Teague, et al v. AMR Services Corp, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-06800-AKH

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 25, 2017 at 12:30 PM DT (4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Elaine Teague, Plaintiff

Represented by Hanly Conroy Bierstein Sheridan Fisher & Hayes, LLP

Represented by Motley Rice, LLC

v.
No Logo AirTran Airways, Inc., Defendant
American Airlines, Inc. American Airlines, Inc., Defendant
AMR Corporation Unknown Role, AMR Corporation
Unknown Role, Orbitz Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon & Forsyth LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Desmond Thomas Barry, Jr +1 212 894 6700 +1 212 894 6771 dbarry@condonlaw.com
AMR Corporation AMR Corporation, Defendant
Unknown Role, Orbitz Inc
Unknown Role, Mesa Airlines Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon & Forsyth LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Desmond Thomas Barry, Jr +1 212 894 6700 +1 212 894 6771 dbarry@condonlaw.com
No Logo Argenbright Security, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon & Forsyth LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Desmond Thomas Barry, Jr +1 212 894 6700 +1 212 894 6771 dbarry@condonlaw.com
No Logo Atlantic Coast Airlines, Inc., Defendant
Continental Airlines, Inc. Continental Airlines, Inc., Defendant
Delta Air Lines, Inc. Delta Air Lines, Inc., Defendant
No Logo National Airlines, Inc., Defendant
No Logo NorthWest Airlines Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Securicor PLC., Defendant
The Boeing Company, Inc. The Boeing Company, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "The Boeing Company"
No Logo Us Airways, Inc., Defendant
United Airlines, Inc. United Airlines, Inc., Defendant
Office Foley Square
Filed 9/8/2003
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County XX Out of State
Terminated 7/18/2008
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
121-mc-00101-AKH
Related Case
102-cv-00458-AKH
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, MEMBER, RELATED
  Entries (133) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 8/1/2008, Entered: 8/1/2008 Received Returned Mail
Received returned mail Mail was addressed to Paul J Hanly Jr of Hanly Conroy Bierstein & Sheridan LLP at 415 Madison Avenue, New York NY 10017 and was returned for the following reason(s): Not Deliverable As Addressed. (jab)
    LREF
    Legal Document 116 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
    STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... that any and all claims asserted and/or assertable by Plaintiff(s) The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey, WTC Retail LLC and the Port Authority Trans-Hudson Corporation contained in the Complaint(08cv3701 and dated 4/16/08) against Defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc. with regard to United Airlines Flight 175 in the captioned lawsuit shall be dismissed by the Court without prejudice... and without costs to either party as against the other. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/28/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(rjm)
      LREF
      Legal Document 115 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
      STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... that any and all claims asserted and/or assertable by Plaintiff(s) World Trade Center Properties LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC and 4 World Trade Center LLC against Defendant(s) Delta Air Lines, Inc. and Delta Express, Inc. with regard to United Airlines Flight 175 shall be dismissed by the Court without prejudice... and without costs to either party as against the other... and as further set forth. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/18/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(rjm) Modified on 7/21/2008 (rjm).
        LREF
        Legal Document 114 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: 7/18/2008 Judgment*Court Filing
        FINAL JUDGMENT that there is no just reason for delay pursuant to FRCP 54(b), settling the action as to 03 CV 6800(AKH) and dismissing the complaint with prejudice as to all defendants. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/15/08) (Attachments: # (1) notice of right to appeal)(ml)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: 7/25/2008 Mail Notice of Right to Appeal
          Mailed notice of Right to Appeal to Attorney(s) of Record: Desmond Thomas Barry, Jr, Jodi Westbrook Flowers, Robert Turner Haefele, Paul J. Hanly, Jr, Donald A. Migliori, Ronald L. Motley, Mary F. Schiavo, Elizabeth S. Smith, Jeffrey Scott Thompson. (ama)
            LREF
            Legal Document 113 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: 7/10/2008 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [111] MOTION for Judgment Approving Settlement and Dismissing Complaint.. Document filed by American Airlines, Inc., Argenbright Security, Inc., AMR Corporation. (Barry, Desmond)
              LREF
              Legal Document 112 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: 7/10/2008 Declaration in Support of Motion
              DECLARATION of Desmond T. Barry, Jr. in Support re: [111] MOTION for Judgment Approving Settlement and Dismissing Complaint.. Document filed by American Airlines, Inc., Argenbright Security, Inc., AMR Corporation. (Barry, Desmond)
                LREF
                Legal Document 111 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: 7/10/2008, Terminated: 7/18/2008 ~Motion for Judgment
                MOTION for Judgment Approving Settlement and Dismissing Complaint. Document filed by American Airlines, Inc., Argenbright Security, Inc., AMR Corporation.(Barry, Desmond)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 3/19/2008, Entered: 4/8/2008 Case Consolidation - Member
