Hayden, et al v. UAL Corporation, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-06811-AKH

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 12, 2016 at 11:10 AM DT (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Elizabeth Gail Hayden, Plaintiff

Represented by Hanly Conroy Bierstein Sheridan Fisher & Hayes, LLP

Represented by Motley Rice, LLC

Toggle Switch Represented by Simmons Browder Gianaris Angelides & Barnerd LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jayne Conroy +1 212 784 6400 +1 212 213 5949 jconroy@simmonsfirm.com
Space Paul J. Hanly, Jr. +1 212 784 6400 +1 212 213 5949 phanly@simmonsfirm.com
v.
No Logo Air France, Defendant
No Logo Air Jamaica, Defendant
No Logo Air Transport Association, Defendant
No Logo AirTran Airways, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Alaska Airlines, Inc., Defendant
No Logo America West Airlines, Inc., Defendant
American Airlines, Inc. American Airlines, Inc., Defendant
AMR Corporation Unknown Role, AMR Corporation
Unknown Role, Orbitz Inc
No Logo American Trans Air, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Burns International Security Services Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Cape Air, Defendant
No Logo Colgan Air, Inc., Defendant
Continental Airlines, Inc. Continental Airlines, Inc., Defendant
Delta Air Lines, Inc. Delta Air Lines, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Delta Airlines"
Unknown Role, Orbitz Inc
No Logo Delta Express, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Does, Defendant
No Logo Globe Aviation Services, Defendant

Represented by Jones Hirsch Connors & Bull PC

No Logo Heimann Systems Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Heimann Systems Corp."
No Logo Huntleigh USA Corporation, Defendant

Represented by Susman Godfrey, LLP

No Logo ICTS International NV, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McLaughlin & Stern, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jon Paul Robbins +1 212 448 1100 +1 212 448 0066 probbins@mclaughlinstern.com
No Logo In Vision Technologies, Inc., Defendant
No Logo L-3 Communications Corporation, Defendant
No Logo L-3 Communications Corporation Security and Detection Systems, Defendant
No Logo L3 Communications Holdings, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Massachusetts Port Authority, Defendant
No Logo Midway Airlines Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Midwest Express Airlines, Inc., Defendant
No Logo NorthWest Airlines Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Pinkerton's, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Quantam Magnetics, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Securitas Ab, Defendant
No Logo Swiss, Defendant
The Boeing Company, Inc. The Boeing Company, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "The Boeing Company"
UAL Corporation UAL Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quirk and Bakalor, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian Patrick Sexton +1 212 319 1000 +1 212 319 1065 bsexton@quirkbakalor.com
United Airlines, Inc. United Airlines, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quirk and Bakalor, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian Patrick Sexton +1 212 319 1000 +1 212 319 1065 bsexton@quirkbakalor.com
No Logo Us Airways, Inc., Defendant
Office Foley Square
Filed 9/8/2003
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Other
County XX Out of State
Terminated 7/25/2008
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
121-mc-00101-AKH
Related Case
102-cv-00458-AKH
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, MEMBER, RELATED
  Entries (120) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 78 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... that any and all claims asserted and/or assertable by Plaintiff(s) The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey, WTC Retail LLC and the Port Authority Trans-Hudson Corporation contained in the Complaint(08cv3701 and dated 4/16/08) against Defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc. with regard to United Airlines Flight 175 in the captioned lawsuit shall be dismissed by the Court without prejudice... and without costs to either party as against the other. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/28/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(rjm)
    LREF
    Legal Document 77 Filed: 7/25/2008, Entered: 7/25/2008 Judgment*Court Filing
    FINAL JUDGMENT that there is no just reason for delay pursuant to FRCP 54(b), settling the action as to 03 CV 6811(AKH) and dismissing the complaint with prejudice as to all defendants. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/25/08) (Attachments: # (1) notice of right to appeal)(ml)
      LREF
      Legal Document 76 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
      STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... that any and all claims asserted and/or assertable by Plaintiff(s) World Trade Center Properties LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC and 4 World Trade Center LLC against Defendant(s) Delta Air Lines, Inc. and Delta Express, Inc. with regard to United Airlines Flight 175 shall be dismissed by the Court without prejudice... and without costs to either party as against the other... and as further set forth. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/18/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(rjm) Modified on 7/21/2008 (rjm).
        LREF
        Legal Document 75 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: 7/7/2008 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [73] MOTION to enter final judgment and rule that the ATSSSA limitation applies.. Document filed by UAL Corporation, United Airlines, Inc.. (Sexton, Brian)
          LREF
          Legal Document 74 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: 7/7/2008 Declaration in Support of Motion
          DECLARATION of Jeffrey J. Ellis in Support re: [73] MOTION to enter final judgment and rule that the ATSSSA limitation applies.. Document filed by UAL Corporation, United Airlines, Inc.. (Sexton, Brian)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None
            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 6/5/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 04/09/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document 73 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: 7/7/2008, Terminated: 7/25/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
              MOTION to enter final judgment and rule that the ATSSSA limitation applies. Document filed by UAL Corporation, United Airlines, Inc..(Sexton, Brian)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 6/5/2012 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Paula Speer, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/3/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/13/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/11/2013.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 04/09/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 3/19/2008, Entered: 4/8/2008 Case Consolidation - Member
                  CONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Create association to 1:21-mc-00101-AKH. (rw)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: None
