In Re Ethereummax Investor Litigation

Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:22-cv-00163-MWF-SK
District Judge Michael W Fitzgerald, presiding
Tags
District Judge Michael W Fitzgerald
Last Updated Today at 2:37 AM (14.6 hours ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Christopher DeLuca, Plaintiff

Represented by Scott + Scott, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John T. Jasnoch +1 619 233 4565 +1 619 233 0508 jjasnoch@scott-scott.com
No Logo Milan Puda, Plaintiff

Represented by Scott + Scott, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John T. Jasnoch +1 619 233 4565 +1 619 233 0508 jjasnoch@scott-scott.com
No Logo Neil Shah, Plaintiff

Represented by Scott + Scott, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John T. Jasnoch +1 619 233 4565 +1 619 233 0508 jjasnoch@scott-scott.com
No Logo Ryan Huegerich, Plaintiff

Represented by Scott + Scott, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John T. Jasnoch +1 619 233 4565 +1 619 233 0508 jjasnoch@scott-scott.com
No Logo Tunisia Brignol, Plaintiff

Represented by Scott + Scott, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John T. Jasnoch +1 619 233 4565 +1 619 233 0508 jjasnoch@scott-scott.com
v.
No Logo Antonio Brown, Defendant
No Logo Defendant X, Defendant
No Logo Floyd Mayweather, Jr. , Defendant
No Logo Giovanni Perone, Defendant

Represented by King & Spalding LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Craig Carpenito +1 212 556 2142 +1 212 556 2222 ccarpenito@kslaw.com
Space Andrew Z. Michaelson +1 212 790 5358 +1 212 556 2222 amichaelson@kslaw.com
Space Meghan Strong +1 415 318 1200 +1 415 318 1300 mstrong@kslaw.com
Space David Karl Willingham +1 213 218 4005 +1 213 443 4310 dwillingham@kslaw.com
No Logo John Does 1-10, Defendant
No Logo Justin French, Defendant
No Logo Justin Maher, Defendant
No Logo Kimberly Kardashian, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Maximilian Sladek De La Cal +1 310 883 6527 +1 310 883 6500 msladekdelacal@cooley.com
Space Robby L. R. Saldana +1 202 776 2109 +1 202 842 7899 rsaldana@cooley.com

Represented by Cooley LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Travis LeBlanc +1 202 728 7018 tleblanc@cooley.com
Space Joseph Douglas Mornin +1 415 693 2000 +1 415 693 2222 jmornin@cooley.com
Space Michael Graham Rhodes +1 858 550 6000 +1 858 550 6420 rhodesmg@cooley.com
No Logo Mike Speer, Defendant
No Logo Paul Pierce, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joel R Weiner +1 310 788 4400 joel.weiner@katten.com
No Logo Russell Davis, Defendant
No Logo Steve Gentile, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David W. Feder +1 212 430 2600 +1 650 938 5200 dfeder@fenwick.com
Space Corey E. Klein +1 310 556 2700 +1 310 556 2705 cklein@kbkfirm.com
Space Melissa Leigh Lawton +1 310 434 5400 +1 650 938 5200 mlawton@fenwick.com

Represented by Fenwick & West LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marie Caroline Bafus +1 415 875 2300 +1 415 281 1350 mbafus@fenwick.com
Space Michael Scott Dicke , +1 415 875 2300 +1 415 281 1350 mdicke@fenwick.com

Represented by Shipman & Goodwin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alison P. Baker +1 203 324 8100 abaker@goodwin.com
Space Andrew M. Zeitlin +1 203 324 8100 azeitlin@goodwin.com
Other Parties
No Logo Jonathan Semerjian, Consol Plaintiff

Represented by Scott + Scott, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John T. Jasnoch +1 619 233 4565 +1 619 233 0508 jjasnoch@scott-scott.com
No Logo Marko Ciklic, Consol Plaintiff

Represented by Scott + Scott, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John T. Jasnoch +1 619 233 4565 +1 619 233 0508 jjasnoch@scott-scott.com
No Logo Nabil Nahlah, Consol Plaintiff

Represented by Scott + Scott, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John T. Jasnoch +1 619 233 4565 +1 619 233 0508 jjasnoch@scott-scott.com
No Logo Till Freeman, Consol Plaintiff

