In Re: Municipal Derivatives Antitrust Litigation
Federal Court Proceeding New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:08-md-01950-VM

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 26, 2016 at 5:22 PM DT (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Berkeley County, South Carolina, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Boies, Schiller & Flexner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tanya S. Chutkan +1 202 237 2727 +1 202 237 6131 tchutkan@bsfllp.com
Space Jonathan Shaw +1 202 274 1123 +1 202 237 6131 jshaw@bsfllp.com

Represented by Case Lombardi & Pettit

Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

No Logo Bucks County Water And Sewer Authority, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Gerard Eisler +1 212 838 7797 +1 212 838 7745 reisler@cmht.com
No Logo Central Bucks School District, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Gerard Eisler +1 212 838 7797 +1 212 838 7745 reisler@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gold Bennett Cera & Sidener LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Pamela A. Markert +1 415 777 2230 +1 415 777 5189 pmarkert@gbcslaw.com
No Logo Charleston County School District, South Carolina, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Boies, Schiller & Flexner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tanya S. Chutkan +1 202 237 2727 +1 202 237 6131 tchutkan@bsfllp.com
Space Jonathan Shaw +1 202 274 1123 +1 202 237 6131 jshaw@bsfllp.com

Represented by Case Lombardi & Pettit

Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

No Logo City of Baltimore, Maryland, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Gerard Eisler +1 212 838 7797 +1 212 838 7745 reisler@cmht.com
City of Chicago City of Chicago, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "City of Chicago, Illinois"

Toggle Switch Represented by Boies, Schiller & Flexner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tanya S. Chutkan +1 202 237 2727 +1 202 237 6131 tchutkan@bsfllp.com
Space Jonathan Shaw +1 202 274 1123 +1 202 237 6131 jshaw@bsfllp.com

Represented by Case Lombardi & Pettit

Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

No Logo City of Fall River, Massachusetts, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Boies, Schiller & Flexner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tanya S. Chutkan +1 202 237 2727 +1 202 237 6131 tchutkan@bsfllp.com
Space Jonathan Shaw +1 202 274 1123 +1 202 237 6131 jshaw@bsfllp.com

Represented by Case Lombardi & Pettit

Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

No Logo County of Alameda, California, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "County of Alameda"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew Kingsdale +1 215 870 5397 +1 415 956 1008 akingsdale@yahoo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eric B. Fastiff +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 efastiff@lchb.com
Space Richard Martin Heimann +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 rheimann@lchb.com
Space Joseph Richard Saveri +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 jsaveri@lchb.com
No Logo Fairfax County, Virginia, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Boies, Schiller & Flexner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tanya S. Chutkan +1 202 237 2727 +1 202 237 6131 tchutkan@bsfllp.com
Space Jonathan Shaw +1 202 274 1123 +1 202 237 6131 jshaw@bsfllp.com

Represented by Case Lombardi & Pettit

Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Toggle Switch Represented by Levin, Fishbein, Sedran & Berman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Laurence S. Berman +1 215 592 1500 +1 215 592 4663 lberman@lfsblaw.com
Space ARNOLD B. LEVIN +1 215 592 1500 +1 215 592 4663 alevin@lfsblaw.com
No Logo Hinds County, Mississippi, Plaintiff

Represented by Boies, Schiller & Flexner, LLP

No Logo State of Mississippi, Plaintiff

Represented by Boies, Schiller & Flexner, LLP

Represented by Case Lombardi & Pettit

Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

v.
American International Group, Inc. American International Group, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "AIG Financial Products Corp."
Officer/Director, Ipcs, Inc.
Officer/Director, Perini Corp
Officer/Director, World Airways Inc /de/
Officer/Director, Ipc Holdings Ltd
Officer/Director, Selmer Industries Inc
Officer/Director, Vision Acquisition I, Inc
Officer/Director, Blackstone Group Lp
Officer/Director, AIG BG Holdings LLC
Officer/Director, Tidewater Inc.
Officer/Director, American Home Assurance Co
Officer/Director, SQZ Biotechnologies Co
Officer/Director, On Minerals Co Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Benjamin Zabel +1 212 872 8060 +1 212 872 1002 rzabel@akingump.com
Bank of America, NA Bank of America, NA, Defendant
Officer/Director, Oneida Ltd.
Officer/Director, NATIONSBANK CORP
Officer/Director, Blue Ridge Investments, LLC
Officer/Director, Pioneer High Income Trust
Officer/Director, Nb Holdings Corp

Represented by King & Spalding LLP

Bear, Stearns & Company, Inc. Bear, Stearns & Company, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Tiffany & Bosco, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Janelle Louis Filson +1 212 455 3024 +1 212 455 2502 jfilson@stblaw.com
Space Annette C. Rizzi +1 212 455 3257 +1 212 455 2502 arizzi@stblaw.com
Space Janelle Louis Filson +1 212 455 3024 +1 212 455 2502 jfilson@stblaw.com
Space Annette C. Rizzi +1 212 455 3257 +1 212 455 2502 arizzi@stblaw.com
No Logo Cain Brothers & Company, Llc, Defendant
Officially listed as "Cain Brothers & Co., LLC"

Toggle Switch Represented by Arkin & Kaplan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen Thomas Heiser +21233 302 00x0232 +1 212 333 2350 sheiser@arkin-law.com
Space Howard Jay Kaplan +1 212 333 0219 +1 212 333 2350 hkaplan@arkin-law.com
Space Lisa Christine Solbakken +1 212 333 0200 +1 212 333 2350 lsolbakken@arken-law.com
No Logo CDR Financial Products, Defendant
No Logo Feld Winters Financial LLC, Defendant
No Logo Financial Guaranty Insurance Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cravath, Swaine & Moore, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John E Beerbower +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 jbeerbower@cravath.com
No Logo Financial Security Assurance Holdings, Ltd., Defendant
No Logo Financial Security Assurance Inc., Defendant
No Logo First Southwest Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Vinson & Elkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alden Lewis Atkins +1 202 639 6613 +1 202 879 8813 aatkins@velaw.com
No Logo GE Funding Capital Market Services, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Eggert +1 202 942 5000

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jon Jason Nathan +1 202 942 6481 +1 202 942 5999 jon.nathan@aporter.com
Space Craig A. Stewart +1 212 715 1142 +1 212 715 1399 craig_stewart@aporter.com
Space Douglas Lewis Wald +1 202 942 5112 +1 202 942 5999 douglas.wald@aporter.com
No Logo Genworth Financial, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Genworth Financial Investment Management, LLC, Defendant
No Logo George K. Baum & Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "George K. Baum & Co."

Toggle Switch Represented by Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael William Byrne +1 303 223 1100 +1 303 223 1111 mbyrne@bhfs.com
Space John Vincent McDermott +1 303 223 1100 +1 303 223 1111 jmcdermott@bhfs.com
No Logo Investment Management Advisory Group, Inc., Defendant
JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA, Defendant
Officially listed as "JP Morgan Chase Bank"

Toggle Switch Represented by Tiffany & Bosco, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Janelle Louis Filson +1 212 455 3024 +1 212 455 2502 jfilson@stblaw.com
Space Annette C. Rizzi +1 212 455 3257 +1 212 455 2502 arizzi@stblaw.com
Space Joseph Franklin Wayland +1 212 455 3203 +1 212 455 2502 jwayland@stblaw.com
Space Janelle Louis Filson +1 212 455 3024 +1 212 455 2502 jfilson@stblaw.com
Space Annette C. Rizzi +1 212 455 3257 +1 212 455 2502 arizzi@stblaw.com
No Logo Kinsell Newcomb & DE Dios, Inc., Defendant
Lehman Brothers, Inc. Lehman Brothers, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Lehman Abs Corp

Represented by Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison, LLP

Merrill Lynch & Company, Inc. Merrill Lynch & Company, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Merrill Lynch & Co. Inc."
No Logo MORGAN KEEGAN AND Company, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Morgan Keegan & Co., Inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph Dowell Edmondson, Jr +1 202 672 5300 +1 202 672 5399 jedmondson@foleylaw.com
Space Dana Christina Rundlof +1 212 338 3439 +1 212 687 2329 drundlof@foley.com
Morgan Stanley & Company Inc. Morgan Stanley & Company Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Morgan Stanley"
Director, Toy Biz, Inc.
Officer/Director, Pagemart Wireless, Inc.
Officer/Director, Vital Images, Inc.
Officer/Director, Xcyte Therapies, Inc.
Officer/Director, Websense, Inc.
Officer/Director, Silgan Holdings Inc.
Officer/Director, Msci Inc.
Officer/Director, Allegiance Telecom, Inc.
Officer/Director, Wci Communities, Inc.
Officer/Director, Gramercy Capital Corp.
Officer/Director, Discover Financial Services
Officer/Director, Cadiz Land Co Inc
Officer/Director, Ivf America Inc /de
Officer/Director, Jefferson Smurfit Corp /de/
Officer/Director, Imre Corp
Officer/Director, Uniholding Corp
Officer/Director, Cardiac Pathways Corp
Officer/Director, Impsat Corp
Officer/Director, Allscripts Inc /il
Officer/Director, Allscripts Holding Inc
Officer/Director, Psf Group Holdings Inc
Officer/Director, Acquicor Technology Inc
Officer/Director, Constant Contact, Inc.
Officer/Director, Big Entertainment, Inc.
Officer/Director, Pilgrim Prime Rate Trust
Officer/Director, Digitalglobe, Inc.
Officer/Director, Remec, Inc.
Officer/Director, Golden Tan, Inc
Officer/Director, Ms Holdings Inc
Officer/Director, NB Telecom, Inc.
Officer/Director, Pioneer High Income Trust
Officer/Director, Muniyield Quality Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Lazarus Industries Inc
Officer/Director, Pacholder Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Texas Industries, Inc.
Officer/Director, Innocoll Holdings plc
Officer/Director, Visions In Glass Inc
Officer/Director, Bloom Energy Corp
Officer/Director, Leisure Acquisition Corp.
Officer/Director, Rps Realty Trust
Officer/Director, Symix Systems, Inc.
Officer/Director, Cfw Communications Co
Officer/Director, Saratogo Holdings I Inc
Officer/Director, Municipal Partners Fund Inc
No Logo Municipal Government Investors Corp., Defendant
No Logo National Westminster Bank Plc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dickstein Shapiro LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jay N. Fastow +1 212 277 6500 +1 212 277 6501 fastowj@ballardspahr.com
No Logo Natixis Funding Corp., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis & Gilbert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peggy Senyie Chen +1 212 468 4902 +1 212 974 7047 pchen@dglaw.com
Space Paul Francis Corcoran +1 212 468 4825 +1 212 974 7037 pcorcoran@dglaw.com
Space Bruce Martin Ginsberg +1 212 468 4800 +1 212 974 6920 bginsberg@dglaw.com
Space James R. Levine +1 212 468 4985 +1 212 621 0938 jlevine@dglaw.com
Space Howard Jeffrey Rubin +1 212 468 4822 +1 212 621 0919 hrubin@dglaw.com
No Logo Natixis S.a., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis & Gilbert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peggy Senyie Chen +1 212 468 4902 +1 212 974 7047 pchen@dglaw.com
Space Paul Francis Corcoran +1 212 468 4825 +1 212 974 7037 pcorcoran@dglaw.com
Space Bruce Martin Ginsberg +1 212 468 4800 +1 212 974 6920 bginsberg@dglaw.com
Space James R. Levine +1 212 468 4985 +1 212 621 0938 jlevine@dglaw.com
Space Howard Jeffrey Rubin +1 212 468 4822 +1 212 621 0919 hrubin@dglaw.com
No Logo Packerkiss Securities, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Piper Jaffray & Co., Defendant
No Logo Shockley Financial Corp., Defendant
Société Générale, SA Société Générale, SA, Defendant
Officially listed as "Societe Generale SA"

Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

No Logo Sound Capital Management, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fredrikson & Byron, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John W. Lundquist +1 612 492 7000 +1 612 492 7077 jlundquist@fredlaw.com
Space Nicole M. Moen +1 612 492 7000 +1 612 492 7077 nmoen@fredlaw.com
No Logo Trinity Funding Co., LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Eggert +1 202 942 5000

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jon Jason Nathan +1 202 942 6481 +1 202 942 5999 jon.nathan@aporter.com
Space Craig A. Stewart +1 212 715 1142 +1 212 715 1399 craig_stewart@aporter.com
Space Douglas Lewis Wald +1 202 942 5112 +1 202 942 5999 douglas.wald@aporter.com
UBS AG UBS AG, Defendant
Officer/Director, Cabletron Systems, Inc.
Officer/Director, Dov Pharmaceutical Inc.
Officer/Director, Greenfield Online Inc.
Officer/Director, First South Africa Corp Ltd
Officer/Director, Impsat Corp
Officer/Director, Ubs Capital II Inc
Officer/Director, Dynamic Ventures Inc/canada
Officer/Director, Ip Factory Inc
Officer/Director, Desert Native Designs Inc
Officer/Director, Muniyield Michigan Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Muniyield Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Muniyield Florida Fund
Officer/Director, Pilgrim Prime Rate Trust
Officer/Director, Munivest Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Pioneer High Income Trust
Officer/Director, Mfs Municipal Income Trust
Officer/Director, Pioneer Floating Rate Trust
Officer/Director, Nuveen Senior Income Fund
Officer/Director, Pimco Municipal Income Fund
Officer/Director, Pimco High Income Fund
No Logo Wachovia Bank, NA, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David B Tulchin +1 212 558 3749 +1 212 558 3588 tulchind@sullcrom.com
No Logo Winters & Co. Advisors, LLC, Defendant
No Logo XL Asset Funding Co. I LLC, Defendant
No Logo XL Asset Funding Company LLC, Defendant
No Logo Xl Capital Ltd, Defendant
No Logo XL Life Insurance & Annuity, Inc., Defendant
No Logo City of Oakland, Intervenor

