Taylor v. Gray et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-08838-SAS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 29, 2017 at 11:51 PM DT (4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Roy Taylor, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by 30th Street Men's Shelter

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Roy Taylor
v.
No Logo Ada Isabelle Redman, Defendant
No Logo Attorney Gaynor, Defendant
No Logo Attorney Peter Mitchell, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Garbarini & Scher, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Goldman Scher +1 212 689 1113 +1 212 725 9630 wscher@garbarini-scher.com
No Logo Attorney Peter Ricther, Defendant
No Logo Attorney Stuart Singer, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office Of Lori D. Fishman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Christopher Folchetti +1 914 524 5736
No Logo Battle, Defendant
No Logo Bell, Defendant
No Logo Blackmore, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Morgan David Kunz +1 212 356 2357 +1 212 788 9776 Morgan.Kunz@gmail.com
No Logo Brautigam, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
NYPD Officer
TERMINATED: 03/09/2009 Morgan David Kunz +1 212 356 2357 +1 212 788 9776 Morgan.Kunz@gmail.com
No Logo C.O. Battle, Defendant
No Logo C.O. Davis, Defendant
No Logo C.O. Gray, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Morgan David Kunz +1 212 356 2357 +1 212 788 9776 Morgan.Kunz@gmail.com
No Logo C.O. Hawkins, Defendant
No Logo C.O. Kalber, Defendant
No Logo C.O. McLeod, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Morgan David Kunz +1 212 356 2357 +1 212 788 9776 Morgan.Kunz@gmail.com
No Logo C.O. Pena, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Morgan David Kunz +1 212 356 2357 +1 212 788 9776 Morgan.Kunz@gmail.com
No Logo C.O. Thorn, Defendant
No Logo C.O. Williams, Defendant
No Logo C.O. Gary Gason, Defendant
No Logo C.O. Brutts, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/09/2009 Morgan David Kunz +1 212 356 2357 +1 212 788 9776 Morgan.Kunz@gmail.com
No Logo C.O. Mariner, Defendant
No Logo C.O. Saunderson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Morgan David Kunz +1 212 356 2357 +1 212 788 9776 Morgan.Kunz@gmail.com
No Logo Callaghan, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
NYPD Officer
TERMINATED: 03/09/2009 Morgan David Kunz +1 212 356 2357 +1 212 788 9776 Morgan.Kunz@gmail.com
No Logo Captain Bell, Defendant
No Logo Captain Green, Defendant
No Logo Captain McCrary, Defendant
No Logo Captain McDuffy, Defendant
No Logo Captain Miller, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Morgan David Kunz +1 212 356 2357 +1 212 788 9776 Morgan.Kunz@gmail.com
No Logo Captain Murphy, Defendant
No Logo Captain Salamon, Defendant
No Logo Captain Smith, Defendant
No Logo Captain Williams, Defendant
No Logo Commissioner Warren, Defendant
No Logo Coordinator Reddick, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Morgan David Kunz +1 212 356 2357 +1 212 788 9776 Morgan.Kunz@gmail.com
No Logo Coordinator Zayas, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Morgan David Kunz +1 212 356 2357 +1 212 788 9776 Morgan.Kunz@gmail.com
No Logo Counselor Glavine, Defendant
No Logo Davis, Defendant
No Logo Dep Lemon, Defendant
No Logo Dep Warden Ramos, Defendant
No Logo California Department of Transportation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Department of Transportation"
No Logo Former Judge Gibbons, Defendant
No Logo Former Judge Brenda Solof, Defendant
No Logo Former Judge Robert H. Strauss, Defendant
No Logo Gaynor, Defendant
No Logo Gladden, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Morgan David Kunz +1 212 356 2357 +1 212 788 9776 Morgan.Kunz@gmail.com
No Logo Glavine, Defendant
No Logo GMDC Sec, Defendant
No Logo Goldberg, Defendant
No Logo Gray, Defendant
No Logo Green, Defendant
No Logo Grievance Chairman Moultrie, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Morgan David Kunz +1 212 356 2357 +1 212 788 9776 Morgan.Kunz@gmail.com
No Logo Grievance Chairman Kevin Guerrant, Defendant
No Logo Hawkins, Defendant
No Logo Hora Hard, Defendant
No Logo James, Defendant
No Logo Kalber, Defendant
No Logo Knight, Defendant
No Logo Lemon, Defendant
Bloomberg, Michael Rubens Bloomberg, Michael Rubens, Defendant
Officially listed as "Mayor Bloomberg"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Morgan David Kunz +1 212 356 2357 +1 212 788 9776 Morgan.Kunz@gmail.com
No Logo McCrary, Defendant
No Logo McDuffy, Defendant
No Logo Mcleod, Defendant
No Logo Miller, Defendant
No Logo Moultree, Defendant
No Logo Murphy, Defendant
No Logo NYC DOC, Defendant
No Logo NYC DOC Commissioner Martin Horn, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Morgan David Kunz +1 212 356 2357 +1 212 788 9776 Morgan.Kunz@gmail.com
No Logo NYC Government, Defendant
No Logo OBCC Captain Jumott, Defendant
No Logo OBCC Captain McDuffy, Defendant
No Logo OBCC Captain Moore, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Morgan David Kunz +1 212 356 2357 +1 212 788 9776 Morgan.Kunz@gmail.com
No Logo OBCC Captain Richards, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Morgan David Kunz +1 212 356 2357 +1 212 788 9776 Morgan.Kunz@gmail.com
No Logo OBCC Health Adm. & Intake 7-3 Staff, Defendant
No Logo OBCC Warden Horahand, Defendant
No Logo Paul Zigler, Defendant
No Logo Pena, Defendant
No Logo People for the State of New York, Defendant
No Logo Peter Ricther, Defendant
No Logo Podiatrist Goldberg, Defendant