Represented by Scott + Scott, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John T. Jasnoch +1 619 233 4565 +1 619 233 0508 jjasnoch@scott-scott.com
Attributes
Timeline
  Entries (212) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 4/29/2025, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 4/28/2025, Entered: None Sealed Declaration in Support
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 4/28/2025, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 4/28/2025, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 4/28/2025, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 4/28/2025, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 4/25/2025, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 4/24/2025, Entered: None Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 4/22/2025, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 4/18/2025, Entered: None Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 4/18/2025, Entered: None Substitute Attorney (G-01)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 3/11/2025, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 3/7/2025, Entered: None Substitute Attorney (G-01)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 2/12/2025, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 2/12/2025, Entered: None Certify Class Action
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 2/12/2025, Entered: None Sealed Declaration in Support
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 2/12/2025, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 1/31/2025, Entered: None Protective Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 1/30/2025, Entered: None Protective Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 1/8/2025, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 1/3/2025, Entered: None Substitute Attorney (G-01)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 1/3/2025, Entered: None Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1))
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 10/8/2024, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 10/4/2024, Entered: None Notice of Lodging
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 8/16/2024, Entered: None Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 8/13/2024, Entered: None Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 8/12/2024, Entered: None Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 8/12/2024, Entered: None Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 8/12/2024, Entered: None Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 8/6/2024, Entered: None Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 7/15/2024, Entered: None Declaration
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 7/10/2024, Entered: None Declaration
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 6/26/2024, Entered: None Declaration
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 6/6/2024, Entered: None Declaration
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 5/31/2024, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 4/29/2024, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 4/16/2024, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 2/13/2024, Entered: None Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 1/24/2024, Entered: None Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 1/24/2024, Entered: None Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 1/24/2024, Entered: None Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 12/27/2023, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 12/26/2023, Entered: None Substitute Attorney (G-01)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 12/22/2023, Entered: None Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 12/5/2023, Entered: None Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 11/27/2023, Entered: None Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 10/17/2023, Entered: None Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 10/13/2023, Entered: None Notice of Lodging
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 10/6/2023, Entered: None Amended Complaint/Petition
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 10/5/2023, Entered: None Dismiss
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 9/21/2023, Entered: None Dismiss
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 7/13/2023, Entered: None Extending Answer Due Deadline
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 7/12/2023, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 7/6/2023, Entered: None Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 7/6/2023, Entered: None Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 7/6/2023, Entered: None Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 6/26/2023, Entered: None Amended Complaint/Petition
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 6/7/2023, Entered: None Transcript Order Form (G-120)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 6/6/2023, Entered: None Dismiss
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 5/30/2023, Entered: None Transcript
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 5/17/2023, Entered: None Transcript Order Form (G-120)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 5/16/2023, Entered: None Strike
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 5/9/2023, Entered: None Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 5/8/2023, Entered: None Notice of Lodging
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 5/8/2023, Entered: None Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 5/5/2023, Entered: None Leave
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 5/2/2023, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 5/2/2023, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 5/1/2023, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 5/1/2023, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 5/1/2023, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 5/1/2023, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 5/1/2023, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 5/1/2023, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 5/1/2023, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 4/19/2023, Entered: None Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 4/3/2023, Entered: None For Judicial Notice