                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 1/23/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 01/31/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document 72 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: 3/18/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                      JOINT PROPOSED ORDER TRANSFERRING CASES TO 21MC101 (AKH) DOCKET AND CLOSING 21MC97 (AKH) that the cases attached hereto as "Exhibit A" are to be moved from the 21mc97(AKH) Master Docket to the 21mc101(AKH) Master Docket. The Cross-Claims of all WTCP Cross-Claim Plaintiffs and the Cross-Claims of The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey, pending in 21mc97, shall be transferred to the 21mc101 docket under four new civil action numbers, two to be purchased by the WTCP Cross-Claim Plaintiffs and two to be purchased by the Port Authority. Leave is hereby granted for Cross-Claim Plaintiffs to amend their respective cross-claims within thirty days of this order solely to recast them as direct claims by the Cross-Claim Plaintiffs as Plaintiffs against the Cross-Claim Defendants as Defendants. The Clerk is instructed to close the Master Docket numbered 21mc97(AKH) thirty days from the date of this Order. This Document relates to member cases listed on attached Exhibit A as well as: 21mc97, 21mc101, 02-7156, 02-7289, 04-0365, 03-6800, 02-7145, 02-7260, 02-7154, 03-6811, 03-6940, 04-7213, 04-1350, 03-9965, 04-6788, 04-6789, 04-7914, 03-10203. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/18/08) (rjm)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 1/23/2013 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Martha Drevis, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/25/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/7/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/6/2013.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 01/31/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document 71 Filed: 11/26/2007, Entered: 11/26/2007 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                          STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... that any and all claims asserted and/or assertable by Plaintiffs against Defendant(s) ATA Airlines, Inc. in the captioned lawsuits shall be dismissed by the Court without prejudice... and without costs to either party as against the other. This Document relates to member cases listed and 03-6802, 02-6364, 02-7154, 02-7153, 03-6811, 03-6801, 02-0458, 03-7083, 02-2802, 03-7084, 02-1727, 02-6365, 02-7152. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 11/26/07) (rjm)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 12/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER: 12/17/2012 Status Conference reset for 1/23/2013 at 03:00 PM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein, for the Cantor claims and at 3:15 for the Silverstein claims. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/10/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(cd) (Entered: 12/13/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document 70 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/14/2007 ~Notice (other)
                              NOTICE of Adoption of Answer of Defendant the Boeing Company to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Flight 175 Master Liability Complaint. Document filed by The Boeing Company. (Attachments: # (1) Answer of Defendant the Boeing Company to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Flight 175 Master Liability Complaint)(Lent, Eric)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None
                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 10/11/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 11/13/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document 69 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 Affidavit of Service Other
                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of NOTICE OF ADOPTING MASTER ANSWER OF HUNTLEIGH USA, INC. TO PLAINTIFFS FOURTH AMENDED FLIGHT 175 COMPLAINT served on All Parties on November 13, 2007. Service was accepted by Pursuant to Court Order. Document filed by Huntleigh USA Corporation. (Ross, Johnathan)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 10/11/2012 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Karen Gorlaski, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/7/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/17/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/14/2013.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 11/13/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document 68 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                      ANSWER to Amended Complaint. Document filed by Huntleigh USA Corporation. Related document: [6] Amended Complaint,, filed by Elizabeth Gail Hayden. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit MASTER ANSWER OF HUNTLEIGH USA, INC. TO PLAINTIFFS FOURTH AMENDED FLIGHT 175 COMPLAINT)(Ross, Johnathan)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a ARGUMENT proceeding held on 10/18/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 11/08/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document 67 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 Affidavit of Service Other
                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice Adopting Answer of Defendants United & UAL to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Flight 175 Master Liability Complaint served on All Parties on November 13, 2007. Document filed by UAL Corporation, United Airlines, Inc.. (Redmond, Loretta)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 8/1/11 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document 66 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                              NOTICE of Adoption of Defendants United & UAL's Answer to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Flight 175 Master Liability Complaint. Document filed by UAL Corporation, United Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Pages 1-25 of Defendants United & UAL's Answer to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Flight 175 Master Liability Complaint# (2) Page 26-45 of Defendants United & UAL's Answer to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Flight 175 Master Liability Complaint)(Redmond, Loretta)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 8/1/2011 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Denise Richards, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/12/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/22/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/21/2011.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document 65 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 Answer
