Lin et al v. Chertoff et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-06391-GEL

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cheng Yin Liu, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by tedcoxlaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Theodore N. Cox +1 212 925 1208 +1 212 925 5188 theodorecox@gmail.com
No Logo Feng Duan Lin, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by tedcoxlaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Theodore N. Cox +1 212 925 1208 +1 212 925 5188 theodorecox@gmail.com
No Logo Lin Fan Liu, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by tedcoxlaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Theodore N. Cox +1 212 925 1208 +1 212 925 5188 theodorecox@gmail.com
No Logo Rin Bin Liu, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by tedcoxlaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Theodore N. Cox +1 212 925 1208 +1 212 925 5188 theodorecox@gmail.com
v.
No Logo Andrea Qurantillo, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frank James Loprest, Jr +1 212 637 2728 +1 212 637 2786 james.loprest@usdoj.gov
Rice, Condoleezza Rice, Condoleezza, Defendant
Officially listed as "Condoleeza Rice"
Unknown Role, Kior, Inc.
Unknown Role, Evenflow, Inc.
Unknown Role, C3, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frank James Loprest, Jr +1 212 637 2728 +1 212 637 2786 james.loprest@usdoj.gov
No Logo Henrietta Fore, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frank James Loprest, Jr +1 212 637 2728 +1 212 637 2786 james.loprest@usdoj.gov
No Logo Jonathan Scharfen, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frank James Loprest, Jr +1 212 637 2728 +1 212 637 2786 james.loprest@usdoj.gov
No Logo Michael Chertoff, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frank James Loprest, Jr +1 212 637 2728 +1 212 637 2786 james.loprest@usdoj.gov
No Logo Robert Goldberg, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frank James Loprest, Jr +1 212 637 2728 +1 212 637 2786 james.loprest@usdoj.gov
Office Foley Square
Filed 7/16/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 540 - Prisoner Petitions: Mandamus and Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County NewYork
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag ECF
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 3 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: 8/4/2008 Notice of Appearance/
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Frank James Loprest, Jr on behalf of Jonathan Scharfen, Andrea Qurantillo, Condoleeza Rice, Henrietta Fore, Robert Goldberg, Michael Chertoff (Loprest, Frank)
    LREF
    Legal Document 2 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to USA
    SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Jonathan Scharfen served on 7/16/2008, answer due 9/15/2008; Andrea Qurantillo served on 7/16/2008, answer due 9/15/2008; Condoleeza Rice served on 7/16/2008, answer due 9/15/2008; Henrietta Fore served on 7/16/2008, answer due 9/15/2008; Robert Goldberg served on 7/16/2008, answer due 9/15/2008; Michael Chertoff served on 7/16/2008, answer due 9/15/2008. Service was made by Certified Mail. Document filed by Feng Duan Lin; Rin Bin Liu; Cheng Yin Liu; Lin Fan Liu. (Cox, Theodore)
      LREF
      Blank 1 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: 7/17/2008 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus
      COMPLAINT IN THE NATURE OF MANDAMUS against Jonathan Scharfen, Andrea Qurantillo, Condoleeza Rice, Henrietta Fore, Robert Goldberg, Michael Chertoff (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 656919).Document filed by Feng Duan Lin, Rin Bin Liu, Cheng Yin Liu, Lin Fan Liu.(tro)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: 7/17/2008 Case Designated ECF.
        Case Designated ECF. (tro)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: 7/17/2008 Case Designation
          Magistrate Judge Kevin N. Fox is so designated. (tro)
            LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 71 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?