No Logo Pollaro, Defendant
No Logo Ramos, Defendant
No Logo Rec Guard James, Defendant
No Logo Rec Guard Pollaro, Defendant
No Logo Rec Officer Knight, Defendant
No Logo Retired C.O. Maldonado, Defendant
No Logo Richard Sewel, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Belvue Hospital Podiatrist/Orthropedic Surgeon Morgan David Kunz +1 212 356 2357 +1 212 788 9776 Morgan.Kunz@gmail.com
No Logo Salamon, Defendant
No Logo Sanchez, Defendant
No Logo Smith, Defendant
No Logo Steve Lyons, Defendant
No Logo Stuart Singer, Defendant
No Logo Thorn, Defendant
No Logo Warden Lorquet, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Morgan David Kunz +1 212 356 2357 +1 212 788 9776 Morgan.Kunz@gmail.com
No Logo Warden Hora Hard, Defendant
No Logo Warren, Defendant
No Logo Warren Bailey, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
GMDC
TERMINATED: 03/09/2009 Morgan David Kunz +1 212 356 2357 +1 212 788 9776 Morgan.Kunz@gmail.com
No Logo Williams, Defendant
Office Foley Square
Filed 10/15/2007
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 555 - Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County Queens
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags PLRA, R33.2
  Entries (109) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER: Accordingly, the Clerk of the Court is directed to close any open motions including plaintiffs Motion in Opposition to Defendants' Motion of Untimeliness (Document # 100). (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 9/14/2009) (jfe) (Entered: 09/14/2009)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 8/24/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SETTLEMENT AND DISCONTINUANCE, that the above-referenced action is hereby dismissed, with prejudice, and without costs, expenses, or fees in excess of the amount specified in paragraph "2" below. Defendant City of New York hereby agrees to pay plaintiff ROY TAYLOR, the sum of TWELVE THOUSAND FIVE HUNDRED DOLLARS ($12,500.00) in full satisfaction of all claims made against the defendants, including claims for costs, expenses, and attorney fees. Additional relief as set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 8/24/09) (pl) (Entered: 08/24/2009)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 6/11/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Morgan D. Kunz dated 6/10/2009 re: Defendants respectfully request that: (l) plaintiff be ordered to attend a deposition on June 17, 2009; (2) discovery be extended until June 17, 2009 for the limited purpose of taking plaintiff's deposition; and (3) this case be dismissed for failure to prosecute if plaintiff fails to attend the June 17,2009 deposition. ENDORSEMENT: Defendants' request is granted. Plaintiff is directed to present himself for deposition by no later than July 24, 2009. The discovery deadline will be extended until July 24, 2009. Failure of the plaintiff to do so may be granted for dismissal of this action. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 6/11/2009) (jfe) (Entered: 06/11/2009)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 6/5/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Morgan D. Kunz dated 6/4/09 re: Defendants respectfully request that discovery be extended for two days, from 6/2/09 until 6/10/09, for the limited purpose of taking plaintiff's deposition. ENDORSEMENT: Request granted. The discovery cut-off is extended to and including June 10, 2009. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 6/5/09) (tro) (Entered: 06/05/2009)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 4/15/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on March 9, 2009 @ 3;07 p.m. before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. (jab) (Entered: 04/29/2009)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 4/15/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Morgan D. Kunz dated 4/13/09 re: Defendants respectfully request that: (1) discovery be held in abeyance pending plaintiff's release from custody; (2) plaintiff be required to notify the Court and defendants immediately upon his release; and (3) discovery be extended until 30 days after plaintiff notifies the court and defendants of his release. ENDORSEMENT: Defendants' requests are granted. Discovery is hereby stayed pending plaintiff's release from custody and shall re-commence within 30 days of his release. Plaintiff shall notify Chambers and counsel of his release. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 4/15/09) (tro) (Entered: 04/22/2009)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 3/31/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Corrected Motion Opposition to defendants motion of untimeliness to FRCP Rule 45 & Motion in Limine. Document filed by Roy Taylor.(dle) (Entered: 04/09/2009)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL DISCONTINUING THIS ACTION AS TO SPECIFIC DEFENDANTS AND CAUSES OF ACTION, that Plaintiff agrees to dismiss, with prejudice, any and all claims alleged in theamended complaint, or that could be brought in this action, as against the defendants that are set forth in this order. Plaintiff agrees to dismiss this action, with prejudice, in connection with any and all of the claims in the manner that is set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 3/9/09) (pl) (Entered: 03/10/2009)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  ORDER, that for the reasons stated on the record at today's conference, and pursuant to the Stipulation and Order of Dismissal dated March 9, 2009, the following motions are hereby closed: motion to dismiss filed by defendant Stuart R. Singer (Document # 70); motion to dismiss filed by defendant Peter Mitchell (Document # 80); and plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time (Document # 91). The Clerk of the Court is directed to close these motions. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 3/9/09) (pl) (Entered: 03/10/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint served. Callaghan served on 2/13/2009, answer due 3/5/2009. Service was accepted by Det Cavallo. Document filed by Roy Taylor. (mro) (Entered: 03/10/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED as to Sanchez. Attempted Service of Summons and Amended Complaint. Service was attempted on 2/13/09. Document filed by Roy Taylor. (mro) (Entered: 03/10/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED as to Richard Sewel. Attempted Service of Summons and Amended Complaint. Service was attempted on 2/24/09. Document filed by Roy Taylor. (mro) (Entered: 03/10/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint served. Brautigam served on 2/13/2009, answer due 3/5/2009. Service was accepted by Det Cavallo. Document filed by Roy Taylor. (mro) (Entered: 03/10/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint served. Bloomberg served on 2/13/2009, answer due 3/5/2009. Service was accepted by D. Aronov (clerk). Document filed by Roy Taylor. (mro) (Entered: 03/10/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 3/6/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              ANSWER to Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Richard Sewel, Warren Bailey, Bloomberg, Lorquet, Martin Horn, Moore, Richards, Gladden, Blackmore, Reddick, Zayas, Moultrie, C.O. Brutts, C.O. Saunderson, McLeod, Gray, Miller, Pena, Callaghan, Brautigam.(Kunz, Morgan) (Entered: 03/06/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                MOTION for Extension of Time. Document filed by Roy Taylor.(djc) (Entered: 03/02/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 2/23/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Sheindlin from MOrgan D. Kunz dated 2/20/09 re: Counsel requests an extension of time to respond to plaintiffs amended complaint until March 6, 2009. ENDORSEMENT: The City defendants request is hereby granted. The City defendants shall have until March 6, 2009 to answer or otherwise respond to the amended complaint. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 2/23/09) (mme) (Entered: 02/23/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 2/5/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Motion, Declaration of Daniel C. Folchetti and Memorandum of Law in Support served on Roy Taylor on February 2, 2009. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Stuart Singer. (Folchetti, Daniel) (Entered: 02/05/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 2/2/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement*. Referred to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 1/29/2009) (jfe) (Entered: 02/02/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 2/2/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of NOTICE OF MOTION, AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT AND MEMO OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS served on RON TAYLOR on 01/30/2009. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Peter Mitchell. (Scher, William) (Entered: 02/02/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 1/29/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE. Stuart Singer served on 12/24/2008, answer due 1/13/2009. Service was accepted by Daniel Folchetti, Esq.. Document filed by Roy Taylor. (djc) (Entered: 01/30/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            PRO SE MEMORANDUM dated 12/31/08 re: CHANGE OF ADDRESS for Roy Taylor. New Address: 30th Street Men's Shelter, 400-430 E. 30th Street, New York, New York, 10016. (js) (Entered: 01/30/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 1/27/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint, served. Gray(DOC) served on 1/14/2009, answer due 2/3/2009. Service was accepted by Captain Lemon. Document filed by Roy Taylor. (djc) (Entered: 01/29/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 1/28/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 80 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Peter Mitchell. (Scher, William) (Entered: 01/28/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 1/28/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  AFFIRMATION of William G. Scher in Support re: 80 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Peter Mitchell. (Scher, William) (Entered: 01/28/2009)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 1/28/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    AFFIRMATION of Gregg Weinstock in Support re: 80 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Peter Mitchell. (Scher, William) (Entered: 01/28/2009)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 1/28/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Peter Mitchell. Return Date set for 2/6/2009 at 09:00 AM.(Scher, William) (Entered: 01/28/2009)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 77 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Peter Mitchell. (Scher, William) Modified on 1/27/2009 (jar). (Entered: 01/26/2009)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - AFFIRMATION of William G. Scher in Support re: 77 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Peter Mitchell. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Exhibit 1: Regarding Electronic Filing of Exhibit)(Scher, William) Modified on 1/27/2009 (jar). (Entered: 01/26/2009)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Peter Mitchell. Return Date set for 2/6/2009 at 09:00 AM.(Scher, William) Modified on 1/27/2009 (jar). (Entered: 01/26/2009)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 1/23/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 75 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. Document filed by Peter Mitchell. (Scher, William) Modified on 1/26/2009 (jar). (Entered: 01/23/2009)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 1/23/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. Document filed by Peter Mitchell. Return Date set for 2/6/2009 at 09:00 AM. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit #1: Affirmation concerning Exhibit, # 2 Affidavit Affidavit in Support)(Scher, William) Modified on 1/26/2009 (jar). (Entered: 01/23/2009)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 1/16/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE. Peter Mitchell served on 12/30/2008, answer due 1/20/2009. Service was accepted by Peter Mitchell. Document filed by Roy Taylor. (djc) (Entered: 01/22/2009)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 1/21/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff file opposition papers, if any, to defendant's motion by February 20, 2009. All papers must be sent to this Court's Pro Se Office at 500 Pearl Street, Room 230, New York, NY 10007, and must be served upon defendant's counsel. If plaintiff submits opposition papers, defendant's reply is due March 6, 2009. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, the Court will decide the motion solely on the papers submitted by defendant. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 1/21/09) (mme) (Entered: 01/21/2009)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 1/21/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 70 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint as asserted against Stuart R. Singer, Esq... Document filed by Stuart Singer. (Folchetti, Daniel) (Entered: 01/21/2009)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 1/21/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        DECLARATION of Daniel C. Folchetti, Esq. in Support re: 70 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint as asserted against Stuart R. Singer, Esq... Document filed by Stuart Singer. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Folchetti, Daniel) (Entered: 01/21/2009)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 1/21/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          FIRST MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint as asserted against Stuart R. Singer, Esq.. Document filed by Stuart Singer. Responses due by 2/9/2009 Return Date set for 2/9/2009 at 09:30 AM.(Folchetti, Daniel) (Entered: 01/21/2009)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint, served. Ada Isabelle Redman served on 11/28/2008, answer due 12/18/2008. Service was accepted by David Young Supervisor. Document filed by Roy Taylor. (djc) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint, served. Service was accepted by Captain Lemon, #802. Document filed by Roy Taylor. (djc) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint, served. Pena served on 11/22/2008, answer due 12/12/2008. Service was accepted by Captain Lemon #802. Document filed by Roy Taylor. (djc) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint served. Lorquet served on 11/28/2008, answer due 12/18/2008. Service was accepted by Captain Lemen, #802. Document filed by Roy Taylor. (djc) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint served. Roy Taylor served on 11/28/2008, answer due 12/18/2008. Service was accepted by Captain Lemon #802. Document filed by Roy Taylor. (djc) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint served. Martin Horn served on 11/28/2008, answer due 12/18/2008. Service was accepted by Officer Slade-Meekins #14005. Document filed by Roy Taylor. (djc) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED as to Roy Taylor. Attempted Service of Summons and Amended Complaint. Service was attempted on 12/8/08. Document filed by Roy Taylor. (djc) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Roy Taylor served on 12/8/2008, answer due 12/28/2008. Service was accepted by R. Lopez. Document filed by Roy Taylor. (djc) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED as to Steve Lyons. Attempted Service of Summons and Amended Complaint. Service was attempted on 12/8/08. Document filed by Roy Taylor. (djc) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED as to Thorn. Attempted Service of Summons and Amended Complaint. Service was attempted on 12/8/08. Document filed by Roy Taylor. (djc) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED as to Williams. Attempted Service of Summons and Amended Complaint. Service was attempted on 12/8/08. Document filed by Roy Taylor. (djc) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED as to Davis. Attempted Service of Summons and Amended Complaint. Service was attempted on 12/8/08. Document filed by Roy Taylor. (djc) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED as to Battle. Attempted Service of Summons and Amended Complaint. Service was attempted on 12/8/08. Document filed by Roy Taylor. (djc) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED as to C.O. Brutts. Attempted Service of Summons and Amended Complaint. Service was attempted on 12/8/08. Document filed by Roy Taylor. (djc) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED as to McCrary(GMDC). Attempted Service of Summons and Amended Complaint. Service was attempted on 12/8/08. Document filed by Roy Taylor. (djc) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED as to McCrary(GMDC). Attempted Service of Summons and Amended Complaint. Service was attempted on 12/8/08. Document filed by Roy Taylor. (djc) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint, served. C.O. Saunderson served on 12/8/2008, answer due 12/28/2008. Service was accepted by Captain Rembert. Document filed by Roy Taylor. (djc) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED as to Williams. Attempted Service of Summons and Amended Complaint. Service was attempted on 12/8/08. Document filed by Roy Taylor. (djc) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED as to Horahand. Attempted Service of Summons and Amended Complaint. Service was attempted on 12/8/08. Document filed by Roy Taylor. (djc) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED as to McDuffy. Attempted Service of Summons and Amended Complaint, Service was attempted on 12/8/08. Document filed by Roy Taylor. (djc) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED as to Jumott. Attempted Service of Summons and Amended Complaint, Service was attempted on 12/8/08. Document filed by Roy Taylor. (djc) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED as to Gary Gason. Attempted Service of Summons and Amended Complaint, Service was attempted on 12/8/08. Document filed by Roy Taylor. (djc) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint, served. Moultrie served on 12/8/2008, answer due 12/28/2008. Service was accepted by Captain Seymour. Document filed by Roy Taylor. (djc) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint, served. Moore served on 12/8/2008, answer due 12/28/2008. Service was accepted by Captain Hewitt. Document filed by Roy Taylor. (djc) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint, served. Gladden served on 12/8/2008, answer due 12/28/2008. Service was accepted by Captain Hewitt. Document filed by Roy Taylor. (djc) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint, served. Blackmore served on 12/8/2008, answer due 12/28/2008. Service was accepted by Captain Hewitt. Document filed by Roy Taylor. (djc) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint, served. Zayas served on 12/8/2008, answer due 12/28/2008. Service was accepted by Captain Hewitt. Document filed by Roy Taylor. (djc) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint, served. Reddick served on 12/8/2008, answer due 12/28/2008. Service was accepted by Captain Hewitt. Document filed by Roy Taylor. (djc) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/16/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 40 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Peter Mitchell. (Scher, William) Modified on 1/20/2009 (jar). (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/16/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Peter Mitchell. Return Date set for 2/2/2009 at 09:30 AM. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Attesting to why exhibit cannot be electroncially filed)(Scher, William) Modified on 1/20/2009 (jar). (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint, served. Richards served on 12/8/2008, answer due 12/28/2008. Service was accepted by Capt. Hewitt. Document filed by Richards. (djc) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/15/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER Given the number of defendants in this action, the Clerk of the Court is directed to designate this case as an ECF case. Defense counsel are directed to familiarize themselves with the Courts ECF rules and adhere to them henceforth. Plaintiff, who is proceedings pro se, shall continue to submit and receive paper filings. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 1/15/09) (mme) (Entered: 01/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/3/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 2 PLRA Sec. 7(2)(g)(2) Complaint, PLRA Sec. 7(2)(g)(2) Complaint, PLRA Sec. 7(2)(g)(2) Complaint against Bloomberg, Ada Isabelle Redman, Robert H. Strauss, Brenda Solof, Gibbons, Lorquet, Maldonado, Martin Horn, Horahand, Jumott, Moore, McDuffy, Richards, Gladden, Blackmore, Gary Gason, Reddick, Zayas, Kevin Guerrant, Moultrie, Peter Mitchell, Richard Sewel, Warren Bailey, McCrary(GMDC), C.O. Brutts, C.O. Saunderson, Williams, Williams(GRVC), Thorn, Battle, Davis, McLeod, Green, Steve Lyons, Gray(DOC), Stuart Singer, Gray, Miller, Pena, Sanchez, Callaghan, Brautigam.Document filed by Roy Taylor. Related document: 2 PLRA Sec. 7(2)(g)(2) Complaint, PLRA Sec. 7(2)(g)(2) Complaint, PLRA Sec. 7(2)(g)(2) Complaint filed by Roy Taylor.(dle) (Entered: 10/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 34 Filed: 8/29/2008, Entered: 8/29/2008 Order Removing Case from SuspenseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER: The Clerk of the Court is directed to reinstate the above-captioned cases to my active docket. The final pre-trial conference is scheduled for 3/18/2009, and will be held in Courtroom 15C. The parties are directed to promptly contact my Chambers in case of any discovery disputes. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 8/29/2008) (tve) Modified on 9/3/2008 (tve).