                                                  ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Globe Aviation Services.(Connors, James)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL. PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that Douglas M. Pravda hereby withdraws as counsel of record for defendant The Boeing Company in the above-captioned actions. Robert A. Atkins and H. Christopher Boehning of the law firm Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Ganison LLP have entered notices of appearance in this matter and together with Perkins Coie LLP and Richards Kibbe & Orbe LLP, will continue to represent The Boeing Company. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 4/4/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(djc) (Entered: 04/05/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document 64 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                      NOTICE of adoption of answer to amended complaint. Document filed by ICTS International NV. (Attachments: # (1))(Robbins, Jon)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 8/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE of Motion for an Order Requiring WTCP to Post an Appeal Bond. Document filed by Industrial Risk Insurers. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(Clifford, Robert) (Entered: 08/19/2010)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document 63 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                          NOTICE of of Adoption. Document filed by Massachusetts Port Authority. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service)(Wood, Willard)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 4/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE of Notice of Change of Attorney. Document filed by Delta Air Lines, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(Crowley, Michael) (Entered: 04/22/2010)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document 62 Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: 12/11/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER... All attorneys who have been admitted to this Court, either for all purposes or pro hac vice for purposes of this case who are not yet registered to file documents electronically, shall complete and file a CM/ECF attorney registration form by November 1, 2006. Forms can be found on the Court's website at www.nysd.uscourts.gov. As of October 17, 2006 all documents filed in the Miscellaneous case and the underlying civil cases shall be filed electronically on the Court's ECF system via the Internet at ecf.nysd.uscourts.gov. All correspondences are to be submitted in either Word or WordPerfect format to WTC_letters@nysd.uscourts.gov. The subject heading of the email must include the case number of the action or actions that the email pertains to. No correspondences are to be sent to Chambers through regular mail. No correspondences should be in the form of a motion. Amended complaints and supplemental pleading shall provide a list of the additional parties and indicate the action to which they are being added... (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/17/2006) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK,1:02-cv-00456-AKH,1:02-cv-00458-AKH,1:02-cv-01727-AKH,1:02-cv-01728-AKH,1:02-cv-03676-AKH,1:02-cv-06186-AKH,1:02-cv-06364-AKH,1:02-cv-06365-AKH,1:02-cv-06378-AKH,1:02-cv-06379-AKH,1:02-cv-07144-AKH,1:02-cv-07145-AKH,1:02-cv-07147-AKH,1:02-cv-07149-AKH,1:02-cv-07150-AKH,1:02-cv-07153-AKH,1:02-cv-07154-AKH,1:02-cv-07155-AKH,1:02-cv-07156-AKH,1:02-cv-07259-AKH,1:02-cv-07260-AKH,1:02-cv-07261-AKH,1:02-cv-07289-AKH,1:02-cv-07290-AKH,1:02-cv-07608-AKH,1:02-cv-07912-AKH,1:02-cv-08916-AKH,1:02-cv-08918-AKH,1:02-cv-08919-AKH,1:02-cv-09234-AKH,1:02-cv-10273-AKH,1:03-cv-00006-AKH,1:03-cv-00029-AKH,1:03-cv-00332-AKH-THK,1:03-cv-01016-AKH,1:03-cv-06183-AKH,1:03-cv-06801-AKH,1:03-cv-06805-AKH,1:03-cv-06843-AKH,1:03-cv-06929-AKH,1:03-cv-06940-AKH,1:03-cv-07019-AKH,1:03-cv-07040-AKH,1:03-cv-07641-AKH,1:03-cv-10203-AKH,1:04-cv-00365-AKH,1:04-cv-01857-AKH,1:04-cv-07189-AKH,1:04-cv-07226-AKH,1:04-cv-07298-AKH,1:04-cv-08067-AKH,1:04-cv-09627-AKH,1:05-cv-07243-AKH,1:06-cv-02990-AKH,1:06-cv-05115-AKH,1:06-cv-05967-AKH,2:03-cv-06105-AKH,2:03-cv-06310-AKH,2:03-cv-06800-AKH,2:03-cv-06802-AKH,2:03-cv-06803-AKH,2:03-cv-06808-AKH,2:03-cv-06810-AKH,2:03-cv-06811-AKH,2:03-cv-06838-AKH,2:03-cv-06966-AKH,2:03-cv-06968-AKH,2:03-cv-07021-AKH,2:03-cv-07022-AKH,2:03-cv-07071-AKH,2:03-cv-07076-AKH,2:03-cv-07083-AKH,2:03-cv-07084-AKH(mj, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (63 in 1:04-cv-07299-AKH, 42 in 1:03-cv-06925-AKH, 41 in 1:04-cv-07136-AKH, 43 in 1:03-cv-10203-AKH, 55 in 1:04-cv-05020-AKH, 32 in 1:08-cv-10646-AKH, 12 in 1:04-cv-07914-AKH, 31 in 1:04-cv-07213-AKH, 58 in 1:04-cv-07294-AKH, 83 in 1:02-cv-02987-AKH, 54 in 1:04-cv-05021-AKH, 48 in 1:02-cv-07198-AKH, 65 in 1:04-cv-07231-AKH, 169 in 1:02-cv-07188-AKH, 15 in 1:04-cv-01350-AKH, 351 in 1:04-cv-07272-AKH, 69 in 1:02-cv-07260-AKH, 54 in 1:04-cv-05023-AKH, 38 in 1:02-cv-10052-AKH, 118 in 1:03-cv-06800-AKH, 55 in 1:04-cv-07240-AKH, 67 in 1:04-cv-07225-AKH, 91 in 1:02-cv-07154-AKH, 48 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH, 64 in 1:04-cv-07291-AKH, 58 in 1:04-cv-07244-AKH, 48 in 1:03-cv-06940-AKH, 719 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 60 in 1:04-cv-07238-AKH, 56 in 1:04-cv-07298-AKH, 13 in 1:04-cv-06788-AKH, 75 in 1:04-cv-07234-AKH, 55 in 1:04-cv-05022-AKH, 101 in 1:02-cv-07145-AKH, 56 in 1:04-cv-07246-AKH, 70 in 1:04-cv-07199-AKH, 86 in 1:03-cv-00131-AKH, 54 in 1:04-cv-05025-AKH, 56 in 1:04-cv-06848-AKH, 54 in 1:04-cv-05024-AKH, 9 in 1:08-cv-03701-AKH, 53 in 1:04-cv-04577-AKH, 12 in 1:08-cv-03700-AKH, 37 in 1:04-cv-07318-AKH, 15 in 1:04-cv-06789-AKH, 55 in 1:04-cv-07241-AKH, 24 in 1:07-cv-07968-AKH, 83 in 1:03-cv-07040-AKH, 12 in 1:07-cv-07969-AKH, 64 in 1:04-cv-07248-AKH, 81 in 1:03-cv-06811-AKH, 45 in 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 13 in 1:03-cv-09965-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by 1 World Trade Center LLC, 3 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Company, L.P., 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(Egan, Thomas) Modified on 2/17/2009 (jar). (Entered: 02/13/2009)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 61 Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: 8/17/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER ADMITTING COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE; purs. to Local Civil Rule 1.3(c), Justin B. Kaplan is admitted pro hac vice to the bar of this Court for the purpose of representing pltffs in this proceeding and consolidated cases. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/14/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK. This document relates to: 03 cv 6183; 03 cv 7040; 03 cv 7073; 04 cv 365; 03 cv 7076; 03 cv 7083; 03 cv 7070; 03 cv 7084; 03 cv 7071; 02 cv 7150; 02 cv 3676; 03 cv 6802; 02 cv 6364; 02 cv 7154; 02 cv 7259; 02 cv 8918; 02 cv 6378; 02 cv 7153; 02 cv 6379; 03 cv 29; 02 cv 7920; 02 cv 7145; 03 cv 6810; 03 cv 6808; 02 cv 7147; 02 cv 7260; 03 cv 6809; 03 cv 6811; 02 cv 8916; 03 cv 6801; 02 cv 7149; 02 cv 7156; 02 cv 2802; 02 cv 7155; 02 cv 7262; 03 cv 6803; 02 cv 458; 02 cv 1728; 03 cv 7022; 02 cv 456; 03 cv 6805; 02 cv 1727; 03 cv 6800; 02 cv 6365; 02 cv 7261; 02 cv 7144; 02 cv 8919; 03 cv 1016; 02 cv 7608; 02 cv 7912; 02 cv 6186. (Original document filed under 21 mc 97 as Doc. #872)(sn)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                    FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - AFFIDAVIT of Cathi A. Hession in Support re: (41 in 1:04-cv-07136-AKH, 43 in 1:03-cv-10203-AKH, 55 in 1:04-cv-05020-AKH, 32 in 1:08-cv-10646-AKH, 31 in 1:04-cv-07213-AKH, 54 in 1:04-cv-05021-AKH, 48 in 1:02-cv-07198-AKH, 65 in 1:04-cv-07231-AKH, 169 in 1:02-cv-07188-AKH, 69 in 1:02-cv-07260-AKH, 67 in 1:04-cv-07225-AKH, 48 in 1:03-cv-06940-AKH, 13 in 1:04-cv-06788-AKH, 101 in 1:02-cv-07145-AKH, 70 in 1:04-cv-07199-AKH, 54 in 1:04-cv-05025-AKH, 86 in 1:03-cv-00131-AKH, 54 in 1:04-cv-05024-AKH, 9 in 1:08-cv-03701-AKH, 37 in 1:04-cv-07318-AKH, 55 in 1:04-cv-07241-AKH, 24 in 1:07-cv-07968-AKH, 64 in 1:04-cv-07248-AKH, 45 in 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 13 in 1:03-cv-09965-AKH, 63 in 1:04-cv-07299-AKH, 42 in 1:03-cv-06925-AKH, 12 in 1:04-cv-07914-AKH, 58 in 1:04-cv-07294-AKH, 83 in 1:02-cv-02987-AKH, 15 in 1:04-cv-01350-AKH, 351 in 1:04-cv-07272-AKH, 38 in 1:02-cv-10052-AKH, 54 in 1:04-cv-05023-AKH, 118 in 1:03-cv-06800-AKH, 55 in 1:04-cv-07240-AKH, 91 in 1:02-cv-07154-AKH, 48 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH, 64 in 1:04-cv-07291-AKH, 58 in 1:04-cv-07244-AKH, 719 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 60 