Karuna v. City of Portland et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 3:00-cv-00694-HU

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Gail Karuna, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald D. Dartt +1 503 221 1907 +1 503 226 1321 donalddartt@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Herbert A. Terrell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Spencer M. Neal +1 503 473 8325 +1 503 295 0676 spencerneal@justice.com
v.
No Logo City of Portland, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nancy E. Martin +1 860 930 8346 +1 860 233 8578

Toggle Switch Represented by davidlesh.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David N. Lesh +1 503 223 3422 +1 503 296 2935 info@davidlesh.net
No Logo Fred Kellogg, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nancy E. Martin +1 860 930 8346 +1 860 233 8578

Toggle Switch Represented by davidlesh.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David N. Lesh +1 503 223 3422 +1 503 296 2935 info@davidlesh.net
Office Portland
Filed 5/23/2000
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Lane
Terminated 2/11/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags FRC, TERMINATED
  Entries (90) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: 7/17/2008 Satisfaction
Satisfaction re Order on Cost bill[89] by Fred Kellogg, City of Portland. Filed by Fred Kellogg, City of Portland. (Law, Linda)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 5/21/2002, Entered: 5/21/2002 Order on Cost billCourt Filing
    ORDER:Order Granting in part, Denying in part Defendants' Bill of Costs: (Related Doc #[86]). Costs taxed in the amount of $649.24 against Plaintiff. Signed on May 21, 2002 by Judge Dennis James Hubel. (DJH2).
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 2/26/2002, Entered: 2/27/2002 Declaration
      Declaration of Spencer Neal. Filed by Gail Karuna. (Related document(s)[87]) (dls, )
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 2/26/2002, Entered: 2/27/2002 Objections to Bill of Costs
        Objections to Bill of Costs. Filed by Gail Karuna. (Related motion(s)[86]) (dls, )
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 2/19/2002, Entered: 2/20/2002, Terminated: 5/21/2002 Bill of Costs
          Bill of Costs. Filed by City of Portland, Fred Kellogg. Objections to the Bill of Costs due by 3/5/2002. Taxation of the Bill of Costs due by 3/5/2002. (dls, )
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 2/11/2002, Entered: 2/14/2002 Judgment*Court Filing
            Judgment: Based on the Record, IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that this Action is dismissed, with prejudice. Signed 2/11/02 by Judge Ancer L. Haggerty. (dls, )
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 2/7/2002, Entered: 2/7/2002 Order on Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
              ORDER: Order Adopting Magistrate Judge Hubel's Findings and Recommendation dated November 21,2001 in its entirety. (Related Doc #[69]), Order Granting Defendants'Motion for Summary Judgment (Related Doc #[54]),Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment (Related Doc #[28]). Signed on 2/5/02 by Judge Ancer L.Haggerty. (md, )
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 1/8/2002, Entered: 1/10/2002 Notice of Change of Address
                Corrected Notice of Address Change for attorney Spencer Neal. Filed by all plaintiffs. (dls, )
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002 Notice of Change of Address
                  Notice of Address Change for attorney Spencer Neal. Filed by all plaintiffs. (dls, )
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank 81 Filed: 1/3/2002, Entered: 1/3/2002 Findings & Recommendation ReferredCourt Filing
                    CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order -- Findings and Recommendation of November 21, 2002, referred to Judge Ancer L. Haggerty due to a conflict for Judge Brown. Objections to the F&R have been filed. Motion to Strike Objections referred to Judge Haggerty. (Related documents(s) [54], [69]) Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (sm, )
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 12/28/2001, Entered: 1/3/2002 Declaration
                      Declaration of Spencer M. Neal. Filed by Gail Karuna. (Related document(s)[79]) (ljb, )
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 12/28/2001, Entered: 1/3/2002 Response to Motion
                        Response to Motion to Strike. Filed by Gail Karuna. (Related motion(s)[75]) (ljb, )
                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                          Blank 74 Filed: 12/21/2001, Entered: 12/21/2001 Findings & Recommendation ReferredCourt Filing
                          CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order -- Findings and Recommendation of November 21, 2001, referred to Judge Anna L. Brown. An objection to the f&r has been filed. Defendants' Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Objections to Findings and Recommendation referred to Judge Anna L. Brown. (Related documents(s) [54], [69]) Ordered by Judge Dennis J. Hubel. (kb, )
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 12/20/2001, Entered: 12/26/2001 Affidavit
                            Affidavit of Nancy E. Martin in support of Response to Objections to Findings & Recommendation. Filed by all defendants. (Related document(s)[77]) (dls, )
                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 12/20/2001, Entered: 12/26/2001 Response to Objections to Findings & Recommendatio
                              Response to Objections to Findings & Recommendation. Filed by all defendants. (Related motion(s)[69]) (dls, )
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 12/20/2001, Entered: 12/26/2001 Affidavit
                                Affidavit of Nancy E. Martin in support of Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Objections to Findings and Recommendation. Filed by all defendants. (Related document(s)[75]) (dls, )
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 12/20/2001, Entered: 12/26/2001 Motion to Strike
