Lykins et al v. Hohnbaum et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 3:01-cv-00063-JO

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Allan Lykins, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald D. Dartt +1 503 221 1907 +1 503 226 1321 donalddartt@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Herbert A. Terrell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Spencer M. Neal +1 503 473 8325 +1 503 295 0676 spencerneal@justice.com
No Logo Angela Dittmar-Lykins, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald D. Dartt +1 503 221 1907 +1 503 226 1321 donalddartt@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Herbert A. Terrell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Spencer M. Neal +1 503 473 8325 +1 503 295 0676 spencerneal@justice.com
v.
No Logo City of Scappoose, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Miller & Wagner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David C. Lewis +1 503 299 6116 +1 503 299 6106 dcl@miller-wagner.com
Space Robert S. Wagner +1 503 299 6116 +1 503 299 6106 rsw@miller-wagner.com
No Logo Lisa Smith, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Miller & Wagner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David C. Lewis +1 503 299 6116 +1 503 299 6106 dcl@miller-wagner.com
Space Robert S. Wagner +1 503 299 6116 +1 503 299 6106 rsw@miller-wagner.com
No Logo Margo Dew, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hart Wagner LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven A. Kraemer +1 503 222 4499 +1 503 222 2301 sak@hhw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Miller & Wagner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David C. Lewis +1 503 299 6116 +1 503 299 6106 dcl@miller-wagner.com
No Logo Rick Hohnbaum, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Miller & Wagner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David C. Lewis +1 503 299 6116 +1 503 299 6106 dcl@miller-wagner.com
Space Robert S. Wagner +1 503 299 6116 +1 503 299 6106 rsw@miller-wagner.com
Office Portland
Filed 1/12/2001
Jury Demand Both
Demand
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Columbia
Terminated 2/25/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags FRC, TERMINATED
  Entries (43) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/25/2002, Entered: 2/25/2002 Judgment*Court Filing
Judgment: This action is dismissed with prejudice.Signed 2/22/02 by Judge Robert E. Jones. (ccs, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/25/2002, Entered: 2/25/2002 OpinionCourt Filing
    Opinion and Order by Judge Robert E. Jones. Signed 2/22/02 (ccs, )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 41 Filed: 2/8/2002, Entered: 2/8/2002 Motion HearingCourt Filing
      CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Proceedings -- Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment is denied.Defendant's motion for summary judgment is granted. Opinion to follow. Strike pretrial conference of 4/1/02, and jury trial of 4/9/02. Ordered by Judge Robert E. Jones. Counsel Present for Defendant: David Lewis. Court Reporter: Amanda LeGore. (ccs, )
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/16/2002, Entered: 1/17/2002 Motion to Dismiss
        Objection(s) to Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Statement of Facts. Filed by all defendants. (ccs, )
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/16/2002, Entered: 1/17/2002 reply to motion
          Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by all defendants. (Related motion(s)[24]) (ccs, )
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/8/2002, Entered: 1/15/2002 Notice of Change of Address
            Corrected Notice of Address Change. Filed by Spencer M. Neal, representing Angela Dittmar-Lykins and Allan Lykins. (tomg, )
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/15/2002 Notice of Change of Address
              Notice of Address Change. Filed by Spencer M. Neal, representing Angela Dittmar-Lykins and Allan Lykins. (tomg, )
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/3/2002, Entered: 1/29/2002 Response
                Response To Defendants' Statement of Facts (docketed late because original and copy both went to chambers, and not to docketing). Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related document(s)[26]) (tomg, )
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/3/2002, Entered: 1/4/2002 Response to Motion
                  Response to Motion (Plaintiffs' Response To Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment). Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related motion(s)[24]) (tomg, )
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/2/2002, Entered: 1/4/2002 Objection
                    Objection(s) To The Declaration Of Allan Lykins. Filed by all defendants. (tomg, )
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/2/2002, Entered: 1/4/2002 Objection
                      Objection(s) To The Declaration Of Angela Dittmar-Lykins. Filed by all defendants. (tomg, )
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/2/2002, Entered: 1/4/2002 Response
                        Response (Defendant's Response To Plaintiff's Statement Of Undisputed Material Facts). Filed by all defendants. (Related document(s)[22]) (tomg, )
