The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey et al v. American Airlines, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-03700-AKH

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo The Port Authority Of New York And New Jersey, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Port Authority of New York and New Jersey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Keith Edward Harris +1 212 435 3437 +1 212 435 3584 kharris@panynj.gov
No Logo The Port Authority Trans-Hudson Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Port Authority of New York and New Jersey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Keith Edward Harris +1 212 435 3437 +1 212 435 3584 kharris@panynj.gov
No Logo WTC Retail, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Port Authority of New York and New Jersey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Keith Edward Harris +1 212 435 3437 +1 212 435 3584 kharris@panynj.gov
v.
American Airlines, Inc. American Airlines, Inc., Defendant
AMR Corporation Unknown Role, AMR Corporation
Unknown Role, Orbitz Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon & Forsyth LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Desmond Thomas Barry, Jr +1 212 894 6700 +1 212 894 6771 dbarry@condonlaw.com
No Logo Burnes International Security Services Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Burns International Services Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Colgan Air, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JEFFREY W. MORYAN +1 973 535 0500 jmoryan@connellfoley.com
Continental Airlines, Inc. Continental Airlines, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wright Robinson McCammon Osthimer & Tatum

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space BENJAMIN C. CURCIO +1 973 491 3600 +1 973 491 3555 benjamin.curcio@leclairryan.com
Delta Air Lines, Inc. Delta Air Lines, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Orbitz Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Gallagher Harnett & Lagalante LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Francis Gallagher +1 516 742 2500 +1 516 742 2516 JFGallagher@ggfc-law.com
No Logo Huntleigh USA Corporation, Defendant
No Logo ICTS International, N.V., Defendant
No Logo Massachusetts Port Authority, Defendant
No Logo Midway Airlines, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gallagher Harnett & Lagalante LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Francis Gallagher +1 516 742 2500 +1 516 742 2516 JFGallagher@ggfc-law.com
No Logo Pinkerton's, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Securitas Ab, Defendant
The Boeing Company, Inc. The Boeing Company, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "The Boeing Company"

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eric Scott Lent +20635 980 00x3058 +1 206 359 9000 elent@perkinscoie.com
UAL Corporation UAL Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quirk and Bakalor, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Loretta Anne Redmond +1 212 319 1000 +1 212 319 1064 lredmond@quirkbakalor.com
United Air Lines, Inc. United Air Lines, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "United Airlines"

Toggle Switch Represented by Quirk and Bakalor, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Loretta Anne Redmond +1 212 319 1000 +1 212 319 1064 lredmond@quirkbakalor.com
US Airways Group, Inc. US Airways Group, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Us Airways, Inc., Defendant
Office Foley Square
Filed 4/16/2008
Jury Demand Both
Demand
Nature of Suit 310 - Personal Injury: Airplane
Cause Section 49 U.S.C. § 40101 Air Trans. Safety and Sys. Stabilization Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County NewYork
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
121-mc-00101-AKH
Related Case
121-mc-00101-AKH
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ECF, MEMBER, RELATED
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 10 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... that any and all claims asserted and/or assertable by Plaintiff(s) The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey, WTC Retail LLC and the Port Authority Trans-Hudson Corporation contained in the Complaint(08cv3701 and dated 4/16/08) against Defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc. with regard to United Airlines Flight 175 in the captioned lawsuit shall be dismissed by the Court without prejudice... and without costs to either party as against the other. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/28/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(rjm)
    LREF
    Legal Document 9 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
    STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... that any and all claims asserted and/or assertable by Plaintiff(s) World Trade Center Properties LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC and 4 World Trade Center LLC against Defendant(s) Delta Air Lines, Inc. and Delta Express, Inc. with regard to United Airlines Flight 175 shall be dismissed by the Court without prejudice... and without costs to either party as against the other... and as further set forth. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/18/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(rjm) Modified on 7/21/2008 (rjm).
      LREF
      Legal Document 8 Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: 6/10/2008 Answer
      ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Midway Airlines.(Gallagher, James)
        LREF
        Legal Document 7 Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: 6/10/2008 Answer
        ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Delta Airlines, Inc..(Gallagher, James)
          LREF
          Legal Document 6 Filed: 5/21/2008, Entered: 5/21/2008 Answer
          ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Service)(Curcio, Benjamin)
            LREF
            Legal Document 5 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: 5/12/2008 Answer
            ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Colgan Air, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Service)(Moryan, Jeffrey)
              LREF
              Legal Document 4 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: 5/12/2008 Answer
              ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by American Airlines, Inc., AMR Corporation.(Barry, Desmond)
                LREF
                Legal Document 3 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: 5/12/2008 Answer
                ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by UAL Corporation, United Airlines.(Redmond, Loretta)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 2 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: 5/12/2008 Answer
                  ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by The Boeing Company.(Lent, Eric)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: 4/21/2008 Complaint
                    COMPLAINT against Colgan Air, Inc., US Airways Group, Inc., US Airways, Inc., Delta Airlines, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc., Midway Airlines, Huntleigh USA Corporation, ICTS International, N.V., Burnes International Security Services Corporation, Burns International Services Corporation, Pinkerton's, Inc., Securitas AB, American Airlines, Inc., AMR Corporation, UAL Corporation, United Airlines, Massachusetts Port Authority, The Boeing Company. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 648526)Document filed by The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey, WTC Retail, L.L.C., The Port Authority Trans-Hudson Corporation.(tve) (jeh).
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: 4/21/2008 Case Designated ECF.
                      Case Designated ECF. (tve)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: 4/21/2008 Case Consolidation - Member
                        CONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Create association to 1:21-mc-00101-AKH.. (tve)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: 4/21/2008 Case Accepted as Related
                          CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:21-mc-00101-AKH. (tve)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: 4/21/2008 Case Designation
                            Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz is so designated. (tve)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: 4/21/2008 Summons Issued
                              SUMMONS ISSUED as to Colgan Air, Inc., US Airways Group, Inc., US Airways, Inc., Delta Airlines, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc., Midway Airlines, Huntleigh USA Corporation, ICTS International, N.V., Burnes International Security Services Corporation, Burns International Services Corporation, Pinkerton's, Inc., Securitas AB, American Airlines, Inc., AMR Corporation, UAL Corporation, United Airlines, Massachusetts Port Authority, The Boeing Company. (tve)
                                LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 358 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?