                                  Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Objections to Findings and Recommendation. Filed by all defendants. (Related document(s)[70]) (dls, )
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 12/18/2001, Entered: 12/21/2001 Order on Motion to StrikeCourt Filing
                                    ORDER:Record of Order Granting Motion to Strike (Related Doc #[71]). The deadline for the lodging of a pretrial order is STRICKEN. The 3-day jury trial set to commence on January 15, 2002, is STRICKEN. These deadlines will be reset at a later date if necessary. by Judge Dennis J. Hubel. (dls, )
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 12/17/2001, Entered: 12/19/2001 Affidavit
                                      Affidavit of Nancy E. Martin in support of Motion to Strike Current Schedule for Lodging of Pretrial Order and Trial Date. Filed by all defendants. (Related document(s)[71]) (dls, )
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 12/17/2001, Entered: 12/19/2001, Terminated: 12/18/2001 Motion to Strike
                                        Motion to Strike Current Schedule for Lodging of Pretrial Order and Trial Date. Filed by City of Portland. (dls, )
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 12/7/2001, Entered: 12/11/2001 Objections to Findings & Recommendation
                                          Objections to Findings & Recommendation. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related motion(s)[69]) (dls, )
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 11/21/2001, Entered: 11/21/2001, Terminated: 2/7/2002 Findings and RecommendationCourt Filing
                                            Findings & Recommendations: Plaintiff's motion to strike is denied. Plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment should be denied and defendants' motion for summary judgment should be granted. Signed on November 21, 2001 by Judge Dennis James Hubel. Objections to the Findings and Recommendation due by 12/6/2001. Response to the objection to the F & R due by 12/20/2001. (Related document(s)[47], [54], [28]) (DJH2).
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Blank 68 Filed: 9/25/2001, Entered: 9/25/2001 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                              CIVIL MINUTES:Record of oral argument held on Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, and Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Affidavit of Fred Kellogg: ORDER - the motions are taken under advisement this date. (Related documents(s) [47], [54], [28]) Ordered by Judge Dennis J. Hubel. Counsel Present for Plaintiff: Spencer Neal; Donald Dart. Counsel Present for Defendant: Nancy Martin; David Lesh.Tape No: FTR. (kb, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 67 Filed: 9/19/2001, Entered: 9/19/2001 SchedulingCourt Filing
                                                CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order -- The Motion Argument currently set on September 24, 2001, is RESET to September 25, 2001, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom #9B. (Related documents(s) [54], [47], [28]) Ordered by Judge Dennis J. Hubel. (kb, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 66 Filed: 9/17/2001, Entered: 9/17/2001 SchedulingCourt Filing
                                                  CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order -- The motions argument set on September 24, 2001, will now be held at 10:00 a.m., that same date, in Courtroom #9B (change in time only) (Related documents(s) [54], [47], [28]) Ordered by Judge Dennis J. Hubel. (kb, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 9/4/2001, Entered: 9/5/2001 Response
                                                    Response to Concise Statement of Material Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by David N Lesh on behalf of all defendants. (Related document(s)[60], [56]) (dls, )
                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 9/4/2001, Entered: 9/5/2001 Affidavit
                                                      Affidavit of Nancy E. Martin in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by Nancy E. Martin on behalf of all defendants. (Related document(s)[54]) (dls, )
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/4/2001, Entered: 9/5/2001 reply to motion
                                                        Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by David N Lesh on behalf of all defendants. (Related motion(s)[54]) (dls, )
                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/27/2001, Entered: 8/28/2001 Response to Motion
                                                          Response to Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by Spencer M. Neal on behalf of all plaintiffs. (Related motion(s)[54]) (dls, )
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/27/2001, Entered: 8/28/2001 Declaration
                                                            Declaration of Spencer Neal in support of Response to Defendants' Statement of Facts. Filed by Spencer M. Neal on behalf of all plaintiffs. (Related document(s)[60]) (dls, )
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/27/2001, Entered: 8/28/2001 Response
                                                              Response to Defendants' Statement of Facts. Filed by Spencer M. Neal on behalf of all plaintiffs. (Related document(s)[56]) (dls, )
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/14/2001, Entered: 8/15/2001 Affidavit
                                                                Affidavit of Scott Anderson In Support Of Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment. Filed by Nancy E. Martin on behalf of all defendants. (Related document(s)[54]) (dls, )
                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                  Blank 58 Filed: 8/14/2001, Entered: 8/14/2001 Scheduling