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/3/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER: The Clerk of the Court is directed to accept the attached Amended Complaint for filing. The Pro Se Office is instructed to send plaintiff a new mailing package so that he can effect service through the U.S. Marshals. Defendants' Answer will be due thirty days after the service is completed. The Clerk of the Court is further directed to close plaintiff's motion to amend complaint (Document #32). (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 10/2/08) (tro) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 33 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: 8/28/2008 Order on Application for the Court to Request CounCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying [31] Application for the Court to Request Counsel. For the reasons set forth herein, Taylor's application for appointment of counsel is denied. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 8/26/08) (tro)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/4/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 7/29/08 before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. (ama) (Entered: 09/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 32 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Amend/Correct [2] PLRA Sec. 7(2)(g)(2) Complaint, PLRA Sec. 7(2)(g)(2) Complaint, PLRA Sec. 7(2)(g)(2) Complaint. Document filed by Roy Taylor.(djc)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 31 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: 8/18/2008, Terminated: 8/27/2008 Application for Court to Request Counsel
                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION for the Court to Request Counsel. Document filed by Roy Taylor.(dle)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 30 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: 7/31/2008 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER:SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties hereby submit the following information as required by the Order: The date of the conference and the appearances for the parties, July 29, 2008 at 2:30 p.m. Time when discovery is to be completed: (mid-March). The defendant's request 6 months form the filling of the answer for discovery. The parties will submit a pre-trial order in a form conforming with the Court's instructions together with trial briefs: (mid-May). The final pre-trial conference to F.R.C.P. 16(d), to be filed in by the Court at the conference: March 18 at 4:30. The defendant's anticipate that the trial would last between 3 and 4 days by jury. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 7/29/2008) (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 7/29/08) (rw)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 29 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: 7/7/2008 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: The City Defendants are hereby order to produce any photographs relevant to plaintiff's request, in their possession, within thirty (30) days of this Order. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close the above-referenced motions (Documents #25, 26, 27 & 28). The City Defendants are directed to notify Chambers once plaintiff's criminal cases have been resolved. A conference is scheduled for July 28, 2008, at 4:30 p.m. in Courtroom 15C.. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 7/3/08) (tro)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: 7/7/2008 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                                                                                                              Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference set for 7/28/2008 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 15C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. (tro)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 28 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/18/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for an order requesting a Restraining Order. Document filed by Roy Taylor.(pl)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 27 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/18/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for an order for Extension of Time until 5/20/08 to fulfill request relief and also request permission to drop certain defendants and add certain defendants. Document filed by Roy Taylor.(pl)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 26 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/18/2008 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for an order to Stay or dismiss particular claims and preserve right to bring claim at later time. Document filed by Roy Taylor.(pl)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 25 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/18/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for an order to voluntarily dismiss defendants in particular and add particular defendants in this action. Document filed by Roy Taylor.(pl)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 24 Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: 3/17/2008 Marshal's Process Receipt and Return of Service Ex
                                                                                                                                                                        MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED Summons and PLRA Sec. 7(2)(g)(2) Complaint, PLRA Sec. 7(2)(g)(2) Complaint, PLRA Sec. 7(2)(g)(2) Complaint served as to Podiatry/Orthopedic Surgery Dept. Belleue Hospital. Service was accepted by L. Butler. Document filed by Roy Taylor. (djc)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 23 Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: 3/17/2008 Marshal's Process Receipt and Return of Service Ex
