SAN MARTIN GARCIA-SILVESTRE v. GOODWILL OF SILICON VALLEY

State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 20CV374735
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 17, 2023 at 1:38 AM EST (2.3 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo GARCIA-SILVESTRE, SAN MARTIN, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karla Ruiz
v.
No Logo GOODWILL OF SILICON VALLEY, Defendant

Represented by Rankin Sproat Mires Beaty & Reynolds

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin Randall Mintz +1 510 465 3922 +1 510 452 3006 mintz@rankinlaw.com

Represented by Tadlock, Lyn D

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jenny Silverstein +1 925 825 9500
No Logo Stokes, Keith, Defendant

Represented by Rankin Sproat Mires Beaty & Reynolds

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin Randall Mintz +1 510 465 3922 +1 510 452 3006 mintz@rankinlaw.com
Attributes
Case Type Other PI/PD/WD Unlimited (23)
Case Status Active
Case Location Civil
Timeline
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 26 Filed: 10/18/2022, Entered: None Minute Order
Request RequestSpace
Blank 25 Filed: 9/27/2022, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
Case Management Statement
Request RequestSpace
Blank 24 Filed: 6/7/2022, Entered: None Minute Order
Request RequestSpace
Blank 23 Filed: 5/18/2022, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
Case Management Statement
Request RequestSpace
Blank 22 Filed: 5/18/2022, Entered: None Notice
Notice of Remote Appearance
Request RequestSpace
Blank 21 Filed: 5/18/2022, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
Case Management Statement
Request RequestSpace
Blank 20 Filed: 1/19/2022, Entered: None Minute Order
Request RequestSpace
Blank 19 Filed: 1/3/2022, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
Case Management Statement
Request RequestSpace
Blank 18 Filed: 1/3/2022, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
Case Management Statement
Request RequestSpace
Blank 17 Filed: 12/28/2021, Entered: None Motion To Be Relieved As Counsel
HRG 04/05/22, 9am, D19
Request RequestSpace
Blank 16 Filed: 10/15/2021, Entered: None Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
to complaint, atty Mintz
Request RequestSpace
Blank 15 Filed: 9/15/2021, Entered: None Complaint: Amendment To (New Party)
Amendment to Complaint to Substitute Defendant's True Name for DOE 1
Request RequestSpace
Blank 14 Filed: 8/31/2021, Entered: None Minute Order
Request RequestSpace
Blank 13 Filed: 8/13/2021, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
Case Management Statement
Request RequestSpace
Blank 12 Filed: 8/11/2021, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
Case Management Statement
Request RequestSpace
Blank 11 Filed: 5/4/2021, Entered: None Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
to complaint, Atty Silverstein
Request RequestSpace
Blank 10 Filed: 5/4/2021, Entered: None Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable)
$150 paid
Request RequestSpace
Blank 9 Filed: 3/24/2021, Entered: None Minute Order
Request RequestSpace
Blank 8 Filed: 3/22/2021, Entered: None Clerk Rejection Letter
ENV#6082500 / Answer: $435.00 first paper fee required
Request RequestSpace
Blank 7 Filed: 3/11/2021, Entered: None Request Dismissal
as to 2nd cause of action of complaint
Request RequestSpace
Blank 6 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: None Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable)
Notice
Request RequestSpace
Blank 5 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
Case Management Statement
Request RequestSpace
Blank 4 Filed: 1/28/2021, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
Proof of Service Summons
Request RequestSpace
Blank 3 Filed: 12/15/2020, Entered: None Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Complaint
Request RequestSpace
Blank 2 Filed: 12/15/2020, Entered: None Civil Case Cover Sheet
Civil Case Cover Sheet
Request RequestSpace
Blank 1 Filed: 12/15/2020, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed
Summons
Request RequestSpace

Statistics

This case has been viewed 1 time.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?