IN RE FACEBOOK INC DERIVATIVE LITIGATION
Administrative Proceeding Delaware Court of Chancery, Case No. 2018-0307-JRS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 21, 2021 at 11:48 AM DT (3.5 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo City of Birmingham Relief And Retirement System, Plaintiff
No Logo City of Warwick Retirement System, Plaintiff
No Logo Construction and General Building Laborers’ Local No. 79 General Fund, Plaintiff
No Logo Employees' Retirement System of Rhode Island, Plaintiff
No Logo Firemen's Retirement System of St. Louis, Plaintiff
No Logo Levy, Lidia, Plaintiff
No Logo Sbriglio, Karen, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Alford Peggy, Defendant
Officer/Director, Macerich Co
Facebook, Inc. Officer/Director, Facebook, Inc.
Officer/Director, PayPal Holdings, Inc.
Andreessen, Marc L. Andreessen, Marc L., Defendant
Officially listed as "Andreessen, Marc"
Officer/Director, Cacheflow, Inc.
Officer/Director, Loudcloud, Inc.
Officer/Director, Orbitz Inc
eBay, Inc. Officer/Director, eBay, Inc.
Hewlett-Packard Company Officer/Director, Hewlett-Packard Company
Facebook, Inc. Officer/Director, Facebook, Inc.
AH Equity Partners I, L.L.C. Officer/Director, AH Equity Partners I, L.L.C.
AH Parallel Fund IV, L.P. Officer/Director, AH Parallel Fund IV, L.P.
AH Parallel Fund IV-A, L.P. Officer/Director, AH Parallel Fund IV-A, L.P.
AH Parallel Fund IV-B, L.P. Officer/Director, AH Parallel Fund IV-B, L.P.
AH Parallel Fund IV-Q, L.P. Officer/Director, AH Parallel Fund IV-Q, L.P.
Officer/Director, Okta, Inc.
Officer/Director, Cold Brew Labs, Inc.
Slack Technologies, Inc. Officer/Director, Slack Technologies, Inc.
Officer/Director, Horowitz Benjamin A
Officer/Director, Accolade LLC
Officer/Director, Digital Ocean, Inc.
Coinbase Global, Inc. Officer/Director, Coinbase Global, Inc.
AH Bio Fund II-B, L.P. Officer/Director, AH Bio Fund II-B, L.P.
No Logo Atwahl, Lee, Defendant
Bowles, Erskine B. Bowles, Erskine B., Defendant
Officer/Director, Cousins Properties Inc.
General Motors Corporation Officer/Director, General Motors Corporation
Officer/Director, Krispy Kreme Doughnuts Inc
Officer/Director, Norfolk Southern Corp
Officer/Director, Belk, Inc.
Facebook, Inc. Officer/Director, Facebook, Inc.
Chenault, Kenneth I. Chenault, Kenneth I., Defendant
Officially listed as "Chenault, Kenneth"
American Express Company Officer/Director, American Express Company
Officer/Director, Procter & Gamble Co
Facebook, Inc. Officer/Director, Facebook, Inc.
Officer/Director, Livongo Health, Inc.
Officer/Director, GC Partners Holdings, LP
Officer/Director, GC Venture LH Manager, LLC
Airbnb, Inc. Officer/Director, Airbnb, Inc.
Officer/Director, Cutler Joel E
Officer/Director, Fialkow David P
Officer/Director, Nbh Inc
Officer/Director, Taneja Hemant
No Logo Cox, Christopher, Defendant
Officer/Director, Newport Corp
Desmond-Hellmann, Susan Desmond-Hellmann, Susan, Defendant
Officer/Director, Procter & Gamble Co
Facebook, Inc. Officer/Director, Facebook, Inc.
Pfizer, Inc. Officer/Director, Pfizer, Inc.
No Logo Fisher, David, Defendant
Officer/Director, CBOE Holdings, Inc.
Officer/Director, Innerworkings Inc.
Officer/Director, Grubhub Seamless Inc.
Officer/Director, Enova International, Inc.
Hastings, W. Reed Hastings, W. Reed, Defendant
Officially listed as "Hastings, Reed"
Microsoft Corporation Officer/Director, Microsoft Corporation
Netflix, Inc. Officer/Director, Netflix, Inc.
Facebook, Inc. Officer/Director, Facebook, Inc.
Koum, Jan Koum, Jan, Defendant
Facebook, Inc. Officer/Director, Facebook, Inc.
No Logo Lessin, Samuel, Defendant
Officially listed as "Lessin, Sam"
Palantir Technologies, Inc. Palantir Technologies, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Papamiltiadis, Konstantinos, Defendant
PriceWaterhouseCoopers LLP PriceWaterhouseCoopers LLP, Defendant
Sandberg, Sheryl K. Sandberg, Sheryl K., Defendant
Officially listed as "Sandberg, Sheryl"
Officer/Director, eHealth, Inc.
Starbucks Corporation Officer/Director, Starbucks Corporation
Officer/Director, DC Holdco, Inc.
Facebook, Inc. Officer/Director, Facebook, Inc.
Officer/Director, SVMK Inc.
No Logo Schropefer, Michael, Defendant
No Logo Stretch Colin, Defendant
Facebook, Inc. Officer/Director, Facebook, Inc.
Thiel, Peter Thiel, Peter, Defendant
Officially listed as "Thiel, Peter A"
Facebook, Inc. Board Member, Facebook, Inc.
Palantir Technologies, Inc. Officer/Director, Palantir Technologies, Inc.
Officer/Director, Abcellera Biologics Inc.
Officer/Director, Singerman Brian Aaron
Officer/Director, BioCancell Ltd.
Officer/Director, Mithril II Lp
Officer/Director, Mithril II UGP LLC
Officer/Director, Mithril II GP LP
Officer/Director, Adagio Therapeutics, Inc.
No Logo Wehner, David, Defendant
No Logo Zients, Jeffrey, Defendant
Zuckerberg, Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Mark Elliot, Defendant
Officially listed as "Zuckerberg, Mark"
No Logo Construction and General Building Laborers' Local Union No. 79 General Fund, Intervenor
No Logo The City of Birmingham Relief and Retirement System, Intervenor
No Logo Employees' Retirement System of Rhode Island, Interested Party
No Logo Feuer, Robert A., Interested Party
No Logo Sbriglio, Karen, Interested Party
Facebook, Inc. Facebook, Inc., Nominal Defendant
Officer/Director, Performant Financial Corp
Officer/Director, Auxogyn, Inc.