                  CONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Create association to 1:21-mc-00101-AKH.. (rw)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 110 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: 3/18/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                    JOINT PROPOSED ORDER TRANSFERRING CASES TO 21MC101 (AKH) DOCKET AND CLOSING 21MC97 (AKH) that the cases attached hereto as "Exhibit A" are to be moved from the 21mc97(AKH) Master Docket to the 21mc101(AKH) Master Docket. The Cross-Claims of all WTCP Cross-Claim Plaintiffs and the Cross-Claims of The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey, pending in 21mc97, shall be transferred to the 21mc101 docket under four new civil action numbers, two to be purchased by the WTCP Cross-Claim Plaintiffs and two to be purchased by the Port Authority. Leave is hereby granted for Cross-Claim Plaintiffs to amend their respective cross-claims within thirty days of this order solely to recast them as direct claims by the Cross-Claim Plaintiffs as Plaintiffs against the Cross-Claim Defendants as Defendants. The Clerk is instructed to close the Master Docket numbered 21mc97(AKH) thirty days from the date of this Order. This Document relates to member cases listed on attached Exhibit A as well as: 21mc97, 21mc101, 02-7156, 02-7289, 04-0365, 03-6800, 02-7145, 02-7260, 02-7154, 03-6811, 03-6940, 04-7213, 04-1350, 03-9965, 04-6788, 04-6789, 04-7914, 03-10203. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/18/08) (rjm)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 109 Filed: 2/27/2008, Entered: 2/27/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER DENYING MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT... that Teague's motion to enforce settlement is denied. The parties did not come to agreement on all material terms. This document relates to 21mc97 and 03-6800. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/27/08) (rjm)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 108 Filed: 2/26/2008, Entered: 2/26/2008 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                        DECLARATION of Desmond T. Barry, Jr. in Opposition re: [105] MOTION to Authorize Enforcement of Settlement Agreement Between Parties.. Document filed by American Airlines, Inc., Argenbright Security, Inc., AMR Corporation. (Barry, Desmond)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 107 Filed: 2/26/2008, Entered: 2/26/2008 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: [105] MOTION to Authorize Enforcement of Settlement Agreement Between Parties.. Document filed by American Airlines, Inc., Argenbright Security, Inc., AMR Corporation. (Barry, Desmond)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 106 Filed: 2/26/2008, Entered: 2/26/2008 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Desmond T. Barry, Jr. dated 2/22/08 re: Request to file opposition papers under seal. ENDORSEMENT: The parties shall redact the agreed settlement amount from the papers presented for filing. With such redaction all papers on this motion shall be filed publicly. This Document relates to 21mc97 and 03-6800. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/26/08) (rjm)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 105 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: 2/7/2008, Terminated: 2/27/2008 Motion to Authorize
                              MOTION to Authorize Enforcement of Settlement Agreement Between Parties. Document filed by Elaine Teague. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit 3, # (4) Errata Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit Exhibit 9, # (10) Exhibit Exhibit 10, # (11) Exhibit Exhibit 11, # (12) Exhibit Exhibit 12, # (13) Exhibit Exhibit 13, # (14) Exhibit Exhibit 14, # (15) Exhibit Exhibit 15, # (16) Exhibit Exhibit 16, # (17) Exhibit Exhibit 17A, # (18) Exhibit Exhibit 17B, # (19) Exhibit Exhibit 18, # (20) Exhibit Exhibit 19)(Schiavo, Mary)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 104 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: 2/7/2008 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                AFFIDAVIT of Mary Schiavo in Support re: [103] MOTION to Authorize Enforcement of Settlement Agreement Between Parties.. Document filed by Elaine Teague. (Schiavo, Mary)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 103 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: 2/7/2008, Terminated: 2/27/2008 Motion to Authorize
                                  MOTION to Authorize Enforcement of Settlement Agreement Between Parties. Document filed by Elaine Teague. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 9, # (10) Exhibit 10, # (11) Exhibit 11, # (12) Exhibit 12, # (13) Exhibit 13)(Schiavo, Mary)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 102 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: 2/7/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                    NOTICE of Motion. Document filed by Elaine Teague. (Schiavo, Mary)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 101 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                      NOTICE of Adoption of Answer of Defendant the Boeing Company to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Flight 77 Master Liability Complaint. Document filed by The Boeing Company. (Attachments: # (1) Answer of Defendant the Boeing Company to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Flight 77 Master Liability Complaint)(Lent, Eric)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 100 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                        NOTICE of Adopting Master Answer to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Flight 77 Master Liability Complaint (Document No. 1301 in 21MC97 (AKH)). Document filed by Argenbright Security, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service)(Wayland, Joseph)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 99 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                          NOTICE of Notice of Adoption to Flight 77 Fourth Amended MLC. Document filed by Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (Crowley, Michael)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 98 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 Affidavit of Service Other
                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice Adopting Answer of Defendant United Air Lines, Inc. to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Flight 77 Master Liability Complaint served on All Parties on 11/13/2007. Document filed by United Air Lines, Inc.. (Sexton, Brian)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 97 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                              NOTICE of Adoption by Defendant Airtran Airways, Inc.. Document filed by Airtran Airways, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of service)(Coster, James)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 96 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                NOTICE of Adoption of Master Answer to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Flight 77 Master Liability Complaint. Document filed by U.S. Airways, Inc.. (Guilfoyle, Kathleen)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 95 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                  NOTICE of Adopting Answer of Defendant United Air Lines, Inc. to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Flight 77 Master Liability Complaint. Document filed by United Air Lines, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Answer to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Flight 77 Master Liability Complaint# (2) Affidavit of Service of Answer to Fourth Amended Master Liability Complaint)(Sexton, Brian)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 