TRUMP v. THOMPSON et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:21-cv-02769-TSC
District Judge Tanya S. Chutkan, presiding

Tags
Last Updated January 21, 2022 at 7:09 PM EST (1.3 days ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
Trump, Donald J. Trump, Donald J., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "DONALD J. TRUMP"
Officer/Director, Riviera Holdings Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Binnall, Jesse R.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jesse R Binnall +1 703 888 1943 jesse@binnall.com
v.
No Logo BENNIE G. THOMPSON, Defendant
No Logo DAVID S. FERRIERO, Defendant
National Archives & Records Administration National Archives & Records Administration, Defendant
No Logo United States House Select Committee to Investigate the January 6th Attack on the United States Capitol, Defendant
Office Washington, DC
Filed 10/18/2021
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 44 U.S.C. § 2107 Presidential Recordings and Materials Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 88888
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (65) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/21/2022, Entered: None Extension of Time to
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/21/2022, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document 36 Filed: 11/9/2021, Entered: 11/9/2021 Order on Motion for Preliminary InjunctionCourt Filing
      ORDER denying [5] Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/09/2021. (lcwk)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/20/2022, Entered: None USCA Mandate
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document 35 Filed: 11/9/2021, Entered: 11/9/2021 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
          MEMORANDUM AND OPINION re Plaintiff's [5] Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/09/2021. (lcwk)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/15/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time to
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank  Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction
              MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiffs' [34] Emergency Motion for a Stay is hereby DENIED without prejudice. Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 62(d) allows temporary injunctive relief "[w]hile an appeal is pending from an interlocutory order or final judgment." This court has not yet entered any such interlocutory order or final judgment and thus a request for relief under Rule 62(d), which plainly requires an interlocutory order or final judgment before considering such motions, is premature. The court intends to rule expeditiously in this matter, and will consider a Rule 62(d) motion for a stay from the non-prevailing party following its ruling. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/09/2021. (lcac)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/16/2021, Entered: None USCA Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document 34 Filed: 11/8/2021, Entered: 11/8/2021, Terminated: 11/9/2021 Motion for preliminary injunction
                  Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal, or Administrative Injunction by DONALD J. TRUMP. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Binnall, Jesse)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/14/2021, Entered: None Order
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank  Motion Hearing
                      Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 11/4/2021 before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan: re [5] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Expedited Hearing filed by DONALD J. TRUMP; motion heard and taken under advisement. (Court Reporter Sara Wick) (tb)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/13/2021, Entered: None Order
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document 33 Filed: 11/3/2021, Entered: 11/4/2021 Reply to opposition to Motion
                          Amended REPLY to opposition to motion re [5] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Expedited Hearing filed by DONALD J. TRUMP. (znmw)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/10/2021, Entered: None Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document 32 Filed: 11/3/2021, Entered: 11/3/2021 Notice of appearance
                              NOTICE of Appearance by Mary B. McCord on behalf of BENNIE G. THOMPSON, UNITED STATES HOUSE SELECT COMMITTEE TO INVESTIGATE THE JANUARY 6TH ATTACK ON THE UNITED STATES CAPITOL (McCord, Mary)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/10/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document 31 Filed: 11/3/2021, Entered: 11/3/2021, Terminated: 11/3/2021 motion to amend/correct
                                  Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct [30] Reply to opposition to Motion for a Preliminary Injunction by DONALD J. TRUMP. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Corrected Reply Brief, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Binnall, Jesse)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/10/2021, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Blank  Order on motion to amend/correct
                                      MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff's [31] Consent Motion to Amend/Correct Reply to Opposition to Motion for a Preliminary Injunction is hereby GRANTED. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/03/2021. (lcwk)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/10/2021, Entered: None Transcript
