Daniel Gonzalez v. West Valley Community Services of Santa Clara County, Inc.

State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 21CV375969
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 17, 2023 at 9:01 AM EST (2.3 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Gonzalez, Daniel D, Plaintiff

Represented by Abronson, Louis S.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Abronson, Louis S. +1 408 687 9155
v.
No Logo West Valley Community Services of Santa Clara County, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Tadlock, Lyn D

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jenny Silverstein +1 925 825 9500
Attributes
Case Type Other PI/PD/WD Unlimited (23)
Case Status Active
Case Location Civil
Timeline
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 17 Filed: 4/13/2022, Entered: None Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS
Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Request RequestSpace
Blank 16 Filed: 4/11/2022, Entered: None Request Dismissal
Request for Dismissal
Request RequestSpace
Blank 15 Filed: 2/8/2022, Entered: None Minute Order
Request RequestSpace
Blank 14 Filed: 1/26/2022, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
Case Management Statement
Request RequestSpace
Blank 13 Filed: 1/19/2022, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
Case Management Statement
Request RequestSpace
Blank 12 Filed: 9/14/2021, Entered: None Minute Order
Request RequestSpace
Blank 11 Filed: 8/30/2021, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
Case Management Statement
Request RequestSpace
Blank 10 Filed: 8/25/2021, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
Case Management Statement
Request RequestSpace
Blank 9 Filed: 5/28/2021, Entered: None Minute Order
Request RequestSpace
Blank 8 Filed: 5/18/2021, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
Case Management Statement
Request RequestSpace
Blank 7 Filed: 5/5/2021, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
Case Management Statement
Request RequestSpace
Blank 6 Filed: 5/4/2021, Entered: None Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
to complaint, Atty Silverstein
Request RequestSpace
Blank 5 Filed: 5/4/2021, Entered: None Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable)
$150 paid
Request RequestSpace
Blank 4 Filed: 3/22/2021, Entered: None Clerk Rejection Letter
ENV#6082187 / Answer + Notice of Posting Jury Fees: $435.00 and $150.00 required
Request RequestSpace
Blank 3 Filed: 1/11/2021, Entered: None Civil Case Cover Sheet
Civil Case Cover Sheet
Request RequestSpace
Blank 2 Filed: 1/11/2021, Entered: None Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Complaint
Request RequestSpace
Blank 1 Filed: 1/11/2021, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed
Summons
Request RequestSpace

Statistics

This case has been viewed 1 time.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?