Lee et al v. Katz et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 3:00-cv-00310-PA

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Daniel Lee, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Herbert G. Grey +1 503 641 4908 +1 503 641 8757 hgrey.law1@verizon.net

Toggle Switch Represented by fights4rights.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James E. Leuenberger +1 503 542 7433 +1 503 419 6415 jim@fights4rights.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Herbert A. Terrell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Spencer M. Neal +1 503 473 8325 +1 503 295 0676 spencerneal@justice.com
No Logo Edward Gathright, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Herbert G. Grey +1 503 641 4908 +1 503 641 8757 hgrey.law1@verizon.net

Toggle Switch Represented by fights4rights.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James E. Leuenberger +1 503 542 7433 +1 503 419 6415 jim@fights4rights.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Herbert A. Terrell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Spencer M. Neal +1 503 473 8325 +1 503 295 0676 spencerneal@justice.com
No Logo Jeremy Sonnier, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Herbert G. Grey +1 503 641 4908 +1 503 641 8757 hgrey.law1@verizon.net

Toggle Switch Represented by fights4rights.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James E. Leuenberger +1 503 542 7433 +1 503 419 6415 jim@fights4rights.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Herbert A. Terrell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Spencer M. Neal +1 503 473 8325 +1 503 295 0676 spencerneal@justice.com
No Logo Michael Carr, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Herbert G. Grey +1 503 641 4908 +1 503 641 8757 hgrey.law1@verizon.net

Toggle Switch Represented by fights4rights.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James E. Leuenberger +1 503 542 7433 +1 503 419 6415 jim@fights4rights.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Herbert A. Terrell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Spencer M. Neal +1 503 473 8325 +1 503 295 0676 spencerneal@justice.com
v.
No Logo Brian Duddy, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of Portland

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harry Michael Auerbach +1 503 823 4047 +1 503 823 3089 harry.auerbach@portlandoregon.gov
Space J. Scott Moede +1 503 823 4047 +1 503 823 3089 smoede@ci.portland.or.us
No Logo Charles Jordon, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of Portland

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harry Michael Auerbach +1 503 823 4047 +1 503 823 3089 harry.auerbach@portlandoregon.gov
Space J. Scott Moede +1 503 823 4047 +1 503 823 3089 smoede@ci.portland.or.us
No Logo Curtis Chinn, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of Portland

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harry Michael Auerbach +1 503 823 4047 +1 503 823 3089 harry.auerbach@portlandoregon.gov
Space J. Scott Moede +1 503 823 4047 +1 503 823 3089 smoede@ci.portland.or.us
No Logo J M Patterson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of Portland

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harry Michael Auerbach +1 503 823 4047 +1 503 823 3089 harry.auerbach@portlandoregon.gov
Space J. Scott Moede +1 503 823 4047 +1 503 823 3089 smoede@ci.portland.or.us
No Logo James Francesconi, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of Portland

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harry Michael Auerbach +1 503 823 4047 +1 503 823 3089 harry.auerbach@portlandoregon.gov
Space J. Scott Moede +1 503 823 4047 +1 503 823 3089 smoede@ci.portland.or.us
No Logo Osha & Liang, LLP, Defendant
Officially listed as "John Montgomery"

Toggle Switch Represented by City of Portland

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harry Michael Auerbach +1 503 823 4047 +1 503 823 3089 harry.auerbach@portlandoregon.gov
Space J. Scott Moede +1 503 823 4047 +1 503 823 3089 smoede@ci.portland.or.us
No Logo Kimberly Adams, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of Portland

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harry Michael Auerbach +1 503 823 4047 +1 503 823 3089 harry.auerbach@portlandoregon.gov
Space J. Scott Moede +1 503 823 4047 +1 503 823 3089 smoede@ci.portland.or.us
No Logo Mace Winter, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of Portland

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harry Michael Auerbach +1 503 823 4047 +1 503 823 3089 harry.auerbach@portlandoregon.gov
Space J. Scott Moede +1 503 823 4047 +1 503 823 3089 smoede@ci.portland.or.us
No Logo Michael Fennell, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Schwabe, Williamson & Wyatt, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel F. Knox +1 503 796 2908 +1 503 796 2900 dknox@schwabe.com
Space Thomas M. Triplett +1 503 796 2901 +1 503 796 2900 ttriplett@schwabe.com
No Logo Oregon Arena Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Schwabe, Williamson & Wyatt, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel F. Knox +1 503 796 2908 +1 503 796 2900 dknox@schwabe.com
Space Thomas M. Triplett +1 503 796 2901 +1 503 796 2900 ttriplett@schwabe.com
No Logo Pioneer Courthouse Square Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of Portland