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew Kingsdale +1 215 870 5397 +1 415 956 1008 akingsdale@yahoo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eric B. Fastiff +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 efastiff@lchb.com
Space Richard Martin Heimann +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 rheimann@lchb.com
Space Joseph Richard Saveri +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 jsaveri@lchb.com
Office Foley Square
Filed 6/18/2008
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 410 - Anti-Trust
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 1 Antitrust Litigation
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County XX Out of State
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
108-md-01950-VM None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
  Entries (454) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 451 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Timothy E. Hoeffner in Support re: (1977 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG) MOTION for Timothy E. Hoeffner to Withdraw as Attorney .. Document filed by Investment Management Advisory Group, Inc., Investment Management Advisory Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(Hoeffner, Timothy) (Entered: 11/02/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 450 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None
    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (1977 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG) MOTION for Timothy E. Hoeffner to Withdraw as Attorney . . Document filed by Investment Management Advisory Group, Inc., Investment Management Advisory Group, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(Hoeffner, Timothy) (Entered: 11/02/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 449 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None
      MOTION for Timothy E. Hoeffner to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Investment Management Advisory Group, Inc., Investment Management Advisory Group, Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(Hoeffner, Timothy) (Entered: 11/02/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 448 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
        STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, pursuant to rule 41(a)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by and between Plaintiff State of West Virginia, by and through Patrick Morrisey, the duly elected and current Attorney General, and Defendant Bayerische Landesbank, subject to the order of the Court, that all claims in the above- captioned action against Defendant Bayerische Landesbank are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees., Bayerische Landesbank Girozentrale and Bayerische Landesbank Girozentrale terminated. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 9/30/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(lmb) (Entered: 09/30/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 447 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
          MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (1948 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG) Letter filed by Plaintiffs. ENDORSEMENT: The parties are directed to address the matter set forth above to Magistrate Judge Gabriel Gorenstein. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 8/28/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(lmb) (Entered: 09/23/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 446 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None
            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Andrew Dingerson on behalf of Natixis Funding Corp., Natixis S.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(Dingerson, Daniel) (Entered: 09/01/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 445 Filed: 8/19/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
              STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED pursuant to Rule 41(a)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by and between the Plaintiff (Active Retirement Community, Inc., d/b/a Jefferson's Ferry) and Defendants General Electric Capital Corporation, GE Funding Capital Market Services, Inc. (formerly known as FGIC Capital Market Services, Inc.), Trinity Plus Funding Co., LLC, and Trinity Funding Co., LLC (individually and collectively, the "GE Trinity Defendants") that all claims in the above-captioned action against the GE Trinity Defendants are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees., General Electric Capital Corporation, Trinity Funding Co., LLC, Trinity Plus Funding Co., LLC, GE Funding Capital Market Services, Inc. and General Electric Capital Corporation terminated. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 8/18/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG, 1:10-cv-08273-VM(lmb) (Entered: 08/19/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 444 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                JOINT DEPOSITION PROTOCOL AND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Deposition Protocol. The Nationwide Putative Class Plaintiffs (represented by Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel) may take up to 45 depositions. Plaintiffs other than the Nationwide Putative Class Plaintiffs ("Additional Plaintiffs") may take up to 20 depositions. Plaintiffs collectively may not take more than 7 depositions of current or former employees of a Defendant, excluding 30(b)(6) depositions. Defendants collectively may take up to 65 depositions. Defendants collectively may not take more than 7 depositions of current or former employees of a Plaintiff, excluding 30(b)(6) depositions. For purposes of this Deposition Protocol, each group of affiliated Defendant entities is treated collectively as one defendant, and as further set forth herein regarding the Deposition Protocol. Amendment to Scheduling Order. Depositions noticed by the Additional Plaintiffs and depositions noticed by Defendants relating to the claims of Additional Plaintiffs (including all depositions of Additional Plaintiffs and their current and former employees) shall be completed on or before March 15, 2016. No other deadlines in the June 25, 2014 Joint Discovery Scheduling Order (Dkt. 432) shall be impacted by this Order, and as further set forth in this Order. (Deposition due by 3/15/2016). (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 6/29/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG as per Chambers. (rjm) (Entered: 06/29/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 443 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None
                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Scott E. Gant on behalf of Bucks County Water And Sewer Authority, Central Bucks School District, City of Baltimore, Maryland. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(Gant, Scott) (Entered: 06/26/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 442 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting (441) Motion for Scott E. Gant to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-md-01950-VM. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 4/13/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG (tn) (Entered: 04/13/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 441 Filed: 3/25/2015, Entered: None
                      MOTION for Scott E. Gant to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10743268. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Plaintiff Class. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Gant, Scott) (Entered: 03/25/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 440 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL: granting (1925) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Upon the motion of counsel Robert J. Mathias, Quincy M. Crawford III, John Vukelj and Robert C. Santoro, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Michael P. McMahan is no longer counsel of record for defendant Transamerica Life Insurance Company. The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to amend the Court's records accordingly. Attorney Michael Palmer McMahan terminated in case 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 1/12/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG (lmb) (Entered: 01/12/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 439 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                          MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting (1915 in 08cv2516) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting (437 in 08md1950) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: Request GRANTED. Attorney Magda Maria Jimenez terminated in case 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG; Attorney Magda Maria Jimenez terminated in case 1:08-md-01950-VM. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 8/25/2014) ***As per instructions from chambers, filed in: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG only. (tn) Modified on 8/25/2014 (tn). (Entered: 08/25/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 438 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None
                            DECLARATION of Magda M. Jimenez in Support re: (1915 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG) MOTION for Magda M. Jimenez to Withdraw as Attorney .. Document filed by Hinds County, Mississippi. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(Barrett, David) (Entered: 08/22/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 437 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None
                              MOTION for Magda M. Jimenez to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Hinds County, Mississippi.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(Barrett, David) (Entered: 08/22/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 436 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None
                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David A. Barrett on behalf of Hinds County, Mississippi. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(Barrett, David) (Entered: 08/22/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 435 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Pursuant to rule 41(a)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, that all claims in the above-captioned action against Defendants GE Funding Capital Market Services, Inc. (formerly known as FGIC Capital Market Services, Inc.), Trinity Plus Funding Co., LLC, and Trinity Funding Co., LLC are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 7/14/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG, 1:10-cv-00769-VM(ja) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 434 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: that all claims in the above-captioned action against Defendant Bayerische Landesbank are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Bayerische Landesbank terminated. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 7/10/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG, 1:11-cv-01019-VM (tn) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Blank 433 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None
                                      DOCUMENT REFERRED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, With prejudice against the defendant(s) Bayerische Landesbank Girozentrale, Bayerische Landesbank and Without costs to either party pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Bayerische Landesbank Girozentrale, Utah Housing Corporation.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG, 1:11-cv-01019-VM(Houpt, Timothy) Modified on 7/11/2014 (jno). (Entered: 07/10/2014)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        JOINT DISCOVERY SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties submit for this Court's consideration this Joint Proposed Discovery Scheduling Order. Plaintiffs have conferred with the U.S. Department of Justice ("DOJ"). The DOJ will not seek to extend the terms of the discovery stay embodied in the Court's Order dated March 22, 2011 and modified in the Court's June 14, 2013 Order (the "Discovery Stay"). Accordingly, the Discovery Stay shall no longer operate to prohibit or otherwise have any effect on depositions, on written and documentary discovery, or on interrogatories. The parties agree that, subject to Paragraph I.3(f) below, fact discovery shall close by September 30, 2015. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. Motions due by 4/3/2015. Fact Discovery due by 9/30/2015. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 6/24/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(ama) (Entered: 06/25/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 6/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from J. Jackson dated 6/24/2014 re: We write on behalf of the Defendants in the above-captioned MDL proceeding in response to Your Honor's order of June 18, 2014, which requests an explanation as to (1) why it is necessary for the Proposed Joint Discovery Scheduling Order to provide 150 days for Defendants to respond to the Class Plaintiffs' class certification motion and expert reports (Section 3(b); and (2) why the parties appear to presume that the Court will hold a class certification hearing (Section 3(e). (ama). (ama) (Entered: 06/24/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 430 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from Megan E. Jones dated 6/13/2014 re: The parties in the above-captioned case are pleased to report agreement on a jointly proposed discovery scheduling order for your consideration (attached). The attached schedule is the result of meeting and conferring among all interested parties and is uncontested. ENDORSEMENT: With respect to paragraph 1.3 of the proposed order, please file a letter explaining (1) why 150 days is an appropriate time period to respond to the motion for class certification; and (2) why it should be assumed that a "hearing" will be required for Judge Marrero to adjudicate the class certification motion. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 6/17/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(ama) (Entered: 06/18/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 429 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Jason A. Roth dated 6/13/2014 re: Accordingly, I respectfully request that my appearance be withdrawn and that I be removed from all ECF notifications in this action. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Attorney Jason Andrew Roth terminated. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 6/16/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG (tn) (Entered: 06/16/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 428 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORDER APPROVING MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF DISTRIBUTION PLAN, CLAIM FORM, AND NOTICE PROGRAM granting (1874) Motion to Approve in case 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG: The Court approves the proposed Distribution Plan and Claim Form. The Court approves the proposed Notice Program. The Court finds that the manner of distribution of the Notice set forth below constitutes the best practicable notice under the circumstances as well as valid, due and sufficient notice to all persons entitled thereto and complies fully with the requirements of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23 and the due process requirements of the United States Constitution. Class Counsel shall cause the Distribution Plan and Claim Form to be distributed no later than October 1, 2014 in accordance with the Notice Program. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 6/6/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG (tn) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 427 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER granting (1877) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG: Class Plaintiffs' Counsel shall receive a total of $11,475,000 in attorneys' fees to be paid out of settlement funds created by two separate settlement agreements reached with (a) defendants Bank of America, N.A. ("BOA") and (b) defendants GE Funding Capital Market Services, Inc., Trinity Funding Co., LLC and Trinity Plus Funding Co., LLC (collectively, "GE") (the "Settlements"). Class Plaintiffs' Counsel shall be reimbursed $38,522.51 in costs and expenses reasonably incurred in the presentation and settlement of this litigation, to be paid out of the settlement funds created by the Settlements. Class Plaintiffs' current Lead Counsel (consisting of Hausfeld LLP, Boies Schiller & Flexner, LLP, and Susman Godfrey, LLP) shall have the sole authority to allocate and distribute any attorneys' fees and expenses awarded pursuant to this Order from the Settlements in a manner which, in the opinion of Lead Counsel, fairly compensates the Class Plaintiffs' Counsel's firms for their services. An incentive award of $5,000, to be paid out of each of the respective settlement funds created by the Settlements, shall be paid to each of the following named Class Plaintiffs: the City of Baltimore, Maryland; the Central Bucks School District; and the Bucks County Water & Sewer Authority. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 6/6/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG (tn) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 426 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT ON TRINITY FUNDING CO., LLC, TRINITY PLUS FUNDING CO., LLC, AND GE FUNDING CAPITAL MARKET SERVICES, INC. SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT: Final approval of Class Plaintiffs' settlement with GE Defendants is hereby granted pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(e), because it is "fair, reasonable, and adequate" to the Class. In reaching this conclusion, the Court considered the complexity, expense, and likely duration of the litigation, the Class's reaction to the settlement, and the result achieved. The Escrow Account established by Class Plaintiffs' Co-Lead Counsel and GE Defendants, in which $18,050,000 will remain after $200,000 is returned to the GE Defendants, is approved as a Qualified Settlement Fund pursuant to Internal Revenue Code Section 468B and the Treasury Regulations promulgated thereunder. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54, and finding no just reason for delay, the Court hereby directs the entry of final judgment as to the GE Defendants. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 6/6/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG (tn) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 425 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT ON BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT: Final approval of Class Plaintiffs' settlement with Defendant BoA is hereby granted pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(e), because it is fair, reasonable, and adequate to the Class. In reaching this conclusion, the Court considered the complexity, expense, and likely duration of the litigation, the Class's reaction to the settlement, and the result achieved. The Escrow Account established by Class Plaintiffs' Co-Lead Counsel and BoA that shall be funded in the amount of $20,528,804.91 is approved as a Qualified Settlement Fund pursuant to Internal Revenue Code Section 468B and the Treasury Regulations promulgated thereunder. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54, and finding no just reason for delay, the Court hereby directs the entry of final judgment as to Defendant BoA. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 6/6/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(tn) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 424 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Megan E. Jones dated 5/30/2014 re: Counsel requests permission to revise two items on the docket to provide recently obtained settlement information from certain State Attorneys General. ENDORSEMENT: Request GRANTED. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 5/30/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG (tn) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 423 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1) (A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by and between Plaintiff and Defendants JPMorgan Chase & Co, and J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, subject to the Order of the Court, that Defendants JPMorgan Chase & Co. and J.P. Morgan Securities LLC are hereby dismissed with prejudice, with the parties to bear their own attorneys fees and costs. All claims pending against other defendants shall remain pending. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 5/29/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG, 1:10-cv-00769-VM(ja) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 422 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            ORDERGRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW APPEARANCES granting (1890) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney: that Kevin R. Sullivan and Kana Ellis Caplan are no longer counsel of record for defendants Bank of America, N.A. and Bank of America Corporation. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully requested to amend the Court's records accordingly. Attorney Kana Ellis Caplan and Kevin R. Sullivan terminated in case 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 5/23/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG (tn) (Entered: 05/23/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 421 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting (1888) Motion for Michael J. Ciatti to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 5/21/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG (tn) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 420 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL granting (1884) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG: that Christopher C. Javillonar is no longer counsel of record for Defendant George K. Baum & Company. The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to amend the Court's records accordingly. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 5/12/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG (tn) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 419 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL: granting (1880) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney David Victor Sack terminated in case 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG; granting (417) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney David Victor Sack terminated in case 1:08-md-01950-VM. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 5/02/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG (ama) (Entered: 05/02/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Blank 418 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                    DECLARATION of David V. Sack in Support re: (1880 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG, 417 in 1:08-md-01950-VM) MOTION for David Victor Sack to Withdraw as Attorney .. Document filed by Transamerica Life Insurance Company, Transamerica Life Insurance and Annuity Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(McMahan, Michael) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 417 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                      MOTION for David Victor Sack to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Transamerica Life Insurance Company, Transamerica Life Insurance and Annuity Company. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(McMahan, Michael) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 416 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Palmer McMahan on behalf of Transamerica Life Insurance Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(McMahan, Michael) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 415 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Sylvia Sokol on behalf of City of Fresno, California, City of Oakland, County of Alameda, East Bay Delta Housing & Finance Agency, Fresno County Financing Authority. New Address: Scott+Scott, Attorneys at Law, LLP, The Chrysler Building, 405 Lexington Ave., 40th Floor, New York, New York, 10174, 212-223-6444. (Sokol, Sylvia) (Entered: 04/08/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 414 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                            CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT AS TO CDR Financial Products, Inc. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(dt) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 413 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER STRIKING DEFENDANT CDR FINANCIAL PRODUCTS, INC.'S ANSWER AND ENTERING DEFAULT AGAINST CDR FINANCIAL PRODUCTS, INC. IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF UTAH HOUSING CORPORATION granting (1863) Motion to Strike Document No. (1583) in case 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG: Plaintiff's motion is hereby GRANTED. The Answer of Defendant CDR Financial Products, Inc. to Utah Housing Corporation's Second Amended Complaint is stricken from the record. The Clerk of this Court shall hereby enter the default of Defendant CDR Financial Products, Inc. in favor of Plaintiff Utah Housing Corporation. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 3/18/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG (tn) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 412 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Rachel A. Owens dated 3/6/2014 re: Counsel requests that her appearance be withdrawn and she be removed from all ECF notifications in this action. ENDORSEMENT: Request GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to remove Attorney Rachel A. Owens from ECF notification in this action. Attorney Rachel Anne Owens terminated. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 3/6/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG (tn) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 411 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE OF ARPAN SURA in case 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG; granting (400) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:08-md-01950-VM: that the Motion for Withdrawal of Appearance of Arpan Sura on behalf of Defendants Trinity Funding Co., LLC, Trinity Plus Funding Co., LLC, GE Funding Capital Market Services, Inc., and General Electric Capital Corp. (collectively, "GE/Trinity") is granted. Attorneys Craig Stewart, Douglas L. Waldo John A. Freedman and Laura Cofer Taylor of the law fum Arnold & Porter LLP will continue to appear on behalf of GE/Trinity. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 2/20/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG (tn) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 410 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER CONCERNING RESPONSE TO THE STATE OF WEST VIRGINIA'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between Plaintiff West Virginia and Defendant JPMorgan, subject to the approval of the Court, as follows: JPMorgan need not respond to the West Virginia Second Amended Complaint in this action until March 5, 2014. IT IS SO ORDERED. JP Morgan Chase & Co. answer due 3/5/2014; JP Morgan Chase & Co. answer due 3/5/2014; JPMorgan Securities, Inc. answer due 3/5/2014. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 1/30/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(ama) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 409 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, pursuant to rule 41(a)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by and between Plaintiff and Defendants Trinity Plus Funding Co., LLC and GE Funding Capital Market Services, Inc. (formerly known as FGIC Capital Market Services, Inc.), subject to the order of the Court, that all claims in the above-captioned action against Defendants Trinity Plus Funding Co., LLC and GE Funding Capital Market Services, Inc. (formerly known as FGIC Capital Market Services, Inc.) are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 1/17/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG, 1:11-cv-01019-VM(lmb) (Entered: 01/24/2014)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 408 Filed: 12/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        ORDER APPROVING NOTICE PLAN AND FORMS RELATED TO SETTLEMENTS WITH DEFENDANT BANK OF AMERICA NA AND DEFENDANTS TRINITY FUNDING CO LLC TRINITY PLUS FUNDING CO LLC AND GE FUNDING CAPITAL MARKET SERVICES INC. AND NOW, this 26th day of December, 2013, upon consideration of Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Notice Program and Forms Related to the Settlement Agreements with Defendants Bank of America, N.A. ("Bank of America") and Defendants Trinity Funding Co., LLC, Trinity Plus Funding Co., LLC, and GE Funding Capital Market Services, Inc. (collectively, "G.E."), it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. It is FURTHER ORDERED as follows: 1. The Court approves the proposed Notice Program, including the Bank of America and G.E. Cover Letters, Long Form Notices ("Direct Notices"), and Short Form Notices ("Publication Notices"), attached as Exhibits A-F, respectively, to the Declaration of Katherine Lloyd, and approves the form of the Banner Advertisement previously submitted (see Docket No. 1513-7). The Court finds that the manner of distribution of the Notice set forth below constitutes the best practicable notice under the circumstances as well as valid, due and sufficient notice to all persons entitled thereto and complies fully with the requirements of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23 and the due process requirements of the United States Constitution. 2. On or before February 5. 2014, Class Counsel shall cause the Notice, in substantially the same form as Exhibits A-F referenced above, to be mailed by first class mail, postage prepaid, to all members of the proposed Settlement Class, including those identified by the Settling Defendants. Additionally, the Notice shall be published in accord with the Declaration of Katherine Lloyd (including but not limited to publication in the press and on the Internet) in same form as referenced above (Exhibits C and F and Docket No. 1513-7). Class Counsel shall also provide a copy of the Notice to all persons who request it and shall post a copy of the Notice on the Internet at the address identified in the Notice. Class Counsel shall notify counsel for Settling Defendants of all members of the Settlement Class who elect to opt out of the Settlement Class or object to the Settlement Agreements within five business days of the deadline for same. For these Settlements, and the Distribution Plan, a hearing (the "Final Fairness Hearing") shall be held by this Court on June 6, 2014 at 10 a.m., before the Honorable Victor Marrero at the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Daniel Patrick Moynihan United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl St., New York, NY 10007-1312 to make a final determination whether the proposed Settlement Agreements are fair, adequate, and reasonable to the Settlement Classes and should be approved by the Court, and whether Bank of America and G.E. should be released from all claims, as provided in the Settlement Agreements. The Court may adjourn this Final Fairness Hearing without further notice to members of the Class. All other provisions as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 12/26/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG (js) Modified on 12/26/2013 (js). (Entered: 12/26/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 407 Filed: 12/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                          ANSWER to 379 Amended Complaint,, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Societe Generale SA.(Lin, Paula) (Entered: 12/18/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 406 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting (1830) Application for the Court to Request Counsel in case 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 12/16/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al. (js) (Entered: 12/17/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 405 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, pursuant to Rule 41(8)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. by and between the undersigned attorneys for Plaintiffs as listed in Exhibit A and Defendants Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (f/k/a Wachovia Bank, N.A.) and Wells Fargo'" Company, subject to the order of the Court, that each and every claim asserted in the above-captioned actions against Defendants Wells Fargo Bank. N.A. (f/k/a Wachovia Bank, N.A.) and Wells Fargo & Company only are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 12/9/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(js) Modified on 12/10/2013 (js). (Entered: 12/10/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Disclosures. Within 60 days of the date on which this Proposed Scheduling Order is so-ordered, the Utah Housing parties will exchange Initial Disclosures as required by Rule 26(a)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Exchange of Discovery Conducted to Date in MDL No. 1950. Within 90 days of the date on which the Proposed Scheduling Order is so-ordered, each party in the Utah Housing Case (to the extent they have not done so already) will exchange a copy of any discovery responses, deposition transcripts, and documents (including any electronic documents and audio recordings) that that party previously produced or served in any of the consolidated actions pending in MDL No. 1950, including any discovery described in Paragraph 5 of the Master Scheduling Order and any discovery conducted by any of the Utah Housing parties in any of the MDL No. 1950 consolidated actions between the filing of this Proposed Scheduling Order and the deadline described above. If any party objects to the exchange of any particular discovery response, deposition transcript, or document, the objecting party will meet and confer with the opposing party at least 30 days prior to the deadline set above, and all parties will work in good faith to resolve any such objections. Joining the Master Scheduling Order. The parties in the Utah Housing Case request that, following the completion of Initial Disclosures and the exchange of discovery described in Paragraphs 8-9 above, the Utah Housing Case joins, adopts, and otherwise becomes subject to the discovery schedule described in Paragraphs 6-7 of the Master Scheduling Order, with the express exception that, to the extent that any individual or entity has been deposed prior to the completion of the deadlines described in Paragraphs 8-9 above and a Utah Housing party was not notified of, or otherwise able to participate in, that deposition, that Utah Housing party reserves the right without prejudice to further depose the individual or entity. The Utah Housing Defendants agree that, from this date forward, they will simultaneously serve UHC with any discovery requests (including deposition notices and subpoenas) that they serve in any of the other consolidated actions pending in MDL No. 1950. