USA v. Arcaro
Criminal Case California Southern District Court, Case No. 3:21-cr-02542-TWR

Tags
Last Updated September 17, 2021 at 1:34 PM DT (1.1 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carl Brooker +1 619 546 8685 carl.brooker@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin Paul Lowell +1 202 262 7795 kevin.lowell@usdoj.gov
Space Mark Pletcher +1 202 307 6186 mark.pletcher@usdoj.gov
Space Daniel C. Silva +1 619 546 9713 +1 619 696 7124 Daniel.C.Silva@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Glenn Arcaro, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Andrues/Podberesky

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mary Carter Andrues +1 213 395 0400 +1 213 395 0401 mandrues@aplaw.law

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Glenn Arcaro (1)
Office San Diego
Filed 9/1/2021
County San Diego
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1349.F
Offense Level 4
181349; 18982(a)(2)(A), 21 2461(c) - Conspiracy to Commit Wire Fraud; Criminal Forfeiture
Defendant Custody Status Released
Flags SEALDC
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/17/2021, Entered: None Order Accepting Guilty Plea
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/9/2021, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/1/2021, Entered: 9/2/2021 Order Setting Conditions of Release (Pretrial Release Order)Court Filing
      PRETRIAL RELEASE ORDER. $500,000 P/S Bond set for Glenn Arcaro (1)... Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 9/01/2021. (jpp)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/1/2021, Entered: 9/2/2021 Abstract of Order
        ABSTRACT OF ORDER Releasing Glenn Arcaro re [7] Bond. (jpp)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/1/2021, Entered: 9/2/2021 bondCourt Filing
          P/S Bond Filed as to Glenn Arcaro in amount of $ 500,000, Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on.. (Document applicable to USA, Glenn Arcaro.) (jpp)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/1/2021, Entered: 9/2/2021 plea agreement
            PLEA AGREEMENT as to Glenn Arcaro (jpp)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/1/2021, Entered: 9/2/2021 Consent to PleaCourt Filing
              CONSENT TO RULE 11 PLEA before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin by Glenn Arcaro. (jpp)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/1/2021, Entered: 9/2/2021 Findings and RecommendationCourt Filing
                FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge upon a Tendered Plea of Guilty as to Glenn Arcaro: Recommending that the district judge accept the defendant's plea of guilty.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 9/01/2021. (jpp)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 2 Filed: 9/1/2021, Entered: 9/1/2021 Initial Appearance (w/ Schedules)Court Filing
                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin: Initial Appearance as to Glenn Arcaro held on 9/1/2021. Defendant present in court; Brady advisal provided. Bond set as to Glenn Arcaro (1) $500,000 P/S + 1 FRRA (Mother) + $50,000 deposit. Arraignment on Information as to Glenn Arcaro (1) Count 1 held on 9/1/2021. Not Guilty plea entered. Defendant waived Indictment in open court. Change of Plea Hearing as to Glenn Arcaro held on 9/1/2021. Plea Tendered by Glenn Arcaro Guilty on count 1 of the Information. Excludable(s) started as to Glenn Arcaro: XK 9/1/21-11/15/21. PSR Ordered. Any objections to Findings due within 14 days. Sentence With PSR set for 11/15/2021 09:30 AM before Judge Todd W. Robinson. Plea agreement, consent and findings filed. Bond packet submitted/approved; abstract issued (fingerprint and release). (CD# 9/1/2021 MDD 1003-1025). (Plaintiff Attorney Kevin Lowell, AUSA; Daniel Silva, AUSA; Mark Pletcher, AUSA; Carl Brooker, AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Mary Andrues, RET; Vicki Podberesky, RET). (dls)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 9/1/2021, Entered: 9/1/2021 information - felony
                    INFORMATION as to Glenn Arcaro (1) count(s) 1. (dls)
                      LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 85 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?