National Wildlife Federation et al v. National Marine Fisheries Service et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 3:01-cv-00640-RE

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 16, 2021 at 4:56 PM DT (1.7 days ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo American Rivers Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by EARTHJUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen D. Mashuda +1 206 343 7340 +1 206 343 1526 smashuda@earthjustice.org
Space Todd Dale True +20634 373 40ext30 +1 206 343 1526 ttrue@earthjustice.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Pacific Environmental Advocacy Ctr

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel John Rohlf , +1 503 768 6707 +1 503 768 6642 rohlf@lclark.edu
No Logo Columbia Riverkeeper, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by EARTHJUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen D. Mashuda +1 206 343 7340 +1 206 343 1526 smashuda@earthjustice.org
Space Todd Dale True +20634 373 40ext30 +1 206 343 1526 ttrue@earthjustice.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Pacific Environmental Advocacy Ctr

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel John Rohlf , +1 503 768 6707 +1 503 768 6642 rohlf@lclark.edu
No Logo Federation of Fly Fishers, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by EARTHJUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen D. Mashuda +1 206 343 7340 +1 206 343 1526 smashuda@earthjustice.org
Space Todd Dale True +20634 373 40ext30 +1 206 343 1526 ttrue@earthjustice.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Pacific Environmental Advocacy Ctr

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel John Rohlf , +1 503 768 6707 +1 503 768 6642 rohlf@lclark.edu
No Logo Idaho Rivers United, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by EARTHJUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen D. Mashuda +1 206 343 7340 +1 206 343 1526 smashuda@earthjustice.org
Space Todd Dale True +20634 373 40ext30 +1 206 343 1526 ttrue@earthjustice.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Pacific Environmental Advocacy Ctr

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel John Rohlf , +1 503 768 6707 +1 503 768 6642 rohlf@lclark.edu
No Logo Idaho Steelhead and Salmon United, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by EARTHJUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen D. Mashuda +1 206 343 7340 +1 206 343 1526 smashuda@earthjustice.org
Space Todd Dale True +20634 373 40ext30 +1 206 343 1526 ttrue@earthjustice.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Pacific Environmental Advocacy Ctr

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel John Rohlf , +1 503 768 6707 +1 503 768 6642 rohlf@lclark.edu
No Logo Idaho Wildlife Federation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by EARTHJUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen D. Mashuda +1 206 343 7340 +1 206 343 1526 smashuda@earthjustice.org
Space Todd Dale True +20634 373 40ext30 +1 206 343 1526 ttrue@earthjustice.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Pacific Environmental Advocacy Ctr

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel John Rohlf , +1 503 768 6707 +1 503 768 6642 rohlf@lclark.edu
No Logo Institute for Fisheries Resources, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by EARTHJUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen D. Mashuda +1 206 343 7340 +1 206 343 1526 smashuda@earthjustice.org
Space Todd Dale True +20634 373 40ext30 +1 206 343 1526 ttrue@earthjustice.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Pacific Environmental Advocacy Ctr

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel John Rohlf , +1 503 768 6707 +1 503 768 6642 rohlf@lclark.edu
No Logo National Wildlife Federation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by EARTHJUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen D. Mashuda +1 206 343 7340 +1 206 343 1526 smashuda@earthjustice.org
Space Todd Dale True +20634 373 40ext30 +1 206 343 1526 ttrue@earthjustice.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Pacific Environmental Advocacy Ctr

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel John Rohlf , +1 503 768 6707 +1 503 768 6642 rohlf@lclark.edu
No Logo Northwest Sportfishing Industry Association, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by EARTHJUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen D. Mashuda +1 206 343 7340 +1 206 343 1526 smashuda@earthjustice.org
Space Todd Dale True +20634 373 40ext30 +1 206 343 1526 ttrue@earthjustice.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Pacific Environmental Advocacy Ctr

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel John Rohlf , +1 503 768 6707 +1 503 768 6642 rohlf@lclark.edu
No Logo NW Energy Coalition, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by EARTHJUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen D. Mashuda +1 206 343 7340 +1 206 343 1526 smashuda@earthjustice.org
Space Todd Dale True +20634 373 40ext30 +1 206 343 1526 ttrue@earthjustice.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Pacific Environmental Advocacy Ctr

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel John Rohlf , +1 503 768 6707 +1 503 768 6642 rohlf@lclark.edu
No Logo Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by EARTHJUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen D. Mashuda +1 206 343 7340 +1 206 343 1526 smashuda@earthjustice.org
Space Todd Dale True +20634 373 40ext30 +1 206 343 1526 ttrue@earthjustice.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Pacific Environmental Advocacy Ctr

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel John Rohlf , +1 503 768 6707 +1 503 768 6642 rohlf@lclark.edu
No Logo Salmon for All, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by EARTHJUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen D. Mashuda +1 206 343 7340 +1 206 343 1526 smashuda@earthjustice.org
Space Todd Dale True +20634 373 40ext30 +1 206 343 1526 ttrue@earthjustice.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Pacific Environmental Advocacy Ctr

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel John Rohlf , +1 503 768 6707 +1 503 768 6642 rohlf@lclark.edu
No Logo Sierra Club, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by EARTHJUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen D. Mashuda +1 206 343 7340 +1 206 343 1526 smashuda@earthjustice.org
Space Todd Dale True +20634 373 40ext30 +1 206 343 1526 ttrue@earthjustice.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Pacific Environmental Advocacy Ctr

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel John Rohlf , +1 503 768 6707 +1 503 768 6642 rohlf@lclark.edu
No Logo Trout Unlimited, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by EARTHJUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen D. Mashuda +1 206 343 7340 +1 206 343 1526 smashuda@earthjustice.org
Space Todd Dale True +20634 373 40ext30 +1 206 343 1526 ttrue@earthjustice.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Pacific Environmental Advocacy Ctr

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel John Rohlf , +1 503 768 6707 +1 503 768 6642 rohlf@lclark.edu
No Logo Washington Wildlife Federation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by EARTHJUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen D. Mashuda +1 206 343 7340 +1 206 343 1526 smashuda@earthjustice.org
Space Todd Dale True +20634 373 40ext30 +1 206 343 1526 ttrue@earthjustice.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Pacific Environmental Advocacy Ctr

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel John Rohlf , +1 503 768 6707 +1 503 768 6642 rohlf@lclark.edu
v.
No Logo National Marine Fisheries Service, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas L. Sansonetti +1 202 514 2738

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Seth M Barsky +1 202 305 0223 +1 202 305 0275 seth.barsky@usdoj.gov
Space Coby Healy Howell +1 503 727 1023 +1 503 727 1117 coby.howell@usdoj.gov
Space Bridget Kennedy McNeil +1 303 844 1484 +1 303 844 1350 bridget.mcneil@usdoj.gov
Space Stephen J. Odell +1 503 727 1024 +1 503 727 1117 steve.odell@usdoj.gov
No Logo United States Army Corps of Engineers, Defendant
Officially listed as "U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Coby Healy Howell +1 503 727 1023 +1 503 727 1117 coby.howell@usdoj.gov
Space Bridget Kennedy McNeil +1 303 844 1484 +1 303 844 1350 bridget.mcneil@usdoj.gov
No Logo U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Coby Healy Howell +1 503 727 1023 +1 503 727 1117 coby.howell@usdoj.gov
Space Bridget Kennedy McNeil +1 303 844 1484 +1 303 844 1350 bridget.mcneil@usdoj.gov
No Logo Clarkston Golf & Country Club, Intervenor-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James W. Givens +1 208 746 2374 +1 208 746 6640