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 11/21/2013) (rsh) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR ALL DEFENDANTS TO ANSWER THE CORRECTED THIRD CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between Class Plaintiff's and the undersigned Defendant's that Defendant's shall have until and including December 18, 2013, to answer or otherwise respond to the Corrected Third Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint and Plaintiff's shall have until February 18, 2014 to respond to any such pleadings (if necessary). Bank of America answer due 12/18/2013; GE Funding Capital Market Services, Inc. answer due 12/18/2013; National Westminster Bank PLC answer due 12/18/2013; Natixis Funding Corp. answer due 12/18/2013; Piper Jaffray & Co. answer due 12/18/2013; Sound Capital Management, Inc. answer due 12/18/2013; UBS AG answer due 12/18/2013. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 11/7/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(rsh) (Entered: 11/07/2013)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 402 Filed: 11/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED. pursuant to Rule 41(a)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by and between the undersigned attorneys for Plaintiffs City of Oakland, County of Alameda, City of Fresno, Fresno County Financing Authority, and East Bay Delta Housing'" Finance Agency, and Defendants Wachovia Bank, N.A. (n/k/a and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.), and Wells Fargo & Co., that each and every claim asserted in the above captioned actions against Defendants Wachovia Bank, N,A. (n/k/a Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.), and Wells Fargo & Co. are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 11/6/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG, 1:08-cv-06340-VM, 1:09-cv-01199-VM, 1:11-cv-05796-VM(js) Modified on 11/7/2013 (js). Modified on 11/7/2013 (js). (Entered: 11/07/2013)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 11/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, pursuant to Rule 41(a)( 1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by and between Plaintiff and Defendants Bank of America. N.A. and Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc., subject to the order of the Court, that Defendants Bank of America, N.A. and Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc. are voluntarily dismissed from the Action with prejudice, with the parties to bear their own attorneys' fees and costs. All claims pending against all other defendants in this action shall remain pending. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 11/6/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG, 1:10-cv-00769-VM(js) (Entered: 11/07/2013)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                        MOTION for Arpan A. Sura to Withdraw as Attorney. Document filed by GE Funding Capital Market Services, Inc., General Electric Capital Corporation, Trinity Funding Co., LLC, Trinity Plus Funding Co., LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Taylor, Laura) (Entered: 10/10/2013)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 7/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          DECISION AND ORDER: For the reasons discussed above it is hereby ordered that the motion (Dkt. No. 1787) of the State of West Virginia for leave to file an amended complaint is granted. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 7/29/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(js) (Entered: 07/30/2013)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER re: (DE 1792 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG) GRANTING MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE OF RYAN A. KANE: It is hereby ordered that the Motion for Withdrawal of Appearance of Ryan A. Kane on behalf of Defendants JPMorgan Chase & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, and Bear, Stearns & Co., Inc. is granted (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 7/18/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(js) (Entered: 07/30/2013)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              DECISION AND ORDER: denying (1750) Motion to Dismiss in case. For the reasons discussed above, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion (Dkt. No. 1750) of defendants Transamerica Life Insurance Company and Transamerica Life Insurance and Annuity Company to dismiss the Second Amended Complaint is DENIED. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 7/9/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(js) (Entered: 07/10/2013)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE OF SONIA K. PFAFFENROTH: It is hereby ORDERED that the Motion for Withdrawal of Appearance of Sonia K. Pfaffenroth on behalf of Defendants Trinity Funding Co., LLC, Trinity Plus Funding Co., LLC, GE Funding Capital Market Services, Inc., and General Electric Capital Corp. (collectively, "GE/Trinity") is granted. Attorneys Craig Stewart, DouglasL. Wald, John A. Freedman, Laura Cofer Taylor, and Arpan Sura of the law firm Arnold & Porter LLP will continue to appear on behalf of GE/Trinity. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 7/8/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(js) (Entered: 07/08/2013)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 7/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  MOTION for Sonia K. Pfaffenroth to Withdraw as Attorney. Document filed by GE Funding Capital Market Services, Inc., General Electric Capital Corporation, Trinity Funding Co., LLC, Trinity Plus Funding Co., LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Taylor, Laura) (Entered: 07/02/2013)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Roland Gustaf Riopelle on behalf of Hinds County, Mississippi. New Address: Sercarz & Riopelle LLP, 810 Seventh Avenue, Suite 620, New York, New York, USA 10019, 212-586-4900. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 06/27/2013)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 393 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Joshua I. Barrett dated 6/11/2013 re: The State of West Virginia respectfully requests leave to move for leave to file a Second Amended Complaint in this action. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of Court is directed to enter into the public record of this action the letter above submitted to the Court by State of West Virginia. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 6/17/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(lmb) (Entered: 06/17/2013)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 392 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Joshua I. Barrett dated 6/17/2013 re: West Virginia respectfully requests that this Court grant West Virginia's request for leave to amend its complaint. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of Court is directed to enter into the public record of this action the letter above submitted to the Court by plaintiff West Virginia. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 6/17/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(lmb) (Entered: 06/17/2013)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Douglas L. Wald dated 6/13/2013 re: GE/Trinity respectfully requests that this Court deny plaintiff West Virginia's request for leave to amend its complaint. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of Court is directed to enter into the public record of this action the letter above submitted to the Court by defendant GE/Trinity. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 6/17/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(lmb) (Entered: 06/17/2013)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 5/31/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER FOR WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE: It is hereby ordered that the motion for withdrawal of the appearance of Daniel R. Sterrett is GRANTED; and the Court further directs the Clerk to remove Daniel R. Sterrett from the docket in the above noted cases. It is So Ordered (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 5/31/2013) (js) (Entered: 05/31/2013)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE: Now therefore, It is hereby stipulated and agreed, pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by and between Plaintiffs as listed in Exhibit A and Defendant First Southwest Company, subject to the Order of the Court, that Defendant First Southwest Company only is voluntarily dismissed from the Actions without prejudice, with the parties to bear their own attorneys' fees and costs. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 5/10/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(js) (Entered: 05/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, pursuant to Rule 41{a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by and between the undersigned attorneys for Plaintiff State of West Virginia, and Defendant Royal Bank of Canada, that any and all claims in the above-captioned action against Royal Bank of Canada are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 5/8/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(js) Modified on 5/8/2013 (js). (Entered: 05/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER: The parties are directed to consult with each other and provide a report to the Court on or before May 16, 2013, as to the status of discovery in this matter and any proposals for scheduling. The report may be in the form of a letter from a single party. If there are disagreements, more than one report may be sent. If the parties believe a conference with the Court is necessary, one may be requested. To the extent that the Department of Justice is affected by any proposal, the parties should consult with the appropriate attorney from that agency. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 5/2/2013) (rdz) (Entered: 05/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 5/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED; pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(l)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by and between the undersigned attorneys for Plaintiff State ofWest Virginia, and Defendant Royal Bank of Canada, that any and all claims in the above-captioned action against Royal Bank of Canada are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 5/2/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(js) (Entered: 05/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian David Waller on behalf of CDR Financial Products Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(Waller, Brian) (Entered: 04/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Change of Firm Name and E-Mail Addresses. Document filed by Plaintiff Class. (Simon, Bruce) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 3/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR ALL DEFENDANTS TO ANSWER THE THIRD CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT: that all Defendants shall have until and including May 3, 2013, to answer or otherwise respond to the Third Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 3/21/2013) (pl) (Entered: 03/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 3/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Megan E. Jones dated 3/15/2013 re: Class Plaintiff's respectfully request permission to file a "Corrected Third Amended Class Complaint" and can do so immediately if permission is granted. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter into the public record of this action the letter above submitted to the Court by Class Plaintiffs. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 3/19/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(rsh) (Entered: 03/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 3/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE: The Amended Motion of Swathi Bojedla, for admission practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned action is GRANTED (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 3/14/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(js) (Entered: 03/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 3/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: Swathi Bojedla to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 3/14/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(js) (Entered: 03/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 3/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  THIRD CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bank of America, Bear, Stearns & Co., Inc., CDR, GE Funding Capital Market Services, Inc., George K. Baum & Co., Investment Management Advisory Group, Inc., JP Morgan Chase & Co., National Westminster Bank Plc, Natixis Funding Corp.(f/k/a IXIS Funding Corp.), Natixis Funding Corp., Piper Jaffray & Co., Societe Generale SA, Sound Capital Management, Inc., UBS AG, Wachovia Bank N.A., Wells Fargo & Co., Inc., Winters & Co. Advisors, LLC, GE Trinity, GE Trinity Plus with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by City of Baltimore, Maryland, Bucks County Water And Sewer Authority, Central Bucks School District. (This document related to ALL ACTIONS.) (mro) (Entered: 03/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 3/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER: It is hereby ordered that the motion to withdraw Andrew S. Kingsdale as Counsel for Plaintiffs (Dkt. No. 1680) is hereby GRANTED. So OrderedFiled In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(js) (Entered: 03/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from David B. Tulchin dated 2/15/2013 re: Wells Fargo requests that the Court enter the enclosed order finally approving the settlement (originally filed as Docket No. 1732). Counsel for plaintiffs, Megan Jones of Hausfeld LLP, has authorized us to report that they join in this request. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of Court is directed to enter into the public record of this action the letter above submitted to the Court by Wells Fargo defendants. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 2/19/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(ft) (Entered: 02/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT ON WELLS FARGO SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT, Settling action as to Wells Fargo. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 2/19/13) (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Right to Appeal)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(dt) (Entered: 02/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 2/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero, from Gregory Asciolla, dated 2/6/2013, re: We represent Plaintiffs. Three colleagues, Hollis Salzman, Bernard Persky and William V. Reiss are no longer associated with this firm. Request that the Court relieve Ms. Salzman, Mr. Persky and Mr. Reiss as attorneys for Plaintiffs, and direct the Clerk to terminate their ECF noticing in Master Docket No. 08-CV-2516 (VM), and in the multidistrict file, In re Municipal Derivatives Antitrust Litigation, 08-md-1950 (VM). My Labaton Sucharow LLP colleagues and I will continue to represent Plaintiffs. ENDORSEMENT: Request GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the ECF notification attorneys Hollis Salzman, Bernard Persky and William V. Reiss in this case. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 2/7/2013) (ja) (Entered: 02/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Natixis Funding Corp..(Rubin, Howard) (Entered: 01/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Victor Sack on behalf of Transamerica Life Insurance Company Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(Sack, David) (Entered: 01/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 372 Filed: 12/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT ON JPMORGAN SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT: This Court has jurisdiction over the subject matter of this litigation. Terms capitalized in this Order and Final Judgment have the same meanings as those used in the Settlement Agreement. "Actions" means In re Municipal Derivatives Antitrust Litigation and each of the cases previously or later consolidated and/or included as part of MDL Docket No. 1950, Master Docket No. 08-2516 (VM) (GWG). The JPM Preliminary Approval Order outlined the form and manner by which the Class Plaintiffs would provide the Class with notice of the settlement, the fairness hearing, and related matters. The notice program included individual notice to members of the Class who could be identified through reasonable efforts, as well as the publication of a summary notice in The Wall Street Journal. Proof that mailing and publication complied with the JPM Preliminary Approval Order has been tiled with the Court. This notice program fully complied with Fed. R. Civ. P. 23 and the requirements of due process. It provided due and adequate notice to the Class. The settlement was attained following an extensive investigation of the facts. 1t resulted from vigorous arm's-length negotiations which were undertaken in good faith by counsel with significant experience litigating antitrust class actions. By order of this Court dated June 4, 2012 (Docket No. 1693), pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.23 and in light of the proposed settlement, the Court certified the following class for settlement purposes (the "JPM Settlement Class"): Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54, and finding no just reason for delay, the Court hereby directs the entry of final judgment as to Defendant JPMorgan. This Order shall become effective immediately. All other provisions as further set forth in this order (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 12/14/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(js) (Entered: 12/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 371 Filed: 12/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Paragraph One of the Order at Dkt. No. 1724 is replaced with the paragraph set forth here: 1. Class Plaintiffs' Counsel shall receive a total of $23,316,150.77 in attorneys' fees to be paid out of settlement funds funds created by two separate settlement agreements reached with (a) defendants JPMorgan Chase & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities, Inc. (n/k/a J.P. Morgan Securities LLC) and Bear Stearns & Co., Inc. (n/k/a/ J.P. Morgan Securities LLC) ("JPMorgan") and (b) defendants Wachovia Bank, N.A.,n/k/a Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., and Wells Fargo & Company ("Wachovia") (the "Settlements").The remainder of the order as set forth at Docket No. 1724 is unchanged. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 12/14/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(js) Modified on 12/14/2012 (js). (Entered: 12/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 12/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    Letter addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from David B. Tulchin dated 11/15/2012 re: Counsel for defendant write to provide additional background concerning the request made in Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Settlement and in the accompanying memorandum in support thereof filed yesterday that the fairness hearing on the proposed class action settlement between Wells Fargo and the class proceed as scheduled on December 14, 2012, but that the Court delay issuing any ruling as to whether the settlement should be approved until February 15, 2013 to allow for the 90-day notice period required by the Class Action Fairness Act of 2005 ("CAF A"), 28 U.S.C. §1715(d). Class plaintiffs do not oppose this request. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of Court is directed to enter into the public record of this action the letter above submitted to the Court by Wells Fargo Defendants Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(js) Modified on 12/14/2012 (js). (Entered: 12/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance. Document filed by CDR Financial Products. (Kell, Lashon) (Entered: 11/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance. Document filed by CDR Financial Products. (Beckler, Richard) (Entered: 11/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bradley Drew Simon on behalf of CDR, CDR Financial Products (Simon, Bradley) (Entered: 11/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Stewart Katz on behalf of CDR, CDR Financial Products (Katz, Adam) (Entered: 11/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 365 Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. Class Plaintiffs' Counsel shall receive a total of $24,572,500 in attorneys' fees to be paid out of settlement funds created by two separate settlement agreements reached with (a) defendants JPMorgan Chase & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities, Inc. (n/k/a J.P. Morgan Securities LLC) and Bear Stearns & Co., Inc. (n/k/a J.P. Morgan Securities LLC) ("JPMorgan") and (b) defendants Wachovia Bank, N.A., n/k/a Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., and Wells Fargo & Company ("Wachovia") (the "Settlements"). 2. Class Plaintiffs' Counsel shall be reimbursed $71,796.67 in costs and expenses reasonably incurred in the presentation and settlement of this litigation, to be paid out of the settlement funds created by the Settlements. 3. Class Plaintiffs' current Lead Counsel (consisting of Hausfeld LLP, Boies Schiller & Flexner, LLP, and Susman Godfrey, LLP) shall have the sole authority to allocate and distribute any attorneys' fees and expenses awarded pursuant to this Order from the Settlements in a manner which, in the opinion of Lead Counsel, fairly compensates the Class Plaintiffs' Counsel's firms for their services. 4. An incentive award of $40,000, to be paid equally out of settlement funds created by the Settlements ($120,000 from each Settlement), shall be paid to each of the following named Class Plaintiffs: the City of Baltimore, Maryland; the University of Mississippi Medical Center; the University of Southern Mississippi; the University of Mississippi; the Central Bucks School District; and the Bucks County Water & Sewer Authority. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 11/5/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(lmb) (Entered: 11/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 8/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                DECISION AND ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that, the Class Plaintiffs' motion for leave to amend the Second Amended Class Action Complaint, deemed contained in their March 5, 2012 letter (Docket No. 1678), is GRANTED. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 8/3/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(rjm) (Entered: 08/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Douglas L. Wald dated 6/25/2012 re: Counsel requests that this Court rule that Class Plaintiffs' proposed Third Consolidated Amended Complaint would be untimely with respect to claims against the GE Entities. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of Court is directed to enter into the public records of this action the letter above submitted to the Court by defendant GE Entities. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 6/26/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(ft) (Entered: 06/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Magda Jimenez Train dated 4/13/2012 re: Class Plaintiffs respectfully submit that this Court should grant Class Plaintiffs leave to file a motion for leave to amend or alternatively should simply grant leave to amend. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of Court is directed to enter into the public records of this action the letter above submitted to the Court by plaintiffs. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 6/27/2012) (ft) (Entered: 06/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Douglas L. Wald dated 4/13/2012 re: Counsel writes to inform the Court that Section 16(i) does not toll the limitations period with respect to claims against the GE Entities. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of Court is directed to enter into the public records of this action the letter above submitted to the Court by defendant GE Entities. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 6/26/2012) (ft) (Entered: 06/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 6/25/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Magda Jimenez Train dated 6/22/12 re: Counsel writes to supplement Class Plaintiffs' response to Your Honor's April 3 Order directing Class Plaintiffs to "address the extent of any applicability of 15 U.S.C. 16(i) to the Class Plaintiffs' proposes claims against the GE defendants." ENDORSEMENT: Defendant GE entities are directed to respond by 6-28-12, by letter not to exceed three (3) pages, to the matter set forth above by plaintiffs. No further correspondence on the issue will be considered. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 6/25/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(mro) (Entered: 06/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 4/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: Accordingly, it is hereby ordered that, by letter briefs not to exceed five (5) pages, to be submitted by April 13, 2012, Class Plaintiffs and the GE Defendants shall each address the extent of any applicability of 15 U.S.C. 16(i) to the Class Plaintiffs' proposed claims against the GE Defendants. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 4/3/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(js) (Entered: 04/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 3/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Douglas L. Wald dated 3/16/12 re: Counsel writes to reply to Class Plaintiffs' 3/15/12 letter to the Court regarding their request for leave to amend the Second Consolidated Amended Complaint to add the GE Entities as defendants. Counsel argues that the new claims against the GE Entities are now time barred. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of Court is directed to enter into the public record of this action the letter above submitted to the Court by defendant GE Entities. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 3/23/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(mro) Modified on 3/26/2012 (mro). (Entered: 03/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 3/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Magda Jimenez Train dated 3/19/12 re: Counsel for the Class Plaintiffs writes to respond to a new argument raised for the first time in Mr. Wald's March 16, 2008, reply letter. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of Court is directed to enter into the public record of this action the letter above submitted to the Court by Class Plaintiffs. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 3/23/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(mro) Modified on 3/26/2012 (mro). (Entered: 03/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Magda Jimenez Train dated 3/15/12 re: Counsel for the Class Plaintiffs submits that this Court should grant Class Plaintiffs leave to file a motion for leave to amend. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of Court is directed to enter into the public record of this action the letter above submitted to the Court by Class Plaintiffs. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 3/15/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(mro) Modified on 3/16/2012 (mro). (Entered: 03/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 3/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER CONCERNING RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT: GoldmanSachs need not respond to the Sacramento Municipal Utility Districts' Second Amended Complaint until Apri1 23, 2012. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 3/13/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG, 1:09-cv-10103-VM(ft) (Entered: 03/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 3/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Douglas L. Wald dated 3/6/2012 re: We are writing on behalf of GE Funding Capital Market Services, Inc. ("GE Funding") and Trinity Funding Co., LLC ("Trinity") in response to the letter submitted on March 5, 2012 by Class Plaintiffs seeking permission to move for leave to file a Third Amended Complaint that, inter alia, adds GE Funding and Trinity as defendants. ENDORSEMENT: Defendants GE Funding and Trinity herein are directed to respond by 3-14-12, by letter, not to exceed 3 pages, to the request of plaintiff, setting forth defendants good faith basis for objecting to the proposed amended complaint as it relates to these defendants. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 3/7/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(lmb) (Entered: 03/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 3/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Magda Jimenez Train dated 3/5/2012 re: Class Plaintiffs respectfully request leave to move for leave to file a Third Amended Complaint ("TAC") in this action. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of Court is directed to enter into the public record of this action the letter above submitted to the Court by plaintiffs. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 3/7/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(lmb) (Entered: 03/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER CONCERNING RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT: GoldmanSachs need not respond to the Sacramento Municipal Utility District Second Amended Complaint until 1/23/2012. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 12/14/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG, 1:09-cv-10103-VM(ft) (Entered: 12/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Robert Gerard Eisler on behalf of All Plaintiffs. New Address: Grant & Eisenhofer P.A., 123 Justison Street, Wilmington, DE, USA 19801, 302-622-7100. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(Eisler, Robert) (Entered: 11/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: re: (1628 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG) Endorsed Letter, The Court is not persuaded that the relief requested by the NJAG is warranted. Accordingly, the NJAG' s requests, set forth in her October 7, 2011 letter,(Docket No. 1628) are DENIED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 11/09/2011) (ama) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting (1634) Motion for LaShon K. Kell to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 11/7/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG(rjm) (Entered: 11/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Megan Jones dated 11/4/2011 re: Counsel request that the Court should deny each of the request set forth within. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of Court is directed to enter into the public record of this action the letter above submitted to the Court by plaintiffs. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 11/4/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG(jfe) (Entered: 11/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 10/26/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Joshua Rabinowitz dated 10/7/2011 re: The Attorney General of New Jersey request that the Court declare that the notice is unfair for the reasons set forth within. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of Court is directed to enter into the public record of this action the letter above submitted to the Court by the Attorney General of New Jersey. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 10/26/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG(jfe) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Alden L. Atkins dated 10/21/11 re: I write pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.4 to request that the Court relieve Ms. Stark as an attorney for First Southwest Company and direct the Clerk to terminate her ECF notice in the Hinds County file and in the multidistrict file, In re Municipal Derivatives Antitrust Litigation, 08-md-1950 (VM). ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 10/25/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG(rjm) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason Andrew Roth on behalf of Natixis Funding Corp., Natixis S.A., Natixis S.A.(f/k/a Ixis CIB, f/k/a CDC Finance-CDC IXIS) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG(Roth, Jason) (Entered: 10/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Natixis Funding Corp.(f/k/a IXIS Funding Corp.), Natixis Funding Corp..(Rubin, Howard) (Entered: 10/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 10/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying (1603) Motion for Modify Judge Gorenstein's September 27, 2011 Order in case 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG: The motion (Docket No. 1603) of Class Plaintiffs to Modify Judge Gorenstein's September 27, 2011 Order is DENIED. The Attorneys General are directed to amend the Final Notice Packet as indicated herein. In connection with settlements reached with any other defendants in this litigation, the Attorneys General are directed to conform subsequent settlement notice packets to the text of the Final Notice Packet insofar as the substantive provisions of such settlements are similar, and shall provide Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel with an opportunity to review those notice packets for such textual conformity prior to publication of such notice packets. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 10/20/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG (ab) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 10/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Withdrawal of Andrew J. Demko. Document filed by Citibank N.A., Citigroup Financial Products, Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Holdings, Inc., Citigroup Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Holding, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG(Lutz, Brian) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 10/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Seth Ard dated 10/13/2011 re: Counsel ask the Court to confirm that the deadline for filing the motion and supporting papers set forth in the 6/29/11 Order supersedes the deadline set by the 1/18/11 order, and thus Class plaintiffs' motion for final approval is due 10 days prior to the Fairness Hearing. ENDORSEMENT: Request GRANTED. The time for the filing of the motion and supporting papers for approval of the settlement herein remains as set forth in the Courts Order dated 6/29/11, which supersedes the date previously set. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 10/15/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG(jfe) Modified on 10/19/2011 (jfe). (Main Document 341 replaced on 10/19/2011) (jfe). (Entered: 10/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 10/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER CONCERNING RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT: GoldmanSachs need not respond to the SMUDSAC until 11/23/2011. Goldman Sachs Bank USA answer due 11/23/2011; Goldman Sachs Mitsui Marine Derivative Products, L.P. answer due 11/23/2011. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 10/13/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG, 1:09-cv-10103-VM(ft) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: Plaintiffs' Counsel shall receive a total of $1.55 million dollars from the Morgan Stanley Settlement Agreement (equaling $1,484,494.17 in expenses and costs, and legal fees of $65,505.83). Class Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel shall have authority to distribute any attorneys' fees and expenses awarded from the settlement in a manner which, in the opinion of Lead Counsel, fairly compensates the Plaintiffs' Counsel's firms for their services as described in the Declaration. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 10/6/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(ft) (Entered: 10/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 10/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Daniel R. Sterrett dated 8/15/2011 re: Counsel writes to respond to the letter submitted by Kenneth Schacter arguing that RBC should be dismissed from Jefferson's Ferry complaint. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of Court is directed to enter into the public record of this action the letter above submitted to the Court by plaintiff Active Retirement Community, Inc. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 10/3/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG(jfe) (Entered: 10/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: For the reasons set forth on this Order, the Clerk is directed to mark the motion docketed as #1573 as denied. Annexed hereto is the final version of the Notice Packet as approved by the Court. The Court finds that this revision discloses to the eligible counterparties "the nature of any remedies that may be available to them as putative class members in MDL No. 1950 and the attendant consequences of electing to opt in to the State Agreement" and that it does so "in clear, concise and neutral terms." (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 9/27/2011) (ab) (Entered: 09/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 9/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 268 Amended Complaint,,,,, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by GE Funding Capital Market Services, Inc., General Electric Capital Corporation, Trinity Funding Co. LLC, Trinity Plus Funding Co., LLC.(Stewart, Craig) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 335 Filed: 9/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 305 Motion to Dismiss THE COTCHETT COMPLAINTS. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion that the Court has deemed contained in defendant Royal Bank of Canada's ( "RBC") letter dated June 30, 2011 (Docket No. 1578) to dismiss the claims against RBC contained in the action Active Retirement Community, Inc. d/b/a Jefferson's Ferry v. Bank of America, N.A. et al., No. 08 Civ. 2516 (Docket No. 1245) (the "JFSAC") is DENIED; and it is further ORDERED that the motion ("Motion") (Docket No. 305, 08 MDL No. 1950) of defendants General Electric Capital Corporation; GE Funding Capital Market Services, Inc.; Trinity Funding Co., LLC; and Trinity Plus Funding Co., LLC (collectively, "GE/Trinity") to dismiss the claims against it contained in certain complaints in this and other related actions is GRANTED as to the following complaints in the following actions: (see order) and it is further ORDERED that GE/Trinity's Motion (Docket No. 305, 08 MDL No. 1950) to dismiss the claims against GE/Trinity contained in the JFSAC is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motions specified above. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 9/7/2011) (lmb) (Entered: 09/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 8/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from David Ellis dated 8/22/2011 re: Counsel respectfully request a 4 days extension until 8/26/11 to respond to this Court's 8/18/11 Order. ENDORSEMENT: Having considered the AG's letter of August 22, 2011. This request is granted. Both deadlines are extended by for business days. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 8/23/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG(jfe) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 8/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER CONCERNING RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED as follows: Goldman Sachs need not respond to the SMUDSAC until September 22, 2011. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 8/22/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:09-cv-10103-VM(jfe) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL: that the Goldman Sachs Defendants are voluntarily dismissed from these actions without prejudice, with the parties to bear their own attorneys' fees and costs. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 8/19/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al. (ft) (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 8/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: that plaintiffs shall submit their counter-proposal by 8/23/2011 and the Attorney General's Office may submit their own proposal by 8/26/2011. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 8/18/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG (ft) (Entered: 08/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 8/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER IN ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL (CTO-16) transferring this action from the United States District Court - that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, the actions listed on the attached schedule A and pending in the District of other than the SDNY, and the same hereby are, transferred to the Southern District of New York, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Victor Marrero, for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings with the actions pending in that district and listed on Schedule A. (Signed by MDL Panel on 8/18/11) (rjm) (Entered: 08/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Kenneth I. Schacter dated 8/3/11 re: Counsel for the defendant Royal Bank of Canada requests that the Court dismiss the complaint with respect to RBC, with prejudice, for the reasons stated in the June 30th letter. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of Court is directed to enter into the public record of this action the letter above submitted to the Court by defendant Royal Bank of Canada. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 8/10/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:10-cv-08273-VM(mro) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Daniel R. Sterrett dated 8/3/11 re: Counsel for the plaintiff Active Retirement Community, Inc. writes in response to the letter submitted by Kenneth Schacter, counsel for defendant Royal Bank of Canada. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of Court is directed to enter into the public record of this action the letter above submitted to the Court by plaintiff Active Retirement Community, Inc. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 8/10/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG(mro) Modified on 8/11/2011 (mro). (Entered: 08/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 7/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMO ENDORSEMENT re: Letter to Judge Victor Marrero from Vincent J. Esades re: We represent the Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority ("PREP A"), an absent class member in the above MDL litigation. We also serve as one of the firms representing Class Plaintiffs in the above case. We write regarding the Agreement Among the Attorneys General and Bank of America Corporation1 dated December 7, 2010 ("State Agreement"). ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of Court is directed to enter into the public record of this action the letter above submitted to the Court by absent class member Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 6/14/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG(pl) Modified on 7/28/2011 (pl). (Entered: 07/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 7/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, that the motion (Docket No. 1492) of Class Plaintiffs to Seek Relief Related to Select State Attorney Generals' [sic] Proposed Notice Packet is DENIED; and it is further, ORDERED that the parties are directed to confer and continue to work in good faith towards a negotiated resolution of outstanding issues relating to the text of the notice packet ("Notice Packet") to be sent to certain potential plaintiffs regarding the settlement agreement among the Attorneys General and defendant Bank of America,N.A. Within twenty-one days of the date of this Order, the parties shall submit an agreed-upon final draft of the Notice Packet to the Court for approval. In the event that the parties are unable to agree on a complete final text,they shall submit any remaining points of disagreement to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein for resolution. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 7/28/11) (pl) Modified on 7/28/2011 (pl). (Entered: 07/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 7/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECISION AND ORDER, granting in part and denying in part (08cv2516) 1213 Motion For the reasons discussed above, the Court reaffirms its directives as set forth in its Order dated March 1, 2010 {"March 1 Order"} {Docket No. 1253}; and it is further ORDERED that the motion of plaintiff City of Oakland and others {Docket No. 1213} is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, to the extent set forth in the March 1 Order. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 7/27/11) (pl) (Entered: 07/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41, by and among Plaintiffs in the Actions and Defendant Rabobank that Rabobank only is voluntarily dismissed from the Actions without prejudice, with the parties to bear their own attorneys' fees and costs. Rabobank Group, Rabobank Group, Rabobank Group, Rabobank Group, Rabobank Group, Rabobank Group, Rabobank Group, Rabobank Group, Rabobank Group, Rabobank Group, Rabobank Group, Rabobank Group, Rabobank Group, Rabobank Group, Rabobank Group, Rabobank Group, Rabobank Group and Rabobank Group terminated. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 7/26/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(mro) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 7/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINTS: It is hereby stipulated and agreed that Rabobank's time to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to a date to be determined by the Court, if necessary, following its consideration of the Stipulations. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 7/22/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(jfe) (Entered: 07/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 7/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL: It is hereby Stipulated and agreed, pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41, by and between Plaintiff and Defendant Rabobank that Rabobank only is voluntarily dismissed from the Actions without prejudice, with the parties to bear their on attorneys' fees and costs. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 7/22/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG, 1:10-cv-00769-VM(jfe) (Entered: 07/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 7/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL: It is hereby Stipulated and agreed, pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41, by and among Plaintiffs in the Actions and Defendant Rabobank that Rabobank only is voluntarily dismissed from the Actions without prejudice, with the parties to bear their on attorneys' fees and costs. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 7/22/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(jfe) (Entered: 07/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: Upon review of the above correspondence, the Court hereby advises the parties that, absent further determination by the Court, the Court's Order dated March1, 2011 regarding the BoA Settlement shall apply with equal force to the JPMC Settlement. In addition, in the interest of the efficient use of the Court's and the parties' resources, the parties shall postpone further litigation concerning the JPMC Settlement, and the AGs and JPMC shall not disseminate any notice of the JPMC Settlement to putative class members, pending the resolution of outstanding issues as to the BoA Agreement.A decision and order addressing (1) the Court's findings, reasoning and conclusions of law upon which the March 1 Order was founded, and ( 2} certain notice issues with respect to the BoA Settlement that have arisen before Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein, will be forthcoming. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 7/15/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG(js) Modified on 7/15/2011 (js). (Entered: 07/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 305 MOTION to Dismiss THE COTCHETT COMPLAINTS.. Document filed by GE Funding Capital Market Services, Inc., General Electric Capital Corporation, Trinity Funding Co., LLC, Trinity Plus Funding Co., LLC. (Stewart, Craig) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 7/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Thomas C. Rice dated 7/13/2011 re: Counsel for JPMorgan Chase & Co. writes to request an opportunity to respond if the Court allows the Plaintiffs to brief any issue with respect to the JPMorgan/States Agreement. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of Court is directed to enter into the public record of this action the letter above submitted to the Court by Defendant JPMorgan Chase. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 7/13/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG (ft) (Entered: 07/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Elinor R. Hoffmann dated 7/12/2011 re: The Working Group of 25 States ("the States") write in response to Interim Class Counsel's July 8, 2011 letter to Your Honor requesting that the Court stay the implementation of the States $92 million settlement with J.P. Morgan Chase & Co., dated July 7, 2011 (the "JPMC Settlement"). This latest settlement, a copy of which was attached to Class Counsel 's letter, was the third in the States' ongoing investigation of misconduct in the municipal bond derivatives markets. Pursuant to the settlements date, defendants will pay over $190 million into state funds established for restitution for government and not-for-profit entities.. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of Court is directed to enter into the public record of this action the letter above submitted to the Court by The State Attorney's General. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 7/12/2011) (mbe) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 7/7/2011, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bayerische Landesbank Girozentrale, CDR Financial Products, FGIC Capital Market Services, Inc., Investment Management Advisory Group, Inc., Natixis Funding Corp., Transamerica Life Insurance Company, Transamerica Life Insurance and Annuity Company, Trinity Plus Funding Co. LLC.Document filed by Utah Housing Corporation. (mro) (Entered: 07/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Billie J. Siddoway dated 7/1/2011 re: UHC respectfully request that the Court grant UHC leave to submit a second amended complaint or, in the alternative, grant UHC leave to file a motion to submit a second amended complaint. ENDORSEMENT: Request GRANTED. Plaintiff Utah Housing Corporation is authorized to file a Second Amended Complaint herein on or before 7/5/11. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 7/5/2011) (jfe) (Entered: 07/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (305 in 1:08-md-01950-VM) MOTION to Dismiss THE COTCHETT COMPLAINTS.. Document filed by City Of San Jose, City of Los Angeles, City of Redwood City, City of Richmond, City of Riverside, City of Stockton, County of Contra Costa, County of San Diego, County of San Mateo, County of Tulare, East Bay Municipal Utility District, Los Angeles World Airports, Redevelopment Agency of the City of San Francisco, Redevelopment Agency of the City of Stockton, Sacramento Municipal Utility District, Sacramento Suburban Water District, San Jose Redevelopment Agency, The Public Financing Authority of the City of Riverside, The Redevelopment Agency of the City of Riverside, Contra Costa County, Los Angeles Unified School District, Redevelopment Agency of the City and County of San Francisco, The San Jose Redevelopment Agency. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG(Sterrett, Daniel) (Entered: 06/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT: Plaintiff intends to file a Second Amended Complaint in this matter on or before 7/5/2011; This stipulation supersedes the stipulation filed on 5/19/2011 in 11-cv-1019. No Defendant need answer or otherwise respond in this matter until 8/15/2011. Plaintiff's opposition to any motion to dismiss the Second Amended Complaint shall not be due until 9/26/2011. Defendants' replies in support of any motion to dismiss the Second Amended Complaint shall not be due until 10/11/2011. (Responses due by 4/26/2011, Replies due by 10/11/2011.) (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 6/24/2011) (tro) (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 312 Filed: 6/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECISION AND ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the motion (Docket No. 1503) of defendant Royal Bank of Canada to dismiss the claims against it contained in certain complaints in this and other related actions is GRANTED as to the following complaints in the following actions (see Order). It is further ORDERED that RBC's Motion is DENIED as to the complaint in Active Retirement Community, Inc. d/b/a Jefferson's Ferry v. Bank of America, N.A. et al., 08-cv-2516 (Docket No. 1245) (the "Active Retirement Action") It is further ORDERED that, to the extent that RBC seeks to raise any further arguments as to why the claims asserted against it by plaintiff in the Active Retirement Action should be dismissed, RBC is directed to submit a letter to the Court not to exceed three pages on or before June 30, 2011. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 6/22/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG (ab) (Entered: 06/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 6/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Alden Lewis Atkins on behalf of First Southwest Company. New Address: VINSON & ELKINS LLP, 2200 PENNSYLVANIA AVE, NW, SUITE 500 WEST, WASHINGTON, DC, USA 20037, 202-639-6500. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG(Atkins, Alden) (Entered: 06/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 6/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PUBLIC ENTITY PLAINTIFFS' ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE: The withdrawal of appearance of Stuart G. Gross is hereby GRANTED; and the Court further directs the Clerk to remove Stuart G. Gross from the docket in the above noted cases. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 6/13/2011) (tro) (Entered: 06/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Richard William Beckler on behalf of CDR Financial Products. New Address: Bracewell & Giuliani LLP, 2000 K Street NW, Suite 500, Washington, DC, USA 20006, 202-828-5874. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG(Beckler, Richard) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 6/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert J. Mathias on behalf of Transamerica Life Insurance Company Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG(mbe) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINTS: It is hereby Stipulated and agreed that Rabobank may file its answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before 6/24/11. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 5/27/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(jfe) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 305 MOTION to Dismiss THE COTCHETT COMPLAINTS.. Document filed by GE Funding Capital Market Services, Inc., General Electric Capital Corporation, Trinity Funding Co. LLC, Trinity Funding Co., LLC, Trinity Plus Funding Co., LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Taylor, Laura) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss THE COTCHETT COMPLAINTS. Document filed by GE Funding Capital Market Services, Inc., General Electric Capital Corporation, Trinity Funding Co. LLC, Trinity Funding Co., LLC, Trinity Plus Funding Co., LLC.(Taylor, Laura) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Laura Cofer Taylor on behalf of GE Funding Capital Market Services, Inc., General Electric Capital Corporation, Trinity Funding Co. LLC, Trinity Funding Co., LLC, Trinity Plus Funding Co., LLC (Taylor, Laura) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Douglas Lewis Wald on behalf of GE Funding Capital Market Services, Inc., General Electric Capital Corporation, Trinity Funding Co. LLC, Trinity Funding Co., LLC, Trinity Plus Funding Co., LLC (Wald, Douglas) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sonia Kuester Pfaffenroth on behalf of GE Funding Capital Market Services, Inc., General Electric Capital Corporation, Trinity Funding Co. LLC, Trinity Funding Co., LLC, Trinity Plus Funding Co., LLC (Pfaffenroth, Sonia) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Arak Freedman on behalf of GE Funding Capital Market Services, Inc., General Electric Capital Corporation, Trinity Funding Co. LLC, Trinity Funding Co., LLC, Trinity Plus Funding Co., LLC (Freedman, John) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Craig A. Stewart on behalf of GE Funding Capital Market Services, Inc., General Electric Capital Corporation, Trinity Funding Co. LLC, Trinity Funding Co., LLC, Trinity Plus Funding Co., LLC (Stewart, Craig) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 5/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DOCUMENT REFERRED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, WITHOUT prejudice against the defendant(s) AIG Matched Funding Corp.,, Westdeutsche Landesbank, AIG Financial Products Corp.. Document filed by Utah Housing Corporation. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG(Siddoway, Billie) Modified on 5/31/2011 (dt). (Entered: 05/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 5/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of FILING OF A MOTION TO TRANSFER WITH THE JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION REGARDING MDL 1950 re SDCA action Kinsell, Newcomb & De Dios v. Bank of America, N.A, Case No.: 3:11-cv-00994-JAH-WMC. Document filed by Bank of America, Bank of America N.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Attachments)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG(Sullivan, Kevin) (Entered: 05/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 5/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER:The Court is in receipt of letters dated April 12, 2011 and May 4, 2011 from the Antitrust Division and the letter dated April 27, 2011 from the Public Entity Plaintiffs. Having considered the arguments therein and taking into account the need to fashion a stay that appropriately balances the parties' interests with those of the Government, the Court directs the Department of Justice to consider the entire list of 325 witnesses submitted by the Public Entity Plaintiffs for the purposes set forth in paragraph 2 of the Order dated March 22, 2011. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 5/9/2011) (jpo) (Entered: 05/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER CONCERNING TIME TO ANSWER FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT: It is hereby stipulated and agreed that Rabobank may file its answer to the complaint on or before 5/27/11. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 5/13/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG, 1:10-cv-00769-VM(jfe) (Entered: 05/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: As stated at a conference held on May 11, 2011, plaintiffs are directed to provide their comments to Judge Marrero on the proposed notice concerning the settlement agreement between Bank of America and the Attorneys General within one week of their receipt of the class list that is being provided by the New York State Attorney General. Defendants are to submit any response to those comments within one week thereafter. As part of their submission to Judge Marrero, plaintiffs are free to note that the undersigned declined to order certain discovery sought by plaintiffs (on burdensomeness, confidentiality and privilege grounds), and to argue that they require such discovery in order to submit additional comments on certain topic areas. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 5/13/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(jfe) (Entered: 05/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Michael O. Ware dated May 4, 2011 re: I write pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.4 to request thatthe Court relieve Mr. Cerullo as an attorney for Societe Generale and direct the Clerk to terminate his ECF noticing in the Hinds County file and in the multidistrict file, In re Municipal Derivates Antitrust Litigation, 08-md-1950 (VM). ENDORSEMENT: Request GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to remove attorney Norman Cerullo from the list of counsel for defendant Societe Generale and to terminate ECF noticing to him in this action. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 5/6/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG(jmi) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 5/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MODIFIED ORDER APPROVING CLASS PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANT MORGAN STANLEYS ADDENDUM TO SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT: The terms of the August 27, 2010 Settlement Agreement, as modified by the Addendum, are hereby preliminary approved as being fair, reasonable, and adequate to the Settlement Class, subject to the fairness hearing described in the Court;s January 14, 2011 Order Granting Preliminary approval. All Class Defendants that have not already provided the name and the last known addresses of their municipal derivative customers during the class period to Class Plaintiffs by May 16, 2011. Any disputes in connection with providing the information set forth in this paragraph shall be addressed to Judge Gorenstein. All deadlines in this Court's January 14, 2011 Order Granting Preliminary Approval of the Settlement between Class Plaintiffs and Morgan Stanley are hereby extended 60 calendar days. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 5/4/2011) (js) (Entered: 05/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECISION AND ORDER, granting (1096) Motion to Dismiss; denying (1101) Motion to Dismiss; denying (1104) Motion to Dismiss; granting (1112) Motion to Dismiss; granting (1114) Motion to Dismiss; granting (1120) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG. The parties are directed to confer and propose an agreed upon Case Management Plan in the form provided on the Court's website, such proposal to be submitted to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein for approval.Additional relief as set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 4/28/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG(pl) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Bank of America, Bank of America N.A., Merrill Lynch & Co., Merrill Lynch & Co. Inc., Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc.. Related document: 268 Amended Complaint,,,,, filed by Active Retirement Community, Inc..(Sullivan, Kevin) (Entered: 04/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 3/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alejandra De Urioste on behalf of Westdeutsche Landesbank Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG, 1:11-cv-01019-VM(De Urioste, Alejandra) (Entered: 03/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 3/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Drew Miller on behalf of Westdeutsche Landesbank Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG, 1:11-cv-01019-VM(Miller, James) (Entered: 03/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 3/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anthony Mathias Candido on behalf of Westdeutsche Landesbank Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG, 1:11-cv-01019-VM(Candido, Anthony) (Entered: 03/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark David Richardson on behalf of National Westminster Bank PLC, National Westminister Bank, PLC, National Westminster Bank, Plc, National Westministerbank PLC, National Westminster Bank PLC, National Westminster Bank, PLC, National Westminster Bank PLC, National Westminister Bank PLC, National Westminster Bank Plc, National Westminster Bank plc. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(Richardson, Mark) (Entered: 03/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Everett Swartz on behalf of National Westminster Bank PLC, National Westminister Bank, PLC, National Westminster Bank, Plc, National Westministerbank PLC, National Westminster Bank PLC, National Westminster Bank, PLC, National Westminster Bank PLC, National Westminister Bank PLC, National Westminster Bank Plc, National Westminster Bank plc. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(Swartz, Michael) (Entered: 03/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: The stay reflected in the May 27, 2010 Order remains in effect, with the following modifications: Plaintiffs and defendants in any of the Consolidated Cases may seek to depose on any topic related to this case of the approximately 100 individuals who are identified on the Department of Justice, Antitrust Division's ("The Division") List of Permitted Deponents. The Division shall provide the list to counsel for Plaintiffs and Defendants within two days of the entry of this Order. the list shall not be disclosed to anyone other than internal and external counsel for the parties. All other provisions as further set forth in this order. So Ordered (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 3/22/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(js) (Entered: 03/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM DECISION: The Government has made an application to extend the stay of discovery in this matter. Having considered the briefing and having applied the factors relevant to this determination the Government's application is granted in part and denied in part as set forth in a separate Order being issued today. So Ordered. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 3/22/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(js) (Entered: 03/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 3/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Timothy C. Houpt on behalf of Utah Housing Corporation Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG(Houpt, Timothy) (Entered: 03/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 3/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Billie J. Siddoway on behalf of Utah Housing Corporation Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG(Siddoway, Billie) (Entered: 03/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 3/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Douglas L. Wald dated 3/8/2011 re: I am writing on behalf of my clients, defendants GE Funding Capital Market Services, Inc. and Trinity Plus Funding Co., LLC, to comply with this Court's handwritten notation in the February 28, 2011 Stipulation and Order Extending Time to Respond to Complaint in Utah Housing Corp. v. CDR Financial Products, Inc., 11-cv-1019. Counsel for defendants Westdeutsche Landesbank, Transmerica Life Insurance Company, Transamerica Life Insurance and Annuity Company, and AIG Financial Products Corp. authorize me to state that they join in this letter on behalf of their clients. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of Court is directed to enter into the public record of this action the letter above submitted to the Court by defendants. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 3/10/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG(rjm) (Entered: 03/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 3/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sonia Kuester Pfaffenroth on behalf of GE Funding Capital Market Services, Inc., Trinity Funding Co., LLC, General Electric Capital Corporation, Trinity Funding Co. LLC, Trinity Plus Funding Co., LLC, General Electric Capital Corporation Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG, 1:10-cv-08273-VM(Pfaffenroth, Sonia) (Entered: 03/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 3/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Laura Cofer Taylor on behalf of GE Funding Capital Market Services, Inc., Trinity Funding Co., LLC, General Electric Capital Corporation, Trinity Funding Co. LLC, Trinity Plus Funding Co., LLC, General Electric Capital Corporation Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG, 1:10-cv-08273-VM(Taylor, Laura) (Entered: 03/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 3/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Douglas Lewis Wald on behalf of GE Funding Capital Market Services, Inc., Trinity Funding Co., LLC, General Electric Capital Corporation, Trinity Funding Co. LLC, Trinity Plus Funding Co., LLC, General Electric Capital Corporation Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG, 1:10-cv-08273-VM(Wald, Douglas) (Entered: 03/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 3/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Craig A. Stewart on behalf of GE Funding Capital Market Services, Inc., Trinity Funding Co., LLC, General Electric Capital Corporation, Trinity Funding Co. LLC, Trinity Plus Funding Co., LLC, General Electric Capital Corporation Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG, 1:10-cv-08273-VM(Stewart, Craig) (Entered: 03/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 3/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Arak Freedman on behalf of GE Funding Capital Market Services, Inc., Trinity Funding Co., LLC, General Electric Capital Corporation, Trinity Funding Co. LLC, Trinity Plus Funding Co., LLC, General Electric Capital Corporation Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG, 1:10-cv-08273-VM(Freedman, John) (Entered: 03/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Kevin R. Sullivan in Response to the Court's March 1, 2011 Order, as counsel of record for Bank of America, N.A. re: (1253 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG, 272 in 1:08-md-01950-VM) Order,,,. Document filed by Bank of America, Bank of America N.A.