Dobbins v. Tesla, Inc. aka Tesla Motors, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Nevada District Court, Case No. 3:21-cv-00398

Tags
Last Updated September 20, 2021 at 8:28 PM DT (4.7 days ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Terrance Dobbins, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of JAMES P. KEMP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JAMES P. KEMP +1 702 258 1183 +1 702 258 6983 jp@kemp-attorneys.com
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jackson Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Deverie Jean Christensen +41539 494 00x6328 +1 415 394 9401 christensend@jacksonlewis.com
Space Joshua A Sliker +1 702 921 2460 +1 702 921 2461 joshua.sliker@jacksonlewis.com
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/20/2021, Entered: None Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/3/2021, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/1/2021, Entered: 9/1/2021 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO NORTHERN DIVISION. I THEREFORE ORDER that this action is transferred to the unofficial northern division of this court for all further proceedings. The clerk of the court shall transfer and reopen this matter as a new action under a new docket number in the northern division, and the action under this docket number shall be closed, without prejudice to the defendants regarding any federal filing fee. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/1/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - YAW)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/1/2021, Entered: 9/1/2021 Certificate of Interested Parties
        CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Terrance Dobbins. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Kemp, James)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 4 Filed: 8/31/2021, Entered: 8/31/2021 Standing OrderCourt Filing
          STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - YAW)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/31/2021, Entered: 8/31/2021 Minute Order Removal CaseCourt Filing
            MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/31/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 9/15/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 9/30/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - YAW)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/31/2021, Entered: 8/31/2021 Certificate of Interested Parties
              CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Tesla, Inc. aka Tesla Motors, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Christensen, Deverie)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/31/2021, Entered: 8/31/2021 Petition for Removal
                PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court Clark County Nevada, Case Number A-21-838852-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6615189) by Tesla, Inc. aka Tesla Motors, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Complaint, # (2) Exhibit B - Summons, # (3) Civil Cover Sheet) (Christensen, Deverie) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank  Assign Judges in Civil Case
                Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (YAW)
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 107 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?