94 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                    NOTICE of Adoption. Document filed by American Airlines, Inc., AMR Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Flight 77 Answer to Fourth Amended Complaint (21-MC-00097))(Barry, Desmond)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 93 Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: 11/2/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER that the Clerk of the Court shall mark each of the captioned actions as settled but maintain open files on each action until such times as the Court enters an Order approving the settlement, entering final judgment pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b), ruling that the liability limitation of Section 408(a)(1) of the Air Transportation Safety and System Stabilization Act applies to the settlement and dismissing the Complaint with prejudice... and as further set forth in said order. This Document relates to 21mc97, 02-6378, 02-6379, 03-6808, 03-6810, 03-1016, 03-6183, 03-6800. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 11/1/07) (rjm)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 92 Filed: 10/16/2007, Entered: 10/16/2007 Satisfaction of Judgment
                                                        SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT re: [89] Clerk's Judgment entered In favor of Elaine Teague Against AMR Corporation in the amount of $153,078.00. Judgment satisfied on 10/12/07. Document filed by Elaine Teague. (jco)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 91 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: 9/4/2007 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from LeAnn Lester dated 8/10/07 re: determination if Exhibit 1 should be filed under seal or in such a manner as the Court deems appropriate. ENDORSEMENT: The applicant shall discuss with the government if and to what extent sealing is still required and then make application to the Court. This Document relates to 21MC97, 02-7145 and 03-6800. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/4/07) (rjm)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 89 Filed: 8/16/2007, Entered: 8/16/2007 Clerks Judgment
                                                            CLERK'S PARTIAL JUDGMENT # 07,1599 That for the reasons stated in the Court's Amended Opinion and Order dated August 14, 2007, plaintiffs motion for summary judgment is granted as to Count Three in plaintiff Falkenbergs and plaintiff Teagues Amended Complaints for that portion of their Warsaw Convention claims equivalent to 100,000 Special Drawing Rights and denied without prejudice as to that portion of their Warsaw Convention claims in excess of 100,000 Special Drawing Rights; plaintiffs motion to recover litigation expenses, including attorneys fees, is denied; and a partial judgment is entered for plaintiff Ruth Falkenberg, as Personal Representative for the Estate of Leslie Ann Whittington, and for plaintiff Elaine Teague, as Personal Representative for the Estate of Sandra D. Teague, against defendant American Airlines, Inc., in the amount of $153,078, without interest or costs. (Signed by J. Michael McMahon, clerk on 8/16/07) (Attachments: # (1) notice of right to appeal)(ml)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 88 Filed: 8/15/2007, Entered: 8/15/2007 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                                                              AMENDED OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Warsaw Convention) # 94999. This Document relates to 21mc97, 02-7145, 03-6800. Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment is granted as to Count Three in plaintiff Falkenberg's and plaintiff Teague's Amended Complaints for that portion of their Warsaw Convention claims equivalent to 100,000 Special Drawing Rights, and denied without prejudice as to that portion of their Warsaw Convention claims in excess of 100,000 Special Drawing Rights. Plaintiffs may renew their motion for summary judgment for the remaining amount of their Warsaw Convention claims at a more appropriate point. Plaintiffs' motion to recover litigation expenses, including attorneys' fees, is denied. The parties have stipulated that the equivalent in United States dollars of 100,000 Special Drawing Rights for the purpose of this order is $153,078.00 without interest at this point, but subject to further consideration at the time of entry of final judgment. The Clerk shall enter partial judgment for Ruth Falkenberg, as Personal Representative for the Estate of Leslie Ann Whittington, and for plaintiff Elaine Teague, as Personal Representative for the Estate of Sandra D. Teague, against defendant American Airlines, Inc., in the amount of $153,078.00, without interest or costs. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/14/07) (rjm) Modified on 8/21/2007 (kkc).
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 87 Filed: 8/10/2007, Entered: 8/10/2007, Terminated: 8/15/2007 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                MOTION for Reconsideration re; [86] Memorandum & Opinion,,,,,. Document filed by Elaine Teague. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit # (2) Exhibit)(Schiavo, Mary)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 86 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: 7/30/2007 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                  MEMORANDUM AND OPINION # 94999 GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Warsaw Convention) re: [78] MOTION for Summary Judgment. filed by Elaine Teague. This Motion for summary judgment is granted as to Count Three in plaintiff Falkenberg's and plaintiff Teague's Amended Complaints for that portion of their Warsaw Convention claims equivalent to 100,000 Special Drawing Rights, and denied without prejudice as to that portion of their Warsaw Convention claims in excess of 100,000 Special Drawing Rights. The parties shall stipulate, by 8/10/07, the equivalent in US dollars of 100,000 Special Drawing Rights, without any computation of interest at this point. Plaintiffs' motion to recover litigation expenses, including attorneys' fees, is denied. Plaintiffs' non-Warsaw Convention claims (all counts except for Count Three in each complaint) are dismissed as to all defendants, and the complaint is dismissed in its entirety as to all defendants except for defendant American Airlines, Inc., which remains in the case. Plaintiffs may renew their motion for summary judgment for the remaining amount of their Warsaw Convention claims at a more appropriate point. The Clerk shall await a further order before preparing judgment. This Document relates to 21MC97, 02-7145 and 03-6800. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/30/07) (rjm) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/31/2007 (kkc).