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harry Michael Auerbach +1 503 823 4047 +1 503 823 3089 harry.auerbach@portlandoregon.gov
Space J. Scott Moede +1 503 823 4047 +1 503 823 3089 smoede@ci.portland.or.us
No Logo Portland Rose Festival Association, Defendant
No Logo Robert Hawkins, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of Portland

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harry Michael Auerbach +1 503 823 4047 +1 503 823 3089 harry.auerbach@portlandoregon.gov
Space J. Scott Moede +1 503 823 4047 +1 503 823 3089 smoede@ci.portland.or.us
No Logo Shane Nicholson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of Portland

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harry Michael Auerbach +1 503 823 4047 +1 503 823 3089 harry.auerbach@portlandoregon.gov
Space J. Scott Moede +1 503 823 4047 +1 503 823 3089 smoede@ci.portland.or.us
No Logo Stephanie Dekoeyer, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of Portland

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harry Michael Auerbach +1 503 823 4047 +1 503 823 3089 harry.auerbach@portlandoregon.gov
Space J. Scott Moede +1 503 823 4047 +1 503 823 3089 smoede@ci.portland.or.us
No Logo Stuart Palmiter, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of Portland

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harry Michael Auerbach +1 503 823 4047 +1 503 823 3089 harry.auerbach@portlandoregon.gov
Space J. Scott Moede +1 503 823 4047 +1 503 823 3089 smoede@ci.portland.or.us
No Logo Timothy Bacon, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of Portland

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harry Michael Auerbach +1 503 823 4047 +1 503 823 3089 harry.auerbach@portlandoregon.gov
Space J. Scott Moede +1 503 823 4047 +1 503 823 3089 smoede@ci.portland.or.us
No Logo Vera Katz, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of Portland

