Conservatorship of Britney Jean Spears v. Britney J Spears
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:08-cv-01021-PSG-RC
District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 15, 2021 at 8:23 PM DT (2.1 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Conservatorship of Britney Jean Spears, Plaintiff
v.
Spears, Britney Spears, Britney, Defendant
Officially listed as "Britney J Spears"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jon Jay Eardley +1 562 947 2006 +1 562 947 2006 jjeardley3@gmail.com
No Logo James P. Spears, Miscellaneous

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey D Wexler +1 213 488 7129 +1 213 608 1946 jeffrey.wexler@pillsburylaw.com
  Entries (45) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 46 Filed: 3/6/2009, Entered: 3/10/2009 Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding heldCourt Filing
MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER REQUEST FOR LEGAL ADVICE held before Magistrate Judge Oswald Parada: In light of the foregoing authorities, the Court denies plaintiffs motion.(am)
    LREF
    Legal Document 45 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: 3/24/2008 Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding heldCourt Filing
    MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER Striking Papers Filed by Jon Eardley held before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: The Court hereby orders stricken the following documents filed by Jon Eardley: Docket No: 36, 37, 38, 39, 40. As previously stated by this Courts order, Jon Eardley has no authority to act onbehalf of Britney Jean Spears. Further filings by Mr. Eardley in this matter that purport to be on behalf of Britney Jean Spears will warrant sanctions. IT IS SO ORDERED. (es)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/4/2008, Entered: 3/7/2008 Notice of Document Discrepancies - GrantingCourt Filing
      NOTICE OF DOCUMENT DISCREPANCIES AND ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez ORDERING Opposition to Motion to Remand; Declaration of Jon Eardley submitted by Defendant Britney J Spears received on 2/22/2008 to be filed and processed; filed date to be the date the document was stamped Received but not Filed with the Clerk. (vdr)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank  Transmittal of Documents
        TRANSMITTAL of documents - mailed certified copy of Corrected Remand Order with civil docket sheet to the Los Angeles Superior Court, Central District of California. (bm)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/27/2008, Entered: 2/27/2008 Transmittal of Documents
          LETTER OF TRANSMITTAL-REMAND TO SUPERIOR COURT CV 103(ab) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/29/2008 (ab, ).
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Sealed Legal Document 40 Filed: 2/26/2008, Entered: 3/5/2008 Declaration
            SEALED DOCUMENT DECLARATION of "B" filed by Defendant Britney J Spears. (lra) Modified on 3/26/2008 (lra, ). (Main Document 40 replaced on 10/8/2015) (cio).
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Sealed Legal Document 39 Filed: 2/26/2008, Entered: 3/5/2008 Declaration
              SEALED DOCUMENT DECLARATION of "C" filed by Defendant Britney J Spears. (lra) Modified on 3/26/2008 (lra, ). (Main Document 39 replaced on 10/8/2015) (cio).
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Sealed Legal Document 38 Filed: 2/26/2008, Entered: 3/5/2008 Declaration
                SEALED DOCUMENT DECLARATION of JON EARDLEY filed by Defendant Britney J Spears. (lra) Modified on 3/26/2008 (lra, ). (Main Document 38 replaced on 10/8/2015) (cio).
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Sealed Legal Document 37 Filed: 2/26/2008, Entered: 3/5/2008 (TERMED) Application to Seal
                  SEALED DOCUMENT APPLICATION to Seal Notice Of Removal and Declarations of Declarants B and C [36] filed by DEFENDANT Britney J Spears. (lra) Modified on 3/26/2008 (lra, ). (Main Document 37 replaced on 10/8/2015) (cio).
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document 35 Filed: 2/26/2008, Entered: 3/3/2008 Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding heldCourt Filing
                    MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: ***CORRECTED*** Order on the Conservators Motion to Remand [33]. (Attachments: # (1)) (bm) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/3/2008 (jp, ).
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/26/2008, Entered: 2/26/2008 Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding heldCourt Filing
                      MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER ON THE CONSERVATOR'S MOTION TO REMAND before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez : the Court finds this motin appropriate for decision without oral argument; MOTION to Remand Case to Probate Department of Los Angeles Superior Court[5] is GRANTED; the Court ORDERS case to remanded to Superior Court State of California, County of Los Angeles, Case number BP108870, Probate Court; the Court finds tht it is inappropriate to award attorney's fees in this case. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (ab) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/27/2008 (ab, ). Additional attachment(s) added on 2/29/2008 (ab, ).