in 1:04-cv-07238-AKH, 56 in 1:04-cv-07298-AKH, 75 in 1:04-cv-07234-AKH, 55 in 1:04-cv-05022-AKH, 56 in 1:04-cv-07246-AKH, 56 in 1:04-cv-06848-AKH, 53 in 1:04-cv-04577-AKH, 12 in 1:08-cv-03700-AKH, 15 in 1:04-cv-06789-AKH, 83 in 1:03-cv-07040-AKH, 12 in 1:07-cv-07969-AKH, 81 in 1:03-cv-06811-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by 1 World Trade Center LLC, 3 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Company, L.P., 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Hession Affidavit part 1 0f 2, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Hession Affidavit part 2 of 2, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Hession Affidavit, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Hession Affidavit, # 5 Exhibit 4 to Hession Affidavit part 1 of 4, # 6 Exhibit 4 to Hession Affidavit part 2 of 4, # 7 Exhibit 4 to Hession Affidavit part 3 of 4, # 8 Exhibit 4 to Hession Affidavit part 4 of 4, # 9 Exhibit 5 to Hession Affidavit, # 10 Exhibit 6 to Hession Affidavit, # 11 Exhibit 7 to Hession Affidavit, # 12 Exhibit 8 to Hession Affidavit, # 13 Exhibit 9 to Hession Affidavit, # 14 Exhibit 10 to Hession Affidavit, # 15 Exhibit 11 to Hession Affidavit, # 16 Exhibit 12 to Hession Affidavit part 1 of 2, # 17 Exhibit 12 to Hession Affidavit part 2 of 2, # 18 Exhibit 13 to Hession Affidavit, # 19 Exhibit 14 to Hession Affidavit, # 20 Exhibit 15 to Hession Affidavit, # 21 Exhibit 16 to Hession Affidavit, # 22 Exhibit 17 to Hession Affidavit, # 23 Exhibit 18 to Hession Affidavit, # 24 Exhibit 19 to Hession Affidavit, # 25 Exhibit 20 to Hession Affidavit, # 26 Exhibit 21 to Hession Affidavit, # 27 Exhibit 22 to Hession Affidavit, # 28 Exhibit 23 to Hession Affidavit, # 29 Exhibit 24 to Hession Affidavit, # 30 Exhibit 25 to Hession Affidavit)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(Egan, Thomas) Modified on 2/17/2009 (jar). (Entered: 02/13/2009)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 60 Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: 8/16/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER ADMITTING COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE; purs. to Local Civil Rule 1.3(c), Joseph F. Rice is admitted pro hac vice to the bar of this Court for the purpose of representing pltffs in this proceeding and consolidated cases. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/14/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK. This document relates to: 03 cv 6183; 03 cv 7040; 03 cv 7073; 04 cv 365; 03 cv 7076; 03 cv 7083; 03 cv 7070; 03 cv 7084; 03 cv 7071; 02 cv 7150; 02 cv 3676; 03 cv 6802; 02 cv 6364; 02 cv 7154; 02 cv 7259; 02 cv 8918; 02 cv 6378; 02 cv 7153; 02 cv 6379; 03 cv 29; 02 cv 7920; 02 cv 7145; 03 cv 6810; 03 cv 6808; 02 cv 7147; 02 cv 7260; 03 cv 6809; 03 cv 6811; 02 cv 8916; 03 cv 6801; 02 cv 7149; 02 cv 7156; 02 cv 2802; 02 cv 7155; 02 cv 7262; 03 cv 6803; 02 cv 458; 02 cv 1728; 03 cv 7022; 02 cv 456; 03 cv 6805; 02 cv 1727; 03 cv 6800; 02 cv 6365; 02 cv 7261; 02 cv 7144; 02 cv 8919; 03 cv 1016; 02 cv 7608; 02 cv 7912; 02 cv 6186. (Original document filed under 21 mc 97 as Doc. #871)(sn)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                        FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by 1 World Trade Center LLC, 3 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Company, L.P., 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(Egan, Thomas) Modified on 2/17/2009 (jar). (Entered: 02/13/2009)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/1/2006, Entered: 8/16/2006 Order
                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL that defendant MIDWEST AIRLINES is hereby dismissed without prejudice... without costs to either party as against the other in the following individual actions consolidated in the In Re September 11 Litigation (21MC97): Flight 175 03-6802, 02-7154, 02-7153, 03-6811, 03-6801, 02-0458, 03-7083, 02-2802, 03-7084, 02-1727, 02-6365, 02-6364. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/28/06) (rjm, )(original filed in 21MC97 (AKH) as document #862) (Entered: 08/07/2006)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                            FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing All Subrogation Claims. Document filed by 1 World Trade Center LLC, 3 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Company, L.P., 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC. Responses due by 4/15/2009Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(Egan, Thomas) Modified on 2/17/2009 (jar). (Entered: 02/13/2009)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: 7/24/2006 Stipulation and Order of Dismissal
                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL that defendant AMERICA WEST AIRLINES is hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other in the following individual actions consolidated in the In Re September 11 Litigation (21MC97): Flight 175 03-6802, 02-7154, 02-7153, 03-6811, 03-6801, 02-0458, 03-7083, 02-2802, 03-7084, 02-1727, 02-6365, 02-6364. Flight 93 02-6186, 03-7073, 02-7608, 02-7912, 02-7260, 02-0456, 02-7262, 02-1728, 03-6805, 02-7259, 02-7261. Ptffs. specifically reserve the right to recommence these actions if the statements in the affidavits of Rodney Frascht submitted on behalf of America West Airlines are proven untrue. This Document relates to All Cases. (Orig. doc. filed in case no. 21 MC 97, as doc. #851) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel, Part I on 7/6/06) (ae, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 11/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                MOTION for Protective Order Precluding the Deposition of James E. Goodwin, United's Former Chairman and CEO. Document filed by United Air Lines, Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(Redmond, Loretta) (Entered: 11/06/2008)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: 7/24/2006 Stipulation and Order of Dismissal
                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL that defendant NORTHWEST AIRLINES CORPORATION is hereby dismissed without prejudice, and without costs to either party as against the others in the following individual actions consolidated in the In Re September 11 Litigation (21MC97): Flight 175 03-6802, 02-7154, 02-7153, 03-6811, 03-6801, 02-0458, 03-7083, 02-2802, 03-7084, 02-1727, 02-6365, 02-6364. Ptffs. specifically reserve the right to recommence these actions if the statements in the affidavits of Gordon Humpherys submitted on behalf of Northwest Airlines Corporation are proven untrue. This Document relates to All Cases. (Orig. doc. filed in case no. 21 MC 97, as doc. #850) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel, Part I on 7/6/06) (ae, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 6/2/2006, Entered: 6/8/2006 Stipulation and Order of Dismissal
                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL : dft Continental Airlines, Inc. is hereby dismissed without prejudice and without cost to either party as against the other in the individual actions consolidated in the In re September 11 Litigation (21MC97) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/31/06) Original document filed in case #21 MC 97, document #822. (dle, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 6/2/2006, Entered: 6/8/2006 Stipulation and Order of Dismissal
                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL that dfts US Airways, Inc. and US Airways Group, Inc. are hereby dismissed without prejudice and without cost to either party as against the other in the individual actions consolidated in the In Re September 11 Litigation (21 MC 97). (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/30/06) Original document filed in case #21 MC 97, document #821. (dle, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 5/31/2006, Entered: 6/8/2006 Stipulation and Order of Dismissal
