Kolesnikov v. Quarantillo et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-03287-JES

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Vladimir Kolesnikov, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hodgson Russ LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jacqueline Iris Meyer +1 212 751 4300 +1 212 751 0928 jmeyer@hodgsonruss.com
v.
No Logo Andrea J. Quarantillo, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Natasha Oeltjen +1 212 637 2769 +1 212 637 2786 natasha.oeltjen@usdoj.gov
No Logo Emilio Gonzalez, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Natasha Oeltjen +1 212 637 2769 +1 212 637 2786 natasha.oeltjen@usdoj.gov
No Logo Michael Chertoff, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Natasha Oeltjen +1 212 637 2769 +1 212 637 2786 natasha.oeltjen@usdoj.gov
Mueller, Robert S., III Mueller, Robert S., III, Defendant
Officially listed as "Robert S. Mueller, III"
United States Department of Justice Special Counsel, United States Department of Justice, May 17, 2017 - Present
Federal Bureau of Investigation Director, Federal Bureau of Investigation, September 4, 2001 - September 4, 2013

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Natasha Oeltjen +1 212 637 2769 +1 212 637 2786 natasha.oeltjen@usdoj.gov
Office Foley Square
Filed 4/2/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Bronx
Terminated 7/28/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 6 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: This action is dismissed with prejudice and without costs or attorney's fees to any party. (Signed by Judge Peter K. Leisure for Judge John E. Sprizzo on 7/28/08) (db)
    LREF
    Legal Document 5 Filed: 6/25/2008, Entered: 6/25/2008 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge John E. Sprizzo from Natasha Oeltijen dated 6/24/08 re: Defendants' counsel requests leave to extend the Government's period to answer, move, or otherwise responsd to plaintiff's complaint for sixty days, until 8/29/08. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. Andrea J. Quarantillo answer due 8/29/2008; Emilio Gonzalez answer due 8/29/2008; Michael Chertoff answer due 8/29/2008; Robert S. Mueller, III answer due 8/29/2008. (Signed by Judge Peter K. Leisure, Part I on 6/25/08) (ae)
      LREF
      Legal Document 4 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: 5/16/2008 Order for Initial Pretrial ConferenceCourt Filing
      LETTER:Pretrial Conference set for 6/24/2008 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 21C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge John E. Sprizzo. (Signed by Judge John E. Sprizzo on 5/16/2008) (tve)
        LREF
        Legal Document 3 Filed: 5/15/2008, Entered: 5/15/2008 Notice of Appearance/
        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Natasha Oeltjen on behalf of Andrea J. Quarantillo, Emilio Gonzalez, Michael Chertoff, Robert S. Mueller, III (Oeltjen, Natasha)
          LREF
          Legal Document 2 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: 4/10/2008 Notice of Case Assignment/ReassignmentCourt Filing
          NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge John E. Sprizzo. Judge Miriam Goldman Cedarbaum is no longer assigned to the case. (jeh)
            LREF
            Blank 1 Filed: 4/2/2008, Entered: 4/4/2008 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus
            COMPLAINT IN THE NATURE OF MANDAMUS against Andrea J. Quarantillo, Emilio Gonzalez, Michael Chertoff, Robert S. Mueller, III (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 646440).Document filed by Vladimir Kolesnikov.(mbe)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 4/2/2008, Entered: 4/4/2008 Case Designated ECF.
              Case Designated ECF. (mbe)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 4/2/2008, Entered: 4/4/2008 Case Designation
                Magistrate Judge Frank Maas is so designated. (mbe)
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 56 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?