                                                                  CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order -- Oral Argument is set on September 24, 2001, at noon in Courtroom #9B on the following motions: Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment [28]; Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Affidavit of Fred Kellogg [47], and on Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment [54]. (Related documents(s) [54], [47], [28]) (kb, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/13/2001, Entered: 8/14/2001 Affidavit
                                                                    Affidavit of Nancy E. Martin In Support Of Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by Nancy E. Martin on behalf of City of Portland. (Related document(s)[54]) (dls, )
                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/13/2001, Entered: 8/14/2001 Concise Statement of Material Fact
                                                                      Concise Statement of Material Fact. Filed by Nancy E. Martin on behalf of City of Portland. (dls, )
                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/13/2001, Entered: 8/14/2001 Memorandum in Support
                                                                        Memorandum in Support Of Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by Nancy E. Martin on behalf of City of Portland. (Related document(s)[54]) (dls, )
                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/13/2001, Entered: 8/14/2001 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                          Motion for Summary Judgment (Oral Argument Septmember 24, 2001 at 12:00pm. Filed by Nancy E. Martin on behalf of City of Portland. (dls, )
                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/18/2001, Entered: 7/19/2001 Affidavit
                                                                            Supplemental Affidavit of David N. Lesh In Support Of Memorandum in Opposition To Motion to Strike Affidavit of Fred Kellogg. (related document(s)[51]) Filed by all defendants. (dls, )
                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/18/2001, Entered: 7/19/2001 Affidavit
                                                                              Affidavit of Cynthia Warren In Support Of Memorandum in Opposition To Motion to Strike Affidavit of Fred Kellogg. (related document(s)[51]) Filed by all defendants. (dls, )
                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/18/2001, Entered: 7/19/2001 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                Memorandum in Opposition To Motion to Strike Affidavit of Fred Kellogg. Filed by all defendants. (Related motion(s)[47]) (dls, )
                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/17/2001, Entered: 7/17/2001 Joint ADR Report
                                                                                  Joint ADR Report. Filed by all parties. (dls, )
                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/12/2001, Entered: 7/12/2001 Declaration
                                                                                    Declaration of Spencer Neal In Support Of Motion to Strike Affidavit of Fred Kellogg. (related document(s)[47]) Filed by all plaintiffs. (dls, )
                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/12/2001, Entered: 7/12/2001 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                      Memorandum in Support Of Motion to Strike Affidavit of Fred Kellogg. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related motion(s)[47]) (dls, )
                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/12/2001, Entered: 7/12/2001, Terminated: 2/11/2002 Motion to Strike
                                                                                        Motion to Strike Affidavit of Fred Kellogg.(related document(s)[39]) Filed by all plaintiffs. (dls, )
                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/12/2001, Entered: 7/12/2001 reply to motion
                                                                                          Reply to Motion For Summary Judgment. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related motion(s)[28]) (dls, )
                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/12/2001, Entered: 7/12/2001 Response
                                                                                            Response To Defendants' Statement of Facts. (related document(s)[43], [40]) Filed by all plaintiffs. (dls, )
                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/10/2001, Entered: 7/11/2001 Rule 16 ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                              Record of hearing And Order before Judge Dennis J. Hubel: Defendants' Motion For Extension of Deadline to File a Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (#36) is Granted. Response due by 7/6/2001. Defendants' Motion For Extension of Time For Filing Dispositive Motions and for Rescheduling Current Trial Date (#25) is granted as follows: Pretrial Order due by 12/17/2001. Joint ADR Report due by 7/13/2001. Dispositive Motions due by 8/13/2001. Response to Dispositive Motions due by 8/24/2001. Replies to Dispositive Motions due by 9/4/2001. Oral Argument set for 9/24/2001 at 12:00 PM in Portland. 3-day Jury Trial set for 1/15/2002 at 09:00AM in Portland. Court Reporter: Kathy Eismann (related document(s)[28]) (dls, )
                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/6/2001, Entered: 7/9/2001 Response
                                                                                                Response To Plaintiff's Statement Of Undisputed Material Fact. (related document(s)[30]) Filed by all defendants. (dls, )
                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/6/2001, Entered: 7/9/2001 Exhibits
                                                                                                  Exhibits #2 and #3, to Affidavit of David N. Lesh in support of Defendant's Opposition to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (related document(s)[38]) Filed by all defendants. (dls, ) Modified on 9/20/2001 (dls, ).