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 4/3/2023, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 4/3/2023, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 4/3/2023, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 4/3/2023, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 4/3/2023, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 4/3/2023, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 4/3/2023, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 4/3/2023, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 4/3/2023, Entered: None Transcript
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 2/24/2023, Entered: None Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 2/22/2023, Entered: None Notice (Other)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 2/22/2023, Entered: None Strike
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 2/22/2023, Entered: None Dismiss (cause or other)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 2/21/2023, Entered: None Supplement (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 2/21/2023, Entered: None Dismiss (cause or other)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 2/21/2023, Entered: None Dismiss (cause or other)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 2/21/2023, Entered: None Joinder
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 2/21/2023, Entered: None Dismiss (cause or other)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 2/21/2023, Entered: None Dismiss (cause or other)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 2/21/2023, Entered: None Dismiss (cause or other)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 2/21/2023, Entered: None Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 1/25/2023, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 1/23/2023, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 1/23/2023, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 1/20/2023, Entered: None Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 1/20/2023, Entered: None Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 1/20/2023, Entered: None Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 1/20/2023, Entered: None Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 1/19/2023, Entered: None Appearance
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 1/19/2023, Entered: None Appearance
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 1/12/2023, Entered: None Waiver of Service Executed
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 1/9/2023, Entered: None Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 1/4/2023, Entered: None Extending Answer Due Deadline
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 1/3/2023, Entered: None Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 12/29/2022, Entered: None Summons Issued
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 12/28/2022, Entered: None Summons Request
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 12/22/2022, Entered: None Amended Complaint/Petition
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 12/14/2022, Entered: None Transcript
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 12/7/2022, Entered: None Dismiss
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 11/7/2022, Entered: None Motion Hearing
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 10/25/2022, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 10/24/2022, Entered: None Reply
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 10/24/2022, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 10/17/2022, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 10/15/2022, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 10/14/2022, Entered: None Response in Support of Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 10/14/2022, Entered: None Objection
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 10/14/2022, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 10/14/2022, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 10/14/2022, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 10/5/2022, Entered: None For Judicial Notice
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 10/5/2022, Entered: None Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 9/30/2022, Entered: None Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 9/28/2022, Entered: None Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 9/26/2022, Entered: None For Judicial Notice
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 9/26/2022, Entered: None Dismiss (cause or other)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 9/17/2022, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 9/17/2022, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 9/17/2022, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 9/17/2022, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 9/17/2022, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 8/26/2022, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 8/25/2022, Entered: None Exceed Page Limitation
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/15/2022, Entered: None Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 7/29/2022, Entered: 7/29/2022 Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Paul Pierce, identifying Plaintiffs Paul Huegerich, Jonathan Semerjian, Nabil Nahlah, Till Freeman, Marko Ciklic, Tunisia Brignol, Milan Puda, Neil Shah, and Christopher DeLuca; and Defendants Steve Gentile, Giovanni Perone, Justin French, Mike Speer, Justin Maher, Kimberly Kardashian, Floyd Mayweather, Jr., Paul Pierce, Russell Davis, and Antonio Brown. (Weiner, Joel)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 7/29/2022, Entered: 7/29/2022 Request For Judicial Notice
