BLUE ORIGIN FEDERATION, LLC v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:21-cv-01695-RAH
District Judge Richard A. Hertling, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 24, 2021 at 3:17 PM DT (22.2 hours ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo BLUE ORIGIN FEDERATION, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Barnes & Thornburg, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott E. Pickens +1 202 371 6349 +1 202 289 1330 scott.pickens@btlaw.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"
Office COFC
Filed 8/13/2021
Jury Demand None
Demand $3000000
Nature of Suit 140 - Contract - Injunction (Post Award)
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags ECF,PROTO
  Entries (59) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 9/24/2021, Entered: None Redacted Document
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 9/24/2021, Entered: None Redacted Document
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/24/2021, Entered: None Transcripts
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/24/2021, Entered: None Notice Of Filing Of Certified Transcript
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/23/2021, Entered: None Redacted Document
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/23/2021, Entered: None Redacted Document
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/22/2021, Entered: None Redacted Document
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/22/2021, Entered: None Redacted Document
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/22/2021, Entered: None Redacted Document
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/21/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/21/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Complete the Administrative Record
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/20/2021, Entered: None Order
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/20/2021, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/16/2021, Entered: None Response to Motion
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/16/2021, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/13/2021, Entered: None Setting Oral Argument/Hearing on Motion
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/13/2021, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/13/2021, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/11/2021, Entered: None Complete the Administrative Record
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/11/2021, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/9/2021, Entered: None Setting Oral Argument/Hearing on Motion
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/9/2021, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document 30 Filed: 8/27/2021, Entered: 8/27/2021 Order on Motion to Amend ScheduleCourt Filing
                                              ORDER Granting [28] Motion to Amend Schedule. Administrative Record due by 9/3/2021. Motion regarding Administrative Record due by 9/10/2021. Responses due by 9/16/2021. Cross-Motions due by 10/1/2021. Replies due by 10/13/2021. Oral Argument set for 10/21/2021 09:30 AM before Judge Richard A. Hertling. Signed by Judge Richard A. Hertling. (agg) Service on parties made.
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/8/2021, Entered: None Unseal Document
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document 29 Filed: 8/27/2021, Entered: 8/27/2021 Application for Access to Protected Material
                                                  APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Dr. Alan Wilhite, filed by BLUE ORIGIN FEDERATION, LLC.Response due by 8/30/2021.(Pickens, Scott)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/7/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document 28 Filed: 8/27/2021, Entered: 8/27/2021, Terminated: 8/27/2021 Motion to Amend Schedule
                                                      MOTION to Amend Schedule re: [27] Order on Motion for Leave to File,, Order on Motion to Amend Schedule,, filed by BLUE ORIGIN FEDERATION, LLC.Response due by 9/10/2021.(Pickens, Scott)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/4/2021, Entered: None extension of time
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document 27 Filed: 8/27/2021, Entered: 8/27/2021 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER Granting [26] Motion for Leave to File Administrative Record and Motion to Amend Schedule. The defendant may file the administrative record on a series of DVDs by 9/3/2021. The remainder of the current scheduling order remains in force. Signed by Judge Richard A. Hertling. (agg) Service on parties made.
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 26 Filed: 8/27/2021, Entered: 8/27/2021, Terminated: 8/27/2021 motion for leave to file
                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File the Administrative Record via DVD , Unopposed MOTION to Amend Schedule re: [23] Scheduling Order,, filed by USA.Response due by 9/10/2021.(Schiavetti, Anthony)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/26/2021, Entered: 8/26/2021 Application for Access to Protected Material
                                                              APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Erin Steele, filed by BLUE ORIGIN FEDERATION, LLC.Response due by 8/30/2021.(Pickens, Scott)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/26/2021, Entered: 8/26/2021 Application for Access to Protected Material
                                                                APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by David Frazee, filed by BLUE ORIGIN FEDERATION, LLC.Response due by 8/30/2021.(Pickens, Scott)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 23 Filed: 8/19/2021, Entered: 8/19/2021 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER:Administrative Record due by 8/27/2021. Motion regarding Administrative Record due by 9/3/2021. Responses due by 9/9/2021. Cross-Motions due by 9/24/2021. Replies due by 10/6/2021. Voluntary stay of performance shall expire on 11/1/2021. Oral Argument set for 10/14/2021 at 9:30 AM before Judge Richard A. Hertling. Signed by Judge Richard A. Hertling. (agg) Service on parties made.
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 22 Filed: 8/19/2021, Entered: 8/19/2021 Joint Status Report
                                                                    JOINT STATUS REPORT , filed by USA. (Schiavetti, Anthony)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 21 Filed: 8/17/2021, Entered: 8/17/2021 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      STATUS REPORT ORDER. The parties are directed to file a Joint Status Report reflecting a proposed schedule for further proceedings by 8/19/2021 at 2:00pm EDT. Signed by Judge Richard A. Hertling. (naw) Service on parties made.