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 85 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: 6/4/2007 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Mary Schiavo dated 5/17/07 re: Granted request for an enlargement of time of three business days to and including 5/23/07 to respond to Deft. American Airline's Opposition to the Motion for Summary Judgment in the two actions 02-7145 and 03-6800. Entered as Doc. No. 1073 in 21MC97. Relates to 02-7145 and 03-6800. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/17/07) (rjm)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 84 Filed: 5/24/2007, Entered: 5/24/2007 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                      REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [78] MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Elaine Teague. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 5)(Schiavo, Mary)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 83 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: 5/23/2007 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                        REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [78] MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Elaine Teague. (Schiavo, Mary)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 82 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: 5/7/2007 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Desmond T. Barry, Jr. in Opposition re: [78] MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by American Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A, Part 1# (2) Exhibit Exhibit A, Part 2# (3) Exhibit Exhibit B, Part 1# (4) Exhibit Exhibit B, Part 2# (5) Exhibit Exhibit B, Part 3# (6) Exhibit Exhibit B, Part 4# (7) Exhibit Exhibit C# (8) Exhibit Exhibit D# (9) Exhibit Exhibit E)(Barry, Desmond)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 81 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: 5/7/2007 Brief
                                                                            BRIEF re: [80] Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion Response to Plaintiffs' Statement of Material Facts in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment. Document filed by American Airlines, Inc..(Barry, Desmond)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 80 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: 5/7/2007 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: [78] MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by American Airlines, Inc.. (Barry, Desmond)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 79 Filed: 3/21/2007, Entered: 3/21/2007 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [78] MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Elaine Teague. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2# (3) Exhibit 3# (4) Exhibit 4)(Schiavo, Mary)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 78 Filed: 3/21/2007, Entered: 3/21/2007, Terminated: 7/30/2007 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                  MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Elaine Teague. (Attachments: # (1) Supplement Statement of Material Fact under Local Rule 56.1)(Schiavo, Mary)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 77 Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: 12/11/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                    CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER... All attorneys who have been admitted to this Court, either for all purposes or pro hac vice for purposes of this case who are not yet registered to file documents electronically, shall complete and file a CM/ECF attorney registration form by November 1, 2006. Forms can be found on the Court's website at www.nysd.uscourts.gov. As of October 17, 2006 all documents filed in the Miscellaneous case and the underlying civil cases shall be filed electronically on the Court's ECF system via the Internet at ecf.nysd.uscourts.gov. All correspondences are to be submitted in either Word or WordPerfect format to WTC_letters@nysd.uscourts.gov. The subject heading of the email must include the case number of the action or actions that the email pertains to. No correspondences are to be sent to Chambers through regular mail. No correspondences should be in the form of a motion. Amended complaints and supplemental pleading shall provide a list of the additional parties and indicate the action to which they are being added... (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/17/2006) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK,1:02-cv-00456-AKH,1:02-cv-00458-AKH,1:02-cv-01727-AKH,1:02-cv-01728-AKH,1:02-cv-03676-AKH,1:02-cv-06186-AKH,1:02-cv-06364-AKH,1:02-cv-06365-AKH,1:02-cv-06378-AKH,1:02-cv-06379-AKH,1:02-cv-07144-AKH,1:02-cv-07145-AKH,1:02-cv-07147-AKH,1:02-cv-07149-AKH,1:02-cv-07150-AKH,1:02-cv-07153-AKH,1:02-cv-07154-AKH,1:02-cv-07155-AKH,1:02-cv-07156-AKH,1:02-cv-07259-AKH,1:02-cv-07260-AKH,1:02-cv-07261-AKH,1:02-cv-07289-AKH,1:02-cv-07290-AKH,1:02-cv-07608-AKH,1:02-cv-07912-AKH,1:02-cv-08916-AKH,1:02-cv-08918-AKH,1:02-cv-08919-AKH,1:02-cv-09234-AKH,1:02-cv-10273-AKH,1:03-cv-00006-AKH,1:03-cv-00029-AKH,1:03-cv-00332-AKH-THK,1:03-cv-01016-AKH,1:03-cv-06183-AKH,1:03-cv-06801-AKH,1:03-cv-06805-AKH,1:03-cv-06843-AKH,1:03-cv-06929-AKH,1:03-cv-06940-AKH,1:03-cv-07019-AKH,1:03-cv-07040-AKH,1:03-cv-07641-AKH,1:03-cv-10203-AKH,1:04-cv-00365-AKH,1:04-cv-01857-AKH,1:04-cv-07189-AKH,1:04-cv-07226-AKH,1:04-cv-07298-AKH,1:04-cv-08067-AKH,1:04-cv-09627-AKH,1:05-cv-07243-AKH,1:06-cv-02990-AKH,1:06-cv-05115-AKH,1:06-cv-05967-AKH,2:03-cv-06105-AKH,2:03-cv-06310-AKH,2:03-cv-06800-AKH,2:03-cv-06802-AKH,2:03-cv-06803-AKH,2:03-cv-06808-AKH,2:03-cv-06810-AKH,2:03-cv-06811-AKH,2:03-cv-06838-AKH,2:03-cv-06966-AKH,2:03-cv-06968-AKH,2:03-cv-07021-AKH,2:03-cv-07022-AKH,2:03-cv-07071-AKH,2:03-cv-07076-AKH,2:03-cv-07083-AKH,2:03-cv-07084-AKH(mj, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 76 Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: 8/17/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER ADMITTING COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE; purs. to Local Civil Rule 1.3(c), Justin B. Kaplan is admitted pro hac vice to the bar of this Court for the purpose of representing pltffs in this proceeding and consolidated cases. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/14/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK. This document relates to: 03 cv 6183; 03 cv 7040; 03 cv 7073; 04 cv 365; 03 cv 7076; 03 cv 7083; 03 cv 7070; 03 cv 7084; 03 cv 7071; 02 cv 7150; 02 cv 3676; 03 cv 6802; 02 cv 6364; 02 cv 7154; 02 cv 7259; 02 cv 8918; 02 cv 6378; 02 cv 7153; 02 cv 6379; 03 cv 29; 02 cv 7920; 02 cv 7145; 03 cv 6810; 03 cv 6808; 02 cv 7147; 02 cv 7260; 03 cv 6809; 03 cv 6811; 02 cv 8916; 03 cv 6801; 02 cv 7149; 02 cv 7156; 02 cv 2802; 02 cv 7155; 02 cv 7262; 03 cv 6803; 02 cv 458; 02 cv 1728; 03 cv 7022; 02 cv 456; 03 cv 6805; 02 cv 1727; 03 cv 6800; 02 cv 6365; 02 cv 7261; 02 cv 7144; 02 cv 8919; 03 cv 1016; 02 cv 7608; 02 cv 7912; 02 cv 6186. (Original document filed under 21 mc 97 as Doc. #872)(sn)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 75 Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: 8/16/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                        ORDER ADMITTING COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE; purs. to Local Civil Rule 1.3(c), Joseph F. Rice is admitted pro hac vice to the bar of this Court for the purpose of representing pltffs in this proceeding and consolidated cases. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/14/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK. This document relates to: 03 cv 6183; 03 cv 7040; 03 cv 7073; 04 cv 365; 03 cv 7076; 03 cv 7083; 03 cv 7070; 03 cv 7084; 03 cv 7071; 02 cv 7150; 02 cv 3676; 03 cv 6802; 02 cv 6364; 02 cv 7154; 02 cv 7259; 02 cv 8918; 02 cv 6378; 02 cv 7153; 02 cv 6379; 03 cv 29; 02 cv 7920; 02 cv 7145; 03 cv 6810; 03 cv 6808; 02 cv 7147; 02 cv 7260; 03 cv 6809; 03 cv 6811; 02 cv 8916; 03 cv 6801; 02 cv 7149; 02 cv 7156; 02 cv 2802; 02 cv 7155; 02 cv 7262; 03 cv 6803; 02 cv 458; 02 cv 1728; 03 cv 7022; 02 cv 456; 03 cv 6805; 02 cv 1727; 03 cv 6800; 02 cv 6365; 02 cv 7261; 02 cv 7144; 02 cv 8919; 03 cv 1016; 02 cv 7608; 02 cv 7912; 02 cv 6186. (Original document filed under 21 mc 97 as Doc. #871)(sn)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 10/27/2004, Entered: 11/9/2004 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Signed