                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL : that dft Delta Air Lines, Inc. is hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other in the individual actions consolidated in the In re September 11 litigation. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/25/06) Original document filed in case #21mc97, document #820.(dle, )
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/26/2006, Entered: 5/26/2006 Stipulation and Order of Dismissal
                                                                                          STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE; that Defendants American Airlines, Inc. and AMR Corporation are hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other in the followings individual actions consolidated in the In re September 11 Litigation (21MC97): 02cv2802, 02cv458, 02cv1727, 02cv7153, 02cv7154, 02cv6364, 02cv6365, 03cv6802, 03cv6811, 03cv6801, 03cv7083, 03cv7084, 02cv456, 02cv6186, 03cv7073, 02cv7912, 02cv7259, 02cv7260, 02cv7261, 02cv7262, 02cv7608, 03cv6104, 03cv6206, 03cv6805. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/24/06) Original Document filed in 21MC97, Doc#815. (sac, )
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 10/27/2004, Entered: 11/9/2004 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Signed
                                                                                            NOTICE of Dismissal as to Individual Defendants (this document relates to 02cv7150, 03cv6802, 02cv6364, 02cv7154, 02cv6363, 02cv6378, 02cv7153, 02cv6379, 02cv29, 02cv7920, 02cv7145, 03cv6808, 03cv6810, 03cv6801, 03cv6811, 02cv7149, 03cv7147, 02cv2802, 02cv458, 02cv7152, 02cv7147, 02cv1727, 03cv6800, 02cv6365, 02cv8919); pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(i) of the F.R.C.P., plaintiffs in the above cases dismiss all claims asserted in this action against the following defendants: Air Jamaica, Austrian Airlines, British Midland Airways Ltd., BWIA International Airways, Ethiopian Airlines S.C., KLM, Saudi Arabian Airlines, Scandinavian Airlines System, Swiss. The action remains pending as it is not dismissed as to any other defendant. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/22/2004) Original document filed in case no 21mc97, doc. #614.(kkc, )
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 59 Filed: 9/30/2004, Entered: 10/4/2004 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL, the above-entitled action is dismissed without prejudice as against defendant, Alaska Airlines, Inc., and without costs to either party as against the other. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/23/04) (dt, )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 58 Filed: 9/1/2004, Entered: 9/15/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                NOTICE of Amended Notice Adopting Amended Answer Of Defendants United Air Lines, INC. And UAL Corporation To Plaintiffs Amended Flight 175 Master Liability Complaint. Document filed by UAL Corporation, United Airlines, Inc.. (jmi, )
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 57 Filed: 8/31/2004, Entered: 9/10/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                  Amended Notice Adopting Master Answer Of Defendant US Airways, INC. To Plaintiffs' Amended Flight 175 Master Liability Complaint And Jury Demand. Document filed by US Airways, Inc.. (jmi, )
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 56 Filed: 6/29/2004, Entered: 6/30/2004 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - SignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to defts.without prejudice as to Air France and Cape Air, pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1) of the F.R.C.P. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/25/04) (jf, )
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 6/28/2004, Entered: 7/19/2004 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER for substitution of co-counsel for defendant The Boeing Company. Original filed in case 21MC91, Doc# 561. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/24/04) (jco, )
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 55 Filed: 6/15/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                        SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint served. AirTran Airways, Inc. served on 3/1/2004, answer due 3/22/2004. Service was accepted by Indra Hall. Document filed by Elizabeth Gail Hayden ; AirTran Airways, Inc. (db, )
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 54 Filed: 6/15/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                          SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint served. AirTran Airways, Inc. served on 3/1/2004, answer due 3/22/2004. Service was accepted by Indra Hall. Document filed by Elizabeth Gail Hayden ; AirTran Airways, Inc. (db, )
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 53 Filed: 6/15/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                            SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint served. American Airlines, Inc. served on 3/1/2004, answer due 3/22/2004. Service was accepted by Elena Boutakova. Document filed by Elizabeth Gail Hayden ; American Airlines, Inc. (db, )
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 52 Filed: 6/15/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                              SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,, served. NorthWest Airlines Corporation served on 2/19/2004, answer due 3/10/2004. Service was accepted by Deb Van Ness. Document filed by Elizabeth Gail Hayden ; NorthWest Airlines Corporation. (db, )
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 51 Filed: 6/15/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,, served. Pinkerton's Inc. served on 2/25/2004, answer due 3/16/2004. Service was accepted by Brandy Anderson. Document filed by Elizabeth Gail Hayden ; Pinkerton's Inc. (db, )
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 50 Filed: 6/15/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                  SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint served upon Thomas Berglund, persident. Service was accepted by Carin Bergman. Document filed by Elizabeth Gail Hayden. (db, )
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 49 Filed: 6/15/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                    SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint served. AMR Corporation served on 2/20/2004, answer due 3/11/2004. Service was accepted by Beatrice Casarez. Document filed by Elizabeth Gail Hayden ; AMR Corporation. (db, )
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 48 Filed: 6/15/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,. Securitas AB served on 3/4/2004, answer due 3/24/2004. Service was accepted by Amy Lesch. Document filed by Elizabeth Gail Hayden ; Securitas AB. (db, )
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 47 Filed: 6/15/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                        SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,, served. Alaska Airlines, Inc. served on 2/24/2004, answer due 3/15/2004. Service was accepted by Jim Walden. Document filed by Elizabeth Gail Hayden ; Alaska Airlines, Inc.. (db, )
