Securities and Exchange Commission v. Jun et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Washington Western District Court, Case No. 2:21-cv-01108

Tags
Last Updated September 2, 2021 at 8:43 PM DT (2.7 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States Securities and Exchange Commission United States Securities and Exchange Commission, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Securities and Exchange Commission"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Securities and Exchange Commission

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Dennis Buchholz +1 415 705 2500 +1 415 705 2501 buchholzs@sec.gov
Space Rahul Kaustubh Kolhatkar +1 415 391 0600 +1 415 395 8095 kolhatkarr@sec.gov
v.
No Logo Ayden Lee, Defendant
No Logo Jae Hyeon Bae, Defendant
No Logo Joon Jun, Defendant
No Logo Junwoo Chon, Defendant
No Logo Sung Mo Jun, Defendant
Office Seattle
Filed 8/18/2021
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Plaintiff
Disposition
County King
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/2/2021, Entered: None Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/2/2021, Entered: None Judgment
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/2/2021, Entered: None Judgment
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/2/2021, Entered: None Judgment
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/2/2021, Entered: None Judgment
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/26/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/25/2021, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/23/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/19/2021, Entered: None Case/IFP Deficiency Letter
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/19/2021, Entered: None Summons Issued
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/19/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/18/2021, Entered: 8/18/2021 ~Motion for Judgment
                        MOTION for Judgment as to Jae Hyeon Bae, filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Consent of Jae Hyeon Bae) Noting Date 8/31/2021, (Kolhatkar, Rahul)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/18/2021, Entered: 8/18/2021 ~Motion for Judgment
                          MOTION for Judgment as to Ayden Lee, filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Consent of Ayden Lee) Noting Date 8/31/2021, (Kolhatkar, Rahul)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/18/2021, Entered: 8/18/2021 ~Motion for Judgment
                            MOTION for Judgment as to Junwoo Chon, filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Consent of Junwoo Chon) Noting Date 8/31/2021, (Kolhatkar, Rahul)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/18/2021, Entered: 8/18/2021 ~Motion for Judgment
                              MOTION for Judgment as to Joon Jun, filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Consent of Joon Jun) Noting Date 8/31/2021, (Kolhatkar, Rahul)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/18/2021, Entered: 8/18/2021 ~Motion for Judgment
                                MOTION for Judgment as to Sung Mo Jun, filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Consent of Defendant Sung Mo Jun) Noting Date 8/31/2021, (Kolhatkar, Rahul)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/18/2021, Entered: 8/18/2021 Complaint
                                  COMPLAINT against All Defendants Attorney Rahul Kolhatkar added to party Securities and Exchange Commission(pty:pla), filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Summons, # (3) Summons, # (4) Summons, # (5) Summons, # (6) Summons)(Kolhatkar, Rahul) (No Fee Required)
                                    LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 70 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?