Crimson Capital LLC et al v. The Spartan Group Holding, LLC et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-06554-JFK
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Crimson Capital LLC, Plaintiff
No Logo Michael Staisil, Plaintiff
No Logo Ddd Ventures, LLC, Counter-Claimant

Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Jonas Hibsher +1 212 541 1085 +1 212 541 4630 wjhibsher@bclplaw.com
Space John Douglas Kircher +1 212 541 3010 +1 212 261 9863 john.kircher@bryancave.com

Represented by Kudman Trachten LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space PAUL H. ALOE +1 212 868 1010 +MDL TER MINATED paloe@kudmanlaw.com
No Logo Dennis Dammerman, Counter-Claimant

Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Jonas Hibsher +1 212 541 1085 +1 212 541 4630 wjhibsher@bclplaw.com
Space John Douglas Kircher +1 212 541 3010 +1 212 261 9863 john.kircher@bryancave.com

Represented by Kudman Trachten LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space PAUL H. ALOE +1 212 868 1010 +MDL TER MINATED paloe@kudmanlaw.com
No Logo M82 Group LLC, Counter-Claimant

Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Jonas Hibsher +1 212 541 1085 +1 212 541 4630 wjhibsher@bclplaw.com
Space John Douglas Kircher +1 212 541 3010 +1 212 261 9863 john.kircher@bryancave.com

Represented by Kudman Trachten LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space PAUL H. ALOE +1 212 868 1010 +MDL TER MINATED paloe@kudmanlaw.com
No Logo Marshall Manley, Counter-Claimant

Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Jonas Hibsher +1 212 541 1085 +1 212 541 4630 wjhibsher@bclplaw.com
Space John Douglas Kircher +1 212 541 3010 +1 212 261 9863 john.kircher@bryancave.com

Represented by Kudman Trachten LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space PAUL H. ALOE +1 212 868 1010 +MDL TER MINATED paloe@kudmanlaw.com
No Logo Spartan Capital Management, LLC, Counter-Claimant

Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Jonas Hibsher +1 212 541 1085 +1 212 541 4630 wjhibsher@bclplaw.com
Space John Douglas Kircher +1 212 541 3010 +1 212 261 9863 john.kircher@bryancave.com

Represented by Kudman Trachten LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space PAUL H. ALOE +1 212 868 1010 +MDL TER MINATED paloe@kudmanlaw.com
No Logo Spartan Investment Association LP, Counter-Claimant

Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Jonas Hibsher +1 212 541 1085 +1 212 541 4630 wjhibsher@bclplaw.com
Space John Douglas Kircher +1 212 541 3010 +1 212 261 9863 john.kircher@bryancave.com

Represented by Kudman Trachten LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space PAUL H. ALOE +1 212 868 1010 +MDL TER MINATED paloe@kudmanlaw.com
No Logo Spartan Investment Partners LP, Counter-Claimant

Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Jonas Hibsher +1 212 541 1085 +1 212 541 4630 wjhibsher@bclplaw.com
Space John Douglas Kircher +1 212 541 3010 +1 212 261 9863 john.kircher@bryancave.com

Represented by Kudman Trachten LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space PAUL H. ALOE +1 212 868 1010 +MDL TER MINATED paloe@kudmanlaw.com
No Logo Spartan Partners GP, LLC, Counter-Claimant

Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Jonas Hibsher +1 212 541 1085 +1 212 541 4630 wjhibsher@bclplaw.com
Space John Douglas Kircher +1 212 541 3010 +1 212 261 9863 john.kircher@bryancave.com

Represented by Kudman Trachten LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space PAUL H. ALOE +1 212 868 1010 +MDL TER MINATED paloe@kudmanlaw.com
No Logo The Spartan Group Holding, LLC, Counter-Claimant

Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Jonas Hibsher +1 212 541 1085 +1 212 541 4630 wjhibsher@bclplaw.com
Space John Douglas Kircher +1 212 541 3010 +1 212 261 9863 john.kircher@bryancave.com

Represented by Kudman Trachten LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space PAUL H. ALOE +1 212 868 1010 +MDL TER MINATED paloe@kudmanlaw.com
v.
No Logo Abc, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Ddd Ventures, LLC, Defendant

Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Jonas Hibsher +1 212 541 1085 +1 212 541 4630 wjhibsher@bclplaw.com
Space John Douglas Kircher +1 212 541 3010 +1 212 261 9863 john.kircher@bryancave.com

Represented by Kudman Trachten LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space PAUL H. ALOE +1 212 868 1010 +MDL TER MINATED paloe@kudmanlaw.com
No Logo DEF LLC, Defendant

Represented by Kudman Trachten LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space PAUL H. ALOE +1 212 868 1010 +MDL TER MINATED paloe@kudmanlaw.com
No Logo Dennis Dammerman, Defendant

Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Jonas Hibsher +1 212 541 1085 +1 212 541 4630 wjhibsher@bclplaw.com
Space John Douglas Kircher +1 212 541 3010 +1 212 261 9863 john.kircher@bryancave.com

Represented by Kudman Trachten LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space PAUL H. ALOE +1 212 868 1010 +MDL TER MINATED paloe@kudmanlaw.com
GE Asset Management, Inc. GE Asset Management, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "GE Asset Management Incorporated"
No Logo Inflexion Capital Partners, LP, Defendant
No Logo M82 Group LLC, Defendant

Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Jonas Hibsher +1 212 541 1085 +1 212 541 4630 wjhibsher@bclplaw.com
Space John Douglas Kircher +1 212 541 3010 +1 212 261 9863 john.kircher@bryancave.com

Represented by Kudman Trachten LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space PAUL H. ALOE +1 212 868 1010 +MDL TER MINATED paloe@kudmanlaw.com
No Logo Marshall Manley, Defendant

Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Jonas Hibsher +1 212 541 1085 +1 212 541 4630 wjhibsher@bclplaw.com
Space John Douglas Kircher +1 212 541 3010 +1 212 261 9863 john.kircher@bryancave.com

Represented by Kudman Trachten LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space PAUL H. ALOE +1 212 868 1010 +MDL TER MINATED paloe@kudmanlaw.com
No Logo Spartan Capital Management, LLC, Defendant

Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Jonas Hibsher +1 212 541 1085 +1 212 541 4630 wjhibsher@bclplaw.com
Space John Douglas Kircher +1 212 541 3010 +1 212 261 9863 john.kircher@bryancave.com

Represented by Kudman Trachten LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space PAUL H. ALOE +1 212 868 1010 +MDL TER MINATED paloe@kudmanlaw.com
No Logo Spartan Investment Association LP, Defendant

Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Jonas Hibsher +1 212 541 1085 +1 212 541 4630 wjhibsher@bclplaw.com
Space John Douglas Kircher +1 212 541 3010 +1 212 261 9863 john.kircher@bryancave.com

Represented by Kudman Trachten LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space PAUL H. ALOE +1 212 868 1010 +MDL TER MINATED paloe@kudmanlaw.com
No Logo Spartan Investment Partners LP, Defendant

Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Jonas Hibsher +1 212 541 1085 +1 212 541 4630 wjhibsher@bclplaw.com
Space John Douglas Kircher +1 212 541 3010 +1 212 261 9863 john.kircher@bryancave.com

Represented by Kudman Trachten LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space PAUL H. ALOE +1 212 868 1010 +MDL TER MINATED paloe@kudmanlaw.com
No Logo Spartan Partners GP, LLC, Defendant

Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Jonas Hibsher +1 212 541 1085 +1 212 541 4630 wjhibsher@bclplaw.com
Space John Douglas Kircher +1 212 541 3010 +1 212 261 9863 john.kircher@bryancave.com

Represented by Kudman Trachten LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space PAUL H. ALOE +1 212 868 1010 +MDL TER MINATED paloe@kudmanlaw.com
No Logo Stephen Norris, Defendant
No Logo Stephen Norris Capital Partners LLC, Defendant
No Logo The Spartan Group Holding, LLC, Defendant

Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Jonas Hibsher +1 212 541 1085 +1 212 541 4630 wjhibsher@bclplaw.com
Space John Douglas Kircher +1 212 541 3010 +1 212 261 9863 john.kircher@bryancave.com

Represented by Kudman Trachten LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space PAUL H. ALOE +1 212 868 1010 +MDL TER MINATED paloe@kudmanlaw.com
No Logo UVW LP, Defendant
No Logo XYZ LP, Defendant
No Logo Crimson Capital LLC, Counter-Defendant
No Logo Michael Staisil, Counter-Defendant
Attributes
Office Foley Square
Filed 7/23/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Transfer/Remand - Transfer to Another District
County NewYork
Terminated 9/2/2008
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 601873-08[State Court-Supreme]
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF
Timeline
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 5 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: 9/2/2008 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER OF REMAND: the matter having been reviewed by substitute counsel, and on the suggestion that of subject matter jurisdiction is lacking, this case is hereby remanded to the Supreme Court, the State of New York, County of New York. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 9/2/2008) (tve)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: 9/5/2008 Case Remanded Out - State Court
CASE REMANDED OUT from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the State Court - Supreme Court Court of the State of New York, County of New York. Sent certified copy of docket entries and remand order. Mailed via Federal Express AIRBILL # 8655711252520215 on 9/5/2008. (jfe)
LREF
Legal Document 4 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: 8/11/2008 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paul H. Aloe on behalf of Spartan Partners GP, LLC, Spartan Capital Management, LLC, M82 Group LLC, Marshall Manley, DDD Ventures LLC, Dennis Dammerman, DEF LLC, The Spartan Group Holding, LLC, Spartan Investment Partners LP, Spartan Investment Association LP (Aloe, Paul)
LREF
Legal Document 3 Filed: 7/25/2008, Entered: 7/25/2008 Answer
ANSWER to Complaint., COUNTERCLAIM against Crimson Capital LLC, Michael Staisil. Document filed by Spartan Partners GP, LLC, Spartan Capital Management, LLC, M82 Group LLC, Marshall Manley, DDD Ventures LLC, Dennis Dammerman, The Spartan Group Holding, LLC, Spartan Investment Partners LP, Spartan Investment Association LP. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A Part 1, # (2) Exhibit A Part 2, # (3) Affidavit of Service)(Hibsher, William)
LREF
Blank 2 Filed: 7/23/2008, Entered: 7/25/2008 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Spartan Partners GP, LLC, Spartan Capital Management, LLC, M82 Group LLC, DDD Ventures LLC, The Spartan Group Holding, LLC.(rdz)
LREF
Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/23/2008, Entered: 7/25/2008 Notice of Removal
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 601873-08. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 657535).Document filed by Spartan Partners GP, LLC, Spartan Capital Management, LLC, M82 Group LLC, Marshall Manley, DDD Ventures LLC, The Spartan Group Holding, LLC, Spartan Investment Partners LP, Spartan Investment Association LP, Dennis Dammerman.(rdz) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/25/2008: # (1) Exhibit) (rdz). Modified on 7/25/2008 (kkc).
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 7/23/2008, Entered: 7/25/2008 Case Designated ECF.
Case Designated ECF. (rdz)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 7/23/2008, Entered: 7/25/2008 Case Designation
Magistrate Judge James C. Francis IV is so designated. (rdz)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 237 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?