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint [69] filed by Defendant Paul Pierce. (Weiner, Joel)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 7/29/2022, Entered: 7/29/2022 Motion to Dismiss (cause or other)Court Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Defendant Paul Pierce. Motion set for hearing on 10/17/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Attorney Joel R Weiner added to party Paul Pierce(pty:dft)) (Weiner, Joel)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/29/2022, Entered: 7/29/2022 Motion to Dismiss CaseCourt Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant Kim Kardashians Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Defendant Kimberly Kardashian. Motion set for hearing on 10/17/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Rhodes, Michael)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/29/2022, Entered: 7/29/2022 Motion to Dismiss CaseCourt Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Steve Gentile. Motion set for hearing on 10/17/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration In Support of Motion to Dismiss, # (2) Proposed Order Granting Defendant Stephen Gentile's Motion to Dismiss) (Klein, Corey)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document 66 Filed: 7/29/2022, Entered: 7/29/2022 Motion to Dismiss CaseCourt Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant Giovanni Perone's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint: Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Defendant Giovanni Perone. Motion set for hearing on 10/17/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Michaelson, Andrew)
LREF
Legal Document 65 Filed: 7/29/2022, Entered: 7/29/2022 Motion to Dismiss CaseCourt Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendants' Notice of Motion and Omnibus Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint: Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Defendant Kimberly Kardashian. Motion set for hearing on 10/17/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Rhodes, Michael)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/28/2022, Entered: 7/28/2022 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Robby Saldana to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Kimberly Kardashian, designating Max Sladek de la Cal as local counsel [61]. (iv)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/28/2022, Entered: 7/28/2022 waiver of service executed
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Neil Shah, Jonathan Semerjian, Milan Puda, Ryan Huegerich, Nabil Nahlah, Tunisia Brignol, Till Freeman, Marko Ciklic, Christopher DeLuca. upon Floyd Mayweather, Jr. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 7/27/2022, answer due 9/26/2022. Waiver of Service signed by Carla M. Wirtschafter. (Jasnoch, John)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document 62 Filed: 7/26/2022, Entered: 7/26/2022 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION REGARDING PAGE LIMITS FOR DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS [60] by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Defendants may jointly submit an omnibus motion to dismiss supported by a memorandum of points and authorities that shall not exceed 40 pages in length, excluding indices and exhibits. (iv)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/26/2022, Entered: 7/26/2022, Terminated: 7/28/2022 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Robby L.R. Saldana to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Kimberly Kardashian (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33698515) filed by Defendant Kimberly Kardashian. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Sladek De La Cal, Maximilian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/25/2022, Entered: 7/25/2022 Stipulation for Relief
STIPULATION for Relief from Page Limits for Defendants' Motions to Dismiss filed by Defendant Giovanni Perone. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Strong, Meghan)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/25/2022, Entered: 7/25/2022 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Maximilian Sladek De La Cal counsel for Defendant Kimberly Kardashian. Adding Max Sladek de la Cal as counsel of record for Kimberly Kardashian for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Kimberly Kardashian. (Attorney Maximilian Sladek De La Cal added to party Kimberly Kardashian(pty:dft))(Sladek De La Cal, Maximilian)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/7/2022, Entered: 7/7/2022 Order Extending Answer Due DeadlineCourt Filing
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTIONCOMPLAINT [57] by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Defendant Giovanni Perone shall serve and file any answer or response to the Consolidated Complaint by July 29, 2022. (et)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/7/2022, Entered: 7/7/2022 Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Giovanni Perone answer now due 7/29/2022, re Amended Complaint/Petition,, [41] filed by Defendant Giovanni Perone. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Strong, Meghan)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/6/2022, Entered: 6/7/2022 Order Extending Answer Due DeadlineCourt Filing
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT JUSTIN MAHER TO RESPOND TO CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT [55] by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Maher shall serve and file any answer or response to the Consolidated Complaint by July 15, 2022. (iv)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 6/3/2022, Entered: 6/3/2022 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days)
