Foundation of Human Understanding v. United States of America
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 6:01-cv-03014-AA

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Foundation of Human Understanding, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joel R Bryan +1 818 991 1049

Toggle Switch Represented by grrtech.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dennis M. Richardson +1 541 664 6622 +1 541 664 6625 randa@grrtech.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Office Eugene
Filed 2/8/2001
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 875 - Taxes: Customer Challenge
Cause Section 26 U.S.C. § 7609 IRS
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County Josephine
Terminated 4/17/2001
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags FRC, TERMINATED
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/17/2001, Entered: 4/18/2001 Judgment*
Judgment of Dismissal:Signed 4/17/01 by Deputy L. Malley. (related document(s)[9]) (cp, )
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/17/2001, Entered: 4/18/2001 Order of DismissalCourt Filing
    Order of Dismissal by Judge Ann Aiken. Signed 4/17/01 (cp, )
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/6/2001, Entered: 4/6/2001 Return of Service Executed
      Return of Service Executed upon John Ashcroft, signed for by Tax West on 2/15/01. Filed by Foundation of Human Understanding. (cp, )
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/16/2001, Entered: 3/16/2001 Return of Service Executed as to USA
        Return of Service (Federal Defendant) Executed upon Paula Henderson, signed for by Charlotte James, Internal Revenue Service, served via certified mail on 2/12/01. Filed by Foundation of Human Understanding. (cp, )
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/16/2001, Entered: 3/16/2001 Return of Service Executed as to USA
          Return of Service (Federal Defendant) Executed upon Kim Butler, US Attorney on 2/15/01. Filed by Foundation of Human Understanding. (cp, )
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/12/2001, Entered: 2/26/2001 Certificate Of Service.
            Certificate of Service. (related document(s)[2]) Filed by Foundation of Human Understanding. (cp, )
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/9/2001, Entered: 2/26/2001 Exhibits
              Exhibits to Petition to Quash Summons. (related document(s)[1]) Filed by Foundation of Human Understanding. (cp, )
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/8/2001, Entered: 2/26/2001 Order on Application for special admission pro hacCourt Filing
                Order Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Joel R. Bryan. Receipt number 801192 Signed 2/8/01 by Judge Ann Aiken. (cp, )
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/8/2001, Entered: 2/26/2001 Notice
                  Notice of Petition for Order to Quash Summons; Memorandum of Points and Autorities. (related document(s)[1]) Filed by Foundation of Human Understanding. (cp, )
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/8/2001, Entered: 2/26/2001 Petition
                    Petition against United States of America. to Quash Summons Filing Fee collected. Receipt #: 801193 and 903454 issued. Filed by Foundation of Human Understanding (cp, ) Modified on 3/1/2001 (cp, ).
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 56 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?