USA v. Pilotti
Criminal Case New York Southern District Court, Case No. 7:08-cr-00294-SCR

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Perry Anthony Carbone +1 914 993 1941 +1 914 993 1980 Perry.Carbone2@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Dennis Pilotti, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by DeMatteo & Bernfeld, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph Raphael DeMatteo +1 212 661 1661 +1 212 557 9610 josephdematteo@hotmail.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office White Plains
Filed 4/4/2008
County Westchester
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7201.F
Offense Level 4
Count 2
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1014.F
Offense Level 4
Def Custody Status Released
Flag ECF
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/24/2008, Entered: 4/25/2008 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER ACCEPTING PLEA ALLOCUTION BEFORE A USMJ as to Dennis Pilotti re: [9] Report and Recommendations...The Report and Recommendation of the Honorable George A. Yanthis, USMJ, dated April 4, 2008, is approved and accepted. The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter the plea. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Stephen C. Robinson on 4/23/08)(fk)
    LREF
    Legal Document 9 Filed: 4/18/2008, Entered: 4/18/2008 Report and RecommendationsCourt Filing
    REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS as to Dennis Pilotti. Objections to R&R due by 5/5/2008. (Signed by Magistrate Judge George A. Yanthis on 4/18/2008) The Clerk's Office Has Mailed Copies.(cg)
      LREF
      Blank 8 Filed: 4/18/2008, Entered: 4/18/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
      TRANSCRIPT of PLEA Proceedings as to Dennis Pilotti held on 4/4/2008 before Magistrate Judge George A. Yanthis. Court Reporter: Christina Arends-Dieck. (cg)
        LREF
        Legal Document 7 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: 4/7/2008 Advice of Penalties and Sanctions
        ADVICE OF PENALTIES AND SANCTIONS as to Dennis Pilotti. (cg)
          LREF
          Legal Document 6 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: 4/7/2008 Order Setting Conditions of Release
          ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Dennis Pilotti (1) 100,000.00 PRB, Travel to SDNY/EDNY & N.J...... (cg)
            LREF
            Legal Document 5 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: 4/7/2008 Bond
            Appearance Bond Entered as to Dennis Pilotti in amount of $ 100,000.00 PRB, Surrender Psitol Permit immediatley. Whole case is pending no application for a new one. Travel Restricted to SDNY/EDNY & New Jersey. (cg)
              LREF
              Legal Document 4 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: 4/7/2008 Consent to Proceed on Felony Plea Allocution
              CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE ON A FELONY PLEA ALLOCUTION by Dennis Pilotti. (cg)
                LREF
                Legal Document 3 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: 4/7/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Joseph Raphael DeMatteo appearing for Dennis Pilotti. (cg)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 2 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: 4/7/2008 Waiver of Indictment
                  WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Dennis Pilotti. (cg)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: 4/7/2008 Information - Felony
                    INFORMATION (Felony) filed as to Dennis Pilotti (1) count(s) 1, 2. (cg)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: 4/7/2008 Set/Reset Hearings
                      Set/Reset Hearings as to Dennis Pilotti: Sentencing set for 7/8/2008 at 12:00 PM before Judge Stephen C. Robinson.. (cg)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: 4/7/2008 Order of Referral to Probation for Presentence Inv
                        ORAL Order of Referral to Probation for Presentence Investigation and Report as to Dennis Pilotti. (cg)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: 4/7/2008 Plea Entered
                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge George A. Yanthis: Plea entered by Dennis Pilotti (1) Guilty as to Count 1,2. (cg)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: 4/7/2008 Change of Plea Hearing
                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge George A. Yanthis:Change of Plea Hearing as to Dennis Pilotti held on 4/4/2008. Defendant present with attorney Joseph DeMatteo, AUSA Perry Carbone. Defendant withdraws his previous plea of not guilty and enters a plea of guilty to Counts 1-2 as charged. PSI ordered. Sentencing set for 7/8/2008 at 12pm. Bail set as follows: $100,000.00 PRB, Surrender Pistol Permit, no new one while case is pending. Travel extended to New Jersey. (cg)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: 4/7/2008 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                              Case as to Dennis Pilotti ASSIGNED to Judge Stephen C. Robinson. Judge Unassigned no longer assigned to the case.. (cg)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: 4/7/2008 Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                Attorney update in case as to Dennis Pilotti. Attorney Joseph Raphael DeMatteo for Dennis Pilotti added.. (cg)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: 4/7/2008 Plea Entered
                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge George A. Yanthis: Plea entered by Dennis Pilotti (1) Count 1,2 Not Guilty. (cg)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: 4/7/2008 Arraignment
                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge George A. Yanthis:Arraignment as to Dennis Pilotti (1) Count 1,2 held on 4/4/2008. Defendant present with attorney Joseph DeMatteo, AUSA Perry Carbone. Defendant enters a not guilty plea. Case assigned to Judge Robinson. (cg)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: 4/7/2008 Initial Appearance
                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge George A. Yanthis:Initial Appearance as to Dennis Pilotti held on 4/4/2008. Defendant present with attorney with attorney Joseph DeMatteo, AUSA Perry Carbone. (cg)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: 4/7/2008 Case Designated ECF.
                                        Case Designated ECF as to Dennis Pilotti. (cg)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: 4/7/2008 Arrest
                                          Arrest of Dennis Pilotti. (cg)
                                            LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 852 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?