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to July 15, 2022 re Amended Complaint/Petition,, [41] filed by Plaintiffs Tunisia Brignol, Marko Ciklic, Christopher DeLuca, Till Freeman, Ryan Huegerich, Nabil Nahlah, Milan Puda, Jonathan Semerjian, Neil Shah. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order)(Jasnoch, John)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document 54 Filed: 5/31/2022, Entered: 5/31/2022 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT [51] by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Defendants shall serve and file any answer or response to the Consolidated Complaint by July 15, 2022. (iv)
LREF
Legal Document 53 Filed: 5/27/2022, Entered: 5/27/2022 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Steve Gentile, designating Corey E. Klein as local counsel. granting [50] Non-Resident Attorney Alison P. Baker (rolm)
LREF
Legal Document 52 Filed: 5/27/2022, Entered: 5/27/2022 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Steve Gentile, designating Corey E. Klein as local counsel. granting [49] Non-Resident Attorney Andrew M. Zeitlin (rolm)
LREF
Legal Document 51 Filed: 5/27/2022, Entered: 5/27/2022 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Respond as to Stipulation to Consolidate Cases[28], Order,, Set/Clear Flags, [29] filed by Defendant Giovanni Perone. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Strong, Meghan)
LREF
Legal Document 50 Filed: 5/25/2022, Entered: 5/25/2022, Terminated: 5/27/2022 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Alison P. Baker to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Steve Gentile (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33363730) filed by Defendant Steve Gentile. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney To Appear In A Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Klein, Corey)
LREF
Legal Document 49 Filed: 5/25/2022, Entered: 5/25/2022, Terminated: 5/27/2022 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Andrew M. Zeitlin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Steve Gentile (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33360520) filed by Defendant Steve Gentile. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney To Appear In A Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Klein, Corey)
LREF
Legal Document 48 Filed: 5/25/2022, Entered: 5/25/2022 Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Neil Shah, Jonathan Semerjian, Milan Puda, Ryan Huegerich, Nabil Nahlah, Tunisia Brignol, Till Freeman, Marko Ciklic, Christopher DeLuca, upon Defendant Russell Davis served on 5/21/2022, answer due 6/13/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Russell Davis, Personally in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jasnoch, John)
LREF
Legal Document 47 Filed: 5/25/2022, Entered: 5/25/2022 Order on Request to Substitute AttorneyCourt Filing
ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. granting [46] Request to Substitute Attorney. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm)
LREF
Legal Document 46 Filed: 5/24/2022, Entered: 5/24/2022, Terminated: 5/25/2022 Request to Substitute or Withdraw Attorney (G-01)
REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Corey E. Klein in place of attorney Marie C. Bafus , Michael S. Dicke, David W. Feder and Melissa Lawton filed by Defendant Steve Gentile. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order On Request For Approval Of Substitution Or Withdrawal of Attorney) (Attorney Corey E Klein added to party Steve Gentile(pty:dft)) (Klein, Corey)
LREF
Legal Document 45 Filed: 5/13/2022, Entered: 5/13/2022 Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Neil Shah, Jonathan Semerjian, Milan Puda, Ryan Huegerich, Nabil Nahlah, Tunisia Brignol, Till Freeman, Marko Ciklic, Christopher DeLuca, upon Defendant Mike Speer served on 4/28/2022, answer due 5/19/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Chelsey Speer, Wife/Co-occupant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jasnoch, John)
LREF
Legal Document 44 Filed: 5/13/2022, Entered: 5/13/2022 Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Neil Shah, Jonathan Semerjian, Milan Puda, Ryan Huegerich, Nabil Nahlah, Tunisia Brignol, Till Freeman, Marko Ciklic, Christopher DeLuca, upon Defendant Justin Maher served on 4/28/2022, answer due 5/19/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Justin Maher, Personally in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Jasnoch, John)
LREF
Legal Document 43 Filed: 4/25/2022, Entered: 4/25/2022 Summons issued
21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition,, [41] as to Defendant Antonio Brown, Russell Davis, Justin Maher, Mike Speer. (iv)
LREF
Legal Document 42 Filed: 4/22/2022, Entered: 4/22/2022 Summons Request
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition,, [41] filed by Plaintiffs Tunisia Brignol, Marko Ciklic, Christopher DeLuca, Till Freeman, Ryan Huegerich, Nabil Nahlah, Milan Puda, Jonathan Semerjian, Neil Shah. (Jasnoch, John)
LREF
Legal Document 41 Filed: 4/18/2022, Entered: 4/18/2022 Amended Complaint/Petition
First (Consolidated) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Defendant X, John Does 1-10, Justin French, Steve Gentile, Kimberly Kardashian, Floyd Mayweather, Jr., Giovanni Perone, Paul Pierce, Mike Speer, Justin Maher, Russell Davis, Antonio Brown amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)[1], filed by Plaintiffs Jonathan Semerjian, Ryan Huegerich, Nabil Nahlah, Till Freeman, Marko Ciklic, Christopher DeLuca, Neil Shah, Tunisia Brignol, Milan Puda(Attorney John T Jasnoch added to party Tunisia Brignol(pty:pla), Attorney John T Jasnoch added to party Milan Puda(pty:pla), Attorney John T Jasnoch added to party Neil Shah(pty:pla), Attorney John T Jasnoch added to party Christopher DeLuca(pty:pla))(Jasnoch, John)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/1/2022, Entered: 4/1/2022 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Craig Carpentino to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Giovanni Perone, designating David Willingham as local counsel [39]. (iv)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/30/2022, Entered: 3/30/2022, Terminated: 4/1/2022 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Craig Carpenito to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Giovanni Perone (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 3/15/2022, Receipt No. ACACDC-32951357) filed by Defendant Giovanni Perone. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Willingham, David)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document 38 Filed: 3/18/2022, Entered: 3/18/2022 Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html formCourt Filing
RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice (C. Carpenito) [36] by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by 3/25/2022. (iv)
LREF
Legal Document 37 Filed: 3/16/2022, Entered: 3/16/2022 Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form
NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Craig Carpenito to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Giovanni Perone (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32951357)[36]. The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Other error(s) with document(s): The attorney seeking to appear pro hac vice must complete Section I of this Application, personally sign, in ink, the certification in Section II, and have the designated Local Counsel sign in Section III. ELECTRONIC SIGNATURES ARE NOT ACCEPTED. See Instructions for Applicants (1). (lt)
LREF
Legal Document 36 Filed: 3/15/2022, Entered: 3/15/2022, Terminated: 3/18/2022 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
**STRICKEN** APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Craig Carpenito to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Giovanni Perone (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32951357) filed by Defendant Giovanni Perone. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Willingham, David) Modified on 3/18/2022 Per Response [38] (iv).
LREF
Legal Document 35 Filed: 3/11/2022, Entered: 3/11/2022 Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance[34]. The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance of Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
LREF
Legal Document 34 Filed: 3/10/2022, Entered: 3/10/2022 Notice of Appearance
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Michael S Dicke on behalf of Defendant Steve Gentile (Attorney Michael S Dicke added to party Steve Gentile(pty:dft))(Dicke, Michael)
LREF
Legal Document 33 Filed: 3/7/2022, Entered: 3/7/2022 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney David Feder to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Steve Gentile, designating Melissa Lawton as local counsel [32]. (iv)
LREF
Legal Document 32 Filed: 3/4/2022, Entered: 3/4/2022, Terminated: 3/7/2022 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
REQUEST of Non-Resident Attorney David W. Feder to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Steve Gentile (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32892204) filed by Defendant Steve Gentile. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Lawton, Melissa)
LREF
Legal Document 31 Filed: 3/4/2022, Entered: 3/4/2022 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Melissa Leigh Lawton counsel for Defendant Steve Gentile. Adding Melissa L. Lawton as counsel of record for Steve Gentile for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Steve Gentile. (Attorney Melissa Leigh Lawton added to party Steve Gentile(pty:dft))(Lawton, Melissa)
LREF
Legal Document 30 Filed: 3/3/2022, Entered: 3/3/2022 Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Steve Gentile, (Bafus, Marie)
LREF
Legal Document 29 Filed: 3/2/2022, Entered: 3/3/2022 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION FOR CONSOLIDATION; APPOINTMENT OF LEAD COUNSEL; SCHEDULE FOR FILING OF CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT AND RESPONSES THERETO; and CLOSING CASE NO. CV 22-400 UPON CONSOLIDATION [28] by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Plaintiffs shall file a Consolidated Complaint no later than April 18, 2022. Defendants shall serve and file any answer or response to the Consolidated Complaint 45 days after service of the Consolidated Complaint. (iv)
LREF
Legal Document 28 Filed: 3/2/2022, Entered: 3/2/2022 Stipulation to Consolidate Cases
Joint STIPULATION to Consolidate Cases as to 2:22-cv-00400 filed by Plaintiff Ryan Huegerich. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Jasnoch, John)
LREF
Legal Document 27 Filed: 2/7/2022, Entered: 2/7/2022 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Andrew Michaelson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Giovanni Perone, designating David Willingham as local counsel [26]. (iv)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/2/2022, Entered: 2/2/2022, Terminated: 2/7/2022 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Andrew Michaelson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Giovanni Perone (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32729153) filed by Defendant Giovanni Perone. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Willingham, David)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document 25 Filed: 2/2/2022, Entered: 2/2/2022 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney David Karl Willingham counsel for Defendant Giovanni Perone. Adding David Karl Willingham as counsel of record for Giovanni Perone for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Giovanni Perone. (Attorney David Karl Willingham added to party Giovanni Perone(pty:dft))(Willingham, David)
LREF
Legal Document 24 Filed: 2/2/2022, Entered: 2/2/2022 Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
CERTIFICATE AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Giovanni Perone, (Strong, Meghan)
LREF
Legal Document 23 Filed: 2/1/2022, Entered: 2/1/2022 Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Steve Gentile answer now due 3/9/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)[1] filed by defendant Steve Gentile.(Bafus, Marie)
LREF