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harry Michael Auerbach +1 503 823 4047 +1 503 823 3089 harry.auerbach@portlandoregon.gov
Space J. Scott Moede +1 503 823 4047 +1 503 823 3089 smoede@ci.portland.or.us
No Logo Portland Rose Festival Association, Claimant
Office Portland
Filed 3/2/2000
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Court Trial
County Multnomah
Terminated 6/29/2004
Origin 3
Reopened 4/1/2002
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case '04-35577'[]
Def Custody Status
Flags FRC, REOPENED, TERMINATED
  Entries (102) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 4/22/2005, Entered: 5/2/2005 Order of Dismissal of Appeal by USCA
Order from USCA for the 9th Circuit dismissing Appeal CA 04-35577 re Notice of Appeal [96]: Appellee's motion to dismiss this appeal for lack of jurisdiction is granted. (Related Document(s): Notice of Appeal, [96] ) (tomg, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 9/1/2004, Entered: 9/1/2004 Certificate of Record by Clerk to USCA
    Certificate of Record transmitted to USCA for the 9th Circuit re Notice of Appeal CA 04-35577 [96] filed by Daniel Lee on 6/30/04. (Related Document(s): Notice of Appeal, [96] ) (tomg, )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 8/9/2004, Entered: 8/9/2004 USCA Docket Number
      Notification by USCA - 9th Circuit of case number CA 04-35577 for appeal [96] filed 6/30/04. (Related Document(s): Notice of Appeal, [96] ) (tomg, )
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 7/1/2004, Entered: 7/1/2004 Notification of Appeal Sent
        Notification of Appeal mailed to USCA - 9th Circuit and to counsel along with copy of docket sheet. CADS mailed to Court of Appeals. (Related Document(s): Notice of Appeal, [96] ) (tomg, )
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 6/30/2004, Entered: 7/1/2004 Representation Statement
          Representation Statement. Filed by plaintiffs. (Related Document(s): Notice of Appeal, [96] ) (tomg, )
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 6/30/2004, Entered: 7/1/2004, Terminated: 4/22/2005 Notice of Appeal
            Notice of Appeal To USCA - 9th Circuit from Amended Findings Of Fact entered 6/2/04 and from Final Judgment entered 6/29/04. Filing fee in amount of $255.00 collected; Receipt No. 176692 issued. Filed by plaintiffs. (Related Document(s): Findings of Fact[93], Judgment[95] ) (tomg, )
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 6/29/2004, Entered: 6/29/2004 Judgment*Court Filing
              Final Judgment: Based upon the record, judgment is entered in favor of defendants and against plaintiffs. Signed on 6/28/04 by Judge Owen M. Panner. (mja, )
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 6/2/2004, Entered: 6/2/2004 Findings of FactCourt Filing
                Amended Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law: Judgment is entered in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiffs. Signed on 5/31/04 by Judge Owen M. Panner. (gm)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 94 Filed: 6/1/2004, Entered: 6/2/2004 SchedulingCourt Filing
                  CIVIL MINUTES: Record of Order by Judge Owen M. Panner: The Stay of this case from Bankruptcy is Lifted. (gm)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 3/24/2004, Entered: 3/24/2004 Scheduling Conference
                    Record of Order: This action is stayed, until further notice, due to the bankruptcy filing by DefendantOregon Arena Corporation. The parties shall promptly notify the court once the automatic stay has been lifted. Owen M. Panner presiding. (mja, )
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 5/28/2003, Entered: 5/30/2003 Declaration
                      Declaration of Paul deParrie. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Kirk, )
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 5/28/2003, Entered: 5/30/2003 Declaration
                        Supplemental Declaration of Michael Carr. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Kirk, )
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 5/27/2003, Entered: 5/28/2003 Declaration
                          Declaration of Paul DeParrie. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Kirk, )
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 5/27/2003, Entered: 5/28/2003 Declaration
                            Supplemental Declaration of michael Carr. Filed by Michael Carr. (Kirk, )
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 5/27/2003, Entered: 5/28/2003 Memorandum in Support
                              Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Summary Judgment & Premanent Injunction. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related document(s)[11]) (Kirk, )
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 5/27/2003, Entered: 5/28/2003 Brief
                                Brief Briefing of Oregon Arena Corporation & Michael Fennell. Filed by Michael Fennell, Oregon Arena Corporation. (Kirk, )
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 5/7/2003, Entered: 5/12/2003 SchedulingCourt Filing
                                  CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order by Judge Owen M. Panner: Striking Status Conference of 5/12/03;Remaining parties have until5/27/2003 to file briefs. (Kirk, )
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 5/5/2003, Entered: 5/6/2003 SchedulingCourt Filing
                                    CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order by Judge Owen M. Panner: Setting a Telephone Status Conference for 5/12/2003 at 01:30PM. (Kirk, )
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 5/31/2002, Entered: 6/4/2002 Notice of Change of Address
                                      Notice of Address Change for Herbert G. Grey of attorneys for plaintiffs. (Kirk, )
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 2/20/2002, Entered: 2/20/2002 Attorney Appearance
                                        Notice of Association of Counsel by Attorney Herbert G. Grey. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Kirk, )
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 2/4/2002, Entered: 2/6/2002 Mandate
