RPM Freight Systems, LLC v. K1 Express, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Michigan Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:21-cv-11964-NGE-CI
District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds, presiding

Tags
Last Updated January 27, 2022 at 12:35 PM EST (15.8 hours ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo RPM Freight Systems, LLC, Plaintiff

Represented by Clark Hill, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anthony A. Agosta +1 313 965 8300 aagosta@clarkhill.com
v.
No Logo K1 Express, Inc., Defendant
Office Detroit
Filed 8/24/2021
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition
County Oakland
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/27/2022, Entered: None Scheduling Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/12/2022, Entered: None Appear*
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/12/2022, Entered: None Memorandum Opinion & Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/7/2021, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/23/2021, Entered: None Response to Motion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/13/2021, Entered: None Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument*
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/12/2021, Entered: None Dismiss
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/12/2021, Entered: None Dismiss
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/12/2021, Entered: None Answer to Complaint
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/12/2021, Entered: None Appearance
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/6/2021, Entered: None Vacating Show Cause*
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/6/2021, Entered: None Response to Order to Show Cause
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/4/2021, Entered: None Show Cause
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/16/2021, Entered: 9/16/2021 Notice to Withdraw Motion
                            NOTICE by RPM Freight Systems, LLC of withdrawal of [3] MOTION for Alternate Service . (Agosta, Anthony)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/16/2021, Entered: 9/16/2021 Waiver of Service Executed (60 Day)
                              WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. K1 Express, Inc. waiver sent on 9/14/2021, answer due 11/15/2021. (Agosta, Anthony)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/7/2021, Entered: 9/7/2021, Terminated: 9/16/2021 Motion for Alternate Service
                                MOTION for Alternate Service by RPM Freight Systems, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Index of Exhibits, # (2) Exhibit 1 - Complaint, # (3) Exhibit 2 - Affidavit of Process Server) (Agosta, Anthony)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/24/2021, Entered: 8/24/2021 Summons issued
                                  SUMMONS Issued for *K1 Express, Inc.* (DPer)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/24/2021, Entered: 8/24/2021 Complaint
                                    COMPLAINT filed by RPM Freight Systems, LLC against K1 Express, Inc. with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8588851 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland County, MI - County of 1st Defendant: Middlesex. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: # (1) Index of Exhibits, # (2) Exhibit A - K1 Express Broker Carrier Agreement, # (3) Exhibit B - Rate Confirmation, # (4) Exhibit C - Bill of Lading, # (5) Exhibit D - Tesla Demand Letter) (Agosta, Anthony)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank  Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option
                                    A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DPer)
                                      LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 295 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?