Officer/Director, Zoetis Inc.
Officer/Director, Quarta-Rad, Inc.
Officer/Director, Canaan Partners Viii Llc
Officer/Director, McAfee Corp.
Robinhood Markets, Inc. Officer/Director, Robinhood Markets, Inc.
No Logo New Castle County, Sheriff, Sheriff
  Entries (224) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 224 Filed: 9/17/2021, Entered: None Letter
Letter to The Honorable Joseph R. Slights III from Nathan A. Cook enclosing materials that the Rhode Island Plaintiffs may refer to at the September 30, 2021 hearing
Blank 223 Filed: 9/15/2021, Entered: None Letter
Letter to The Honorable Joseph R. Slights III from Samuel L. Closic regarding the parties have conferred about the order of presentation and duration of the arguments
    Blank 222 Filed: 9/7/2021, Entered: None reply
    Blank 221 Filed: 8/31/2021, Entered: None Public Version
    Public Version of Response of CalSTRS Plaintiffs to Application for Leadership by Rhode Island Plaintiffs with Certificate of Service
      Blank 220 Filed: 8/31/2021, Entered: None Public Version
      PUBLIC VERSION Rhode Island Group's Opposition to Application for Appointment of Lead Plaintiffs and Co-Lead Counsel by Plaintiffs California State Teachers' Retirement System, Construction and General Building Laborers' Local Union No. 79 General Fund, and City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System with Certificate of Service
        Blank 219 Filed: 8/27/2021, Entered: None Order Pro Hac Vice
          Blank 218 Filed: 8/26/2021, Entered: None Motion for Pro Hac Vice
          Blank 217 Filed: 8/24/2021, Entered: None response
          (Confidential Filing) Response of CalSTRS Plaintiffs to Application for Leadership by Rhode Island Plaintiffs with Certificate of Service
          Blank 215 Filed: 8/24/2021, Entered: None response
          Rhode Island Plaintiffs' Response to the Facebook Defendants' Motion to Consolidate or, in the Alternative, to Stay the Feuer Action, with Certificate of Service
            Blank 216 Filed: 8/24/2021, Entered: None Letter
            Letter from Nathan A. Cook, Esq., to the Honorable Joseph R. Slights III enclosing courtesy copies of Rhode Island Plaintiffs' Response to the Facebook Defendants' Motion to Consolidate
              Blank 211 Filed: 8/24/2021, Entered: None Opposition
              Rhode Island Group's Opposition to Application for Appointment of Lead Plaintiffs and Co-Lead Counsel by Plaintiffs California State Teachers' Retirement System, Construction and General Building Laborers' Local Union No. 79 General Fund, and City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System, with Certificate of Service
                Blank 212 Filed: 8/24/2021, Entered: None Declaration
                Transmittal Declaration Pursuant to 10 Del. C. § 3927 of Nathan A. Cook in Support of Rhode Island Group's Opposition to Application for Appointment of Lead Plaintiffs and Co-Lead Counsel by Plaintiffs California State Teachers' Retirement System, Construction and General Building Laborers' Local Union No. 79 General Fund, and City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System, with Certificate of Service
                  Blank 213 Filed: 8/24/2021, Entered: None Exhibit(s)
                  Exhibits P-U to Transmittal Declaration Pursuant to 10 Del. C. § 3927 of Nathan A. Cook in Support of Rhode Island Group's Opposition to Application for Appointment of Lead Plaintiffs and Co-Lead Counsel by Plaintiffs California State Teachers' Retirement System, Construction and General Building Laborers' Local Union No. 79 General Fund, and City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System
                    Blank 214 Filed: 8/24/2021, Entered: None Letter
                      Blank 210 Filed: 8/24/2021, Entered: None Opposition
                      Robert A. Feuer's Opposition to the Facebook Defendants' Motion to Consolidate, or , in the Alternative, to Stay (with Certificate of Service)
                        Blank 208 Filed: 8/20/2021, Entered: None Order Pro Hac Vice
                        Granted (Feldman, Boris: Proposed Order for the Admission of Pro Hac Vice to represent Defendant Palantir Technologies Inc.)
                          Blank 209 Filed: 8/20/2021, Entered: None Order Pro Hac Vice
                          Granted (Livshiz, David Y.: Proposed Order for the Admission of Pro Hac Vice to represent Defendant Palantir Technologies Inc.)