                                                                                          NOTICE of Dismissal as to Individual Defendants (this document relates to 02cv7150, 03cv6802, 02cv6364, 02cv7154, 02cv6363, 02cv6378, 02cv7153, 02cv6379, 02cv29, 02cv7920, 02cv7145, 03cv6808, 03cv6810, 03cv6801, 03cv6811, 02cv7149, 03cv7147, 02cv2802, 02cv458, 02cv7152, 02cv7147, 02cv1727, 03cv6800, 02cv6365, 02cv8919); pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(i) of the F.R.C.P., plaintiffs in the above cases dismiss all claims asserted in this action against the following defendants: Air Jamaica, Austrian Airlines, British Midland Airways Ltd., BWIA International Airways, Ethiopian Airlines S.C., KLM, Saudi Arabian Airlines, Scandinavian Airlines System, Swiss. The action remains pending as it is not dismissed as to any other defendant. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/22/2004) Original document filed in case no 21mc97, doc. #614.(kkc, )
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 74 Filed: 9/1/2004, Entered: 9/15/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                            Amended Notice Adopting Amended Answer Of Defendants United Air Lines, INC. To Plaintiffs' Second Amended Flight 77 Master Liability Complaint. Document filed by United Airlines, Inc.. (jmi, )
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 73 Filed: 8/31/2004, Entered: 9/8/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                              NOTICE of Amended Notice Adopting Master Answer of Defendants US Airways,INC. To Plaintiffs' Amended Flight 77 Master Liabilty Complaint and Jury Demand. Document filed by U.S. Airways, Inc.. (jmi, )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 72 Filed: 6/29/2004, Entered: 7/1/2004 Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                                                                                                ORDER OF DISMISSAL without prejudice as to Aeroflot Russian Airlines, ("Aeroflot"), British Airways, Air France, Jet Blue Airways ("JetBlue") Korean Air Lines,TACA International (a/k/a "Grupo TACA") and Quntas Airways Limited Only.The action remains pending as it is not dismissed as to any other Defendant. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/25/04) (dt, )
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 6/28/2004, Entered: 7/19/2004 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER for substitution of co-counsel for defendant The Boeing Company. Original filed in case 21MC91, Doc# 561 (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/24/04) (jco, )
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 6/28/2004, Entered: 7/19/2004 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER for substitution of co-counsel for defendant The Boeing Company. Original filed in case 21MC91, Doc# 561 (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/24/04) (jco, )
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 5/19/2004, Entered: 6/2/2004 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Signed
                                                                                                      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(i) of the F.R.C.P. without prejudice of Security Equipment Manufacturer Defendants. (This document relates to 21MC97 as document #487.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/18/04) (pl, )
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 71 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: 5/21/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                        NOTICE of Adopting Master Answer of Defendant Metropolitan Washington Airports Authority to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Flight 77 Master Liability Complaint. Document filed by Metropolitan Washington Airports Authority. (dfe, )
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 70 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: 5/21/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Adopting Master Answer of Defendant Atlantic Coast Airlines, Inc. to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Flight 77 Master Liability Complaint. Document filed by Atlantic Coast Airlines, Inc. (dfe, )
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 66 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                            NOTICE of adoption of its Master Answer to plaintiffs Second Amended Flight 77 Master Liability Complaint. Document filed by NorthWest Airlines Corporation. (jp, )
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 69 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/20/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                              NOTICE ADOPTING ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS AMR CORPORATION AND AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC. TO PLAINTIFFS SECONDED AMENDED FLIGHT 77 MASTER LIABILITY COMPLAINT. (laq)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 68 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Adopting Master Answer of Defendants Delta Air Lines, Inc., Incorrectly s/h/a Delta Airlines, Inc. to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Flight 77 Master Liability Complaint. Document filed by Delta Air Lines, Inc. (dfe, )
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 67 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF AMENDED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED FLIGHT 77 MASTER LIABILITY COMPLAINT. Document filed by United Air Lines, Inc. (ps, )
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 65 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                    NOTICE of adoption of its Master Answer to plaintiffs Amended Flight 77 Master Liability Complaint. Document filed by Argenbright Security, Inc.. (jp, )
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 64 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                      NOTICE ADOPTING MASTER ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED FLIGHT 77 MASTER LIABILITY COMPLAINT. Document filed by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (gf, )
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 63 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: 5/18/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                        NOTICE ADOPTING MASTER ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED FLIGHT 77 MASTER LIABILITY COMPLAINT. Document filed by The Boeing Company. (sac, )
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 4/26/2004, Entered: 5/3/2004 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                          ORDER granting Motion for Elizabeth Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for plaintiff. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 4/22/2004) Original document filed in case no. 21mc97, doc. #334.(kkc, )
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 4/16/2004, Entered: 4/21/2004 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                            MOTION; for an order pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.3(c) of the F.R.C.P. granting Elizabeth Smith permission to appear as attorney of record for the plaintiffs; w/ attch. affidavit in support; Document filed by plaintiffs. (orig. document docketed in 02cv0456 as document #42).. (pl, )
