Employees' Retirement System of Rhode Island, et. al. v. Mark Zuckerberg, et. al.
Administrative Proceeding Delaware Court of Chancery, Case No. 2021-0617-JRS

Tags
Last Updated September 21, 2021 at 10:31 AM DT (3.5 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo City of Warwick Retirement System, Plaintiff
No Logo Employees' Retirement System of Rhode Island, Plaintiff
v.
Andreessen, Marc L. Andreessen, Marc L., Defendant
Officially listed as "Andreessen, Marc"
Officer/Director, Cacheflow, Inc.
Officer/Director, Loudcloud, Inc.
Officer/Director, Orbitz Inc
eBay, Inc. Officer/Director, eBay, Inc.
Hewlett-Packard Company Officer/Director, Hewlett-Packard Company
Facebook, Inc. Officer/Director, Facebook, Inc.
AH Equity Partners I, L.L.C. Officer/Director, AH Equity Partners I, L.L.C.
AH Parallel Fund IV, L.P. Officer/Director, AH Parallel Fund IV, L.P.
AH Parallel Fund IV-A, L.P. Officer/Director, AH Parallel Fund IV-A, L.P.
AH Parallel Fund IV-B, L.P. Officer/Director, AH Parallel Fund IV-B, L.P.
AH Parallel Fund IV-Q, L.P. Officer/Director, AH Parallel Fund IV-Q, L.P.
Officer/Director, Okta, Inc.
Officer/Director, Cold Brew Labs, Inc.
Slack Technologies, Inc. Officer/Director, Slack Technologies, Inc.
Officer/Director, Horowitz Benjamin A
Officer/Director, Accolade LLC
Officer/Director, Digital Ocean, Inc.
Coinbase Global, Inc. Officer/Director, Coinbase Global, Inc.
AH Bio Fund II-B, L.P. Officer/Director, AH Bio Fund II-B, L.P.
Palantir Technologies, Inc. Palantir Technologies, Inc., Defendant
Sandberg, Sheryl K. Sandberg, Sheryl K., Defendant
Officially listed as "Sandberg, Sheryl"
Officer/Director, eHealth, Inc.
Starbucks Corporation Officer/Director, Starbucks Corporation
Officer/Director, DC Holdco, Inc.
Facebook, Inc. Officer/Director, Facebook, Inc.
Officer/Director, SVMK Inc.
Thiel, Peter Thiel, Peter, Defendant
Facebook, Inc. Board Member, Facebook, Inc.
Palantir Technologies, Inc. Officer/Director, Palantir Technologies, Inc.
Officer/Director, Abcellera Biologics Inc.
Officer/Director, Singerman Brian Aaron
Officer/Director, BioCancell Ltd.
Officer/Director, Mithril II Lp
Officer/Director, Mithril II UGP LLC
Officer/Director, Mithril II GP LP
Officer/Director, Adagio Therapeutics, Inc.
Zuckerberg, Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Mark Elliot, Defendant
Officially listed as "Zuckerberg, Mark"
Facebook, Inc. Facebook, Inc., Nominal Defendant
Officer/Director, Performant Financial Corp
Officer/Director, Auxogyn, Inc.
Officer/Director, Zoetis Inc.
Officer/Director, Quarta-Rad, Inc.
Officer/Director, Canaan Partners Viii Llc
Officer/Director, McAfee Corp.
Robinhood Markets, Inc. Officer/Director, Robinhood Markets, Inc.
No Logo Feuer, R.A., Interested Party
No Logo New Castle County, Sheriff, Sheriff
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 13 Filed: 8/10/2021, Entered: 8/10/2021 Registered Mail Return
Registered mail green card return from Peter Thiel, RE338070242US on 08-10-21, re: mailing 07-27-21
    Blank 12 Filed: 8/9/2021, Entered: 8/9/2021 Registered Mail Return
    Registered mail green card returns from Mark Zuckerberg RF338070211US, Marc Andersen , RF338070239US, Sheryl Sanberg, RF338070255US, on 08.09.2021.
      Legal Document 11 Filed: 8/6/2021, Entered: 8/6/2021 Public Version
      PUBLIC VERSION Verified Stockholder Derivative Complaint
        Blank 10 Filed: 8/2/2021, Entered: 8/2/2021 Order
        Granted (Stipulation and [Proposed] Order for Consolidation of Related Actions)
          Blank 9 Filed: 7/29/2021, Entered: 7/29/2021 Letter
          Letter to Vice Chancellor Joseph R. Slights III from Daniel K. Astin, Esq. Regarding Stipulation and [Proposed] Order for Consolidation of Related Actions
            Blank 8 Filed: 7/27/2021, Entered: 7/27/2021
            Stipulation and [Proposed] Order for Consolidation of Related Actions
              Blank 7 Filed: 7/27/2021, Entered: 7/27/2021 Register's Certificate
              Register's Certificate of Registered Mailings sent to the post office on 07.27.2021.
                Blank 6 Filed: 7/22/2021, Entered: 7/22/2021 Summons
                Summons and Affidavit of Service of Verified Stockholder Derivative Complaint pursuant to 10 Del. C. ยง 3114 upon Defendants Mark Zuckerberg, Sheryl Sandberg, Marc Andreessen, and Peter Thiel, with Certificate of Service
                  Blank 5 Filed: 7/22/2021, Entered: 7/22/2021 Summons
                  Summons and Affidavit of Service of Verified Stockholder Derivative Complaint upon Defendant Palantir Technologies Inc., with Certificate of Service
                    Blank 4 Filed: 7/22/2021, Entered: 7/22/2021 Summons
                    Summons and Affidavit of Service of Verified Stockholder Derivative Complaint upon Nominal Defendant Facebook, Inc., with Certificate of Service
                      Blank 3 Filed: 7/19/2021, Entered: 7/19/2021 Issuance of Summons
                      Issued 1 Summons (3114) 4 copies; Issued 2 Summons 2 copies to Counsel 07.19.21.
                        Blank 2 Filed: 7/16/2021, Entered: 7/16/2021 Entry of Appearance
                        Notice of Entry of Appearance of Kurt M. Heyman, Aaron M. Nelson and Melissa N. Donimirski of Heyman Enerio Gattuso & Hirzel on behalf of Plaintiffs Employees' Retirement System of Rhode Island and City of Warwik Retirement System with Certificate of Service
                          Blank 1 Filed: 7/16/2021, Entered: 7/16/2021 Complaint-class action or derivative<=10defs
                          Verified Stockholder Derivative Complaint (CONFIDENTIAL)

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 142 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?