Toggle Switch Represented by Hart Wagner LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rodney K. Norton +1 503 222 4499 +1 503 222 2301 rkn@hhw.com
No Logo Confederated Salish and Kootenai Tribes, Intervenor-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Confederated Salish and Kootenai Tribes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph P. Hovenkotter +1 406 675 4665 joeh@cskt.org
No Logo Franklin County Farm Bureau Federation, Intervenor-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Budd-Falen Law Offices LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karen Jean Budd-Falen +1 307 632 5105 +1 307 637 3891 main@buddfalen.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Dunn Carney Allen Higgins & Tongue LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth E. Howard +1 503 224 6440 +1 503 224 7324 eeh@dunn-carney.com
No Logo Grant County Farm Bureau Federation, Intervenor-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Budd-Falen Law Offices LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karen Jean Budd-Falen +1 307 632 5105 +1 307 637 3891 main@buddfalen.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Dunn Carney Allen Higgins & Tongue LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth E. Howard +1 503 224 6440 +1 503 224 7324 eeh@dunn-carney.com
No Logo Portland Office, Intervenor-Defendant
Officially listed as "Kootenai Tribe of Idaho"

Toggle Switch Represented by Haglund Kelley Horngren Jones & Wilder LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William K. Barquin +1 503 225 0777 +1 503 225 1257 wbarquin@hk-law.com
Space Julie A. Weis +1 503 225 0777 +1 503 225 1257 jweis@hk-law.com
No Logo Northwest Irrigation Utilities, Intervenor-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Stoel Rives, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barbara D. Craig +1 503 294 9166 +1 503 220 2480 bdcraig@stoel.com
Space Beth S. Ginsberg +1 206 323 7581 +1 206 386 7500 bsginsberg@stoel.com
No Logo Northwest River Partners, Intervenor-Defendant
No Logo Public Power Council, Intervenor-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Stoel Rives, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barbara D. Craig +1 503 294 9166 +1 503 220 2480 bdcraig@stoel.com
Space Beth S. Ginsberg +1 206 323 7581 +1 206 386 7500 bsginsberg@stoel.com
No Logo State of Idaho, Intervenor-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Attorney General, Civil Litigation Division

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven W Strack +1 208 334 4124 +1 208 334 2690 steve.strack@ag.idaho.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Idaho Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Clay R Smith +1 208 334 4118 +1 208 854 8073 clay.smith@ag.idaho.gov
No Logo State of Montana, Intervenor-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Glaser, Weil, Fink, Jacobs, Howard, Avchen & Shapiro, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark Lawrence Stermitz +1 310 556 7861 +1 310 556 2920 mstermitz@chrisglase.com

