Elhendi et al v. Quarantillo et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-01498-SHS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Agnes Minns, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Naresh M. Gehi +1 718 263 5999 +1 718 263 1685 lawofficesofnmgehi@yahoo.com
No Logo Mohammed M. Elhendi, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Naresh M. Gehi +1 718 263 5999 +1 718 263 1685 lawofficesofnmgehi@yahoo.com
v.
No Logo Andrea Quarantillo, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Natasha Oeltjen +1 212 637 2769 +1 212 637 2786 natasha.oeltjen@usdoj.gov
No Logo Michael B. Mukasey, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Natasha Oeltjen +1 212 637 2769 +1 212 637 2786 natasha.oeltjen@usdoj.gov
No Logo Michael Chertoff, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Natasha Oeltjen +1 212 637 2769 +1 212 637 2786 natasha.oeltjen@usdoj.gov
No Logo Robert Mueller, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Natasha Oeltjen +1 212 637 2769 +1 212 637 2786 natasha.oeltjen@usdoj.gov
Office Foley Square
Filed 2/13/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County NewYork
Terminated 5/8/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 9 Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: 5/8/2008 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: that the above-captioned action is dismissed with prejudice and without costs or attorney's fees to any party. The May 23 initial pretrial conference is cancelled. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 5/8/08) (tro)
    LREF
    Legal Document 8 Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: 5/2/2008 Order for Initial Pretrial ConferenceCourt Filing
    ORDER FOR INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: that a Initial Conference set for 5/23/2008 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 23A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Sidney H. Stein. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 5/2/08) (pl)
      LREF
      Legal Document 7 Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: 5/1/2008 Notice of Case Assignment/ReassignmentCourt Filing
      NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Sidney H. Stein. Judge Stephen C. Robinson is no longer assigned to the case. (fk)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: 5/1/2008 Case Redesignation
        Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck is so redesignated. (fk)
          LREF
          Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: 3/21/2008 Affidavit of Service Complaints
          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Andrea Quarantillo served on 3/7/2008, answer due 3/27/2008. Service was accepted by Aretha Charles, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Mohammed M. Elhendi. (Gehi, Naresh)
            LREF
            Legal Document 5 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: 3/21/2008 Affidavit of Service Complaints
            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Michael Chertoff served on 3/13/2008, answer due 4/2/2008. Service was accepted by Meagan Gemunder, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Mohammed M. Elhendi. (Gehi, Naresh)
              LREF
              Legal Document 4 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: 3/21/2008 Acknowledgment of Service Complaints
              ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE. Robert Mueller served on 3/11/2008, answer due 3/31/2008. Service was accepted by Henry R. Felix, Assistant General Counsel. Document filed by Mohammed M. Elhendi. (Gehi, Naresh)
                LREF
                Legal Document 3 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: 3/21/2008 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Michael B. Mukasey served on 3/12/2008, answer due 4/1/2008. Service was accepted by W.T. Lee, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Mohammed M. Elhendi. (Gehi, Naresh)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 2 Filed: 3/12/2008, Entered: 3/12/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Natasha Oeltjen on behalf of Andrea Quarantillo, Robert Mueller, Michael B. Mukasey, Michael Chertoff (Oeltjen, Natasha)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: 2/14/2008 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus
                    PETITION IN THE NATURE OF MANDAMUS against Andrea Quarantillo, Robert Mueller, Michael B. Mukasey, Michael Chertoff (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 641146).Document filed by Mohammed M. Elhendi, Agnes Minns.(rdz) (jma).
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: 2/14/2008 Case Designated ECF.
                      Case Designated ECF. (rdz)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: 2/14/2008 Case Designation
                        Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. (rdz)
                          LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 42 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?