Assad v. Pershing Square Tontine Holdings, Ltd. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:21-cv-06907

Tags
Last Updated September 23, 2021 at 6:42 PM DT (1.8 days ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo George Assad, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark Lebovitch +1 212 554 1400 +1 212 554 1444 markl@blbglaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Susman Godfrey, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cory Spencer Buland +1 212 336 8330 +1 212 336 8340 cbuland@susmangodfrey.com
Space Beatrice Catherine Franklin +1 212 336 8330 +1 212 336 8340 bfranklin@susmangodfrey.com
Space Shawn J. Rabin +1 212 471 8347 +1 212 336 8340 srabin@susmangodfrey.com
Space Stephen L Shackelford, Jr. sshackelford@susmangodfrey.com
v.
No Logo Jacqueline D. Reses, Defendant
No Logo Joseph S. Steinberg, Defendant
No Logo Lisa Gersh, Defendant
No Logo Michael Ovitz, Defendant
No Logo Pershing Square Holdings, Ltd., Defendant
No Logo Pershing Square International Ltd., Defendant
Officer/Director, Wendy's International, Inc.
No Logo Pershing Square TH Sponsor, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Pershing Square L P, Defendant
Office Foley Square
Filed 8/17/2021
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 160 - Contract: Stockholders' Suits
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County Albany
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (37) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/23/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/17/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/16/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/7/2021, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/3/2021, Entered: None Letter
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/3/2021, Entered: None Proposed Stipulation and Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/1/2021, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/27/2021, Entered: None Letter
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/27/2021, Entered: None Letter
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/26/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/26/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/26/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/25/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/25/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/25/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/23/2021, Entered: None Order
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/23/2021, Entered: None Order
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/23/2021, Entered: None Order
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/20/2021, Entered: None Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/20/2021, Entered: None Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/20/2021, Entered: None Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/18/2021, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/18/2021, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/18/2021, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/18/2021, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/18/2021, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/17/2021, Entered: 8/17/2021 Notice of appearance
                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Beatrice Catherine Franklin on behalf of George Assad..(Franklin, Beatrice)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/17/2021, Entered: 8/17/2021 Notice of appearance
                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Cory Spencer Buland on behalf of George Assad..(Buland, Cory)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/17/2021, Entered: 8/17/2021 Notice of appearance
                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Shackelford, Jr on behalf of George Assad..(Shackelford, Stephen)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/17/2021, Entered: 8/17/2021 Notice of appearance
                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Shawn J. Rabin on behalf of George Assad..(Rabin, Shawn)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/17/2021, Entered: 8/17/2021 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                              REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Pershing Square, L.P., re: [1] Complaint,. Document filed by George Assad..(Lebovitch, Mark)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/17/2021, Entered: 8/17/2021 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Pershing Square International, Ltd., re: [1] Complaint,. Document filed by George Assad..(Lebovitch, Mark)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/17/2021, Entered: 8/17/2021 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                  REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Pershing Square Holdings, LTD., re: [1] Complaint,. Document filed by George Assad..(Lebovitch, Mark)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/17/2021, Entered: 8/17/2021 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                    REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Pershing Square Tontine Holdings, Ltd., Lisa Gersh, Michael Ovitz, Jacqueline D. Reses, Joseph S. Steinberg, re: [1] Complaint,. Document filed by George Assad..(Lebovitch, Mark)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/17/2021, Entered: 8/17/2021 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                      REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Pershing Square TH Sponsor, LLC, re: [1] Complaint,. Document filed by George Assad..(Lebovitch, Mark)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/17/2021, Entered: 8/17/2021 Civil Cover Sheet
                                                                        CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lebovitch, Mark)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/17/2021, Entered: 8/17/2021 Complaint
                                                                          COMPLAINT against Lisa Gersh, Michael Ovitz, Pershing Square Holdings, Ltd., Pershing Square International, Ltd., Pershing Square TH Sponsor, LLC, Pershing Square Tontine Holdings, Ltd., Pershing Square, L.P., Jacqueline D. Reses, Joseph S. Steinberg. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24940935)Document filed by George Assad..(Lebovitch, Mark)
                                                                            LREF

                                                                            Statistics

                                                                            This case has been viewed 134 times.

                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                            Space
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                             
                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                            Need Password Help?