                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/6/2001, Entered: 7/9/2001 Exhibits
                                                                                                    Exhibits #1 To Affidavit Of David N. Lesh In Support Of Memorandum in Opposition To Motion For Partial Summary Judgment. (related document(s)[38]) Filed by all defendants. (dls, )
                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/6/2001, Entered: 7/9/2001 Affidavit
                                                                                                      Affidavit of David N. Lesh In Support Of Memorandum in Opposition To Motion For Partial Summary Judgment. (related document(s)[38]) Filed by all defendants. (dls, )
                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/6/2001, Entered: 7/9/2001 Affidavit
                                                                                                        Affidavit of Fred Kellogg In Support Of Memorandum in Opposition To Motion For Partial Summary Judgment. (related document(s)[38]) Filed by all defendants. (dls, )
                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/6/2001, Entered: 7/9/2001 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                          Memorandum in Opposition To Motion For Partial Summary Judgment. Filed by all defendants. (Related motion(s)[28]) (dls, )
                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/5/2001, Entered: 7/6/2001 Affidavit
                                                                                                            Affidavit of David N. Lesh In Support Of Motion For Extension of Time. (related document(s)[36]) Filed by all defendants. (dls, )
                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/5/2001, Entered: 7/6/2001 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                              Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response/Reply Plaintiff's Motion For Partial Sumamry Judgment.(related document(s)[28]) Filed by all defendants. (dls, )
                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/25/2001, Entered: 6/26/2001 Declaration
                                                                                                                Declaration of Spencer Neal In Support Of Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines. (related document(s)[25]) Filed by Gail Karuna. (dls, )
                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/25/2001, Entered: 6/26/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                  Response to Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines. Filed by Gail Karuna. (Related motion(s)[25]) (dls, )
                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/22/2001, Entered: 6/26/2001 SchedulingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    Record of Order by Judge Dennis J. Hubel: setting a hearing on Defendant's Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines (related document(s)[25]) Hearing set for 7/10/2001 at 11:00 AM in Portland. (dls, )
                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/21/2001, Entered: 6/21/2001 Declaration
                                                                                                                      Declaration of Spencer Neal In Support Of Partial Motion for Summary Judgment. (related document(s)[28]) Filed by Gail Karuna. (dls, )
                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/21/2001, Entered: 6/21/2001 Declaration
                                                                                                                        Declaration of Gail Karuna. (related document(s)[28]) Filed by Gail Karuna. (dls, )
                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/21/2001, Entered: 6/21/2001 Concise Statement of Material Fact
                                                                                                                          Concise Statement of Material Fact. (related document(s)[28]) Filed by Gail Karuna. (dls, )
                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/21/2001, Entered: 6/21/2001 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                            Memorandum in Support of Partial Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by Gail Karuna. (Related motion(s)[28]) (dls, )
                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/21/2001, Entered: 6/21/2001, Terminated: 2/7/2002 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                              Partial Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by Gail Karuna. (dls, )
                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/20/2001, Entered: 6/21/2001 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                Answer to Amended Complaint. (Related Doc # [23]) Filed by City of Portland, Fred Kellogg. (dls, )
                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/20/2001, Entered: 6/21/2001 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                  Affidavit of Nancy E. Martin In Support Of Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines. (related document(s)[25]) Filed by all defendants. (dls, )
                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/20/2001, Entered: 6/21/2001 Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines
                                                                                                                                    Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines. Filed by all defendants. (dls, )
                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/18/2001, Entered: 6/19/2001 Order on motion for extension of discovery & PTO dCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      Record of Order by Judge Dennis J. Hubel - Granting Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines (Related Doc #[21]). Discovery to be completed by 7/23/2001. (dls, )
                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/11/2001, Entered: 6/11/2001, Terminated: 6/21/2001 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                        Amended Complaint Jury Trial Demand against Fred Kellogg, City of Portland. (related document(s)[1]) Filed by Gail Karuna (dls, )
                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/8/2001, Entered: 6/11/2001 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                          Affidavit of Nancy E. Martin In Support Of Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines. (related document(s)[21]) Filed by all defendants. (dls, )
                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/8/2001, Entered: 6/11/2001, Terminated: 6/18/2001 Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines
                                                                                                                                            Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines. Filed by all defendants. (dls, )
                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/8/2001, Entered: 6/11/2001 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                              Notice of Address Change Of Plaintiff's Counsel. Filed by all plaintiffs. (dls, )
                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/19/2001, Entered: 4/20/2001 SchedulingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                Record of Status Conferencer by Judge Dennis J. Hubel: Tape No: 293 Discovery to be completed by 6/8/2001. Dispositive Motions due by 6/22/2001. (ccs, )
                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/9/2001, Entered: 4/9/2001 Scheduling
                                                                                                                                                  Record of Order : Telephone Conference set for 4/19/2001 at 02:00PM, to discuss a new case schedule. Plaintiff's motion (14) for leave to file amended complaint is granted. (ccs, )
                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/2/2001, Entered: 4/4/2001 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                    Affidavit of David N. Lesh In Support Of Motion to Alter/Amend/Correct Complaint. (related document(s)[14]) Filed by all defendants. (dls, )
                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/2/2001, Entered: 4/4/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                      Response to Motion to Alter/Amend/Correct Complaint. Filed by all defendants. Reply due by 4/16/2001. (Related motion(s)[14]) (dls, )
                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/20/2001, Entered: 3/21/2001 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Spencer M. Neal. (related document(s)[14]) Filed by all plaintiffs. (dls, )
                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/20/2001, Entered: 3/21/2001 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                          Motion to Alter/Amend/Correct Complaint. Response due by 4/3/2001. Filed by all plaintiffs. (dls, )
                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/8/2001, Entered: 3/9/2001 Rule 16 ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            Record of Order by Judge Dennis J. Hubel. Resetting 3-day Jury Trial for 10/9/2001 at 09:00AM in Portland. (dls, )
                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/6/2001, Entered: 3/7/2001 Rule 16 ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              Record of Order by Judge Dennis J. Hubel. Pursuant to the agreement of the parties: Order - setting a 3-day Jury Trial set for 10/16/2001 at 09:00AM in Portland. (dls, )
                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/8/2001, Entered: 2/9/2001 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                Record of Further Telephone Status Conference - All case deadlines remain as currently set. Counsel shall confer and advise the court via letter of agreed upon proposed trial dates. (kb, )
                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/11/2001, Entered: 1/11/2001 SchedulingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  Record of Order by Judge Dennis J. Hubel: Discovery to be completed by 3/20/2001. Pretrial Order due by 6/19/2001. Status Conference set for 2/8/2001 at 10:00AM in / by telephone. Dispositive Motions due by 3/20/2001. (kb, )
                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/20/2000, Entered: 12/20/2000 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    RECORD OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge Hubel: ORDER - parties shall confer and advise the court of their proposed new schedule for the case. (kb, )
                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/6/2000, Entered: 12/6/2000 SchedulingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      Record of Order by Judge Dennis J. Hubel: Resetting Further Scheduling Conference set for 12/20/2000 at 10:00AM in Portland. (dls, )
                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/1/2000, Entered: 11/1/2000 SchedulingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        Record of Order by Judge Dennis J. Hubel: The Scheduling Conference, currently set on 11/2/00, is RESET to December 1, 2000, at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom #9B. (kb, )
                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/2/2000, Entered: 10/4/2000 SchedulingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          Record of Scheduling Conference by Judge Dennis J. Hubel: setting a Further Scheduling Conference set for 11/2/2000 at 11:00AM in Portland. (dls, )
                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/1/2000, Entered: 9/25/2000 SchedulingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            Record of Rule 16 Conference by Judge Dennis J. Hubel: Order extending case deadlines as follows: Discovery to be completed by 1/5/2001. Dispositive Motions due by 1/5/2001. Pursuant to Local Rule 16.4, parties shall file an Alternative Dispute Resolution Report no later than 1/5/01. Pretrial Order due by 2/5/2001. Scheduling Conference set for 10/2/2000 at 10:30 AM.. Court Reporter: none (jlr, )
                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/14/2000, Entered: 9/25/2000 SchedulingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              Record of Order by Judge Dennis J. Hubel: Court Reporter: none Rule 16 Conference set for 9/1/2000 at 10:30AM. (jlr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/13/2000, Entered: 9/25/2000 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                Answer to Complaint. (Related Doc # [1]) Filed by City of Portland, Vera Katz, Mark Kroeker. (jlr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/23/2000, Entered: 9/25/2000 Discovery Order
                                                                                                                                                                                  Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order: Discovery to be completed by 9/20/2000. Pretrial Order due by 10/20/2000. (jlr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/23/2000, Entered: 9/25/2000 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                    Complaint against City of Portland, Vera Katz, Mark Kroeker. Filing Fee collected. Receipt #: 430491 issued.Summons issued as to Mary Kroeker, City of Portland. Filed by Gail Karuna (jlr, )
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 78 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?