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 62 Filed: 4/15/2004, Entered: 4/16/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                              SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint, served. Atlantic Coast Airlines, Inc. served on 2/25/2004, answer due 3/16/2004. Service was accepted by Brandy Anderson. Document filed by Elaine Teague. (cd, )
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 61 Filed: 4/15/2004, Entered: 4/16/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint, served. National Airlines, Inc. served on 2/20/2004, answer due 3/11/2004. Service was accepted by CT Corp/Gerome Jones. Document filed by Elaine Teague. (cd, )
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 60 Filed: 3/31/2004, Entered: 4/6/2004 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                  SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending [5] Amended Complaint, against AMR Corporation, Airtran Airways, Inc., American Airlines, Inc., Argenbright Security, Inc., Atlantic Coast Airlines, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc., Delta Airlines, National Airlines, Inc., NorthWest Airlines Corporation, Qantas Airways Ltd, Securicor PLC., The Boeing Company, U.S. Airways, Inc., United Air Lines, Inc..Document filed by Elaine Teague. Related document: [5] Amended Complaint, filed by Elaine Teague.(sac, )
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/31/2004, Entered: 4/6/2004 Set Answer Due Date for Amended Pleadings
                                                                                                                                    Set Answer Due Date re: [60] Amended Complaint, as to AMR Corporation answer due on 4/12/2004; Airtran Airways, Inc. answer due on 4/12/2004; American Airlines, Inc. answer due on 4/12/2004; Argenbright Security, Inc. answer due on 4/12/2004; Atlantic Coast Airlines, Inc. answer due on 4/12/2004; Continental Airlines, Inc. answer due on 4/12/2004; Delta Air Lines, Inc. answer due on 4/12/2004; National Airlines, Inc. answer due on 4/12/2004; NorthWest Airlines Corporation answer due on 4/12/2004; Qantas Airways Ltd answer due on 4/12/2004; Securicor PLC. answer due on 4/12/2004; The Boeing Company answer due on 4/12/2004; U.S. Airways, Inc. answer due on 4/12/2004; United Air Lines, Inc. answer due on 4/12/2004. (sac, )
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 90 Filed: 3/19/2004, Entered: 9/4/2007 Clerk Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                      CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of Summons & Amended Complaint mailed to Securicor PLC at the following address: Sutton Park House 15 Carshalton Road, Sutton, London, United Kingdom SM1 4LD on 3/19/2004 by Registered Mail # rb 632 316 714. (aba)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 3/11/2004, Entered: 3/17/2004 Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                        MEMO-ENDORSEMENT ON MOTIONS ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Attorney Jeffrey Scott Thompson for Elaine Teague, Ronald L. Motley for Elaine Teague, Jodi Westbrook Flowers for Elaine Teague, Robert T. Haefele for Elaine Teague, Donald A. Migliori for Elaine Teague, Mary F. Schiavo for Elaine Teague admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/4/2004) Original Endorsements filed in case no. 21 MC 97, docs. # 289 (Jeffrey Scott Thompson), # 290 (Ronald L. Motley), # 291 (Jodi Westbrook Flowers), # 292 (Robert T. Haefele), # 293 (Donald A. Migliori), # 304 (Mary Schiavo).(kkc, )
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 59 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/12/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. NorthWest Airlines Corporation served on 12/29/2003, answer due 1/19/2004. Service was accepted by Deb Van Ness. (sb, )
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 58 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/12/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                            RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. United Air Lines, Inc. served on 12/24/2003, answer due 1/13/2004. Service was accepted by Nikki Chapple. (sb, )
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 57 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/12/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                              RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Quantam Magnetics, Inc. served on 12/29/2003, answer due 1/19/2004. Service was accepted by Lowell Burnett. (sb, )
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 56 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/12/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Delta Air Lines, Inc. served on 12/29/2003, answer due 1/19/2004. Service was accepted by Valerie Holmes. (sb, )
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 55 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/12/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                  RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Argenbright Security, Inc. served on 12/29/2003, answer due 1/19/2004. Service was accepted by Monique Jobes. (sb, )
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 54 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/12/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                    RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Heimann Systems Corp. served on 12/24/2003, answer due 1/13/2004. Service was accepted by Becky De George. (sb, )
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 53 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/12/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Air Transport Association served on 1/2/2004, answer due 1/22/2004. Service was accepted by David Berg. (sb, )
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 52 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/12/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Midwest Express Airlines, Inc. served on 12/29/2003, answer due 1/19/2004. Service was accepted by Mary Iden. (sb, )
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 51 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/12/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Metropolitan Washington Airports Authority served on 1/5/2004, answer due 1/26/2004. Service was accepted by Barbara Barnes. (sb, )
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 50 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/12/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                            RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Invision Technologies, Inc. served on 12/29/2003, answer due 1/19/2004. Service was accepted by Vivian Imperial. (sb, )
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 49 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/12/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                              RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. AMR Corporation served on 1/5/2004, answer due 1/26/2004. Service was accepted by Lisa Magdaleno. (sb, )
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 48 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/12/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. The Boeing Company served on 12/24/2003, answer due 1/13/2004. Service was accepted by Jenise Gogan. (sb, )