Toggle Switch Represented by OFFICE OF THE YELLOWSTONE COUNTY ATTORNEY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert N. Lane +1 406 444 4594 +1 406 444 7456 blane@mt.gov
Space Jeremiah D. Weiner +1 406 444 5886 +1 406 444 3549 jweiner2@mt.gov
No Logo Washington Farm Bureau Federation, Intervenor-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Budd-Falen Law Offices LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karen Jean Budd-Falen +1 307 632 5105 +1 307 637 3891 main@buddfalen.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Dunn Carney Allen Higgins & Tongue LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth E. Howard +1 503 224 6440 +1 503 224 7324 eeh@dunn-carney.com
No Logo State Of Oregon, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by State of Oregon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Roger J. DeHoog +1 503 947 4700 +1 503 947 4793 roger.dehoog@doj.state.or.us
Space David Euan Leith +1 503 947 4700 +1 503 947 4793 david.leith@doj.state.or.us
Office Portland
Filed 5/3/2001
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 893 - Environmental Matters
Cause Section 16 U.S.C. § 1538 Endangered Species Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Plaintiff
Disposition
County Outside State
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
301-cv-00640-RE None
Related Case
Other Court Cases '04-35673'[], '06-35019'['9th Circuit Court of Appeals']
Def Custody Status
Flag PROTECTIVE ORD
  Entries (1965) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2368 Filed: 6/16/2021, Entered: None reply to motion
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2367 Filed: 6/9/2021, Entered: None Declaration
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2366 Filed: 6/9/2021, Entered: None Amend/Correct
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2365 Filed: 6/9/2021, Entered: None Response to Motion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2363 Filed: 5/27/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2362 Filed: 5/19/2021, Entered: None Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2361 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: None Attorney Association
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2360 Filed: 4/27/2021, Entered: None Attorney Appearance
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2358 Filed: 4/22/2021, Entered: None Withdraw
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2356 Filed: 4/21/2021, Entered: None Order on Application for CMECF Registration as a Self-Represented Party - FORM EVENT
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2355 Filed: 4/19/2021, Entered: None Notice
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2354 Filed: 4/19/2021, Entered: None Notice
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2353 Filed: 4/19/2021, Entered: None Notice
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2352 Filed: 4/19/2021, Entered: None Notice
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2351 Filed: 4/19/2021, Entered: None Notice
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2350 Filed: 4/19/2021, Entered: None Notice
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2349 Filed: 4/19/2021, Entered: None Notice
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2348 Filed: 4/19/2021, Entered: None Notice
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2347 Filed: 4/19/2021, Entered: None MOTION - Miscellaneous
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2346 Filed: 4/19/2021, Entered: None Attorney Appearance
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2345 Filed: 4/19/2021, Entered: None Notice
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2344 Filed: 4/19/2021, Entered: None Notice
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2343 Filed: 4/19/2021, Entered: None Notice
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2342 Filed: 4/19/2021, Entered: None Notice
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2341 Filed: 4/19/2021, Entered: None Application for CM/ECF Registration as a Self-Represented Party
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2340 Filed: 4/16/2021, Entered: None Notice
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2339 Filed: 4/16/2021, Entered: None Address Change
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2338 Filed: 4/16/2021, Entered: None Notice
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2337 Filed: 4/16/2021, Entered: None Notice
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2336 Filed: 4/6/2021, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2335 Filed: 4/2/2021, Entered: None Order
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2334 Filed: 3/29/2021, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2333 Filed: 3/26/2021, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2332 Filed: 3/26/2021, Entered: None Proposed Joint Case Management Schedule
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2331 Filed: 3/24/2021, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2330 Filed: 3/23/2021, Entered: None Complaint - Intervenor
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2328 Filed: 3/22/2021, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2327 Filed: 3/12/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Intervene
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2326 Filed: 3/11/2021, Entered: None Intervene
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2325 Filed: 3/4/2021, Entered: None Supplemental Complaint
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2323 Filed: 3/3/2021, Entered: None Leave
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2322 Filed: 3/2/2021, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2321 Filed: 2/26/2021, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2320 Filed: 2/25/2021, Entered: None Complaint - Intervenor
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2319 Filed: 2/24/2021, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2318 Filed: 2/24/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Intervene
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2317 Filed: 2/19/2021, Entered: None Intervene
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2316 Filed: 2/12/2021, Entered: None Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2314 Filed: 2/11/2021, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2313 Filed: 2/11/2021, Entered: None Withdraw/Substitute Attorney
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2312 Filed: 2/10/2021, Entered: None Crossclaim
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2311 Filed: 1/20/2021, Entered: None Supplemental Complaint
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2310 Filed: 1/19/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2309 Filed: 1/19/2021, Entered: None Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2308 Filed: 1/19/2021, Entered: None Leave
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2306 Filed: 1/7/2021, Entered: None Attorney Substitution
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2305 Filed: 1/6/2021, Entered: None Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2303 Filed: 4/23/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 1889 Filed: 3/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER - The Joint Stipulation and Order to Settle Plaintiffs' Second Application for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs 1427 is GRANTED. Signed on 3/19/12 by Judge Michael H. Simon. Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-SI, 3:05-cv-00023-SI (mja)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1888 Filed: 3/16/2012, Entered: 3/16/2012 Stipulation
                                                                                                                        Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Settle Plaintiffs' Second Application for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs by National Marine Fisheries Service, U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation. Filed by National Marine Fisheries Service, U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation. Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-SI, 3:05-cv-00023-SI (Eitel, Michael) (Entered: 03/16/2012)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1887 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: 3/9/2012 Notice
                                                                                                                          Notice Re: 2012 Spill Operations Filed by National Marine Fisheries Service, U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2, # 3 Attachment 3, # 4 Attachment 4)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-SI, 3:05-cv-00023-SI (Eitel, Michael) (Entered: 03/09/2012)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1886 Filed: 2/7/2012, Entered: 2/7/2012 Reply
                                                                                                                            Oregon, Nez Perce Tribe and NWF's Joint Reply Re: 2010 Progress Report. Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-SI, 3:05-cv-00023-SI (tll) (Entered: 02/07/2012)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1885 Filed: 2/6/2012, Entered: 2/6/2012 Attorney Substitution
                                                                                                                              Notice of Attorney Substitution: in place of Attorney Roger J. DeHoog and David Euan Leith Filed by State of OregonAssociated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-SI, 3:05-cv-00023-SI (Parent, Stephanie) (Entered: 02/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1884 Filed: 12/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER - Granting Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Trout Unlimited as a Plaintiff 1881 . Order - Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Oregon, Nez Perce Tribe and NWF's Joint Reply re: 2010 Progress Report 1883 in case 3:01-cv-00640-SI; Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-SI, 3:05-cv-00023-SI (mja) (Entered: 12/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1883 Filed: 12/1/2011, Entered: 12/1/2011 Motion for Leave
                                                                                                                                  Joint Motion for Leave to File Oregon, Nez Perce Tribe and NWF's Joint Reply Re 2010 Progress Report. Filed by American Rivers, Inc., Columbia Riverkeeper, Federation of Fly Fishers, Idaho Rivers United, Idaho Steelhead and Salmon United, Idaho Wildlife Federation, Institute for Fisheries Resources, NW Energy Coalition, National Wildlife Federation, Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, Salmon for All, Sierra Club, Washington Wildlife Federation. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Oregon, Nez Perce Tribe and NWF's Joint Reply Re 2010 Progress Report)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-SI, 3:05-cv-00023-SI (Mashuda, Stephen) (Entered: 12/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1882 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: 11/28/2011 Case Reassignment NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Judge James A. Redden to Judge Michael H. Simon. Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (eo) (Entered: 11/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1881 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: 11/22/2011 MOTION - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                      Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Trout Unlimited as a Plaintiff. Filed by American Rivers, Inc., Columbia Riverkeeper, Federation of Fly Fishers, Idaho Rivers United, Idaho Steelhead and Salmon United, Idaho Wildlife Federation, Institute for Fisheries Resources, NW Energy Coalition, National Wildlife Federation, Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, Salmon for All, Sierra Club, Trout Unlimited, Washington Wildlife Federation.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (True, Todd) (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1880 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: 11/18/2011 Supplement
                                                                                                                                        Supplement Reply to Comments on 2010 Progress Report. Filed by Columbia-Snake River Irrigators Association. (Related document(s): Motion - Miscellaneous, (943 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Buchal, James) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1879 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER: Granting Joint Motion for Leave to File Response to Plaintiffs' Comments on the 2010 Progress Report (1873); Granting Motion for Leave to File Reply to Comments on the 2010 Progress Report (1875); Granting Joint Motion for Leave to File Response to Plaintiffs' Comments on the 2010 Progress Report (1877) in case 3:01-cv-00640-RE; Granting Joint Motion for Leave to File Response to Plaintiffs' Comments on the 2010 Progress Report (941); Granting Motion for Leave to File Reply to Comments on the 2010 Progress Report (943); Granting Joint Motion for Leave to File Response to Plaintiffs' Comments on the 2010 Progress Report (945) in case 3:05-cv-00023-RE. Ordered by Judge James A. Redden. Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (pvh) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1878 Filed: 11/16/2011, Entered: 11/16/2011 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                            Washington's, Idaho's, and Montana's Joint Memorandum in Support of Motion and Response to Plaintiffs' Comments on the 2010 Progress Report. Filed by State of Washington. (Related document(s): Motion for Leave(945 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Grossmann, Michael) (Entered: 11/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1877 Filed: 11/16/2011, Entered: 11/16/2011 Motion for Leave