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG(Sullivan, Kevin) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER CONCERNING RESPONSES TO COMPLAINTS: Defendants need not respond to the New or Amended Complaints until 17 days after the date by which all of the Amended Complaints are filed upon filing of a further stipulation in accordance with the Court's ruling at the February 2, 2011 hearing; in the event that any Defendant files a Motion to Dismiss a New or Amended Complaint, opposition papers. This extension and briefing schedule is available to all named Defendants and Plaintiffs without further stipulation. This Stipulation shall not act to shorten the time for response of any Defendant that would otherwise have a longer time to respond to the New and Amended Complaints pursuant to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure or any applicable local rules, and shall be without prejudice to any Defendant's right to seek an additional extension of time to respond to the New and Amended Complaints. No defense of JPMorgan or any other Defendant to this action is prejudiced or waived by its submission of this stipulation. This Stipulation may be executed in separate counterparts, and counterparts may be executed in facsimile form, each of which shall be an original. So Ordered (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 3/1/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(js) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER CONCERNING RESPONSES TO CERTAIN PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINTS: Now therefore, it is hereby stipulated and agreed, by and between Plaintiffs and Goldman Sachs, subject to the approval of the Court, as follows: Goldman Sachs need not respond to any of the complaints until April 8, 2011. So Ordered (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 3/1/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG(js) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: It is hereby ordered that the motion of Interim Class Plaintiffs for an order enjoining defendant Bank of America from proceeding with certain provisions of a settlement agreement entered into in December 2010 with the Attorneys General of particular states is Denied; and it is further ordered ordered that BoA and all those acting in concert with it shall not disseminate, nor cause to be disseminated, any packet or written communication to any notice(s) or written communication(s) and (2) BoA files with the Court a declaration from its counsel affirming that Boa's consent to the State Agreement and its terms was no achieved as the result, in whole or in part, of threats, coercion, intimidation or other "strong-arm tactics" by the AGs of the Settling States or any other third party. All other provisions as set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 3/1/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG(js) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Elinor R. Hoffman dated 2/22/2011 re: Counsel writes to alert the Court that the Declarations and Memorandum inaccurately describe the State/BOA negotiations and settlement. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of Court is directed to enter into the public record of this action the letter above submitted to the Court by the State Attorneys General. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 2/28/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG(jfe) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT: It is hereby Stipulated and agreed that no Defendant need answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint until forty-five days from the date of entry by the MDL 1950 Court of an order coordinating the Utah Housing Corporation action with the MDL 1950 proceedings. Plaintiff's opposition to any motion to dismiss the Complaint filed by a Defendant shall not be due until thirty days after that date. Defendants' replies in support of any motion to dismiss the Complaint shall not be due until fifteen days after that date. This extension is available to all named Defendants without further stipulation with counsel for Plaintiff. This stipulation shall not act to shorten the time for response of any Defendant that would otherwise have a longer time to respond to the Complaint pursuant to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure or any applicable local rules, and shall be without prejudice to any Defendant's right to seek an additional extension of time to respond to the Complaint. No defense of GE/Trinity or any other Defendant to this action is prejudiced or waived by its submission of this Stipulation. No rights or claims of Utah Housing Corporation or any other Plaintiff to an MDL 1950 action is prejudiced or waived by this Stipulation, including, but not limited to, any rights of Utah Housing Corporation to file an amended complaint under any applicable federal or local rules. ENDORSEMENT: No new motion to dismiss shall be filed without a prior showing of cause why the grounds asserted therefor have not been addressed by the Court's previous rulings herein. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 2/28/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG, 1:11-cv-01019-VM(jfe) Modified on 3/4/2011 (jfe). (Entered: 02/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: Attorney Kirsten E. Schubert for Piper Jaffray & Co.,Kirsten E. Schubert for Piper Jaffray & Co. admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 2/28/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(jfe) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 2/23/2011, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 246 Amended Complaint against Assured Guaranty US Holdings, Inc., Bank of America N.A., Bayerische Landesbank Girozentrale, CDR Financial Products, Citibank N.A., Citigroup Financial Products, Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Holding, Inc., Dexia S.A., Financial Security Assurance, Inc., First Southwest Company, GE Funding Capital Market Services, Inc., General Electric Capital Corporation, George K. Baum & Co., Goldman Sachs Bank USA, Goldman Sachs Mitsui Marine Derivative Products, L.P., Investment Management Advisory Group, Inc., JP Morgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Securities, Inc., MBIA Inc., Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc., Morgan Stanley, National Westminster Bank PLC, Natixis Funding Corp.(f/k/a IXIS Funding Corp.), Natixis S.A.(f/k/a Ixis CIB, f/k/a CDC Finance-CDC IXIS), PFM Asset Management LLC, PFM Investment, LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., Rabobank Group, Royal Bank of Canada, Societe Generale SA, Sound Capital Management, Inc., The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Trinity Funding Co. LLC, Trinity Plus Funding Co., LLC, UBS AG, UBS Financial Services Inc., UBS Securities, LLC, Wachovia Bank N.A., Wells Fargo & Co., Inc., Winters & Co. Advisors, LLC.Document filed by Active Retirement Community, Inc. Related document: 246 Amended Complaint filed by Active Retirement Community, Inc. ***This document relates to 08-cv-2516. (Attachments: # 1 part 2, # 2 part 3)(mro) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: Attorney F. Matthew Ralph for Piper Jaffray & Co.,F. Matthew Ralph for Piper Jaffray & Co. admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 2/28/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(jfe) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 2/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by J David Jackson on behalf of Piper Jaffray & Co. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Jackson, J) (Entered: 02/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 2/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by J David Jackson on behalf of Piper Jaffray & Co. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Serivce)(Jackson, J) (Entered: 02/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 264 Filed: 2/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps) (Entered: 02/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 2/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER IN ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL (CTO-15) transferring this action from the United States District Court - that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, the actions listed on the attached schedule A and pending in the District of other than the SDNY, and the same hereby are, transferred to the Southern District of New York, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Victor Marrero, for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings with the actions pending in that district and listed on Schedule A. (Signed by MDL Panel on 2/15/2011) (rjm) (Entered: 02/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 2/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by J David Jackson on behalf of Piper Jaffray & Co. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Jackson, J) (Entered: 02/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 2/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by J David Jackson on behalf of Piper Jaffray & Co. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Jackson, J) (Entered: 02/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 2/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter from Patricia L. Jannaco dated 1/31/11 re: The United States Department of Justice Antitrust Division has moved to extend the terms of an order to stay discovery and a protective order; We noticed that these filings have not been entered on the docket although they have been stamped as Received by the Clerk's office. Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG(mro) (Entered: 02/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (1160) Motion to Seal Document in case 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG. ENDORSEMENT: Granted without objection. So Ordered. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 2/2/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(jfe) (Entered: 02/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 2/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER IN ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL (CTO-14) transferring this action from the United States District Court - that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, the actions listed on the attached schedule A and pending in the District of other than the SDNY, and the same hereby are, transferred to the Southern District of New York, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Victor Marrero, for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings with the actions pending in that district and listed on Schedule A. (Signed by MDL Panel on 2/1/2011) (rjm) (Entered: 02/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (1161) Motion to Withdraw in case 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 2/2/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(jfe) (Entered: 02/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Arun Subramanian dated 1/19/11 re: counsel for plaintiff writes that pursuant to the Court's endorsement of today's date, class plaintiffs will be submitting to the Court tomorrow: (I) a notice of motion. (2) a brief, (3) a supporting declaration of Michael Hausfeld and (4) a proposed order. The declaration discusses in detail confidential settlement negotiations with the Bank of America and has attached exhibits that reflect communications in furtherance of those negotiations. Class plaintiffs request that these portions of the declaration and associated exhibits be filed under seal. ENDORSEMENT: The portions of the declaration and briefs referred to above may be filed under seal. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 1/20/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG(pl) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER, that 1. Defendants need not respond to the First Amended Complaint on January 21, 2011. Defendants need not respond to the First Amended Complaint thereafter as long as the Court grants leave for Plaintiff to file its Second Amended Complaint. Dated: January 19, 2011. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 1/19/11). ( As instructed by chambers this order will be docketed in 08md1950 & 08cv2516 only). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG(pl) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER IN ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL (CTO-13) transferring this action from the United States District Court - that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, the actions listed on the attached schedule A and pending in the District of other than the SDNY, and the same hereby are, transferred to the Southern District of New York, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Victor Marrero, for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings with the actions pending in that district and listed on Schedule A. (Signed by MDL Panel on 1/19/11) (rjm) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: A conference to discuss the Government's request for an extension of the stay and the plaintiffs' request to amend certain complaints will be held on February 2, 2011, at 4:00 p.m. in Courtroom 17-A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. Only parties that submitted papers to the Court will be heard at the conference. No other party is required to attend. Parties wishing to attend by telephone shall comply with the procedures outlines in the July 30, 2010 Order. The stay described in the may 27, 2010 Order shall remain in place until the disposition of the current application for an extension. So Ordered (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 1/18/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG(js) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 1/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER. The parties are directed to confer and submit to the Court by January 18, 2011 a summary of the issues the parties believe are in dispute and will require briefing, as well as a proposed schedule for briefing on Class Counsel's anticipated motion; and further it is ORDERED that the AG's shall be permitted to intervene in this action solely for the limited purpose of submitting briefing on the issues presented by Class Counsel's proposed motion. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 1/10/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG(rjm) Modified on 1/28/2011 (rjm). (Entered: 01/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 12/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William Perry Brandt on behalf of George K. Baum & Co. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Brandt, William) (Entered: 12/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 12/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Calderon Javillonar on behalf of George K. Baum & Co. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Javillonar, Christopher) (Entered: 12/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 12/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FILING ERROR - WRONG PDF FILE ASSOCIATED WITH DOCKET ENTRY - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Calderon Javillonar on behalf of George K. Baum & Co. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Javillonar, Christopher) Modified on 1/5/2011 (lb). (Entered: 12/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 12/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Bank of America N.A., Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc.. Related document: 246 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,, filed by Active Retirement Community, Inc..(Sullivan, Kevin) (Entered: 12/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Woodwardx on behalf of All Plaintiffs, Bucks County Water And Sewer Authority, Central Bucks School District, City Of San Jose, City of Baltimore, Maryland, City of Fresno, California, City of Los Angeles, City of Oakland, City of Redwood City, City of Richmond, City of Riverside, City of Stockton, County of Alameda, County of Alameda, California, County of Contra Costa, County of San Diego, County of San Mateo, County of Tulare, East Bay Municipal Utility District, Fairfax County, Virginia, Fresno County Financing Authority, Haywood County, Tennessee, Hinds County, Mississippi, Los Angeles World Airports, Mayor and City Counsel of Baltimore, Darrell V. McGraw, Jr, Mississippi Department of Transportation, Redevelopment Agency of the City of San Francisco, Redevelopment Agency of the City of Stockton, Sacramento Municipal Utility District, Sacramento Suburban Water District, San Jose Redevelopment Agency, State of Mississippi, State of West Virginia, The Public Financing Authority of the City of Riverside, The Redevelopment Agency of the City of Riverside, University of Mississippi, University of Mississippi Medical Center, University of Southern Mississippi, Active Retirement Community, Inc., Berkeley County, South Carolina, Charleston County School District, South Carolina, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Fall River, Massachusetts, Contra Costa County, Plaintiff Class, Redevelopment Agency of the City and County of San Francisco, State of West Virginia, The San Jose Redevelopment Agency Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG(jfe) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 12/8/2010, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 33 Amended Complaint,,,, against AIG Financial Products Corp., AIG Matched Funding Corp., AIG Sunamerica Life Assurance Co., Assured Guaranty US Holdings, Inc., Bank of America, Bank of America N.A., Bayerische Landesbank Girozentrale, Bear Sterns Companies, Inc., Bear, Stearns & Co., Inc., CDR, CDR Financial Products, Cain Brothers & Co., LLC, Citibank N.A., Citigroup Financial Products, Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Holding, Inc., Dexia S.A., Feld Winters Financial LLC, Financial Guaranty Insurance Company, Financial Security Assurance Holdings, Ltd., Financial Security Assurance, Inc., First Southwest Company, GE Funding Capital Market Services, Inc., General Electric Capital Corporation, Genworth Financial Inc., Genworth Financial Investment Management, LLC, George K. Baum & Co., Goldman Sachs Bank USA, Goldman Sachs Mitsui Marine Derivative Products, L.P., Investment Management Advisory Group, Inc., JP Morgan Chase & Co., JP Morgan Chase Bank, JPMorgan Securities, Inc., Kinsell Newcomb & DE Dios, Inc., Kinsell Newcomb & De Dios Inc., Lehman Brothers Inc., MBIA Inc., Merrill Lynch & Co., Merrill Lynch & Co. Inc., Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc., Mesirow Financial, Morgan Keegan & Co., Inc., Morgan Stanley, Municipal Government Investors Corp., National Westminster Bank PLC, National Westminster Bank Plc, Natixis Funding Corp.(f/k/a IXIS Funding Corp.), Natixis Funding Corp., Natixis S.A.(f/k/a Ixis CIB, f/k/a CDC Finance-CDC IXIS), Natixis S.A., PFM Asset Management LLC, PFM Investment, LLC, Packerkiss Securities, Inc., Piper Jaffray & Co., Rabobank Group, Royal Bank of Canada, Shockley Financial Corp., Societe Generale SA, Sound Capital Management, Inc., SunAmerica Life Assurance Co., Syncora Guarantee Inc., Syncora Holdings Ltd., The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Transamerica Occidental Life Insurance Company, Trinity Funding Co. LLC, Trinity Funding Co., LLC, Trinity Plus Funding Co., LLC, UBS AG, UBS Financial Services Inc., UBS Securities, UBS Securities, LLC, Wachovia Bank N.A., Wells Fargo & Co., Inc., Winters & Co. Advisors, LLC, XL Asset Funding Co. I LLC, XL Asset Funding Company LLC, XL Capital Ltd.(a Bermuda Corporation), XL Capital Ltd., XL Life Insurance & Annuity, Inc..Document filed by Active Retirement Community, Inc.. Related document: 33 Amended Complaint,,,, filed by State of Mississippi, Central Bucks School District, Fairfax County, Virginia, Bucks County Water And Sewer Authority, City of Baltimore, Maryland.(jfe) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 11/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER IN ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL (CTO-12) transferring this action from the United States District Court - that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, the actions listed on the attached schedule A and pending in the District of other than the SDNY, and the same hereby are, transferred to the Southern District of New York, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Victor Marrero, for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings with the actions pending in that district and listed on Schedule A. (Signed by MDL Panel on 11/2/10) (rjm) (Entered: 11/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 10/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL, Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiff Sacramento Municipal Utility District only, hereby voluntarily dismisses, with prejudice, its complaint against defendants Assured Guaranty Municipal Corp. (f/k/a Financial Security Assurance Inc.) and Assured Guaranty US Holdings, Inc. only. Each party shall bear its own costs. Assured Guaranty US Holdings, Inc. terminated. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 10/29/2010) (lnl) (Entered: 10/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 10/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (1120 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG) MOTION to Dismiss the State of West Virginia's First Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Transamerica Life Insurance Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM -GWG(Gill, Anthony) (Entered: 10/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Withdrawl of Counsel of Joseph F. Wayland. Document filed by Bear, Stearns & Co., Inc., JP Morgan Chase & Co., JP Morgan Chase & Co., JP Morgan Chase & Co., Inc., JPMorgan Securities, Inc., Bear Stearns & Co. Inc., Bear, Stearns & Co., Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities, Inc., JPMorgan Chase & Co., J.P. Morgan Chase & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities, Inc., Bear Stearns & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities Inc., JPMorgan Chase & Co, Bear, Stearns & Co., Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(Zelig, Peri) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sonia Kuester Pfaffenroth on behalf of GE Funding Capital Market Services, Inc. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(Pfaffenroth, Sonia) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas C. Rice on behalf of Bear, Stearns & Co., Inc., JP Morgan Chase & Co., JP Morgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Securities, Inc., Bear, Stearns & Co., Inc. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(Rice, Thomas) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter Coyne Thomas on behalf of Bear, Stearns & Co., Inc., JP Morgan Chase & Co., JP Morgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Securities, Inc., Bear, Stearns & Co., Inc. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(Thomas, Peter) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher B. Hall on behalf of State of West Virginia Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(tro) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Douglas Lewis Wald on behalf of GE Funding Capital Market Services, Inc. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(Wald, Douglas) (Entered: 09/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 8/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Arak Freedman on behalf of GE Funding Capital Market Services, Inc. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(Freedman, John) (Entered: 08/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 8/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Craig A. Stewart on behalf of GE Funding Capital Market Services, Inc. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(Stewart, Craig) (Entered: 08/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 8/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Laura Cofer Taylor on behalf of GE Funding Capital Market Services, Inc. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(Taylor, Laura) (Entered: 08/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. General Electric Company Document filed by GE Funding Capital Market Services, Inc..Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(Boccanfuso, Anthony) Modified on 8/24/2010 (rdz). (Entered: 08/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (1114 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG, 231 in 1:08-md-01950-VM) MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by GE Funding Capital Market Services, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(Boccanfuso, Anthony) (Entered: 08/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by GE Funding Capital Market Services, Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(Boccanfuso, Anthony) (Entered: 08/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Morgan Stanley. Related document: 212 Amended Complaint,,,, filed by State of West Virginia.(Goldfein, Shepard) (Entered: 08/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William G. Caldes on behalf of The San Jose Redevelopment Agency, Mayor and City Counsel of Baltimore, Washington County, Tennessee, Redevelopment Agency of the City and County of San Francisco, City of Redwood City, Public Financing Authority of the City of Stockton, Redevelopment Agency of the City of Stockton, Sacramento Municipal Utility District, Charleston County School, District South Carolina, City of Fall River, Massachusetts, Fairfax County, Virginia, State of Mississippi, County of Contra Costa, County of San Mateo, All Plaintiffs, Bucks County Water And Sewer Authority, Central Bucks School District, City of Baltimore, Maryland, City of Fresno, California, City of Los Angeles, City of Oakland, City of Riverside, City of Stockton, County of Alameda, County of Alameda, California, County of San Diego, County of Tulare, Fresno County Financing Authority, Haywood County, Tennessee, Hinds County, Mississippi, Los Angeles World Airports, Mayor and City Counsel of Baltimore, Darrell V. McGraw, Jr, Mississippi Department of Transportation, Sacramento Suburban Water District, State of West Virginia, The Public Financing Authority of the City of Riverside, The Redevelopment Agency of the City of Riverside, University of Mississippi, University of Mississippi Medical Center, University of Southern Mississippi, City of Richmond, Sacramento Municipal Utility District, East Bay Municipal Utility District, Central Buck School District, City of Oakland, California, Berkeley County, South Carolina, Charleston County School District, South Carolina, City Of San Jose, City of Chicago, Illinois, Contra Costa County, Plaintiff Class, State of West Virginia, Los Angeles World Airports, Haywood County, Tennessee, Darrell V. McGraw, Jr, Central Bucks School District. Entered as Doc. No. 229 in Case No. 08md1950. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(rjm) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eugene A. Spector on behalf of City Of San Jose, The San Jose Redevelopment Agency, Mayor and City Counsel of Baltimore, Washington County, Tennessee, Redevelopment Agency of the City and County of San Francisco, City of Redwood City, Public Financing Authority of the City of Stockton, Redevelopment Agency of the City of Stockton, Sacramento Municipal Utility District, Charleston County School, District South Carolina, City of Fall River, Massachusetts, Fairfax County, Virginia, State of Mississippi, County of Contra Costa, County of San Mateo, Bucks County Water And Sewer Authority, Central Bucks School District, City of Baltimore, Maryland, City of Fresno, California, City of Los Angeles, City of Oakland, City of Riverside, City of Stockton, County of Alameda, County of Alameda, California, County of San Diego, County of Tulare, Fresno County Financing Authority, Haywood County, Tennessee, Hinds County, Mississippi, Los Angeles World Airports, Mayor and City Counsel of Baltimore, Darrell V. McGraw, Jr, Mississippi Department of Transportation, Sacramento Suburban Water District, State of West Virginia, The Public Financing Authority of the City of Riverside, The Redevelopment Agency of the City of Riverside, University of Mississippi, University of Mississippi Medical Center, University of Southern Mississippi, City of Richmond, Sacramento Municipal Utility District, East Bay Municipal Utility District, Central Buck School District, City of Oakland, California, Berkeley County, South Carolina, Charleston County School District, South Carolina, City of Chicago, Illinois, Contra Costa County, Plaintiff Class, State of West Virginia, Los Angeles World Airports, Haywood County, Tennessee, Darrell V. McGraw, Jr, Central Bucks School District Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(rjm) (rjm). (Entered: 08/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Morgan Stanley.(Goldfein, Shepard) (Entered: 08/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER. A conference to discuss the discovery dispute raised in the letter from Seth Ard dated July 21, 2010, will be held on August 5, 2010, at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 17-A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. Only parties that submitted letters to the Court will be heard at the conference. No other party is required to attend. (Conference set for 8/5/2010 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 17A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 7/30/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(rjm) (Entered: 08/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER. The Court is in receipt of a letter dated July 20, 2010, from Mr. Stuart Gross. Mr. Gross should make all efforts appropriate to confer with other counsel regarding the requested relief as required by paragraph 2.A of this Court's Individual Practices. Once he has done so, and if no resolution has been reached, he has leave to make an appropriate motion. The pre-motion conference requirement for the motion is waived. Briefing on the motion shall be in accordance with paragraph 2.B of this Court's Individual Practices. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 7/21/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(rjm) (Entered: 07/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 7/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER CONCERNING RESPONSES TO THE STATE OF WEST VIRGINIA'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. No defendant need respond to the West Virginia First Amended Complaint in this action before August 23, 2010; Plaintiff West Virginia shall respond to any motion to dismiss on or before October 7, 2010; Any reply in support of a motion to dismiss shall be served on or before October 28, 2010, and as further set forth. (Responses due by 10/7/2010) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 7/16/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG, 1:10-cv-00769-VM(rjm) (Entered: 07/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 7/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc., Bank of America, Bank of America N.A., Merrill Lynch & Co. Inc., Merrill Lynch & Co.. Related document: 217 Amended Complaint,,,, filed by City of Los Angeles.(Sullivan, Kevin) (Entered: 07/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 7/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER. A conference will be held regarding the various proposals for a protective order on Thursday, July 22, 2010, at 3:30 p.m. in Courtroom 17-A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. Only parties that submitted letters to the Court will be heard at the conference. No other party is required to attend. (Conference set for 7/22/2010 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 17A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 7/15/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(rjm) (Entered: 07/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED ANSWER to (129 in 1:08-md-01950-VM) Amended Complaint,,,, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Bank of America, Bank of America N.A.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(Sullivan, Kevin) (Entered: 07/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 6/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT (Jury Trial Demanded) against PFM Investment, LLC, Citigroup Global Markets Holding, Inc., Citibank N.A., Citigroup Financial Products, Inc., Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc., UBS Securities, LLC, JPMorgan Securities, Inc., MBIA Inc., Rabobank Group, Assured Guaranty US Holdings, Inc., Dexia S.A., Natixis S.A.(f/k/a Ixis CIB, f/k/a CDC Finance-CDC IXIS), PFM Asset Management LLC, Bank of America N.A., CDR Financial Products, Financial Security Assurance, Inc., First Southwest Company, George K. Baum & Co., Investment Management Advisory Group, Inc., JP Morgan Chase & Co., Morgan Stanley, Piper Jaffray & Co., Societe Generale SA, Sound Capital Management, Inc., UBS AG, Wachovia Bank N.A., The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Goldman Sachs Mitsui Marine Derivative Products, L.P., Goldman Sachs Bank USA, UBS Financial Services Inc., Wells Fargo & Co., Inc., Winters & Co. Advisors, LLC, Natixis Funding Corp.(f/k/a IXIS Funding Corp.), National Westminster Bank Plc, Bayerische Landesbank Girozentrale. Document filed by Contra Costa County. Relates to 08-2516.(rjm) (Entered: 07/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 6/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT (Jury Trial Demanded) against PFM Investment, LLC, Citigroup Global Markets Holding, Inc., Citibank N.A., Citigroup Financial Products, Inc., Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc., UBS Securities, LLC, JPMorgan Securities, Inc., MBIA Inc., Rabobank Group, Assured Guaranty US Holdings, Inc., Dexia S.A., Natixis S.A.(f/k/a Ixis CIB, f/k/a CDC Finance-CDC IXIS), PFM Asset Management LLC, Bank of America N.A., CDR Financial Products, Financial Security Assurance, Inc., First Southwest Company, George K. Baum & Co., Investment Management Advisory Group, Inc., JP Morgan Chase & Co., Morgan Stanley, Piper Jaffray & Co., Societe Generale SA, Sound Capital Management, Inc., UBS AG, Wachovia Bank N.A., The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Goldman Sachs Mitsui Marine Derivative Products, L.P., Goldman Sachs Bank USA, UBS Financial Services Inc., Wells Fargo & Co., Inc., Winters & Co. Advisors, LLC, Natixis Funding Corp.(f/k/a IXIS Funding Corp.), National Westminster Bank Plc, Bayerische Landesbank Girozentrale. Document filed by County of San Mateo. Relates to 08-2516.(rjm) (Entered: 07/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 6/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT (Jury Trial Demanded) against PFM Investment, LLC, Citigroup Global Markets Holding, Inc., Citibank N.A., Citigroup Financial Products, Inc., Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc., UBS Securities, LLC, JPMorgan Securities, Inc., MBIA Inc., Rabobank Group, Assured Guaranty US Holdings, Inc., Dexia S.A., Natixis S.A.(f/k/a Ixis CIB, f/k/a CDC Finance-CDC IXIS), PFM Asset Management LLC, Bank of America N.A., CDR Financial Products, Financial Security Assurance, Inc., First Southwest Company, George K. Baum & Co., Investment Management Advisory Group, Inc., JP Morgan Chase & Co., Morgan Stanley, Piper Jaffray & Co., Societe Generale SA, Sound Capital Management, Inc., UBS AG, Wachovia Bank N.A., The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Goldman Sachs Mitsui Marine Derivative Products, L.P., Goldman Sachs Bank USA, UBS Financial Services Inc., Wells Fargo & Co., Inc., Winters & Co. Advisors, LLC, Natixis Funding Corp.