Stubblefield v. US West Communications, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 3:00-cv-01722-ST

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Tammar M. Stubblefield, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hollander Lebenbaum & Gannicott

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David J. Hollander +1 503 222 2408 +1 503 222 0659 david@hollanderlaw.com
v.
Qwest Communications, Inc. Qwest Communications, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Qwest"

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Calvin L. Keith +1 503 727 2000 +1 503 727 2222 ckeith@perkinscoie.com
No Logo US West Communications, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Calvin L. Keith +1 503 727 2000 +1 503 727 2222 ckeith@perkinscoie.com
Office Portland
Filed 12/14/2000
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $326000
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County Multnomah
Terminated 12/19/2001
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CONSOLIDATED, FRC, TERMINATED
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/19/2001, Entered: 12/19/2001 Judgment*
Judgment: Based on the stipulation of the parties (See CV00-957), IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED this action is dismissed with prejudice and without fees or costs to any party. Signed 12/18/01 by deputy clerk. (da, )
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/13/2001, Entered: 2/15/2001 Case Reassignment Notice
    Order and Notice of Case Reassignment : Case reassigned from Brown, Anna J. to Janice M. Stewart. (ljb, )
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/7/2001, Entered: 2/8/2001 SchedulingCourt Filing
      Record of Order by Judge Anna J. Brown: Joint Motion to Consolidate and to Extend Deadline to Answer Complaint (#5) is GRANTED. This matter is reassisgned to Judge Janice Stewart and consolidated with case number CV 00-957 ST. Defendant's Answer shall be filed within 10 days of the date of this Order. Case number of this matter to reflect "ST" in case number on all future pleadings. Counsle are further directed to immediately file their respective Consents to proceed before a magistrate in this matter. (sm, )
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/6/2001, Entered: 2/7/2001 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint
        Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer.(related document(s)[1]) Filed by Qwest, US West Communications, Inc.. (ljb, )
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/28/2000, Entered: 12/29/2000 Return of Service Executed
          Return of Service Executed upon Qwest on 12/15/00. Filed by Tammar M. Stubblefield. (tely, )
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/28/2000, Entered: 12/29/2000 Return of Service Executed
            Return of Service Executed upon US West Communications on 12/15/00. Filed by Tammar M. Stubblefield. (tely, )
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/14/2000, Entered: 12/15/2000 Discovery Order
              Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order: Discovery to be completed by 4/13/2001. Joint ADR Report due by 5/13/2001. Pretrial Order due by 5/13/2001. (ljb, )
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/14/2000, Entered: 12/15/2000 Complaint
                Complaint against Qwest, US West Communications, Inc.. Filing Fee collected. Receipt #: 434610 issued.Summons issued as to US West Communications and Qwest. Filed by Tammar M. Stubblefield (ljb, )
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 80 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?