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document 30 Filed: 11/2/2021, Entered: 11/2/2021 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                          REPLY to opposition to motion re [5] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Expedited Hearing filed by DONALD J. TRUMP. (Binnall, Jesse)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/10/2021, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document 29 Filed: 11/2/2021, Entered: 11/2/2021 Notice of appearance
                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Wilfred Mead on behalf of BENNIE G. THOMPSON, UNITED STATES HOUSE SELECT COMMITTEE TO INVESTIGATE THE JANUARY 6TH ATTACK ON THE UNITED STATES CAPITOL (Mead, Joseph)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/10/2021, Entered: None Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document 28 Filed: 11/2/2021, Entered: 11/2/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER denying James Murray leave to appear as amicus. The Clerk of the court shall mail a copy of this Order to the movant at his address of record. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/2/21. (Attachments: # (1) ) (DJS)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/10/2021, Entered: None Preliminary Injunction
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/2/2021, Entered: 11/2/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER: Denying leave to file attached document by Third-Party Kevin Cassaday. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/2/21. (Attachments: # (1) ) (DJS)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/9/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                          MINUTE ORDER: Granting in part and denying in part [22] Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Justin R. Clark may be heard in open court on behalf of Plaintiff, but may not file papers in this court. See Local Civil Rule 83.2(c)(2) ("An attorney who engages in the practice of law from an office located in the District of Columbia must be a member of the District of Columbia Bar AND the Bar of this Court to file papers in this Court."). Upon submission of an application to the bar of this court, Clark may file a renewed motion (without paying an additional fee), at which time the court will remove the prohibition against filing papers in this court. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/2/21. (DJS)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank  Order
                                                            MINUTE ORDER: Before the court is the third proffered filing by non-party Kevin Cassaday. The court previously denied Cassaday leave to file documents in this case because he had not established that his "position" will "not [be] adequately represented by a party" to this case. See LCvR 7(o). Cassaday's proffered filings have placed an undue burden on both the Clerk's Office and Chambers. Accordingly, the Clerk of the Court is hereby directed to refrain from docketing any letters or filings from Cassaday in this action and to discard any of his future submissions. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to: Kevin Cassady, 1804 Guenther Ave., Lansing, MI 48917. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/2/21. (DJS)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 26 Filed: 11/1/2021, Entered: 11/1/2021 Notice of appearance
                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Annie L. Owens on behalf of BENNIE G. THOMPSON, UNITED STATES HOUSE SELECT COMMITTEE TO INVESTIGATE THE JANUARY 6TH ATTACK ON THE UNITED STATES CAPITOL (Owens, Annie)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 24 Filed: 11/1/2021, Entered: 11/1/2021, Terminated: 11/1/2021 motion for extension of time to file
                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amici Curiae Brief by JASON BARON, NORMAN EISEN, LOUIS FISHER, GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY PROJECT, GOVERNMENT INFORMATION WATCH, HEIDI KITROSSER, NATIONAL SECURITY COUNSELORS, MARK J. ROZELL, MITCHEL A. SOLLENBERGER. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(McClanahan, Kelly)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank  order on motion for extension of time to file
                                                                  MINUTE ORDER: The unopposed [24] Motion for Extension of Time to File Amici Curiae Brief by Jason Baron, Norman Eisen, Louis Fisher, Government Accountability Project, Government Information Watch, Heidi Kitrosser, National Security Counselors, Mark J. Rozell, and Mitchel A. Sollenberger is GRANTED; no party is prejudiced by the delayed filing, as evidenced by the fact that they do not oppose the extension. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/01/2021. (lcwk)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 23 Filed: 10/30/2021, Entered: 10/31/2021 Amicus Brief
                                                                    AMICUS BRIEF in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction by LOUIS FISHER, GOVERNMENT INFORMATION WATCH, NATIONAL SECURITY COUNSELORS, GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY PROJECT, JASON BARON, NORMAN EISEN, HEIDI KITROSSER, MARK J. ROZELL, MITCHEL A. SOLLENBERGER. (McClanahan, Kelly)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 22 Filed: 10/30/2021, Entered: 10/30/2021, Terminated: 11/2/2021 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                      MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Justin R. Clark, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8834098. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DONALD J. TRUMP. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Binnall, Jesse)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 21 Filed: 10/30/2021, Entered: 10/30/2021 Response to motion