                                          Mandate from US Court of Appeals: The Decision of the District Court is REVERSED & REMANDED. USDC Notice of Appeal Doc. # [62], [77]and USCA # 00-35755. Costs Taxed in the amount of $756.60 for Plaintiffs. (Related document(s)[62], [77]) (Kirk, )
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 1/30/2001, Entered: 1/30/2001, Terminated: 2/4/2002 Certificate of Record by Clerk to USCA
                                            Certificate of Record transmitted to the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit. (related document(s)[77]) (Kirk, )
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 1/16/2001, Entered: 1/17/2001 USCA Order
                                              Order from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals: Appeal Dismissed as to Appellee Portland Rose Festival Association (related document(s)[62]) (Kirk, )
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 11/28/2000, Entered: 12/5/2000 Description not available
                                                Representation Statement (related document(s)[77]) Filed by all plaintiffs. (Kirk, )
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 11/28/2000, Entered: 12/5/2000 Notice of Appeal
                                                  Amended Notice of Appeal to. 9th Circuit Court of Appeals. (related document(s)[62]) Filed by all plaintiffs. (Kirk, )
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 10/13/2000, Entered: 10/17/2000 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                    Transcript of Proceedings held on 8/25/00 before Judge Owen M. Panner. Court Reporter: Robert D. Stimler. (Kirk, )
                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/12/2000, Entered: 10/13/2000 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                      Transcript of Proceedings (Telephone conference) held on 6/21/00 before Judge Owen M. Panner. Court Reporter: Dennis R. Grube. (Kirk, )
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/12/2000, Entered: 10/13/2000 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                        Transcript of Proceedings (Preliminary Injunction Hearing) held on 4/24/00 before Judge Owen M. Panner. Court Reporter: Dennis R. Grube. (Kirk, )
                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/6/2000, Entered: 10/11/2000 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                          Transcript of Proceedings (Motion Hearing) held on 4/25/00 before Judge Owen M. Panner. Court Reporter: Katherine Eismann. (Kirk, )
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/6/2000, Entered: 10/11/2000 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                            Transcript of Proceedings (Telephone Status Conference) held on 3/30/00 before Judge Owen M. Panner. Court Reporter: Katherine Eismann. (Kirk, )
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 10/4/2000, Entered: 10/5/2000 Response
                                                              Joint Response to City Defendants/Appellees Designation of Transcripts. (related document(s)[68]) Filed by Daniel Lee. (Kirk, )
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/2/2000, Entered: 10/3/2000 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                Transcript of Proceedings (Preliminary Injunction Hearing) held on 4/24/00 before Judge Owen M. Panner. Court Reporter: Dennis R. Grube. (Kirk, )
                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/2/2000, Entered: 10/3/2000 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                  Transcript of Proceedings (Motion Hearing) held on 5/4/00 before Judge Owen M. Panner. Court Reporter: Liz Kauble. (Kirk, )
                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 9/29/2000, Entered: 10/2/2000 Transcript Designation and Order FormCourt Filing
                                                                    Transcript Designation and Ordering form for Transcript(s) of Proceedings held on 3/31/00, 4/24 & 25/00, 5/4/00, 6/21/00 & 7/10/00 before Judge Owen M. Panner. Court Reporter: Eismann, Grube, Stimler & Johnson. (related document(s)[62]) Filed by Kimberly Adams, Timothy Bacon, Curtis Chinn, Stephanie Dekoeyer, Brian Duddy, James Francesconi, Robert Hawkins, Charles Jordon, Vera Katz, John Montgomery, Shane Nicholson, Stuart Palmiter, Pioneer Courthouse Square Inc., Mace Winter. (Kirk, )
                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 9/18/2000, Entered: 9/19/2000 USCA Order
                                                                      Time Schedule Order from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals: Court reporter to file transcript by 10/16/00; Appellant to file opening brief by 11/30/00 & Appellees Brief is due 1/2/01(related document(s)[62]) (Kirk, )
                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 9/18/2000, Entered: 9/19/2000 USCA Docket Number
                                                                        Docket number 00-35755 assigned by the United States Court of Appeals. (related document(s)[62]) (Kirk, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 9/6/2000, Entered: 9/12/2000 Transcript Designation and Order FormCourt Filing
                                                                          Transcript Designation and Ordering form for Transcript(s) of Proceedings held on 4/24/00 before Judge Owen M. Panner. Court Reporter: Dennis Grube. (related document(s)[62]) Filed by Edward Gathright. (Kirk, )
                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 9/6/2000, Entered: 9/12/2000 Transcript Designation and Order FormCourt Filing
                                                                            Transcript Designation and Ordering form for Transcript(s) of Proceedings held on 4/25/00 before Judge. Court Reporter: Robert Stimler. (related document(s)[62]) Filed by Edward Gathright. (Kirk, )
                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 9/6/2000, Entered: 9/11/2000 Transcript Designation and Order FormCourt Filing
                                                                              Transcript Designation and Ordering form for Transcript(s) of Proceedings held on 4/25/00 before Judge Owen M. Panner. Court Reporter: K. Eismann. (related document(s)[62]) Filed by all plaintiffs. (Kirk, )