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/2/2002, Entered: 1/4/2002 Response to Motion
                          Response to Motion (Defendants' Response To Plaintiff's Motion For Partial Summary Judgment). Filed by all defendants. (Related motion(s)[20]) (tomg, )
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank 30 Filed: 12/26/2001, Entered: 12/26/2001 Scheduling
                            CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order -- Defendants' motion for summary judgment and plaintiffs' motion for partial summary judgment are set for hearing on 2/8/2002 at 09:00AM. (Related documents(s) [24], [20]) (ccs, )
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/20/2001, Entered: 12/21/2001 Declaration
                              Declaration of Spencer M. Neal. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related document(s)[20]) (tomg, )
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/20/2001, Entered: 12/21/2001 Concise Statement of Material Fact
                                Concise Statement of Material Fact. Filed by all plaintiffs. (tomg, )
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/20/2001, Entered: 12/21/2001 Memorandum in Support
                                  Memorandum in Support Of Motion For Partial Summary Judgment. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related document(s)[20]) (tomg, )
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/20/2001, Entered: 12/21/2001 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
                                    Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Oral Argument Requested). Filed by all plaintiffs. (tomg, )
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/19/2001, Entered: 12/21/2001 Affidavit
                                      Affidavit of Rick Hohnbaum In Support of Motion For Summary Judgment. Filed by all defendants. (Related document(s)[24]) (tomg, )
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/19/2001, Entered: 12/21/2001 Affidavit
                                        Affidavit of Robert S. Wagner In Support of Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment. Filed by all defendants. (Related document(s)[24]) (tomg, )
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/19/2001, Entered: 12/21/2001 Affidavit
                                          Affidavit of Andrew E. Jordan In Support of Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment. Filed by all defendants. (Related document(s)[24]) (tomg, )
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/19/2001, Entered: 12/21/2001 Concise Statement of Material Fact
                                            Concise Statement of Material Fact In Support of Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment. Filed by all defendants. (tomg, )
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/19/2001, Entered: 12/21/2001 Memorandum in Support
                                              Memorandum in Support Of Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment. Filed by all defendants. (Related document(s)[24]) (tomg, )
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/19/2001, Entered: 12/21/2001 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                Motion for Summary Judgment (Oral Argument Requested). Filed by all defendants. (tomg, )
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/22/2001, Entered: 10/22/2001 Trial Management Order
                                                  ORDER ESTABLISHING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL CONFERENCE DATES AND PROCEDURES. (ccs, )
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                    Blank 18 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/19/2001 Rule 16 ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                    CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Rule 16 Conference -- Plaintiff's motion (14) for extension of deadlines is granted. Discovery to be completed by 10/19/2001. Dispositive Motions due by 12/19/2001. Pretrial Conference set for 4/1/2002 at 09:30AM. Three day Jury Trial set for 4/9/2002 at 09:00AM. Pretrial order is waived. Ordered by Judge Robert E. Jones. Counsel Present for Plaintiff: Spencer Neal. Counsel Present for Defendant: Dave Lewis. Court Reporter: Amanda LeGore. (ccs, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 17 Filed: 10/18/2001, Entered: 10/18/2001 Order on Motion for JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                      CIVIL MINUTES:RECORD OF ORDER: Granting Stipulated Motion for Judgment of Dismissal (as to Defendant Margo Dew) (Related Doc #[16]) by Judge Robert E. Jones. (ccs, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/10/2001, Entered: 10/15/2001, Terminated: 10/18/2001 ~Motion for Judgment
                                                        Motion for Judgment of Dismissal (Defendant Margo Dew). Filed by all plaintiffs. (tomg, )
                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 10/10/2001, Entered: 10/10/2001 Scheduling
                                                          CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order -- Plaintiff's motion (14) for extension of pretrial deadlines is set for hearing on 10/19/2001 at 11:00AM. (Related documents(s) [14]) (ccs, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/5/2001, Entered: 10/5/2001, Terminated: 10/19/2001 Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines
                                                            Stipulated Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines. Filed by all plaintiffs. (tomg, )
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 9/21/2001, Entered: 9/21/2001 Scheduling
                                                              CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order -- Rule 16 Conference set for 10/19/2001 at 11:00AM. (ccs, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 10 Filed: 8/10/2001, Entered: 8/10/2001 Scheduling
                                                                Minute Entry: Record of Order -- Defendants' motion (6) for extension of pretrial deadlines is granted as follows: Discovery to be completed by 10/11/2001. Joint Status Report due by 10/11/2001. Pretrial Order due by 11/12/2001. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report due by 10/11/2001 Dispositive Motions due by 10/11/2001. (ccs, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/8/2001, Entered: 8/10/2001 Affidavit
                                                                  Affidavit of Robert S. Wagner In Support of Motion For Order To Extend Discovery. Filed by Robert S. Wagner on behalf of City of Scappoose, Rick Hohnbaum, Lisa Smith. (Related document(s)[11]) (tomg, )
                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/8/2001, Entered: 8/10/2001 Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines
                                                                    Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines. Filed by Robert S. Wagner on behalf of City of Scappoose, Rick Hohnbaum, Lisa Smith. (tomg, )
                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/8/2001, Entered: 6/11/2001 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                      Notice of Address Change. Filed by all plaintiffs. (tomg, )
                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/14/2001, Entered: 5/15/2001 Order on motion for extension of discovery & PTO d
                                                                        Record of Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines (Related Doc #[6]). Discovery to be completed by 7/12/2001. Joint Status Report due by 7/12/2001. Pretrial Order due by 8/13/2001. Joint ADR Report due by 7/12/2001. Dispositive Motions due by 7/12/2001. (ccs, )
                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/11/2001, Entered: 5/11/2001 Declaration
                                                                          Declaration of Spencer Neal In Support of Motion To Extend Pretrial Deadlines. (related document(s)[6]) Filed by all plaintiffs. (tomg, )
                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/11/2001, Entered: 5/11/2001, Terminated: 5/15/2001 Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines
                                                                            Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines. Filed by all plaintiffs. (tomg, )
                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/21/2001, Entered: 3/23/2001 Notice
                                                                              Notice of Substitution of Counsel For Defendant Margo Dew Only. Filed by Margo Dew. (tomg, )
                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/13/2001, Entered: 2/15/2001 Answer
                                                                                Answer to Complaint (Jury Trial Demanded). (Related Doc # [1]) Filed by City of Scappoose, Margo Dew, Rick Hohnbaum, Lisa Smith. (tomg, )
                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/25/2001, Entered: 1/28/2001 Return of Service Executed
                                                                                  Return of Service Executed upon City of Scappoose on 1/18/01. Filed by Allan Lykins. (tomg, )
                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/12/2001, Entered: 1/16/2001 Discovery Order
                                                                                    Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order: Discovery to be completed by 5/12/2001. Joint Status Report due by 5/12/2001. Joint ADR Report due by 6/11/2001. Pretrial Order due by 6/11/2001. (tomg, )
                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/12/2001, Entered: 1/16/2001 Complaint
                                                                                      Complaint against City of Scappoose, Margo Dew, Rick Hohnbaum, Lisa Smith. Filing Fee collected. Receipt #: 435168 issued.Summons issued as to City of Scappoose. Filed by Angela Dittmar-Lykins, Allan Lykins (tomg, )
                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                        This case has been viewed 761 times.

                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                        Space
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                         
                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                        Need Password Help?