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/17/2021, Entered: 8/17/2021, Terminated: 8/20/2021 Application for Access to Protected Material
                                                                        APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Aime JH Joo, filed by SPACE EXPLORATION TECHNOLOGIES CORP..Response due by 8/19/2021.(Daniels, Kara)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/17/2021, Entered: 8/17/2021, Terminated: 8/20/2021 Application for Access to Protected Material
                                                                          APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Thomas A. Pettit, filed by SPACE EXPLORATION TECHNOLOGIES CORP..Response due by 8/19/2021.(Daniels, Kara)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/17/2021, Entered: 8/17/2021, Terminated: 8/20/2021 Application for Access to Protected Material
                                                                            APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Nathaniel Castellano, filed by SPACE EXPLORATION TECHNOLOGIES CORP..Response due by 8/19/2021.(Daniels, Kara)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/17/2021, Entered: 8/17/2021, Terminated: 8/20/2021 Application for Access to Protected Material
                                                                              APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Mark D. Colley, filed by SPACE EXPLORATION TECHNOLOGIES CORP..Response due by 8/19/2021.(Daniels, Kara)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/17/2021, Entered: 8/17/2021, Terminated: 8/20/2021 Application for Access to Protected Material
                                                                                APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Kara L. Daniels, filed by SPACE EXPLORATION TECHNOLOGIES CORP..Response due by 8/19/2021.(Daniels, Kara)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                  Minute Entry - Was the proceeding sealed to the public? Yes. Proceeding held in Washington, D.C. 8/17/2021 before Judge Richard A. Hertling: Status Conference. [Total number of days of proceeding: 1] Approximate duration of proceeding: 30 minutes. Official record of proceeding taken via electronic digital recording (EDR). To order a certified transcript or an audio recording of the proceeding, click HERE.(kac)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/16/2021, Entered: 8/16/2021, Terminated: 8/19/2021 Application for Access to Protected Material
                                                                                    APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by MATTHEW MICHAELS, filed by BLUE ORIGIN FEDERATION, LLC.Response due by 8/18/2021.(Pickens, Scott)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/16/2021, Entered: 8/16/2021, Terminated: 8/19/2021 Application for Access to Protected Material
                                                                                      APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by SCOTT GODES, filed by BLUE ORIGIN FEDERATION, LLC.Response due by 8/18/2021.(Pickens, Scott)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/16/2021, Entered: 8/16/2021, Terminated: 8/19/2021 Application for Access to Protected Material
                                                                                        APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by SCOTT PICKENS, filed by BLUE ORIGIN FEDERATION, LLC.Response due by 8/18/2021.(Pickens, Scott)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/16/2021, Entered: 8/16/2021 Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1
                                                                                          Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement , filed by SPACE EXPLORATION TECHNOLOGIES CORP.. (Daniels, Kara)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/16/2021, Entered: 8/16/2021, Terminated: 8/16/2021 Motion to intervene
                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION to Intervene , filed by SPACE EXPLORATION TECHNOLOGIES CORP..Response due by 8/30/2021. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Daniels, Kara)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/16/2021, Entered: 8/16/2021 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                              STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER:Status Conference set for 8/17/2021 03:00 PM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Judge Richard A. Hertling. Signed by Judge Richard A. Hertling. (agg) Service on parties made.
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/16/2021, Entered: 8/16/2021 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Francis Schiavetti for USA . (Schiavetti, Anthony)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 8 Filed: 8/16/2021, Entered: 8/16/2021 protective orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                  PROTECTIVE ORDER (related to Order on Motion for Protective Order ). Signed by Judge Richard A. Hertling. (agg) Service on parties made.
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 7 Filed: 8/16/2021, Entered: 8/16/2021 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                                                                                                    NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (ead)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document 6 Filed: 8/16/2021, Entered: 8/16/2021 Notice of Random AssignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                      Notice of Random Assignment Pursuant to Rule 40.1(a) to Judge Richard A. Hertling. (ead)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank  Order on motion to intervene
                                                                                                        ORDER Granting [11] Motion to Intervene filed by SPACE EXPLORATION TECHNOLOGIES. Issued by Judge Richard A. Hertling. (agg) Service on parties made.
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank  Order on Motion for protective order
                                                                                                          ORDER Granting [5] Motion for Protective Order. Issued by Judge Richard A. Hertling. (agg) Service on parties made.
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank  Order on Motion for protective order
                                                                                                            ORDER Granting [5] Motion for Protective Order. Issued by Judge Richard A. Hertling. (agg) Service on parties made.
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 5 Filed: 8/13/2021, Entered: 8/16/2021 Motion for protective order
                                                                                                              MOTION for Protective Order, filed by BLUE ORIGIN FEDERATION, LLC.Response due by 8/27/2021.(ead)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 4 Filed: 8/13/2021, Entered: 8/16/2021 Proposed Redacted Document
                                                                                                                **SEALED**PROPOSED REDACTED DOCUMENT, filed by BLUE ORIGIN FEDERATION, LLC. Redaction of [1] Complaint, FILED UNDER SEAL. (ead)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 3 Filed: 8/13/2021, Entered: 8/16/2021 motion to seal document
                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Complaint Under Seal, filed by BLUE ORIGIN FEDERATION, LLC.Response due by 8/27/2021.(ead)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 2 Filed: 8/13/2021, Entered: 8/16/2021 Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1
                                                                                                                    Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, filed by BLUE ORIGIN FEDERATION, LLC. (ead)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/13/2021, Entered: 8/16/2021 Complaint
                                                                                                                      **SEALED**COMPLAINT against USA (NAS) (Filing fee $402, Receipt number AUSFCC-7259853) (Copy Served Electronically on Department of Justice), filed by BLUE ORIGIN FEDERATION, LLC.Answer due by 10/12/2021. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Civil Cover Sheet)(ead)
                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 293 times.

                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?