Eduardo v. The City of New York
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-06725-AKH

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Joseph Eduardo, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Sullivan, Papain, Block, McGrath & Cannavo, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew John Carboy, Sr. +1 212 732 9000 +1 212 266 4141 ACarboy@TrialLaw1.com
v.
No Logo AMEC Construction Management, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Amec Earth & Environmental, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Bovis Lend Lease LMB, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Bovis Lend Lease, Inc., Defendant
City of New York City of New York, Defendant
Officially listed as "The City of New York"
No Logo Tishman Construction Corporation of Manhattan, Defendant
No Logo Tishman Construction Corporation of New York, Defendant
No Logo Tishman Interiors Corporation, Defendant
Tishman Speyer Properties Tishman Speyer Properties, Defendant
No Logo Tully Construction Company Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Tully Construction Co., Inc."
No Logo Tully Environmental Inc., Defendant
No Logo Tully Industries, Inc., Defendant
Turner Construction Company Turner Construction Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "Turner Construction Co."
Office Foley Square
Filed 7/28/2008
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
Cause Section 49 U.S.C. § 40101 Air Trans. Safety and Sys. Stabilization Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County XX Out of State
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case
Related Case
121-mc-00100-AKH
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ECF, MEMBER, RELATED
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 2 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: 8/12/2008 Affidavit of Service Complaints
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. The City of New York served on 8/4/2008, answer due 8/25/2008. Service was accepted by Amanda Gonzalez, Docketing Clerk. Document filed by Joseph Eduardo. (Carboy, Andrew)
    LREF
    Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: 8/11/2008 Complaint
    COMPLAINT against Tishman Interiors Corporation, Tishman Speyer Properties, Tishman Construction Corporation of Manhattan, Tishman Construction Corporation of New York, Tully Construction Co., Inc., Tully Environmental Inc., Tully Industries, Inc., Turner Construction Co., Turner Construction Company, Turner Construction International, L.L.C., The City of New York, AMEC Construction Management, Inc., AMEC Earth & Environmental, Inc., Bovis Lend Lease, Inc., Bovis Lend Lease LMB, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 657848)Document filed by Joseph Eduardo.(laq) (mbe).
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: 8/11/2008 Case Accepted as Related
      CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:21-mc-00100-AKH. CONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Create association to 1:21-mc-00100-AKH.. (laq)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: 8/11/2008 Case Designated ECF.
        Case Designated ECF. (laq)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: 8/11/2008 Case Designation
          Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz is so designated. (laq)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: 8/11/2008 Summons Issued
            SUMMONS ISSUED as to Tishman Interiors Corporation, Tishman Speyer Properties, Tishman Construction Corporation of Manhattan, Tishman Construction Corporation of New York, Tully Construction Co., Inc., Tully Environmental Inc., Tully Industries, Inc., Turner Construction Co., Turner Construction Company, Turner Construction International, L.L.C., The City of New York, AMEC Construction Management, Inc., AMEC Earth & Environmental, Inc., Bovis Lend Lease, Inc., Bovis Lend Lease LMB, Inc. (laq)
              LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 106 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?