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 47 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/12/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. American Airlines, Inc. served on 12/29/2003, answer due 1/19/2004; Continental Airlines, Inc. served on 12/29/2003, answer due 1/19/2004; L-3 Communications Corporation served on 12/29/2003, answer due 1/19/2004; L-3 Communications Holdings, Inc. served on 12/29/2003, answer due 1/19/2004; U.S. Airways, Inc. served on 12/29/2003, answer due 1/19/2004. Service was accepted by Paula Kash. (sb, )
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 46 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/12/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Airtran Airways, Inc. served on 12/29/2003, answer due 1/19/2004. Service was accepted by Collen A. Davis. (sb, )
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 45 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/12/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. American Airlines, Inc. served on 12/30/2003, answer due 1/19/2004. Service was accepted by Jim Walden. (sb, )
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 44 Filed: 3/3/2004, Entered: 3/4/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Lufthansa served on 12/29/2003, answer due 1/19/2004. Service was accepted by Sabine Simon. Document filed by Elaine Teague. (laq, )
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 2/5/2004, Entered: 2/11/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE TO ACTIVATE LAWSUIT. Document filed by Elaine Teague. Original Document filed in 21 mc 97, Doc. #272. (sac, )
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 43 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 2/2/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served upon Air France. Service was accepted by Greg Kozlowski, Legal Counsel. Document filed by Elaine Teague. (pl, )
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 42 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 2/2/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served upon Virgin Atlantic Airways Ltd. Service was accepted by Christina Bonney. Document filed by Elaine Teague. (pl, )
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 41 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 2/2/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served upon British Midland Airways Ltd. Service was accepted by Lisa Stiegler, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Elaine Teague. (pl, )
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 40 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Qantas Airways Ltd served on 12/11/2003, answer due 12/31/2003. Service was accepted by Anne Sulsord. Document filed by Elaine Teague. (pl, )
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 39 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Air Tran Airways served on 11/4/2003, answer due 11/24/2003. Service was accepted by Mia Wintersmith, Supervisor. Document filed by Elaine Teague. (yv, )
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 38 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Taca International Airlines, Inc. served on 11/4/2003, answer due 11/24/2003. Service was accepted by Kenneth A. Hoffman. Document filed by Elaine Teague. (yv, )
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 37 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. ANA served on 11/5/2003, answer due 11/25/2003. Service was accepted by Frank J. Costello. Document filed by Elaine Teague. (yv, )
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 36 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. BWIA International Airways served on 12/1/2003, answer due 12/21/2003. Service was accepted by Tracey Butler. Document filed by Elaine Teague. (db, )
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 35 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Swiss served on 11/17/2003, answer due 12/7/2003. Service was accepted by Lisa Stiegler. Document filed by Elaine Teague. (db, )
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 34 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Quantam Magnetics, Inc. served on 11/11/2003, answer due 12/1/2003. Service was accepted by Lowell J. Burnett, authorized agent. Document filed by Elaine Teague. (kw, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 33 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Austrian Airlines served on 11/19/2003, answer due 12/9/2003. Service was accepted by Sara Clarden, authorized agent. Document filed by Elaine Teague. (kw, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 32 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Air Transport Association served on 12/8/2003, answer due 12/28/2003. Service was accepted by Mimi Soloman. Document filed by Elaine Teague. (db, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 31 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. L-3 Communications Corporation served on 12/11/2003, answer due 12/31/2003. Service was accepted by Nora Dindyal. Document filed by Elaine Teague. (db, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 30 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. NorthWest Airlines Corporation served on 11/25/2003, answer due 12/15/2003. Service was accepted by Karen Clower. Document filed by Elaine Teague. (db, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 29 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. The Boeing Company served on 11/10/2003, answer due 11/30/2003. Service was accepted by Marsha Montgomer, authorized agent. Document filed by Elaine Teague. (kw, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 28 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Summons and complaint to Aeroflot served on 11/5/03. Service was accepted by Elizabeth Diaz. Document filed by Elaine Teague. (dle, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 27 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Summons and complaint served on Jetblue on 11/19/03. Service was accepted by Nicole Gurdoglanyan. Document filed by Elaine Teague. (dle, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 26 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Summons and complaint served on Alaska Airlines on 11/4/03. Service was accepted by Carla Brateng, Corp. Officer. Document filed by Elaine Teague. (dle, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 25 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. United Air Lines, Inc. served on 11/17/2003, answer due 12/7/2003. Service was accepted by Mia Wintersmith. Document filed by Elaine Teague. (db, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 24 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Scandanavian Airlines System, S.A.S served on 12/30/2003, answer due 1/19/2004. Service was accepted by Jorgen Hoe-Knudsen. Document filed by Elaine Teague. (db, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 23 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Airtran Airways, Inc. served on 12/24/2003, answer due 1/13/2004. Service was accepted by Anne Boutilier. Document filed by Elaine Teague. (db, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 22 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint, served. Continental Airlines, Inc. served on 11/4/2003, answer due 11/24/2003. Service was accepted by Lynne Key. Document filed by Elaine Teague. (jco, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 21 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint, served. American Airlines, Inc. served on 10/31/2003, answer due 11/20/2003. Service was accepted by Shirley Dillon. Document filed by Elaine Teague. (jco, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 20 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint, served. U.S. Airways, Inc. served on 11/7/2003, answer due 11/27/2003. Service was accepted by Tanika Baylor. Document filed by Elaine Teague. (jco, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 19 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint, served. Delta