                            Blank 206 Filed: 8/19/2021, Entered: None Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                            Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Boris Feldman, Esq. to represent Defendant Palantir Technologies Inc., with Certificate of Service
                            Blank 207 Filed: 8/19/2021, Entered: None Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                            Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David Y. Livshiz, Esq. to represent Defendant Palantir Technologies Inc., with Certificate of Service
                              Blank 205 Filed: 8/11/2021, Entered: None Order
                              Granted (Stipulation Regarding Palantir Technologies Inc.'s Agreement to Case Consolidation)
                                Blank 203 Filed: 8/10/2021, Entered: None Entry of Appearance
                                Entry of Appearance of A. Thompson Bayliss, Esq. and Daniel J. McBride, Esq. of Abrams & Bayliss LLP in the above-captioned action on behalf of defendant Palantir Technologies Inc., with Certificate of Service
                                Blank 204 Filed: 8/10/2021, Entered: None Stipulation And [proposed} Order
                                Stipulation Regarding Palantir Technologies Inc.'s Agreement to Case Consolidation
                                  Blank 202 Filed: 8/10/2021, Entered: None Public Version
                                  Public Version of Application for Appointment of Lead Plaintiffs and Co-Lead Counsel by Plaintiffs California State Teachers' Retirement System, Construction and General Building Laborers' Local Union No. 79 General Fund and City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System with Certificate of Service
                                    Blank 201 Filed: 8/10/2021, Entered: None Public Version
                                    PUBLIC VERSION Rhode Island Group’s Leadership Application with Certificate of Service
                                      Legal Document 200 Filed: 8/6/2021, Entered: None Public Version
                                      Public Version of Second Amended Stockholder Derivative Complaint with Certificate of Service
                                        Blank 199 Filed: 8/6/2021, Entered: None Public Version
                                        PUBLIC VERSION Verified Stockholder Derivative Complaint
                                          Blank 198 Filed: 8/4/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                            Blank 197 Filed: 8/3/2021, Entered: None Motion to Consolidate
                                            The Facebook Defendants' Motion to Consolidate or, in the Alternative, to Stay the Feuer Action (with Certificate of Service)
                                            Blank 196 Filed: 8/3/2021, Entered: None Motion
                                            (Confidential Filing) Application for Appointment of Lead Plaintiffs and Co-Lead Counsel by Plaintiffs California State Teachers' Retirement System, Construction and General Building Laborers' Local Union No. 79 General Fund and City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System with Certificate of Service
                                            Blank 195 Filed: 8/3/2021, Entered: None other
                                            Blank 194 Filed: 8/2/2021, Entered: None Order
                                            Granted (Stipulation and [Proposed] Order for Consolidation of Related Actions)
                                              Blank 193 Filed: 7/29/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                              Letter to Vice Chancellor Slights from Daniel K. Astin, Esq. Regarding Stipulation and [Proposed] Order for Consolidation of Related Actions
                                                Blank 192 Filed: 7/27/2021, Entered: None Stipulation And [proposed} Order
                                                Stipulation and [Proposed] Order for Consolidation of Related Actions
                                                Blank 191 Filed: 7/26/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                Letter dated July 26, 2021, from VC Slights to counsel rescheduling oral argument regarding the parties' leadership structure from September 14, 2021, to September 30, 2021, at 1:30 p.m., via Zoom
                                                  Blank 190 Filed: 7/21/2021, Entered: None Issuance of Summons
                                                  Issued 1 Summons (3114) 7 Copies to Counsel. 7.21.2021.
                                                    Blank 189 Filed: 7/20/2021, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                    (Confidential Filing) Second Amended Verified Stockholder Derivative Complaint with Certificate of Service
                                                    Blank 188 Filed: 7/20/2021, Entered: None Entry of Appearance
                                                      Blank 187 Filed: 7/19/2021, Entered: None Order
                                                      Granted (Stipulation and (Proposed) Order Modifying the June 29, 2021 Order Regarding Case Schedule to Authorize Confidential Filing of Plenary Complaints)
                                                        Blank 186 Filed: 7/19/2021, Entered: None Stipulation And [proposed} Order
                                                        Stipulation and (Proposed) Order Modifying the June 29, 2021 Order Regarding Case Schedule to Authorize Confidential Filing of Plenary Complaints
                                                          Blank 185 Filed: 7/15/2021, Entered: None Notice
                                                          Notice of Change of Firm Address with Certificate of Service
                                                            Blank 184 Filed: 7/14/2021, Entered: None Notice
                                                            Notice of Change of Firm Address with Certificate of Service
                                                              Blank 183 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: None Order
                                                              Granted (Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Enlargement of Time (regarding the filing of public versions of the Complaints))
                                                                Blank 182 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: None Stipulation And [proposed} Order
                                                                Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Enlargement of Time (regarding the filing of public versions of the Complaints)
                                                                  Blank 181 Filed: 7/8/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                  Letter dated July 8, 2021, from VC Slights to counsel scheduling oral argument for September 14, 2021, at 9:15 a.m. on the parties' forthcoming leadership applications, via Zoom
                                                                    Blank 180 Filed: 6/29/2021, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                    Stipulation and Order Regarding Case Schedule, approved by Vice Chancellor Slights on June 29, 2021
                                                                      Blank 179 Filed: 6/25/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                      Letter to Vice Chancellor Slights from Nathan A. Cook regarding Scheduling Update
                                                                        Blank 178 Filed: 6/25/2021, Entered: None Official Transcript (Addl Fees Apply)
                                                                        Transcript of 6.8.21 Status Conference Held via Zoom
                                                                          Blank 177 Filed: 6/21/2021, Entered: None Judicial Action Form
                                                                          Judicial Action Form received 06.21.21- Telephonic Conf. Status held 06.08.21. VC Slights. Jeanne Cahill, Court Reporter. See Transcript
                                                                            Blank 176 Filed: 6/15/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                            Letter to Vice Chancellor Slights from Nathan A. Cook regarding Schedule for Leadership and Consolidation
                                                                            Blank 175 Filed: 5/14/2021, Entered: None Order
                                                                              Blank 174 Filed: 5/13/2021, Entered: None Motion
                                                                              Blank 173 Filed: 5/11/2021, Entered: None Official Transcript (Addl Fees Apply)
                                                                              4-28-2021 Telephonic Status Conference
                                                                                Blank 172 Filed: 5/3/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                Letter dated May 3, 2021, from VC Slights to counsel scheduling a status conference for June 8, 2021, at 1:30 p.m., via Zoom
                                                                                  Blank 171 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: None Judicial Action Form
                                                                                  Judicial Action Form-Zoom Telephone Conference Status held 04.28.21. VC Slights. Jeanne Cahill, Court Reporter. See Transcript.
                                                                                    Blank 170 Filed: 3/29/2021, Entered: None Official Transcript (Addl Fees Apply)
                                                                                    3-17-21 Status conference
                                                                                      Blank 169 Filed: 3/23/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                      Letter dated March 23, 2021, from VC Slights to counsel scheduling a status conference for April 28, 2021, at 1:30 p.m., via Zoom
                                                                                        Blank 168 Filed: 3/18/2021, Entered: None Judicial Action Form
                                                                                        Judicial Action completed by Karen Siedlecki, Court Reporter. Status teleconference held 3-17-21 via Zoom. See transcript.
                                                                                          Blank 167 Filed: 3/15/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                          Letter to the Honorable Joseph R. Slights III from Nathan A. Cook, Esq. Regarding Proposed Agenda for Status Conference Scheduled for March 17, 2021
                                                                                            Blank 166 Filed: 3/9/2021, Entered: None Official Transcript (Addl Fees Apply)
                                                                                            Transcript, 2-16-21. Oral Argument and Rulings of the Court on Motion to Consolidate and Motions to Intervene. Held via Zoom.
