World Trade Center Properties LLC. et al v. American Airlines, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-03722-AKH

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 29, 2017 at 10:34 PM DT (4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo 1 World Trade Center LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Flemming Zulack Williamson Zauderer, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregg Herbert Kanter +1 212 412 9553 +1 212 964 9200 gkanter@fzw.com
Space Richard Arthur Williamson +1 212 412 9500 +1 212 964 9200 rwilliamson@fzw.com
No Logo 3 World Trade Center LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Flemming Zulack Williamson Zauderer, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregg Herbert Kanter +1 212 412 9553 +1 212 964 9200 gkanter@fzw.com
Space Richard Arthur Williamson +1 212 412 9500 +1 212 964 9200 rwilliamson@fzw.com
No Logo 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Flemming Zulack Williamson Zauderer, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Arthur Williamson +1 212 412 9500 +1 212 964 9200 rwilliamson@fzw.com
No Logo World Trade Center Properties LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Flemming Zulack Williamson Zauderer, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregg Herbert Kanter +1 212 412 9553 +1 212 964 9200 gkanter@fzw.com
Space Richard Arthur Williamson +1 212 412 9500 +1 212 964 9200 rwilliamson@fzw.com
v.
American Airlines, Inc. American Airlines, Inc., Defendant
AMR Corporation Unknown Role, AMR Corporation
Unknown Role, Orbitz Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon & Forsyth LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Desmond Thomas Barry, Jr +1 212 894 6700 +1 212 894 6771 dbarry@condonlaw.com
AMR Corporation AMR Corporation, Defendant
Unknown Role, Orbitz Inc
Unknown Role, Mesa Airlines Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Desmond Thomas Barry, Jr +1 212 894 6700 +1 212 894 6771 dbarry@condonlaw.com
No Logo Burn International Services Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Burns International Security Services Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Colgan Air, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JEFFREY W. MORYAN +1 973 535 0500 jmoryan@connellfoley.com
Continental Airlines, Inc. Continental Airlines, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by LeClair Ryan, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/19/2013 Douglas H. Amster +1 973 491 3372 +1 973 491 3555 dha@stjohnlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wright Robinson McCammon Osthimer & Tatum

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space BENJAMIN C. CURCIO +1 973 491 3600 +1 973 491 3555 benjamin.curcio@leclairryan.com
Delta Air Lines, Inc. Delta Air Lines, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gallagher Harnett & Lagalante LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Francis Gallagher +1 516 742 2500 +1 516 742 2516 JFGallagher@ggfc-law.com
No Logo Globe Aviation Services Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Hirsch Connors & Bull PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Patrick Connors +1 212 527 1350 +1 212 527 1680 jconnors@jhcb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Locke Lord Bissell & Liddell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ann Caroline Taylor +1 312 443 0689 +1 312 443 0336 ataylor@lockelord.com
No Logo Huntleigh USA Corporation, Defendant
No Logo ICTS International, N.V., Defendant
No Logo Massachusetts Port Authority, Defendant
No Logo Midway Airlines Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gallagher Harnett & Lagalante LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Francis Gallagher +1 516 742 2500 +1 516 742 2516 JFGallagher@ggfc-law.com
No Logo Pinkerton's, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Securitas Ab, Defendant
The Boeing Company, Inc. The Boeing Company, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "The Boeing Company"

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eric Scott Lent +20635 980 00x3058 +1 206 359 9000 elent@perkinscoie.com
UAL Corporation UAL Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quirk and Bakalor, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Loretta Anne Redmond +1 212 319 1000 +1 212 319 1064 lredmond@quirkbakalor.com
United Airlines, Inc. United Airlines, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quirk and Bakalor, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Loretta Anne Redmond +1 212 319 1000 +1 212 319 1064 lredmond@quirkbakalor.com
US Airways Group, Inc. US Airways Group, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by CAMPBELL, CAMPBELL, EDWARDS & CONROY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kathleen Marie Guilfoyle +1 617 241 3109 +1 617 241 5115 kguilfoyle@campbell-trial-lawyers.com
No Logo Us Airways, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by CAMPBELL, CAMPBELL, EDWARDS & CONROY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kathleen Marie Guilfoyle +1 617 241 3109 +1 617 241 5115 kguilfoyle@campbell-trial-lawyers.com
No Logo Tig Insurance Company, Intervenor Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Abrams, Gorelick, Friedman & Jacobson, P.C(1 Bat. Pk. Plz)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ALEXANDRA ELIZABETH RIGNEY +1 212 422 1200 +1 212 968 7573 arigney@agfjlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Abrams, Gorelick, Friedman & Jacobson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Evan Gorelick +1 212 422 1200 +1 212 968 7573 mgorelick@agfjlaw.com
Office Foley Square
Filed 4/17/2008
Jury Demand Both
Demand
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 49 U.S.C. § 40101 Air Trans. Safety and Sys. Stabilization Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County NewYork
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
121-mc-00101-AKH
Related Cases
121-mc-00097-AKH-THK, 121-mc-00101-AKH, 121-mc-00101-AKH
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ECF, MEMBER, RELATED
  Entries (284) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 1802 Joint Motion to Approve Plaintiff 7 World Trade Company, L.P.'s and the Aviation Defendants' Joint Unopposed Motion for an Order Approving Their Settlement in case 1:21-mc-00101-AKH; granting 277 Joint Motion to Approve Plaintiff 7 World Trade Company, L.P.'s and the Aviation Defendants' Joint Unopposed Motion for an Order Approving Their Settlement in case 1:08-cv-03722-AKH. ENDORSEMENT: Motion granted. The case is dismissed with prejudice and without costs, upon the terms of the parties' settlement agreement and my Findings of Facts and Conclusions of Law filed August 1, 2013. I approve the Settlement Agreement as consistent with ATSSSA. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/28/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(tn) (Entered: 08/28/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    JOINT MOTION to Approve Plaintiff 7 World Trade Company, L.P.'s and the Aviation Defendants' Joint Unopposed Motion for an Order Approving Their Settlement. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 08/27/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 276 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW SUPPORTING JUDGMENT FOR DEFENDANTS: Accordingly, for the reasons stated, the business interruption and replacement cost insurance recoveries for the main site of the World Trade Center, which comprised all, or nearly all, of the $4.044 billion in total insurance recoveries, correspond to Plaintiffs' potential tort recovery and constitute a total offset to Plaintiffs' maximum potential tort recovery of $2.805 billion. Similarly, for the reasons stated, the business interruption and replacement cost proceeds for Tower 7, totaling nearly $829 million, correspond to Plaintiffs' possible tort recovery and thus completely offset Plaintiffs' maximum tort recovery of $737 million for the loss of the Tower 7 lease. These insurance proceeds, however, have not fully compensated Plaintiffs for art losses and personal property losses related to the destruction of Tower 7, and Plaintiffs may be owed up to $300,000 and $823,921 for these two types of losses, respectively. I shall confer with counsel at a conference on August 26, 2013, at 2:30 p.m. to discuss how these claims can be speedily resolved. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/1/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(cd) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 7/9/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER: For the reasons stated on the record, 7 World Trade Company's motion in limine is denied as premature and calling for speculation. The clerk shall mark the motion (Doc No, 1777 in 21 MC 101) terminated. SO ORDERED. Motions terminated: 1777 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) MOTION in Limine To Preclude the Aviation Defendants From Referring to or Introducing Evidence Regarding the New 7 World Trade Center Building filed by 7 World Trade Company, L.P. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/9/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(rsh) (Entered: 07/09/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Aviation Defendants' Proposed Conclusions of Law)Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 07/08/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            DECLARATION of Desmond T. Barry, Jr. in Support re: (1784 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 272 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH, 182 in 1:08-cv-03719-AKH) Pretrial Memorandum. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Part 1 of 2, # 2 Exhibit A - Part 2 of 2, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Exhibit Q, # 19 Exhibit R, # 20 Exhibit S, # 21 Exhibit T, # 22 Exhibit U, # 23 Exhibit V, # 24 Exhibit W, # 25 Exhibit X - Part 1 of 2, # 26 Exhibit X - Part 2 of 2, # 27 Exhibit Y, # 28 Exhibit Z, # 29 Exhibit AA, # 30 Exhibit BB, # 31 Exhibit CC, # 32 Exhibit DD, # 33 Exhibit EE, # 34 Exhibit FF, # 35 Exhibit GG, # 36 Exhibit HH, # 37 Exhibit II, # 38 Exhibit JJ, # 39 Exhibit KK, # 40 Exhibit LL, # 41 Exhibit MM, # 42 Exhibit NN, # 43 Exhibit OO, # 44 Exhibit PP, # 45 Exhibit QQ)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 07/08/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Appendix B)Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 07/08/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                DECLARATION of Desmond T. Barry, Jr. in Opposition re: (1777 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) MOTION in Limine To Preclude the Aviation Defendants From Referring to or Introducing Evidence Regarding the New 7 World Trade Center Building.. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 07/03/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (1777 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) MOTION in Limine To Preclude the Aviation Defendants From Referring to or Introducing Evidence Regarding the New 7 World Trade Center Building.. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 07/03/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 5/20/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    SUMMARY ORDER. Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment dismissing the act-of-war affirmative defenses is denied. Whether there is any merit to this defense depends on how it is to be presented at trial, and therefore it is premature to decide this issue now. Plaintiffs' may refile their motion to dismiss this defense at the opportune time. I also deny Defendants' motion for a declaratory judgment that they are entitled to a reduction in damages related to 7 World Trade Center. Defendant seeks an authoritative interpretation of a contract with Industrial Risk Insurers ("IRI"). Because IRI is not before me, I decline to interpret the contract. The clerk shall mark the motions (Doc. Nos. 1728 and 1736 in 21 MC 101, 241 and 246 in 08 Civ. 3722) terminated. Denying (1728) Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; Denying (1736) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 1:21-mc-00101-AKH; Denying (241) Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; Denying (246) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 1:08-cv-03722-AKH. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/17/2013). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(rjm) (Entered: 05/20/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Therefore, it is hereby stipulated and agreed, by and between the undersigned attorneys of record for the respective parties thereto that 1.All claims against Delta bearing Docket Nos. 21 MC 101 and 08 CIV 3722 be and hereby are dismissed with each party bearing its own costs; 2.The Claims of Plaintiffs contained in the Complaint against Delta with regard to Flight 11 will be reinstated nunc pro tunc as of the date of this stipulation if, through an appeal or any other determination the November 21, 2012 Decision is reversed, vacated or modified such that Plaintiffs may pursue their claims against United related to Flight II or if Plaintiffs' claims against United arising our the hijacking and crash of flight II are otherwise restored, reinstated or revived by this or any other court; All other provisions as further set forth in this order (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 4/5/2013) (js) (Entered: 04/09/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 6/5/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 04/09/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 6/5/2012 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Paula Speer, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/3/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/13/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/11/2013.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 04/09/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            ORDER SETTING ORAL ARGUMENT. Oral argument on 1) Plaintiffs' motion for partial summary judgment dismissing the act of war affirmative defense, and 2) Aviation Defendants' motion for summary judgment on their counterclaims for declaratory relief as to WTC 7, is scheduled for May 14, 2013 at 4:00 p.m. (Oral Argument set for 5/14/2013 at 04:00 PM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 4/1/2013). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH. (rjm) (Entered: 04/01/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (246 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment By The Aviation Defendants On Their Counterclaims For Declaratory Relief As To WTC 7.. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 3/20/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  ORDER: Plaintiffs' request to obtain an additional expert for the upcoming correspondence trial is denied with leave to renew. Plaintiffs have not shown the need for a new expert and why the present experts cannot adequately address the issue that Plaintiffs characterize as newly discovered. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/20/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(rsh) (Entered: 03/20/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 3/20/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the following Joint Case Management Plan regarding remaining discovery, motion practice, and pretrial preparations relating to the July 15, 2013 trial of CPLR 4545 correspondence is established for the World Trade Center P1aintiffs and Aviation Defendants in In re September 11 Litigation. May 10, 2013 is the deadline for Aviation Defendants to complete their depositions and May 24, 2013 is the deadline for World Trade Center Plaintiffs to complete their depositions. July 1, 2013 any motions in limine, other motions concerning any expert witness or other pre-trial motions shall be filed by this date. July 8, 2013 the parties shall submit a joint pretrial order. July 15, 2013 a two week non-jury correspondence trial will commence. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/20/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(rsh) (Entered: 03/20/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 3/19/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      COUNTER STATEMENT TO (248 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH) Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by 7 World Trade Company, L.P., 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 03/19/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 3/19/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (246 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment By The Aviation Defendants On Their Counterclaims For Declaratory Relief As To WTC 7.. Document filed by 7 World Trade Company, L.P., 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 03/19/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 3/12/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          REPLY AFFIRMATION of Richard A. Williamson in Support re: (241 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH, 1728 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment.. Document filed by 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 3 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Company, L.P., World Trade Center Properties LLC, 1 World Trade Center L.L.C., 3 World Trade Center L.L.C., 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P., World Trade Center Properties LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 03/12/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 3/12/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (241 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment.. Document filed by 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 3 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Company, L.P., World Trade Center Properties LLC, 1 World Trade Center L.L.C., 3 World Trade Center L.L.C., 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P., World Trade Center Properties LLC.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 03/12/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 3/8/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Richard A. Williamson dated 3/5/2013 re: The WTCP Plaintiffs write pursuant to Your Honor's Individual Rule 2E with respect to a dispute concerning the newly-filed "Motion by Aviation Defendants for Summary Judgment on Their Counterclaims for Declaratory Relief As to WTC 7." ENDORSEMENT: Denied. I will address motions as they came to me for dec'n. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/8/2013) (tro) (Entered: 03/09/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  DECLARATION of Desmond T. Barry, Jr. in Opposition re: (241 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH, 1728 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment.. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    COUNTER STATEMENT TO (244 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH, 1731 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) Rule 56.1 Statement,. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (241 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH, 1728 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment.. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        ENDORSED LETTER: addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Desmond T. Barry Jr. dated 2/26/2013 re: Counsel write on behalf of Aviation Defendants and the World Trade Center Plaintiffs concerning the Court's endorsement of yesterday on my letter dated February 22. 2013 (a copy of which is enclosed) scheduling a hearing for 3:30 p.m. today. As set forth below, the parties believe today's hearing is no longer necessary and respectfully request that it be cancelled. Accordingly, the Aviation Defendants withdraw their request to file the motion papers under seal as set forth in my February 22, 2013 letter and the parties respectfully request that the Court cancel today's hearing. ENDORSEMENT: Since the parties represent that no sealing of confidential documents relevant to the motion will be required, the conference is canceled, and briefing and argument of the motion in open records and in an open courtroom may proceed. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/26/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(js) (Entered: 02/27/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 2/26/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 02/26/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 2/26/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            DECLARATION of Desmond T. Barry, Jr. in Support re: (246 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH, 1736 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment By The Aviation Defendants On Their Counterclaims For Declaratory Relief As To WTC 7.. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 02/26/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 2/26/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 02/26/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 2/26/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (246 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH, 1736 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment By The Aviation Defendants On Their Counterclaims For Declaratory Relief As To WTC 7.. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 02/26/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 2/26/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  MOTION for Summary Judgment By The Aviation Defendants On Their Counterclaims For Declaratory Relief As To WTC 7. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 02/26/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER: addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Desmond T. Barry Jr. dated 2/22/2013 re: Accordingly, the Aviation Defendants respectfully request that the Court direct the Clerk of the Court to accept the Aviation Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on their counterclaims for declaratory relief as to the WTCP Plaintiffs claims arising from the destruction of WTC 7 for filing under seal by endorsing this letter below. ENDORSEMENT: "At a hearing to be held tomorrow, Feb. 26, 2013, at 3:30 p.m., any party who is interested to preserve confidentiality in any paper proposed to be filed shall show cause why perceived prejudice to such party outweighs the public interest in openness of the proceedings. ( Hearing set for 2/26/2013 at 03:30 PM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/25/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(js) (Entered: 02/25/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 3 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Company, L.P., World Trade Center Properties LLC, 1 World Trade Center L.L.C., 3 World Trade Center L.L.C., 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P., World Trade Center Properties LLC.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 02/20/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        DECLARATION of Richard A. Williamson in Support re: (241 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment.. Document filed by 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 3 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Company, L.P., World Trade Center Properties LLC, 1 World Trade Center L.L.C., 3 World Trade Center L.L.C., 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P., World Trade Center Properties LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Williamson Declaration Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Williamson Declaration Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Williamson Declaration Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit Williamson Declaration Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit Williamson Declaration Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit Williamson Declaration Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit Williamson Declaration Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit Williamson Declaration Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit Williamson Declaration Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit Williamson Declaration Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit Williamson Declaration Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit Williamson Declaration Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit Williamson Declaration Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit Williamson Declaration Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit Williamson Declaration Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit Williamson Declaration Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit Williamson Declaration Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit Williamson Declaration Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit Williamson Declaration Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit Williamson Declaration Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit Williamson Declaration Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit Williamson Declaration Exhibit 22)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 02/20/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (241 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment.. Document filed by 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 3 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Company, L.P., World Trade Center Properties LLC, 1 World Trade Center L.L.C., 3 World Trade Center L.L.C., 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P., World Trade Center Properties LLC.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 02/20/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Document filed by 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 3 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Company, L.P., World Trade Center Properties LLC, 1 World Trade Center L.L.C., 3 World Trade Center L.L.C., 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P., World Trade Center Properties LLC.. Responses due by 3/6/2013Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 02/20/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Document filed by 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 3 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Company, L.P., World Trade Center Properties LLC, 1 World Trade Center L.L.C., 3 World Trade Center L.L.C., 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P., World Trade Center Properties LLC.. Responses due by 3/6/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Rule 56.1 Statement, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Richard A. Williamson, # 3 Exhibit Williamson Declaration Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit Williamson Declaration Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit Williamson Declaration Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit Williamson Declaration Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit Williamson Declaration Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit Williamson Declaration Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit Williamson Declaration Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit Williamson Declaration Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit Williamson Declaration Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit Williamson Declaration Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit Williamson Declaration Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit Williamson Declaration Exhibit 12, # 15 Exhibit Williamson Declaration Exhibit 13, # 16 Exhibit Williamson Declaration Exhibit 14, # 17 Exhibit Williamson Declaration Exhibit 15, # 18 Exhibit Williamson Declaration Exhibit 16, # 19 Exhibit Williamson Declaration Exhibit 17, # 20 Exhibit Williamson Declaration Exhibit 18, # 21 Exhibit Williamson Declaration Exhibit 19, # 22 Exhibit Williamson Declaration Exhibit 20, # 23 Exhibit Williamson Declaration Exhibit 21, # 24 Exhibit Williamson Declaration Exhibit 22, # 25 Affidavit Memorandum of Law)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Cohen, Jason) Modified on 2/20/2013 (ldi). (Entered: 02/20/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL: THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned attorneys of record for the respective parties hereto that All claims against Continental bearing Docket Nos. 21-MC-101 and 08-CV-3722 be and hereby are dismissed with each party bearing its own costs2.The Claims of Plaintiffs contained in the Complaint against Continental with regard to Flight 11 will be reinstated nunc pro tunc as of the date of this stipulation if, through an appeal or any other determination the November 21, 2012 Decision is reversed, vacated or modified such that Plaintiffs may pursue their claims against United related to Flight 11 or if Plaintiffs' claims against United arising our the hijacking and crash of Flight II are otherwise restored, reinstated Or revived by this or any other court. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/15/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(js) (Entered: 02/19/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 2/7/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Desmond T. Barry, Jr. dated 2/7/2013 re: counsel for Defendants writes to request a one week adjournment (from July 8th to July 15th) of the scheduled non-jury correspondence trial in the above-referenced cases due to the unavailability of one of the Aviation Defendants' key witnesses. ENDORSEMENT: Trial is adjourned to July 15. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/7/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(pl) (Entered: 02/07/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER: On January 23, 2013, I held a status conference at which I scheduled a non-jury correspondence trial to take place in the 08 CIV 3719 (AKH) and 08 CIV 3722 (AKH) dockets, beginning on July 8, 2013. I declined to grant the application of the WTCP Plaintiffs for an all-issues jury trial. WTCP Plaintiffs are allowed to participate together with the Cantor Fitzgerald Plaintiffs in pre-trial discovery in the 04-CV-07318 (AKH) docket, as well as pre-trial SSI issues, through the July 8, 2013 correspondence trial. I will determine whether WTCP can participate further following the July 8, 2013 correspondence trial. I also directed counsel to submit a joint case management plan with respect to the July 8, 2013 correspondence trial, addressing remaining discovery, motion practice, pretrial preparations and trial for my consideration. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/1/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(lmb) (Entered: 02/01/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 1/23/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 01/31/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 1/23/2013 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Martha Drevis, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/25/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/7/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/6/2013.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 01/31/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 12/13/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                          ORDER: 12/17/2012 Status Conference reset for 1/23/2013 at 03:00 PM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein, for the Cantor claims and at 3:15 for the Silverstein claims. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/10/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(cd) (Entered: 12/13/2012)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                            OPINION AND ORDER DENYING MOTION TO CREDIT INSURANCE RECOVERIES AGAINST POTENTIAL TORT RECOVERIES (CORRECTED OPINION): #102648 For the reasons discussed above, Aviation Defendants' motion for summary judgment is denied. The Clerk shall mark the motion (Doc. No. 205) terminated. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/5/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(pl) Modified on 12/21/2012 (jab). (Entered: 12/06/2012)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Blank 232 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                              OPINION AND ORDER DENYING MOTION TO CREDIT INSURANCE RECOVERIES AGAINST POTENTIAL TORT RECOVERIES; re: #102648 (205 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing All Claims of Plaintiff 7 World Trade Company, L.P. Relating to 7 World Trade Center. filed by American Airlines, Inc., AMR Corporation.For the reasons discussed above, Aviation Defendants' motion for summary judgment is denied. The Clerk shall mark the motion (Doc. No. 205) terminated. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/3/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(pl) Modified on 12/11/2012 (jab). (Entered: 12/03/2012)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                JUDGMENT That for the reasons stated in the Court's Opinion and Order dated November 21, 2012, United's motion for summary judgment is granted, and judgment is entered dismissing Defendants United Continental Holdings, Inc. and United Airlines, Inc. from the case with costs to be taxed by the Clerk (RELATES TO 08CV3722). (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 11/21/12) (Attachments: # 1 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO APPEAL)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(ml) (Entered: 11/21/2012)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER AND OPINION GRANTING UNITED'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT THAT IT HAD NO DUTY FOR FLIGHT 11: in case 1:21-mc-00101-AKH; granting (187) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:08-cv-03722-AKH; granting (159) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:21-mc-00101-AKH.CONCLUSION: For the reasons discussed above, United's motion for summary judgment is granted. The Clerk shall mark the motion (Doc. No. 187) terminated and enter judgment dismissing Defendants United Continental Holdings, Inc. and United Airlines, Inc. from the case. Costs shall be taxed by the Clerk.SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 11/21/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(ama) (Entered: 11/21/2012)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 10/11/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 11/13/2012)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 10/11/2012 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Karen Gorlaski, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/7/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/17/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/14/2013.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 11/13/2012)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a ARGUMENT proceeding held on 10/18/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 11/08/2012)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 10/16/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Declaration of Jason T. Cohen in Response to Court's October 3, 2012 Order re: 187 MOTION to Dismiss all claims of the World Trade Center Plaintiffs relating to Building 7 of the World Trade Center against United.. Document filed by 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13)(Egan, Thomas) (Entered: 10/16/2012)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 10/16/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of United's Submission Pursuant to Court's October 3, 2012 Order on October 16, 2012. Document filed by UAL Corporation, United Air Lines, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Bayley, Anoushka) (Entered: 10/16/2012)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 10/16/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              NOTICE of United's Submission Pursuant to Court's October 3, 2012 Order re: (187 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH) MOTION to Dismiss all claims of the World Trade Center Plaintiffs relating to Building 7 of the World Trade Center against United.. Document filed by UAL Corporation, United Air Lines, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Bayley, Anoushka) (Entered: 10/16/2012)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 10/11/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a argument proceeding held on 9/27/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 10/11/2012)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 10/11/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: ARGUMENT held on 9/27/2012 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Khristine Sellin, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/5/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/16/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/14/2013.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 10/11/2012)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 10/11/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (1648 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 187 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH) MOTION to Dismiss all claims of the World Trade Center Plaintiffs relating to Building 7 of the World Trade Center against United.. Document filed by 7 World Trade Company, L.P.