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 46 Filed: 6/15/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                          SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,, served. Midway Airlines Corporation served on 2/20/2004, answer due 3/11/2004. Service was accepted by Dot Adams. Document filed by Elizabeth Gail Hayden ; Midway Airlines Corporation. (db, )
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 45 Filed: 6/15/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004 Summons Returned Unexecuted
                                                                                                                            SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED as to Securitas AB. Attempted Service of Summons and Amended Complaint. Service was attempted on 3/3/04. Document filed by Elizabeth Gail Hayden, Securitas AB. (db, )
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 44 Filed: 6/15/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004 Certificate of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint. Securitas AB served on 3/17/2004, answer due 4/6/2004. Service was accepted by Nina Svensson. Document filed by Elizabeth Gail Hayden ; Securitas AB. (db, )
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 43 Filed: 6/1/2004, Entered: 6/1/2004 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL that pursuant to Rule 41 of the F.R.C.P. this action is dismissed as to defendant Air Transport Association of America, Inc. without prejudice. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/25/04) (jco, )
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 5/19/2004, Entered: 6/2/2004 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Signed
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(i) of the F.R.C.P. without prejudice of Security Equipment Manufacturer Defendants. (This document relates to 21MC97 as document #487.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/18/04) (pl, )
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 42 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: 5/21/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Adopting Master Answer of Defendant America West Airlines, Inc. to Plaintiffs' Amended Flight 175 Master Liability Complaint. Document filed by America West Airlines, Inc. (dfe, )
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 41 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/20/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Adopting Master Answer of Defendant ATA Airlines, Inc. s/h/a American Trans Air, Inc., to Plaintiffs' Amended Flight 175 Master Liability Complaint. Document filed by American Trans Air, Inc. (dfe, )
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 40 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE ADOPTING ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS AMR CORPORATION AND AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC. TO PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED FLIGHT 175 MASTER LIABILITY COMPLAINT. (laq) Modified on 5/19/2004 (laq, ).
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 39 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF ITS MASTER ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED FLIGHT 175 MASTER LIABILITY COMPLAINT. Document filed by Globe Aviation Services. (sac, )
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 38 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF AMENDED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED FLIGHT 175 MASTER LIABILITY COMPLAINT. Document filed by UAL Corporation, United Airlines, Inc.. (ps, )
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 37 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE ADOPTING MASTER ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED FLIGHT 175 MASTER LIABILITY COMPLAINT. Document filed by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (gf, )
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 36 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Adopting Master Answer of Defendants Delta Air Lines, Inc., Incorrectly s/h/a Delta Airlines, Inc. and Delta Express, Inc. to Plaintiffs' Amended Flight 175 Master Liability Complaint. Document filed by Delta Express, Inc., Delta Airlines. (dfe, )
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 35 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Adoption Of Master Answer Of Defendant Huntleigh USA Corporation. Document filed by Huntleigh USA Corporation. (jmi, )
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 33 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of adopting Massachusetts Port Authority's Master Answer to plaintiffs' amended flight 175 Master Liability Complaint. Document filed by Massachusetts Port Authority. (jp, )
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 34 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE ADOPTING MASTER ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED FLIGHT 175 MASTER LIABILITY COMPLAINT. Document filed by The Boeing Company. (sac, )
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 32 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: 5/18/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE ADOPTING MASTER ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED FLIGHT 175 MASTER LIABILITY COMPLAINT. Document filed by Colgan Air, Inc.. (sac, )
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 31 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: 5/17/2004 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Amended Complaint. Document filed by ICTS International NV.(djc, )
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 5/4/2004, Entered: 6/3/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Change of Address by John L. Altieri Jr. on behalf of Massachusetts Port Authority. New Address: O'Melveny & Myers, L.L.P., Times Square Tower, 7 Times Square, New York, NY, 10036, (212) 326-2000. Original document filed in case #21MC97, document #408.(dle, )
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 4/26/2004, Entered: 5/3/2004 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting Motion for Elizabeth Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for plaintiff. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 4/22/2004) Original document filed in case no. 21mc97, doc. #334.(kkc, )
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 4/16/2004, Entered: 4/21/2004 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION; for an order pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.3(c) of the F.R.C.P. granting Elizabeth Smith permission to appear as attorney of record for the plaintiffs; w/ attch. affidavit in support; Document filed by plaintiffs. (orig. document docketed in 02cv0456 as document #42).. (pl, )
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/12/2004, Entered: 4/16/2004 Order