Legal Document 22 Filed: 2/1/2022, Entered: 2/1/2022 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Marie Bafus counsel for Defendant Steve Gentile. Adding Marie C. Bafus as counsel of record for Steve Gentile for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Steve Gentile. (Attorney Marie Bafus added to party Steve Gentile(pty:dft))(Bafus, Marie)
LREF
Legal Document 21 Filed: 1/31/2022, Entered: 1/31/2022 Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Kimberly Kardashian, (Rhodes, Michael)
LREF
Legal Document 20 Filed: 1/28/2022, Entered: 1/28/2022 Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Paul Pierce answer now due 3/4/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)[1] filed by Plaintiff Ryan Huegerich.(Jasnoch, John)
LREF
Legal Document 19 Filed: 1/27/2022, Entered: 1/27/2022 Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Giovanni Perone answer now due 3/4/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)[1] filed by Defendant Giovanni Perone Giovanni Perone.(Strong, Meghan)
LREF
Legal Document 18 Filed: 1/27/2022, Entered: 1/27/2022 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Meghan Strong counsel for Defendant Giovanni Perone. Adding Meghan H. Strong as counsel of record for Defendant Giovanni Perone for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Giovanni Perone. (Attorney Meghan Strong added to party Giovanni Perone(pty:dft))(Strong, Meghan)
LREF
Legal Document 17 Filed: 1/25/2022, Entered: 1/25/2022 Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ryan Huegerich, upon Defendant Justin French served on 1/12/2022, answer due 2/2/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Justin French in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Jasnoch, John)
LREF
Legal Document 16 Filed: 1/24/2022, Entered: 1/24/2022 Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ryan Huegerich, upon Defendant Giovanni Perone served on 1/12/2022, answer due 2/2/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Giovanni Perone in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Jasnoch, John)
LREF
Legal Document 15 Filed: 1/24/2022, Entered: 1/24/2022 Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ryan Huegerich, upon Defendant Steve Gentile served on 1/15/2022, answer due 2/7/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Steve Gentile in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Jasnoch, John)
LREF
Legal Document 14 Filed: 1/24/2022, Entered: 1/24/2022 Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ryan Huegerich, upon Defendant Paul Pierce served on 1/12/2022, answer due 2/2/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Paul Pierce in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Jasnoch, John)
LREF
Legal Document 13 Filed: 1/13/2022, Entered: 1/13/2022 waiver of service executed
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Ryan Huegerich. upon Kimberly Kardashian waiver sent by Plaintiff on 1/10/2022, answer due 3/11/2022. Waiver of Service signed by Michael G. Rhodes. (Jasnoch, John)
LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 12 Filed: 1/13/2022, Entered: 1/13/2022 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Joseph D Mornin counsel for Defendant Kimberly Kardashian. Adding Joseph D. Mornin as counsel of record for Kim Kardashian West for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Kim Kardashian West. (Attorney Joseph D Mornin added to party Kimberly Kardashian(pty:dft))(Mornin, Joseph)
LREF
Legal Document 11 Filed: 1/13/2022, Entered: 1/13/2022 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Travis LeBlanc counsel for Defendant Kimberly Kardashian. Adding Travis LeBlanc as counsel of record for Kim Kardashian West for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Kim Kardashian West. (Attorney Travis LeBlanc added to party Kimberly Kardashian(pty:dft))(LeBlanc, Travis)
LREF
Legal Document 10 Filed: 1/10/2022, Entered: 1/10/2022 Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)[1] as to Defendants Justin French, Steve Gentile, Kimberly Kardashian, Floyd Mayweather, Jr., Giovanni Perone and Paul Pierce. (jtil)
LREF
Legal Document 9 Filed: 1/10/2022, Entered: 1/10/2022 Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html formCourt Filing
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
LREF
Legal Document 8 Filed: 1/10/2022, Entered: 1/10/2022 Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
LREF
Legal Document 7 Filed: 1/10/2022, Entered: 1/10/2022 Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html formCourt Filing
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (jtil)
LREF
Legal Document 6 Filed: 1/10/2022, Entered: 1/10/2022 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael G Rhodes counsel for Defendant Kimberly Kardashian. Adding Michael G. Rhodes as counsel of record for Kimberly Kardashian for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Kimberly Kardashian. (Attorney Michael G Rhodes added to party Kimberly Kardashian(pty:dft))(Rhodes, Michael)
LREF
Legal Document 5 Filed: 1/7/2022, Entered: 1/7/2022 Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Ryan Huegerich, identifying n/a. (Jasnoch, John)
LREF
Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/7/2022, Entered: 1/7/2022 Declaration
LREF
Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/7/2022, Entered: 1/7/2022 Summons Request
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)[1] filed by Plaintiff Ryan Huegerich. (Jasnoch, John)
LREF
Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/7/2022, Entered: 1/7/2022 Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Ryan Huegerich. (Jasnoch, John)
LREF
Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/7/2022, Entered: 1/7/2022 Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32588084 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Ryan Huegerich. (Attorney John T Jasnoch added to party Ryan Huegerich(pty:pla))(Jasnoch, John)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 73 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?