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Egan, Thomas) (Entered: 10/11/2012)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 10/3/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER: With respect to United's supplemental motion for summary judgment, by October 15, 2012, United and World Trade Center Properties shall each submit to the Court an account of the passage of American Airlines Flight 11 hijackers Mohamed Atta and Abdul Aziz al Omari through Portland International Jetport and Boston Logan International Airport on September 11, 2001, including terminal maps identifying the locations of relevant security checkpoints and departure and arrival gates. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/3/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(lmb) (Entered: 10/03/2012)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 9/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (205 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing All Claims of Plaintiff 7 World Trade Company, L.P. Relating to 7 World Trade Center.. Document filed by 7 World Trade Company, L.P.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Egan, Thomas) (Entered: 09/26/2012)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 9/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Andrew R. Berman in Opposition re: (205 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing All Claims of Plaintiff 7 World Trade Company, L.P. Relating to 7 World Trade Center.. Document filed by 7 World Trade Company, L.P.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Egan, Thomas) (Entered: 09/26/2012)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 9/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Kerry D. Vandell, Ph.D. in Opposition re: (205 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing All Claims of Plaintiff 7 World Trade Company, L.P. Relating to 7 World Trade Center.. Document filed by 7 World Trade Company, L.P.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Egan, Thomas) (Entered: 09/26/2012)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 9/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Sheldon Gottlieb in Opposition re: (205 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing All Claims of Plaintiff 7 World Trade Company, L.P. Relating to 7 World Trade Center.. Document filed by 7 World Trade Company, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 35, # 2 Exhibit 36)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Egan, Thomas) (Entered: 09/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 9/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Richard A. Williamson in Opposition re: (205 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing All Claims of Plaintiff 7 World Trade Company, L.P. Relating to 7 World Trade Center.. Document filed by 7 World Trade Company, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 18, # 2 Exhibit 19 (1 of 2), # 3 Exhibit 19 (2 of 2), # 4 Exhibit 20 (1 of 3), # 5 Exhibit 20 (2 of 3), # 6 Exhibit 20 (3 of 3), # 7 Exhibit 21, # 8 Exhibit 22, # 9 Exhibit 23, # 10 Exhibit 24, # 11 Exhibit 25, # 12 Exhibit 26, # 13 Exhibit 27, # 14 Exhibit 28, # 15 Exhibit 29, # 16 Exhibit 30, # 17 Exhibit 31, # 18 Exhibit 32 (1 of 2), # 19 Exhibit 32 (2 of 2), # 20 Exhibit 33, # 21 Exhibit 34)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Egan, Thomas) (Entered: 09/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 9/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Michael L. Levy in Opposition re: (205 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing All Claims of Plaintiff 7 World Trade Company, L.P. Relating to 7 World Trade Center.. Document filed by 7 World Trade Company, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (1 of 4), # 2 Exhibit 1 (2 of 4), # 3 Exhibit 1 (3 of 4), # 4 Exhibit 1 (4 of 4), # 5 Exhibit 2 (1 of 4), # 6 Exhibit 2 (2 of 4), # 7 Exhibit 2 (3 of 4), # 8 Exhibit 2 (4 of 4), # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit 12 (1 of 2), # 19 Exhibit 12 (2 of 2), # 20 Exhibit, # 21 Exhibit, # 22 Exhibit, # 23 Exhibit, # 24 Exhibit)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Egan, Thomas) (Entered: 09/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 9/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    COUNTER STATEMENT TO (208 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH) Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by 7 World Trade Company, L.P.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Egan, Thomas) (Entered: 09/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 9/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 09/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 9/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Desmond T. Barry, Jr. in Support re: (1678 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 205 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing All Claims of Plaintiff 7 World Trade Company, L.P. Relating to 7 World Trade Center.. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit RR, # 2 Exhibit SS, # 3 Exhibit TT, # 4 Exhibit UU, # 5 Exhibit VV (Part 1 of 3), # 6 Exhibit VV (Part 2 of 3), # 7 Exhibit VV (Part 3 of 3), # 8 Exhibit WW, # 9 Exhibit XX)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 09/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 9/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (1678 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 205 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing All Claims of Plaintiff 7 World Trade Company, L.P. Relating to 7 World Trade Center.. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 09/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 9/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 09/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 9/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 09/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 9/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Desmond T. Barry, Jr. in Support re: (1678 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 205 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing All Claims of Plaintiff 7 World Trade Company, L.P. Relating to 7 World Trade Center.. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G (Part 1 of 2), # 8 Exhibit G (Part 2 of 2), # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N (Part 1 of 3), # 16 Exhibit N (Part 2 of 3), # 17 Exhibit N (Part 3 of 3), # 18 Exhibit O, # 19 Exhibit P, # 20 Exhibit Q, # 21 Exhibit R, # 22 Exhibit S, # 23 Exhibit T, # 24 Exhibit U, # 25 Exhibit V, # 26 Exhibit W, # 27 Exhibit X, # 28 Exhibit Y, # 29 Exhibit Z, # 30 Exhibit AA, # 31 Exhibit BB, # 32 Exhibit CC, # 33 Exhibit DD (Part 1 of 11), # 34 Exhibit DD (Part 2 of 11), # 35 Exhibit DD (Part 3 of 11), # 36 Exhibit DD (Part 4 of 11), # 37 Exhibit DD (Part 5 of 11), # 38 Exhibit DD (Part 6 of 11), # 39 Exhibit DD (Part 7 of 11), # 40 Exhibit DD (Part 8 of 11), # 41 Exhibit DD (Part 9 of 11), # 42 Exhibit DD (Part 10 of 11), # 43 Exhibit DD (Part 11 of 11), # 44 Exhibit EE, # 45 Exhibit FF, # 46 Exhibit GG, # 47 Exhibit HH, # 48 Exhibit II, # 49 Exhibit JJ, # 50 Exhibit KK, # 51 Exhibit LL, # 52 Exhibit MM, # 53 Exhibit NN, # 54 Exhibit OO, # 55 Exhibit PP, # 56 Exhibit QQ)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 09/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 9/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (1678 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 205 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing All Claims of Plaintiff 7 World Trade Company, L.P. Relating to 7 World Trade Center.. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 09/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 9/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing All Claims of Plaintiff 7 World Trade Company, L.P. Relating to 7 World Trade Center. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 09/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Reply Memorandum in Support of Supplemental Motion by United for Summary Judgment Dismissing All Claims of the WTCP Plaintiffs Relating to 7 WTC and Reply Declaration of Jeffrey J. Ellis in Support of Supplemental Motion by United for Summary Judgment Dismissing All Claims of the WTCP Plaintiffs Relating to 7 WTC on September 21, 2012. Document filed by UAL Corporation, United Air Lines, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Bayley, Anoushka) (Entered: 09/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Jeffrey J. Ellis in Support re: (187 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH) MOTION to Dismiss all claims of the World Trade Center Plaintiffs relating to Building 7 of the World Trade Center against United.. Document filed by UAL Corporation, United Air Lines, Inc., United Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Bayley, Anoushka) (Entered: 09/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (187 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH) MOTION to Dismiss all claims of the World Trade Center Plaintiffs relating to Building 7 of the World Trade Center against United.. Document filed by UAL Corporation, United Air Lines, Inc., United Airlines, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Bayley, Anoushka) (Entered: 09/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 9/11/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Richard A. William dated 9/10/2012 re: Counsel respectfully ask Your Honor to put a stop to the Aviation Defendants' efforts to keep the WTCP Plaintiffs from ever having their case heard by a jury. ENDORSEMENT: Motion to fix a date for trial before discovery is completed, denied. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/11/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(jfe) (Entered: 09/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 9/11/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (187 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH) MOTION to Dismiss all claims of the World Trade Center Plaintiffs relating to Building 7 of the World Trade Center against United.. Document filed by 7 World Trade Company, L.P.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Egan, Thomas) (Entered: 09/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 9/11/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Jason T. Cohen in Opposition re: (187 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH) MOTION to Dismiss all claims of the World Trade Center Plaintiffs relating to Building 7 of the World Trade Center against United.. Document filed by 7 World Trade Company, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits to be filed on disc.)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Egan, Thomas) (Entered: 09/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 9/11/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Richard A. Williamson in Opposition re: (187 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH) MOTION to Dismiss all claims of the World Trade Center Plaintiffs relating to Building 7 of the World Trade Center against United.. Document filed by 7 World Trade Company, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits to be filed on disc.)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Egan, Thomas) (Entered: 09/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 9/11/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    COUNTER STATEMENT TO (190 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH, 1651 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by 7 World Trade Company, L.P.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Egan, Thomas) (Entered: 09/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Desmond T. Barry, Jr. dated 9/06/2012 re: Specifically, we write to request an evidentiary hearing pursuant to New York's C.P.L.R. § 4545(c) on the remaining issue of correspondence between WTCP's potential tort recoveries and its insurance recoveries. ENDORSEMENT: Denied w/out prejudice to renewal after close of expert's discovery. Future applications should conform to Individual Rule 2e Procedure. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/06/2012) (ama) (Entered: 09/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        OPINION AND ORDER DENYING MOTION TO CREDIT INSURANCE RECOVERIES AGAINST POTENTIAL TORT RECOVERIES #102330: Defendants' motion to credit insurance recoveries against potential tort recoveries is denied. The issue is not suitable for summary disposition on the record presented. The clerk shall terrninate the motions (08 Civ. 3719, Doc. No. 153; 08 Civ. 3722, Doc. No. 169). (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/31/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(ft) Modified on 9/14/2012 (ft). (Entered: 09/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 194 Filed: 8/31/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps) (Entered: 08/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 193 Filed: 8/17/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps) (Entered: 08/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE: WTCP asks that briefing of United's supplemental motion be deferred until I decide the pending motion filed by all the Aviation Defendants. But United is entitled to press defenses unique to it. Accordingly, WTCP's request is denied. Nearly eleven years after September 11, 2001, and after years of massive discovery, it is time to resolve these cases. WTCP shall file its opposition to United's supplemental motion by September 11, 2012. United shall file its reply by September 21, 2012. The parties shall appear for oral argument on September 27, 2012, at 2:30 p.m. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/9/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(pl) (Entered: 08/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Motion, Memorandum in Support of Supplemental Motion by United for Summary Judgment Dismissing All Claims of the WTCP Plaintiffs Relating to 7 WTC, Declaration of Jeffrey J. Ellis in Support of Supplemental Motion by United for Summary Judgment Dismissing All Claims of the WTCP Plaintiffs Relating to 7 WTC and United's Statement of Undisputed Facts Pursuant to Local Rule 56.1 on June 29, 2012. Service was made by ECF System and electronic mail. Document filed by UAL Corporation, United Air Lines, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Bayley, Anoushka) (Entered: 06/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by UAL Corporation, United Air Lines, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Bayley, Anoushka) (Entered: 06/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Jeffrey J. Ellis in Support re: (187 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH) MOTION to Dismiss all claims of the World Trade Center Plaintiffs relating to Building 7 of the World Trade Center against United.. Document filed by UAL Corporation, United Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Bayley, Anoushka) (Entered: 06/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (187 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH) MOTION to Dismiss all claims of the World Trade Center Plaintiffs relating to Building 7 of the World Trade Center against United. . Document filed by UAL Corporation, United Airlines, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Bayley, Anoushka) (Entered: 06/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss all claims of the World Trade Center Plaintiffs relating to Building 7 of the World Trade Center against United. Document filed by UAL Corporation, United Air Lines, Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Bayley, Anoushka) (Entered: 06/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 186 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps) (Entered: 06/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Desmond T. Barry, Jr. dated 6/27/2012 re: The Aviation Defendants and 7 World Trade Co. respectfully request that the Court direct the Clerk of the Court to accept all motion papers filed in conjunction with the Aviation Defendants' motion for summary judgment dismissing 7 World Trade Co.'s claim for WTC 7 for filing under seal by endorsing this letter as set forth below. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/27/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(lmb) (Entered: 06/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 5/9/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER SETTING ORAL ARGUMENT: Oral argument in the above-captioned matters, regarding the Aviation Defendants' Renewed Motion for Collateral Setoff, will be held on June 5, 2012 at 2:30 p.m. in Courtroom 14D., ( Oral Argument set for 6/5/2012 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 14D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/8/2012) (lmb) (Entered: 05/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Desmond T. Barry, Jr. and Richard A. Williamson dated 2/22/2012 re: We write pursuant to your Honor's Individual Rule 2(E) to seek the Court's assistance in resolving a dispute between the Aviation Defendants and 7 World Trade Company L.P. ("7 World Trade Co.") ENDORSEMENT: The settlement agreement shall be produced to be kept confidential by inspecting Counsel. Ruling on relevance and admissibility are deferred. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 4/4/2012) (djc) Modified on 4/6/2012 (djc). (Entered: 04/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 12/30/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED that Peter B. Van Deventer, Jr., be substituted as attorney of record for the defendant Continental Airlines, Inc., in the above matter instead of Benjamin C. Curcio.(Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/29/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(djc) (Entered: 12/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 12/29/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Desmond T. Barry, Jr. dated 12/29/11 re: Counsel for the Aviation Defendants' Liaison Counsel writes to request the Court's authorization and approval for the Rule 30(b)(6) deposition of 7 World Trade Company, L.P., by Michael Levy, to go forward as scheduled on 1/5/12. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/29/2011) (mro) (Entered: 12/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Douglas H. Amster on behalf of Continental Airlines, Inc. (Amster, Douglas) (Entered: 12/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 12/15/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 12/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 12/15/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Desmond T. Barry, Jr. in Support re: (1569 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 169 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH, 153 in 1:08-cv-03719-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Renewed Motion for Collateral Setoff Against WTCP's Claims Pursuant to N.Y. CPLR 4545(c) and for Summary Judgment Dismissing WTCP's Damages Claims. MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Renewed Motion for Collateral Setoff Against WTCP's Claims Pursuant to N.Y. CPLR 4545(c) and for Summary Judgment Dismissing WTCP's Damages Claims.. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit WW)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 12/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 12/15/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (1569 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 169 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH, 153 in 1:08-cv-03719-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Renewed Motion for Collateral Setoff Against WTCP's Claims Pursuant to N.Y. CPLR 4545(c) and for Summary Judgment Dismissing WTCP's Damages Claims. MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Renewed Motion for Collateral Setoff Against WTCP's Claims Pursuant to N.Y. CPLR 4545(c) and for Summary Judgment Dismissing WTCP's Damages Claims.. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 12/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Suggestion of Bankruptcy. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 11/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - (MISSING A PAGE)- NOTICE of Suggestion of Bankruptcy. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc., AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Barry, Desmond) Modified on 12/1/2011 (lb). (Entered: 11/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 11/16/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER :7 WTC will complete or acknowledge the completion of its production of documents in response to the Aviation Defendants' Request for Production of Documents to WTC 7 by December 5, 2012. The deposition of the 7 WTC FRCP 30(b)(6) witness shall take place on January 5, 2012.The close of fact discovery on the issue of Plaintiffs' recoverable damages for 7 WTC shall be January 16, 2012. However, the Aviation Defendants may request the production of documents identified at the 7 WTC deposition on or before this date, and Plaintiffs shall respond in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 34(b). Plaintiffs' expert reports shall be served on or before February 6, 2012 Defendants' expert reports shall be served on or before March 19, 2012. Expert depositions shall be completed on or before April 30, 2012. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 11/14/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(js) (Entered: 11/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Desmond T. Barry, Jr. in Support re: (1569 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 169 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH, 153 in 1:08-cv-03719-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Renewed Motion for Collateral Setoff Against WTCP's Claims Pursuant to N.Y. CPLR 4545(c) and for Summary Judgment Dismissing WTCP's Damages Claims. MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Renewed Motion for Collateral Setoff Against WTCP's Claims Pursuant to N.Y. CPLR 4545(c) and for Summary Judgment Dismissing WTCP's Damages Claims.. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (1569 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 169 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH, 153 in 1:08-cv-03719-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Renewed Motion for Collateral Setoff Against WTCP's Claims Pursuant to N.Y. CPLR 4545(c) and for Summary Judgment Dismissing WTCP's Damages Claims. MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Renewed Motion for Collateral Setoff Against WTCP's Claims Pursuant to N.Y. CPLR 4545(c) and for Summary Judgment Dismissing WTCP's Damages Claims.. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Renewed Motion for Collateral Setoff Against WTCP's Claims Pursuant to N.Y. CPLR 4545(c) and for Summary Judgment Dismissing WTCP's Damages Claims. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Renewed Motion for Collateral Setoff Against WTCP's Claims Pursuant to C.P.L.R. 4545(c) and for Summary Judgment Dismissing WTCP's Damages Claims. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 8/1/11 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 8/1/2011 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Denise Richards, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/12/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/22/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/21/2011.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of First Amended Answer and Counterclaim of Defendants United Air Lines, Inc. and United Continental Holdings, Inc. (f/k/a UAL Corporation) to the WTCP Flight 11 Plaintiffs' Complaint on August 12, 2011. Document filed by UAL Corporation, United Airlines, Inc.. (Bayley, Anoushka) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED ANSWER to with JURY DEMAND., COUNTERCLAIM against 1 World Trade Center L.L.C., 3 World Trade Center L.L.C., 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P., World Trade Center Properties LLC.. Document filed by United Airlines, Inc., UAL Corporation. (Bayley, Anoushka) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, with JURY DEMAND., COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs. Document filed by Huntleigh USA Corporation.(Ross, Johnathan) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, with JURY DEMAND., COUNTERCLAIM against 1 World Trade Center L.L.C., 3 World Trade Center L.L.C., 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P., World Trade Center Properties LLC.. Document filed by Massachusetts Port Authority. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Wood, Willard) (Entered: 08/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED ANSWER to (1 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH) Complaint,,. Document filed by Boeing Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Shultz, Mack) (Entered: 08/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, with JURY DEMAND., COUNTERCLAIM against World Trade Center Properties LLC.. Document filed by US Airways, Inc., US Airways Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Guilfoyle, Kathleen) (Entered: 08/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED ANSWER to with JURY DEMAND., COUNTERCLAIM against 1 World Trade Center L.L.C.. Document filed by Colgan Air, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(Moryan, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,., COUNTERCLAIM against 1 World Trade Center L.L.C., 3 World Trade Center L.L.C., 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P.. Document filed by The Boeing Company. (Shultz, Mack) (Entered: 08/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 8/3/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED ANSWER to (1 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH) Complaint,,. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 08/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 7/28/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Answer. Document filed by Globe Aviation Services Corporation. (Connors, James) (Entered: 07/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 7/28/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Globe Aviation Services Corporation.(Connors, James) (Entered: 07/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from James Freire dated 7/15/2011 re: Counsel for Globe writes to advise the Court that an oversight took place such that this answer was not electronically filed with the Court. We are advised by counsel for WTCP that they have no objection to the Court allowing Globe to correct this error and have Globe's answer dated May 12, 2008 filed in 08 Civ. 3722. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk shall docket the Answer in 21 MC 101 and 08 Civ. 3722. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/26/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH (ab) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER: It is hereby stipulated and agreed, that the Aviation Defendants may each supplement their individual answers to the WTCP Plaintiffs' flight 11 Complaint and as set forth in this stipulation and order. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/2011) (mbe) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY AFFIRMATION of Jason T. Cohen in Support re: (1457 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 162 in 1:02-cv-07154-AKH) MOTION for Pre-Trial Applicable Standard of Care.. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties LLC, 2 World Trade Center, L.L.C., 4 World Trade Center, L.L.C., World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 3 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Company, L.P., 1 World Trade Center L.L.C., 3 World Trade Center L.L.C., 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P., World Trade Center Properties LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Egan, Thomas) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Huntleigh USA Corporation.(Ross, Johnathan) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Massachusetts Port Authority.(Wood, Willard) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (1430 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 145 in 1:02-cv-07154-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment. [Superseding]. Document filed by Massachusetts Port Authority, Massachusetts Port Authority. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Wood, Willard) (Entered: 07/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 7/1/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of The Massachusetts Port Authoritys Motion for Summary Judgment; The Massachusetts Port Authoritys Reply to Mary Baviss Statement of Disputed Facts Pursuant to Local Rule 56.1; and Reply Declaration of Shiva Eftekhari with attached exhibits on 7/1/2011. Document filed by Massachusetts Port Authority. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Wood, Willard) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 7/1/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Shiva Eftekhari in Support re: (1430 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 145 in 1:02-cv-07154-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Massachusetts Port Authority. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - C, # 2 Exhibit D - O, # 3 Exhibit P - Z, # 4 Exhibit AA - FF)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Wood, Willard) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 7/1/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY re: (1467 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) Counter Statement to Rule 56.1,, (1471 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) Counter Statement to Rule 56.1. Document filed by Massachusetts Port Authority. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Wood, Willard) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 7/1/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (1430 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 145 in 1:02-cv-07154-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Massachusetts Port Authority. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Wood, Willard) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMARY ORDER AMENDING DISCOVERY PLAN-WTCP PLAINTIFFS: This Order amends the deadlines provided in my previous Order, and cancels the conference set for August 25, 2011. With regard to discovery pertaining to open WTCP damages issues, the parties shall exchange expert reports by August 12, 2011. In World Trade Center Properties LLC v. American Airlines, Inc., 08 Civ, 3722 (AKH), Plaintiffs allege injuries arising from the collapse of7 World Trade Center. The schedule for discovery of damages for this aspect of the case shall be recommended by the parties. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/24/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(jpo) (Entered: 06/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Jason T. Cohen in Opposition re: (1430 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 145 in 1:02-cv-07154-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties LLC, 2 World Trade Center, L.L.C., 4 World Trade Center, L.L.C., 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 3 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Company, L.P., 1 World Trade Center L.L.C., 3 World Trade Center L.L.C., 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit Exh. 1 Part 1 of 3, # 12 Exhibit Exh. 1 Part 2 of 3, # 13 Exhibit Exh. 1 Part 3 of 3)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Egan, Thomas) (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COUNTER STATEMENT TO (1432 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 147 in 1:02-cv-07154-AKH) Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by 2 World Trade Center, L.L.C., 4 World Trade Center, L.L.C., World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 3 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Company, L.P., 1 World Trade Center L.L.C., 3 World Trade Center L.L.C., 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Egan, Thomas) (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (1430 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 145 in 1:02-cv-07154-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties LLC, 2 World Trade Center, L.L.C., 4 World Trade Center, L.L.C., World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 3 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Company, L.P., 1 World Trade Center L.L.C., 3 World Trade Center L.L.C., 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Egan, Thomas) (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER: The actions are hereby discontinued with prejudice and without costs as to defendants ICTS International, N.V. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/24/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(jar) (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 6/16/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER ENLARGING TIME TO FILE OPPOSITION PAPERS: The WTCP Plaintiffs failed throughout to ask for discovery on the issues relevant to ICTS's dismissal, and, as I have said, their opposition fails to identify the "facts essential to justify [their] opposition." Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(d). Without such identification, their opposition will not be considered. However, I grant to the WTCP Plaintiffs an enlarged period, until June 24,2011, to file renewed or supplementary opposition papers to the ICTS motion, specifying the "facts essential to justify [their] opposition," id., or the precise discovery that will lead to such facts, and making such arguments as they wish from the considerable array of facts and documents they have collected. ICTS may file its reply by June 30, 2011. Briefing then will be closed. It is important to resolve the issue of ICTS's exposure to claims well before intensive proceedings preparing for a trial of the Bavis case begins November 7, 2011. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/16/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(jpo) (Entered: 06/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Jason T. Cohen dated 5/24/2011 re: The WTCP Plaintiffs write with regard to the May 3, 2011 Motion of ICTS International, N.V., for Summary Judgment Dismissing the Remaining Actions Against it. This afternoon, counsel for ICTS provided the WTCP Plaintiffs with additional insurance information. Counsel for ICTS and the WTCP Plaintiffs have agreed that the WTCP Plaintiffs will have until June 9, 2011 to oppose the summary judgment motion and that ICTS will have until June 16, 2011 to submit reply papers. If in the interim, the WTCP Plaintiffs decide to not oppose the motion, we will immediately notify counsel for ICTS and the Court. We respectfully request that the Court so order the revised briefing schedule by endorsement of this letter. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/3/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(js) (Entered: 06/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMARY ORDER WTCP PLAINTIFFS: In January 2011, I memo-endorsed a joint letter from the parties, lifting the stay on discovery in the 21 MC 101 Master Calendar to allow discovery on damages claimed by the WTCP Plaintiffs. The narrow damages issue that remains is whether the WTCP Plaintiffs' insurance recoveries compensated them fully for all potential tort recoveries from the Aviation Defendants. E.g., Order Denying Motion for Certification of Interlocutory Appeals under 28U.S.c. § 1292(b), World Trade Center Props. LLC v. United Airlines, Inc., 08 Civ. 3719 (21 MC 101) (Doc. No. 1322) (S.D.N.Y. Oct. 26, 2010). This issue, I believe, entails limited expert discovery, and perhaps nothing more.I learned at the status conference held June 1, 2011, that hardly any discovery, and no experts discovery whatsoever, has taken place. This leisurely pace shall not continue. The parties shall complete all discovery, both fact and expert, by August 12, 2011. The parties shall appear at a conference on August 25, 2011, at 2:30pm, to plan dispositive motions or to set a trial date. These dates will not be enlarged. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/2/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(js) (Entered: 06/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 5/11/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Ann C. Taylor to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Globe Aviation Services Corporation.(sjo) (Entered: 06/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMARY ORDER terminating 56 Motion for Reargument, which has previously been decided. The Clerk shall terminate the motion (Doc. No. 56). (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/6/11) (cd) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 5/2/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to (95 in 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1221 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 97 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH) Amended Notice of Appeal,, filed by 7 World Trade Company, L.P., 4 World Trade Center LLC, 3 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 1 World Trade Center LLC, World Trade Center Properties LLC., (93 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH, 1204 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 91 in 1:08-cv-03719-AKH) Notice of Appeal,, filed by 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P., 4 World Trade Center, L.L.C., 3 World Trade Center L.L.C., 2 World Trade Center, L.L.C., 1 World Trade Center L.L.C., World Trade Center Properties LLC, (99 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH) Notice of Appeal, filed by 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P., 3 World Trade Center L.L.C., 1 World Trade Center L.L.C., World Trade Center Properties LLC., (1303 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) Notice of Appeal, filed by The Port Authority of New York & New Jersey, (98 in 1:08-cv-03719-AKH) Notice of Appeal filed by 4 World Trade Center, L.L.C., 2 World Trade Center, L.L.C., World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., (1312 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) Notice of Appeal, filed by Cedar & Washington Associates, LLC. USCA Case Number 10-2970-cv(L). Ordered, Adjudged and Decreed that the judgment of the District Court is AFFIRMED in accordance with the opinion of this Court. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 05/02/2011. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(nd) (Entered: 05/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL. PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that Douglas M. Pravda hereby withdraws as counsel of record for defendant The Boeing Company in the above-captioned actions. Robert A. Atkins and H. Christopher Boehning of the law firm Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Ganison LLP have entered notices of appearance in this matter and together with Perkins Coie LLP and Richards Kibbe & Orbe LLP, will continue to represent The Boeing Company. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 4/4/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(djc) (Entered: 04/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re: (1352 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) MOTION for Reconsideration and Oral Argument.. Document filed by 2 World Trade Center, L.L.C., 4 World Trade Center, L.L.C., World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 3 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Company, L.P., World Trade Center Properties LLC.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 12/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 12/8/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to 99 Notice of Appeal, filed by 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P., 3 World Trade Center L.L.C., 1 World Trade Center L.L.C., World Trade Center Properties LLC. USCA Case Number 10-3241-cv. Appellees, through counsel, move to dismiss the appeals docketed under 10-3241-cv and 10-3279-cv. Upon due consideration, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Judgments under Rule 54(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure were not properly entered in Appellants underlying actions because Appellants claims have not been finally decided and the district court did not make an express determination that there is no just reason for delay with respect to Appellants claims. See Information Resources, Inc. v. Dun & Bradstreet Corp., 294 F.3d 447, 451 (2d Cir. 2002). To the extent that Appellants have a plausible cognizable interest in challenging the settlement order, they will be able to protect that interest in the remaining eighteen appeals they have filed in this matter. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Order: 12/7/2010. (tp) (Entered: 12/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER DENYING HUNTLEIGH'S MOTIONS TO DISMISS OR STAY ACTIONS. Defendants Huntleigh USA Corp. ("Huntleigh") and its parent company, ICTS International N.V. ("ICTS"), move under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) to dismiss the three remaining lawsuits against them, or in the alternative to stay the suits against them pending the WTCP Plaintiffs' appeal of my approval of the property-damage settlements between the Aviation Defendants and the Property Damage Plaintiffs. The motions are denied. The Clerk shall mark the motions (Doc Nos. 1328 & 1332) terminated. denying (1328) Motion to Dismiss; denying (1332) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:21-mc-00101-AKH. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/1/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH (rjm) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 11/24/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (1332 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) MOTION to Dismiss., (1328 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) MOTION to Dismiss Remaining Claims Against It, or in the Alternative, to Stay Action During Pendency of Settlement Appeal.. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties LLC, 2 World Trade Center, L.L.C., 4 World Trade Center, L.L.C., World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 3 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Company, L.P., 1 World Trade Center L.L.C., 3 World Trade Center L.L.C., 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P., World Trade Center Properties LLC.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Egan, Thomas) (Entered: 11/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR CERTIFICATION OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEALS UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1292(b): The WTCP Plaintiffs move to certify several previous orders for interlocutory appeal under 28 U.S.C. 1292(b). I previously denied this motion in my order of September 30, 2009. I now deny it again. The Clerk shall mark the motion (Doc. No. 1300) terminated. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/26/2010) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(jfe) (Entered: 10/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 10/22/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING PARTIAL RELIEF FROM JOINT STIPULATION FOR ACCELERATED BRIEFING, the WTCP Plaintiffs move for relief from a joint stipulation entered into with the Aviation Defendants under my order of September 21, 2010. The motion is granted to a limited extent. I cannot grant the WTCP Plaintiffs' requested relief. To allow the WTCP Plaintiffs to put off filing their opening brief until after the Aviation Defendants' motion is decided could undermine the speediness I deemed necessary to provide fairness to all those involved with the settlement. The Motions Panel is not obligated to render a decision on the Aviation Defendants' motion to dismiss at any particular time, and it may well refer the matter to the Argument Panel, who will hear oral argument and render a decision in its own time. However, a short enlargement of time is appropriate to avoid prejudice to the WTCP Plaintiffs. I therefore will enlarge the date the WTCP Plaintiffs must file their opening brief from October 29, 2010, to November 2, 2010. All subsequent dates in the stipulation shall be enlarged by two business days. This Order is subject to review and revision by the Second Circuit, including its Staff Counsel. The WTCP Plaintiffs should proceed to brief their entire array of consolidated cases. Should the Second Circuit decide the motion to dismiss in the Aviation Defendants' favor, the WTCP Plaintiffs can inform the Argument Panel that those two appeals are no longer before it. Should the WTCP Plaintiffs prevail, they will have already prepared and filed a complete opening brief. (Brief due by 11/2/2010.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/22/2010) (ae) (Entered: 10/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 10/21/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Thomas A. Egan in Support re: (124 in 1:08-cv-03719-AKH) EMERGENCY MOTION to Set Aside Seeking Relief from Order.. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Egan Declaration, # 2 Exhibit B to Egan Declaration, # 3 Exhibit C to Egan Declaration, # 4 Exhibit D to Egan Declaration)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Egan, Thomas) (Entered: 10/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 10/21/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EMERGENCY MOTION to Set Aside Seeking Relief from Order. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties LLC, 2 World Trade Center, L.L.C., 4 World Trade Center, L.L.C., World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 3 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Company, L.P., 1 World Trade Center L.L.C., 3 World Trade Center L.L.C., 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Egan, Thomas) (Entered: 10/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (116 in 1:08-cv-03719-AKH) MOTION for Certificate of Appealability.. Document filed by 2 World Trade Center, L.L.C., 4 World Trade Center, L.L.C., World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 3 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 1 World Trade Center L.L.C., 3 World Trade Center L.L.C., World Trade Center Properties LLC.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Egan, Thomas) (Entered: 10/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Desmond T. Barry, Jr. in Opposition re: (117 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH, 116 in 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1300 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) MOTION for Certificate of Appealability.. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (117 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH, 116 in 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1300 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) MOTION for Certificate of Appealability.. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 10/4/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Willard Mark Wood on behalf of Massachusetts Port Authority (Wood, Willard) (Entered: 10/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 9/28/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (116 in 1:08-cv-03719-AKH) MOTION for Certificate of Appealability.. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties LLC, 2 World Trade Center, L.L.C., 4 World Trade Center, L.L.C., World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 3 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 1 World Trade Center L.L.C., 3 World Trade Center L.L.C., World Trade Center Properties LLC.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Egan, Thomas) (Entered: 09/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 9/28/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Thomas A. Egan, Esq. in Support re: (116 in 1:08-cv-03719-AKH) MOTION for Certificate of Appealability.. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties LLC, 2 World Trade Center, L.L.C., 4 World Trade Center, L.L.C., World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 3 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 1 World Trade Center L.L.C., 3 World Trade Center L.L.C., World Trade Center Properties LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Egan, Thomas) (Entered: 09/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 9/28/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Certificate of Appealability. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties LLC, 2 World Trade Center, L.L.C., 4 World Trade Center, L.L.C., World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 3 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 1 World Trade Center L.L.C., 3 World Trade Center L.L.C., World Trade Center Properties LLC..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Egan, Thomas) (Entered: 09/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER DENYING UNINSURED LOSS PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR EARLY DISBURSEMENT OF SETTLEMENT FUNDS: At a proceeding held August 25, 2010, the Aviation Defendants agreed to make these early disbursements but only if the WTCP Plaintiffs agreed to drop the Uninsured Loss Plaintiffs from the appeal. The WTCP Plaintiffs have declined to do so. To require the WTCP Plaintiffs to drop a party from their appeal, or to make the Aviation Defendants pay early disbursements without the WTCP Plaintiffs' cooperation, would be inappropriate and without legal basis. I therefore deny the Uninsured Loss Plaintiffs' request for early disbursement of funds, but condition that denial on the following, in the interests of serving the rights of all parties. The parties to the appeal shall enter into a binding accelerated briefing schedule in the Second Circuit. The schedule shall require appellants to perfect their appeal and file an opening brief by the end of October; appellees to file their brief by the end of November; and appellants to file their reply brief within fifteen days thereafter. The parties shall also request the earliest possible argument date. The briefing schedule shall be filed in the Second Circuit within seven days from today, and a copy shall be filed with me at the same time. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/27/2010) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(jfe) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER DENYING MOTION TO INTERVENE: Intervenor-plaintiff TIG Insurance Company ("TIG") moves to intervene in the above-captioned cases under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 24, either as of right or discretion. TIG's motion to intervene is denied. The Clerk shall mark the motion (Doc. No. 1242) terminated. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/27/2010) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(jfe) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER DENYING UNINSURED LOSS PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR EARLY DISBURSEMENT OF SETTLEMENT FUNDS....I therefore deny the Uninsured Loss Plaintiffs' request for early disbursement of funds, subject to the conditions that follow. The parties to the appeal shall enter into a binding accelerated briefing schedule in the Second Circuit, and as further set forth in this document. The briefing schedule shall be filed in the Second Circuit within seven days, and a copy shall be filed with me simultaneously. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/21/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(cd) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE: In view of these various submissions, a status conference shall be held October 20, 2010, at 11:00am to plan for pretrial activities and to set a trial date. Depositions shall be complete by January 30, 2011. The Court shall hold a status conference on February 4, 2011, at 2:15pm to plan expert witness discovery, succeeding proceedings leading to trial, and relevant details concerning the mechanics of trial. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/20/2010) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(jpo) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 100 MOTION to Intervene.. Document filed by TIG Insurance Company. (Gorelick, Michael) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 8/31/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 08/31/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 8/31/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Desmond T. Barry, Jr. in Opposition re: (100 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH) MOTION to Intervene., (1242 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) MOTION to Intervene., (99 in 1:08-cv-03719-AKH) MOTION to Intervene.. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 08/31/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 8/31/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (100 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH) MOTION to Intervene., (1242 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) MOTION to Intervene., (99 in 1:08-cv-03719-AKH) MOTION to Intervene.. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 08/31/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 8/31/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 100 MOTION to Intervene.. Document filed by 1 World Trade Center L.L.C., 3 World Trade Center L.L.C., 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P., World Trade Center Properties LLC.. (Egan, Thomas) (Entered: 08/31/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 8/31/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Richard A. Williamson in Opposition re: 100 MOTION to Intervene.. Document filed by 1 World Trade Center L.L.C., 3 World Trade Center L.L.C., 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P., World Trade Center Properties LLC.. (Egan, Thomas) (Entered: 08/31/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 8/27/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexandra Elizabeth Rigney on behalf of TIG Insurance Company (Rigney, Alexandra) (Entered: 08/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 8/24/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER, 1. The Amended Notice shall include the July 30 Order; 2. This Stipulation may be executed in counterparts by any of the signatories hereto, including by facsimile, each of which shall constitute a duplicate original, and as so executed shall constitute one agreement. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 08/20/2010) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH, 1:08-cv-09146-AKH(ad) (Entered: 08/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 8/19/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Motion for an Order Requiring WTCP to Post an Appeal Bond. Document filed by Industrial Risk Insurers. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(Clifford, Robert) (Entered: 08/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 8/19/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 100 MOTION to Intervene.. Document filed by TIG Insurance Company. (Gorelick, Michael) (Entered: 08/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 8/19/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Charles G. Ehrlich in Support re: 100 MOTION to Intervene.. Document filed by TIG Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 3)(Gorelick, Michael) (Entered: 08/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 8/19/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Michael E. Gorelick in Support re: 100 MOTION to Intervene.. Document filed by TIG Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Gorelick, Michael) (Entered: 08/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 8/19/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Intervene. Document filed by TIG Insurance Company.(Gorelick, Michael) (Entered: 08/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEAL from 96 Clerk's Judgment,,,. Document filed by 1 World Trade Center L.L.C., 3 World Trade Center L.L.C., 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P., World Trade Center Properties LLC.. Filing fee $ 455.00, receipt number E 911618. (nd) (Entered: 08/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Gerald G. Paul re: (1216 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) Order,. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties LLC, 1 World Trade Center L.L.C., 3 World Trade Center L.L.C., 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P., World Trade Center Properties LLC., 2 World Trade Center, L.L.C., 4 World Trade Center, L.L.C., 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 3 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Company, L.P.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 08/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL re: (93 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH, 1204 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 91 in 1:08-cv-03719-AKH) Notice of Appeal, (1206 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 94 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH, 92 in 1:08-cv-03719-AKH) Order, (88 in 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1199 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 90 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH) Memorandum & Opinion. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties LLC., 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 3 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Company, L.P. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(tp) (Entered: 08/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 7/29/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CLERK'S JUDGMENT That for the reasons stated in the Court's Order dated July 23, 2010, that there is no just reason for delay, final judgment is entered as follows: (1) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b) in 21 MC 101 with respect to the settled cases and claims; (2) pursuant to Rule 54(b) in each individual docket number for the cases identified in (1)-(17) above and those cases are closed; and (3) pursuant to Rule 54(b) with respect to all claims asserted against the Aviation Defendants in Aegis Ins. Servs., Inc., et al. v. 7 World Trade Ctr. Co., L.P., et al., 04 Civ. 7272, identified in (18) above; the Court intends that the foregoing shall effectuate a final, immediately appealable judgment with respect to all of the settled cases and claims. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 7/29/10) (Attachments: # 1 notice of right to appeal)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(ml) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CLERK'S JUDGMENT That for the reasons stated in the Court's Opinion and Order dated July 1, 2010, the settling parties' joint motion for Orders approving the Settlement Agreement and Mutual Release of Claims dated February 23, 2010 is granted; the Court orders all amounts paid pursuant to the settlement agreement to be credited against the settling defendants' respective liability ceilings under § 408(a)(1) of the ATSSSA; the Court dismiss each settling plaintiff's claims with prejudice as to all Aviation Defendants; a final judgment, pursuant to Rule 54(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, is entered in each of the settling plaintiff's actions in accordance with the terms of the settlement agreement; and the Court finds that payment by Huntleigh's insurers has exhausted the limits of Huntleigh's liability insurance coverage. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 7/23/10) (Attachments: # 1 notice of right to appeal)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(ml) (Entered: 07/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER CLARIFYING ORDER AND OPINION APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND GRANTING INTERVENOR STATUS that The Clerk shall: Enter final judgment pursuant to FRCP 54(b) with respect to the settled cases and claims; Enter final judgment pursuant to FRCP 54(b) in each individual docket number for the cases identified in (1)-(17) of footnote 1 above and mark those cases as closed; Enter final judgment pursuant to FRCP 54(b) with respect to all claims asserted against the Aviation Defendants in Aegis Ins. Servs., Inc v. 7 World Trade Ctr. Co., L.P., et al, 04-7272,identified in (18) of footnote 1 above. The Court intends that the foregoing shall effectuate a final appealable judgment with respect to all of the settled cases and claims. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/23/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(cd) (Entered: 07/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 7/22/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEAL from (88 in 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1199 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 90 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH) Order and Opinion granting joint motion approving property damage settlements. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties LLC, 1 World Trade Center L.L.C., 3 World Trade Center L.L.C., 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P., 2 World Trade Center, L.L.C., 4 World Trade Center, L.L.C. Filing fee $ 455.00, receipt number E 909448. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(nd) (Entered: 07/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED ORDER AND OPINION RESOLVING INTERVENOR'S MOTION TO UNSEAL DOCUMENTS: For the reasons discussed in this Opinion, the Times' motion is granted in part and denied in part. The aggregate amount of the settlement and its allocation among contributing insurers shall be disclosed to the public. The allocation of settlement proceeds among the settling plaintiffs as well as confidential documents exchanged in the course of damages discovery, settlement negotiations and mediation shall remain under seal. By July 14, 2010, the parties shall submit redacted versions, complying with this Order, of all papers submitted in connection with the motion for approval of the settlement, including the transcript of the May 27,2010 oral argument on the motion. The Clerk shall mark the motion (Doc. No. 1164) as terminated. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/1/2010) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(jpo) (Entered: 07/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CLARIFYING ORDER: This order is being issued to correct a clerical error in the Order and Opinion Resolving Intervenor's Motion to Unseal Documents, dated July 1, 2010. On page 4, fourth full paragraph, line 1, "March" should read "May". An amended opinion correcting the error shall issue forthwith. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/1/2010) (jpo) (Entered: 07/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER AND OPINION GRANTING JOINT MOTION APPROVING PROPERTY DAMAGE SETTLEMENTS. For the reasons discussed in this Opinion, I grant the settling parties' joint motion for Orders approving the Settlement Agreement and Mutual Release of Claims dated February 23, 2010. I find the proposed settlements to be fair, reasonable and consistent with the ATSSSA, I approve them, I order all amounts paid pursuant to the settlement agreement to be credited against the settling defendants' respective liability ceilings under § 408(a)(1) of the ATSSSA, I dismiss each settling plaintiff's claims with prejudice as to all Aviation Defendants, I direct entry of a final judgment, pursuant to Rule 54(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, in each of the settling plaintiff's actions in accordance with the terms of the settlement agreement, and I find that payment by Huntleigh's insurers has exhausted the limits of Huntleigh's liability insurance coverage. The Clerk shall mark the motion (Doc. No.1080) as terminated. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/1/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(rjm) (Entered: 07/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER AND OPINION RESOLVING INTERVENOR'S MOTION TO UNSEAL DOCUMENTS. The Times' motion is granted in part and denied in part. The aggregate amount of the settlement and its allocation among contributing insurers shall be disclosed to the public. The allocation of settlement proceeds among the settling plaintiffs as well as confidential documents exchanged in the course of damages discovery, settlement negotiations and mediation shall remain under seal. By July 14, 2010, the parties shall submit redacted versions, complying with this Order, of all papers submitted in connection with the motion for approval of the settlement, including the transcript of the May 27, 2010 oral argument on the motion. The Clerk shall mark the motion (Doc. No. 1164) as terminated. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/1/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(rjm) (Entered: 07/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 88 Filed: 6/25/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm) (Entered: 06/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 5/6/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING CROSS-MOTION BY THE WTCP PLAINTIFFS AND 7 WORLD TRADE COMPANY, L.P. FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. The Aviation Defendants and their Contributing Insurers have no present intention to authorize the release of funds pursuant to Section 7 of the Settlement Agreement... the WTCP Plaintiffs and 7 World Trade Company, L.P. hereby withdraw their cross-motion for a preliminary injunction without prejudice to their right to renew the motion, including upon receipt of at least fourteen business days' advance electronic notice from the Aviation Defendants and their Contributing Insurers that the Aviation Defendants and their Contributing Insurers intend to authorize the release of any funds pursuant to Section 7 of the Settlement Agreement and as further set forth. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/5/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(rjm) (Entered: 05/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Cathi A. Hession dated 5/3/10 re: I write on behalf of the WTCP Plaintiffs and 7 World Trade Company, L.P. (the "Competing Limited Funds Claimants"). On Friday, April 30, 2010, counsel for the Aviation Defendants and the Settling Plaintiffs (the "Settling Parties") each served a separate, lengthy set of reply papers in further support of the Motion of the Aviation Defendants and Settling Plaintiffs for Orders Approving the Confidential Settlement Agreement and Mutual Release of Claims dated as of February 23, 2010, and in opposition to the Competing Limited Funds Claimants' Cross-Motion for a Preliminary Injunction... with the Court's permission, we would submit only a short sur-reply letter on the Motion to Approve. ENDORSEMENT: Application for a sur-reply is denied, without prejudice to oral renewal at the time of argument. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/4/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(rjm) (Entered: 05/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 4/22/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Notice of Change of Attorney. Document filed by Delta Air Lines, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(Crowley, Michael) (Entered: 04/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 84 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm) (Entered: 04/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMARY ORDER. On April 15, 2010, the parties appeared before me for oral argument on the motion, by way of order to show cause, of the WTCP Plaintiffs, and 7 World Trade Company, L.P. to (1) vacate the February 19, 2010 Order Authorizing Sealing of Settlement and (2) modify the March 30, 2004 Confidentiality Order. For the reasons stated on the record, the motion is premature and is denied without prejudice. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 4/16/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(rjm) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (76 in 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1112 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 79 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH) Order to Show Cause,,,,. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties LLC, 1 World Trade Center LLC, 3 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Company, L.P., 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, World Trade Center Properties LLC., 1 World Trade Center L.L.C., 3 World Trade Center L.L.C., 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P., World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 2 World Trade Center, L.L.C., 4 World Trade Center, L.L.C.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 04/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of Richard A. Williamson in Support re: (1112 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) Order to Show Cause,,,,. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties LLC, 1 World Trade Center LLC, 3 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Company, L.P., 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, World Trade Center Properties LLC., 1 World Trade Center L.L.C., 3 World Trade Center L.L.C., 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P., World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 2 World Trade Center, L.L.C., 4 World Trade Center, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to the Williamson Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to the Williamson Affidavit, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to the Williamson Affidavit, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to the Williamson Affidavit, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 to the Williamson Affidavit, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 to the Williamson Affidavit, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7 to the Williamson Affidavit)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 03/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (1112 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) Order to Show Cause,,,, Seeking to (1) Vacate the February 19, 2010 Order Authorizing Sealing of Settlement and (2) Modify the March 30, 2004 Confidentiality Order. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties LLC, 1 World Trade Center LLC, 3 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Company, L.P., 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, World Trade Center Properties LLC., 1 World Trade Center L.L.C., 3 World Trade Center L.L.C., 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P., World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 2 World Trade Center, L.L.C., 4 World Trade Center, L.L.C.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 03/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Aviation Defendants and the Property Damage Plaintiffs that are parties to the February 23, 2010 settlement agreement (collectively, the "Settling Parties) shall show cause as to why an order should not be entered: (A) vacating the Court's February 19, 2010 Order Authorizing Sealing of Settlement, and (B) modifying the Court's March 30, 2004 Confidentiality Order so as to allow the WTCP Plaintiffs and 7 World Trade Company, L.P. to publicly file their opposition to the motion for an order approving the settlement agreement among the Settling Parties (which is due on April 16, 2010), and (C) granting such other and further relief as the Court deems proper. Show Cause Hearing set for 4/15/2010 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 14D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Show Cause Response due by 4/2/2010. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/26/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(rjm) (Entered: 03/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/19/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Notice of Intention to Oppose Motion for Settlement Approval. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties LLC., 1 World Trade Center L.L.C., 3 World Trade Center L.L.C., 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P.. (Scholz, Andrew) (Entered: 03/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 9/8/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 09/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 9/8/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY To WTCP's Counter-Statement of Material Facts. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Explanation of Delayed Filing)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 09/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 9/8/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (858 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 63 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH, 60 in 1:08-cv-03719-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment on WTCP's Miscellaneous Damages Claims and for Collateral Setoff Against WTCP's Claims Pursuant to CPLR 4545(C). MOTION for Summary Judgment on WTCP's Miscellaneous Damages Claims and for Collateral Setoff Against WTCP's Claims Pursuant to CPLR 4545(C).. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 09/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 9/3/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Desmond T. Barry in Support re: (858 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 63 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH, 60 in 1:08-cv-03719-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment on WTCP's Miscellaneous Damages Claims and for Collateral Setoff Against WTCP's Claims Pursuant to CPLR 4545(C). MOTION for Summary Judgment on WTCP's Miscellaneous Damages Claims and for Collateral Setoff Against WTCP's Claims Pursuant to CPLR 4545(C).. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit LLL, # 2 Exhibit MMM, # 3 Exhibit NNN)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 09/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 9/3/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (858 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 63 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH, 60 in 1:08-cv-03719-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment on WTCP's Miscellaneous Damages Claims and for Collateral Setoff Against WTCP's Claims Pursuant to CPLR 4545(C). MOTION for Summary Judgment on WTCP's Miscellaneous Damages Claims and for Collateral Setoff Against WTCP's Claims Pursuant to CPLR 4545(C).. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Barry, Desmond) Modified on 9/8/2009 (jar). (Entered: 09/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/26/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COUNTER STATEMENT TO 62 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties LLC., 1 World Trade Center L.L.C., 3 World Trade Center L.L.C.. (Hackett, Jean Marie) (Entered: 08/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/25/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Michael L. Levy in Opposition re: 63 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties LLC., 1 World Trade Center L.L.C., 3 World Trade Center L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Errata 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32, # 33 Exhibit 33, # 34 Exhibit 34, # 35 Exhibit 35, # 36 Exhibit 36, # 37 Exhibit 37, # 38 Exhibit 38, # 39 Exhibit 39, # 40 Exhibit 40, # 41 Exhibit 41, # 42 Exhibit 42, # 43 Exhibit 43, # 44 Exhibit 44, # 45 Exhibit 45, # 46 Exhibit 46, # 47 Exhibit 47, # 48 Exhibit 48, # 49 Errata 49, # 50 Exhibit 50, # 51 Exhibit 51, # 52 Exhibit 52, # 53 Errata 53, # 54 Exhibit 54, # 55 Exhibit 55, # 56 Exhibit 56, # 57 Exhibit 57, # 58 Exhibit 58, # 59 Exhibit 59, # 60 Exhibit 60, # 61 Exhibit 61, # 62 Exhibit 62, # 63 Exhibit 63, # 64 Exhibit 64, # 65 Exhibit 65, # 66 Exhibit 66, # 67 Exhibit 67, # 68 Exhibit 68)(Scholz, Andrew) (Entered: 08/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/25/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 63 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties LLC., 1 World Trade Center L.L.C., 3 World Trade Center L.L.C.. (Hackett, Jean Marie) (Entered: 08/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/25/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU (Counter Statement to Rule 56.1) - RESPONSE in Opposition re: 63 MOTION for Summary Judgment. WTCP Plaintiffs' Counter-Statement of Material Facts Pursuant to Local Rule 56.1. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties LLC., 1 World Trade Center L.L.C., 3 World Trade Center L.L.C.. (Hackett, Jean Marie) Modified on 8/26/2009 (jar). (Entered: 08/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/25/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Cathi A. Hession in Opposition re: 63 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties LLC., 1 World Trade Center L.L.C., 3 World Trade Center L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Errata 69, # 2 Errata 70, # 3 Exhibit 71, # 4 Errata 72, # 5 Exhibit 73, # 6 Exhibit 74, # 7 Exhibit 75)(Hackett, Jean Marie) (Entered: 08/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/16/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER,the Parties agree and this Court orders: The WTCP Plaintiffs' opposition papers shall be electronically served and filed by August 24, 2009; The Aviation Defendants' reply papers shall be electronically served and filed by September 3, 2009. Oral Argument will be held Sep. 24, 2009, at 2:15 pm. SO ORDERED( Replies due by 9/3/2009, Responses due by 8/24/2009, Oral Argument set for 9/24/2009 at 02:15 PM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/14/2009) (jmi) Modified on 8/20/2009 (jmi). (Entered: 08/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 7/17/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 07/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/17/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Desmond T. Barry in Support re: (858 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 63 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH, 60 in 1:08-cv-03719-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment on WTCP's Miscellaneous Damages Claims and for Collateral Setoff Against WTCP's Claims Pursuant to CPLR 4545(C). MOTION for Summary Judgment on WTCP's Miscellaneous Damages Claims and for Collateral Setoff Against WTCP's Claims Pursuant to CPLR 4545(C).. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - KKK)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 07/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/17/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (858 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 63 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH, 60 in 1:08-cv-03719-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment on WTCP's Miscellaneous Damages Claims and for Collateral Setoff Against WTCP's Claims Pursuant to CPLR 4545(C). MOTION for Summary Judgment on WTCP's Miscellaneous Damages Claims and for Collateral Setoff Against WTCP's Claims Pursuant to CPLR 4545(C).. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 07/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/17/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Summary Judgment on WTCP's Miscellaneous Damages Claims and for Collateral Setoff Against WTCP's Claims Pursuant to CPLR 4545(C). Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 07/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/17/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 07/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/17/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Motion for Collateral Setoff Against WTCP's Claims Pursuant to N.Y. CPLR 4545(C) and for Summary Judgment on WTCP's Miscellaneous Damages Claims. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 07/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/21/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 56 MOTION for Reargument and Reconsideration, or in the Alternative, for 28 U.S.C. Section 1292(b) Certification.. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties LLC., 1 World Trade Center L.L.C., 3 World Trade Center L.L.C.. (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 05/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 5/19/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 05/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/19/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (53 in 1:08-cv-03719-AKH) MOTION for Reargument and Reconsideration, or in the Alternative, for 28 U.S.C. Section 1292(b) Certification. MOTION for Reargument and Reconsideration, or in the Alternative, for 28 U.S.C. Section 1292(b) Certification.. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 05/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/14/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 56 MOTION for Reargument and Reconsideration, or in the Alternative, for 28 U.S.C. Section 1292(b) Certification.. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties LLC., 1 World Trade Center L.L.C., 3 World Trade Center L.L.C.. (Powell, Alexander) (Entered: 05/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/14/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Reargument and Reconsideration, or in the Alternative, for 28 U.S.C. Section 1292(b) Certification. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties LLC., 1 World Trade Center L.L.C., 3 World Trade Center L.L.C..(Powell, Alexander) (Entered: 05/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/31/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Andrew R. Berman in Opposition re: 14 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties LLC., 1 World Trade Center L.L.C., 3 World Trade Center L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 38, # 2 Exhibit 39, # 3 Exhibit 40, # 4 Exhibit 41, # 5 Exhibit 42 (Part 1 of 2), # 6 Exhibit 42 (Part 2 of 2), # 7 Exhibit 43)(Powell, Alexander) (Entered: 03/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/31/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Kerry D. Vandell in Opposition re: 14 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties LLC., 1 World Trade Center L.L.C., 3 World Trade Center L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 6 (Part 1 of 2), # 2 Exhibit 6 (Part 2 of 2), # 3 Exhibit 7, # 4 Exhibit 8, # 5 Exhibit 9, # 6 Exhibit 10, # 7 Exhibit 11, # 8 Exhibit 12, # 9 Exhibit 13, # 10 Exhibit 14, # 11 Exhibit 15, # 12 Exhibit 16, # 13 Exhibit 17, # 14 Exhibit 18, # 15 Exhibit 19, # 16 Exhibit 20, # 17 Exhibit 21, # 18 Exhibit 22, # 19 Exhibit 23, # 20 Exhibit 24, # 21 Exhibit 25, # 22 Exhibit 26, # 23 Exhibit 27, # 24 Exhibit 28, # 25 Exhibit 29, # 26 Exhibit 30, # 27 Exhibit 31, # 28 Exhibit 32, # 29 Exhibit 33, # 30 Exhibit 34, # 31 Exhibit 35, # 32 Exhibit 36, # 33 Exhibit 37)(Powell, Alexander) (Entered: 03/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/31/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Cathi A. Hession in Opposition re: 14 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties LLC., 1 World Trade Center L.L.C., 3 World Trade Center L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3 (Part 1 of 2), # 4 Exhibit 3 (Part 2 of 2), # 5 Exhibit 4 (Part 1 of 2), # 6 Exhibit 4 (Part 2 of 2), # 7 Exhibit 5)(Powell, Alexander) (Entered: 03/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/31/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 14 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties LLC., 1 World Trade Center L.L.C., 3 World Trade Center L.L.C.. (Powell, Alexander) (Entered: 03/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (63 in 1:04-cv-07299-AKH, 42 in 1:03-cv-06925-AKH, 41 in 1:04-cv-07136-AKH, 43 in 1:03-cv-10203-AKH, 55 in 1:04-cv-05020-AKH, 32 in 1:08-cv-10646-AKH, 12 in 1:04-cv-07914-AKH, 31 in 1:04-cv-07213-AKH, 58 in 1:04-cv-07294-AKH, 83 in 1:02-cv-02987-AKH, 54 in 1:04-cv-05021-AKH, 48 in 1:02-cv-07198-AKH, 65 in 1:04-cv-07231-AKH, 169 in 1:02-cv-07188-AKH, 15 in 1:04-cv-01350-AKH, 351 in 1:04-cv-07272-AKH, 69 in 1:02-cv-07260-AKH, 54 in 1:04-cv-05023-AKH, 38 in 1:02-cv-10052-AKH, 118 in 1:03-cv-06800-AKH, 55 in 1:04-cv-07240-AKH, 67 in 1:04-cv-07225-AKH, 91 in 1:02-cv-07154-AKH, 48 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH, 64 in 1:04-cv-07291-AKH, 58 in 1:04-cv-07244-AKH, 48 in 1:03-cv-06940-AKH, 719 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 60 in 1:04-cv-07238-AKH, 56 in 1:04-cv-07298-AKH, 13 in 1:04-cv-06788-AKH, 75 in 1:04-cv-07234-AKH, 55 in 1:04-cv-05022-AKH, 101 in 1:02-cv-07145-AKH, 56 in 1:04-cv-07246-AKH, 70 in 1:04-cv-07199-AKH, 86 in 1:03-cv-00131-AKH, 54 in 1:04-cv-05025-AKH, 56 in 1:04-cv-06848-AKH, 54 in 1:04-cv-05024-AKH, 9 in 1:08-cv-03701-AKH, 53 in 1:04-cv-04577-AKH, 12 in 1:08-cv-03700-AKH, 37 in 1:04-cv-07318-AKH, 15 in 1:04-cv-06789-AKH, 55 in 1:04-cv-07241-AKH, 24 in 1:07-cv-07968-AKH, 83 in 1:03-cv-07040-AKH, 12 in 1:07-cv-07969-AKH, 64 in 1:04-cv-07248-AKH, 81 in 1:03-cv-06811-AKH, 45 in 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 13 in 1:03-cv-09965-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by 1 World Trade Center LLC, 3 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Company, L.P., 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(Egan, Thomas) Modified on 2/18/2009 (jar). (Entered: 02/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - AFFIDAVIT of Cathi A. Hession in Support re: (41 in 1:04-cv-07136-AKH, 43 in 1:03-cv-10203-AKH, 55 in 1:04-cv-05020-AKH, 32 in 1:08-cv-10646-AKH, 31 in 1:04-cv-07213-AKH, 54 in 1:04-cv-05021-AKH, 48 in 1:02-cv-07198-AKH, 65 in 1:04-cv-07231-AKH, 169 in 1:02-cv-07188-AKH, 69 in 1:02-cv-07260-AKH, 67 in 1:04-cv-07225-AKH, 48 in 1:03-cv-06940-AKH, 13 in 1:04-cv-06788-AKH, 101 in 1:02-cv-07145-AKH, 70 in 1:04-cv-07199-AKH, 54 in 1:04-cv-05025-AKH, 86 in 1:03-cv-00131-AKH, 54 in 1:04-cv-05024-AKH, 9 in 1:08-cv-03701-AKH, 37 in 1:04-cv-07318-AKH, 55 in 1:04-cv-07241-AKH, 24 in 1:07-cv-07968-AKH, 64 in 1:04-cv-07248-AKH, 45 in 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 13 in 1:03-cv-09965-AKH, 63 in 1:04-cv-07299-AKH, 42 in 1:03-cv-06925-AKH, 12 in 1:04-cv-07914-AKH, 58 in 1:04-cv-07294-AKH, 83 in 1:02-cv-02987-AKH, 15 in 1:04-cv-01350-AKH, 351 in 1:04-cv-07272-AKH, 38 in 1:02-cv-10052-AKH, 54 in 1:04-cv-05023-AKH, 118 in 1:03-cv-06800-AKH, 55 in 1:04-cv-07240-AKH, 91 in 1:02-cv-07154-AKH, 48 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH, 64 in 1:04-cv-07291-AKH, 58 in 1:04-cv-07244-AKH, 719 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 60 in 1:04-cv-07238-AKH, 56 in 1:04-cv-07298-AKH, 75 in 1:04-cv-07234-AKH, 55 in 1:04-cv-05022-AKH, 56 in 1:04-cv-07246-AKH, 56 in 1:04-cv-06848-AKH, 53 in 1:04-cv-04577-AKH, 12 in 1:08-cv-03700-AKH, 15 in 1:04-cv-06789-AKH, 83 in 1:03-cv-07040-AKH, 12 in 1:07-cv-07969-AKH, 81 in 1:03-cv-06811-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by 1 World Trade Center LLC, 3 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Company, L.P., 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Hession Affidavit part 1 0f 2, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Hession Affidavit part 2 of 2, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Hession Affidavit, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Hession Affidavit, # 5 Exhibit 4 to Hession Affidavit part 1 of 4, # 6 Exhibit 4 to Hession Affidavit part 2 of 4, # 7 Exhibit 4 to Hession Affidavit part 3 of 4, # 8 Exhibit 4 to Hession Affidavit part 4 of 4, # 9 Exhibit 5 to Hession Affidavit, # 10 Exhibit 6 to Hession Affidavit, # 11 Exhibit 7 to Hession Affidavit, # 12 Exhibit 8 to Hession Affidavit, # 13 Exhibit 9 to Hession Affidavit, # 14 Exhibit 10 to Hession Affidavit, # 15 Exhibit 11 to Hession Affidavit, # 16 Exhibit 12 to Hession Affidavit part 1 of 2, # 17 Exhibit 12 to Hession Affidavit part 2 of 2, # 18 Exhibit 13 to Hession Affidavit, # 19 Exhibit 14 to Hession Affidavit, # 20 Exhibit 15 to Hession Affidavit, # 21 Exhibit 16 to Hession Affidavit, # 22 Exhibit 17 to Hession Affidavit, # 23 Exhibit 18 to Hession Affidavit, # 24 Exhibit 19 to Hession Affidavit, # 25 Exhibit 20 to Hession Affidavit, # 26 Exhibit 21 to Hession Affidavit, # 27 Exhibit 22 to Hession Affidavit, # 28 Exhibit 23 to Hession Affidavit, # 29 Exhibit 24 to Hession Affidavit, # 30 Exhibit 25 to Hession Affidavit)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(Egan, Thomas) Modified on 2/18/2009 (jar). (Entered: 02/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by 1 World Trade Center LLC, 3 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Company, L.P., 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(Egan, Thomas) Modified on 2/18/2009 (jar). (Entered: 02/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing All Subrogation Claims. Document filed by 1 World Trade Center LLC, 3 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Company, L.P., 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC. Responses due by 4/15/2009Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(Egan, Thomas) Modified on 2/18/2009 (jar). (Entered: 02/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/6/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Protective Order Precluding the Deposition of James E. Goodwin, United's Former Chairman and CEO. Document filed by United Air Lines, Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(Redmond, Loretta) (Entered: 11/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/23/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Document filed by American Airlines, Inc., AMR Corporation. (Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 09/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/23/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 14 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by American Airlines, Inc., AMR Corporation. (Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 09/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/23/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Richard A. Williamson in Opposition re: (9 in 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 503 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 14 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties LLC, 1 World Trade Center LLC, 3 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exh. 1 to Williamson Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Exh. 2 to Williamson Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Exh. 3 to Williamson Declaration, # 4 Exhibit Exh. 4, Part 1, to Williamson Declaration, # 5 Exhibit Exh. 4, Part 2, to Williamson Declaration, # 6 Exhibit Exh. 5 to Williamson Declaration, # 7 Exhibit Exh. 6 to Williamson Declaration)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Kanter, Gregg) (Entered: 09/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/23/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (9 in 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 503 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 14 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties LLC, 1 World Trade Center LLC, 3 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Kanter, Gregg) (Entered: 09/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/18/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, ( Brief due by 9/23/2008.), Set Deadlines/Hearing as to (503 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 9 in 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 14 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing All Claims by World Trade Center Properties For the Destruction of WTC 1, 2, 4 & 5. :( Motion Hearing set for 9/24/2008 at 02:15 PM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/17/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(rjm) (Entered: 09/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to WTCP's Counter-Statement of Material Facts. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 09/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Desmond T. Barry in Support re: (9 in 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 14 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH, 503 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Y, # 2 Exhibit Z, # 3 Exhibit AA, # 4 Exhibit BB, # 5 Exhibit CC, # 6 Exhibit DD, # 7 Exhibit EE, # 8 Exhibit FF, # 9 Exhibit GG, # 10 Exhibit HH)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 09/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 34 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: 8/20/2008 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMO ENDORSEMENT on MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER; The discovery complained of will be regulated at the conclusion of argument in the Aviation Defendant's motion for summary judgment. The motion for a protective Order, therefore is denied, without prejudice to renewal after such regulation. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/20/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(djc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (9 in 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 503 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 14 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 09/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 33 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: 8/18/2008 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (26 in 1:08-cv-03719-AKH) MOTION to Strike Document No. (505). MOTION to Strike Document No. (505). MOTION to Strike Document No. (505).. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties LLC, 1 World Trade Center LLC, 3 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, World Trade Center Properties LLC., 1 World Trade Center L.L.C., 3 World Trade Center L.L.C., World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 2 World Trade Center, L.L.C., 4 World Trade Center, L.L.C.