                                                                        RESPONSE re [5] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Expedited Hearing filed by DAVID S. FERRIERO, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Proposed Order)(Shapiro, Elizabeth)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 20 Filed: 10/30/2021, Entered: 10/30/2021, Terminated: 10/30/2021 motion for extension of time to file response/reply
                                                                          Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Nunc Pro Tunc by DAVID S. FERRIERO, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Shapiro, Elizabeth)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank  Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / Reply
                                                                            MINUTE ORDER: The National Archives and Records Administration Defendants' [20] Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply is GRANTED because the other parties are not prejudiced by the delayed filing, as evidenced by their consent to the extension. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/30/2021. (lcwk)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 25 Filed: 10/29/2021, Entered: 11/1/2021 Amicus Brief
                                                                              AMICUS BRIEF by FORMER MEMBERS OF CONGRESS. (znmw)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 19 Filed: 10/29/2021, Entered: 10/29/2021 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                Memorandum in opposition to re [5] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Expedited Hearing filed by BENNIE G. THOMPSON, UNITED STATES HOUSE SELECT COMMITTEE TO INVESTIGATE THE JANUARY 6TH ATTACK ON THE UNITED STATES CAPITOL. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Letter, Douglas)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank  order on motion for leave to file
                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER: For good cause shown, the [12] Consent Motion for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief by Louis Fisher, Government Information Watch, and National Security Counselors is hereby GRANTED; the movants shall file their brief on or before October 30, 2021. Further, for good cause shown, the [18] Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief by Former Members of Congress is hereby GRANTED. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/29/2021. (lcwk)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/28/2021, Entered: 10/28/2021, Terminated: 10/29/2021 motion for leave to file
                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by FORMER MEMBERS OF CONGRESS. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Amicus Brief, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Dunn, Owen)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/27/2021, Entered: 10/27/2021 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. BENNIE G. THOMPSON served on 10/20/2021 (Binnall, Jesse)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/27/2021, Entered: 10/27/2021 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION served on 10/20/2021 (Binnall, Jesse)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/27/2021, Entered: 10/27/2021 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DAVID S. FERRIERO served on 10/20/2021 (Binnall, Jesse)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/27/2021, Entered: 10/27/2021 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                                                            RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES HOUSE SELECT COMMITTEE TO INVESTIGATE THE JANUARY 6TH ATTACK ON THE UNITED STATES CAPITOL served on 10/20/2021 (Binnall, Jesse)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 13 Filed: 10/27/2021, Entered: 10/27/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER: Deny leave to file attached "Objection" by Third-Party Kevin Cassady. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/27/21. (Attachments: # (1) Objection) (DJS)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/26/2021, Entered: 10/26/2021, Terminated: 10/29/2021 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                Consent MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief by LOUIS FISHER, GOVERNMENT INFORMATION WATCH, NATIONAL SECURITY COUNSELORS. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(McClanahan, Kelly)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Blank  order on motion for leave to file
                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the [8] Consent Motion for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief, the motion is hereby DENIED without prejudice for failure to comply with Local Civil Rule 7(o)(2) ("A motion for leave to file an amicus brief shall concisely state the nature of the movant's interest; identify the party or parties supported, if any; and set forth the reasons why an amicus brief is desirable, why the movant's position is not adequately represented by a party, and why the matters asserted are relevant to the disposition of the case."). Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/26/2021. (lcwk)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank  set/reset deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Responses due by 10/29/2021. Replies due by 11/2/2021. Status Conference set for 11/4/2021 at 11:00 AM in Telephonic/VTC before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zjch, )
