Atwa v. Quarantillo
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-03732-RJS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Sami Atwa, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by BRETZ & COVEN, LLP.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space EILEEN C. BRETZ +1 212 267 2555 ebretz@bretzlaw.com
v.
No Logo Andrea Quarantillo, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kirti Vaidya Reddy +1 212 637 2751 +1 212 637 2786 kirti.reddy@usdoj.gov
Office Foley Square
Filed 4/18/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause No cause code entered
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County NewYork
Terminated 8/4/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 7 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: 8/4/2008 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL; that this action is dismissed with prejudice and without costs or attorney's fees to any party. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 8/1/08) (pl)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: 7/31/2008 Note to Attorney to Re-File Document - Non-ECF Doc
    ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - NON-ECF DOCUMENT ERROR. Note to Attorney Eileen Collins Bretz to E-MAIL pdf copy to judgments@nysd.uscourts.gov Document No. [6] Stipulation and Order of Settlement and Dismissal. This document is not filed via ECF. (KA)
      LREF
      Legal Document 6 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: 7/29/2008 Settlement Agreement
      FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING FOR NON-ECF DOCUMENT - SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT (STIPULATION AND ORDER). Document filed by Sami Atwa.(Collins Bretz, Eileen) Modified on 7/31/2008 (KA).
        LREF
        Legal Document 5 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: 7/11/2008 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Kirti Vaidya Reddy dated 7/9/08 re: Counsel requests a nunc pro tunc thirty-day extension of time, from 6/23/08 to 7/23/08 to respond to the complaint in the above captioned action. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 7/10/08) (tro)
          LREF
          Legal Document 4 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: 6/3/2008 Notice of Appearance/
          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kirti Vaidya Reddy on behalf of Andrea Quarantillo (Reddy, Kirti)
            LREF
            Legal Document 3 Filed: 4/24/2008, Entered: 4/24/2008 Certificate of Service Complaints
            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Sami Atwa. (Collins Bretz, Eileen)
              LREF
              Legal Document 2 Filed: 4/24/2008, Entered: 4/24/2008 Application for Writ
              APPLICATION for Writ of Complaint as to Andrea Quarantillo. Document filed by Sami Atwa., SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Andrea Quarantillo served on 4/24/2008, answer due 6/23/2008. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Sami Atwa. (Collins Bretz, Eileen)
                LREF
                Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/18/2008, Entered: 4/22/2008 Complaint
                COMPLAINT against Andrea Quarantillo. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 648639)Document filed by Sami Atwa.(tve)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 4/18/2008, Entered: 4/22/2008 Case Designated ECF.
                  Case Designated ECF. (tve)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 4/18/2008, Entered: 4/22/2008 Case Designation
                    Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz is so designated. (tve)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 4/18/2008, Entered: 4/22/2008 Summons Issued
                      SUMMONS ISSUED as to Andrea Quarantillo. (tve)
                        LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 82 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?