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Kanter, Gregg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Jason T. Cohen in Support re: 36 MOTION for Protective Order.. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties LLC., 1 World Trade Center L.L.C., 3 World Trade Center L.L.C.. (Powell, Alexander) (Entered: 09/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 32 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: 8/18/2008 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Cohen in Support re: (26 in 1:08-cv-03719-AKH) MOTION to Strike Document No. (505). MOTION to Strike Document No. (505). MOTION to Strike Document No. (505).. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties LLC, 1 World Trade Center LLC, 3 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, World Trade Center Properties LLC., 1 World Trade Center L.L.C., 3 World Trade Center L.L.C., World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 2 World Trade Center, L.L.C., 4 World Trade Center, L.L.C.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Kanter, Gregg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 36 MOTION for Protective Order.. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties LLC., 1 World Trade Center L.L.C., 3 World Trade Center L.L.C.. (Powell, Alexander) (Entered: 09/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 31 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: 8/18/2008 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Strike Document No. (505) Exhibits to Barry Declaration and the Gokhale Declaration. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties LLC, 1 World Trade Center LLC, 3 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, World Trade Center Properties LLC., 1 World Trade Center L.L.C., 3 World Trade Center L.L.C., World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 2 World Trade Center, L.L.C., 4 World Trade Center, L.L.C.. Responses due by 9/2/2008Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Kanter, Gregg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Protective Order. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties LLC., 1 World Trade Center L.L.C., 3 World Trade Center L.L.C..(Powell, Alexander) (Entered: 09/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 30 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: 8/18/2008 Counter Statement to Rule 56.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COUNTER STATEMENT TO (13 in 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 18 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH) Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties LLC, 1 World Trade Center LLC, 3 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, World Trade Center Properties LLC., 1 World Trade Center L.L.C., 3 World Trade Center L.L.C., World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 2 World Trade Center, L.L.C., 4 World Trade Center, L.L.C.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Kanter, Gregg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/11/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Protective Order. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties LLC., 1 World Trade Center L.L.C., 3 World Trade Center L.L.C. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law, # 2 Declaration)(Powell, Alexander) Modified on 9/12/2008 (db). (Entered: 09/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 29 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: 8/18/2008 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (9 in 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 14 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties LLC, 1 World Trade Center LLC, 3 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, World Trade Center Properties LLC., 1 World Trade Center L.L.C., 3 World Trade Center L.L.C., World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 2 World Trade Center, L.L.C., 4 World Trade Center, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # (1) Supplement Part 2 of 2 of Memorandum)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Kanter, Gregg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 28 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: 8/18/2008 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Harris in Opposition re: (9 in 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 14 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties LLC, 1 World Trade Center LLC, 3 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, World Trade Center Properties LLC., 1 World Trade Center L.L.C., 3 World Trade Center L.L.C., World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 2 World Trade Center, L.L.C., 4 World Trade Center, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 31, # (2) Exhibit 32)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Kanter, Gregg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 27 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: 8/18/2008 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Vandell in Opposition re: (9 in 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 14 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties LLC, 1 World Trade Center LLC, 3 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, World Trade Center Properties LLC., 1 World Trade Center L.L.C., 3 World Trade Center L.L.C., World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 2 World Trade Center, L.L.C., 4 World Trade Center, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 29, # (2) Exhibit 30)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Kanter, Gregg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 26 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: 8/18/2008 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Gottlieb in Opposition re: (9 in 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 14 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties LLC, 1 World Trade Center LLC, 3 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, World Trade Center Properties LLC., 1 World Trade Center L.L.C., 3 World Trade Center L.L.C., World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 2 World Trade Center, L.L.C., 4 World Trade Center, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 26, # (2) Exhibit 27, # (3) Exhibit 28)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Kanter, Gregg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 25 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: 8/18/2008 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Garvin in Opposition re: (9 in 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 14 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties LLC, 1 World Trade Center LLC, 3 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, World Trade Center Properties LLC., 1 World Trade Center L.L.C., 3 World Trade Center L.L.C., World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 2 World Trade Center, L.L.C., 4 World Trade Center, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 19, # (2) Exhibit 20, # (3) Exhibit 21, # (4) Exhibit 22, # (5) Exhibit 23, # (6) Exhibit 24, # (7) Exhibit 25 Part 1 of 3, # (8) Exhibit 25 2 of 3, # (9) Exhibit 25 3 of 3)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Kanter, Gregg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 24 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: 8/18/2008 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Williamson in Opposition re: (9 in 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 14 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties LLC, 1 World Trade Center LLC, 3 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, World Trade Center Properties LLC., 1 World Trade Center L.L.C., 3 World Trade Center L.L.C., World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 2 World Trade Center, L.L.C., 4 World Trade Center, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Kanter, Gregg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 23 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: 8/18/2008 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Levy in Opposition re: (9 in 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 14 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties LLC, 1 World Trade Center LLC, 3 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, World Trade Center Properties LLC., 1 World Trade Center L.L.C., 3 World Trade Center L.L.C., World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 2 World Trade Center, L.L.C., 4 World Trade Center, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 5, # (2) Exhibit 6, # (3) Exhibit 7, # (4) Exhibit 8, # (5) Exhibit 9, # (6) Exhibit 10, # (7) Exhibit 11, # (8) Exhibit 12, # (9) Exhibit 13, # (10) Exhibit 14, # (11) Exhibit 15, # (12) Exhibit 16, # (13) Exhibit 17, # (14) Exhibit 18)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Kanter, Gregg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 22 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... that any and all claims asserted and/or assertable by Plaintiff(s) The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey, WTC Retail LLC and the Port Authority Trans-Hudson Corporation contained in the Complaint(08cv3701 and dated 4/16/08) against Defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc. with regard to United Airlines Flight 175 in the captioned lawsuit shall be dismissed by the Court without prejudice... and without costs to either party as against the other. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/28/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(rjm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 21 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... that any and all claims asserted and/or assertable by Plaintiff(s) World Trade Center Properties LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC and 4 World Trade Center LLC against Defendant(s) Delta Air Lines, Inc. and Delta Express, Inc. with regard to United Airlines Flight 175 shall be dismissed by the Court without prejudice... and without costs to either party as against the other... and as further set forth. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/18/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(rjm) Modified on 7/21/2008 (rjm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 20 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: 6/25/2008 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION OF DESMOND T. BARRY, JR. and attached EXHIBITS A through I (filed in hard copy format pursuant to Doc. No. 502 in 21mc101). Original Document in 21mc101. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(rjm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 19 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008 Affidavit of Service Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Barry, Desmond)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 18 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008 Rule 56.1 Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Barry, Desmond)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 17 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Rajiv Gokhale in Support re: (9 in 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 503 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 14 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-1, # (2) Exhibit A-2, # (3) Exhibit A-3, # (4) Exhibit B-1, # (5) Exhibit B-2, # (6) Exhibit B-3)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Barry, Desmond)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 16 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Desmond T. Barry in Support re: (9 in 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 14 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH, 503 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I, # (10) Exhibit J, # (11) Exhibit K, # (12) Exhibit L, # (13) Exhibit M, # (14) Exhibit N, # (15) Exhibit O, # (16) Exhibit P, # (17) Exhibit Q, # (18) Exhibit R, # (19) Exhibit S, # (20) Exhibit T, # (21) Exhibit U, # (22) Exhibit V, # (23) Exhibit W, # (24) Exhibit X)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Barry, Desmond)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 15 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (9 in 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 503 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 14 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by AMEC, PLC, American Airlines, Inc., AMR Corporation. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Barry, Desmond)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 14 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing All Claims by World Trade Center Properties For the Destruction of WTC 1, 2, 4 & 5. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Barry, Desmond)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 13 Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: 6/10/2008 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Midway Airlines Corporation.(Gallagher, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 12 Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: 6/10/2008 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Delta Airlines, Inc..(Gallagher, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 11 Filed: 5/21/2008, Entered: 5/21/2008 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Service)(Curcio, Benjamin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 10 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: 5/13/2008 Affidavit of Service Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Document filed by US Airways Group, Inc., US Airways, Inc.. (Guilfoyle, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 9 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: 5/13/2008 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by US Airways, Inc., US Airways Group, Inc..(Guilfoyle, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 8 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: 5/13/2008 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Colgan Air, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Service)(Moryan, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 7 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: 5/12/2008 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by American Airlines, Inc., AMR Corporation.(Barry, Desmond)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 6 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: 5/12/2008 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by United Airlines, Inc., UAL Corporation.(Redmond, Loretta)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 5 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: 5/12/2008 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by The Boeing Company.(Lent, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 4 Filed: 5/1/2008, Entered: 5/1/2008 Certificate of Service Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Complaint served on American Airlines, Inc., AMR Corporation, United Airlines, Inc., UAL Corporation, Massachusetts Port Authority, The Boeing Company, Delta Air Lines, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc., Colgan Air, Inc., US Airways, Inc., US Airways Group, Inc., Midway Airlines Corporation, Huntleigh USA Corporation, ICTS International, N.V., Globe Aviation Services Corporation, Burns International Security Services Corporation, Burns International Services Corporation, Pinkerton's Inc., Securitas AB on 04/23/2008. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties LLC., 1 World Trade Center L.L.C., 3 World Trade Center L.L.C., 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P.. (Powell, Alexander)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: 4/30/2008 Notice of Case Assignment/ReassignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (jeh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: 4/30/2008 Case Consolidation - Member
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Create association to 1:21-mc-00101-AKH. (jeh) Modified on 4/30/2008 (jeh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: 4/30/2008 Case Designation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz is so designated. (jeh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: 4/30/2008 Case Accepted as Related
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:21-mc-00101-AKH. Notice of Assignment to follow. (jeh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2 Filed: 4/17/2008, Entered: 4/21/2008 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties LLC., 1 World Trade Center L.L.C., 3 World Trade Center L.L.C., 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P..(mme) (mbe).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/17/2008, Entered: 4/21/2008 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against The Boeing Company, Delta Airlines, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc., Colgan Air, Inc., US Airways Group, Inc., Midway Airlines Corporation, Huntleigh USA Corporation, ICTS International, N.V., Globe Aviation Services Corporation, Burns International Security Services Corporation, Burn International Services Corporation, Pinkerton's Inc., Securitas A.B., American Airlines, Inc., AMR Corporation, United Airlines, Inc., UAL Corporation, Massachusetts Port Authority. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 648597)Document filed by World Trade Center Properties LLC., 1 World Trade Center L.L.C., 3 World Trade Center L.L.C., 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P..(mme) (mbe).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/17/2008, Entered: 4/21/2008 Case Referred as Possibly Related/Similar
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CASE REFERRED TO Judge Hellerstein as possibly related to 21-101. (mme)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 4/17/2008, Entered: 4/21/2008 Case Designated ECF.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Case Designated ECF. (mme)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 4/17/2008, Entered: 4/21/2008 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Boeing Company, Delta Airlines, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc., Colgan Air, Inc., US Airways Group, Inc., Midway Airlines Corporation, Huntleigh USA Corporation, ICTS International, N.V., Globe Aviation Services Corporation, Burns International Security Services Corporation, Burn International Services Corporation, Pinkerton's Inc., Securitas A.B., American Airlines, Inc., AMR Corporation, United Airlines, Inc., UAL Corporation, Massachusetts Port Authority. (mme)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 439 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?