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER; that the cases listed immediately below are active cases but plaintiffs in those cases have filed VCF claims. However, these cases were not included in Appendix A to the 3/1/2004 Order. These cases also may be subject to motions to dismiss by defendants but these cases shall remain active subject to any dismissal motions. 02cv452, 02cv458, 02cv6361, 03cv7031, 02cv6364, 02cv7143, 02cv7146, 02cv7147, 02cv7148, 02cv7150, 02cv7224, 03cv7098, 03cv7638, 03cv10325, 02cv7243, 02cv7245, 03cv7075, 02cv7258, 02cv7267, 03cv7133, 02cv7271, 02cv7272, 02cv7290, 03cv6866, 02cv7608, 03cv2004, 02cv10160, 03cv6183, 03cv6801, 03cv6802, 03cv6803, 03cv6804, 03cv6805, 03cv6809, 03cv6811, 03cv6944, 03cv7022, 03cv7028, 03cv7070, 03cv7071, 03cv7076, 04cv1857, 04cv2519. The foregoing cases will be subject to the discovery and briefing schedule originally set forth in the 3/24/2004 Order as modified by Order of 4/7/2004. Accordingly, plaintiffs in the foregoing cases will provide defendants with documents responsive to Richard Williamson's 3/22/2004 letter by 4/16/2004. Thereafter, defendants will review the materials produced by plaintiffs to determine whether depositions will be necessary. If defendants determine that depositions are necessary, defendants will contact plaintiff's counsel in the individual action to obtain consent for the depositions. Defendants will then request a conference with the Court to determine whether defendants may take such depositions. Defendants shall serve and file motions to dismiss by 5/17/2004. Opposing memoranda and affidavits shall be served and filed by 5/31/2004. Reply papers shall be served and filed by 6/7/2004. Oral argument on the motions to dismiss will be held on 6/9/2004 at 3:00 p.m. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa, Part I on 4/9/2004) Original document filed in case no. 21 MC 97, doc. #332(kkc, )
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 30 Filed: 3/19/2004, Entered: 4/8/2004 Clerk Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                    CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of Summons and Complaint mailed to Securitas AB at the following address: Securitas AB c/o Lindhagensplan 70, Box 12307, SE 102-28, Stockholm, Sweden on 3/19/04 by Registered Mail # RB 632 316 507. (ps, )
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/19/2004, Entered: 4/9/2004 Clerk Certificate of Mailing Received
                                                                                                                                                                      CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING RECEIVED for Summons and Complaint mailed to Securitas AB on 3/19/04 by Registered Mail # RB 632 316 507, RECEIVED ON: 3/30/04. (ps, )
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 3/11/2004, Entered: 3/16/2004 Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                        MEMO-ENDORSEMENT ON MOTIONS ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Attorney Jeffrey Scott Thompson for Elizabeth Gail Hayden, Ronald L. Motley for Elizabeth Gail Hayden, Jodi Westbrook Flowers for Elizabeth Gail Hayden, Robert T. Haefele for Elizabeth Gail Hayden, Donald A. Migliori for Elizabeth Gail Hayden, Mary F. Schiavo for Elizabeth Gail Hayden admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/4/2004) Original Endorsements filed in case no. 21 MC 97, docs. # 289 (Jeffrey Scott Thompson), # 290 (Ronald L. Motley), # 291 (Jodi Westbrook Flowers), # 292 (Robert T. Haefele), # 293 (Donald A. Migliori), # 304 (Mary Schiavo).(kkc, )
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 2/5/2004, Entered: 2/11/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE TO ACTIVATE LAWSUIT. Document filed by Elizabeth Gail Hayden. Original Document filed in 21 mc 97, Doc. #280. (sac, )
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 29 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 2/2/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served upon Air France. Service was accepted by Greg Kozlowski, Legal Counsel. Document filed by Elizabeth Gail Hayden. (pl, )
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 28 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Delta Airlines served on 11/20/2003, answer due 12/10/2003. Service was accepted by Valerie Holmes. Document filed by Elizabeth Gail Hayden ; Delta Airlines. (db, )
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 27 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. United Airlines, Inc. served on 11/17/2003, answer due 12/7/2003. Service was accepted by Mia Wintersmith. Document filed by Elizabeth Gail Hayden ; United Airlines, Inc. (db, )
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 26 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Colgan Air, Inc. served on 12/8/2003, answer due 12/28/2003. Service was accepted by Janice Baxter. Document filed by Elizabeth Gail Hayden ; Colgan Air, Inc.. (db, )
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 25 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Massachusetts Port Authority served on 12/1/2003, answer due 12/21/2003. Service was accepted by Maria Snow. (sb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 24 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE. Invision Technologies, Inc. served on 11/13/2003, answer due 12/3/2003. Service was accepted by Becky DeGeorge. (sb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 23 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Continental Airlines, Inc. served on 11/4/2003, answer due 11/24/2003. Service was accepted by Lynne Key. Document filed by Elizabeth Gail Hayden ; Continental Airlines, Inc. (yv, )
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 22 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Midwest Express Airlines, Inc. served on 11/5/2003, answer due 11/25/2003. Service was accepted by Brandy Anderson. Document filed by Elizabeth Gail Hayden ; Midwest Express Airlines, Inc. (yv, )
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 21 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint served. Huntleigh USA Corporation served on 11/4/2003, answer due 11/24/2003. Service was accepted by Kathy Richardson, Sr. Document filed by Elizabeth Gail Hayden. (jco, )
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 20 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Burns International Security Services Corporation served on 11/4/2003, answer due 11/24/2003. Service was accepted by Lisa Stiegler, authorized agent. Document filed by Elizabeth Gail Hayden. (kw, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 19 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Air Transport Association served on 12/4/2003, answer due 12/24/2003. Service was accepted by Mimi Soloman, authorized agent. Document filed by Elizabeth Gail Hayden. (kw, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 18 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. UAL Corporation served on 11/4/2003, answer due 11/24/2003. Service was accepted by Prentice Hall/Mia Wintersmith. Document filed by Elizabeth Gail Hayden. (cd, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 17 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. The Boeing Company served on 11/10/2003, answer due 11/30/2003. Service was accepted by Illinois Corp/Marsha Montgomery. Document filed by Elizabeth Gail Hayden. (cd, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 16 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. L-3 Communications Holdings, Inc. served on 12/11/2003, answer due 12/31/2003. Service was accepted by Nora Dindyal. Document filed by Elizabeth Gail Hayden ; L-3 Communications Holdings, Inc.. (db, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 15 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Cape Air served on 11/4/2003, answer due 11/24/2003. Service was accepted by Wilfred Gardner. Document filed by Elizabeth Gail Hayden. (cd, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 14 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Heimann Systems Corp. served on 10/29/2003, answer due 11/18/2003. Service was accepted by Lawyers Inc Service/Becky Degeorge. Document filed by Elizabeth Gail Hayden. (cd, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. US Airways, Inc. served on 11/7/2003, answer due 11/27/2003. Service was accepted by Tanika Baylor. Document filed by Elizabeth