USA v. Gonzalez
Criminal Case Vermont District Court, Case No. 5:21-cr-00076-gwc

Tags
Last Updated August 31, 2021 at 3:52 PM DT (3.6 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey W. Davis +1 404 581 6323 jeffrey.davis2@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Michael A. Gonzalez, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Barr & Associates, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Chandler W. Matson ,. +1 802 253 6272 chandler@barrlaw.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Michael A. Gonzalez (1)
Office Rutland
Filed 8/26/2021
County Lamoille
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 2313.F
Offense Level 4
182313.F SALE OR RECEIPT OF STOLEN VEHICLES - possessed and sold a knowingly stolen motor vehicle - a 2018 Tesla Model 3
Count 2
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 2313.F
Offense Level 4
182313.F SALE OR RECEIPT OF STOLEN VEHICLES - possessed, concealed, stored, and sold a knowingly stolen motor vehicle - a 2018 Tesla Model X
Count 3
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 2313.F
Offense Level 4
182313.F SALE OR RECEIPT OF STOLEN VEHICLES - possessed, concealed, ad disposed of a knowingly stolen motor vehicle - a 2018 Tesla Model X
Count 4
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 2313.F
Offense Level 4
182313.F SALE OR RECEIPT OF STOLEN VEHICLES - received, possessed, sold and disposed of a knowingly stolen motor vehicle - a 2019 Tesla Model X
Count 5
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 2313.F
Offense Level 4
182313.F SALE OR RECEIPT OF STOLEN VEHICLES - possessed, concealed, stored, and disposed of a knowingly stolen motor vehicle - a 2019 Tesla Model X
Defendant Custody Status Custody This Court
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/31/2021, Entered: None Order Setting Conditions of Release
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/31/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Protective Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/31/2021, Entered: None Warrant Returned Executed
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/30/2021, Entered: 8/30/2021 Notice of hearingCourt Filing
        REVISED NOTICE OF HEARING as to Michael A. Gonzalez: Detention Hearing rescheduled for 8/31/2021 at 1:00 PM in Burlington Courtroom 410 before Judge Kevin J. Doyle. (hbc)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/30/2021, Entered: 8/30/2021 Motion for protective order
          UNOPPOSED MOTION for Protective Order for Discovery Materials by USA as to Michael A. Gonzalez. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Davis, Jeffrey) Text clarified on 8/30/2021 (jlh).
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/27/2021, Entered: 8/27/2021 Order Scheduling a Detention HearingCourt Filing
            ORDER SCHEDULING A DETENTION HEARING as to Michael A. Gonzalez. Detention Hearing set for 8/30/2021 at 2:00 PM in Burlington Courtroom 410 before Judge Kevin J. Doyle. Signed by Judge Kevin J. Doyle on 8/27/2021. (hbc)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/27/2021, Entered: 8/27/2021 Order of Prosecutorial Obligation Under Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f)Court Filing
              ORDER of Prosecutorial Obligation Under Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f) as to Michael A. Gonzalez. Signed by Judge Kevin J. Doyle on 8/27/2021. (hbc)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/27/2021, Entered: 8/27/2021 Criminal Pretrial Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                CRIMINAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER as to Michael A. Gonzalez. Motions due by 11/29/2021. Time excluded from 8/27/2021 to 11/29/2021. Signed by Judge Kevin J. Doyle on 8/27/2021. (hbc)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/27/2021, Entered: 8/27/2021 Financial Affidavit - CJA 23
                  CJA 23 Financial Affidavit as to Michael A. Gonzalez. (Document image is sealed) (hbc)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank 7 Filed: 8/27/2021, Entered: 8/27/2021 initial appearanceCourt Filing
                    MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Kevin J. Doyle: Initial Appearance and Arraignment as to Michael A. Gonzalez held on 8/27/2021. Jeffrey Davis, AUSA present for the gov't and deft present with Atty Chandler Matson. Court advises deft of rights, deft sworn, and Court makes inquiries. Financial affidavit reviewed. Court summarizes Indictment. Deft waives a full reading and enters plea of not guilty. Gov't reports on nature and extent of discovery. Statements by counsel re time required for filing pretrial motions. Court makes findings. Gov't moves for detention and requests a one-day continuance. ORAL ORDER: Consistent with Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f), Court confirms disclosure obligation of the prosecutor under Brady v. Maryland and possible consequences of violating such Order. ORDERED: Court appoints counsel on behalf of deft. Pretrial Motions to be filed by 11/29/2021. Deft remanded to the custody of the US Marshal to be detained pending Detention Hearing set for 8/30/2021 at 2:00 PM in Burlington Courtroom 410 before Judge Kevin J. Doyle. (Court Reporter: Recorded) (hbc)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/27/2021, Entered: 8/27/2021 warrant returned executed
                      ARREST WARRANT RETURNED executed on 8/27/2021 as to Michael A. Gonzalez. (esb)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document 5 Filed: 8/27/2021, Entered: 8/27/2021 Motion for Detention
                        MOTION for Detention by USA as to Michael A. Gonzalez. (Davis, Jeffrey)
                          LREF
                          Blank  CJA 20 Appointment
                          CJA 20: Appointment of Chandler W. Matson, Esq for Michael A. Gonzalez. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 8/27/2021. (law)
                            LREF
                            Blank  Indictment Unsealed
                            INDICTMENT UNSEALED as to Michael A. Gonzalez pursuant to notification of Defendant's arrest. (hbc)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/26/2021, Entered: 8/26/2021 order on motion to seal documentCourt Filing
                              SEALING ORDER granting [2] Motion to Seal [1] Indictment and Related Materials as to Michael A. Gonzalez (1). Sealed until the arrest of the defendant. Signed by Judge Kevin J. Doyle on 8/26/2021. (esb)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/26/2021, Entered: 8/26/2021, Terminated: 8/26/2021 motion to seal document
                                MOTION to Seal [1] Indictment and Related Materials by USA as to Michael A. Gonzalez. (esb)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/26/2021, Entered: 8/26/2021 Indictment (Sealed)
                                  INDICTMENT as to Michael A. Gonzalez (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, 5. (esb)
                                    LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 178 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?