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank  Order
                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report, the court hereby ORDERS that the parties shall adhere to the following briefing schedule: Defendants shall file a joint opposition or their respective oppositions to Plaintiff's [5] motion on or before October 29, 2021, and Plaintiff shall file his reply on or before November 2, 2021, at 6:00 p.m. The court further ORDERS that a hearing is set for November 4, 2021, at 11:00 a.m. via video teleconference before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. A courtroom deputy will provide the parties with dial-in instructions by email. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/22/2021. (lcwk)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/21/2021, Entered: 10/21/2021 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Stacie Marion Fahsel on behalf of BENNIE G. THOMPSON, UNITED STATES HOUSE SELECT COMMITTEE TO INVESTIGATE THE JANUARY 6TH ATTACK ON THE UNITED STATES CAPITOL (Fahsel, Stacie)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 10 Filed: 10/21/2021, Entered: 10/21/2021 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Randal Columbus on behalf of BENNIE G. THOMPSON, UNITED STATES HOUSE SELECT COMMITTEE TO INVESTIGATE THE JANUARY 6TH ATTACK ON THE UNITED STATES CAPITOL (Columbus, Eric)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/21/2021, Entered: 10/21/2021 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Todd Barry Tatelman on behalf of BENNIE G. THOMPSON, UNITED STATES HOUSE SELECT COMMITTEE TO INVESTIGATE THE JANUARY 6TH ATTACK ON THE UNITED STATES CAPITOL (Tatelman, Todd)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 8 Filed: 10/21/2021, Entered: 10/21/2021, Terminated: 10/26/2021 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                              Consent MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief by GOVERNMENT INFORMATION WATCH, NATIONAL SECURITY COUNSELORS, LOUIS FISHER. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(McClanahan, Kelly)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/21/2021, Entered: 10/21/2021 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by James J. Gilligan on behalf of DAVID S. FERRIERO, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION (Gilligan, James)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 6 Filed: 10/21/2021, Entered: 10/21/2021 Status report
                                                                                                                  Joint STATUS REPORT by DAVID S. FERRIERO, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Shapiro, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule and Joint Status Report due by 10/21/2021. (tb)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank  Order
                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's [5] Motion for Preliminary Injunction, the court hereby directs the parties to meet and confer and file a joint status report, along with a briefing schedule regarding Plaintiff's motion, no later than October 21, 2021, at 5pm. The report shall be accompanied by a proposed order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/20/2021. (lcwk)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 5 Filed: 10/19/2021, Entered: 10/19/2021, Terminated: 11/9/2021 Motion for preliminary injunction
                                                                                                                        MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Expedited Hearing by DONALD J. TRUMP. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support, # (2) Declaration, # (3) Text of Proposed Order)(Binnall, Jesse)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 4 Filed: 10/19/2021, Entered: 10/19/2021 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth J. Shapiro on behalf of DAVID S. FERRIERO, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION (Shapiro, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 3 Filed: 10/19/2021, Entered: 10/19/2021 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas N. Letter on behalf of BENNIE G. THOMPSON, UNITED STATES HOUSE SELECT COMMITTEE TO INVESTIGATE THE JANUARY 6TH ATTACK ON THE UNITED STATES CAPITOL (Letter, Douglas)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 2 Filed: 10/19/2021, Entered: 10/19/2021 Summons Issued Electronically
                                                                                                                              SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to DAVID S. FERRIERO, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, BENNIE G. THOMPSON, UNITED STATES HOUSE SELECT COMMITTEE TO INVESTIGATE THE JANUARY 6TH ATTACK ON THE UNITED STATES CAPITOL. (Attachments: # (1) Notice and Consent)(adh, )
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank  Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                                                Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zsb)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 10/18/2021, Entered: 10/18/2021 Complaint
                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8807324) filed by DONALD J. TRUMP. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit 3, # (5) Exhibit 4, # (6) Exhibit 5, # (7) Exhibit 6, # (8) Exhibit 7, # (9) Exhibit 8, # (10) Summons, # (11) Summons, # (12) Summons, # (13) Summons)(Binnall, Jesse)
                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 41 times.

                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?