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/26/2008, Entered: 2/26/2008 Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
                        PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Temporary Conservator of the Person and Temporary Co-Conservator of the Estate James P. Spears, re Response in Support of Motion, [30], Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related)[31] served on February 25, 2008. (Wexler, Jeffrey)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: 2/25/2008 Declaration (Motion related)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: 2/25/2008 Response in Support of Motion
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document 42 Filed: 2/22/2008, Entered: 3/7/2008 response in opposition to motion
                              OPPOSITION to MOTION to Remand Case [5]; Declaration of Jon Eardley filed by Defendant Britney J Spears. (vdr)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/22/2008, Entered: 2/22/2008 Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
                                PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Temporary Conservator of the Person and Temporary Co-Conservatee of the Estate James P. Spears, re Order,, [28] Proof of Service of Order on Osama Lutfi served on February 22, 2008. (Wexler, Jeffrey)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: 2/21/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez GRANTNG EX PARTE APPLICATION (1) to Continue Hearing on Civil Harassment TRO Against Osama ("Sam") Lutfi (2) to Extend Term of TRO Through New Hearing Date and (3) to Extend Deadline for serving TRO Papers [18]. The hearing date on the TRO against Mr. Lutfi is extended until 1:30 pm on March 17, 2008. The TRO is extended until the new hearing date. The deadline for serving Mr. Lutfi with copies of the TRO papers is extended until five days before the new hearing date. (ir)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: 2/21/2008 Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
                                    PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Temporary Conservator of the Person and Temporary Co-Conservator of the Estate James P. Spears, Proof of Personal Service of Civil Harassment Temporary Restraining Order and related papers on Osama ("Sam") Lutfi served on February 21, 2008. (Wexler, Jeffrey)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: 2/21/2008 Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
                                      PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Temporary Conservator of the Person and Temporary Co-Conservator of the Estate James P. Spears, re Joinder (Motion Related), Joinder (Motion Related), Joinder (Motion Related)[21], Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related)[20], Response (non-motion), Response (non-motion)[22], EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Ex Parte Application: (1) to Continue Hearing on Civil Harassment TRO Against Osama ("Sam") Lutfi; (2) to Extend Term of TRO Through New Hearing Date; and (3) to Extend Deadline for EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Ex Parte Application: (1) to Continue Hearing on Civil Harassment TRO Against Osama ("Sam") Lutfi; (2) to Extend Term of TRO Through New Hearing Date; and (3) to Extend Deadline for[18], Memorandum in Support of Motion,, [19] served on February 20, 2008. (Wexler, Jeffrey)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: 2/21/2008 memorandum in support of motion
                                        MEMORANDUM in Support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Ex Parte Application: (1) to Continue Hearing on Civil Harassment TRO Against Osama ("Sam") Lutfi; (2) to Extend Term of TRO Through New Hearing Date; and (3) to Extend Deadline for EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Ex Parte Application: (1) to Continue Hearing on Civil Harassment TRO Against Osama ("Sam") Lutfi; (2) to Extend Term of TRO Through New Hearing Date; and (3) to Extend Deadline for[18] Supplemental Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Miscellaneous James P. Spears. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Jeffrey D. Wexler)(Wexler, Jeffrey)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: 2/21/2008 Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
                                          PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Temporary Conservator of the Person and Temporary Co-Conservator of the Estate James P. Spears, re Notice of Related Case(s)[4], Exhibit to Motion,,,, [9], Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related)[14], Exhibit to Motion, [17], Memorandum in Support of Motion, [12], Certificate of Interested Parties[3], Memorandum in Support of Motion[6], Declaration (Motion related)[8], Declaration (Motion related)[7], Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related)[13], Joinder (Motion Related), Joinder (Motion Related)[10], MOTION to Remand Case to Probate Department of Los Angeles Superior Court[5], EX PARTE APPLICATION to Expedite Briefing and Hearing Schedule on Motion to Remand [Docket 5] EX PARTE APPLICATION to Expedite Briefing and Hearing Schedule on Motion to Remand [Docket 5][11] served on February 19-20, 2008. (Wexler, Jeffrey)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: 2/20/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                            ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION to Expedite Briefing and Hearing Schedule on Motion to Remand [Docket 5] [11]. Any opposition to the motion to remand must be electronically filed by 2/22/08 with courtesy copies delivered to chambers by 12:00 noon on 2/25/08. Any reply papers in support of the motion to remand must be electronically filed by 2/25/08 with courtesy copies delivered to chambers by 12:00 noon on 2/26/08. The motion to remand will be submitted on the papers. (ir)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document 22 Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: 2/20/2008 response