                                                                                                                                              Joint Motion for Leave to File Response to Plaintiffs' Comments on the 2010 Progress Report. Filed by State of Washington.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Grossmann, Michael) (Entered: 11/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1876 Filed: 11/16/2011, Entered: 11/16/2011 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                Memorandum in Support of Motion for Leave to File Reply to Comments on the 2010 Progress Report. Filed by Columbia-Snake River Irrigators Association. (Related document(s): Motion - Miscellaneous, (943 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Buchal, James) (Entered: 11/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1875 Filed: 11/16/2011, Entered: 11/16/2011 MOTION - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                  Motion for Leave to File Reply to Comments on the 2010 Progress Report. Filed by Columbia-Snake River Irrigators Association. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Reply to Comments on 2010 Progress Report)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Buchal, James) (Entered: 11/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1874 Filed: 11/16/2011, Entered: 11/16/2011 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                    Joint Response Memorandum in Support of Motion to File Response to Plaintiffs' Comments on the 2010 Progress Report. Filed by Confederated Salish and Kootenai Tribes, Confederated Tribes of the Colville Reservation, Kootenai Tribe of Idaho. (Related document(s): Motion for Leave, (941 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Weis, Julie) (Entered: 11/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1873 Filed: 11/16/2011, Entered: 11/16/2011 Motion for Leave
                                                                                                                                                      Joint Motion for Leave to File Response to Plaintiffs' Comments on the 2010 Progress Report. Filed by Confederated Salish and Kootenai Tribes, Confederated Tribes of the Colville Reservation, Kootenai Tribe of Idaho.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Weis, Julie) (Entered: 11/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1872 Filed: 11/16/2011, Entered: 11/16/2011 Brief
                                                                                                                                                        Brief In Response to Plaintiffs' Comments on 2010 Progress Report. Filed by National Marine Fisheries Service, U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation. (Related document(s): Response,, (933 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE, 1865 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE), Response, (934 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE, 1866 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE), Response(1867 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 935 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-7)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Eitel, Michael) (Entered: 11/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1871 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: 11/8/2011 Transcript of ProceedingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          OFFICIAL COURT TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS FILED Status Conference held on 8/21/2008 before Judge Redden, Court Reporter Dennis Grube, telephone number 503-326-8180. Transcript may be viewed at Court's public terminal or purchased from the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. Afterwards it may be obtained through PACER-See Policy at ord.uscourts.gov. Notice of Intent to Redact Transcript is due by 11/18/2011. Redaction Request due 12/2/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/12/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/9/2012. (Attachments: # 1 transcript)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (tll) (Entered: 11/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1870 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: 11/8/2011 Transcript of ProceedingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            OFFICIAL COURT TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS FILED Status Conference held on 2/20/2008 before Judge Redden, Court Reporter Dennis Grube, telephone number (503) 477-7369. Transcript may be viewed at Court's public terminal or purchased from the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. Afterwards it may be obtained through PACER-See Policy at ord.uscourts.gov. Notice of Intent to Redact Transcript is due by 11/18/2011. Redaction Request due 12/2/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/12/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/9/2012. (Attachments: # 1 transcript)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (tll) (Entered: 11/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1869 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: 10/28/2011 Transcript Designation and Order FormCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              Transcript Designation and Order Form for the hearing held on 2/20/2008; 8/22/2008 before Judge J. Redden. Court Reporter: Dennis Grube. regarding Notice of Appeal, (926 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE, 1858 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE) . Filed by National Marine Fisheries Service, U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation. Transcript is due by 12/1/2011. Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Eitel, Michael) (Entered: 10/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1868 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: 10/25/2011 Response
                                                                                                                                                                Response Northwest RiverPartners' Comments on 2010 Progress Report. Filed by Northwest River Partners. (Related document(s): Notice, (1859 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 927 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Morgan, Jason) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1867 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: 10/25/2011 Response
                                                                                                                                                                  Response (titled Oregon's Comments on 2010 Progress Report). Filed by State of Oregon. (Related document(s): Notice, (927 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (DeHoog, Roger) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1866 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: 10/25/2011 Response
                                                                                                                                                                    Response Nez Perce Tribe's Response to 2010 Progress Report. Filed by Nez Perce Tribe. (Related document(s): Notice, (1859 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 927 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter to Senator Crapo (Sept 26 2011))Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Cummings, David) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1865 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: 10/25/2011 Response
                                                                                                                                                                      Response [NWF's Comments on 2010 Progress Report]. Filed by American Rivers, Inc., Columbia Riverkeeper, Federation of Fly Fishers, Idaho Rivers United, Idaho Steelhead and Salmon United, Idaho Wildlife Federation, Institute for Fisheries Resources, NW Energy Coalition, National Wildlife Federation, Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, Salmon for All, Sierra Club, Trout Unlimited, Washington Wildlife Federation. (Related document(s): Notice, (1859 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 927 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Mashuda, Stephen) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1864 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: 10/14/2011 Representation Statement
                                                                                                                                                                        Representation Statement re Notice of Appeal(931 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE) . Filed by Inland Ports and Navigation Group. Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Kobak, Sara) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1863 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: 10/14/2011 Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Appeal to the 9th Circuit 1855 . Filed by Inland Ports and Navigation Group. Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Kobak, Sara) Text Modified on 10/17/2011 (cib). (Entered: 10/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1862 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time 1861 in case 3:01-cv-00640-RE; Granting Motion for Extension of Time (929) in case 3:05-cv-00023-RE. Plaintiffs' Response to Federal Defendants' 2010 Progress Report is due by 10/25/2011. Ordered by Judge James A. Redden. Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (js) Modified docket text on 10/12/2011 (cib). (Entered: 10/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1861 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: 10/7/2011 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                              Motion for Extension of Time [Joint Motion for Additional Time to Respond to 2010 Progress Report]. Filed by American Rivers, Inc., Columbia Riverkeeper, Federation of Fly Fishers, Idaho Rivers United, Idaho Steelhead and Salmon United, Idaho Wildlife Federation, Institute for Fisheries Resources, NW Energy Coalition, National Wildlife Federation, Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, Salmon for All, Sierra Club, Trout Unlimited, Washington Wildlife Federation.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (True, Todd) (Entered: 10/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1860 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: 9/30/2011 Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Appeal to the 9th Circuit . Filed by Northwest River Partners. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Representation Statement) Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Ginsberg, Beth) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1859 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: 9/30/2011 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Filing 2010 Annual Progress Report Filed by National Marine Fisheries Service, U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Eitel, Michael) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1858 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: 9/30/2011 Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Appeal to the 9th Circuit . Filed by National Marine Fisheries Service, U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Representation Statement) Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Eitel, Michael) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1857 Filed: 9/14/2011, Entered: 9/14/2011 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Filing Fifth Spill Implementation Report Filed by National Marine Fisheries Service, U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Eitel, Michael) (Entered: 09/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1856 Filed: 8/15/2011, Entered: 8/15/2011 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Filing Fourth Spill Implementation Report Filed by National Marine Fisheries Service, U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Eitel, Michael) (Entered: 08/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1855 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: 8/2/2011 Order on Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          OPINION AND ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the attached Opinion and Order, I DENY Federal Defendants' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment 1556 , and Supplemental Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment 1805 , Northwest River Partners' Motion for Summary Judgment 1539 ; Confederated Salish and Kootenai Tribes' Joint and Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment 1542 and 1551 ; and Washington's and Idaho's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment 1553 , and Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment 1819 . I GRANT in part, and DENY in part, NWF's Motion for Summary Judgment 1498 , and Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment 1793 , and Oregon's Motion for Summary Judgment 1507 , and Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment 1801 . Additionally, I REMAND the 2008/2010 BiOp to NOAA Fisheries for reconsideration consistent with this order. The 2008/2010 BiOp and the accompanying incidental take statement shall stay in place through the end of 2013. No later than January 1, 2014, NOAA Fisheries shall produce a new or supplemental BiOp. During the remand period, Federal Defendants shall fund and implement all of the reasonable and prudent alternative actions set forth in the 2008/2010 BiOp, including the Memoranda of Agreement they have executed with the various sovereigns. In addition, Federal Defendants shall continue to collaborate with the sovereigns to develop mitigation actions to be included in the proposed action, and to develop data to support any proposed mitigation. Finally, I GRANT Plaintiff's Corrected Motion for Preliminary Injunction 1627 with respect to spill. Federal Defendants shall implement spring and summer spill operations in a manner consistent with this courts previous spill orders. I DENY Plaintiff's motion, however, with respect to flow augmentation and reservoir storage operations. To the extent possible, Federal Defendants shall operate the FCRPS to meet the flow augmentation objectives in the 2008/2010 BiOp. Signed on 8/2/2011 by Judge James A. Redden. Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (js) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1854 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: 7/15/2011 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Federal Defendants' Third Spill Implementation Report Filed by National Marine Fisheries Service, U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, United States Army Corps of Engineers (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 1a, # 3 Exhibit 1b)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Howell, Coby) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1853 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: 6/17/2011 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Filing Second 2011 Spill Implementation Report Filed by National Marine Fisheries Service, U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Eitel, Michael) (Entered: 06/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1852 Filed: 6/14/2011, Entered: 6/14/2011 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER for 2011 Summer Operations. Signed on 6/14/2011 by Judge James A. Redden. (Attachment: #(1) 2011 Summer Fish Operations Plan). Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (pvh) (Entered: 06/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1851 Filed: 6/13/2011, Entered: 6/13/2011 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice and Submission of Proposed Order on 2011 Summer Operations Filed by National Marine Fisheries Service, U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Eitel, Michael) (Entered: 06/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1850 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: 6/7/2011 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Response to Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Authority. Filed by National Marine Fisheries Service, U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation. (Related document(s): Notice,, (917 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE, 1849 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Eitel, Michael) (Entered: 06/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1849 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: 6/2/2011 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Supplemental Authority Filed by American Rivers, Inc., Columbia Riverkeeper, Federation of Fly Fishers, Idaho Rivers United, Idaho Steelhead and Salmon United, Idaho Wildlife Federation, Institute for Fisheries Resources, NW Energy Coalition, National Wildlife Federation, Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, Salmon for All, Sierra Club, Trout Unlimited, Washington Wildlife Federation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (True, Todd) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1848 Filed: 5/17/2011, Entered: 5/17/2011 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Filing First 2011 Spill Implementation Report Filed by National Marine Fisheries Service, U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Eitel, Michael) (Entered: 05/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1847 Filed: 5/16/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED MINUTES OF 05/09/2011 ORAL ARGUMENT PROCEEDINGS: Oral Argument held 05/09/2011 before Judge James A. Redden. The following counsel made comments: Coby Howell for Federal Defendants; Todd True for Plaintiffs; Roger DeHoog for the State of Oregon; David Cummings for the Nez Perce Tribe; Mark Stermitz for the States of Montana, Idaho and Washington; John Ogan for the Warm Springs Tribe. Also present: Michael Eitel for Federal Defendants; Brent Hall for Confederated Tribes of the Umatilla Indian Reservation; Brian Gruber for Confederated Tribes of the Colville Reservation; John Harrison for Confederated Salish and Kootenai Tribes; Julie Weis and William Barquin for Kootenai Tribe of Idaho; Patrick Spurgin for Confederated Tribes and Bands of the Yakama Nation; Clay Smith for the State of Idaho; Michael Grossman for the State of Washington; Jay Waldron for Inland Ports and Navigation Group; Beth Ginsberg for Northwest River Partners; Jeremiah D. Weiner for the State of Montana. Judge James A. Redden presiding. Court Reporter: Dennis Apodaca. Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (pvh) (Entered: 05/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1846 Filed: 5/12/2011, Entered: 5/12/2011 Transcript of ProceedingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            OFFICIAL COURT TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS FILED Status Conference held on May 9, 2011 before Judge James A. Redden, Court Reporter Dennis W. Apodaca, telephone number (503) 326-8182. Transcript may be viewed at Court's public terminal or purchased from the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. Afterwards it may be obtained through PACER-See Policy at ord.uscourts.gov. Notice of Intent to Redact Transcript is due by 5/23/2011. Redaction Request due 6/6/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/16/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/15/2011. Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Apodaca, Dennis) (Entered: 05/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1845 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTES of Oral Argument Proceedings: Oral Argument held 05/09/2011 before Judge James A. Redden. The following counsel made comments: Coby Howell for Federal Defendants; Todd True for Plaintiffs; Roger DeHoog for the State of Oregon; David Cummings for the Nez Perce Tribe; Mark Stermitz for the States of Montana, Idaho and Washington; John Ogan for the Warm Springs Tribe. Also present: Michael Eitel for Federal Defendants; Brent Hall for Confederated Tribes of the Umatilla Indian Reservation; Brian Gruber for Confederated Tribes of the Colville Reservation; John Harrison for Confederated Salish and Kootenai Tribes; Julie Weis and William Barquin for Kootenai Tribe of Idaho; Patrick Spurgin for Confederated Tribes and Bands of the Yakama Nation; Clay Smith for the State of Idaho; Michael Grossman for the State of Washington; Jay Waldron for Inland Ports and Navigation Group; Beth Ginsberg for Northwest Irrigation Utilities. Court Reporter: Dennis Apodaca. Judge James A. Redden presiding. Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (pvh) (Entered: 05/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1844 Filed: 5/3/2011, Entered: 5/3/2011 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter to Counsel of Record; Re: May 9, 2011 - Oral Argument. Signed on 5/3/2011 by Judge James A. Redden. (pvh) (Entered: 05/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1843 Filed: 3/24/2011, Entered: 3/24/2011 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER for 2011 Spring Operations. Signed on 3/24/2011 by Judge James A. Redden. (pvh) (Entered: 03/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1842 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Scheduling Order by Judge James A. Redden. Oral Argument is set for 5/9/2011 at 09:30AM in Judge Redden's Courtroom before Judge James A. Redden. Ordered by Judge James A. Redden. (js) (Entered: 03/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1841 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Scheduling Order. Oral Argument is set for 5/9/2010 at 09:30AM in Portland before Judge James A. Redden. Ordered by Judge James A. Redden. (js) (Entered: 03/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1840 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: 3/22/2011 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of 2011 Spring Operations Filed by National Marine Fisheries Service, U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, United States Army Corps of Engineers, NOAA Fisheries (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Howell, Coby) (Entered: 03/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1839 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: 2/11/2011 Surreply to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Amicus Sur-Reply Warm Springs, Umatilla, and Yakama Tribes in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Motions for Summary Judgment. Filed by Confederated Tribes of the Warm Springs Reservation of Oregon.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Ogan, John) (Entered: 02/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1838 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: 2/11/2011 reply to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Reply Federal Defendants' Reply in Support of Supplemental Cross Motion for Summary Judgment to Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment Federal Defendants' Supplemental Cross Motion for Summary Judgment(877 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE). Filed by National Marine Fisheries Service, U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, United States Army Corps of Engineers, NOAA Fisheries.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Howell, Coby) (Entered: 02/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1837 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: 2/11/2011 reply to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint Reply Brief of Washington, Idaho and Montana to Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment(891 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE). Filed by State of Idaho, State of Montana, State of Washington. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A Three State Brief)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Stermitz, Mark) (Entered: 02/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1836 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: 2/10/2011 reply to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Reply to Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment [NWF's Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment Re 2010 Supplemental BiOp]Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment [NWF's Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment Re 2010 Supplemental BiOp]Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment [NWF's Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment Re 2010 Supplemental BiOp](865 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE). Filed by Inland Ports and Navigation Group.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Waldron, Jay) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1835 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Record of Order: Motion to File Excess Pages 1830 in case 3:01-cv-00640-RE is GRANTED; Motion to File Excess Pages 901 in case 3:05-cv-00023-RE is GRANTED. Ordered by Judge James A. Redden. Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (pvh) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1834 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: 1/21/2011 reply to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Reply and Response (in Support of) to Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment(873 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE). Filed by State of Oregon.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (DeHoog, Roger) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1833 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: 1/21/2011 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Response Nez Perce Tribe's Reply/Response Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Motions for Summary Judgment to Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment Federal Defendants' Supplemental Cross Motion for Summary Judgment(1805 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 877 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE). Filed by Nez Perce Tribe.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Cummings, David) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1832 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: 1/21/2011 Response to Concise Statement of Material Facts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Response to Concise Statement of Material Facts regarding Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment Federal Defendants' Supplemental Cross Motion for Summary Judgment(877 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE, 1805 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE) [NWF's Response to Concise Statement of Material Facts and Reply to the Responses of Federal Defendants]. Filed by American Rivers, Inc., Columbia Riverkeeper, Federation of Fly Fishers, Idaho Rivers United, Idaho Steelhead and Salmon United, Idaho Wildlife Federation, Institute for Fisheries Resources, NW Energy Coalition, National Wildlife Federation, Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, Salmon for All, Sierra Club, Trout Unlimited, Washington Wildlife Federation.