Martha Cavero et al v. GEORGE CHIALA FARMS, INC. et al

State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 20CV368367
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 16, 2023 at 2:29 PM EST (2.3 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Cavero, Martha Merino, Plaintiff

Represented by The Law Office Of R.j. Molligan Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Molligan, Rene Juliette +1 310 284 7878
No Logo Navarro, Jorge, Plaintiff

Represented by The Law Office Of R.j. Molligan Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Molligan, Rene Juliette +1 310 284 7878
v.
No Logo CHIALA FAMILY PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Ferrier

Represented by Kronenberg, William Scott

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kronenberg, William Scott +1 415 788 1900
No Logo CHIALA PROPERTIES, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Chiala, George Allen, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Ferrier

Represented by Kronenberg, William Scott

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kronenberg, William Scott +1 415 788 1900
No Logo Chiala, Mary Alice, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Ferrier

Represented by Kronenberg, William Scott

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kronenberg, William Scott +1 415 788 1900
No Logo Chiala, Timothy, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Ferrier

Represented by Kronenberg, William Scott

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kronenberg, William Scott +1 415 788 1900
No Logo GEORGE CHIALA FARMS, INC., Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Ferrier

Represented by Kronenberg, William Scott

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kronenberg, William Scott +1 415 788 1900
No Logo GEORGE CHIALA FROZEN, INC., Defendant
No Logo GEORGE CHIALA PACKING, Defendant
No Logo THE ESTATE OF GEORGE CHIALA, Defendant
Other Parties
No Logo AMERI-KLEEN, INC., Cross Defendant/Cross Complainant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher Michael Long +1 408 286 9800 +1 408 998 4790 clong@hopkinscarley.com
Attributes
Case Type Other PI/PD/WD Unlimited (23)
Case Status Active
Case Location Civil
Timeline
  Entries (36) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 36 Filed: 12/28/2022, Entered: None Application and Order
DECLARATION OF RJ MOLLIGAN TO VACATE HEARING RE DISMISSAL AFTER SETTLEMENT [PROPOSED] ORDER
Request RequestSpace
Blank 35 Filed: 12/5/2022, Entered: None Order: ProposedCourt Filing
*WFP CV Judge 3 Calendar 12/13/22* Re Application for Order
Request RequestSpace
Blank 34 Filed: 10/19/2022, Entered: None Minute Order
Request RequestSpace
Blank 33 Filed: 10/19/2022, Entered: None Answer/Response (No Fee)
Answer to Ameri-Kleen, Inc.'s Cross Complaint
Request RequestSpace
Blank 32 Filed: 10/14/2022, Entered: None Notice
Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint
Request RequestSpace
Blank 31 Filed: 10/5/2022, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
Hrg 10-18-22 Opposition to Motion for Leave to File a First-Amended Cross-Complaint
Request RequestSpace
Blank 30 Filed: 10/5/2022, Entered: None Declaration in Support
Declaration
Request RequestSpace
Blank 29 Filed: 9/15/2022, Entered: None Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
to X-complaint: atty Kreeft
Request RequestSpace
Blank 28 Filed: 9/15/2022, Entered: None Cross Complaint
Request RequestSpace
Blank 27 Filed: 8/30/2022, Entered: None Notice
Notice of Change of Handling Attorney
Request RequestSpace
Blank 26 Filed: 8/16/2022, Entered: None Acknowledgement-Receipt
Request RequestSpace
Blank 25 Filed: 7/29/2022, Entered: None Motion-Leave
to File First Amended Complaint, hrg 10/18/22
Request RequestSpace
Blank 24 Filed: 6/22/2022, Entered: None Minute Order
Request RequestSpace
Blank 23 Filed: 6/16/2022, Entered: None Cross Complaint
CROSS-COMPLAINT OF DEFENDANTS/CROSSCOMPLAINANTS, GEORGE CHIALA FARMS, INC.; MARY ALICE CHIALA; GEORGE ALLEN CHIALA; TIMOTHY CHIALA; AND CHIALA FAMILY PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, LLC (Comment)
Request RequestSpace
Blank 22 Filed: 6/16/2022, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed
SUMMONS Cross-Complaint (Summons)
Request RequestSpace
Blank 21 Filed: 10/26/2021, Entered: None Minute Order
Request RequestSpace
Blank 20 Filed: 10/8/2021, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
Request RequestSpace
Blank 19 Filed: 6/11/2021, Entered: None Minute Order
Request RequestSpace
Blank 18 Filed: 5/11/2021, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
Request RequestSpace
Blank 17 Filed: 5/11/2021, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
Case Management Statement
Request RequestSpace
Blank 16 Filed: 1/29/2021, Entered: None Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Answer Response Denial Demurrer - First Appearance - $435.00
Request RequestSpace
Blank 15 Filed: 1/25/2021, Entered: None Request Dismissal
Partial, Without Prejudice, as to the 6th, 7th, 8th, 9th & 10th Causes of Action in the Complaint ONLY
Request RequestSpace
Blank 14 Filed: 1/14/2021, Entered: None Request Dismissal
Request for Dismissal
Request RequestSpace
Blank 13 Filed: 12/11/2020, Entered: None Declaration
Declaration
Request RequestSpace
Blank 12 Filed: 12/8/2020, Entered: None Minute Order
Request RequestSpace
Blank 11 Filed: 12/3/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
to extend time to respond to complaint - GRANTED up until 12-21-20 - signed by Judge Manoukian
Request RequestSpace
Blank 10 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
Proof of Service of Summons Complaint
Request RequestSpace
Blank 9 Filed: 10/29/2020, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
Request RequestSpace
Blank 8 Filed: 10/26/2020, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
Request RequestSpace
Blank 7 Filed: 10/26/2020, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
Request RequestSpace
Blank 6 Filed: 10/26/2020, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
Request RequestSpace
Blank 5 Filed: 10/26/2020, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
Request RequestSpace
Blank 4 Filed: 10/26/2020, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
Request RequestSpace
Blank 3 Filed: 7/15/2020, Entered: None Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Request RequestSpace
Blank 2 Filed: 7/15/2020, Entered: None Civil Case Cover Sheet
Request RequestSpace
Blank 1 Filed: 7/15/2020, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed
Request RequestSpace

Statistics

This case has been viewed 1 time.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?