                                                                                              Blank 165 Filed: 2/19/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                              Letter dated February 19, 2021, from VC Slights to counsel scheduling a status conference for March 17, 2021, at 1:30 p.m., via Zoom
                                                                                                Blank 164 Filed: 2/17/2021, Entered: None Judicial Action Form
                                                                                                Judicial Action Form-Held 02.16.21. VC Slights. Oral Argument and rulings of the Court of Plts' Motion for Consolidation Related Actions and Entry of Briefing Schedule on Rhode Island's Motion to Intervene; Robert A. Feuer's Motion to intervene and Respond to Local 79 Plts' Motion for Consolidation of Related Actions and Entry of a Briefing Schedule for Appt Lead Plts and Lead Counsel. Douglas Zweizig, Court Reporter. See Transcript.
                                                                                                  Blank 163 Filed: 2/16/2021, Entered: None Order Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                    Blank 162 Filed: 2/16/2021, Entered: None Order Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                    Granted (Johnson, Geoffrey, M.: [Proposed] Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Geoffrey M. Johnson, Esquire as Counsel for Plaintiff City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System)
                                                                                                      Blank 161 Filed: 2/15/2021, Entered: None Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                      Johnson, Geoffrey, M.: Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Geoffrey M. Johnson, Esquire as Counsel for Plaintiff City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                      Blank 160 Filed: 2/15/2021, Entered: None Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                      Blank 159 Filed: 1/7/2021, Entered: None Order Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                      Granted (Murphy, J. Emmett: [Proposed] Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice on behalf of PricewaterhouseCoopers, LLP)
                                                                                                        Blank 158 Filed: 1/7/2021, Entered: None Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                        Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of J. Emmett Murphy on behalf of PricewaterhouseCoopers, LLP (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                        Blank 157 Filed: 1/7/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                        Letter dated January 7, 2021, from VC Slights to counsel rescheduling oral argument on (1) Pls' Mot. for Consolidation and Entry of a Briefing Schedule for Appt. of Lead Plaintiffs and Lead Counsel; (2) Emps' Ret. Sys. of Rhode Island's Mot. to Intervene; and (3) Robert A. Feuer's Mot. to Intervene and Respond to Local 79 Pls' Mot. for Consolidation and Entry of a Briefing Schedule, currently scheduled for January 12, 2021 to February 16, 2021, at 1:30 p.m., via Zoom
                                                                                                          Blank 156 Filed: 1/6/2021, Entered: None Order Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                          Granted (Greenfield, Richard D. :(Proposed Order re Motion for Pro Hac Vice)
                                                                                                            Blank 154 Filed: 1/5/2021, Entered: None Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                            Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Richard Greenfield
                                                                                                            Blank 155 Filed: 1/5/2021, Entered: None Proposed Order - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                            Proposed Order re Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                              Blank 153 Filed: 1/5/2021, Entered: None reply
                                                                                                              Robert A. Feuer's Omnibus Reply in Support of Motion to Intervene and Respond to Local 79 Plaintiffs' Motion for Consolidation of Related Actions and Entry of Briefing Schedule for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff(s) and Lead Counsel with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                              Blank 152 Filed: 1/5/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                              LETTER TO VICE CHANCELLOR SLIGHTS ENCLOSING COURTESY COPIES OF CALSTRS PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO FEUER'S MOTION TO INTERVENE AND RESPOND TO MOTION FOR CONSOLIDATION, WITH PROPOSED FORM OF ORDER
                                                                                                                Blank 151 Filed: 12/23/2020, Entered: None response
                                                                                                                  Blank 150 Filed: 12/23/2020, Entered: None Opposition
                                                                                                                  Local 79 Plaintiffs' Opposition to Robert A. Feuer's Motion to Intervene and Respond to Local 79 Plaintiffs' Motion for Consolidation of Related Actions and Entry of a Briefing Schedule for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff(s) and Lead Counsel with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                    Blank 149 Filed: 12/23/2020, Entered: None Response to Other Motion
                                                                                                                    CALSTRS PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO FEUER'S MOTION TO INTERVENE AND RESPOND TO MOTION FOR CONSOLIDATION
                                                                                                                    Blank 148 Filed: 12/23/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                    Granted (Stipulation and [Proposed] Order re Briefing Schedule on Motion to Intervene filed by R.A. Feuer)
                                                                                                                      Blank 147 Filed: 12/22/2020, Entered: None Stipulation And [proposed} Order
                                                                                                                      Stipulation and [Proposed] Order re Briefing Schedule on Motion to Intervene filed by R.A. Feuer
                                                                                                                        Blank 146 Filed: 12/18/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                        Letter dated December 18, 2020, from VC Slights to counsel changing the argument on January 12, 2021, at 1:30 p.m. on (1) Pls' Mot. for Consolidation and Entry of a Briefing Schedule; (2) Empls' Ret. Sys. of Rhode Island's Mot. to Intervene; and (3) Robert A. Feuer's Mot. to Intervene from a telephonic argument to an argument via Zoom
                                                                                                                          Blank 145 Filed: 12/16/2020, Entered: None Motion
                                                                                                                          Blank 144 Filed: 11/23/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                          Letter dated November 23, 2020, from VC Slights to counsel scheduling a telephonic argument for January 12, 2021, at 1:30 p.m. concerning (1) Plaintiffs' Motion for Consolidation of Related Actions and Entry of a Briefing Schedule for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff(s) and Lead Counsel and (2) Employees' Retirement System of Rhode Island's Motion to Intervene (via Court-Solutions LLC)
                                                                                                                            Blank 141 Filed: 11/20/2020, Entered: None reply
                                                                                                                            Plaintiffs' Omnibus Reply in Further Support of Motion for Consolidation of Related Actions and Entry of a Briefing Schedule for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff(s) and Lead Counsel with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                            Blank 142 Filed: 11/20/2020, Entered: None Compendium
                                                                                                                            Compendium of Transcript and Orders cited in Plaintiffs' Omnibus Reply in further support of Motion for Consolidation of Related Actions and Entry of a Briefing Schedule for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff(s) and Lead Counsel with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                              Blank 143 Filed: 11/20/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                                                                              Transmittal Declaration of Samuel L. Closic in Support of Plaintiffs' Omnibus Reply in Further Support of Motion for Consolidation of Related Actions and Entry of a Briefing Schedule for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff(s) and Lead Counsel with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                Blank 140 Filed: 11/20/2020, Entered: None reply