                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/6/2000, Entered: 9/11/2000 Transcript Designation and Order FormCourt Filing
                                                                                Transcript Designation and Ordering form for Transcript(s) of Proceedings held on 5/4/00 before Judge Owen M. Panner. Court Reporter: Liz Kauble. (related document(s)[62]) Filed by all plaintiffs. (Kirk, )
                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/14/2000, Entered: 8/22/2000 Notice of Appeal
                                                                                  Notice of Appeal to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals. Filing fee collected. Receipt #: 432069 issued. (related document(s)[57], [60], [61], [54]) Filed by all plaintiffs. (Kirk, )
                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/18/2000, Entered: 7/19/2000 Judgment*Court Filing
                                                                                    Judgment: Based on Courts Orders (Doc #51 & #60) Judgment is for Defendants; Signed 7/17/00 by Judge Owen M. Panner. (related document(s)[1]) (Kirk, )
                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/18/2000, Entered: 7/19/2000 Order on Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                      Order: Granting PRFA's Motion for Summary Judgment (Related Doc #[54]) & Order Granting OAC's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Related Doc #[57]); Plaintiffs have voluntarily dismissed their remaining claims for money damages against defendants; Signed 7/17/00 by Judge Owen M. Panner. (Kirk, )
                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/10/2000, Entered: 7/20/2000 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                        Record of Proceedings before Judge Owen M. Panner: Status Conference; Formal Order to follow; Court Reporter: Marilyn Johnson (Kirk, )
                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/5/2000, Entered: 7/11/2000 Order on Motion for JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                          Record of Order Taking Under Advisement Motion for Entry of Judgment on the Pleadings (Related Doc #[57]). To be set under advisement as of August 9, 2000. Judge Owen M. Panner. Court Reporter or Tape Number: none. (jlr, )
                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/30/2000, Entered: 7/11/2000 Description not available
                                                                                            Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Response due by 7/14/2000. Filed by Michael Fennell, Oregon Arena Corporation. (Ely, Tami)
                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/28/2000, Entered: 6/29/2000 Concise Statement of Material Fact
                                                                                              Concise Statement of Material Fact. Filed by Portland Rose Festival Association. (Related motion(s)[54]) (tomg, )
                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 6/28/2000, Entered: 6/29/2000 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                Memorandum in Support. Filed by Portland Rose Festival Association. (Related motion(s)[54]) (tomg, )
                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/28/2000, Entered: 6/29/2000, Terminated: 7/18/2000 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                  Motion for Summary Judgment. Response due by 7/10/2000. Filed by Portland Rose Festival Association. (tomg, )
                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/21/2000, Entered: 6/27/2000 SchedulingCourt Filing
                                                                                                    Record of Status Conference before Judge Owen M. Panner: Status Conference set for 7/10/2000 at 01:30PM by Telephone. Court Reporter: Dennis Grube (dls, )
                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/6/2000, Entered: 6/27/2000 SchedulingCourt Filing
                                                                                                      Record of Order by Judge Owen M. Panner: Status Conference set for 6/21/2000 at 01:30PM by Telephone. (dls, )
                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/31/2000, Entered: 6/27/2000 Findings of FactCourt Filing
                                                                                                        Findings of Fact And Conclusions Of Law by Judge Owen M. Panner. Signed 5/31/00. (dls, )
                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/31/2000, Entered: 6/27/2000 Stipulation
                                                                                                          Stipulated Facts And Facts To Which Stipulation Has Been Requested But Not Given. Filed by Kimberly Adams, Timothy Bacon, Curtis Chinn, Stephanie Dekoeyer, Brian Duddy, James Francesconi, Robert Hawkins, Charles Jordon, Vera Katz, John Montgomery, Shane Nicholson, Stuart Palmiter, J M Patterson, Pioneer Courthouse Square Inc., Mace Winter. (dls, ) Modified on 6/27/2000 (dls, ).
                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/8/2000, Entered: 6/27/2000 Brief
                                                                                                            Supplemental Brief RE: Preclusion. Filed by Kimberly Adams, Timothy Bacon, Curtis Chinn, Stephanie Dekoeyer, Brian Duddy, James Francesconi, Robert Hawkins, Charles Jordon, Vera Katz, John Montgomery, Shane Nicholson, Stuart Palmiter, J M Patterson, Pioneer Courthouse Square Inc., Mace Winter. (dls, )
                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/4/2000, Entered: 6/27/2000 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                              Record of Court Trial before Judge Owen M. Panner: Legal argument heard on issue of injunctive relief. Order: Defendant City's Exhibit No. 104 is received into evidence without objection. Order: The parties have until Tuesday 5/9/00 to file simultaneous supplemental briefing on the issue of whether a federal court can overrule a state court decision as the situation is presented in this proceeding. Court Reporter: Liz Kauble (dls, )
