Gutierrez et al v. The City of New York et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-06537-LBS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 13, 2017 at 1:17 AM DT (3.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo DAVID FLORES, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cronin & Byczek, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rocco G. Avallone +1 516 358 1700 +1 516 358 1730 ravallone@cblawyers.net
Space Christopher Francis Bellistri +1 516 358 1730 cbellistri@cblawyers.net
Space Dominick Peter Revellino +1 516 358 1700 +1 516 358 1730 drevellino@cblawyers.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office Of Jeffrey L. Goldberg, P.c.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Susan P Bernstein +1 516 358 1700 +1 516 358 1730 sbernstein@cblawyers.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Simmons, Jannace & Stagg, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Linda M Cronin +1 516 358 1700 +1 516 358 1730 lcronin@cblawyers.net
No Logo Frankie Rosado, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cronin & Byczek, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rocco G. Avallone +1 516 358 1700 +1 516 358 1730 ravallone@cblawyers.net
Space Dominick Peter Revellino +1 516 358 1700 +1 516 358 1730 drevellino@cblawyers.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office Of Jeffrey L. Goldberg, P.c.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Susan P Bernstein +1 516 358 1700 +1 516 358 1730 sbernstein@cblawyers.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Simmons, Jannace & Stagg, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Linda M Cronin +1 516 358 1700 +1 516 358 1730 lcronin@cblawyers.net
No Logo Rene Canela, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cronin & Byczek, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rocco G. Avallone +1 516 358 1700 +1 516 358 1730 ravallone@cblawyers.net
Space Christopher Francis Bellistri +1 516 358 1730 cbellistri@cblawyers.net
Space Dominick Peter Revellino +1 516 358 1700 +1 516 358 1730 drevellino@cblawyers.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office Of Jeffrey L. Goldberg, P.c.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Susan P Bernstein +1 516 358 1700 +1 516 358 1730 sbernstein@cblawyers.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Simmons, Jannace & Stagg, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Linda M Cronin +1 516 358 1700 +1 516 358 1730 lcronin@cblawyers.net
No Logo Roland Gutierrez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cronin & Byczek, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rocco G. Avallone +1 516 358 1700 +1 516 358 1730 ravallone@cblawyers.net
Space Christopher Francis Bellistri +1 516 358 1730 cbellistri@cblawyers.net
Space Dominick Peter Revellino +1 516 358 1700 +1 516 358 1730 drevellino@cblawyers.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office Of Jeffrey L. Goldberg, P.c.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Susan P Bernstein +1 516 358 1700 +1 516 358 1730 sbernstein@cblawyers.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Simmons, Jannace & Stagg, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Linda M Cronin +1 516 358 1700 +1 516 358 1730 lcronin@cblawyers.net
v.
No Logo Kevin Moroney, Defendant
No Logo Raymond Kelly, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher Lee Heer +1 212 788 2903 +1 212 788 8896 cheer@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Raymond Rooney, Defendant
No Logo Stephen R. Kennedy, Defendant
City of New York City of New York, Defendant
Officially listed as "The City of New York"

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher Lee Heer +1 212 788 2903 +1 212 788 8896 cheer@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Harrisburg Civil Law Clinic

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alicia Hayley Welch +1 212 788 6760 +1 212 788 0940 aliciahwelch@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Littler Mendelson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Sergio Gomez-Sanchez +1 631 247 0404 +1 631 247 0417 dsgomez@littler.com

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Depart. Office of the Corporation Counsel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Camille Danielle Barnett +1 212 788 8685 +1 212 788 8877 cbarnett@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ricardo Tapia, Jr. +1 212 356 1104 +1 718 788 3770 Ricardo.Tapia@nyct.com

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department, Office of the Corporation Counsel (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James M. Lemonedes +1 212 788 0881 +1 212 788 0940 jlemonedes@foxrothschild.com

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Office of Corporation Counsel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Megan Burrows Carpenter +1 212 788 0574 +1 212 676 2629 mcarpent@law.nyc.gov
No Logo The New York City Police Department, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher Lee Heer +1 212 788 2903 +1 212 788 8896 cheer@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Harrisburg Civil Law Clinic

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/29/2010 Alicia Hayley Welch +1 212 788 6760 +1 212 788 0940 aliciahwelch@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Depart. Office of the Corporation Counsel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/29/2010 Camille Danielle Barnett +1 212 788 8685 +1 212 788 8877 cbarnett@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/29/2010 Ricardo Tapia, Jr. +1 212 356 1104 +1 718 788 3770 Ricardo.Tapia@nyct.com

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department, Office of the Corporation Counsel (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/29/2010 James M. Lemonedes +1 212 788 0881 +1 212 788 0940 jlemonedes@foxrothschild.com

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Office of Corporation Counsel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/29/2010 Megan Burrows Carpenter +1 212 788 0574 +1 212 676 2629 mcarpent@law.nyc.gov
Office Foley Square
Filed 7/23/2008
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $15000
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1981 Equal Rights Under the Law
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County Westchester
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag ECF