                                                                                                                                Employees' Retirement System of Rhode Island's Reply in Support of Motion to Intervene and Oppose, in Part, Local 79 Plaintiffs Motion for Consolidation of Related Actions and Entry of a Briefing Schedule for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff(s) and Lead Counsel with certificate of service
                                                                                                                                Blank 139 Filed: 11/17/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                Letter to Court enclosing CalSTRS Plaintiffs' Opposition to (A) Motion for Consolidation and Entry of a Briefing Schedule for Leadership and (B) Motion for Intervention with proposed form of Order and Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                  Blank 137 Filed: 11/16/2020, Entered: None Opposition
                                                                                                                                  CalSTRS Plaintiffs' Opposition to (A) Motion for Consolidation and Entry of a Briefing Schedule for Leadership and (B) Motion for Intervention
                                                                                                                                  Blank 138 Filed: 11/16/2020, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                  Certificate of Service (for CalSTRS Plaintiffs' Opposition to (A) Motion for Consolidation and Entry of a Briefing Schedule for Leadership and (B) Motion for Intervention, and Proposed Form of Order)
                                                                                                                                    Blank 136 Filed: 11/13/2020, Entered: None Joinder
                                                                                                                                      Blank 135 Filed: 11/13/2020, Entered: None Opposition
                                                                                                                                      Blank 134 Filed: 11/10/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                      Granted (Stipulation & (Proposed) Order regarding Motion for Consolidation of Related Actions and Entry of a Briefing Schedule for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff(s) and Lead Counsel and Motion to Intervene and Oppose, In Part, Local 79 Plaintiffs' Motion for Consolidation of Related Actions and Entry of a Briefing Schedule for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff(s) and Lead Counsel)
                                                                                                                                        Blank 133 Filed: 11/9/2020, Entered: None Stipulation And [proposed} Order
                                                                                                                                        Stipulation & (Proposed) Order regarding Motion for Consolidation of Related Actions and Entry of a Briefing Schedule for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff(s) and Lead Counsel and Motion to Intervene and Oppose, In Part, Local 79 Plaintiffs' Motion for Consolidation of Related Actions and Entry of a Briefing Schedule for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff(s) and Lead Counsel
                                                                                                                                          Blank 132 Filed: 11/5/2020, Entered: None Opposition
                                                                                                                                          Plaintiffs' Opposition to Employees' Retirement System of Rhode Island's Motion to Intervene and Oppose, in part, Local 79 Plaintiffs' Motion for Consolidation of Related Actions and Entry of a Briefing Schedule for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff(s) and Lead Counsel with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                            Blank 131 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                            November 2, 2020 letter from counsel for the CalSTRS Plaintiffs (Thaddeus J. Weaver) regarding briefing on recently filed motions of Employees' Retirement System of Rhode Island and Local No. 79
                                                                                                                                              Blank 130 Filed: 10/29/2020, Entered: None Motion
                                                                                                                                              Blank 129 Filed: 10/28/2020, Entered: None Motion to Consolidate
                                                                                                                                              Plaintiffs' Motion for Consolidation of Related Actions and Entry of a Briefing Schedule for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff(s) and Lead Counsel with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                              Blank 128 Filed: 5/29/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                              May 29, 2020 Letter from Thaddeus J. Weaver, Esquire on behalf of the CalSTRS Plaintiffs, to Vice Chancellor Slights, regarding a proposed order on case schedule
                                                                                                                                              Blank 127 Filed: 5/29/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                              Letter from Attorney Heyman to Vice Chancellor Slights regarding a proposed order
                                                                                                                                              Blank 126 Filed: 5/29/2020, Entered: None Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                              Notice of Entry of Appearance of Nathan A. Cook of Block & Leviton LLP on Behalf of Interested-Party Employees' Retirement System of Rhode Island with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                Blank 125 Filed: 5/29/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                Letter from David E. Ross to The Honorable Joseph R. Slights III enclosing [Proposed] Order Setting Schedule
                                                                                                                                                Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                Blank 124 Filed: 5/29/2020, Entered: None Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                Notice of Entry of Appearance of Kurt M. Heyman and Aaron M. Nelson of Heyman Enerio Gattuso & Hirzel LLP on Behalf of Interested Party Employees' Retirement System of Rhode Island with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 123 Filed: 5/26/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 122 Filed: 5/7/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                  Letter dated May 7, 2020 from VC Slights to counsel canceling the telephonic argument scheduled for May 8, 2020, at 11:00 a.m. concerning Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of an Order Requiring Defendants to Include Plaintiff in (I) Communications and (II) Responses to Status Update Requests and Inquiries Regarding the Lifting of Discovery-Related Stays
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 121 Filed: 5/1/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                    Letter dated May 1, 2020, from VC Slights to counsel requesting proposed schedule(s) for moving these matters forward
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 120 Filed: 4/30/2020, Entered: None Status report
                                                                                                                                                      Updated Joint Status Report
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 119 Filed: 2/14/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                        Letter dated February 14, 2020, from VC Slights to counsel scheduling a telephonic argument for May 8, 2020, at 11:00 a.m. concerning Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of an Order Requiring Defendants to Include Plaintiff in (I) Communications and (II) Responses to Status Update Requests and Inquiries Regarding the Lifting of Discovery-Related Stays, filed in C.A. No. 2019-0324-JRS
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 118 Filed: 1/8/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                          Letter dated January 8, 2020 from VC Slights to counsel in response to the parties' status report of January 3, 2020
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 117 Filed: 1/3/2020, Entered: None Status report
                                                                                                                                                            Updated Joint Status Report
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 116 Filed: 10/3/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                              Letter dated October 3, 2019, from VC Slights to counsel granting request to maintain stay. An updated joint status report is due on or before January 3, 2020.
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 115 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: None Status report
                                                                                                                                                                Joint Status Report Regarding Parties' Position on Whether the Stay Should Remain in Place
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 114 Filed: 9/5/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                  Letter dated September 5, 2019, from VC Slights to counsel requesting a status report (due on or before September 27, 2019).
