Elsidig et al v. Hermann et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-06612-JGK

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Fatma O. Khalid, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by ppid.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Scott Shabasson +1 212 233 8100 +1 212 233 9238 dss@ppid.com
No Logo Nadir E. Elsidig, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by ppid.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Scott Shabasson +1 212 233 8100 +1 212 233 9238 dss@ppid.com
v.
Rice, Condoleezza Rice, Condoleezza, Defendant
Officially listed as "Condoleeza Rice"
Unknown Role, Kior, Inc.
Unknown Role, Evenflow, Inc.
Unknown Role, C3, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Natasha Oeltjen +1 212 637 2769 +1 212 637 2786 natasha.oeltjen@usdoj.gov
No Logo Emilio T. Gonzalez, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Natasha Oeltjen +1 212 637 2769 +1 212 637 2786 natasha.oeltjen@usdoj.gov
No Logo Mark J. Mershon, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Natasha Oeltjen +1 212 637 2769 +1 212 637 2786 natasha.oeltjen@usdoj.gov
No Logo Michael Mukasey, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Natasha Oeltjen +1 212 637 2769 +1 212 637 2786 natasha.oeltjen@usdoj.gov
No Logo Richard Hermann, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Natasha Oeltjen +1 212 637 2769 +1 212 637 2786 natasha.oeltjen@usdoj.gov
Mueller, Robert S., III Mueller, Robert S., III, Defendant
Officially listed as "Robert S. Mueller, III"
United States Department of Justice Special Counsel, United States Department of Justice, May 17, 2017 - Present
Federal Bureau of Investigation Director, Federal Bureau of Investigation, September 4, 2001 - September 4, 2013

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Natasha Oeltjen +1 212 637 2769 +1 212 637 2786 natasha.oeltjen@usdoj.gov
Office Foley Square
Filed 7/25/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 465 - Immigration: Other Immigration Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County Bronx
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag ECF
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: 8/5/2008 Certificate of Service Complaints
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Mark J. Mershon served on 8/5/2008, answer due 8/25/2008; Fatma O. Khalid served on 8/5/2008, answer due 8/25/2008; Richard Hermann served on 8/5/2008, answer due 8/25/2008; Condoleeza Rice served on 8/5/2008, answer due 8/25/2008; Emilio T. Gonzalez served on 8/5/2008, answer due 8/25/2008; Michael Mukasey served on 8/5/2008, answer due 8/25/2008; Robert S. Mueller, III served on 8/5/2008, answer due 8/25/2008. Service was accepted by US Attorney's Office. Document filed by Nadir E. Elsidig. (Shabasson, Daniel)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: 8/5/2008 Notice of Appearance/
    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Natasha Oeltjen on behalf of Mark J. Mershon, Richard Hermann, Condoleeza Rice, Emilio T. Gonzalez, Michael Mukasey, Robert S. Mueller, III (Oeltjen, Natasha)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 1 Filed: 7/25/2008, Entered: 7/30/2008 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus
      COMPLAINT for MANDAMUS against Mark J. Mershon, Richard Hermann, Condoleeza Rice, Emilio T. Gonzalez, Michael Mukasey, Robert S. Mueller, III (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 657674).Document filed by Nadir E. Elsidig, Fatma O. Khalid.(rdz)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 7/25/2008, Entered: 7/30/2008 Case Designated ECF.
        Case Designated ECF. (rdz)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 7/25/2008, Entered: 7/30/2008 Case Designation
          Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. (rdz)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 7/25/2008, Entered: 7/30/2008 Summons Issued as to USA
            SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mark J. Mershon, Richard Hermann, Condoleeza Rice, Emilio T. Gonzalez, Michael Mukasey, Robert S. Mueller, III, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (rdz)
              LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 43 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?