. They shall also advise the Court of their intentions with respect to dispositive motions. Any dispositive motion shall be filed by 6/14/02. Responses shall be filed by 7/12/02. Any replies shall be filed by 7/24/02. If there are no dispositive motions, a joint pre-trial order shall be filed by 6/14/02 . ( signed by Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz ); Copies mailed. (kw)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/15/2002, Entered: 3/19/2002 Discovery Hearing
                                                                                                                    Discovery Hearing held by telephone by Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz . Decision: pretrial order or dispositive motion is due by 5/17/02; response to motions due 6/14/02; reply paper due 6/28/02. (bai)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 13 Filed: 2/15/2002, Entered: 2/20/2002 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Mag. Judge Katz from Fred D. Weinstein, dated 02/14/02; all pretrial discovery shall be completed by 04/22/02 ; Re: counsel to defendants reqeusts and extension of all corresponding dates in the court's prior scheduling order; Request granted. By 03/22/02 the parties shall submit a status report on discovery ; the joint pre-trial order shall be filed by 4/19/02 ; ( signed by Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz ); Copies mailed. (djc)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 12 Filed: 2/11/2002, Entered: 2/13/2002 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Mag. Judge Katz from Marcia Normande, dated 2/8/02. Re: plaintiffs request that the Court order the defendants to provide each information that can allow plaintiffs to assess the alleged damages, when required; Once the discovery period is completed, there will be no further discovery permitted. If Plaintiff believes that she needs certain information that she has requested of the defendants, and she has attempted to resolve this issue w/ defendant's counsel, she may seek relief from the Court, specifically the information she is seeking. If she chooses not to do so during the discovery period, then she will have to proceed to trial w/out the requested information . ( signed by Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz ); Copies mailed. (ae)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 11 Filed: 1/16/2002, Entered: 1/18/2002 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER #86473, plaintiff who presently resides in Brazil and contends that the cost of flying to New York from Brazil would exceed $3,000, and would impose further hardship on her because she would be required to travel with her infant son; because that his case is not a complex case, Plaintiff is proceeding pro se, and the time, expense, and inconvenience of coming to New York from Brazil with an infant child would be significant, Plaintiff's application to have her deposition taken by telephone is granted. The Court reserves the right to require Plaintiff to appear in New york for a follow-up deposition upon a showing by Defendants that they were unable to conduct a meaningful deposition by telephone . ( signed by Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz ); Copies mailed. (pl) Modified on 01/22/2002
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 10 Filed: 12/20/2001, Entered: 12/21/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [9-1] motion for an Order to amend complaint, Plaintiff shall serve and file her amended complaint by 1/4/02 . ( signed by Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz ); Copies mailed. (tp)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 8 Filed: 12/5/2001, Entered: 12/7/2001 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Mag Judge Katz from Fred D. Weinstein, dated 12/3/01, Re plntf's motion to amend the complaint: any response tothe motion shall be served and fld by 12/17/02. Any reply by plntf shall be served and fld by 1/4/02 ( signed by Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz ); Copies mailed. (cd)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 9 Filed: 11/26/2001, Entered: 12/12/2001, Terminated: 12/20/2001 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF MOTION by Marcia B. Normande; for an Order to amend complaint . Return date not indicated. (jco)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 10/10/2001, Entered: 10/22/2001 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of summons and compalint as to Sherin Sabek on 8/10/01 . Answer due on 8/30/01 for Sherin Sabek . (bai)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 10/10/2001, Entered: 10/22/2001 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of summons and complaint as to Innovative on 8/10/01 . Answer due on 8/30/01 for Innovative . (bai)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 10/10/2001, Entered: 10/22/2001 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of summons and complaint as to Innovative More on 8/10/01 . Answer due on 8/30/01 for Innovative More . (bai)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 10/10/2001, Entered: 10/22/2001 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT by Marcia B. Normande (Answer due 10/23/01 for Sherin Sabek, for Robert Grippo, for Innovative More, for Innovative ) amending [1-1] complaint ; Summons issued. (jp)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 10/5/2001, Entered: 10/9/2001 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: All pretrial discovery shall be completed by 2/22/02; There shall be no further amendments of the Complaint or joinder of additional parties after 11/30.01; By 2/25/02, the parties shall submit a status letter to the Court regarding pre-trial activity and any proposed dispositive motions; If there is no motion for summary judgment, a Joint Pretrial Order shall be filed by 3/29/02, consistent with Judge Rakoff's rules. ( signed by Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz ); Copies mailed. (tp)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 9/24/2001, Entered: 9/26/2001 Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                            COUNTERCLAIM by Innovative, Innovative More, Robert Grippo, Sherin Sabek against Marcia B. Normande (db)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 9/24/2001, Entered: 9/26/2001 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                              ANSWER TO THE AMENDED COMPLAINT by Innovative, Innovative More, Robert Grippo, Sherin Sabek (Attorney Fred D. Weinstein from the Firm: Kurzman, Eisenberg, Corbin, Lever & Goodman, L.L.P.). (db)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 8/31/2001, Entered: 9/4/2001 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for general pretrial/including initial case management conference; and dispositive motion (i.e. motion requiring a report and recommendation). Referred to Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz. ( signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff ) (sn)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 8/30/2001, Entered: 9/5/2001 Answer
                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Complaint and COUNTERCLAIM by Robert Grippo, Sherin Sabek, Innovative, Innovative More (Attorney Fred D Weinstein) against Marcia B. Normande; Firm of: Kurzman, Eisenberg, Corbin Lever & Goodman by attorney Fred D Weinstein for defendant Sherin Sabek (pl)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 8/10/2001, Entered: 8/16/2001 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT filed. Summons issued and Notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 413853. (jco)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 8/10/2001, Entered: 8/16/2001 Case Designation
                                                                                                                                                      Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz is so designated. (jco)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 43 times.

                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?