USA v. ELDABBAGH
Criminal Case District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:21-cr-00523-TNM

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 1, 2021 at 11:23 AM DT (3.4 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo USA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Leslie A. Goemaat +1 202 803 1608 leslie.goemaat@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo ELIAS ELDABBAGH, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Defender Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Walker Bos +1 202 208 7500 +1 202 208 7515 david_bos@fd.org

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

ELIAS ELDABBAGH (1)
Office Washington, DC
Filed 8/17/2021
County 11001
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1-5
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1343.F
Offense Level 4
18 U.S.C. 1343; FRAUD BY WIRE, RADIO, OR TELEVISION; Wire Fraud
Count 20-33
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1028A.F
Offense Level 4
18 U.S.C. 1028A(a)(1); FRAUD WITH IDENTIFICATION DOCUMENTS; Aggravated Identity Theft
Count 34
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 2232A.F
Offense Level 4
18 U.S.C. 2232(a); DESTRUCTION OR REMOVAL OF PROPERTY TO PREVENT SEIZURE; Destruction or Removal of Property to Prevent Seizure
Count 6-19
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1957-4999.F
Offense Level 4
18 U.S.C. 1957; FRAUD, OTHER; Monetary Transaction of Criminally Derived Property
Defendant Custody Status Custody This Court
Flag CAT B
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/1/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/1/2021, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/28/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/27/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/27/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Protective Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/27/2021, Entered: None Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/27/2021, Entered: None Protective Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/20/2021, Entered: 8/20/2021 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed
                Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 8/20/2021 as to ELIAS ELDABBAGH. (bb)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/23/2021, Entered: None Order Setting Conditions of Release
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank  Order on motion to appoint counsel
                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Zia M. Faruqui: Initial Appearance/Arraignment held on 8/20/2021 as to Counts 1-5,6-19,20-33,34. Plea of NOT guilty entered as to all counts. Defendant present by telephone from CCB. Oral Motion to Appoint Counsel as to ELIAS ELDABBAGH (1); heard and granted. Due Process Order given to the Government. Government did not seek pretrial detention. Government request home confinement. Oral Motion by the Government for Speedy Trial as to ELIAS ELDABBAGH (1); heard and granted. Speedy Trial Excluded from 8/20/2021 to 8/30/2021 in the Interest of Justice (XT). Defense did not object. Status Hearing set for 8/30/2021 at 10:00 AM by Telephonic/VTC before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. Bond Status of Defendant: Defendant Released/Release Issued; Court Reporter: Tim Miller; Defense Attorney: David Bos; US Attorney: Leslie Goematt; Pretrial Officer: Masharia Holman. (ztl)
                      LREF
                      Blank  Motion for Speedy Trial
                      ORAL MOTION for Speedy Trial by USA as to ELIAS ELDABBAGH. (ztl)
                        LREF
                        Blank  Motion to Appoint Counsel
                        ORAL MOTION to Appoint Counsel by ELIAS ELDABBAGH. (ztl)
                          LREF
                          Blank  arrest
                          Arrest of ELIAS ELDABBAGH. (ztl)
                            LREF
                            Blank  Case Unsealed
                            Case unsealed as to ELIAS ELDABBAGH (bb)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/17/2021, Entered: 8/18/2021 Order on Motion to Seal Case +Court Filing
                              ORDER granting [3] Motion to Seal Case as to ELIAS ELDABBAGH (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather on 8/17/2021. (zltp)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/17/2021, Entered: 8/18/2021 Motion to Seal Case
                                EX PARTE MOTION FOR LIMITED SEALING by USA as to ELIAS ELDABBAGH. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(zltp)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/17/2021, Entered: 8/18/2021 indictment
                                  INDICTMENT as to ELIAS ELDABBAGH (1) count(s) 1-5, 6-19, 20-33, 34. (FORFEITURE ALLEGATION) (zltp)
                                    LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 102 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?