                                                                                                                                                                          MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED Summons and PLRA Sec. 7(2)(g)(2) Complaint, PLRA Sec. 7(2)(g)(2) Complaint, PLRA Sec. 7(2)(g)(2) Complaint served as to People Office of Dist. atty Manhattan County D.A. Repman. Service was accepted by Ms D. Young. Document filed by Roy Taylor. (djc)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 22 Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: 3/17/2008 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Morgan D. Kunz dated 3/13/08 re: City defendants request that the Court stay this matter, in its entirety, pending the disposition of plaintiff's criminal cases. ENDORSEMENT: This case is hereby placed on the Court's suspense docket. Defendants' counsel is ordered to update this Court every three months as to the status of the underlying prosecutions. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 3/14/08) (js)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 21 Filed: 3/7/2008, Entered: 3/11/2008 Marshal's Process Receipt and Return of Service Ex
                                                                                                                                                                              MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED Summons and PLRA Sec. 7(2)(g)(2) Complaint, PLRA Sec. 7(2)(g)(2) Complaint, PLRA Sec. 7(2)(g)(2) Complaint served. Gray served on 3/4/2008, answer due 3/24/2008. Service was accepted by Capt. Lemon. Document filed by Roy Taylor. (dle)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 20 Filed: 3/7/2008, Entered: 3/11/2008 Marshal's Process Receipt and Return of Service Un
                                                                                                                                                                                MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED as to Sanchez. Attempted Service of Summons and PLRA Sec. 7(2)(g)(2) Complaint, PLRA Sec. 7(2)(g)(2) Complaint, PLRA Sec. 7(2)(g)(2) Complaint. Service was attempted on 3/4/08. Document filed by Roy Taylor. (dle)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 19 Filed: 3/7/2008, Entered: 3/11/2008 Marshal's Process Receipt and Return of Service Un
                                                                                                                                                                                  MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED as to Callaghan. Attempted Service of Summons and PLRA Sec. 7(2)(g)(2) Complaint, PLRA Sec. 7(2)(g)(2) Complaint, PLRA Sec. 7(2)(g)(2) Complaint. Service was attempted on 3/7/08. Document filed by Roy Taylor. (dle)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 18 Filed: 3/7/2008, Entered: 3/11/2008 Marshal's Process Receipt and Return of Service Un
                                                                                                                                                                                    MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED as to Brautigam. Attempted Service of Summons and PLRA Sec. 7(2)(g)(2) Complaint, PLRA Sec. 7(2)(g)(2) Complaint, PLRA Sec. 7(2)(g)(2) Complaint. Service was attempted on 3/4/08. Document filed by Roy Taylor. (dle)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 17 Filed: 3/7/2008, Entered: 3/11/2008 Marshal's Process Receipt and Return of Service Ex
                                                                                                                                                                                      MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED Summons and PLRA Sec. 7(2)(g)(2) Complaint, PLRA Sec. 7(2)(g)(2) Complaint, PLRA Sec. 7(2)(g)(2) Complaint served. Miller served on 3/4/2008, answer due 3/24/2008. Service was accepted by Capt. Lemon. Document filed by Roy Taylor. (dle)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 16 Filed: 3/7/2008, Entered: 3/11/2008 Marshal's Process Receipt and Return of Service Un
                                                                                                                                                                                        MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED as to Warren. Attempted Service of Summons and PLRA Sec. 7(2)(g)(2) Complaint, PLRA Sec. 7(2)(g)(2) Complaint, PLRA Sec. 7(2)(g)(2) Complaint. Service was attempted on 3/4/08. Document filed by Roy Taylor. (dle)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 3/7/2008, Entered: 3/11/2008 Marshal's Process Receipt and Return of Service Ex
                                                                                                                                                                                          MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED Summons and PLRA Sec. 7(2)(g)(2) Complaint, PLRA Sec. 7(2)(g)(2) Complaint, PLRA Sec. 7(2)(g)(2) Complaint served. NYC Government served on 3/4/2008, answer due 3/24/2008. Service was accepted by S. Bonit. Document filed by Roy Taylor. (dle)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 14 Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: 3/4/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IN A PRO SE ACTION, a pretrial conference has been scheduled for 3/21/08, at 3:45pm, and as further set forth in this document. ( Pretrial Conference set for 3/21/2008 at 03:45 PM in Courtroom 15C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin.) (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 3/3/08) Copies sent by chambers.(cd)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: 2/27/2008 Marshal's Process Receipt and Return of Service Ex
                                                                                                                                                                                              MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED Summons and PLRA Sec. 7(2)(g)(2) Complaint, PLRA Sec. 7(2)(g)(2) Complaint, PLRA Sec. 7(2)(g)(2) Complaint served. McLeod served on 1/31/2008, answer due 2/20/2008. Service was accepted by Earl Thomas. Document filed by Roy Taylor. (djc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 12 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: 2/27/2008 Marshal's Process Receipt and Return of Service Ex
                                                                                                                                                                                                MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED Summons and PLRA Sec. 7(2)(g)(2) Complaint, PLRA Sec. 7(2)(g)(2) Complaint, PLRA Sec. 7(2)(g)(2) Complaint served. C.O. Saunderson served on 1/31/2008, answer due 2/20/2008. Service was accepted by Captain Woodard. Document filed by Roy Taylor. (djc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: 2/27/2008 Marshal's Process Receipt and Return of Service Ex