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 113 Filed: 9/5/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                    Granted (STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO ALLOW CALIFORNIA STATE TEACHERS' RETIREMENT SYSTEM TO INTERVENE AND JOIN AS A PARTY PLAINTIFF)
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 112 Filed: 9/3/2019, Entered: None Stipulation And [proposed} Order
                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO ALLOW CALIFORNIA STATE TEACHERS' RETIREMENT SYSTEM TO INTERVENE AND JOIN AS A PARTY PLAINTIFF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 111 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: None Motion
                                                                                                                                                                      California State Teachers' Retirement System's ("CalSTRS") Motion for Intervention to Lift the Stay for the Limited Purpose of Adding CalSTRS as a Party Plaintiff
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 110 Filed: 1/7/2019, Entered: None Official Transcript (Addl Fees Apply)
                                                                                                                                                                      December 17, 2018 - Proposed intervenors' Motion to Intervene and Stay Proceedings and Ruling of the Court
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 107 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None Order Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                        Granted (Jacobsen, Scott, R.: [Proposed] Order for the Admission of Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Proposed Intervenor City of Birmingham Relief and Retirement System)
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 108 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None Order Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                          Granted (Schirripa, Frank R.: [Proposed] Order for the Admission Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Proposed Intervenor Construction and General Building Laborers' Local Union No. 79 General Fund)
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 109 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None Order Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                            Granted (Rehns, Daniel B.: [Proposed] Order for the Admission Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Proposed Intervenor Construction and General Building Laborers' Local Union No. 79 General Fund)
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 106 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None Judicial Action Form
                                                                                                                                                                              Oral Argument on Motion to Stay and Motion to Intervene before Vice Chancellor Slights on 12.17.2018. Oral ruling on the record; see transcript. Motion to Stay & Motion to Intervene: Granted.
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 105 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None Judicial Action Form
                                                                                                                                                                                Oral Argument on Motion to Stay and Motion to Intervene before Vice Chancellor Slights on 12.17.2018. Oral ruling on the record; see transcript. Motion to Stay & Motion to Intervene: Granted.
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 101 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                  Jacobsen, Scott, R.: Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Proposed Intervenor City of Birmingham Relief and Retirement System with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 102 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Appearance of Jing-Li Yu of Scott+Scott Attorney at Law on behalf of Proposed Intervenor City of Birmingham Relief and Retirement System with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 103 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                    Schirripa, Frank R.: Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Proposed Intervenor Construction and General Building Laborers' Local Union No. 79 General Fund with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 104 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                      Rehns, Daniel B.: Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Proposed Intervenor Construction and General Building Laborers' Local Union No. 79 General Fund with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 100 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: None reply
                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Intervenors' Reply in Further Support of their Motion to Intervene for the Limited Purpose of Staying Proceedings Pending Proposed Intervenors' Books and Records Inspection with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 99 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER TO COURT FROM COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF REGARDING EVIDENCE FROM THE PARLIAMENTARY INVESTIGATION
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 98 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER TO VICE CHANCELLOR SLIGHTS ENCLOSING COURTESY COPIES OF PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO INTERVENE AND STAY PROCEEDINGS; SUPPORTING AFFIDAVIT OF THADDEUS J. WEAVER WITH EX. A AND B; PROPOSED FORM OF ORDER; AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 97 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: None response
                                                                                                                                                                                            PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO INTERVENE AND STAY PROCEEDINGS
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 96 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None response
                                                                                                                                                                                            The Facebook Defendants' Response to Proposed Intervenors' Motion to Intervene (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 95 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Notice of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Service (of "Plaintiffs' Second Request for Production of Documents Directed to Facebook Defendants" with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 94 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter from VC Slights to counsel setting a schedule on the Motion to Intervene and Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 93 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: None Public Version
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Public Version of "Plaintiffs' Omnibus Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Stay these Proceedings"
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 92 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter to The Honorable Joseph R. Slights III from David E. Ross, on behalf of all Defendants, in response to Mr. Weaver's November 15, 2018 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 91 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER TO VICE CHANCELLOR SLIGHTS IN RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO AMEND SCHEDULE ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS, AND SCHEDULE FOR INTERVENORS' MOTION TO INTERVENE
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 90 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 89 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter to The Honorable Joseph R. Slights III from David E. Ross, on behalf of all Defendants, concerning the schedule for Defendants' Motions to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 88 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Withdrawal of Plaintiff Christopher Leagre's Motion for Consolidation of Related Actions, Appointment of Lead Plaintiff, Approval of Lead Counsel, and Designation of Operative Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 87 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER TO VICE CHANCELLOR SLIGHTS ENCLOSING COURTESY COPIES OF PLAINTIFFS' REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY, WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 86 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: None reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                      PLAINTIFFS' REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 85 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER TO VICE CHANCELLOR SLIGHTS ENCLOSING PLAINTIFFS' OMNIBUS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, STAY THESE PROCEEDINGS, WITH SUPPORTING COMPENDIUM OF AUTHORITIES, AFFIDAVIT OF THADDEUS J. WEAVER, ESQ., AND PROPOSED FORM OF ORDER
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 84 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: None Answering Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                        [CONFIDENTIAL FILING] PLAINTIFFS' OMNIBUS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, STAY THESE PROCEEDINGS
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 83 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Granted ([PROPOSED] ORDER PERMITTING SUBMISSION UNDER SEAL OF ANSWERING BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS, AND TO EXCEED WORD LIMIT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 82 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER TO VICE CHANCELLOR SLIGHTS FROM PLAINTIFFS' ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFENDANTS' NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO FILE ANSWERING BRIEF UNDER SEAL AND TO EXCEED WORD LIMIT
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 81 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION TO FILE PLAINTIFFS' ANSWERING BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS UNDER SEAL, AND TO EXCEED WORD LIMIT
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 80 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter from David E. Ross to The Honorable Joseph R. Slights III enclosing courtesy copies of Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Stay Discovery, and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion to Compel Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 79 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: None reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Stay Discovery, and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion to Compel Discovery (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 78 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter to The Honorable Joseph R. Slights, III from Samuel L. Closic enclosing courtesy copies of Proposed Intervenors' Motion to Intervene for the Limited Purpose of Staying Proceedings Pending Completion of Proposed Intervenors' Books and Records Inspection (the "Motion to Intervene" )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 77 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Intervenors' Motion to Intervene for the Limited Purposed of Staying Proceedings Pending Proposed Intervenors' Books and Records Inspections with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 76 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Entry of Appearance of Samuel L. Closic of Prickett, Jones & Elliott, P.A. as counsel for Proposed Intervenors The City of Birmingham Relief and Retirement System, Construction and General Building Laborers' Local Union No. 79 General Fund, and Lidia Levy with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 75 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None Stipulation And [proposed} Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 74 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter to the Honorable Joseph R. Slights, III, from Blake A. Bennett, Esquire enclosing two courtesy copies of Plaintiff Christopher Leagre's Motion for Consolidation of Related Actions, Appointment of Lead Plaintiff, Approval of Lead Counsel and Designation of Operative Complaint with supporting documents
