USA v. Steger
Criminal Case New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:08-cr-00630-VM

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

v.
No Logo Douglas A. Steger, Defendant

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Foley Square
Filed 7/10/2008
County NewYork
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 371.F
Offense Level 4
Count 2
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7206A.F
Offense Level 4
Def Custody Status
Flag ECF
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 5 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: 9/5/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Douglas A. Steger held on 7/10/08 before Magistrate Judge Douglas F. Eaton. (ama)
    LREF
    Legal Document 4 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: 7/15/2008 Consent to Proceed on Felony Plea Allocution
    CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE ON A FELONY PLEA ALLOCUTION by Douglas A. Steger. (jw)
      LREF
      Legal Document 3 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: 7/15/2008 Waiver of Indictment
      WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Douglas A. Steger. (jw)
        LREF
        Legal Document 2 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: 7/15/2008 Information - Felony
        INFORMATION (Felony) filed as to Douglas A. Steger (1) count(s) 1, 2. [Microfilmed on 7/14/08 at 3:00pm] (jw)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: 7/15/2008 Order of Referral to Probation for Presentence Inv
          Order of Referral to Probation for Presentence Investigation and Report as to Douglas A. Steger. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. Eaton on 7/10/08)(jw)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: 7/15/2008 Plea Entered
            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas F. Eaton: Plea entered by Douglas A. Steger (1) Guilty as to Count 1,2. (jw)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: 7/15/2008 Arraignment
              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas F. Eaton:Arraignment as to Douglas A. Steger (1) Count 1,2 held on 7/10/2008. Deft Steger present with attorney Thomas K. McQueen, Esq. For the Govt Stanley Okula/Nanette Davis, present and Court reporter Linda Fisher, present. Deft Steger Waived Indictment and filed a consent to proceed before a US Magistrate Judge on a Felony Allocution referred by Judge Marrero. Deft Steger entered a guilty to Count 1 and Count 2 of the Information. The Court recommends that Judge Marrero the guilty plea to Count 1 and Count 2. PSI ordered. The parties must contact Judge Marrero chambers to schedule a sentencing date. Deft released ROR. (jw)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: 7/15/2008 Initial Appearance
                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Victor Marrero:Initial Appearance on Disposition Sheet as to Douglas A. Steger held on 7/10/2008. Deft present with atty Thomas K. McQueen. AUSA Stanley Okula and Nanette Davis present. Travel restricted to SDNY/EDNY and all 48 states of the USA except Alaska & Hawaii. Surrender travel documents (& No new applications). Deft ROR. Sentence date will be set by Judge Marrero. (jw)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 Case Designated ECF.
                  Case Designated ECF as to Douglas A. Steger. (jm)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/24/2008, Entered: 7/15/2008 Notice of Intent to File Information
                    NOTICE OF INTENT TO FILE an Information by U.S.A. as to Douglas A. Steger. (jw)
                      LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 111 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?