Amidax Trading Group v. S.W.I.F.T. SCRL et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-05689-PKC

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 29, 2017 at 3:25 AM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Amidax Trading Group, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bruce Afran, Attorney at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space BRUCE IRA AFRAN +1 609 924 2075 +1 609 924 1045 bruceafran@aol.com
v.
United States Central Intelligence Agency United States Central Intelligence Agency, Defendant
Officially listed as "Central Intelligence Agency"
No Logo George Tenet, Defendant
Bush, George Walker Bush, George Walker, Defendant
Officially listed as "George W. Bush"
No Logo Henry M. Paulson, Jr., Defendant
No Logo John Snow, Defendant
Hayden, Michael V. Hayden, Michael V., Defendant
Officially listed as "Michael Hayden"
Motorola, Inc. Unknown Role, Motorola, Inc.
Cheney, Richard B. Cheney, Richard B., Defendant
Officially listed as "Richard Cheney"
No Logo S.W.I.F.T. Pan-Americas Inc., Defendant
No Logo S.w.i.f.t. Scrl, Defendant
No Logo Swift, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Stuart Levey, Defendant
United States Department of the Treasury United States Department of the Treasury, Defendant
Officially listed as "United States Department of Treasury"
Office Foley Square
Filed 6/23/2008
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $9999000
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition
County XX Out of State
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag ECF
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 4 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: 8/4/2008 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Bruce I. Afran dated 8/1/08 Counsel requests adjournment of the initial pretrial conference and in support thereof state the following: The conference is scheduled for August 28, 2008 at 11:15 a.m. There have been no previous requests for adjournment or extensions; and the adversaries have not yet been served with summonses or notices of lawsuit and requests for waiver of summons. ENDORSEMENT: Conference is adjourned form August 28 to September 19, 2008 at 11:30 a.m. So ordered. (Initial Conference set for 9/19/2008 at 11:30 AM before Judge P. Kevin Castel.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 8/3/08) (mme)
    LREF
    Legal Document 3 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: 7/2/2008 Order for Initial Pretrial ConferenceCourt Filing
    ORDER SCHEDULING INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 8/28/2008 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 12C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 7/2/08) (mme)
      LREF
      Legal Document 2 Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: 6/30/2008 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
      RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Amidax Trading Group.(mbe) (rdz).
        LREF
        Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: 6/30/2008 Complaint
        COMPLAINT against United States Department of Treasury, George W. Bush(in his personal capacity), George W. Bush(in his professional capacity), Central Intelligence Agency, Richard Cheney(in his personal capacity), Richard Cheney(in his professional capacity), George Tenet(in his personal capacity), George Tenet(in his professional capacity), Michael Hayden, Henry M. Paulson, Jr.(in his personal capacity), Henry M. Paulson, Jr.(in his professional capacity), S.W.I.F.T. SCRL, S.W.I.F.T. Pan-Americas Inc., S.W.I.F.T., Inc., John Snow(in his personal capacity), John Snow(in his professional capacity), Stuart Levey(in his personal capacity), Stuart Levey(in his professional capacity). (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 655129)Document filed by Amidax Trading Group.(mbe) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/29/2008: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D) (mbe). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/26/2008: # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G) (mbe).
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: 6/30/2008 Note to Attorney to E-Mail PDF
          ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO E-MAIL PDF. Note to Attorney for noncompliance with Section (3) of the S.D.N.Y. 3rd Amended Instructions For Filing An Electronic Case or Appeal and Section 1(d) of the S.D.N.Y. Procedures For Electronic Case Filing. E-MAIL the PDF for Document [1] Complaint,,, [2] Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement to: case_openings@nysd.uscourts.gov. (mbe)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: 6/30/2008 Case Designated ECF.
            Case Designated ECF. (mbe)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: 6/30/2008 Case Designation
              Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck is so designated. (mbe)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: 6/30/2008 Summons Issued
                SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Treasury, George W. Bush(in his personal capacity), George W. Bush(in his professional capacity), Central Intelligence Agency, Richard Cheney(in his personal capacity), Richard Cheney(in his professional capacity), George Tenet(in his personal capacity), George Tenet(in his professional capacity), Michael Hayden, Henry M. Paulson, Jr.(in his personal capacity), Henry M. Paulson, Jr.(in his professional capacity), S.W.I.F.T. SCRL, S.W.I.F.T. Pan-Americas Inc., S.W.I.F.T., Inc., John Snow(in his personal capacity), John Snow(in his professional capacity), Stuart Levey(in his personal capacity), Stuart Levey(in his professional capacity). (mbe)
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 94 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?