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 73 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Motion to Consolidate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Plaintiff Christopher Leagre's Motion for Consolidation of Related Actions, Appointment of Lead Plaintiff, Approval of Lead Counsel, and Designation of Operative Complaint with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 72 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Scheduling Order entered by Vice Chancellor Slights on October 23, 2018 on Defendants' Motions to Stay Discovery and Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion to Compel Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 71 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter from David E. Ross to The Honorable Joseph R. Slights III in response to Plaintiffs' October 19, 2018 Letter Regarding Remaining Briefing Schedule on Defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 70 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER APPLICATION TO THE COURT TO SET REMAINING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO STAY DISCOVERY, AND PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION AND CROSS-MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 69 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Public Version
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        EXHIBITS H AND I TO THE AFFIDAVIT OF CATHERINE PRATSINAKIS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO STAY DISCOVERY, AND PLAINTIFFS' CROSS-MOTIONS TO COMPEL DISCOVERY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 68 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Public Version
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY, AND PLAINTIFFS' CROSS-MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 67 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER TO VICE CHANCELLOR SLIGHTS ENCLOSING COURTESY COPIES OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY WITH ACCOMPANYING DOCUMENTS
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 66 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          [CONFIDENTIAL FILING] Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery, and Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion to Compel Discovery [Type-volume limitation exceeded per Order of the Court dated Oct 12, 2018, FSX Transaction ID No.: 62553058]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 65 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Granted ([Proposed] Order On Length and Confidential Treatment of Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motions to Stay Discovery.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 63 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter Application to Court requesting permission to file a joint opposition and cross-motion to compel in excess of word limit under Rule 171, in response to Defendants' Motions to Stay Discovery, and to file joint opposition and cross-motion under seal.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 64 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              [Proposed] Order On Length and Confidential Treatment of Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motions to Stay Discovery.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 62 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: None Public Version
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                [PUBLIC VERSION] Opening Brief of PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP In Support of Its Motion to Dismiss (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 61 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: None Public Version
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PUBLIC VERSION of The Facebook Defendants' Opening Brief In Support of Their Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Stay These Proceedings (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 60 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter from Alexandra M. Cumings to Vice Chancellor Slights enclosing courtesy copies of the Opening Brief of PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP in Support of its Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 59 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter from David E. Ross to The Honorable Joseph R. Slights III enclosing two courtesy copies of (i) The Facebook Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Stay These Proceedings; (ii) The Facebook Defendants' Opening Brief In Support of Their Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Stay These Proceedings; and (iii) the Transmittal Affidavit of R. Garrett Rice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 58 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Notice of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Service of PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP's Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' First Request for Production of Documents
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 57 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendant PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP's Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 56 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          The Facebook Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Stay These Proceedings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 55 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Opening Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          [CONFIDENTIAL] Opening Brief of PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP In Support of Its Motion to Dismiss (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 54 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Granted ((Proposed) Order Granting Motion for Confidential Treatment of Defendant PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP's briefs in support of its motion to dismiss)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 53 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: None Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Defendant PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP's Motion for Confidential Treatment of its briefs in support of its forthcoming motion to dismiss (and Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 52 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Granted ([Proposed] Order Authorizing Confidential Filing (Permitting The Facebook Defendants to File Its Opening Brief in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Verified Stockholder Derivative Complaint as a Confidential Filing))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 51 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: None Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                The Facebook Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Confidential Treatment (Permitting Facebook Defendants to File Its Opening Brief in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Verified Stockholder Derivative Complaint as a Confidential Filing) (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 50 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter to Vice Chancellor Slights from Alexandra M. Cumings enclosing courtesy copies of Defendant PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP's Joinder in Facebook Defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 49 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter from David E. Ross to The Honorable Joseph R. Slights III enclosing two courtesy copies of The Facebook Defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery, which was filed with the Court on September 26, 2018
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 47 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: None Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendant PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP's Joinder in Facebook Defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 48 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: None Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Entry of Appearance of Jon E. Abramczyk and Alexandra M. Cumings of Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP on behalf of Defendant PricewaterhouseCoopers, LLP (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 46 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: None Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        The Facebook Defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 45 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: None Notice of Service of Responses to Request for Prod
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice and Certificate of Service of (i) Facebook Defendants' Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' First Request for Production of Documents Directed to Facebook Defendants; and (ii) this Notice and Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 44 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: None Notice of Service of Request for Production
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS' FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS DIRECTED TO DEFENDANT PRICEWATERHOUSECOOPERS, LLP
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 43 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: None Notice of Service of Request for Production
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS' FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS DIRECTED TO FACEBOOK DEFENDANTS
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 42 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Granted (Second Amended Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Scheduling Filing of Motion to Dismiss Briefing)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 41 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: None Stipulation And [proposed} Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Second Amended Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Scheduling Filing of Motion to Dismiss Briefing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 40 Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: None Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS FOR SERVICE UPON DEFENDANT PRICEWATERHOUSECOOPERS, LLP, WITH ATTACHED RETURN OF SERVICE AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 39 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None Public Version