Airlines served on 11/5/2003, answer due 11/25/2003. Service was accepted by Valarie Holmes. Document filed by Elaine Teague. (jco, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 18 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint, served. Metropolitan Washington Airports Authority served on 11/5/2003, answer due 11/25/2003. Service was accepted by Barbara Barnes. Document filed by Elaine Teague. (jco, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 17 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint, served. Ethiopian Airlines S.C. served on 11/24/2003, answer due 12/14/2003. Service was accepted by Andrew Cutton. Document filed by Elaine Teague. (jco, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 16 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint, served. L-3 Communications Holdings, Inc. served on 11/18/2003, answer due 12/8/2003. Service was accepted by Nora Dindyal, Managing Agent. Document filed by Elaine Teague. (jco, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 15 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Argenbright Security, Inc. served on 11/5/2003, answer due 11/25/2003. Service was accepted by aCindy Zidick, CT Corp.. Document filed by Elaine Teague. (dle, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 14 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Invision Technologies, Inc. served on 11/13/2003, answer due 12/3/2003. Service was accepted by Becky DeGeorge, Clerk. Document filed by Elaine Teague. (sac, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 13 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. AMR Corporation served on 11/3/2003, answer due 11/23/2003. Service was accepted by Shirley Dillon, Agent. Document filed by Elaine Teague. (sac, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 12 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. British Airways served on 11/25/2003, answer due 12/15/2003. Service was accepted by Maureen Renehan, Agent. Document filed by Elaine Teague. (sac, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 11 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Korean Airlines served on 1/26/2004, answer due 2/16/2004. Service was accepted by Catalina Kim. Document filed by Elaine Teague. (cd, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 10 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. L-3 Communications Corporation Security and Detection Systems served on 1/3/2004, answer due 1/23/2004. Service was accepted by Roger McLeon, Agent. Document filed by Elaine Teague. (sac, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 9 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Midwest Express Airlines, Inc. served on 12/1/2003, answer due 12/21/2003. Service was accepted by Brandy Anderson, Agent. Document filed by Elaine Teague. (sac, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Saudi Arabian Airlines served on 11/15/2003, answer due 12/5/2003. Service was accepted by Tracey Butler. Document filed by Elaine Teague. (cd, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. KLM served on 12/17/2003, answer due 1/6/2004. Service was accepted by Chris Jenkins-Wiener. Document filed by Elaine Teague. (cd, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Heimann Systems Corp. served on 10/29/2003, answer due 11/18/2003. Service was accepted by Becky DeGeorge. Document filed by Elaine Teague. (cd, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 1/14/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT amending [1] Complaint against U.S. Airways, Inc., United Air Lines, Inc., NorthWest Airlines Corporation, National Airlines, Inc., Delta Air Lines, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc., Atlantic Coast Airlines, Inc., Airtran Airways, Inc., AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc., Argenbright Security, Inc., Metropolitan Washington Airports Authority, Securicor PLC., The Boeing Company.Document filed by Elaine Teague. Related document: [1] Complaint.(jco, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 1/7/2004, Entered: 1/21/2004 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATED CONSENT AND ORDER TO CHANGE ATTORNEY; that Motley Rice LLC, 28 Bridgeside Blvd., P.O. Box 1792, Mt. Pleasant, SC 29465, is being substituted as counsel for the plaintiffs in this action, instead of Baum Hedlund, 12100 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 950, Los Angeles, CA 90025. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/31/2003) Original document filed under case no. 21 MC 97, doc. # 249. (kkc, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 10/15/2003, Entered: 10/27/2003 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Signed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF DISMISSAL, (This document relates to 02-3676, 8918, 03-7148, 02-7143, 5139, 03-6809, 02-8916, 7156, 7155, 03-6803, 02-7271, 03-7149, 02-2004, 03-7150, 6804, 02-7144, 03-6806, 6802, 02-7154, 6363, 7151, 7204, 7153, 7152, 03-6811, 6801, 7147, 02-458, 2802, 1727, 6365, 6364, 7150, 6378, 7149, 6379, 452, 03-029, 6808, 6810, 02-7147, 7148, 7146, 7920, 03-6944, 6800, 02-7145, 8919, 7272, 03-6807, 02-7258, 7261, 7260, 456, 7262, 1728, 03-6805, 02-6362, 7259 & 6361) pursuant to the Court's directions at the Status Conference on 9/26/03, and pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(2), plaintiffs in each of the designated cases herein, dismiss with prejudice the "DOE" defendants. ( signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein ); ORIGINAL DOCUMENT ENTERED IN CASE #21 MC 97(AKH), DOC. #199. (tp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 9/25/2003, Entered: 9/26/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER; granting [2-1] motion to place on suspense docket. This case shall be placed on the suspense docket immediately following filing of proof of service of summons and complaint. Purs. to the Order issued 7/22/03 in In re 9/11 Litigation, 21 MC 97 (AKH), and applicable to this case, the pltff's motion to place this action on the suspense docket is granted. This case shall be placed on the suspense docket immediately following filing of proof of service of summons and complaint. ( signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein ); (sac) Modified on 09/30/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 9/24/2003, Entered: 9/26/2003 Notice of Case Assignment/ReassignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein . Copy of notice and judge's rules mailed to Attorney(s) of record: John A. Greaves . (jjm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 9/24/2003, Entered: 9/26/2003 Case Designation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz is so designated. (jjm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 9/24/2003, Entered: 9/26/2003 Case Accepted as Related
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Case accepted as related to 1:02cv458. Notice of assignment to follow. (jjm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 9/15/2003, Terminated: 9/25/2003 Motion to Place on Suspense Docket
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF MOTION by Elaine Teague to place on suspense docket .No Return Date Indicated. (gmo) Modified on 09/15/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 9/15/2003 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT filed. Summons issued and Notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 484259. (gmo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 9/15/2003 Case Referred as Possibly Related/Similar
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CASE REFERRED TO Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein as possibly related to 02-cv-458. (gmo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 78 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?