  Entries (122) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 4/19/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 2/15/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 04/19/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 4/19/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 2/15/2013 before Judge Denise L. Cote. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/13/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/23/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/22/2013.(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 04/19/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT AND ORDER OF DISCONTINUANCE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, as follows: 1. The above-referenced action is hereby dismissed, with prejudice, and without costs, expenses, or fees in excess of the amount specified in paragraph "2". 2. The City of New York hereby agrees to pay each of the plaintiffs the following sums as set forth in this order. 3. In consideration for the payment of these settlement sums, each plaintiff agrees to the dismissal of all the claims against the individually named defendants and to release all defendants, any present or former employees or agents of the City of New York, and the New York City Police Department from any and all liability, claims, or rights of action arising from and contained in the complaint in this action, including claims for costs, expenses and attorney's fees as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 2/27/2013) (lmb) (Entered: 02/27/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Linda M. Cronin dated 02/21/2013 re: We represent the Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case. Responses are currently due today, Thursday February 21,2013. The parties respectfully request that they be given until the close of business, Monday February 25, 2013 to submit their responses. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. (Responses due by 2/25/2013) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 02/22/2013) (jcs) (Entered: 02/22/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Linda M. Cronin dated 02/20/2013 re: We represent the Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case. This is a joint request for a 24-hour extension of time to respond to the Court's inquiries during the final Pre Trial Conference held on Friday February 15, 2013. Responses are currently due today, Wednesday February 20, 2013. The parties respectfully request that they be given until the close of business tomorrow, February 21, 2013 to submit their responses. There has been no previous request for an extension of time of this deadline. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. (Responses due by 2/21/2013) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 02/20/2013) (jcs) (Entered: 02/20/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            ORDER: As set forth at the final pretrial conference held in this action on February 15, 2013, it is hereby ORDERED that the claims against defendant Commissioner Raymond Kelly ("Kelly") are dismissed. The Clerk of Court shall remove Kelly as a defendant from this action. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 2/15/2013) (ama) (Entered: 02/15/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 2/12/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 104 SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION in Limine. filed on behalf of all plaintiffs. Document filed by Rene Canela, David Flores, Roland Gutierrez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cronin, Linda) (Entered: 02/12/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 2/7/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                ORDER SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 2/25/2013 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 17A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein. The parties should also note that paragraph 3 of the Standing Order requires certain written submissions, which must be received by the Court and all other parties no later than 12:00 noon three business days before the conference: that is, February 20, 2013. These submissions cannot be sent to the court by means of the ECF system. Also, attorneys must ensure that their client and/or insurer have read the other side's submission prior to the conference. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 2/7/2013) (djc) Modified on 2/7/2013 (djc). (Entered: 02/07/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 2/6/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 2/6/2013) (gr) (Entered: 02/06/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 2/6/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    SCHEDULING ORDER:Any opposition to defendants' Feb. 1, 2013 Supplemental Motion in Limine shall be filed by Feb. 12, 2013. Pretrial Order due by 2/12/2013. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/15/2013 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 15B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Denise L. Cote. Jury Trial set for 3/4/2013 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 15B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Denise L. Cote. (See Scheduling Order for Judge Cote's Practices and Procedures) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 2/6/2013) (gr) (Entered: 02/06/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Denise L. Cote. Judge Jesse M. Furman is no longer assigned to the case. (pgu) (Entered: 02/05/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ricardo Tapia, Jr on behalf of Raymond Kelly, Stephen R. Kennedy, Kevin Moroney, Raymond Rooney, The City of New York, The New York City Police Department (Tapia, Ricardo) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 104 SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION in Limine.. Document filed by Raymond Kelly, Stephen R. Kennedy, Kevin Moroney, Raymond Rooney, The City of New York, The New York City Police Department. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lemonedes, James) (Entered: 02/01/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION in Limine. Document filed by Raymond Kelly, Stephen R. Kennedy, Kevin Moroney, Raymond Rooney, The City of New York, The New York City Police Department.(Lemonedes, James) (Entered: 02/01/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 11/19/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              ORDER: As discussed on the record at the November 19, 2012 pretrial conference, the joint pretrial order and related filings shall be submitted on or before February 1, 2013. Responses to any such filings shall be filed by February 15, 2013. It is further ORDERED that a final pretrial conference will be held on February 14, 2013, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 6A of the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007. Trial will begin on February 25, 2013, at 9:00 a.m., ( Pretrial Order due by 2/1/2013.), ( Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/14/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman., Jury Trial set for 2/25/2013 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesse M. Furman.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 11/19/2012) (lmb) (Entered: 11/19/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 10/24/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Linda M. Cronin dated 10/24/2012 re: We are in receipt of the Court's response to our request regarding the adjournment of the Pre Trial Conference and Joint Trial submissions. The Court has directed that the case be "trial ready" on January 2, 2013, and I write on consent of Defendants to request an adjournment as I will be out of town until January 11, 2013 due to the holidays. I am the principal trial counsel on the case for the Plaintiffs. Therefore, request is made that the case be marked "trial ready" for a date that is convenient to the Court after January 11, 2013. ENDORSEMENT: This matter will be tried beginning on February 25, 2013, at 9 a.m. All other dates and deadlines remain in effect. (Jury Trial set for 2/25/2013 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesse M. Furman.)(Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 10/24/2012) (djc) (Entered: 10/24/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 10/17/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Linda M. Cronin dated 10/17/2012 re: We write on consent of defendants to request an adjournment of the Pre Trial Conference scheduled for October 22, 2012 at 12:00 noon and the final Joint Trial submissions presently due on November 2, 2012. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. The conference is adjourned to November 19, 2012, at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 26A. The Joint Pretrial Order is due December 3, 2012. The parties should be trial ready on January 2, 2013. No further adjournments or extensions will be granted absent a strong showing of good cause. So ordered. (Joint Pretrial Order due by 12/3/2012. Ready for Trial by 1/2/2013.), (Pretrial Conference set for 11/19/2012 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 26A, U.S. Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 10/17/2012) (rjm) Modified on 10/18/2012 (rjm). (Entered: 10/18/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    ORDER: This case has been reassigned to the undersigned for all purposes. The parties are hereby ORDERED to submit to the Court, on or before November 2, 2012, a joint pretrial order and any other filings required by Paragraph 5 of this Court's Individual Rules and Practices, available at http://nysd.uscourts.gov /judge/Furman, that have not already been made. The parties are also directed to the Court's Individual Rules and Practices for Trial. It is further ORDERED that counsel for all parties shall appear for a pretrial conference with the Court on Monday, October 22, 2012, at 12:00 p.m. in Courtroom 6A of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. The conference must be attended by the attorney who will serve as principal trial counsel., ( Pretrial Order due by 11/2/2012.), ( Pretrial Conference set for 10/22/2012 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 6A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 10/12/2012) (lmb) (Entered: 10/12/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Judge Leonard B. Sand is no longer assigned to the case. (pgu) (Entered: 10/12/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 8/6/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 94 Motion for Reconsideration.. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 8/6/2012) (cd) (Entered: 08/06/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 94 MOTION for Reconsideration re; 93 Order on Motion in Limine,, Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's June 20, 2012 Order. MOTION for Reconsideration re; 93 Order on Motion in Limine,, Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's June 20, 2012 Order.. Document filed by Raymond Kelly, Stephen R. Kennedy, Kevin Moroney, Raymond Rooney, The City of New York, The New York City Police Department. (Lemonedes, James) (Entered: 07/18/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 94 MOTION for Reconsideration re; 93 Order on Motion in Limine,, Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's June 20, 2012 Order. MOTION for Reconsideration re; 93 Order on Motion in Limine,, Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's June 20, 2012 Order.. Document filed by Roland Gutierrez. (Bernstein, Susan) (Entered: 07/10/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 6/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 94 MOTION for Reconsideration re; 93 Order on Motion in Limine,, Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's June 20, 2012 Order. MOTION for Reconsideration re; 93 Order on Motion in Limine,, Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's June 20, 2012 Order.. Document filed by Raymond Kelly, Stephen R. Kennedy, Kevin Moroney, Raymond Rooney, The City of New York. (Gomez-Sanchez, Daniel) (Entered: 06/26/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 6/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                MOTION for Reconsideration re; 93 Order on Motion in Limine,, Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's June 20, 2012 Order. Document filed by Raymond Kelly, Stephen R. Kennedy, Kevin Moroney, Raymond Rooney, The City of New York.(Gomez-Sanchez, Daniel) (Entered: 06/26/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Blank 93 Filed: 6/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  MEMORANDUM & ORDER granting in part and denying in part 88 Motion in Limine: Defendants' motion is granted with respect to motions and exhibits from the LOA litigation and denied with respect to testimonial references thereto. This Court will consider Defendants' requests for appropriate limiting instructions. For the reasons stated above, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants' motion in limine to exclude Plaintiffs' Proposed Exhibit 2 to exclude motions and exhibits from the LOA litigation is GRANTED. It is DENIED all other respects. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 6/20/2012) (djc)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 93 Filed: 6/20/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    MEMORANDUM & ORDER granting in part and denying in part 88 Motion in Limine: Defendants' motion is granted with respect to motions and exhibits from the LOA litigation and denied with respect to testimonial references thereto. This Court will consider Defendants' requests for appropriate limiting instructions. For the reasons stated above, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants' motion in limine to exclude Plaintiffs' Proposed Exhibit 2 to exclude motions and exhibits from the LOA litigation is GRANTED. It is DENIED all other respects. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 6/20/2012) (djc) (Entered: 06/20/2012)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 6/10/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 88 MOTION in Limine.. Document filed by Raymond Kelly, Stephen R. Kennedy, Kevin Moroney, Raymond Rooney, The City of New York. (Gomez-Sanchez, Daniel) (Entered: 06/10/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 6/5/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 88 MOTION in Limine.. Document filed by Rene Canela, David Flores, Roland Gutierrez, Frankie Rosado. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cronin, Linda) (Entered: 06/05/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 6/4/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER: In an Order dated November 29, 2010, this Court dismissed all claims against the New York City Police Department. Defendants have requested the Court to amend the case caption to reflect this dismissal. This request is granted. I hereby direct the Clerk of Court to remove the New York City Police Department from the case caption. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 6/4/2012) (jfe) (Entered: 06/04/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 88 MOTION in Limine.. Document filed by Raymond Kelly, Stephen R. Kennedy, Kevin Moroney, Raymond Rooney, The City of New York. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A)(Gomez-Sanchez, Daniel) (Entered: 05/31/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              MOTION in Limine. Document filed by Raymond Kelly, Stephen R. Kennedy, Kevin Moroney, Raymond Rooney, The City of New York.(Gomez-Sanchez, Daniel) (Entered: 05/31/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION in Limine. Document filed by Raymond Kelly, Stephen R. Kennedy, Kevin Moroney, Raymond Rooney, The City of New York. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A)(Gomez-Sanchez, Daniel) Modified on 5/31/2012 (db). (Entered: 05/30/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 5/29/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER: addressed to Judge Leonard B. Sand from James M. Lemonedes dated 5/24/2012 re: Counsel for defendant writes to confirm the scheduled trial dates set forth in this letter and also to request a brief extension of time to file the in limine motions until Wednesday May 30, 2012. ENDORSEMENT: Submission granted. In limine motions due 5/30/2012. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 5/29/2012) (js) (Entered: 05/29/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 5/24/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Sergio Gomez-Sanchez on behalf of Raymond Kelly, Stephen R. Kennedy, Kevin Moroney, Raymond Rooney, The City of New York (Gomez-Sanchez, Daniel) (Entered: 05/24/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 5/17/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Leonard B. Sand from Megan Burrows Carpenter dated 5/15/2012 re: Counsel for the defendant requests that defendants be granted a brief extension of time, until May 17, 2012, to submit their proposed jury instructions and proposed voir dire. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 5/16/2012) (ft) (Entered: 05/17/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Blank 83 Filed: 5/17/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Document filed by Raymond Kelly, Stephen R. Kennedy, Kevin Moroney, Raymond Rooney, The City of New York.(Carpenter, Megan) (Entered: 05/17/2012)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 5/17/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          PROPOSED VOIR DIRE QUESTIONS. Document filed by Raymond Kelly, Stephen R. Kennedy, Kevin Moroney, Raymond Rooney, The City of New York.(Carpenter, Megan) (Entered: 05/17/2012)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 5/16/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            REQUEST TO CHARGE. Document filed by Rene Canela, David Flores, Roland Gutierrez, Frankie Rosado.(Cronin, Linda) (Entered: 05/16/2012)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 5/15/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Document filed by Rene Canela, David Flores, Roland Gutierrez, Frankie Rosado.(Cronin, Linda) Modified on 5/16/2012 (ka). (Entered: 05/15/2012)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 5/15/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                PROPOSED VOIR DIRE QUESTIONS. Document filed by Rene Canela, David Flores, Roland Gutierrez, Frankie Rosado.(Cronin, Linda) (Entered: 05/15/2012)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER: Trial shall begin on June 11, 2012, at 10 a.m. in Courtroom 15A, 500 Pearl Street. The parties shall submit proposed jury charges and voir dire requests by 12 noon, May 15, 2012. Failure to comply with any of the provisions of this Order will result in dismissal of the action, entry of a default judgment, or other appropriate sanction. This Order supersedes the Order dated February 29, 2012. ( Jury Trial set for 6/11/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 15A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Leonard B. Sand.) (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 3/5/2012) (jfe) (Entered: 03/05/2012)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 2/29/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER: Trial shall begin on September 10, 2012, at 10:00 A.M. in Courtroom 15A, 500 Pearl Street. The parties shall submit proposed jury charges and voir dire requests by August 31, 2012, at 12:00 noon. Failure to comply with any of the provisions of this order will result in dismissal of the action, entry of a default judgment, or other appropriate sanction. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 2/29/2012) (pl) (Entered: 02/29/2012)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 2/13/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Susan Penny Bernstein on behalf of Frankie Rosado (Bernstein, Susan) (Entered: 02/13/2012)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 2/13/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Susan Penny Bernstein on behalf of Rene Canela, David Flores, Roland Gutierrez (Bernstein, Susan) (Entered: 02/13/2012)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                          ORDER SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: A settlement conference in this matter is scheduled for January 11, 2012, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 17-A, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. ( Settlement Conference set for 1/11/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 17A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 12/16/2011) (jfe) (Entered: 12/16/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W Gorenstein from Megan Burrows Carpenter dated 12/5/2011 re: Request for a telephonic pretrial conference on 12/13/2011. ENDORSEMENT: Granted for 3:30 on 12/13/2011. Note time change plaintiff to call with all parties on the line. (Telephone Conference set for 12/13/2011 at 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 12/5/11) (cd) (Entered: 12/06/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Megan Burrows Carpenter on behalf of Raymond Kelly, Stephen R. Kennedy, Kevin Moroney, Raymond Rooney, The City of New York, The New York City Police Department (Carpenter, Megan) (Entered: 10/27/2011)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 10/19/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James M. Lemonedes on behalf of Raymond Kelly, Stephen R. Kennedy, Kevin Moroney, Raymond Rooney, The City of New York, The New York City Police Department (Lemonedes, James) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM & ORDER: denying 56 Motion for Reconsideration; denying 58 Motion for Reconsideration. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 9/26/11) (pl) (Entered: 09/26/2011)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 9/14/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                    NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF A REFERRAL TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The referral in the above entitled action has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein, for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Magistrate Judge James C. Francis no longer referred to the case. (pgu) (Entered: 09/14/2011)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 56 MOTION for Reconsideration by Plaintiffs.. Document filed by Rene Canela, David Flores, Roland Gutierrez. (Bellistri, Christopher) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        FIRST REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 58 FIRST MOTION for Reconsideration.. Document filed by Raymond Kelly, Stephen R. Kennedy, Kevin Moroney, Raymond Rooney, The City of New York, The New York City Police Department. (Welch, Alicia) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/4/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Leonard B. Sand from Alicia H. Welch dated 5/4/11 Re: I write to respectfully request that the Court permit defendants a page extension to file a sixteen (16) page Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Their Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Opinion and Order, dated November 29, 2010. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 5/4/11) (rjm) (Entered: 05/04/2011)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Leonard B. Sand from Alicia H. Welch dated 4/20/11 re: Counsel requests an extension of time from April 22, 2011 until May 6, 2011 for both parties to file their reply memoranda of law with respect to the cross-motion for reconsideration. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 4/25/11); (djc) (Entered: 04/25/2011)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/8/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              FIRST MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 56 MOTION for Reconsideration by Plaintiffs.. Document filed by Raymond Kelly, Stephen R. Kennedy, Kevin Moroney, Raymond Rooney, The City of New York, The New York City Police Department. (Welch, Alicia) (Entered: 04/08/2011)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 4/8/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 58 FIRST MOTION for Reconsideration.. Document filed by Rene Canela, David Flores, Roland Gutierrez. (Bellistri, Christopher) (Entered: 04/08/2011)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/8/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Christopher Bellistri in Opposition re: 58 FIRST MOTION for Reconsideration.. Document filed by Rene Canela, David Flores, Roland Gutierrez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bellistri, Christopher) (Entered: 04/08/2011)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/23/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Leonard B. Sand from Linda M. Cronin dated 2/23/2011 re: Requesting the Court grant an extension of time until April 8, 2011 for the parties to file their respective opposition on the motions for reconsideration, and to file reply papers by April 22, 2011. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 2/23/2011) (jpo) (Entered: 02/23/2011)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      FIRST MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 58 FIRST MOTION for Reconsideration.. Document filed by Raymond Kelly, Stephen R. Kennedy, Kevin Moroney, Raymond Rooney, The City of New York, The New York City Police Department. (Welch, Alicia) (Entered: 02/11/2011)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Alicia H. Welch in Support re: 58 FIRST MOTION for Reconsideration.. Document filed by Raymond Kelly, Stephen R. Kennedy, Kevin Moroney, Raymond Rooney, The City of New York, The New York City Police Department. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit OOOO, # 2 Exhibit PPPP)(Welch, Alicia) (Entered: 02/11/2011)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          FIRST MOTION for Reconsideration. Document filed by Raymond Kelly, Stephen R. Kennedy, Kevin Moroney, Raymond Rooney, The City of New York, The New York City Police Department.(Welch, Alicia) (Entered: 02/11/2011)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 56 MOTION for Reconsideration by Plaintiffs.. Document filed by Roland Gutierrez. (Avallone, Rocco) (Entered: 02/11/2011)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              MOTION for Reconsideration by Plaintiffs. Document filed by Roland Gutierrez.(Avallone, Rocco) (Entered: 02/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Leonard B. Sand from Linda M. Cronin dated 1/5/11 re: counsel for plaintiffs writes that the parties respectfully request that the Court grant them an extension of time from January 11, 2011 until February 11, 2011 to file their respective motions for Reconsideration, to serve and file opposition papers on or before March 8, 2011 and to serve and file their reply papers on or before March 22, 2011. ENDORSEMENT: Granted as requested. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 1/7/11) (pl) (Entered: 01/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Leonard B. Sand from Alicia H. Welch dated 12/10/2010 re: Requesting an extension of time until January 11, 2011 for both parties to file motions for reconsideration, to serve and file opposition papers by February 8, 2011, and to serve and file their reply papers by February 22, 2011. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 12/13/2010) (jpo) Modified on 1/5/2011 (jpo). (Entered: 12/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 11/4/10, 11:05 a.m. before Judge Leonard B. Sand. (rjm) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/29/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      OPINION AND ORDER: #99681 For the reasons set forth herein, the Court denies Defendants motion for summary judgment on Plaintiffs Title VII, retaliation, and hostile work environment claims only to the extent noted above. Defendants motion for summary judgment on Plaintiffs § 1981 and § 1983 claims are granted with respect to Defendant City of New York and the individual Defendants sued in their official capacities and denied with respect to the Defendants sued in their individual capacities. Plaintiffs § 1985 claims are dismissed as to all Defendants. All claims against the NYPD are dismissed. The parties are to consult with each other concerning the future progress of this litigation. Should the parties find it useful, the Court will favorably entertain an agreed motion to refer the case to mediation or to pursue other forms of resolution. Alternatively, the parties are to advise the Court of when they will be prepared to proceed to trial. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 11/29/2010) (jpo) Modified on 11/30/2010 (ajc). (Entered: 11/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Leonard B. Sand from 9/27/10 dated 9/27/10 re: counsel for plaintiff respectfully requests an adjournment of the oral argument to November 4, 2010 at either 11:00 a.m. or 2:00 p.m. whichever time is convenient for the Court. ENDORSEMENT: Adjourned to 11/4/10 at 11:00 am. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 9/27/10) (pl) (Entered: 09/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants' Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Raymond Kelly, Stephen R. Kennedy, Kevin Moroney, Raymond Rooney, The City of New York, The New York City Police Department. (Welch, Alicia) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re: 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants' Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment. Response to Plaintiffs' Counter 56.1 Statement. Document filed by Raymond Kelly, Stephen R. Kennedy, Kevin Moroney, Raymond Rooney, The City of New York, The New York City Police Department. (Welch, Alicia) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Assistant Corporation Counsel Alicia Welch in Support re: 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants' Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Raymond Kelly, Stephen R. Kennedy, Kevin Moroney, Raymond Rooney, The City of New York, The New York City Police Department. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit IIII through NNNN)(Welch, Alicia) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/23/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Leonard B. Sand from Alicia H. Welch dated 9/22/2010 re: Requesting a five (5) page extension for a reply brief, which will permit defendants to submit a thirty (30) page reply brief. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 9/23/2010) (jpo) (Entered: 09/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/18/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER: addressed to Judge Leonard B. Sand from Alicia H. Welch dated 8/17/2010 re: Defendants request an extension of time to file defendants' reply memorandum of law in further support of their motion for summary judgment motion from September 3, 2010 until September 24, 2010. Defendants also request that the Court permit defendants to file a twenty five (25) page reply memorandum of law. Accordingly, defendants believe that the additional fifteen (15) pages will be necessary to adequately address the contentions in plaintiffs' forty (40) page memorandum of law in opposition. ENDORSEMENT: Extensions granted on consent. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 8/18/2010) (js) (Entered: 08/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/13/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alicia Hayley Welch on behalf of Raymond Kelly, Stephen R. Kennedy, Kevin Moroney, Raymond Rooney, The City of New York, The New York City Police Department (Welch, Alicia) (Entered: 08/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      COUNTER STATEMENT TO 31 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by Rene Canela, David Flores, Roland Gutierrez, Frankie Rosado. (Cronin, Linda) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Linda M. Cronin in Opposition re: 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants' Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Rene Canela, David Flores, Roland Gutierrez. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit declaration of Canela, # 2 Affidavit declaration of Flores, # 3 Affidavit declaration of Guttierrez, # 4 Affidavit declarationof Rosado, # 5 Exhibit A, # 6 Exhibit B, # 7 Exhibit C, # 8 Exhibit D, # 9 Exhibit E, # 10 Exhibit F, # 11 Exhibit G, # 12 Exhibit H, # 13 Exhibit I, # 14 Exhibit J, # 15 Exhibit K, # 16 Exhibit L, # 17 Exhibit M, # 18 Exhibit N, # 19 Exhibit O, # 20 Exhibit P, # 21 Exhibit Q, # 22 Exhibit R, # 23 Exhibit S, # 24 Exhibit T, # 25 Exhibit U, # 26 Exhibit V, # 27 Exhibit W)(Cronin, Linda) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          FIRST MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants' Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment. filed by all plaintiffs. Document filed by Rene Canela, David Flores, Roland Gutierrez. (Cronin, Linda) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Leonard B. Sand from Linda M. Cronin dated 7/12/10 re: Ms. Goell-Voigt asked that we set the following specific scheduling order request to accommodate their anticipated needs for Reply: Opposition due July 30, 2010. Reply due September 3, 2010. ENDORSEMENT: Schedule approved. So ordered., (Replies due by 9/3/2010., Responses due by 7/30/2010) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel in Part I on 7/13/10) (rjm) (Entered: 07/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/16/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Leonard B. Sand from Linda M. Cronin dated 6/15/2010 re: Requesting that opposition be due July 14, 2010, reply will be due August 4, 2010. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 6/15/2010) (jpo) (Entered: 06/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/16/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Francis Bellistri on behalf of Roland Gutierrez, Rene Canela, David Flores (Bellistri, Christopher) (Entered: 06/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants' Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Stephen R. Kennedy, Kevin Moroney, Raymond Rooney, The City of New York, The New York City Police Department, Raymond Kelly. (Barnett, Camille) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/2/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Leonard B. Sand from Camille D. Barnett dated 5/14/10 re: Defendants respectfully request that the Court allow defendants to submit a 60-page memorandum of law in support of their motion for summary judgment, which we believe will be fully dispositive. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 6/2/10) (rjm) (Entered: 06/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/2/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Leonard B. Sand from Rocco G. Avallone dated 5/21/10 re: Plaintiffs respectfully request that Your Honor extend Plaintiffs' time to file their opposition papers to June 18, 2010 and request that Plaintiffs also be permitted to submit a Memorandum of Law not to exceed 60 pages. ENDORSEMENT: Granted., (Responses due by 6/18/2010) (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 6/2/10) (rjm) (Entered: 06/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/20/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dominick Peter Revellino on behalf of Roland Gutierrez, Frankie Rosado, Rene Canela, David Flores (Revellino, Dominick) (Entered: 05/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/20/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rocco G Avallone on behalf of Roland Gutierrez, Frankie Rosado, Rene Canela, David Flores (Avallone, Rocco) (Entered: 05/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/20/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants' Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Stephen R. Kennedy, Kevin Moroney, Raymond Rooney, The City of New York, The New York City Police Department, Raymond Kelly. (Barnett, Camille) (Entered: 05/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/15/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Camille D. Barnett in Support re: 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants' Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Stephen R. Kennedy, Kevin Moroney, Raymond Rooney, The City of New York, The New York City Police Department, Raymond Kelly. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A (Part 1), # 2 Exhibit Exhibit (Part 2), # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B (Part 1), # 4 Errata Exhibit B (Part 2), # 5 Exhibit Exhibit C - Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit G - Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit K - Exhibit T, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit U - Exhibit X, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit Y - Exhibit CC, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit DD, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit EE - Exhibit GG, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit HH - Exhibit MM, # 17 Exhibit Exhibit NN - Exhibit PP (Part 1), # 18 Exhibit Exhibit PP (Part 2), # 19 Exhibit Exhibit QQ - Exhibit YY, # 20 Exhibit Exhibit ZZ - Exhibit HHH, # 21 Exhibit Exhibit III - Exhibit KKK, # 22 Exhibit Exhibit LLL - Exhibit OOO, # 23 Exhibit Exhibit PPP - Exhibit ZZZ, # 24 Errata Exhibit AAAA - Exhibit FFFF, # 25 Exhibit Exhibit GGGG - Exhbit HHHH)(Barnett, Camille) (Entered: 05/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/15/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Stephen R. Kennedy, Kevin Moroney, Raymond Rooney, The City of New York, The New York City Police Department, Raymond Kelly. (Barnett, Camille) (Entered: 05/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/15/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants' Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Stephen R. Kennedy, Kevin Moroney, Raymond Rooney, The City of New York, The New York City Police Department, Raymond Kelly. (Barnett, Camille) Modified on 5/18/2010 (jar). (Entered: 05/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants' Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Stephen R. Kennedy, Kevin Moroney, Raymond Rooney, The City of New York, The New York City Police Department, Raymond Kelly.(Barnett, Camille) (Entered: 05/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/13/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Leonard B. Sand from Camille D. Barnett dated 5/12/2010 re: I write, with the consent of counsel for plaintiffs, to respectfully request that the Court permit defendants to submit a Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment that is fifteen five pages in excess of the page limit set forth in Your Honor's Individual Rules of Practice. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 5/13/2010) (jmi) (Entered: 05/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/28/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Leonard B. Sand from Camille D. Barnett dated 4/27/2010 re: Defendants write to respectfully an extension of the time to file defendants' summary judgment motion from April 30, 2010 until May 14,2010. ENDORSEMENT: Extension to 5/14/2010 is granted. The Court will not entertain any motions for further extensions. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 4/28/2010) (tve) (Entered: 04/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/21/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINT PRE TRIAL ORDER The parties submit this proposed joint Pre Trial Order pursuant to the Court's Order of April 5, 2010 and 3A of the Court's Individual Rules i. The Full Caption of the Action. See Above ii. The names, addresses (including firm names), and telephone and fax numbers of trial counsel as set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 4/21/2010) (jmi) (Entered: 04/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/5/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Leonard B. Sand from Camille D. Barnett dated 4/1/2010 re: Defendants respectfully request that the Court allow the parties to submit a JPTO by 4/19/2010 and submit dispositive motions by 4/30/2010. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 4/5/2010) (tro) (Entered: 04/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/1/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis from Camille D. Barnett dated 3/31/10 re: counsel for defendants respectfully request that the Court reconsider its March 29, 2010 Order and allow the parties to submit a JPTO on April 14, 2010. Furthermore, defendants seek until April 30, 2010 to submit a motion for summary judgment, which we believe is in the best interest of the parties and the Court. ENDORSEMENT: Counsel shall submit the Joint Pretrial Order by close of business April 5, 2010. Counsel may contact Judge Sand to determine if he is willing to entertain a dispositive motion out of time. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 4/1/10) (pl) (Entered: 04/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis from Camille D. Barnett dated 3/26/2010 re: The parties respectfully request that the Court schedule any settlement conference for a date convenient to the Court after 4/26/2010 and that the Court extend the time to submit a Joint Pre-Trial Order or dispositive motions from 3/31/2010 until 5/31/2010. ENDORSEMENT: Application denied. Counsel were aware that the prior extension of the scheduling order was marked final. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 3/29/2010) (tro) (Entered: 03/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/1/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis from Camille Barnett dated 2/24/10 re: Request for an extension of time until 3/31/10 to complete discovery. ENDORSEMENT: The application for a general extension of the discovery deadline is denied. The depositions of Lt. Moroney and Chief Kennedy may be taken beyond the discovery deadline. However, discovery is otherwise closed. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 3/1/10) (cd) (Entered: 03/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/16/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis from Linda M. Cronin dated 12/14/09 re: counsel requests an extension of discovery deadline until February 28, 2010. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. All discovery shall be completed by February 26, 2010. The deadline for submitting the pretrial order of any dispositive motion is extended to March 31, 2010. No further extensions will be permitted. counsel shall contact my chambers to schedule a settlement conference to be held prior to March 31, 2010. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 12/16/09) (djc) (Entered: 12/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/27/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis from Camille D. Barnett dated 10/26/2009 re: I am an Assistant Corporation Counsel in the Office of Michael A. Cardozo, Corporation Counsel of the City of New York, attorney for the defendants in the above-referenced discrimination action. I write to respectfully request a sixty (60) day extension of discovery until December 31, 2009. Currently, discovery is scheduled to close on October 30, 2009. Plaintiffs attorney, Linda M. Cronin, Esq., consents to this request. This is the parties' second request for such an extension. Accordingly, it is respectfully requested that the Court allow the parties until December 31, 2009 to complete discovery in this matter. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. In addition, the deadline for submitting the pretrial order or any dispositive motion is extended to January 29, 2010. SO ORDERED. ( Motions due by 1/29/2010.