USA v. Simoes
Criminal Case New York Southern District Court, Case No. 7:08-cr-00784-KMK

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jason P.W. Halperin +1 914 993 1933 +1 914 993 1980 jason.halperin@usdoj.gov
Space Anna Margaret Skotko +1 914 993 1939 +1 914 993 9036 anna.skotko@usdoj.gov
Space Benjamin H. Torrance +1 212 637 2703 +1 212 637 2702 benjamin.torrance@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Wayne Simoes, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Gregory Weaver (Unknown Firm)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Denis Patten +1 212 962 1295 +1 212 349 6369 johnpatten@att.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Mellea & Gioffre, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew C Quinn +1 914 997 0555 +1 914 997 0550 aquinn@quinnlawny.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office White Plains
Filed 8/19/2008
County Westchester
Terminated
Reopened
Magistrate Case
708-mj-01466-UA
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 242.F
Offense Level 4
Def Custody Status Released
Flag ECF
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: 8/28/2008 Case Assigned/Reassigned
Case as to Wayne Simoes ASSIGNED to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Judge Unassigned no longer assigned to the case.. (cg)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: 8/28/2008 Plea Entered
    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge George A. Yanthis: Plea entered by Wayne Simoes (1) Count 1 Not Guilty. (cg)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: 8/28/2008 Arraignment
      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge George A. Yanthis:Arraignment as to Wayne Simoes (1) Count 1 held on 8/27/2008. Defendant present with attorney's Andrew Quinn and John Patten, AUSA Jason P.W. Halperin . Defendant enters a not guilty plea. Case assigned to Judge Karas. Court finds all time from today until the 1st ptc before Judge Karas excluded in the interest of justice. Bail continued as previously set. (cg) Modified on 8/28/2008 (cg).
        LREF
        Legal Document 12 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: 8/26/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
        NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: John Denis Patten appearing for Wayne Simoes. (Patten, John)
          LREF
          Legal Document 11 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: 8/26/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Benjamin H. Torrance appearing for USA. (Torrance, Benjamin)
            LREF
            Legal Document 10 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: 8/26/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
            NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Jason P.W. Halperin appearing for USA. (Halperin, Jason)
              LREF
              Legal Document 9 Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: 8/19/2008 Indictment
              INDICTMENT FILED as to Wayne Simoes (1) count(s) 1. (cg)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: 8/19/2008 Case Designated ECF.
                Case Designated ECF as to Wayne Simoes. (cg)
                  LREF
                  Blank 8 Filed: 7/23/2008, Entered: 7/25/2008 Order to Continue - Interest of JusticeCourt Filing
                  ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Wayne Simoes. Time excluded from 7/23/2008 until 8/20/2008.. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Margaret Smith on 7/23/2008)(cg)[7:08-mj-01466-UA]
                    LREF
                    Blank 7 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: 6/30/2008 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                    ENDORSED LETTER as to Wayne Simoes addressed to Magistrate Judge George A. Yanthis from Andrew C. Quinn dated 6/27/2008 re: Request for a modification of Mr. Simoes condition of pretrial release...ENDORSMENT: Approved. So Ordered... (Signed by Magistrate Judge George A. Yanthis on 6/27/2008) Copies Faxed By Chambers.(cg)[7:08-mj-01466-UA]
                      LREF
                      Blank 6 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: 6/30/2008 Order Setting Conditions of Release
                      ORDER Setting Conditions of Release.. (cg)[7:08-mj-01466-UA]
                        LREF
                        Blank 5 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: 6/30/2008 Bond
                        Appearance Bond Entered as to Wayne Simoes in amount of $ 300,000.00 PRB, 2 FRP wife plus 1 more by 6/30/2008. $300,000.00 Real Property, Surrender travel documents. Surrender firemarms by 6/30/2008. Routine pretrial supervision. (cg)[7:08-mj-01466-UA]
                          LREF
                          Blank 4 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: 6/30/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Andrew C Quinn appearing for Wayne Simoes. (cg)[7:08-mj-01466-UA]
                            LREF
                            Blank 2 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: 6/30/2008 Order to Unseal CaseCourt Filing
                            Order to Unseal Case as to Sealed Defendant 1.. (Signed by Magistrate Judge George A. Yanthis on 6/27/2008)(cg)[7:08-mj-01466-UA]
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: 6/30/2008 Set/Reset Hearings
                              Set/Reset Hearings as to Wayne Simoes: Preliminary Examination set for 7/23/2008 at 09:00 AM before Judge Unassigned.. (cg)[7:08-mj-01466-UA]
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: 6/30/2008 Initial Appearance
                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge George A. Yanthis:Initial Appearance as to Wayne Simoes held on 6/27/2008. Defendant present with attorney Andrew Quinn, AUSA Anna Skotko. $300,000.00 PRB, 2FRP and (Wife) no later 6/30/2008, $300,000.00 Property (Home), Travel restricted to SDNY/EDNY, Surrender Travel Documents and no new applications. Surrender all firemarms by 6/30/2008. Date for preliminary Hearing 7/30/2008 at 9AM. (cg)[7:08-mj-01466-UA]
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: 6/30/2008 Arrest
                                  Arrest of Wayne Simoes. (cg)[7:08-mj-01466-UA]
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: 6/30/2008 Complaint Unsealed
                                    COMPLAINT UNSEALED as to Sealed Defendant 1. (cg)[7:08-mj-01466-UA]
                                      LREF
                                      Sealed Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: 6/30/2008 Complaint(Sealed)Court Filing
                                      SEALED COMPLAINT as to Sealed Defendant 1 (1). (Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge George A. Yanthis) (cg)[7:08-mj-01466-UA]
                                        LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 131 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?