                                              RESPONSE filed by Miscellaneous James P. Spearsto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,,, [16] Response of James P. Spears, Temporary Conservator of the Person and Temporary Co-Conservator of the Estate, to Order to Show Cause re Remand to State Court [Docket 16] (Wexler, Jeffrey)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: 2/20/2008 Joinder (Motion Related)
                                                JOINDER in EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Ex Parte Application: (1) to Continue Hearing on Civil Harassment TRO Against Osama ("Sam") Lutfi; (2) to Extend Term of TRO Through New Hearing Date; and (3) to Extend Deadline for EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Ex Parte Application: (1) to Continue Hearing on Civil Harassment TRO Against Osama ("Sam") Lutfi; (2) to Extend Term of TRO Through New Hearing Date; and (3) to Extend Deadline for[18] Notice of Filing of Joinder by Samuel D. Ingham III, Court-Appointed Attorney for Britney Jean Spears, Temporary Conservatee filed by Miscellaneous James P. Spears. (Attachments: # (1))(Wexler, Jeffrey)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: 2/20/2008 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                  DECLARATION of Jeffrey D. Wexler in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Ex Parte Application: (1) to Continue Hearing on Civil Harassment TRO Against Osama ("Sam") Lutfi; (2) to Extend Term of TRO Through New Hearing Date; and (3) to Extend Deadline for EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Ex Parte Application: (1) to Continue Hearing on Civil Harassment TRO Against Osama ("Sam") Lutfi; (2) to Extend Term of TRO Through New Hearing Date; and (3) to Extend Deadline for[18] filed by Miscellaneous James P. Spears. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B)(Wexler, Jeffrey)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: 2/20/2008 memorandum in support of motion
                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Ex Parte Application: (1) to Continue Hearing on Civil Harassment TRO Against Osama ("Sam") Lutfi; (2) to Extend Term of TRO Through New Hearing Date; and (3) to Extend Deadline for EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Ex Parte Application: (1) to Continue Hearing on Civil Harassment TRO Against Osama ("Sam") Lutfi; (2) to Extend Term of TRO Through New Hearing Date; and (3) to Extend Deadline for[18] filed by Miscellaneous James P. Spears. (Wexler, Jeffrey)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: 2/20/2008, Terminated: 2/21/2008 (TERMED) Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order
                                                      EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Ex Parte Application: (1) to Continue Hearing on Civil Harassment TRO Against Osama ("Sam") Lutfi; (2) to Extend Term of TRO Through New Hearing Date; and (3) to Extend Deadline for Serving TRO Papers filed by Temporary Conservator of the Person and Temporary Co-Conservator of the Estate James P. Spears. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Wexler, Jeffrey)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: 2/20/2008 Exhibit to Motion
                                                        EXHIBIT Notice of Lodging of February 14, 2008 Probate Court Transcript in Connection with Motion to Remand to MOTION to Remand Case to Probate Department of Los Angeles Superior Court[5] filed by Miscellaneous James P. Spears. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (2.14.08 Probate Court Transcript))(Wexler, Jeffrey)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: 2/20/2008 Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: 2/20/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. All counsel are hereby ordered to familiarize themselves with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, particularly Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 16, 26, and the Local Rules of the Central District of California, this Court's Order for Jury Trial, and this Court's Order for Court Trial. See document for details. (es)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: 2/19/2008 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                              DECLARATION of Jeffrey D. Wexler in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION to Expedite Briefing and Hearing Schedule on Motion to Remand [Docket 5] EX PARTE APPLICATION to Expedite Briefing and Hearing Schedule on Motion to Remand [Docket 5][11] filed by Miscellaneous James P. Spears. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Wexler, Jeffrey)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: 2/19/2008 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                DECLARATION of Andrew M. Wallet in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION to Expedite Briefing and Hearing Schedule on Motion to Remand [Docket 5] EX PARTE APPLICATION to Expedite Briefing and Hearing Schedule on Motion to Remand [Docket 5][11] filed by Miscellaneous James P. Spears. (Wexler, Jeffrey)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: 2/19/2008 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support of EX PARTE APPLICATION to Expedite Briefing and Hearing Schedule on Motion to Remand [Docket 5] EX PARTE APPLICATION to Expedite Briefing and Hearing Schedule on Motion to Remand [Docket 5][11] filed by Miscellaneous James P. Spears. (Wexler, Jeffrey)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: 2/19/2008, Terminated: 2/20/2008 (TERMED)Ex Parte Application to Expedite