                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/28/2000, Entered: 6/27/2000 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition To Motion For Preliminary Injunction. Filed by Michael Fennell, Oregon Arena Corporation. (Related motion(s)[11]) (dls, )
                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/28/2000, Entered: 6/27/2000 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                  Supplemental Response to Motion For Preliminary Injunction. Filed by Portland Rose Festival Association. (Related motion(s)[11]) (dls, )
                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/28/2000, Entered: 6/27/2000 Trial Memorandum
                                                                                                                    Supplemental Trial Brief. Filed by Kimberly Adams, Timothy Bacon, Curtis Chinn, Stephanie Dekoeyer, Brian Duddy, James Francesconi, Robert Hawkins, Charles Jordon, Vera Katz, John Montgomery, Shane Nicholson, Stuart Palmiter, J M Patterson, Pioneer Courthouse Square Inc., Mace Winter. (dls, ) Modified on 6/27/2000 (dls, ).
                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/25/2000, Entered: 6/27/2000 SchedulingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      Record of Hearing On Preliminary Injunction before Judge Owen M. Panner: Order: Plaintiff's exhibits A-H, and 1-16 are received without objection. Defendant City of Portland's exhibits 101-103 are received without objection. Defendant Oregon Arena Corporation's exhibits 201-205 are received without objection. Order: The proceedings in this matter are bifurcated with the issue of injunctive relief to be decided first by a court trial and the issue of monetary damages to be decided subsequently. Order: Additional briefing on the injunction issue due no later than Friday 4/28/00. (related document(s)[11]) Oral Argument set for 5/4/2000 at 11:00AM. Court Reporter: K. Eismann and Robert Stimler (dls, )
                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/24/2000, Entered: 6/27/2000 SchedulingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        Record of Hearing On Preliminary InjunctionOrder before Judge Owen M. Panner: (related document(s)[11]), continue Hearing for 4/25/2000 at 11:00 AM. The parties are ordered to prepare for the hearing the following three documents: (1) set of agreed facts; (2) set of facts, if any, that plaintiffs believe defendants should have agreed to but did not; and (3) set of facts, if any, that defendants believe plaintiffs should have agreed to but did not. Court Reporter: Dennis Grube (dls, )
                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/24/2000, Entered: 6/27/2000 Affidavit
                                                                                                                          Affidavit of Shane L. Nicholson. Filed by Kimberly Adams, Timothy Bacon, Curtis Chinn, Stephanie Dekoeyer, Brian Duddy, James Francesconi, Robert Hawkins, Charles Jordon, Vera Katz, John Montgomery, Shane Nicholson, Stuart Palmiter, J M Patterson, Pioneer Courthouse Square Inc., Mace Winter. (dls, )
                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/20/2000, Entered: 6/27/2000 Affidavit
                                                                                                                            Affidavit of Randy Kane. Filed by Kimberly Adams, Timothy Bacon, Curtis Chinn, Stephanie Dekoeyer, Brian Duddy, James Francesconi, Robert Hawkins, Charles Jordon, Vera Katz, John Montgomery, Shane Nicholson, Stuart Palmiter, J M Patterson, Pioneer Courthouse Square Inc., Mace Winter. (dls, )
                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/20/2000, Entered: 6/27/2000 Affidavit
                                                                                                                              Affidavit of Lynette Jelinek. Filed by Kimberly Adams, Timothy Bacon, Curtis Chinn, Stephanie Dekoeyer, Brian Duddy, James Francesconi, Robert Hawkins, Charles Jordon, Vera Katz, John Montgomery, Shane Nicholson, Stuart Palmiter, J M Patterson, Pioneer Courthouse Square Inc., Mace Winter. (dls, )
                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/20/2000, Entered: 6/27/2000 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                Affidavit of Charles Jordan. Filed by Kimberly Adams, Timothy Bacon, Curtis Chinn, Stephanie Dekoeyer, Brian Duddy, James Francesconi, Robert Hawkins, Charles Jordon, Vera Katz, John Montgomery, Shane Nicholson, Stuart Palmiter, J M Patterson, Pioneer Courthouse Square Inc., Mace Winter. (dls, )
                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/20/2000, Entered: 6/27/2000 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                  Affidavit of Bruce Frederick. Filed by Kimberly Adams, Timothy Bacon, Curtis Chinn, Stephanie Dekoeyer, Brian Duddy, James Francesconi, Robert Hawkins, Charles Jordon, Vera Katz, John Montgomery, Shane Nicholson, Stuart Palmiter, J M Patterson, Pioneer Courthouse Square Inc., Mace Winter. (dls, )
                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/20/2000, Entered: 6/27/2000 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                    Affidavit of Karen Whitman. Filed by Kimberly Adams, Timothy Bacon, Curtis Chinn, Stephanie Dekoeyer, Brian Duddy, James Francesconi, Robert Hawkins, Charles Jordon, Vera Katz, John Montgomery, Shane Nicholson, Stuart Palmiter, J M Patterson, Pioneer Courthouse Square Inc., Mace Winter. (dls, )
                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/19/2000, Entered: 6/27/2000 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                      Preliminary Injunction Hearing Exhibit List With Attached Exhibits. Filed by all plaintiffs. (dls, ) Modified on 6/27/2000 (dls, ).
                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/19/2000, Entered: 6/27/2000 Witness statement