(f/k/a IXIS Funding Corp.), National Westminster Bank Plc, Bayerische Landesbank Girozentrale. Document filed by County of San Diego. Relates to 08-2516.(rjm) (Entered: 07/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 6/24/2010, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (Jury Trial Demanded) against PFM Investment, LLC, Citigroup Global Markets Holding, Inc., Citibank N.A., Citigroup Financial Products, Inc., Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc., UBS Securities, LLC, JPMorgan Securities, Inc., MBIA Inc., Rabobank Group, Assured Guaranty US Holdings, Inc., Dexia S.A., Natixis S.A.(f/k/a Ixis CIB, f/k/a CDC Finance-CDC IXIS), PFM Asset Management LLC, Bank of America N.A., CDR Financial Products, Financial Security Assurance, Inc., First Southwest Company, George K. Baum & Co., Investment Management Advisory Group, Inc., JP Morgan Chase & Co., Morgan Stanley, Piper Jaffray & Co., Societe Generale SA, Sound Capital Management, Inc., UBS AG, Wachovia Bank N.A., The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Goldman Sachs Mitsui Marine Derivative Products, L.P., Goldman Sachs Bank USA, UBS Financial Services Inc., Wells Fargo & Co., Inc., Winters & Co. Advisors, LLC, Natixis Funding Corp.(f/k/a IXIS Funding Corp.), National Westminster Bank Plc, Bayerische Landesbank Girozentrale. Document filed by City of Los Angeles. Relates to 08-2516.(rjm) (Entered: 07/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 216 Filed: 6/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT (Jury Trial Demanded) against PFM Investment, LLC, Citigroup Global Markets Holding, Inc., Citibank N.A., Citigroup Financial Products, Inc., Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc., UBS Securities, LLC, JPMorgan Securities, Inc., MBIA Inc., Rabobank Group, Assured Guaranty US Holdings, Inc., Dexia S.A., Natixis S.A.(f/k/a Ixis CIB, f/k/a CDC Finance-CDC IXIS), PFM Asset Management LLC, Bank of America N.A., CDR Financial Products, Financial Security Assurance, Inc., First Southwest Company, George K. Baum & Co., Investment Management Advisory Group, Inc., JP Morgan Chase & Co., Morgan Stanley, Piper Jaffray & Co., Societe Generale SA, Sound Capital Management, Inc., UBS AG, Wachovia Bank N.A., The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Goldman Sachs Mitsui Marine Derivative Products, L.P., Goldman Sachs Bank USA, UBS Financial Services Inc., Wells Fargo & Co., Inc., Winters & Co. Advisors, LLC, Natixis Funding Corp.(f/k/a IXIS Funding Corp.), National Westminster Bank Plc, Bayerische Landesbank Girozentrale. Document filed by City of Stockton. Relates to 08-2516.(rjm) (Entered: 07/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gustavo Manuel Gonzalez on behalf of Natixis S.A., Natixis Funding Corp., Natixis S.A.(f/k/a Ixis CIB, f/k/a CDC Finance-CDC IXIS), Natixis Funding Corp.(f/k/a IXIS Funding Corp.) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(Gonzalez, Gustavo) (Entered: 06/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 6/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Morgan Stanley.(Goldfein, Shepard) (Entered: 06/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 6/25/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING MORVILLO, ABRAMOWITZ, GRAND, IASON, ANELLO & BOHRER, P.C.'S MOTION FOR CHANGE OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT MERRILL LYNCH & CO., INC. The Motion to Substitute Attorney (Doc. No. 792 in Case No. 08-2516) is Granted. Morvillo, Abramowitz, Grand, Iason, Anello & Bohrer, P.C. may withdraw and hereby does withdraw from the representation of Defendant Merrill Lynch, and King & Spalding LLP is substituted as counsel for Merrill Lynch; and the Court further directs the Clerk to remove Edward M. Spiro and Sarah Jean North of Morvillo, Abramowitz from the Court's docket in the entitled matters. granting (792) Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Kevin R. Sullivan for Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc. Attorney Sarah Jean North and Edward M. Spiro terminated in case 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 6/24/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(rjm) (Entered: 06/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (Jury Trial Demanded) against Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc., UBS Securities, LLC, UBS Securities, JPMorgan Securities, Inc., MBIA Inc., Rabobank Group, Transamerica Occidental Life Insurance Company, Assured Guaranty US Holdings, Inc., Dexia S.A., Natixis S.A.(f/k/a Ixis CIB, f/k/a CDC Finance-CDC IXIS), Royal Bank of Canada, AIG Financial Products Corp., Bank of America N.A., Financial Security Assurance, Inc., George K. Baum & Co., Investment Management Advisory Group, Inc., JP Morgan Chase & Co., Morgan Stanley, Natixis Funding Corp., UBS AG, UBS Financial Services Inc., CDR, Bayerische Landesbank Girozentrale, AIG Matched Funding Corp., Financial Guaranty Insurance Company, GE Funding Capital Market Services, Inc. Document filed by State of West Virginia. Relates to 08-2516.(rjm) Modified on 6/22/2010 (rjm). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/25/2010: # 1 part 2 of 6 pt 1, # 2 part 2 of 6 pt 2) (tro). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/28/2010: # 3 Part 3 pf 6, pt 1, # 4 part 3 of 6, pt 2, # 5 part 4 of , pt 1, # 6 part 4 of 6, pt 2, # 7 part 5, # 8 part 6) (tro). (Entered: 06/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM ENDORSEMENT re: WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE. Kindly withdraw my appearance as as counsel for plaintiff Fairfax County, Virginia in the above-captioned matter. granting (435) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Docket No. 435 herein and on the motions report. Attorney Arnold Levin terminated in case 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 6/16/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(rjm) (Entered: 06/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 6/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Morgan Stanley. Related document: 129 Amended Complaint,,,, filed by Fresno County Financing Authority, City of Fresno, California, County of Alameda, City of Oakland.(Goldfein, Shepard) (Entered: 06/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 6/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Societe Generale SA. Related document: 129 Amended Complaint,,,, filed by Fresno County Financing Authority, City of Fresno, California, County of Alameda, City of Oakland.(Ware, Michael) (Entered: 06/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 6/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Answer on June 10, 2010. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Wachovia Bank N.A., Wells Fargo & Co., Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(Wheeler, Stephanie) (Entered: 06/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 6/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Amended Complaint. Document filed by Bear, Stearns & Co., Inc.. Related document: 129 Amended Complaint,,,, filed by Fresno County Financing Authority, City of Fresno, California, County of Alameda, City of Oakland.(Wayland, Joseph) (Entered: 06/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 6/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Answer to Joint Second Amended Class Action Complaint on June 10, 2010. Service was made by Email and Mail. Document filed by Winters & Co. Advisors, LLC. (Masters, Marc) (Entered: 06/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 6/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Winters & Co. Advisors, LLC. Related document: 129 Amended Complaint,,,, filed by Fresno County Financing Authority, City of Fresno, California, County of Alameda, City of Oakland.(Masters, Marc) (Entered: 06/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 6/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Amended Complaint. Document filed by JP Morgan Chase & Co.. Related document: 129 Amended Complaint,,,, filed by Fresno County Financing Authority, City of Fresno, California, County of Alameda, City of Oakland.(Wayland, Joseph) (Entered: 06/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 6/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Amended Complaint. Document filed by Wachovia Bank N.A., Wells Fargo & Co., Inc.. Related document: 129 Amended Complaint,,,, filed by Fresno County Financing Authority, City of Fresno, California, County of Alameda, City of Oakland.(Wheeler, Stephanie) (Entered: 06/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 6/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to Amended Complaint. Document filed by Piper Jaffray & Co.. Related document: 129 Amended Complaint,,,, filed by Fresno County Financing Authority, City of Fresno, California, County of Alameda, City of Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Jackson, J) (Entered: 06/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 6/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Amended Complaint. Document filed by Sound Capital Management, Inc.. Related document: 129 Amended Complaint,,,, filed by Fresno County Financing Authority, City of Fresno, California, County of Alameda, City of Oakland.(Moen, Nicole) (Entered: 06/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 6/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by George K. Baum & Co.. Related document: 129 Amended Complaint,,,, filed by Fresno County Financing Authority, City of Fresno, California, County of Alameda, City of Oakland.(McDermott, John) (Entered: 06/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 6/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Amended Complaint. Document filed by Investment Management Advisory Group, Inc.. Related document: 129 Amended Complaint,,,, filed by Fresno County Financing Authority, City of Fresno, California, County of Alameda, City of Oakland.(Hoeffner, Timothy) (Entered: 06/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 6/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Investment Management Advisory Group, Inc..(Hoeffner, Timothy) (Entered: 06/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 6/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Bank of America, Bank of America N.A.. Related document: 129 Amended Complaint,,,, filed by Fresno County Financing Authority, City of Fresno, California, County of Alameda, City of Oakland.(Sullivan, Kevin) (Entered: 06/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 6/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by UBS AG, UBS Financial Services Inc.. Related document: 129 Amended Complaint,,,, filed by Fresno County Financing Authority, City of Fresno, California, County of Alameda, City of Oakland.(Smallwood, Jesse) (Entered: 06/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 6/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Amended Complaint. Document filed by CDR. Related document: 129 Amended Complaint,,,, filed by Fresno County Financing Authority, City of Fresno, California, County of Alameda, City of Oakland.(Beckler, Richard) (Entered: 06/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 6/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to Amended Complaint. Document filed by Natixis Funding Corp., Natixis Funding Corp.(f/k/a IXIS Funding Corp.). Related document: 129 Amended Complaint,,,, filed by Fresno County Financing Authority, City of Fresno, California, County of Alameda, City of Oakland.(Levine, James) (Entered: 06/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 6/9/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Joshua Barrett dated 6/3/2010 re: I am writing on behalf of the State of West Virginia ("West Virginia") to request permission or guidance with respect to information contained in the Voluntary Bill of Particulars provided to the Court by the Department of Justice. Although this information was widely reported, certain of this information has been stricken from the public record by the Court. ENDORSEMENT: The parties are directed to address the matter set forth above to Magistrate Judge Gabriel Gorenstein, to whom this dispute has been referred for resolution, as well as for supervision of reasoning pretrial proceedings, establishing case management scheduled as necessary, and settlement. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 6/8/2010) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(jmi) (Entered: 06/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by CDR.Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(Beckler, Richard) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard William Beckler on behalf of CDR Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(Beckler, Richard) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 188 Government's MOTION to Intervene and for a Limited Stay of Discovery. Relates to All Actions. (rjm) (Entered: 06/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 5/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 188 Government's MOTION to Intervene and for a Limited Stay of Discovery. Relates to All Actions. (rjm) (Entered: 06/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Government's NOTICE OF MOTION to Intervene and for a Limited Stay of Discovery. Relates to All Actions. (rjm) (Entered: 06/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER. As discussed today at a proceeding on the record, the application of the Antitrust Division of the Department of Justice ("the Government") to intervene pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 24(b) is granted for the limited purpose of moving to stay discovery. The Government's application to stay discovery is granted in part and denied in part. The following types of discovery shall not be stayed: (1) requests (including subpoenas) for documents and other tangible things (including but not limited to electronically stored information and tape recordings), (2) interrogatories pursuant to Local Civil Rule 33.3(a), (3) interrogatories seeking the identities of speakers, transactions and other summary information relating to tape recordings, and (4) depositions of custodians of documents concerning matters relating to the production of documents. All other discovery is stayed until February 1, 2011. The Government has leave to move to extend the stay, provided its application is filed no later than December 31, 2010. Prior to filing any such application, however, the Government shall confer with the parties to determine if an agreement can be reached with respect to its request to extend the stay. The Government shall be informed in advance of any deposition. Any tape recordings shall be disclosed only pursuant to the terms of a protective order. The parties and the Government shall attempt to agree on the terms of such an order. If they are unable to do so, the disagreement may be presented to the Court by letter. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 5/27/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(rjm) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Laura Cofer Taylor dated 5/20/10 re: We write on behalf of our clients, GE Funding Capital Market Services, Inc., Trinity Funding Co., LLC, Trinity Plus Funding Co., LLC, and General Electric Capital Corporation (collectively, "GE/Trinity") to request that the Court direct the Clerk of Court to designate these entities as "terminated" on the master docket (08-cv2516) and the MDL docket (08-md-1950) and to remove the seven listed attorneys from the list of counsel receiving ECF notification. ENDORSEMENT: Request granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to designate the GE/Trinity defendants as terminated from the action and to remove the attorneys named above from the list of attorneys receiving ECF notification herein, pursuant to the Court's Decision and Order dated 4/26/10. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 5/24/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(rjm) Modified on 5/25/2010 (rjm). (Entered: 05/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 5/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION FOR PUBLIC ENTITY PLAINTIFF TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED by and between Plaintiff County of San Diego and Defendants in the above-entitled action by and through their attorneys of record, pursuant to Rule 15 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiff may file a Third Amended Complaint for the County of San Diego. The Third Amended Complaint for the County of San Diego is attached hereto as Exhibit A. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 5/21/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG, 1:09-cv-01195-VM(rjm) (Entered: 05/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 5/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER. Oral argument on the motion of the Antitrust Division of the Department of Justice to intervene and for a stay of discovery shall take place on May 27, 2010 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 17-A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York and as further set forth. Relates to All Actions. (Oral Argument set for 5/27/2010 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 17A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 5/20/10) (rjm) (Entered: 05/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 5/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, WITHOUT prejudice against the defendant(s) PFM Investment, LLC, PFM Asset Management LLC. Document filed by Sacramento Municipal Utility District, Sacramento Municipal Utility District. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG, 1:09-cv-10103-VM(Nishimura, Nanci) (Entered: 05/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 5/18/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Plaintiffs County of Tulare, City of Riverside, The Redevelopment Agency of the City of Riverside, The Public Financing Authority of the City of Riverside, Los Angeles World Airports, The Redevelopment Agency of the City of Stockton, the Public Financing Authority of the City of Stockton, Sacramento Municipal Utility District, and Sacramento Suburban Water District, by their undersigned attorneys, and pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i) hereby voluntarily dismiss, without prejudice, their complaint against defendant Feld Winters Financial LLC only. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 5/17/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(rjm) (Entered: 05/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Andrew M. Scott on May 14, 2010, re: 180 . Service was made by ECF. Document filed by The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Goldman Sachs Mitsui Marine Derivative Products, L.P., Goldman Sachs Bank USA. (Davis, Evan) (Entered: 05/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE / Defendants The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Goldman Sachs Mitsui Marine Derivative Products, L.P., and Goldman Sachs Bank USA's Response to Public Entity Plaintiffs' Supplementary Brief in Opposition to Antitrust Divisions' Motion for a Stay of Discovery, dated May 14, 2010. Document filed by The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Goldman Sachs Mitsui Marine Derivative Products, L.P., Goldman Sachs Bank USA. (Davis, Evan) (Entered: 05/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Friedrich on behalf of Hinds County, Mississippi, State of Mississippi. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(rjm) (Entered: 05/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael D. Hoke on behalf of George K. Baum & Co. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(rjm) (Entered: 05/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 177 Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from Magda Jimenez Train dated 5/11/2010 re: Enclosed please find two courtesy copies of the corrected version of Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to the Antitrust Division's Motion for a Stay of Discovery, the supporting declaration and exhibits, and the Plaintiffs' Proposed Order. ENDORSEMENT: In the future, plaintiffs and all other parties should comply with paragraph 2.A through 2.G of this Court's Individual Practices with respect to any motions filed in this matter that are returnable before the undersigned. Paragraph 2.C directs that only one courtesy copy of any motion paper is to be supplied to Chambers. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 5/11/10). Relates to 08md1950, 08-2516. (rjm) (Entered: 05/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO ANSWER THE JOINT SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; Defendants shall have until and including June 10, 2010 to answer the Joint Second Amended Class Action Complaint, and as further set forth. So Ordered. Relates to 08md1950, 08-2516, 08-6340, 08-7034, 08-7355, 09-1199. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 5/11/10) (rjm) (Entered: 05/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. TO ANSWER THE SECOND CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT. Class Action Plaintiffs and Defendant Bank of America, N.A. hereby stipulate and agree that Defendant Bank of America, N.A. shall have until and including June 4, 2010 to answer or otherwise respond to the Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 5/3/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(rjm) (Entered: 05/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECISION AND ORDER. ORDERED that motion of defendant MBIA Inc. for reconsideration (Docket No. 712) of the Court's Decision and Order dated April 26, 2010 is DENIED, and as further set forth. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 5/3/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(rjm) (Entered: 05/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (712 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG) MOTION for Reconsideration. Defendant MBIA Inc.'s Memorandum of Law in Support of Its Motion For Reconsideration. Document filed by MBIA, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(Rauchberg, Ronald) (Entered: 04/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Reconsideration Notice of MBIA'S Motion For Reconsideration. Document filed by MBIA, Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(Rauchberg, Ronald) (Entered: 04/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: 4/28/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECISION AND ORDER. For the reasons discussed above, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion (Docket No. 580) of defendants The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Goldman Sachs Mitsui Marine Derivative Products, L. P. and Goldman Sachs Bank USA is DENIED; and it is further ORDERED that the motion (Docket No. 587) of defendants Syncora Guarantee Inc. and Syncora Holdings Ltd. (collectively, "Syncora") to dismiss the complaints of the City of Los Angeles, City of Riverside, City of Stockton, Contra Costa County, County of San Diego, County of San Mateo, County of Tulare, Los Angeles World Airports, The Redevelopment Agency of the City of Stockton, Sacramento Municipal Utility District, and Sacramento Suburban Water District (collectively, the "California Complaints") is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that the motion (Docket No. 593) of defendants to dismiss the California Complaints is DENIED as to JP Morgan Chase & Co., Morgan Stanley, Wells Fargo & Co., Inc., National Westminster Bank PLC, MBIA, Inc., Rabobank Group, Societe Generale SA, CDR Financial Products, Bear Stearns & Co. Inc., Piper Jaffray & Co., UBS AG, UBS Financial Services, Inc., UBS Securities, LLC, Winters & Co. Advisors LLC, Wachovia Bank N. A., PFM Group, Inc., PFM Asset Management LLC, Assured Guaranty US Holdings Inc., Dexia S.A., Bayerische Landesbank Girozentrale, Natixis S.A., Natixis Funding Corp., Investment Management Advisory Group, Inc., First Southwest Company, George K. Baum & co., Financial Security Assurance Inc., Sound Capital Management, Inc., Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Financial Products, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Holdings, Inc.; and it is further ORDERED that the motion (Docket No. 593) of defendants to dismiss the California Complaints is GRANTED as to AIG Financial Products Corp., Transamerica Life Insurance Company, XL Asset Funding Company LLC, GE Funding Capital Market Services, Inc., Trinity Funding Co., LLC, Trinity Plus Funding Co., LLC, XL Life Insurance & Annuity Company, XL Capital Ltd., XL Life and Annuity Holding Company, and General Electric Capital Corporation (collectively and together with Syncora, "Dismissed Defendants"). The Court dismisses plaintiffs claims against Dismissed Defendants without prejudice, subject to reinstatement of the claims upon a sufficient showing by plaintiff- municipalities during the course of discovery of facts supporting a plausible inference that Dismissed Defendants participated in the alleged conspiracy; and it is finally ORDERED that the parties are directed to appear at a pretrial conference on April 30, 2010 at 1:30 p.m. and, in preparation for that conference, to confer and propose an agreed upon Case Management Plan in the form provided by the Court. (Pretrial Conference set for 4/30/2010 at 01:30 PM before Judge Victor Marrero.) (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 4/26/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(rjm) (Entered: 04/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: 4/27/2010 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF REPRESENTATION by Sean P. McGinley on behalf of State of West Virginia Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(mro) (Entered: 04/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: 4/27/2010 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF REPRESENTATION by Joshua I. Barrett on behalf of State of West Virginia Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(mro) (Entered: 04/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: 4/27/2010 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECISION AND ORDER: For the reasons discussed above, it is hereby ordered that the motion(Docket No. 591) of Wachovia Bank N.A.; Wells Fargo & Co., Inc.; Bear, Stearns & Co., Inc.; Natixis Funding Corp.; JP Morgan Chase & Co.; Piper Jaffray & Co.; Societe Generale SA; UBS AG; UBS Financial ServicesInc.; Morgan Stanley; Investment Management Advisory Group, Inc.; CDR Financial Products; Winters & Co. Advisors, LLC; George K. Baum & Co.; and Sound Capital Management, Inc. to dismiss the joint second amended class action complaint is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; and it is further ordered that the parties are directed to appear at a pretrial conference on April 30, 2010 at 1:30 p.m. and, in preparation for that conference, to confer and propose an agreed upon Case Management Plan in the form provided by the Court. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 4/26/2010) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(js) (Entered: 04/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: 4/20/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER. The Antitrust Division of the Department of Justice has written to the Court asking to intervene in this action for the purpose of seeking a limited stay of discovery. The pre-motion conference requirement is waived. The motion shall be filed on or before April 27, 2010. Briefing thereafter shall proceed in accordance with paragraph 2.B of this Court's Individual Practices. (Motion due by 4/27/2010.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 4/20/10) (rjm) (Entered: 04/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: 4/20/2010 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Victor L. Hou on behalf of The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Goldman Sachs Mitsui Marine Derivative Products, L.P., Goldman Sachs Bank USA Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(Hou, Victor) (Entered: 04/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: 4/16/2010 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (593 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG) JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Cotchett Complaints. with Certificate of Service. Document filed by Citigroup Inc., Salomon Smith Barney, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(Lutz, Brian) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: 4/16/2010 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (44 in 1:08-cv-10350-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01196-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01197-VM, 14 in 1:09-cv-10102-VM, 32 in 1:09-cv-01195-VM, 41 in 1:08-cv-10351-VM, 593 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG) MOTION to Dismiss. TRANSAMERICA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY'S REPLY MEMORANDUM IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS THE COTCHETT COMPLAINTS. Document filed by Transamerica Life Insurance Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(Gupta, Rachel) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: 4/16/2010 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (580 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG, 135 in 1:08-md-01950-VM) MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Goldman Sachs Mitsui Marine Derivative Products, L.P., Goldman Sachs Bank USA. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(Davis, Evan) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: 4/16/2010 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Howard J. Rubin in Support re: (593 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG) JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Cotchett Complaints.. Document filed by Natixis Funding Corp., Natixis Funding Corp.(f/k/a IXIS Funding Corp.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(Cameron, Sean) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: 4/16/2010 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (593 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG) JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Cotchett Complaints.. Document filed by Natixis Funding Corp., Natixis Funding Corp.(f/k/a IXIS Funding Corp.). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(Cameron, Sean) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: 4/16/2010 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Howard J. Rubin in Support re: (593 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG) JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Cotchett Complaints.. Document filed by Natixis S.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(Cameron, Sean) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: 4/16/2010 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (593 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG) JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Cotchett Complaints.. Document filed by Natixis S.A.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(Cameron, Sean) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: 4/16/2010 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (593 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG) JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Cotchett Complaints. Defendant MBIA Inc.'s Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Its Motion to Dismiss the Cotchett Complaints. Document filed by MBIA, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(Rauchberg, Ronald) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: 4/16/2010 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (140 in 1:08-md-01950-VM, 587 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG) MOTION to Dismiss /Notice of Motion of Syncora Guarantee Inc. (f/k/a XL Capital Assurance Inc.) and Syncora Holdings Ltd. (f/k/a Security Capital Assurance Ltd.) to Dismiss. MOTION to Dismiss /Notice of Motion of Syncora Guarantee Inc. (f/k/a XL Capital Assurance Inc.) and Syncora Holdings Ltd. (f/k/a Security Capital Assurance Ltd.) to Dismiss.. Document filed by Syncora Guarantee Inc., Syncora Holdings Ltd.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(Greenfield, Elliot) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: 4/9/2010 Order on Motion for ReconsiderationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECISION AND ORDER: For reasons further set forth in said Order, motion of defendant Morgan Stanley for reconsideration (Docket No. 671 in 08cv2516) of the Court's Decision and Order dated March 25, 2010 is DENIED. ORDER denying (671) Motion for Reconsideration in case 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 4/9/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(db) (Entered: 04/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 4/8/2010, Entered: 4/8/2010 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER CONCERNING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO ANSWER THE SECOND CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs, defendant JPMorgan Chase & Co. and defendant Bear, Stearns & Co, Inc., subject to the approval of the Court as follows: No moving defendant need answer the Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint in the above-captioned action before May 8, 2010, but each moving defendant agrees not to seek permission to answer later than June 8, 2010; The extension is available, without further stipulation with counsel for Plaintiffs, to all moving defendants; and This Stipulation may be executed in separate counterparts, and counterparts may be executed in facsimile form, each of which shall be an original. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 4/8/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(rjm) (Entered: 04/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 4/8/2010, Entered: 4/8/2010 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from Bryan P. Kessler dated 4/7/10 re: The Cotchett-Only Defendants respectfully request an extension of the stay of discovery as to the Cotchett-Only Defendants pending the Court's resolution of their pending motions to dismiss the Cotchett Actions. ENDORSEMENT: Granted on consent. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 4/7/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(rjm) (Entered: 04/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 4/2/2010, Entered: 4/2/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance of Jon J. Nathan. Document filed by GE Funding Capital Market Services, Inc., Trinity Funding Co. LLC. (Boccanfuso, Anthony) (Entered: 04/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 4/1/2010, Entered: 4/1/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CORRECTED ORDER: it is hereby ORDERED that the motion (Docket No. 484) of Wachovia Bank N.A.; Wells Fargo & Co., Inc. Bear, Stearns & Co., Inc. Natixis Funding; JP Morgan Chase & Co.; Piper Jaffray & Co. Societe Generale SA; UBS AG; Morgan Stanley; National Westminster Bank PLC; Investment Management Advisory Group,Inc.; CDR Financial Products; Winters & Co. Advisors, LLC; George K. Baum & Co.; and Sound Capital Management, Inc. to dismiss the SCAC is DENIED; and it is further ORDERED that the parties are directed to appear at a pretrial conference on April 30, 2010 at 1:30 p.m. and, in preparation for that conference, to confer and propose an agreed upon Case Management Plan in the form provided by the Court. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 4/1/2010) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(js) Modified on 4/1/2010 (js). (Entered: 04/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 151 Filed: 3/25/2010, Entered: 3/25/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECISION AND ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion (Docket No. 484) of Wachovia Bank N.A.; Wells Fargo & Co., Inc.; Bear, Stearns & Co., Inc.; Natixis S.A.; JP Morgan Chase & Co.; Piper Jaffray & Co.; Societe Generale SA; UBS AG; Morgan Stanley; National Westminster Bank PLC; Investment Management Advisory Group, Inc.; CDR Financial Products; Winters & Co. Advisors, LLC; George K. Baum & Co.; and Sound Capital Management, Inc. to dismiss the second consolidated amended class action complaint is DENIED; and it is further ORDERED that the parties are directed to appear at a pretrial conference on April 30, 2010 at 1:30 p.m. and, in preparation for that conference, to confer and propose an agreed upon Case Management Plan in the form provided by the Court. (Pretrial Conference set for 4/30/2010 at 01:30 PM before Judge Victor Marrero.) (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 3/25/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(rjm) (Entered: 03/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: 3/17/2010 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Nanci E. Nishimura dated 3/15/10 re: Your guidance is respectfully requested by the above-noted Los Angeles Plaintiffs to resolve an issue presented by the Defendants' Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss the Cotchett Complaints ("Defendants' Joint Motion"). As explained below, in order to circumvent the Court's specific 50-page limit, Defendants' Joint Motion incorporates wholesale arguments from a pleading from the class action and correspondence, totaling 69 pages. As such, the excess pages should be stricken, or the Los Angeles Plaintiffs should be allowed an equal number of additional pages in their joint opposition brief which is due on March 27, 2010. ENDORSEMENT: Request denied. The Court is not persuaded that the additional pagination requested is warranted in light of the Courts previous rulings on this matter. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 3/16/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(rjm) (Entered: 03/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 3/12/2010, Entered: 3/12/2010 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Quincy M. Crawford, III is admitted to practice pro hac vice as counsel for the above-named defendants in the above-captioned MDL proceedings pending in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. granting (637) Motion for Quincy M. Crawford, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG; granting (148) Motion for Quincy M. Crawford, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-md-01950-VM; granting (61) Motion for Quincy M. Crawford, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-10350-VM; granting (58) Motion for Quincy M. Crawford, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:08-cv-10351-VM; granting (49) Motion for Quincy M. Crawford, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-01196-VM; granting (49) Motion for Quincy M. Crawford, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-01195-VM; granting (49) Motion for Quincy M. Crawford, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-01197-VM; granting (37) Motion for Quincy M. Crawford, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-10102-VM; granting (10) Motion for Quincy M. Crawford, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:09-cv-10103-VM; granting (8) Motion for Quincy M. Crawford, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:10-cv-00627-VM; granting (8) Motion for Quincy M. Crawford, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:10-cv-00628-VM; granting (8) Motion for Quincy M. Crawford, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:10-cv-00629-VM; granting (8) Motion for Quincy M. Crawford, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:10-cv-00630-VM. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 3/11/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(rjm) (Entered: 03/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 3/9/2010, Entered: 3/10/2010 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF MOTION for Quincy M. Crawford, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Transamerica Life Insurance Company.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(rjm) (Entered: 03/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 3/2/2010, Entered: 3/2/2010 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rachel Allison Gupta on behalf of Transamerica Life Insurance Company Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(Gupta, Rachel) (Entered: 03/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: 3/1/2010 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE. PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that Henry A. Cirillo of the law firm of Steyer Lowenthal Boodrookas Alvarez & Smith LLP hereby appears as counsel for Plaintiff Fairfax County Virginia in the above-captioned action. Filed by Henry A. Cirillo on behalf of Fairfax County, Virginia. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(rjm) (Entered: 03/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: 2/9/2010 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying BayernLB Holding as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Bayerische Landesbank Girozentrale.(Hellerer, Mark) (Entered: 02/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: 2/9/2010 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Syncora Guarantee Inc., Syncora Holdings Ltd..Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(Greenfield, Elliot) (Entered: 02/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: 2/9/2010 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark Robert Hellerer on behalf of Bayerische Landesbank Girozentrale (Hellerer, Mark) (Entered: 02/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: 2/9/2010 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Elliot Greenfield and Exhibit A in Support re: (140 in 1:08-md-01950-VM, 587 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG) MOTION to Dismiss /Notice of Motion of Syncora Guarantee Inc. (f/k/a XL Capital Assurance Inc.) and Syncora Holdings Ltd. (f/k/a Security Capital Assurance Ltd.) to Dismiss. MOTION to Dismiss /Notice of Motion of Syncora Guarantee Inc. (f/k/a XL Capital Assurance Inc.) and Syncora Holdings Ltd. (f/k/a Security Capital Assurance Ltd.) to Dismiss.. Document filed by Syncora Guarantee Inc., Syncora Holdings Ltd.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(Greenfield, Elliot) (Entered: 02/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: 2/9/2010 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (140 in 1:08-md-01950-VM, 587 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG) MOTION to Dismiss /Notice of Motion of Syncora Guarantee Inc. (f/k/a XL Capital Assurance Inc.) and Syncora Holdings Ltd. (f/k/a Security Capital Assurance Ltd.) to Dismiss. MOTION to Dismiss /Notice of Motion of Syncora Guarantee Inc. (f/k/a XL Capital Assurance Inc.) and Syncora Holdings Ltd. (f/k/a Security Capital Assurance Ltd.) to Dismiss.. Document filed by Syncora Guarantee Inc., Syncora Holdings Ltd.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(Greenfield, Elliot) (Entered: 02/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: 2/9/2010 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss /Notice of Motion of Syncora Guarantee Inc. (f/k/a XL Capital Assurance Inc.) and Syncora Holdings Ltd. (f/k/a Security Capital Assurance Ltd.) to Dismiss. Document filed by Syncora Guarantee Inc., Syncora Holdings Ltd..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(Greenfield, Elliot) (Entered: 02/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: 2/9/2010 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (580 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG, 135 in 1:08-md-01950-VM) MOTION to Dismiss. Defendant MBIA Inc.'s Supplemental Memorandum of Law in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss the Complaints. Document filed by MBIA, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(Rauchberg, Ronald) (Entered: 02/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: 2/9/2010 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Document filed by The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Goldman Sachs Mitsui Marine Derivative Products, L.P., Goldman Sachs Bank USA.Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(Davis, Evan) (Entered: 02/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: 2/9/2010 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (580 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG, 135 in 1:08-md-01950-VM) MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Goldman Sachs Mitsui Marine Derivative Products, L.P., Goldman Sachs Bank USA. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(Davis, Evan) (Entered: 02/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: 2/9/2010 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Evan A. Davis, dated February 5, 2010 (with Exhibits A-C) in Support re: (580 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG, 135 in 1:08-md-01950-VM) MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Goldman Sachs Mitsui Marine Derivative Products, L.P., Goldman Sachs Bank USA. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(Davis, Evan) (Entered: 02/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: 2/9/2010 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss /Notice of Motion, dated February 8, 2010. Document filed by The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Goldman Sachs Mitsui Marine Derivative Products, L.P., Goldman Sachs Bank USA.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(Davis, Evan) (Entered: 02/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: 2/9/2010 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Evan A. Davis on behalf of The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Goldman Sachs Mitsui Marine Derivative Products, L.P., Goldman Sachs Bank USA Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(Davis, Evan) (Entered: 02/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 2/5/2010, Entered: 2/5/2010 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Nanci E. Nishimura dated 1/28/10 re: Pursuant to the Court's Minute Entry of January 26, 2010, extending the page limit for Defendants Omnibus Brief to 50 pages in response to the Los Angeles Plaintiffs Complaints, this is to confirm that the page limit for Los Angeles Plaintiffs' Omnibus Opposition is also extended to 50 pages. ENDORSEMENT: The understanding of plaintiffs set forth above regarding the page limitations applicable to the briefing of the omnibus motion to dismiss and related accurately states the Courts instructions. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 2/2/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(rjm) (Entered: 02/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 2/4/2010, Entered: 2/4/2010 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Feld Winters Financial LLC, Feld Winters Financial, LLC. Document filed by City of Stockton, City of Los Angeles, County of Contra Costa, County of San Mateo, County of San Diego, City of Riverside, The Redevelopment Agency of the City of Riverside, The Public Financing Authority of the City of Riverside, Sacramento Municipal Utility District, Los Angeles World Airports, County of Tulare, Sacramento Suburban Water District, Redevelopment Agency of the City of Stockton. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(Gross, Stuart) (Entered: 02/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 1/26/2010, Entered: 1/26/2010 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Annette C. Rizzi to Withdraw as Attorney. Document filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank, Bear Sterns Companies, Inc., Bear, Stearns & Co., Inc., JP Morgan Chase & Co..(Rizzi, Annette) (Entered: 01/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 1/13/2010, Entered: 1/13/2010 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. AND MERRILL LYNCH & CO., INC. TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINTS. Plaintiffs City of Riverside, et al., and Sacramento Municipal Utility District ("Individual California Plaintiffs"), and Defendants Bank of America, N.A. and Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc. hereby stipulate and agree that Defendants Bank of America, N.A. and Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc. shall have until and including 45 days following this Court's ruling on all motions to dismiss filed by other defendants to the Complaints of the Individual California Plaintiffs, to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaints. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 1/13/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG, 1:09-cv-10102-VM, 1:09-cv-10103-VM(rjm) (Entered: 01/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 12/15/2009, Entered: 12/31/2009 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JOINT SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT (Jury Trial Demanded) against AIG Financial Products Corp., Bank of America N.A., Bear, Stearns & Co., Inc., Feld Winters Financial LLC, Financial Security Assurance, Inc., XL Capital Ltd.(a Bermuda Corporation), XL Asset Funding Co. I LLC, Financial Security Assurance Holdings, Ltd., First Southwest Company, GE Funding Capital Market Services, Inc., George K. Baum & Co., Investment Management Advisory Group, Inc., JP Morgan Chase & Co., Morgan Keegan & Co., Inc., Morgan Stanley, Natixis Funding Corp., Packerkiss Securities, Inc., Piper Jaffray & Co., Societe Generale SA, Sound Capital Management, Inc., UBS AG, Wachovia Bank N.A., UBS Financial Services Inc., Wells Fargo & Co., Inc., Winters & Co. Advisors, LLC, CDR, SunAmerica Life Assurance Co., Trinity Funding Co. LLC, National Westminster Bank Plc, Kinsell Newcomb & De Dios Inc., Mesirow Financial, XL Life Insurance & Annuity, Inc.Document filed by City of Oakland, County of Alameda, City of Fresno, California, Fresno County Financing Authority. Relates to 08-6340, 08-7034, 08-7355, 09-1199.(rjm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/6/2010: # 1 Supplement) (rdz). (Entered: 12/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 12/22/2009, Entered: 12/22/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER TO EXTEND LIMITED STAY OF DISCOVERY. It is this 22nd day of December 2009 ORDERED: That the provisions of the STIPULATION AND ORDER RE LIMITED STAY OF DISCOVERY entered on June 24, 2009 be continued pending resolution of Defendants' motions to dismiss the Second Consolidated Amended Complaint in this case. Relates to 08cv2516 and All Cases. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 12/22/09) (rjm) (Entered: 12/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 12/17/2009, Entered: 12/17/2009 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Evan A. Davis on behalf of The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Goldman Sachs Mitsui Marine Derivative Products, L.P., Goldman Sachs Bank USA Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(Davis, Evan) (Entered: 12/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: 12/14/2009 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMO ENDORSEMENT on NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF PLAINTIFFS CITY OF OAKLAND, ET AL. FOR LEAVE TO AMEND THE JOINT AMENDED COMPLAINT (Doc. No. 524 in Case No. 08cv2516). ENDORSEMENT: In light of the fact that (a) the proposed complaint adds no new parties or causes of actions; and (b) its new allegations are included in pending complaints to which defendants must respond anyway, the Court sees no prejudice to defendants in allowing the amendment. Nor do any of the other factors relevant to motions to amend, see Foman v. Davis, 371 U.S. 178, 182 (1962), suggest that the motion should be denied. The defendants' concerns regarding any future applications to amend the complaint will be dealt with should such applications occur. Accordingly, the motion to amend (Docket # 524) is granted. The proposed amended complaint shall be filed forthwith. Defendants shall respond on or before January 25, 2010. Relates to 08cv2516, 08md1950, 08-6340, 08-7034, 08-7355, 09-1199. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 12/14/09) (rjm) (Entered: 12/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 12/10/2009, Entered: 12/11/2009 MDL Conditional Transfer In OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER IN ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL (CTO-9)... transferring this action from the United States District Court - that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, the actions listed on the attached schedule A and pending in the District of other than the SDNY, and the same hereby are, transferred to the Southern District of New York, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Victor Marrero, for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings with the actions pending in that district and listed on Schedule A. (Signed by MDL Panel on 11/24/09) (rjm) (Entered: 12/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 12/1/2009, Entered: 12/2/2009 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from Eric B. Fastiff dated 12/1/09 re: We represent plaintiffs City of Oakland, County of Alameda, City of Fresno, and Fresno County Financing Authority (collectively, "Oakland Plaintiffs") in the above-referenced litigation. Pursuant to Part 2A of Your Honor's Individual Practices, we write to arrange a pre-motion conference on the Oakland Plaintiffs' anticipated motion for leave to amend their Joint Amended Complaint, filed on September 15, 2009. ENDORSEMENT: The pre-motion conference requirement is waived. The motion may be filed at any time in accordance with paragraphs 2B-G of this Court s Individual Practices. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 12/1/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(rjm) (Entered: 12/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 11/19/2009, Entered: 11/19/2009 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re: (484 in 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG) JOINT MOTION to Dismiss. Plainitffs' Third Request For Judicial Notice In Opposition To Defendants' Joint Motion To Dismiss Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Plaintiff Class. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(Shaw, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 11/3/2009, Entered: 11/4/2009 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - SignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Plaintiffs City of Los Angeles, City of Stockton, County of San Diego, County of San Mateo, Contra Costa County, by their undersigned attorneys, and pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1 )(A)(i) hereby voluntarily dismiss, without prejudice, their complaint against defendants FSA Capital Services LLC and FSA Capital Management Services LLC only. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 11/3/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(rjm) (Entered: 11/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 121 Filed: 11/3/2009, Entered: 11/3/2009 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE SECOND CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT Class Action Plaintiffs and Defendant Bank of America, N.A. hereby stipulate and agree that Defendant Bank of America, N.A. shall have until and including 45 days following this Court's ruling on all motions to dismiss filed by other defendants to the Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint to answer or otherwise respond to the Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 11/3/2009) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(jmi) (Entered: 11/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 10/27/2009, Entered: 10/27/2009 Case Management PlanCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER No. 3. The Court is in receipt of several letters from the parties, dated between October 12 and October 21, 2009, regarding the deadline for responding to the amended complaints filed in what have been referred to as the "California Actions." See Case Management Order No. 2, filed July 31, 2009 (Docket # 474) (Exhibit A). The Court does not believe that the time to respond to the complaints in the California Actions should be stayed until the disposition of the pending motion to dismiss the Second Class Action Complaint. While the Court recognizes that this course of action represents a burden to the defendants, that burden is outweighed by the importance of not unduly delaying the progress of this case. Moreover, to the extent there are substantial similarities between the Second Class Action Complaint and the complaints in the California Actions, it will be of relatively little burden to defendants to repeat arguments related to these similarities or to incorporate them by reference. To the extent there are substantial differences, these differences will raise issues that would have to be briefed anyway. That being said, the Court sees great value in having a briefing schedule in which all defendants named in the California Actions may participate and coordinate their responses in a single timetable. Accordingly, inasmuch as not all defendants in the California Actions have been served to date (a circumstance not contemplated by the Court at the July 17 conference), the Court does not see the point in having multiple briefing schedules for various defendants depending on the date of their service. Accordingly, the time for defendants to move or answer with respect to the California Actions is stayed until 45 days after the California plaintiffs inform defendants that all defendants to the California Actions have been served (or that plaintiffs are stipulating to any unserved defendant's dismissal).' In the event any defendant moves to dismiss, opposition papers will be due 45 days thereafter. Any reply papers will be due 21 days after service of opposition papers. The defendants that are named only in the California Actions have made a request for a stay of discovery beyond the stay provided in Case Management Order No. 2. The Court will defer any ruling on that request until after Judge Marrero decides the motions to dismiss the Second Class Action Complaint. The request should be discussed by the parties following that decision and may be raised again by letter. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 10/27/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(rjm) (Entered: 10/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 10/14/2009, Entered: 10/14/2009 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bernard Persky on behalf of Plaintiff Class (Persky, Bernard) (Entered: 10/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 10/2/2009, Entered: 10/14/2009 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from elliot Greenfield dated 10/2/09 re: I am writing to inform you that I have been asked to assist in the representation of Syncora Guarantee Inc... I do not believe that my involvement in this matter could reasonably be seen as creating a conflict of interest or would otherwise be inappropriate. ENDORSEMENT: Any party which has an interest and view in the matter raised above and desires to express it is directed to do so by 10/8/09 by letter to the Court. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 10/2/09) (rjm) (Entered: 10/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: 10/9/2009 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. AND MERRILL LYNCH & CO., INC. TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINTS. Plaintiffs City of Los Angeles, Contra Costa County, City of Stockton, County of San Diego and County of San Mateo ("Individual California Plaintiffs"), and Defendants Bank of America, N.A and Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc. hereby stipulate and agree that Defendants Bank of America, N.A. and Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc. shall have until and including 45 days following this Court's ruling on all motions to dismiss filed by other defendants to the Amended Complaints of the Individual California Plaintiffs, to answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaints. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 10/9/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(rjm) (Entered: 10/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 9/16/2009, Entered: 9/16/2009 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Joe Wayland dated 9/16/09 re: We write on behalf of Defendants in the above-captioned action to request an extension of the page limit on memorandum of law set forth in Your Honor's Individual Practice Rules. ENDORSEMENT: Request granted. The page limitations provision of the Courts Individual Practices is modified to authorize defendants to file a brief not to exceed 70 pages in connection with the motion to dismiss the second consolidated class action complaint herein. Plaintiffs response may not exceed 70 pages and any reply may not exceed 25 pages. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 9/16/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(rjm) (Entered: 09/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 115 Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: 9/16/2009 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(jri) (Entered: 09/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 8/6/2009, Entered: 8/7/2009 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 7/17/09, 2:48pm before Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein. Relates to 08md1950, 08-2516.(rjm) (Entered: 08/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 7/31/2009, Entered: 7/31/2009 Case Management PlanCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 2. The following deadlines are entered in the Consolidated Class Actions (identified in Exhibit A hereto) for the briefing related to the motions to dismiss the Second Consolidated Amended Complaint: Motions filed on or before September 18, 2009. Responses filed on or before October 18, 2009. Replies filed on or before November 18, 2009. The following deadlines are entered for the filing and response to amended complaints in the California Actions (identified in Exhibit A hereto): The Plaintiffs in the California Actions shall file amended complaints on or before September 15, 2009. Subsequent to the filing of amended complaints in the California Actions, Defendants in such complaints who are also named in the Second Consolidated Amended Complaint will meet and confer with Plaintiffs in the California Actions to arrange a. briefing schedule. and will either submit a Stipulation and Proposed Order, or will submit separate letter briefs outlining their respective proposals... and as further set forth. Amended Pleadings due by 9/15/2009. Motions due by 9/18/2009. Responses due by 10/18/2009. Replies due by 11/18/2009. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 7/31/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(rjm) (Entered: 07/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 7/10/2009, Entered: 7/10/2009 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER CONCERNING RESPONSES TO THE SECOND CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT. NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between Plaintiffs, defendant JPMorgan Chase & Co. and defendant Bear, Stearns & Co., Inc., subject to the approval of the Court, as follows: No defendant need respond to the complaint in this action before September 18, 2009; No defendant shall use the fact of this extension as a justification for a delay of discovery in this matter; No rights or objections of any party with respect to discovery are otherwise prejudiced or waived by the submission of this Stipulation; This extension is available, without further stipulation with counsel for Plaintiffs, to all named defendants; and No defense of JPMorgan Chase & Co., Bear, Steams & Co., Inc., or any other defendant to this action is prejudiced or waived by its submission of this Stipulation. So Stipulated and Agreed. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 7/10/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(rjm) (Entered: 07/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 7/8/2009, Entered: 7/9/2009 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from Kevin R. Sullivan dated 7/6/2009 re: Pursuant to Rule 1.F. of the Court's Individualized Practices, I am writing regarding the Court's Order setting the initial Rule 16 Conference on July 17, 2009. As lead counsel for Defendant Bank of America, N.A. in the above-referenced action, upon receipt of the Court's Order, I began discussions with counsel for other parties regarding their availability on alternative dates because I am unable to attend on July 17 or later in July due to longstanding plans to be out of the country. Counsel haw discussed possible alternative dates, including dates earlier than July 17, but have been unable to reach agreement on a proposed alternative date. Plaintiffs' Co-Lead Counsel have advised that they prefer to proceed on July 17 in order not to delay the resolution of scheduling matters in this case until September 2009. ENDORSEMENT: Mr. Sullivan has informed a clerk to the undersigned that he can participate in a conference by telephone at 2:30 p.m. Accordingly, the conference will take place on July 17, 2009 at 2:30 p.m. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 7/8/2009) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(jmi) (Entered: 07/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 7/8/2009, Entered: 7/8/2009 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Taleah Esperanza Jennings on behalf of National Westminster Bank PLC, National Westminster Bank PLC (Attachments: # 1 Certificate Of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(Jennings, Taleah) (Entered: 07/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 7/8/2009, Entered: 7/8/2009 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Harry Simeon Davis on behalf of National Westminster Bank PLC, National Westminster Bank PLC (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-GWG(Davis, Harry) (Entered: 07/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 7/1/2009, Entered: 7/2/2009 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - SignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Plaintiffs City of Oakland, County of Alameda, City of Fresno, and Fresno County Financing Authority, by their undersigned attorneys, and pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i) hereby voluntarily dismiss, without prejudice, their complaint against defendant Security Capital Assurance Inc., only. Relates to 08md1950, 08-6340, 08-7034, 08-7355, 09-1199. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 7/1/09) (rjm) (Entered: 07/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 6/25/2009, Entered: 6/25/2009 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Timothy E. Hoeffner on behalf of Investment Management Advisory Group, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(Hoeffner, Timothy) (Entered: 06/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 106 Filed: 6/24/2009, Entered: 6/25/2009 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER RE LIMITED STAY OF DISCOVERY. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED that the Department of Justice shall be permitted pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 24 to move to intervene, without objection by Class Plaintiffs, for the limited purpose of staying certain discovery discussed below. The need for briefing from the Department of Justice may be raised at the Rule 16 Conference... and as further set forth. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 6/24/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-DCF(rjm) (Entered: 06/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 6/24/2009, Entered: 6/25/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER FOR RULE 16 CONFERENCE. This action is scheduled for an initial case management conference in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(a), on July 17, 2009, at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 17-A, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. All parties must appear at this conference and should arrive prior to the scheduled time so that the conference may begin promptly... and as further set forth regarding the procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of this Order for Rule 16 Conference. (Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/17/2009 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 17A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 6/24/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-DCF(rjm) (Entered: 06/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 6/8/2009, Entered: 6/9/2009 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT: Pursuant to this Court's Order extending time for Defendant Bank of America, N.A. ("Bank of America") to answer or otherwise respond to the Consolidated Class Action Complaint until June 15, 2009, and in light of Orders of this Court dismissing the Class Action Complaint as to certain defendants other than Defendant Bank of America and allowing Plaintiffs to replead on or before June 18, 2009, Plaintiffs and Bank of America hereby stipulate and agree that Bank of America shall have until and including August 17, 2009 to answer or otherwise respond to the amended Consolidated Complaint. IT IS SO STIPULATED. Bank of America answer due 8/17/2009; Bank of America N.A. answer due 8/17/2009. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman on 6/8/2009) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM-DCF(jmi) (Entered: 06/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 5/18/2009, Entered: 5/18/2009 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Nanci Nishimura dated 5/15/09 re: We write to respectfully request correction of the Docket Text included on the ECF entry for Docket No. 442 (in case no. 08-2516). ENDORSEMENT: Request granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to correct docket number 442 in this case to indicate that the dismissal of the action ordered there applies only as against defendant Packerkiss Securities, Inc. Relates to 08md1950, 08-2516. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 5/18/09) (rjm) (Entered: 05/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 5/11/2009, Entered: 5/12/2009 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Magda M. Jimenez dated 5/8/09 re: On behalf of Plaintiffs in the above-captioned action, I write to request a 30-day extension of time to file the Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint ("SCAC") contemplated by the Court's Order of April 29, 2009 ("Order"). ENDORSEMENT: Request granted. The time for plaintiffs herein to amend the complaint in accordance with the Courts Order dated 4/29/09 is extended to 6/18/09., ( Amended Pleadings due by 6/18/2009.) (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 5/11/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM(rjm) (Entered: 05/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 101 Filed: 5/4/2009, Entered: 5/4/2009 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - SignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed without prejudice against the defendant(s) Financial Guaranty Insurance Company, Financial Guranty Insurance Co.. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 5/1/2009) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-06340-VM, 1:09-cv-01199-VM(jmi) (Entered: 05/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 4/30/2009, Entered: 4/30/2009 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECISION AND ORDER. It is hereby Ordered that the motion (Docket No. 277) to dismiss the consolidated amended class action complaint (CAC) is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that the motion (Docket No. 275) to dismiss the CAC is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that plaintiffs Fairfax County, Virginia, the State of Mississippi, the City of Baltimore, Maryland, the Central Bucks School District, and the Bucks County Water and Sewer Authority are granted leave to file a second amended complaint repleading claims against the Joint Defendants based upon: (1) allegations that specific individuals employed by Joint Defendants engaged in communications in furtherance of any alleged antitrust violation, and (2) claims of fraudulent concealment, provided that such amended complaint shall be filed within twenty days of this Order. The Court will also consider future requests for leave to replead based upon discovery conducted with defendants not affected by these motions to dismiss. granting (275) Motion to Dismiss; granting (277) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:08-cv-02516-VM. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 4/29/09). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(rjm) (Entered: 04/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 99 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: 4/13/2009 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - SignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Plaintiffs City of Oakland, County of Alameda, City of Fresno, and Fresno County Financing Authority, by their undersigned attorneys, and pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(1)(A)(i) hereby voluntarily dismiss, without prejudice, their complaint against defendant Cain Brothers & Co., LLC, only. Relates to 08md1950, 08-6340, 08-7034, 08-7355, 09-1199 and also entered in 08-2516. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 4/10/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM, 1:08-cv-06340-VM, 1:09-cv-01199-VM(rjm) (Entered: 04/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 3/24/2009, Entered: 3/24/2009 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Michael P. Lehmann on behalf of Fairfax County, Virginia. New Address: HAUSFELD LLP, 44 Montgomery, Suite 3400, San Francisco, CA, USA 94104, 415-633-1908. (Lehmann, Michael) (Entered: 03/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 3/23/2009, Entered: 3/23/2009 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael D. Hausfeld on behalf of Fairfax County, Virginia (Hausfeld, Michael) (Entered: 03/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 3/17/2009, Entered: 3/19/2009 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL by Sylvia Sokol on behalf of City of Oakland, California, County of Alameda, California, Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(rjm) (Entered: 03/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: 3/16/2009 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF ENTRY OF APPEARANCE. Pursuant to the Orders signed on July 15, 2008 and July 17, 2008 by the Honorable Victor Marrero, please enter the appearance of Michael P. Lehmann pro hac vice as counsel for Plaintiff Fairfax County, Virginia in this matter. Attached hereto please find a Certificate of Good Standing for Mr. Lehmann. This Document Relates to All Actions. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(rjm) (Entered: 03/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: 3/16/2009 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael P. Lehmann on behalf of Fairfax County, Virginia Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(jmi) (Entered: 03/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: 3/13/2009 Certificate of Service Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Change of Address - Christopher L. Lebsock on 03/13/2009. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Fairfax County, Virginia. (Lebsock, Christopher) (Entered: 03/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: 3/13/2009 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Christopher L. Lebsock on behalf of Fairfax County, Virginia. New Address: HAUSFELD LLP, 44 Montgomery, Suite 3400, San Francisco, CA, USA 94104, 415-633-1908. (Lebsock, Christopher) (Entered: 03/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 3/4/2009, Entered: 3/5/2009 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - SignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Plaintiffs City of Oakland, County of Alameda, City of Fresno, and Fresno County Financing Authority, by their undersigned attorneys, and pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i) hereby voluntarily dismiss, without prejudice, their complaint against defendant Shockley Financial Corporation, only. Relates to 08md1950, 08-2516, 08-6340, 08-7034, 08-7355, 09-1199. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 3/3/09) (rjm) (Entered: 03/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 3/3/2009, Entered: 3/3/2009 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Robert Gerard Eisler on behalf of Fairfax County, Virginia. New Address: HAUSFELD LLP, 1700 K Street NW, Suite 650, Washington, DC, USA 20006, 212-540-7200. (Eisler, Robert) (Entered: 03/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 3/3/2009, Entered: 3/3/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance. Document filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank, Bear Sterns Companies, Inc., Bear, Stearns & Co., Inc., JP Morgan Chase & Co.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(Rizzi, Annette) (Entered: 03/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 3/2/2009, Entered: 3/2/2009 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher L. Lebsock on behalf of Fairfax County, Virginia (Lebsock, Christopher) (Entered: 03/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: 2/27/2009 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Norman Rocco Cerullo on behalf of Societe Generale SA Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM, 1:08-cv-06340-VM, 1:09-cv-01199-VM(Cerullo, Norman) (Entered: 02/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: 2/24/2009 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - SignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed without prejudice against the defendant(s) National Westminster Bank PLC. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 2/24/2009) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-06340-VM, 1:09-cv-01199-VM(jmi) (Entered: 02/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 2/10/2009, Entered: 2/20/2009 MDL Conditional Transfer In OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER IN ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL... that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, the actions listed on the attached schedule A and pending in the District of Central District of California and Northern District of California, and the same hereby are, transferred to the Southern District of New York, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Victor Marrero, for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings with the actions pending in that district and listed on Schedule A. (Signed by MDL Panel on 2/4/2009) (jmi) (Entered: 02/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 2/10/2009, Entered: 2/20/2009 MDL Conditional Transfer In OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER IN ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL... that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, the actions listed on the attached schedule A and pending in the District of Eastern District of California, and the same hereby are, transferred to the Southern District of New York, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Victor Marrero, for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings with the actions pending in that district and listed on Schedule A. (Signed by MDL Panel on 1/22/2009) (jmi) (Entered: 02/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 2/19/2009, Entered: 2/19/2009 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - SignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed without prejudice against the defendant(s) Genworth Financial Investment Management, LLC, Genworth Financial Inc. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 2/19/2009) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-06340-VM(jmi) (Entered: 02/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 2/11/2009, Entered: 2/11/2009 Certificate of Service Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Order Granting Zelle Hofmann Voelbel & Mason LLP's Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiffs on 02/11/2009. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Fairfax County, Virginia. (King, Jon) (Entered: 02/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 2/10/2009, Entered: 2/11/2009 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING ZELLE HOFMANN VOELBEL & MASON LLP'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS in case 1:08-cv-02516-VM; granting (78) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Richard Benjamin Zabel terminated in case 1:08-md-01950-VM. This matter, having come before the Court on a motion for an order granting leave for Zelle Hofmann Voelbel & Mason LLP to withdraw from the representation of Plaintiffs in the above-entitled matter, and the Court, having considered the papers filed in support thereof, hereby orders that the motion is GRANTED, and Zelle Hofmann may withdraw and hereby does withdraw from the representation of Plaintiffs in this matter. Zelle Hofmann reserves its right to petition at the appropriate time for fees and expenses for its work done prior to its withdrawal. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 2/9/2009) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM(jmi) Modified on 2/25/2009 (jmi). (Entered: 02/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 2/10/2009, Entered: 2/10/2009 Certificate of Service Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to Withdraw Zelle Hofmann Voelbel & Mason LLP as Counsel for Plaintiffs on 02/09/2009. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Fairfax County, Virginia. (King, Jon) (Entered: 02/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 2/9/2009, Entered: 2/9/2009 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Craig C. Corbitt in Support re: 78 MOTION for Zelle, Hofmann, Voelbel & Mason LLP to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiffs.. Document filed by Fairfax County, Virginia. (King, Jon) (Entered: 02/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 2/9/2009, Entered: 2/9/2009 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Zelle, Hofmann, Voelbel & Mason LLP to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiffs. Document filed by Fairfax County, Virginia.(King, Jon) (Entered: 02/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 2/6/2009, Entered: 2/9/2009 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - SignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT SHOCKLEY FINANCIAL CORP.Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed without prejudice against the defendant(s) Shockley Financial Corp. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 2/5/2009) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM(jmi) Modified on 2/9/2009 (jmi). (Entered: 02/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 2/4/2009, Entered: 2/5/2009 Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Attorney Marc M. Seltzer for Municipal Derivatives Antitrust Litigation admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 2/4/2009) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM(jmi) (Entered: 02/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: 2/3/2009 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION TO ADMIT COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE for Marc M. Seltzer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by City of Stockton, City of Los Angeles, Hinds County, Mississippi, Haywood County, Tennessee, Fairfax County, Virginia, City of Oakland, Mayor and City Counsel of Baltimore, County of Alameda, Central Bucks School District, City of Baltimore, Maryland, State of Mississippi, Bucks County Water And Sewer Authority, County of Alameda, California, City of Fresno, California, Berkeley County, South Carolina, Charleston County School District, South Carolina, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Fall River, Massachusetts.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM(rjm) (Entered: 02/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 1/9/2009, Entered: 1/12/2009 Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE. Attorney Aron K. Liang for City of Stockton, City of Los Angeles, admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 1/9/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(rjm) (Entered: 01/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 1/9/2009, Entered: 1/12/2009 Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE. Attorney Nanci E. Nishimura for City of Stockton, City of Los Angeles, admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 1/9/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(rjm) (Entered: 01/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 1/8/2009, Entered: 1/8/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Corrected Withdrawal Of Appearance re: (66 in 1:08-md-01950-VM) Notice (Other). Document filed by GE Funding Capital Market Services, Inc., Trinity Funding Co., LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(Boccanfuso, Anthony) (Entered: 01/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 12/31/2008, Entered: 1/8/2009 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nanci E. Nishimura on behalf of City of Stockton, City of Los Angeles Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM(rjm) (Entered: 01/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 12/31/2008, Entered: 1/8/2009 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Aron K. Liang on behalf of City of Stockton, City of Los Angeles Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM(rjm) (Entered: 01/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 1/5/2009, Entered: 1/6/2009 Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Attorney Aron K. Liang for City of Stockton and City of Los Angeles admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 1/5/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM(rjm) (Entered: 01/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 1/6/2009, Entered: 1/6/2009 Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Attorney Nanci E. Nishimura for City of Stockton and City of Los Angeles admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 1/5/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM(rjm) (Entered: 01/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 12/30/2008, Entered: 1/5/2009 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sonia Kuester Pfaffenroth on behalf of GE Funding Capital Market Services, Inc., Trinity Funding Co., LLC Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM(rjm) (Entered: 01/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 12/30/2008, Entered: 12/30/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance. Document filed by Genworth Financial Inc., Trinity Funding Co., LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(Boccanfuso, Anthony) (Entered: 12/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 12/19/2008, Entered: 12/22/2008 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT. In light of the ongoing discussions between Plaintiffs and Defendant Bank of America N.A ("Bank of America") as referenced in paragraph 2 of the Consolidated Complaint, and in order to promote further such discussions, and without waiving either party's rights, Plaintiffs and Bank of America hereby stipulate and agree that Bank of America shall have until and including February 20, 2009 to answer or otherwise respond to the Consolidated Complaint. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 12/19/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM(rjm) (Entered: 12/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: 12/18/2008 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Magda M. Jimenez dated 12/16/08 re: request that Plaintiffs be permitted to file under seal certain of the exhibits cited in our papers in opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss, which will be filed and served on 12/22/08. ENDORSEMENT: Request granted. Plaintiffs are authorized to file under seal their opposition papers to defendants' motion to dismiss with a redacted set filed electronically in the public docket. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 12/16/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(rjm) (Entered: 12/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: 12/18/2008 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - SignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT PACKERKISS SECURITIES, INC. WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed without prejudice against the defendant(s) Packerkiss Securities, Inc., Pakerkiss Securities, Inc, only. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 12/16/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(rjm) (Entered: 12/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: 12/18/2008 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - SignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT FELD WINTERS FINANCIAL LLC WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed without prejudice against the defendant(s) Feld Winters Financial LLC, only. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 12/16/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(rjm) (Entered: 12/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/3/2008, Entered: 12/17/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Bankruptcy. Document filed by James W. Giddens. (rjm) (Entered: 12/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: 12/15/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER OF STAY: This action is hereby stayed with respect to defendant Lehman Brothers, Inc. consistent with the Order Commencing Liquidation dated 9/19/08 and the Automatic Stay provisions of the United States Bankruptcy Code. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 12/16/08) (rjm) (Entered: 12/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: 12/12/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Shannon M. Kasley on behalf of Bank of America, Bank of America N.A. (Kasley, Shannon) (Entered: 12/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 11/26/2008, Entered: 12/11/2008 MDL Conditional Transfer In OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER IN ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL... transferring this action from the United States District Court - that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, the actions listed on the attached schedule A and pending in the District of other than the SDNY, and the same hereby are, transferred to the Southern District of New York, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Victor Marrero, for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings with the actions pending in that district and listed on Schedule A. (Signed by MDL Panel on 11/26/08) (rjm) (Entered: 12/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/4/2008, Entered: 12/4/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: Upon review of the complaints and other papers filed with the Court in connection with the three cases captioned above, the Court notes that the complaints describe the same or substantially similar underlying events and operative facts, and assert claims arising out of the same or substantiallysimilar actions against all or most of the same defendants and that the cases were transferred to this Court by the Multidistrict Litigation Panel as part of 08 MDL 1950 for consolidation and coordination of pretrial proceedings. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to consolidate the two cases captioned above for all pretrial purposes; and it is further ORDERED that all filings in connection with the consolidated action be docketed against the remaining lower number case, 08 Civ. 2516; and its finally ORDERED that the Clerk of Court close the referenced higher numbered cases, 08 Civ. 10350 and 08 Civ. 10351, as a separate actions and remove them from the Court's database of open cases. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 12/4/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM, 1:08-cv-10350-VM, 1:08-cv-10351-VM(db) (Entered: 12/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/2/2008, Entered: 12/4/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sarah Loomis Cave on behalf of James W. Giddens (djc) (Entered: 12/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 11/20/2008, Entered: 11/26/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL by James A. Quadra on behalf of County of Alameda, California, City of Oakland, California. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(rjm) (Entered: 11/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 11/24/2008, Entered: 11/24/2008 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, that Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP is relieved as counsel for Lehman and Hughes Hubbard & Reed LLP is recognized as counsel for the Trustee for Lehman. Attorney Allon Lifshitz; Moses Silverman; David Mark Cave and Michael E. Gertzman terminated. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 11/24/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM(db) (Entered: 11/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/20/2008, Entered: 11/24/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL by G. Scott Emblidge on behalf of City of Oakland, County of Alameda, County of Alameda, California, City of Oakland, California. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(rjm) (Entered: 11/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/12/2008, Entered: 11/17/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dylan J. McFarland on behalf of Hinds County, Mississippi, Haywood County, Tennessee, Fairfax County, Virginia, City of Oakland, Mayor and City Counsel of Baltimore, County of Alameda, Central Bucks School District, City of Baltimore, Maryland, State of Mississippi, Bucks County Water And Sewer Authority, County of Alameda, California, City of Fresno, California, Berkeley County, South Carolina, Charleston County School District, South Carolina, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Fall River, Massachusetts Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM(rjm) (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/12/2008, Entered: 11/17/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Vincent J. Esades on behalf of Hinds County, Mississippi, Haywood County, Tennessee, Fairfax County, Virginia, City of Oakland, Mayor and City Counsel of Baltimore, County of Alameda, Central Bucks School District, City of Baltimore, Maryland, State of Mississippi, Bucks County Water And Sewer Authority, County of Alameda, California, City of Fresno, California, Berkeley County, South Carolina, Charleston County School District, South Carolina, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Fall River, Massachusetts Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM(rjm) (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/14/2008, Entered: 11/14/2008 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Robert Gerard Eisler on behalf of Fairfax County, Virginia. New Address: Hausfeld, LLP, 1146 19th Street, NW, 5th, Washington, DC, USA 20036, 202-579-1089. (Eisler, Robert) (Entered: 11/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/6/2008, Entered: 11/12/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patricia L. Maher on behalf of Bank of America, Bank of America N.A., Bank of America, N.A., Bank of America, N.A. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM, 1:08-cv-03002-VM, 1:08-cv-05493-VM, 1:08-cv-06304-VM(rjm) (Entered: 11/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/6/2008, Entered: 11/10/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Laura Cofer Taylor on behalf of GE Funding Capital Market Services, Inc., Trinity Funding Co., LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(rjm) (Entered: 11/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/22/2008, Entered: 10/22/2008 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINT PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING EXPERT DISCOVERY... Regarding the procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of Expert Discovery... and as further set forth. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 10/21/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM(rjm) (Entered: 10/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/13/2008, Entered: 10/13/2008 Affidavit of Service Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Rule 7.1 Statement (corrected) on 10/13/2008. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by National Westminster Bank PLC. (Davis, Harry) (Entered: 10/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/13/2008, Entered: 10/13/2008 Affidavit of Service Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of notice of appearance of Harry Davis (corrected) on 10/13/2008. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by National Westminster Bank PLC. (Davis, Harry) (Entered: 10/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/13/2008, Entered: 10/13/2008 Affidavit of Service Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of notice of appearance of Taleah Jennings (corrected) on 10/13/2008. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by National Westminster Bank PLC. (Jennings, Taleah) (Entered: 10/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/10/2008, Entered: 10/10/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Taleah Esperanza Jennings on behalf of National Westminster Bank PLC (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of service)(Jennings, Taleah) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/10/2008, Entered: 10/10/2008 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Royal Bank of ScotlandGroup plc as Corporate Parent. Document filed by National Westminster Bank PLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of service)(Davis, Harry) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/10/2008, Entered: 10/10/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Harry Simeon Davis on behalf of National Westminster Bank PLC (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of service)(Davis, Harry) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: 9/17/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John W. Woods on behalf of Genworth Financial Investment Management, LLC Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM(rjm) (Entered: 09/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: 9/17/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by R. Hewitt Pate on behalf of Genworth Financial Investment Management, LLC Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM(rjm) (Entered: 09/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: 9/11/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Neil K. Gilman on behalf of Genworth Financial Investment Management, LLC. This Document relates to 08-2516, 08-0432, 08-6304, 08-2116, 08-3278, 08-0956, 08-1045. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM, 1:08-cv-06304-VM(rjm) (Entered: 09/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 34 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: 8/27/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey B. Gittleman on behalf of Hinds County, Mississippi, Haywood County, Tennessee, Fairfax County, Virginia, City of Oakland, Mayor and City Counsel of Baltimore, County of Alameda, Central Bucks School District, City of Baltimore, Maryland, State of Mississippi, Bucks County Water And Sewer Authority, Municipal Derivatives Antitrust Litigation, Berkeley County, South Carolina, Charleston County School District, South Carolina, City of Chicago, Illinois, City of Fall River, Massachusetts Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM(Gittleman, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 33 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: 8/25/2008 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT against Financial Security Assurance, Inc., Genworth Financial Investment Management, LLC, XL Capital Ltd., XL Asset Funding Co. I LLC, Merrill Lynch & Co. Inc., Municipal Government Investors Corp., AIG Financial Products Corp., AIG Sunamerica Life Assurance Co., Bank of America N.A., Bear, Stearns & Co., Inc., CDR Financial Products, Cain Brothers & Co., LLC, Feld Winters Financial LLC, Financial Guaranty Insurance Company, Financial Security Assurance Holdings, Ltd., First Southwest Company, GE Funding Capital Market Services, Inc., George K. Baum & Co., Investment Management Advisory Group, Inc., JP Morgan Chase & Co., Kinsell Newcomb & DE Dios, Inc., Merrill Lynch & Co., Morgan Keegan & Co., Inc., Morgan Stanley, National Westminster Bank PLC, Natixis Funding Corp., Natixis S.A., Packerkiss Securities, Inc., Piper Jaffray & Co., Shockley Financial Corp., Societe Generale SA, Sound Capital Management, Inc., Trinity Funding Co., LLC, UBS AG, Wachovia Bank N.A., Winters & Co. Advisors, LLC, XL Life Insurance & Annuity, Inc..Document filed by City of Baltimore, Maryland, Bucks County Water And Sewer Authority, Fairfax County, Virginia, State of Mississippi, Central Bucks School District.(dle) (dle).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: 9/11/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael D. Hausfeld on behalf of Fairfax County, Virginia Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM(rjm) (Entered: 09/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/9/2008, Entered: 9/10/2008 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Steven E. Fineman dated 9/9/08 re: The California Plaintiffs request clarification that the consolidation orders do not dismiss their cases or otherwise affect their substantive rights. ENDORSEMENT: The Court's consolidation orders in this action are not intended to dismiss claims not asserted in the consolidated class action complaint. Consolidation of cases involving such claims is for practical purposes only. An appropriate means to address the concerns expressed by plaintiffs herein may be discussed at the 9/12/08 conference. No new motion practice shall be necessary. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 9/9/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM(rjm) (Entered: 09/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 31 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dana Christina Rundlof on behalf of Morgan Keegan & Co., Inc. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-03002-VM, 1:08-cv-05492-VM, 1:08-cv-06340-VM, 1:08-cv-06342-VM(Rundlof, Dana)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 32 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: 8/25/2008 MDL Order Transfer Origin in S.D.N.Y.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER IN ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL... that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, the action(s) listed... and pending... be, and the same hereby are, transferred to the Southern District of New York and, with consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Victor Marrero, for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings with the actions pending in that district... (Signed by MDL Panel on 7/29/08) (laq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: 9/2/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph D. Edmondson, Jr on behalf of Morgan Keegan & Co., Inc. (Original filed in 08 cv 2516, document number 213). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(rw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 30 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: 8/19/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John W. Lundquist on behalf of Sound Capital Management, Inc. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(jmi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 29 Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: 8/15/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Pamela A. Markert on behalf of Central Bucks School District Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM(rjm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 28 Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: 8/12/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicole M. Moen on behalf of Sound Capital Management, Inc. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM, 1:08-cv-02516-VM(rjm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 27 Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: 8/11/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Laurence S. Berman, Arnold Levin on behalf of Fairfax County, Virginia. Pursuant to this Orders signed by the Honorable Victor Marrero in this proceeding on July 17, 2008, I hereby enter the appearance of Arnold Levin and Laurence S. Berman pro hac vice as counsel for plaintiff Fairfax County, Virginia in this matter. Attached hereto please find Certificates of Good Standing for both Mr. Levin and Mr. Berman. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:08-md-01950-VM et al.(jmi) (jmi).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 26 Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: 8/8/2008 MDL Conditional Transfer In OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER IN ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL (CTO-2)... transferring this action from the United States District Court - that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, the actions listed on the attached schedule A and pending in the District of other than the SDNY, and the same hereby are, transferred to the Southern District of New York, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Victor Marrero, for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings with the actions pending in that district and listed on Schedule A. (Signed by MDL Panel on 7/17/08) (rjm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      <