                                                                    EX PARTE APPLICATION to Expedite Briefing and Hearing Schedule on Motion to Remand [Docket 5] filed by Temporary Conservator of the Person and Temporary Co-Conservator of the Estate James P. Spears. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Wexler, Jeffrey)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: 2/19/2008 Joinder (Motion Related)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 9 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: 2/19/2008 Exhibit to Motion
                                                                        EXHIBIT to MOTION to Remand Case to Probate Department of Los Angeles Superior Court[5] Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Remand [Probate Court's Publicly Filed Documents as of Time of Removal] filed by Miscellaneous James P. Spears. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D# (5) Exhibit E# (6) Exhibit F# (7) Exhibit G# (8) Exhibit H# (9) Exhibit I# (10) Exhibit J# (11) Exhibit K# (12) Exhibit L# (13) Exhibit M# (14) Exhibit N# (15) Exhibit O# (16) Exhibit P# (17) Exhibit Q# (18) Exhibit R# (19) Exhibit S# (20) Exhibit T# (21) Exhibit U# (22) Exhibit V# (23) Exhibit W# (24) Exhibit X# (25) Exhibit Y# (26) Exhibit Z# (27) Exhibit AA# (28) Exhibit BB# (29) Exhibit CC# (30) Exhibit DD# (31) Exhibit EE# (32) Exhibit FF# (33) Exhibit GG# (34) Exhibit HH# (35) Exhibit II# (36) Exhibit JJ# (37) Exhibit KK# (38) Exhibit LL# (39) Exhibit MM# (40) Exhibit NN# (41) Exhibit OO# (42) Exhibit PP# (43) Exhibit QQ# (44) Exhibit RR# (45) Exhibit SS# (46) Exhibit TT# (47) Exhibit UU# (48) Exhibit VV# (49) Exhibit WW# (50) Exhibit XX# (51) Exhibit YY# (52) Exhibit ZZ# (53) Exhibit AAA# (54) Exhibit BBB# (55) Exhibit CCC)(Wexler, Jeffrey)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: 2/19/2008 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                          DECLARATION of Jeffrey D. Wexler in support of MOTION to Remand Case to Probate Department of Los Angeles Superior Court[5] filed by Miscellaneous James P. Spears. (Wexler, Jeffrey)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: 2/19/2008 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                            DECLARATION of Andrew M. Wallet in support of MOTION to Remand Case to Probate Department of Los Angeles Superior Court[5] filed by Miscellaneous James P. Spears. (Wexler, Jeffrey)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: 2/19/2008 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION to Remand Case to Probate Department of Los Angeles Superior Court[5] filed by Miscellaneous James P. Spears. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Wexler, Jeffrey)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: 2/19/2008, Terminated: 2/26/2008 Motion to Remand Case to State CourtCourt Filing
                                                                                NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Probate Department of Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Temporary Conservator of the Person and Temporary Co-Conservator of the Estate James P. Spears.Motion set for hearing on 3/17/2008 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Wexler, Jeffrey)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: 2/19/2008 Notice of Related Cases
                                                                                  NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Temporary Conservator of the Person and Temporary Co-Conservator of the Estate James P. Spears. Related Case(s): None (Wexler, Jeffrey)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: 2/19/2008 Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
                                                                                    Certification as to Interested Parties of James P. Spears, Temporary Conservator of the Person and Temporary Co-Conservator of the Estate [Local Rule 7.1-1] of Interested Parties (Wexler, Jeffrey)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: 2/19/2008 Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
                                                                                      CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Britney J Spears. (et) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/1/2008 (ds, ).
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: 2/19/2008 notice of removalCourt Filing
                                                                                        NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of CA for the County of Los Angeles, case number BP 108870 with NO CONFORMED copy of summons and complaint. Case assigned to Judge Philip S. Gutierrez, Discovery to Magistrate Judge Rosalyn M. Chapman. (Filing fee $ 350 PAID. ), filed by Defendant Britney J Spears. [FILED ON DEMAND STATE COMPLAINT UNDER SEAL, NO COMPLAINT ATTACHED FROM STATE COURT.] (et) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/1/2008 (ds, ).
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Blank  (TERMED)Fax Number
                                                                                          FAX number for Attorney Jon J Eardley is 516-876-6906. (et)
                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                            This case has been viewed 1 time.

                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                            Space
                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                             
                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                            Need Password Help?