                                                                                                                                        Preliminary Injunction Witness Statements. Filed by all plaintiffs. (dls, ) Modified on 6/27/2000 (dls, ).
                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/19/2000, Entered: 6/27/2000 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                          Affidavit of Peter Mott. Filed by Portland Rose Festival Association. (dls, )
                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/19/2000, Entered: 6/27/2000 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                            Exhibit List. Filed by Kimberly Adams, Timothy Bacon, Curtis Chinn, Stephanie Dekoeyer, Brian Duddy, James Francesconi, Robert Hawkins, Charles Jordon, Vera Katz, John Montgomery, Shane Nicholson, Stuart Palmiter, J M Patterson, Pioneer Courthouse Square Inc., Mace Winter. (dls, )
                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/19/2000, Entered: 6/27/2000 Witness List
                                                                                                                                              Witness List., Witness Statement. Filed by Kimberly Adams, Timothy Bacon, Curtis Chinn, Stephanie Dekoeyer, Brian Duddy, James Francesconi, Robert Hawkins, Charles Jordon, Vera Katz, John Montgomery, Shane Nicholson, Stuart Palmiter, J M Patterson, Pioneer Courthouse Square Inc., Mace Winter. (dls, )
                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/19/2000, Entered: 6/27/2000 Trial Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                Trial Brief. Filed by Kimberly Adams, Timothy Bacon, Curtis Chinn, Stephanie Dekoeyer, Brian Duddy, James Francesconi, Robert Hawkins, Charles Jordon, Vera Katz, John Montgomery, Shane Nicholson, Stuart Palmiter, J M Patterson, Pioneer Courthouse Square Inc., Mace Winter. (dls, ) Modified on 6/27/2000 (dls, ).
                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/18/2000, Entered: 6/27/2000 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                  Witness List. Filed by Portland Rose Festival Association. (dls, )
                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/18/2000, Entered: 6/27/2000 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                    Response to Motion For Preliminary Injunction. Filed by Portland Rose Festival Association. Reply due by 5/2/2000. (Related motion(s)[11]) (dls, )
                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/18/2000, Entered: 6/27/2000 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                      Affidavit of Harry Auerback In Support Of The Amended Answer. (related document(s)[27]) Filed by Kimberly Adams, Timothy Bacon, Curtis Chinn, Stephanie Dekoeyer, Brian Duddy, James Francesconi, Robert Hawkins, Charles Jordon, Vera Katz, John Montgomery, Shane Nicholson, Stuart Palmiter, J M Patterson, Pioneer Courthouse Square Inc.. (dls, )
                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/18/2000, Entered: 6/27/2000 Answer
                                                                                                                                                        Amended Answer To Complaint. (related document(s)[16]) Filed by Kimberly Adams, Timothy Bacon, Curtis Chinn, Stephanie Dekoeyer, Brian Duddy, James Francesconi, Robert Hawkins, Charles Jordon, Vera Katz, John Montgomery, Shane Nicholson, Stuart Palmiter, J M Patterson, Pioneer Courthouse Square Inc., Mace Winter. (dls, )
                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/17/2000, Entered: 6/27/2000 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                          Exhibit List. Filed by Michael Fennell, Oregon Arena Corporation. (dls, )
                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/17/2000, Entered: 6/27/2000 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                            Witness List. Filed by Michael Fennell, Oregon Arena Corporation. (dls, )
                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/17/2000, Entered: 6/27/2000 Witness statement
                                                                                                                                                              Witness Statement Of Ka'Ala Livingston. Filed by Michael Fennell, Oregon Arena Corporation. (dls, )
                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/17/2000, Entered: 6/27/2000 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                Affidavit/Witness Statement of Michael V. Fennell Re: Memorandum In Opposition. (related document(s)[17]) Filed by Michael Fennell, Oregon Arena Corporation. (dls, ) Modified on 6/27/2000 (dls, ).
                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/17/2000, Entered: 6/27/2000 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                  Affidavit/Witness Statement of Scott Dickson Re: Memorandum In Opposition. (related document(s)[17]) Filed by Michael Fennell, Oregon Arena Corporation. (dls, ) Modified on 6/27/2000 (dls, ).
                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/17/2000, Entered: 6/27/2000 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                    Joint Affidavit of Officers Curtis Chinn and Mace Winter RE: Memorandum In Opposition. (related document(s)[17]) Filed by Michael Fennell, Oregon Arena Corporation. (dls, )
                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/17/2000, Entered: 6/27/2000 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                      Affidavit of Jessica Gachupin Re: Memorandum In Opposition (not an original signature). (related document(s)[17]) Filed by Michael Fennell, Oregon Arena Corporation. (dls, )
                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/17/2000, Entered: 6/27/2000 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                        Joint Affidavit of Sergeant Kim Adams and Officer Rob Hawkins re: Memorandum In Opposition. (related document(s)[17]) Filed by Michael Fennell, Oregon Arena Corporation. (dls, )