Gail Hayden ; US Airways, Inc.. (db, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 12 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Globe Aviation Services served on 11/3/2003, answer due 11/23/2003. Service was accepted by J. Graham, Sr.. Document filed by Elizabeth Gail Hayden ; Globe Aviation Services. (db, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 11 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Quantam Magnetics, Inc. served on 11/11/2003, answer due 12/1/2003. Service was accepted by Lowell J. Burnett, CEO. Document filed by Elizabeth Gail Hayden. (sac, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED; Service of summons and complaint made on L-3 Communications Corporation by Nora Dindyal, CT Corp. on 11/18/04. Document filed by Elizabeth Gail Hayden. (dle, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Air Jamaica served, summons and complaint, on 11/5/2003, answer due 11/25/2003. Service was accepted by Robert Branch, Corp. Service Co.. Document filed by Elizabeth Gail Hayden. (dle, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Swiss served on 11/4/2003, answer due 11/24/2003. Service was accepted by Lisa Stiegler, CT Corp. Document filed by Elizabeth Gail Hayden. (dle, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. L-3 Communications Corporation Security and Detection Systems served on 1/3/2004, answer due 1/23/2004. Service was accepted by Roger McLeon, Agent. Document filed by Elizabeth Gail Hayden. (sac, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 1/15/2004, Entered: 1/20/2004 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons and complaint RETURNED EXECUTED Document filed by Elizabeth Gail Hayden, ICTS International NV. ICTS International NV waiver sent on 12/5/2003, answer due 2/3/2004. (djc, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 1/14/2004, Entered: 1/23/2004 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending [1] Complaint against AMR Corporation, AirTran Airways, Inc., Alaska Airlines, Inc., America West Airlines, Inc., American Airlines, Inc., American Trans Air, Inc., Burns International Security Services Corporation, Colgan Air, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc., Delta Airlines, Globe Aviation Services, Huntleigh USA Corporation, ICTS International NV, Massachusetts Port Authority, Midway Airlines Corporation, NorthWest Airlines Corporation, Pinkerton's Inc., Securitas AB, The Boeing Company, UAL Corporation, US Airways, Inc., United Airlines, Inc..Document filed by Elizabeth Gail Hayden. Related document: [1] Complaint.(tp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 1/14/2004, Entered: 1/23/2004 Set Answer Due Date for Amended Pleadings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Set Answer Due Date re: [6] Amended Complaint, as to Burns International Security Services Corporation answer due on 1/26/2004; Colgan Air, Inc. answer due on 1/26/2004; Continental Airlines, Inc. answer due on 1/26/2004; Delta Airlines answer due on 1/26/2004; Globe Aviation Services answer due on 1/26/2004; Huntleigh USA Corporation answer due on 1/26/2004; ICTS International NV answer due on 1/26/2004; Massachusetts Port Authority answer due on 1/26/2004; Securitas AB answer due on 1/26/2004; The Boeing Company answer due on 1/26/2004; UAL Corporation answer due on 1/26/2004; United Airlines, Inc. answer due on 1/26/2004. (tp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 1/7/2004, Entered: 1/20/2004 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATED CONSENT AND ORDER TO CHANGE ATTORNEY; that Motley Rice LLC, 28 Bridgeside Blvd., P.O. Box 1792, Mt. Pleasant, SC 29465, is being substituted as counsel for the plaintiffs in this action, instead of Baum Hedlund, 12100 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 950, Los Angeles, CA 90025. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/31/2003) Original document filed under case no. 21 MC 97, doc. # 249.(kkc, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 10/15/2003, Entered: 10/27/2003 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Signed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF DISMISSAL, (This document relates to 02-3676, 8918, 03-7148, 02-7143, 5139, 03-6809, 02-8916, 7156, 7155, 03-6803, 02-7271, 03-7149, 02-2004, 03-7150, 6804, 02-7144, 03-6806, 6802, 02-7154, 6363, 7151, 7204, 7153, 7152, 03-6811, 6801, 7147, 02-458, 2802, 1727, 6365, 6364, 7150, 6378, 7149, 6379, 452, 03-029, 6808, 6810, 02-7147, 7148, 7146, 7920, 03-6944, 6800, 02-7145, 8919, 7272, 03-6807, 02-7258, 7261, 7260, 456, 7262, 1728, 03-6805, 02-6362, 7259 & 6361) pursuant to the Court's directions at the Status Conference on 9/26/03, and pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(2), plaintiffs in each of the designated cases herein, dismiss with prejudice the "DOE" defendants. ( signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein ); ORIGINAL DOCUMENT ENTERED IN CASE #21 MC 97(AKH), DOC. #199. (tp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 9/25/2003, Entered: 9/26/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER; granting [2-1] motion for an Order placing the above captioned matter in suspense, which shall not constitute an election of remedies so as to prevent plaintiff form seeking compensation from the Victims Compensation Fund, so long as this lawsuit remains dormant and in suspense until the earlier of such time as set forth in enumerated paragraph 3 of the Court's Order of July 22, 2003. This case shall be placed on the suspense docket immediately following filing of proof of service of summons and complaint. ( signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein ); (sac)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 9/24/2003, Entered: 10/1/2003 Notice of Case Assignment/ReassignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Case assignment to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein . Copy of notice and judge's rules mailed to Attorney(s) of record: John A. Greaves, Mary F. Schiavo . (gf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 9/24/2003, Entered: 10/1/2003 Case Designation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz is so designated. (gf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 9/24/2003, Entered: 10/1/2003 Case Accepted as Related
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Case accepted as related to 1:02cv458 . Notice of assignment to follow. (gf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 9/11/2003, Terminated: 9/25/2003 Motion to Place on Suspense Docket
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF MOTION by Elizabeth Gail Hayden, Elizabeth Gail Hayden for an Order placing the above captioned matter in suspense, which shall not constitute an election of remedies so as to prevent plaintiff form seeking compensation from the Victims Compensation Fund, so long as this lawsuit remains dormant and in suspense until the earlier of such time as set forth in enumerated paragraph 3 of the Court's Order of July 22, 2003 . Return Date Not Indicated. (jjm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 9/10/2003 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT filed. Summons issued and Notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 484259. (jjm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 9/10/2003 Case Referred as Possibly Related/Similar
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CASE REFERRED TO Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein as possibly related 1:02cv458. (jjm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 172 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?