George v. Griffin et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Southern District Court, Case No. 0:21-cv-61719-KMM
District Judge K Michael Moore, presiding

Tags
Last Updated September 23, 2021 at 3:12 PM DT (2 days ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Donnahue George, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Citadel Connect Dark Pool, Defendant
Citadel LLC Citadel LLC, Defendant
Officially listed as "Citadel LLC Hedge Fund"
Citadel Securities LLC Citadel Securities LLC, Defendant
Officially listed as "Citadel Securities Market Maker"
No Logo Depository Trust And Clearing Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "DTCC"
Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc. Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "FNRA"
No Logo Griffin, Kenneth C., Defendant
Officially listed as "Ken Griffin"
Officer/Director, Parallel Technologies Inc.
Officer/Director, Metals Usa, Inc.
E*TRADE Group, Inc. Officer/Director, E*TRADE Group, Inc.
Citadel Equity Fund Ltd. Officer/Director, Citadel Equity Fund Ltd.
Citadel Credit Trading Ltd. Officer/Director, Citadel Credit Trading Ltd.
Officer/Director, Paxson Communications Corp
Officer/Director, Tlc Laser Center Inc
Citadel LP Officer/Director, Citadel LP
Officer/Director, Glb Partners L P
Officer/Director, Idaho General Mines Inc
Citadel Wellington LLC Officer/Director, Citadel Wellington LLC
Officer/Director, Cig Media LLC
Citadel AC Investments Ltd. Officer/Director, Citadel AC Investments Ltd.
Officer/Director, Huntsman Corp
Citadel Holdings I LP Officer/Director, Citadel Holdings I LP
Citadel Advisors LLC Officer/Director, Citadel Advisors LLC
Citadel Holdings II LP Officer/Director, Citadel Holdings II LP
Officer/Director, Wingate Capital Ltd.
Citadel Advisors Holdings LP Officer/Director, Citadel Advisors Holdings LP
Officer/Director, Calc III Lp
Officer/Director, Surveyor Capital Ltd.
Officer/Director, Phh Corp
Officer/Director, Seritage Growth Properties
Robinhood Financial, LLC Robinhood Financial, LLC, Defendant
United States Securities and Exchange Commission United States Securities and Exchange Commission, Defendant
Officially listed as "Securities Exchange Commission"
No Logo Webull Financial LLC, Defendant
Office Ft Lauderdale
Filed 8/17/2021
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 160 - Contract: Stockholders' Suits
Cause Section 18 U.S.C. § 1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition
County Broward (Office - Ft Lauderdale)
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags LSS,REF_DISCOV
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/23/2021, Entered: None Waiver of Service Executed
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/17/2021, Entered: None Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/17/2021, Entered: None Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/7/2021, Entered: None Summons Issued
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/7/2021, Entered: None Hearing
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/7/2021, Entered: None Certificate of Service
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/7/2021, Entered: None Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/22/2021, Entered: None Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 6 Filed: 8/18/2021, Entered: 8/18/2021 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
                    LREF
                    Blank 5 Filed: 8/18/2021, Entered: 8/18/2021 Pretrial OrderCourt Filing
                    PAPERLESS PRETRIAL ORDER. This order has been entered upon the filing of the complaint. Plaintiff's counsel is hereby ORDERED to forward to all defendants, upon receipt of a responsive pleading, a copy of this Order. It is further ORDERED that S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1 shall apply to this case and the parties shall hold a scheduling conference no later than twenty (20) days after the filing of the first responsive pleading by the last responding defendant, or within sixty (60) days after the filing of the complaint, whichever occurs first. However, if all defendants have not been served by the expiration of this deadline, Plaintiff shall move for an enlargement of time to hold the scheduling conference, not to exceed 90 days from the filing of the Complaint. Within ten (10) days of the scheduling conference, counsel shall file a joint scheduling report. Failure of counsel to file a joint scheduling report within the deadlines set forth above may result in dismissal, default, and the imposition of other sanctions including attorney's fees and costs. The parties should note that the time period for filing a joint scheduling report is not tolled by the filing of any other pleading, such as an amended complaint or Rule 12 motion. The scheduling conference may be held via telephone. At the conference, the parties shall comply with the following agenda that the Court adopts from S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1: (1) Documents (S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1.B.1 and 2) - The parties shall determine the procedure for exchanging a copy of, or a description by category and location of, all documents and other evidence that is reasonably available and that a party expects to offer or may offer if the need arises. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(B). (a) Documents include computations of the nature and extent of any category of damages claimed by the disclosing party unless the computations are privileged or otherwise protected from disclosure. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(C). (b) Documents include insurance agreements which may be at issue with the satisfaction of the judgment. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(D). (2) List of Witnesses - The parties shall exchange the name, address and telephone number of each individual known to have knowledge of the facts supporting the material allegations of the pleading filed by the party. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(A). The parties have a continuing obligation to disclose this information. (3) Discussions and Deadlines (S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1.B.2) - The parties shall discuss the nature and basis of their claims and defenses and the possibilities for a prompt settlement or resolution of the case. Failure to comply with this Order or to exchange the information listed above may result in sanctions and/or the exclusion of documents or witnesses at the time of trial. S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1.I. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2016-70 of the Southern District of Florida and consistent with the Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit's Local Rules and Internal Operating Procedures, within three days of the conclusion of a trial or other proceeding, parties must file via CM/ECF electronic versions of documentary exhibits admitted into evidence, including photographs of non-documentary physical exhibits. The Parties are directed to comply with each of the requirements set forth in Administrative Order 2016-70 unless directed otherwise by the Court.Telephonic appearances are not permitted for any purpose. Upon reaching a settlement in this matter the parties are instructed to notify the Court by telephone and to file a Notice of Settlement within twenty-four (24) hours. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 8/18/2021. (thn)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/17/2021, Entered: 8/17/2021 Summons issued
                      Summons Issued as to Citadel Connect Dark Pool, Citadel LLC Hedge Fund, Citadel Securities Market Maker, DTCC, FNRA, Ken Griffin, Robinhood Financial LLC, Securities Exchange Commission, Webull Financial LLC. (ebz) (Main Document 4 replaced on 8/17/2021) (ebz).
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/17/2021, Entered: 8/17/2021 Clerks Receipt
                        Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 8/17/2021 in the amount of $ 402.00, receipt number FLS000014595 (ebz)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Blank 2 Filed: 8/17/2021, Entered: 8/17/2021 Clerk's Notice of Judge AssignmentCourt Filing
                          Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge K. Michael Moore. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/17/2021, Entered: 8/17/2021 Complaint
                            COMPLAINT against Citadel Connect Dark Pool, Citadel LLC Hedge Fund, Citadel Securities Market Maker, DTCC, FNRA, Ken Griffin, Robinhood Financial LLC, Securities Exchange Commission, Webull Financial LLC. Filing fees $ 402.00 Receipt#: FLS000014595, filed by Donnahue George. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(ebz)
                              LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 118 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?