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (True, Todd) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1831 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: 1/21/2011 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Response in Opposition to Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment Federal Defendants' Supplemental Cross Motion for Summary Judgment(1805 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 877 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE), Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment(1819 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 891 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE), Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment [NWF's Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment Re 2010 Supplemental BiOp]Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment [NWF's Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment Re 2010 Supplemental BiOp]Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment [NWF's Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment Re 2010 Supplemental BiOp](1793 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 865 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE), Reply to Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment [NWF's Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment Re 2010 Supplemental BiOp]Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment [NWF's Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment Re 2010 Supplemental BiOp]Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment [NWF's Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment Re 2010 Supplemental BiOp](1793 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 865 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE). Filed by American Rivers, Inc., Columbia Riverkeeper, Federation of Fly Fishers, Idaho Rivers United, Idaho Steelhead and Salmon United, Idaho Wildlife Federation, Institute for Fisheries Resources, NW Energy Coalition, National Wildlife Federation, Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, Salmon for All, Sierra Club, Trout Unlimited, Washington Wildlife Federation.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (True, Todd) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1830 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: 1/21/2011 Motion to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion to File Excess Pages [Motion for Leave to File Overlength (by One Page) Reply/Response Memorandum]. Filed by American Rivers, Inc., Columbia Riverkeeper, Federation of Fly Fishers, Idaho Rivers United, Idaho Steelhead and Salmon United, Idaho Wildlife Federation, Institute for Fisheries Resources, NW Energy Coalition, National Wildlife Federation, Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, Salmon for All, Sierra Club, Trout Unlimited, Washington Wildlife Federation.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (True, Todd) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1829 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: 1/14/2011 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in Opposition Errata to Memorandum of Amici Warm Springs,Umatilla, And Yakama Tribes in Opposition to Plaintiffs Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment to Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment Federal Defendants' Supplemental Cross Motion for Summary Judgment(877 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE). Filed by Confederated Tribes of the Warm Springs Reservation of Oregon.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Ogan, John) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1828 Filed: 1/5/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: Granting Plaintiff's, the State of Oregon's, and the Nez Perce Tribe's Motions for Leave to File Reply Briefs 1822 , 1824 , and 1826 . No later than January 21, 2011, those parties may each file a reply brief of no more than 20 pages. No later than February 11, 2011, Federal Defendants and allied parties may each file a surreply brief of no more than 20 pages. Ordered by Judge James A. Redden. (js) (Entered: 01/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1827 Filed: 1/4/2011, Entered: 1/4/2011 Memorandum in Support of MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum in Support of Nez Perce Tribe's Motion for Leave to File a Reply/Response Memorandum Re Supplemental Motions for Summary Judgement. Filed by Nez Perce Tribe. (Related document(s): Motion for Leave(898 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Cummings, David) (Entered: 01/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1826 Filed: 1/4/2011, Entered: 1/4/2011 Motion for Leave
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion for Leave Nez Perce Tribe's Motion for Leave to File A Reply/Response Memorandum Re Supplemental Motions for Summary Judgment. Filed by Nez Perce Tribe.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Cummings, David) (Entered: 01/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1825 Filed: 1/4/2011, Entered: 1/4/2011 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in Support. Filed by State of Oregon. (Related document(s): Motion for Leave(896 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (DeHoog, Roger) (Entered: 01/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1824 Filed: 1/4/2011, Entered: 1/4/2011 Motion for Leave
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion for Leave to File Response/Reply Brief Re: Supplemental Motions for Summary Judgment. Filed by State of Oregon.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (DeHoog, Roger) (Entered: 01/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1823 Filed: 1/3/2011, Entered: 1/3/2011 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum in Support of NWF's Motion for Leave to File a Reply/Response Memorandum Re Supplemental Motions for Summary Judgment. Filed by American Rivers, Inc., Columbia Riverkeeper, Federation of Fly Fishers, Idaho Rivers United, Idaho Steelhead and Salmon United, Idaho Wildlife Federation, Institute for Fisheries Resources, NW Energy Coalition, National Wildlife Federation, Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, Salmon for All, Sierra Club, Trout Unlimited, Washington Wildlife Federation. (Related document(s): Motion for Leave,, (1822 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 894 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (True, Todd) (Entered: 01/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1822 Filed: 1/3/2011, Entered: 1/3/2011 Motion for Leave
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion for Leave to File a Reply/Response Memorandum Re Supplemental Motions for Summary Judgment. Filed by American Rivers, Inc., Columbia Riverkeeper, Federation of Fly Fishers, Idaho Rivers United, Idaho Steelhead and Salmon United, Idaho Wildlife Federation, Institute for Fisheries Resources, NW Energy Coalition, National Wildlife Federation, Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, Salmon for All, Sierra Club, Trout Unlimited, Washington Wildlife Federation.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (True, Todd) (Entered: 01/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1821 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: 12/23/2010 Concise Statement of Material Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Concise Statement of Material Fact in support of cross motion for summary judgment and in response to plaintiffs' concise statement of material facts. Filed by State of Idaho, State of Montana, State of Washington. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment(891 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Stermitz, Mark) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1820 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: 12/23/2010 Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Brief in support of supplemental cross motion for summary judgment and in opposition to plaintiffs' summary judgment motion. Filed by State of Idaho, State of Montana, State of Washington. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment(891 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Stermitz, Mark) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1819 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: 12/23/2010 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by State of Idaho, State of Montana, State of Washington.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Stermitz, Mark) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1818 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: 12/23/2010 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Michael Rayton in Support of Colville Tribes' Supplemental Amicus Brief. Filed by Confederated Tribes of the Colville Reservation. (Related document(s): Brief, (1816 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 888 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Gruber, Brian) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1817 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: 12/23/2010 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Towey in Support of Colville Tribes' Supplemental Amicus Brief. Filed by Confederated Tribes of the Colville Reservation. (Related document(s): Brief, (1816 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 888 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Gruber, Brian) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1816 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: 12/23/2010 Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Amicus Brief of Colville Tribes in Support of Defendants' Supplemental Cross Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by Confederated Tribes of the Colville Reservation. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment, (1556 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 663 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE), Motion for Summary Judgment, (877 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE, 1805 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE).) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Gruber, Brian) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1815 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: 12/23/2010 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum in Opposition to Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment [NWF's Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment Re 2010 Supplemental BiOp]Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment [NWF's Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment Re 2010 Supplemental BiOp]Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment [NWF's Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment Re 2010 Supplemental BiOp](865 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE). Filed by Inland Ports and Navigation Group. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Environmental Benefits fo Snake River Dams)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Waldron, Jay) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1814 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: 12/23/2010 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in Opposition of Amici Warm Springs, Umatilla,and Yakama Tribes to Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment [NWF's Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment Re 2010 Supplemental BiOp]Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment [NWF's Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment Re 2010 Supplemental BiOp]Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment [NWF's Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment Re 2010 Supplemental BiOp](865 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE). Filed by Confederated Tribes of the Warm Springs Reservation of Oregon. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Ogan, John) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1813 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: 12/23/2010 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in Support of the Federal Govenment's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by Northwest River Partners. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment(873 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE, 1801 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE), Motion for Summary Judgment,, (1793 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 865 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE), Motion for Summary Judgment, (877 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE, 1805 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Ginsberg, Beth) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1812 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: 12/23/2010 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice re Notice, (1780 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 854 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE) Federal Defendants' Notice of Errata on the Administrative Record Filed by National Marine Fisheries Service, U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, United States Army Corps of Engineers, NOAA Fisheries (Related document(s): Notice, (1780 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 854 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Howell, Coby) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1811 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: 12/23/2010 Concise Statement of Material Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint Concise Statement of Material Fact. Filed by Confederated Salish and Kootenai Tribes, Kootenai Tribe of Idaho. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment(873 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE), Motion for Summary Judgment, (877 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE), Motion for Summary Judgment,, (865 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Weis, Julie) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1810 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: 12/23/2010 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint Memorandum in Support of Cross Motions for Summary Judgment and in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motions for Summary Judgment. Filed by Confederated Salish and Kootenai Tribes, Kootenai Tribe of Idaho. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment(873 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE), Motion for Summary Judgment, (877 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE), Motion for Summary Judgment,, (865 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Weis, Julie) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1809 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: 12/23/2010 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice re Motion for Summary Judgment, (1556 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 663 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE), Motion for Summary Judgment, (877 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE, 1805 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE) Federal Defendants' Notice of Filing Excerpts of Record Filed by National Marine Fisheries Service, U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, United States Army Corps of Engineers, NOAA Fisheries (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment, (1556 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 663 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE), Motion for Summary Judgment, (877 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE, 1805 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE).) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Howell, Coby) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1808 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: 12/23/2010 Response to Concise Statement of Material Facts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Response to Concise Statement of Material Facts regarding Motion for Summary Judgment Federal Defendants' Cross Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment(1556 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 663 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE), Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment Federal Defendants' Supplemental Cross Motion for Summary Judgment(877 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE, 1805 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE). Filed by National Marine Fisheries Service, U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, United States Army Corps of Engineers, NOAA Fisheries.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Howell, Coby) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1807 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: 12/23/2010 Concise Statement of Material Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Concise Statement of Material Fact Federal Defendants' Concise Statement of Fact. Filed by National Marine Fisheries Service, U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, United States Army Corps of Engineers, NOAA Fisheries. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment, (1556 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 663 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE), Motion for Summary Judgment, (877 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE, 1805 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Howell, Coby) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1806 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: 12/23/2010 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in Support of Federal Defendants' Supplemental Cross Motion for Summary Judgment and Combined Opposition to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Motions for Summary Judgment. Filed by National Marine Fisheries Service, U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, United States Army Corps of Engineers, NOAA Fisheries. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment, (1556 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 663 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE), Motion for Summary Judgment, (877 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE, 1805 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Howell, Coby) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1805 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: 12/23/2010 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment Federal Defendants' Supplemental Cross Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by National Marine Fisheries Service, U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, United States Army Corps of Engineers, NOAA Fisheries.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Howell, Coby) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1804 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: 11/1/2010 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Exhibits [Excerpts of Administrative Record ("ER") in Support of NWF's Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment Re 2010 Supplemental BiOp] re Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment [NWF's Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment Re 2010 Supplemental BiOp]Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment [NWF's Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment Re 2010 Supplemental BiOp]Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment [NWF's Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment Re 2010 Supplemental BiOp](865 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE, 1793 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE). Filed by American Rivers, Inc., Columbia Riverkeeper, Federation of Fly Fishers, Idaho Rivers United, Idaho Steelhead and Salmon United, Idaho Wildlife Federation, Institute for Fisheries Resources, NW Energy Coalition, National Wildlife Federation, Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, Salmon for All, Sierra Club, Trout Unlimited, Washington Wildlife Federation. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A: Excerpts of Record 1 through 15, # 2 Attachment B: Excerpts of Record 16 through 45, # 3 Attachment C: Excerpts of Record 46 through 75, # 4 Attachment D: Excerpts of Record 76 through 100, # 5 Attachment E: Excerpts of Record 101 through 120, # 6 Attachment F: Excerpts of Record 121 through 135, # 7 Attachment G: Excerpts of Record 136 through 152)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (True, Todd) (Entered: 11/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1803 Filed: 10/29/2010, Entered: 10/29/2010 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Spokane Tribe's Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motions for Summary Judgment. Filed by Spokane Tribe of Indians. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment,, (1793 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 865 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Funke, Howard) (Entered: 10/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1802 Filed: 10/29/2010, Entered: 10/29/2010 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in Support of Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by State of Oregon. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment(873 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (DeHoog, Roger) (Entered: 10/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1801 Filed: 10/29/2010, Entered: 10/29/2010 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by State of Oregon.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (DeHoog, Roger) (Entered: 10/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1800 Filed: 10/29/2010, Entered: 10/29/2010 Concise Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Concise Statement re Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment [NWF's Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment Re 2010 Supplemental BiOp]Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment [NWF's Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment Re 2010 Supplemental BiOp]Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment [NWF's Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment Re 2010 Supplemental BiOp](1793 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 865 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE) [NWF's Statement of Facts in Support of Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment Re 2010 Supplemental BiOp]. Filed by American Rivers, Inc., Columbia Riverkeeper, Federation of Fly Fishers, Idaho Rivers United, Idaho Steelhead and Salmon United, Idaho Wildlife Federation, Institute for Fisheries Resources, NW Energy Coalition, National Wildlife Federation, Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, Salmon for All, Sierra Club, Trout Unlimited, Washington Wildlife Federation. Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (True, Todd) (Entered: 10/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1799 Filed: 10/29/2010, Entered: 10/29/2010 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Second Declaration of Bill Sedivy in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by American Rivers, Inc., Columbia Riverkeeper, Federation of Fly Fishers, Idaho Rivers United, Idaho Steelhead and Salmon United, Idaho Wildlife Federation, Institute for Fisheries Resources, NW Energy Coalition, National Wildlife Federation, Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, Salmon for All, Sierra Club, Trout Unlimited, Washington Wildlife Federation. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment,, (1793 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 865 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (True, Todd) (Entered: 10/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1798 Filed: 10/29/2010, Entered: 10/29/2010 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Second Declaration of William Redman in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by American Rivers, Inc., Columbia Riverkeeper, Federation of Fly Fishers, Idaho Rivers United, Idaho Steelhead and Salmon United, Idaho Wildlife Federation, Institute for Fisheries Resources, NW Energy Coalition, National Wildlife Federation, Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, Salmon for All, Sierra Club, Trout Unlimited, Washington Wildlife Federation. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment,, (1793 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 865 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (True, Todd) (Entered: 10/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1797 Filed: 10/29/2010, Entered: 10/29/2010 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Second Declaration of Liz Hamilton in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by American Rivers, Inc., Columbia Riverkeeper, Federation of Fly Fishers, Idaho Rivers United, Idaho Steelhead and Salmon United, Idaho Wildlife Federation, Institute for Fisheries Resources, NW Energy Coalition, National Wildlife Federation, Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, Salmon for All, Sierra Club, Trout Unlimited, Washington Wildlife Federation. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment,, (1793 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 865 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (True, Todd) (Entered: 10/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1796 Filed: 10/29/2010, Entered: 10/29/2010 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Second Declaration of Joseph Bogaard in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by American Rivers, Inc., Columbia Riverkeeper, Federation of Fly Fishers, Idaho Rivers United, Idaho Steelhead and Salmon United, Idaho Wildlife Federation, Institute for Fisheries Resources, NW Energy Coalition, National Wildlife Federation, Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, Salmon for All, Sierra Club, Trout Unlimited, Washington Wildlife Federation. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment,, (1793 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 865 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (True, Todd) (Entered: 10/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1795 Filed: 10/29/2010, Entered: 10/29/2010 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum in Support Nez Perce Tribe's Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by Nez Perce Tribe. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Nez Perce Tribe's Excerpts of Record)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Cummings, David) (Entered: 10/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1794 Filed: 10/29/2010, Entered: 10/29/2010 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Supplemental Memorandum in Support of NWF's Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment Re 2010 Supplemental BiOp. Filed by American Rivers, Inc., Columbia Riverkeeper, Federation of Fly Fishers, Idaho Rivers United, Idaho Steelhead and Salmon United, Idaho Wildlife Federation, Institute for Fisheries Resources, NW Energy Coalition, National Wildlife Federation, Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, Salmon for All, Sierra Club, Trout Unlimited, Washington Wildlife Federation. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment,, (1793 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 865 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (True, Todd) (Entered: 10/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1793 Filed: 10/29/2010, Entered: 10/29/2010 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment [NWF's Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment Re 2010 Supplemental BiOp]. Filed by American Rivers, Inc., Columbia Riverkeeper, Federation of Fly Fishers, Idaho Rivers United, Idaho Steelhead and Salmon United, Idaho Wildlife Federation, Institute for Fisheries Resources, NW Energy Coalition, National Wildlife Federation, Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, Salmon for All, Sierra Club, Trout Unlimited, Washington Wildlife Federation.