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED Summons and PLRA Sec. 7(2)(g)(2) Complaint, PLRA Sec. 7(2)(g)(2) Complaint, PLRA Sec. 7(2)(g)(2) Complaint served. Warren Bailey served on 1/31/2008, answer due 2/20/2008. Service was accepted by R. Lopez. Document filed by Roy Taylor. (djc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 5 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: 2/19/2008 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Michael Chestnov dated 2/14/2008 re: requesting an extension from February 20, 2008 until April 4, 2008. ENDORSEMENT: Request granted. Defendants time to move or answer is extended to and including April 4, 2008. This will not affect the scheduling of the initial conference. So Ordered., Warren Bailey answer due 4/4/2008; NYC Government answer due 4/4/2008. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 2/19/2008) (jpo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 10 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: 2/26/2008 Marshal's Process Receipt and Return of Service Un
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED as to McDuffy. Attempted Service of Summons and PLRA Sec. 7(2)(g)(2) Complaint, PLRA Sec. 7(2)(g)(2) Complaint, PLRA Sec. 7(2)(g)(2) Complaint. Service was attempted on 1/31/08. Document filed by Roy Taylor. (djc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 9 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: 2/26/2008 Marshal's Process Receipt and Return of Service Un
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED as to James. Attempted Service of Summons and PLRA Sec. 7(2)(g)(2) Complaint, PLRA Sec. 7(2)(g)(2) Complaint, PLRA Sec. 7(2)(g)(2) Complaint. Service was attempted on 1/31/08. Document filed by Roy Taylor. (djc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 8 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: 2/26/2008 Marshal's Process Receipt and Return of Service Un
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED as to Pollaro. Attempted Service of Summons and PLRA Sec. 7(2)(g)(2) Complaint, PLRA Sec. 7(2)(g)(2) Complaint, PLRA Sec. 7(2)(g)(2) Complaint. Service was attempted on 1/31/08. Document filed by Roy Taylor. (djc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 7 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: 2/26/2008 Marshal's Process Receipt and Return of Service Un
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED as to NYC DOC. Attempted Service of Summons and PLRA Sec. 7(2)(g)(2) Complaint, PLRA Sec. 7(2)(g)(2) Complaint, PLRA Sec. 7(2)(g)(2) Complaint. Service was attempted on 1/31/08. Document filed by Roy Taylor. (djc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 6 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: 2/26/2008 Acknowledgment of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE. NYC DOC served on 1/30/2008, answer due 2/19/2008. Service was accepted by Nareisa Pena. Document filed by Roy Taylor. (djc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: 1/15/2008 Pro Se Memorandum to Change Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                PRO SE MEMORANDUM dated 1/10/08 re: CHANGE OF ADDRESS for Roy Taylor. New Address: 349-06-15546, N.I.C. 15-00 Hazzen St., E. Elmhurst, NY, 11370. (tro)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 11/21/2007, Entered: 11/26/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: The plaintiff is directed to have the summons and complaint promptly served on the defendants by filing out and forwarding to the U.S. Marshal the forms provided to plaintiff by the Pro Se office. If service is not made upon the defendants or plaintiff fails to show good cause why such service has not been effected by February 15, 2008, the Court will dismiss the action. So Ordered. The Pro Se Clerk at the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007, telephone number (212)805-0175, may be of assistance in connection with Court procedures but cannot give legal advise. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 11/20/07) (js)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/25/2007 PLRA Sec. 7(2)(g)(2) Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against Department of Transportation, Goldberg, Richard Sewel, Warren, Warren Bailey, Murphy, McCrary(GMDC), C.O. Mariner, C.O. Brutts, C.O. Saunderson, GMDC Sec, Williams, Lemon, Ramos, Smith, Williams(GRVC), Thorn, Battle, Hawkins, Moultree, Davis, McLeod, Green, Steve Lyons, Glavine, James, Pollaro, Bell, Gray(DOC), McDuffy, Knight, OBCC Health Adm. & Intake 7-3 Staff, Hora Hard, Kalber, Salamon, Peter Ricther, Gaynor, Stuart Singer, Gray, Miller, Pena, Paul Zigler, NYC Government, People for the State of New York, NYC DOC. Reply required under Prison Litigation Reform Act Section 7(2)(g)(2)..Document filed by Roy Taylor.(db)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/25/2007 I.F.P. EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ENDORSEMENT on Declaration in Support of Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, I.F.P. REQUEST IS GRANTED. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 10/11/07) (db)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/25/2007 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS ISSUED as to Department of Transportation, Goldberg, Richard Sewel, Warren, Warren Bailey, Murphy, McCrary(GMDC), C.O. Mariner, C.O. Brutts, C.O. Saunderson, GMDC Sec, Williams, Lemon, Ramos, Smith, Williams(GRVC), Thorn, Battle, Hawkins, Moultree, Davis, McLeod, Green, Steve Lyons, Glavine, James, Pollaro, Bell, Gray(DOC), McDuffy, Knight, OBCC Health Adm. & Intake 7-3 Staff, Hora Hard, Kalber, Salamon, Peter Ricther, Gaynor, Stuart Singer, Gray, Miller, Pena, Paul Zigler, NYC Government, People for the State of New York, NYC DOC. (db)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/25/2007 Case Designation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Magistrate Judge James C. Francis, IV is so designated. (db)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 96 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?