                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/17/2000, Entered: 6/27/2000 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                          Affidavit of Sergeant Martin F. RowleyRe: Memorandum In Opposition. (related document(s)[17]) Filed by Michael Fennell, Oregon Arena Corporation. (dls, ) Modified on 6/27/2000 (dls, ).
                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/17/2000, Entered: 6/27/2000 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion For Preliminarh Injunction. Filed by Michael Fennell, Oregon Arena Corporation. Reply due by 5/1/2000. (Related motion(s)[11]) (dls, )
                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/14/2000, Entered: 6/27/2000 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                              Answer to Complaint. (Related Doc # [1]) Filed by Kimberly Adams, Timothy Bacon, Curtis Chinn, Stephanie Dekoeyer, Brian Duddy, James Francesconi, Robert Hawkins, Charles Jordon, Vera Katz, John Montgomery, Shane Nicholson, Stuart Palmiter, J M Patterson, Pioneer Courthouse Square Inc., Mace Winter. (dls, )
                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/13/2000, Entered: 6/27/2000 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                Reply To Counterclaim Of Defendant Portland Rose Festival Association. (related document(s)[14]) Filed by all plaintiffs. (dls, )
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/11/2000, Entered: 6/27/2000 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                  Answer to Complaint. (Related Doc # [1]), Counter-Claim Against Plaintiff's Filed by Portland Rose Festival Association. (dls, )
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/5/2000, Entered: 6/27/2000 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                    Exhibits To Motion For Preliminary Injunction. (related document(s)[11]) Filed by all plaintiffs. (dls, )
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/5/2000, Entered: 6/27/2000 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in Support Of Motion For Preliminary Injunction. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related motion(s)[11]) (dls, )
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/5/2000, Entered: 6/27/2000 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Oral Argument Requested). Response due by 4/19/2000. Filed by all plaintiffs. (dls, )
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/31/2000, Entered: 6/27/2000 Order on motion for extension of time to answer a Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          Record Of Order by Judge Owen M. Panner: Status Conference held. Hearing on preliminary injunction set for April 24, 2000 at 1:30pm. See atttached procedureal order. Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint (Related Doc #[7]), Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint(Related Doc #[8]), and defendants have 10 days from the date of this order to file their first appearances. Court Reporter: K. Eismann. (dls, )
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/24/2000, Entered: 6/27/2000 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. Filed by Portland Rose Festival Association. (dls, )
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/23/2000, Entered: 6/27/2000 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                              Affidavit of Harry Auerbach In Support Of Motion To Extend Time To Answer Complaint. (related document(s)[8]) Filed by Kimberly Adams, Timothy Bacon, Curtis Chinn, Stephanie Dekoeyer, Brian Duddy, James Francesconi, Robert Hawkins, Charles Jordon, Vera Katz, John Montgomery, Shane Nicholson, Stuart Palmiter, J M Patterson, Pioneer Courthouse Square Inc., Mace Winter. (dls, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/23/2000, Entered: 6/27/2000 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. Filed by Kimberly Adams, Timothy Bacon, Curtis Chinn, Stephanie Dekoeyer, Brian Duddy, James Francesconi, Robert Hawkins, Charles Jordon, Vera Katz, John Montgomery, Shane Nicholson, Stuart Palmiter, J M Patterson, Pioneer Courthouse Square Inc., Mace Winter. (dls, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/23/2000, Entered: 6/27/2000 Attorney Substitution
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Attorney Association James E. Leuenberger has been hired to represent the plaintiffs. Filed by all plaintiffs. (dls, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/22/2000, Entered: 6/27/2000 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Answer to Complaint And Demand For Jury Trial. (Related Doc # [1]), Counter-Claim Against Plaintiffs. Filed by Michael Fennell, Oregon Arena Corporation. (dls, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/22/2000, Entered: 6/27/2000 SchedulingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Record of Order by Judge Owen M. Panner: Resetting Telephone Conference for 3/30/2000 at 12:30PM by Telephone. (dls, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/2/2000, Entered: 6/27/2000 SchedulingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Record of Order by Judge Owen M. Panner: Setting Telephone Conference for 3/30/2000 at 02:00PM. Plaintiff's counsel is responsible for providing a copy of this minute order to counsel for defendants. (dls, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/2/2000, Entered: 6/27/2000 Discovery Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order: Discovery to be completed by 6/30/2000. Joint Status Report due by 7/31/2000. Pretrial Order due by 6/30/2000. (dls, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/2/2000, Entered: 6/27/2000 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Complaint against Kimberly Adams, Timothy Bacon, Curtis Chinn, Stephanie Dekoeyer, Brian Duddy, Michael Fennell, James Francesconi, Robert Hawkins, Charles Jordon, Vera Katz, John Montgomery, Shane Nicholson, Oregon Arena Corporation, Stuart Palmiter, J M Patterson, Pioneer Courthouse Square Inc., Portland Rose Festival Association, Mace Winter. Filing Fee collected. Receipt #: 428718 issued.Summons issued as to (19 summons issued). Filed by Michael Carr, Edward Gathright, Daniel Lee, Jeremy Sonnier (dls, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 141 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?