USA v. Jun et al
Criminal Case Washington Western District Court, Case No. 2:21-cr-00135-RAJ

Tags
Last Updated September 15, 2021 at 3:27 PM DT (6 days ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JUSTIN W. ARNOLD +1 973 645 2785 justin.arnold@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Sung Mo Jun, Defendant

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Sung Mo Jun (1)
Office Seattle
Filed 8/17/2021
County King
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78J.F
Offense Level 4
Securities Fraud - Insider Trading - 1578j(b) and 78ff, and 17240.10b5 and 10b5-1
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/15/2021, Entered: None Acceptance of Plea of Guilty
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/14/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Travel
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/10/2021, Entered: None Receipt for Passport
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/10/2021, Entered: None Travel
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/30/2021, Entered: None Appearance Bond
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/30/2021, Entered: None Report and Recommendation re Plea of Guilty
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/30/2021, Entered: None Plea Agreement
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/30/2021, Entered: None Consent to Rule 11 Plea
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/30/2021, Entered: None Waiver of Indictment
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/19/2021, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/18/2021, Entered: 8/18/2021 Consent to Rule 11 Plea
                      CONSENT TO RULE 11 PLEA in a felony case as to Junwoo Chon. (TF)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank 7 Filed: 8/18/2021, Entered: 8/18/2021 Initial Appearance and PleaCourt Filing
                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Michelle L. Peterson- CRD: tfarrell; AUSA: Justin Armold; Def Cnsl: Christopher Black; PTS: Erin O'Donnell; Court Reporter: Digital Recording; Time of Hearing: 1:00pm; Courtroom: 12B; INITIAL APPEARANCE AND PLEA as to Junwoo Chon held on 8/18/2021. Defendant present at liberty. Defendant placed under oath and advised of rights/charges/penalties; Defendant executes Consent to Rule 11 Plea in a felony case before a U.S. Magistrate Judge; Defendant waives indictment by the Grand Jury; Defendant age = born 1971; Education = Bachelor's Degree; Court reviews the plea agreement; Pleas guilty to count(s) 1; Court finds the Defendant is competent to enter a guilty plea; Court signs the Report and Recommendation and Counsel have fourteen days to file objections; Court orders the preparation of a Presentence Report. Court conducts colloquy regarding custody status. Gov't does not seek detention. For reasons stated on the record, defendant placed on bond with special conditions. Sentencing set for 12/3/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Richard A. Jones. (TF)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/18/2021, Entered: 8/18/2021 Waiver of Indictment
                          WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Junwoo Chon. (TF)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/18/2021, Entered: 8/18/2021 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                            NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Christopher R Black appearing for Junwoo Chon (Black, Christopher)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank 4 Filed: 8/18/2021, Entered: 8/18/2021 Notice of hearing
                              NOTICE OF HEARING as to Joon Jun. (cc: USPO, PTS, USMO) Initial Appearance, Change of Plea, and Detention Hearing set for 8/30/2021 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 12B before Hon. Paula L McCandlis. (AQ)
                                LREF
                                Blank 3 Filed: 8/18/2021, Entered: 8/18/2021 Notice of hearing
                                NOTICE OF HEARING as to Sung Mo Jun. (cc: USPO, PTS, USMO) Initial Appearance, Change of Plea, and Detention Hearing set for 8/30/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 12B before Hon. Paula L McCandlis. (AQ)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 2 Filed: 8/18/2021, Entered: 8/18/2021 Notice of hearing
                                  NOTICE OF HEARING as to Junwoo Chon. (cc: USPO, PTS, USMO) Initial Appearance, Change of Plea, and Detention Hearing set for 8/18/2021 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 12B before Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (JES)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/17/2021, Entered: 8/18/2021 information - felony
                                    FELONY INFORMATION as to Sung Mo Jun (1) count(s) 1, Junwoo Chon (2) count(s) 1, Joon Jun (3) count(s) 2, Ayden Lee (4) count(s) 3. (JES)
                                      LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 54 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?