USA v. John
Criminal Case New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:08-cr-00656-AKH

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nicole Ware Friedlander +1 212 627 2211 +1 212 637 2527 nicole.friedlander@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Desteni John, Defendant

Represented by Office of Defender Services

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Foley Square
Filed 7/17/2008
County Bronx
Terminated
Reopened
Magistrate Case
108-mj-01371-UA
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 2113A.F
Offense Level 4
182113A.F BANK ROBBERY BY FORCE OR VIOLENCE
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
Flags ECF, PRIOR
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 8 Filed: 8/15/2008, Entered: 8/20/2008 Consent to Proceed on Felony Plea AllocutionCourt Filing
CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE ON A FELONY PLEA ALLOCUTION by Desteni John. (Accepted by Magistrate Judge Henry Pitman on 8/15/08) (bw)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 7/25/2008, Entered: 8/1/2008 Pretrial Conference
    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein:Pretrial Conference as to Desteni John held on 7/25/2008 as to Desteni John( Pretrial Conference set for 8/28/2008 at 10:00 AM before Judge Denise L. Cote.)Deft present with atty Philip Weinstein; AUSA Nicole Friedlander present. Court reporter Martha Drevis present. Next PTC is set for and time excluded until 8/28/08 at 10:00am; in the interest of justice; Deft cont'd remanded. (jw)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: 7/24/2008 Arraignment
      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Frank Maas: Arraignment as to Desteni John (1) on Count 1 held on 7/18/2008. Dft John is present w/atty Philip Weinstein. AUSA Nicole Friedlander present. Dft arraigned, plea entered by Desteni John (1) to Count 1 of Not Guilty. T/E excluded through 7/25/08. (Case to be reassigned because Judge Cote has recused herself). Control date of 7/25/08 set for conference. (ja)
        LREF
        Legal Document 6 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: 8/4/2008 Notice of Case Assignment/ReassignmentCourt Filing
        NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT as to Desteni John, to Judge Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Judge Judge Denise L. Cote no longer assigned to the case. (mbe) (mbe).
          LREF
          Legal Document 5 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: 7/17/2008 Indictment
          INDICTMENT FILED as to Desteni John (1) count(s) 1. (jm)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: 7/17/2008 Case Designated ECF.
            Case Designated ECF as to Desteni John. (jm)
              LREF
              Blank 4 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008 Order Appointing Public DefenderCourt Filing
              ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Desteni John. Philip L Weinstein for Desteni John appointed.. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck on 6/19/2008)(dif)[1:08-mj-01371-UA]
                LREF
                Blank 3 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Federal Defender Philip Weinstein appearing for Desteni John. (dif)[1:08-mj-01371-UA]
                  LREF
                  Blank 2 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23Court Filing
                  CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Desteni John. (Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck) (dif)[1:08-mj-01371-UA]
                    LREF
                    Blank 1 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008 ComplaintCourt Filing
                    COMPLAINT as to Desteni John (1). In Violation of 18 U.S.C. 2113 (Bank Robbery) (Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck) (dif)[1:08-mj-01371-UA]
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008 Initial Appearance
                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck:Initial Appearance as to Desteni John held on 6/19/2008., with Federal Defender Philip Weinstein and AUSA Nicole Friedlander for the government. $100,000 PRB; 3 FRP'S; Secured by $10,000 Cash; Travel Limited to SDNY/EDNY; Surrender Travel Documents (& No New Applications); Strict Pretrial Supervision with Drug Testing/Treatment; Home Incarceration with Electronic Monitoring; No Release Until All Conditions Met; ( Preliminary Examination set for 7/21/2008 at 10:00 AM before Judge Unassigned.) (dif)[1:08-mj-01371-UA]
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008 Arrest
                        Arrest of Desteni John. (dif)[1:08-mj-01371-UA]
                          LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 258 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?