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 10/27/2009) (jmi) (Entered: 10/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/24/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis from Linda M. Cronin dated 8/20/2009 re: Requesting an extension of the discovery deadline until October 30, 2009 and that the pretrial order be due on November 13, 2009. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 8/21/2009) (jpo) (Entered: 08/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/15/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell, Part I on 7/14/09) (sac) (Entered: 07/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                            RULE 26 DISCLOSURE.Document filed by Stephen R. Kennedy, Kevin Moroney, Raymond Rooney, The City of New York, The New York City Police Department, Raymond Kelly.(Heer, Christopher) (Entered: 03/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 12/8/08) (js) (Entered: 12/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b), after holding an initial pretrial conference, it is hereby ordered that: Discovery due by 8/31/2009. Pretrial Conference set for 9/21/2009 at 10:00 AM before Judge Leonard B. Sand. Pretrial Order due by 9/14/2009. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 12/8/09) (js) (Entered: 12/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/5/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RULE 26 DISCLOSURE.Document filed by Roland Gutierrez.(Cronin, Linda) (Entered: 12/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 10 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: 8/14/2008 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER: Addressed to Judge Leonard B. Sand from Christopher L. Heer dated August 13, 2008 re: I write to respectfully request a 30 day extension of time to respond to the complaint from August 18, 2008 to September 18, 2008. Lind M. Cronin, plaintiffs' counsel, has consented to City Defendants' request for an extension of time. This is the City Defendants' first request for an extension of time. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 8/14/2008) (rw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/24/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Stephen R. Kennedy, Kevin Moroney, Raymond Rooney, The City of New York, The New York City Police Department, Raymond Kelly.(Heer, Christopher) (Entered: 11/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: 8/14/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines: The City of New York answer due 9/18/2008; The New York City Police Department answer due 9/18/2008; and Raymond Kelly answer due 9/18/2008. (rw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/15/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Leonard B. Sand from Christopher L. Heer dated 10/15/08 re: Request for an extension of time until 11/19/08 for City defendants to respond to the complaint. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. The City of New York answer due 11/19/2008; The New York City Police Department answer due 11/19/2008. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 10/15/08) (db) (Entered: 10/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 9 Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: 8/7/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Lee Heer on behalf of The City of New York, The New York City Police Department, Raymond Kelly (Heer, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/18/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Leonard B. Sand from Christopher L. Heer dated 9/16/2008 re: Counsel respectfully request an extension of time to October 20, 2008 to respond to the complaint. ENDORSEMENT: Granted on consent. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 9/17/2008) (jfe) (Entered: 09/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 8 Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: 8/5/2008 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Service was accepted by Person of Suitable Age. Document filed by Roland Gutierrez. (Cronin, Linda)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 7 Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: 8/5/2008 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Raymond Rooney served on 7/25/2008, answer due 8/14/2008. Service was accepted by Principal Maldonado, Suitable Age. Document filed by Roland Gutierrez. (Cronin, Linda)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 6 Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: 8/5/2008 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Kevin Moroney served on 8/1/2008, answer due 8/21/2008. Service was accepted by Rosario Sayer, Suitable Age. Document filed by Roland Gutierrez. (Cronin, Linda)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 5 Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: 8/5/2008 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Stephen R. Kennedy served on 7/25/2008, answer due 8/14/2008. Service was accepted by Principal Maldonado, Suitable Age. Document filed by Roland Gutierrez. (Cronin, Linda)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 4 Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: 8/5/2008 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Raymond Kelly served on 7/25/2008, answer due 8/14/2008. Service was accepted by Suitable Age. Document filed by Roland Gutierrez. (Cronin, Linda)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 3 Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: 8/5/2008 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. The New York City Police Department served on 7/25/2008, answer due 8/14/2008. Service was accepted by Suitable Age. Document filed by Roland Gutierrez. (Cronin, Linda)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 2 Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: 8/5/2008 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. The City of New York served on 7/25/2008, answer due 8/14/2008. Service was accepted by Suitable Age. Document filed by Roland Gutierrez; Rene Canela; David Flores. (Avallone, Rocco)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/23/2008, Entered: 7/25/2008 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT against Stephen R. Kennedy, Kevin Moroney, Raymond Rooney, The City of New York, The New York City Police Department, Raymond Kelly. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 657515)Document filed by Roland Gutierrez, Frankie Rosado, Rene Canela, David Flores.(jeh) (mbe).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 7/23/2008, Entered: 7/25/2008 Case Designated ECF.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Case Designated ECF. (jeh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 7/23/2008, Entered: 7/25/2008 Case Designation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Magistrate Judge James C. Francis is so designated. (jeh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 7/23/2008, Entered: 7/25/2008 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS ISSUED as to Stephen R. Kennedy, Kevin Moroney, Raymond Rooney, The City of New York, The New York City Police Department, Raymond Kelly. (jeh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 115 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?