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Public Version of First Amended Verified Stickholder Derivative Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 38 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None Order Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Granted (SCHWARTZ, AARON L.: PROPOSED ORDER FOR THE ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFFS KAREN SBRIGLIO AND FIREMEN'S RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF ST. LOUIS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 37 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None Order Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Granted (FOX, FREDERIC S.: PROPOSED ORDER FOR THE ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFFS KAREN SBRIGLIO AND FIREMEN'S RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF ST. LOUIS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 36 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SCHWARTZ, AARON L.: MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFFS KAREN SBRIGLIO AND FIREMEN'S RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF ST. LOUIS
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 35 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FOX, FREDERIC S.: MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFFS KAREN SBRIGLIO AND FIREMEN'S RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF ST. LOUIS
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 34 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER TO VICE CHANCELLOR SLIGHTS FROM PLAINTIFFS' ATTORNEY ENCLOSING COURTESY COPIES OF SEALED FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED STOCKHOLDER DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT WITH VERIFICATIONS; EXHIBITS A-T; AND REDLINED VERSION OF AMENDED COMPLAINT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 33 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None Summons Instructions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        August 8, 2018 summons instruction letter to the Register in Chancery as regards Defendant PricewaterhouseCoopers, LLP
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 32 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          [CONFIDENTIAL FILING] First Amended Verified Stockholder Derivative Complaint, with Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 31 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Granted (Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Authorizing the Filing of the Amended Complaint as a Confidential Filing)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 30 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: None Stipulation And [proposed} Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Authorizing the Filing of the Amended Complaint as a Confidential Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 29 Filed: 7/19/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Granted (AMENDED STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER SCHEDULING FILING OF AMENDED COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO DISMISS BRIEFING)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 28 Filed: 7/19/2018, Entered: None Stipulation And [proposed} Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER SCHEDULING FILING OF AMENDED COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO DISMISS BRIEFING
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 27 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Granted (Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Scheduling Filing of Amended Complaint and Motion to Dismiss Briefing)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 26 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: None Stipulation And [proposed} Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Scheduling Filing of Amended Complaint and Motion to Dismiss Briefing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 25 Filed: 7/5/2018, Entered: None Order Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Granted (MCDONOUGH, BRYN M.: PROPOSED ORDER FOR THE ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFF KAREN SBRIGLIO)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 24 Filed: 7/3/2018, Entered: None Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MCDONOUGH, BRYN M.: MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFF KAREN SBRIGLIO
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 23 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter to The Honorable Joseph R. Slights III from David E. Ross in response to the letter from plaintiff's counsel, dated May 31, 2018
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 22 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER FROM COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO VICE CHANCELLOR SLIGHTS REGARDING CALIFORNIA LITIGATION
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 17 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None Order Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Granted (Snyder, Orin: [Proposed] Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Mark Zuckerberg, Sheryl Sandberg, Marc Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, Susan Desmond-Hellmann, Reed Hastings, Jan Koum, Peter A. Thiel and Nominal Defendant Facebook, Inc.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 18 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None Order Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Granted (Lipshutz, Joshua S.: [Proposed] Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Mark Zuckerberg, Sheryl Sandberg, Marc Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, Susan Desmond-Hellmann, Reed Hastings, Jan Koum, Peter A. Thiel and Nominal Defendant Facebook, Inc.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 19 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None Order Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Granted (Lutz, Brian M.: [Proposed] Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Mark Zuckerberg, Sheryl Sandberg, Marc Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, Susan Desmond-Hellmann, Reed Hastings, Jan Koum, Peter A. Thiel and Nominal Defendant Facebook, Inc.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 20 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None Order Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Granted (Linsely, Kristin A.: [Proposed] Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Mark Zuckerberg, Sheryl Sandberg, Marc Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, Susan Desmond-Hellmann, Reed Hastings, Jan Koum, Peter A. Thiel and Nominal Defendant Facebook, Inc.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 21 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None Order Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Granted (Collins, Paul J.: [Proposed] Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Mark Zuckerberg, Sheryl Sandberg, Marc Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, Susan Desmond-Hellmann, Reed Hastings, Jan Koum, Peter A. Thiel and Nominal Defendant Facebook, Inc.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Snyder, Orin: Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Mark Zuckerberg, Sheryl Sandberg, Marc Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, Susan Desmond-Hellmann, Reed Hastings, Jan Koum, Peter A. Thiel and Nominal Defendant Facebook, Inc. (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Lipshutz, Joshua S.: Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Mark Zuckerberg, Sheryl Sandberg, Marc Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, Susan Desmond-Hellmann, Reed Hastings, Jan Koum, Peter A. Thiel and Nominal Defendant Facebook, Inc. (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 14 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Lutz, Brian M.: Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Mark Zuckerberg, Sheryl Sandberg, Marc Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, Susan Desmond-Hellmann, Reed Hastings, Jan Koum, Peter A. Thiel and Nominal Defendant Facebook, Inc. (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 15 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Linsley, Kristin A.: Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Mark Zuckerberg, Sheryl Sandberg, Marc Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, Susan Desmond-Hellmann, Reed Hastings, Jan Koum, Peter A. Thiel and Nominal Defendant Facebook, Inc. (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 16 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Collins, Paul J.: Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Mark Zuckerberg, Sheryl Sandberg, Marc Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, Susan Desmond-Hellmann, Reed Hastings, Jan Koum, Peter A. Thiel and Nominal Defendant Facebook, Inc. (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 11 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Granted (Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Time to Respond to Verified Stockholder Derivative Complaint)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 9 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: None Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Entry of Appearance of David E. Ross and R. Garrett Rice of Ross Aronstam & Moritz LLP on behalf of Defendants Mark Zuckerberg, Sheryl Sandberg, Marc Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, Susan Desmond-Hellmann, Reed Hastings, Jan Koum, Peter A. Theil and Nominal Defendant Facebook, Inc. (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 10 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: None Stipulation And [proposed} Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Time to Respond to Verified Stockholder Derivative Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 8 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None Subpoena
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Subpoena for Documents directed to Cambridge Analytica LLC, with Return of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None Subpoena
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Subpoena for Documents directed to Cambridge Analytica Holdings, LLC, with Return of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: None Subpoena
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Subpoena for Documents directed to Cambridge Analytica, Inc., with Return of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: None Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS FOR SERVICE UPON DEFENDANTS ZUCKERBERG, SANDBERG, ANDREESSEN, BOWLES, DESMOND-HELLMANN, HASTINGS, KOUM AND THIEL, WITH ATTACHED RETURNS OF SERVICE
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: None Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS FOR SERVICE UPON NOMINAL DEFENDANT FACEBOOK, INC., WITH ATTACHED RETURN OF SERVICE
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: None Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issued (1) 3114 summons to special process server (8 copies); Issued (1) summons to special process server (1 copy) on 4.26.18
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: None Summons Instructions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER TO REGISTER IN CHANCERY FROM PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY REQUESTING ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS FOR PROCESS SERVER
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: None Complaint-class action or derivative>10defs
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        VERIFIED STOCKHOLDER DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 134 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?