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (True, Todd) (Entered: 10/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1792 Filed: 10/4/2010, Entered: 10/4/2010 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Change of Address Filed by National Marine Fisheries Service, U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, Donald L Evans, D Robert Lohn, NOAA FisheriesAssociated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (McNeil, Bridget) (Entered: 10/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1791 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: 9/29/2010 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice re Memorandum in Support of Motion,, (862 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE, 1789 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE) [Plaintiffs' Notice of Correction Re Motion to Adjust Briefing Schedule] Filed by American Rivers, Inc., Columbia Riverkeeper, Federation of Fly Fishers, Idaho Rivers United, Idaho Steelhead and Salmon United, Idaho Wildlife Federation, Institute for Fisheries Resources, NW Energy Coalition, National Wildlife Federation, Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, Salmon for All, Sierra Club, Trout Unlimited, Washington Wildlife Federation (Related document(s): Memorandum in Support of Motion,, (862 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE, 1789 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (True, Todd) (Entered: 09/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1790 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time 1788 . Plaintiffs (and allied parties) have until 10/29/2010 to file their supplemental summary judgment memoranda. Federal Defendants (and allied parties) have until 12/23/2010 to file response memoranda. Ordered by Judge James A. Redden. (js) (Entered: 09/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1789 Filed: 9/28/2010, Entered: 9/28/2010 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Adjust Supplemental Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule. Filed by American Rivers, Inc., Columbia Riverkeeper, Federation of Fly Fishers, Idaho Rivers United, Idaho Steelhead and Salmon United, Idaho Wildlife Federation, Institute for Fisheries Resources, NW Energy Coalition, National Wildlife Federation, Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, Salmon for All, Sierra Club, Trout Unlimited, Washington Wildlife Federation. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time,, (861 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE, 1788 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (True, Todd) (Entered: 09/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1788 Filed: 9/28/2010, Entered: 9/28/2010 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion for Extension of Time [Plaintiffs' Motion to Adjust Supplemental Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule]. Filed by American Rivers, Inc., Columbia Riverkeeper, Federation of Fly Fishers, Idaho Rivers United, Idaho Steelhead and Salmon United, Idaho Wildlife Federation, Institute for Fisheries Resources, NW Energy Coalition, National Wildlife Federation, Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, Salmon for All, Sierra Club, Trout Unlimited, Washington Wildlife Federation.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (True, Todd) (Entered: 09/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1787 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: 9/20/2010 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice re: John B. Arum Filed by Confederated Tribes of the Colville ReservationAssociated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Gruber, Brian) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1786 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: 9/20/2010 Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Appearance of Brian C. Gruber appearing on behalf of Confederated Tribes of the Colville Reservation Filed by on behalf of Confederated Tribes of the Colville ReservationAssociated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Gruber, Brian) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1785 Filed: 9/15/2010, Entered: 9/15/2010 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Status Report Fifth Spill Implementation Status Report by National Marine Fisheries Service, U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, United States Army Corps of Engineers, NOAA Fisheries. Filed by National Marine Fisheries Service, U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, United States Army Corps of Engineers, NOAA Fisheries. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B1, # 3 Exhibit B2)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Howell, Coby) (Entered: 09/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1784 Filed: 9/8/2010, Entered: 9/8/2010 Intervener Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Supplemental Intervener Complaint --State of Oregon's Third Supplemental Complaint-in-Intervention for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief.Filed by State of Oregon against National Marine Fisheries Service, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, United States Army Corps of Engineers.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (DeHoog, Roger) (Entered: 09/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1783 Filed: 9/8/2010, Entered: 9/8/2010 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Supplemental Amended Complaint [Sixth Supplemental Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief].Filed by Institute for Fisheries Resources, Idaho Wildlife Federation, Sierra Club, National Wildlife Federation, NW Energy Coalition, Federation of Fly Fishers, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, Salmon for All, Idaho Steelhead and Salmon United, Trout Unlimited, American Rivers, Inc., Washington Wildlife Federation, Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association, Idaho Rivers United, Columbia Riverkeeper against National Marine Fisheries Service, U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (True, Todd) (Entered: 09/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1782 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Relief from LR 15-1(c) 1774 ; Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Sixth Supplemental Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief 1776 ; Granting Oregon's Motion for Leave to File Third Supplemental Complaint-in-Intervention 1778 . Ordered by Judge James A. Redden. (js) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1781 Filed: 8/27/2010, Entered: 8/27/2010 Administrative Record
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Administrative Record(s). Filed by U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, NOAA Fisheries. NOTE: The administrative records were conventionally filed on five DVD ROMS from the US Bureau of Reclamation, one DVD ROM from the US Army Corps of Engineers, and one DVD ROM from NOAA Fisheries. These conventionally filed DVD ROMS are located with the physical case file. Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (eo) (Entered: 08/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1780 Filed: 8/27/2010, Entered: 8/27/2010 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice Federal Defendants' Notice of Filing 2010 Administrative Records Filed by National Marine Fisheries Service, U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, NOAA Fisheries (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Howell, Coby) (Entered: 08/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1779 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: 8/20/2010 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  State of Oregon's Memorandum in Support of Motion to File Third Supplemental Complaint-in-Intervention. Filed by State of Oregon. (Related document(s): Motion for Leave, Motion to intervene(1778 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 1778 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 852 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE, 852 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (DeHoog, Roger) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1778 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: 8/20/2010 Motion for Leave
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion for Leave to File Third Supplemental Complaint-in-Intervention, Motion to Intervene. Filed by State of Oregon.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (DeHoog, Roger) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1777 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: 8/20/2010 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in Support of NWF's Motion for Leave to File Sixth Supplemental Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief. Filed by American Rivers, Inc., Columbia Riverkeeper, Federation of Fly Fishers, Idaho Rivers United, Idaho Steelhead and Salmon United, Idaho Wildlife Federation, Institute for Fisheries Resources, NW Energy Coalition, National Wildlife Federation, Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, Salmon for All, Sierra Club, Trout Unlimited, Washington Wildlife Federation. (Related document(s): Motion for Leave,, (1776 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 850 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).) (Attachments: # 1 Attachment [Proposed] Sixth Supplemental Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Mashuda, Stephen) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1776 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: 8/20/2010 Motion for Leave
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion for Leave to File Sixth Supplemental Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief. Filed by American Rivers, Inc., Columbia Riverkeeper, Federation of Fly Fishers, Idaho Rivers United, Idaho Steelhead and Salmon United, Idaho Wildlife Federation, Institute for Fisheries Resources, NW Energy Coalition, National Wildlife Federation, Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, Salmon for All, Sierra Club, Trout Unlimited, Washington Wildlife Federation.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Mashuda, Stephen) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1775 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: 8/20/2010 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum in Support of NWF's Motion for Relief From LR 15-1(c). Filed by American Rivers, Inc., Columbia Riverkeeper, Federation of Fly Fishers, Idaho Rivers United, Idaho Steelhead and Salmon United, Idaho Wildlife Federation, Institute for Fisheries Resources, NW Energy Coalition, National Wildlife Federation, Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, Salmon for All, Sierra Club, Trout Unlimited, Washington Wildlife Federation. (Related document(s): Motion - Miscellaneous,, (1774 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 848 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Mashuda, Stephen) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1774 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: 8/20/2010 MOTION - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion for Relief From LR 15-1(c). Filed by American Rivers, Inc., Columbia Riverkeeper, Federation of Fly Fishers, Idaho Rivers United, Idaho Steelhead and Salmon United, Idaho Wildlife Federation, Institute for Fisheries Resources, NW Energy Coalition, National Wildlife Federation, Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, Salmon for All, Sierra Club, Trout Unlimited, Washington Wildlife Federation.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Mashuda, Stephen) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1773 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: 8/16/2010 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Fourth Spill Implementation Report Filed by National Marine Fisheries Service, U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B (1 of 2), # 3 Exhibit B (2 of 2))Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (McNeil, Bridget) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1772 Filed: 7/16/2010, Entered: 7/16/2010 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Filing Third Spill Report Filed by National Marine Fisheries Service, U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B (1 of 2), # 3 Exhibit B (2 of 2))Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (McNeil, Bridget) (Entered: 07/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1771 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: 6/18/2010 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint Stipulation re Motion for Attorney FeesApplication for Fees Pursuant to EAJA(844 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE, 844 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE, 1770 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 1770 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE) [Joint Stipulation Between the Federal Defendants and Plaintiffs Regarding Plaintiffs' Third Application for an Award of Attorneys' Fees Under EAJA and the ESA] by Washington Wildlife Federation, NW Energy Coalition, Federation of Fly Fishers, American Rivers, Inc., Sierra Club, Trout Unlimited, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, National Wildlife Federation, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Idaho Rivers United, Idaho Steelhead and Salmon United, Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association, Salmon for All, Columbia Riverkeeper, Idaho Wildlife Federation. Filed by Washington Wildlife Federation, NW Energy Coalition, Federation of Fly Fishers, American Rivers, Inc., Sierra Club, Trout Unlimited, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, National Wildlife Federation, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Idaho Rivers United, Idaho Steelhead and Salmon United, Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association, Salmon for All, Columbia Riverkeeper, Idaho Wildlife Federation. Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (True, Todd) (Entered: 06/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1770 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: 6/18/2010 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion for Attorney Fees [Plaintiffs' Third Application for an Award of Attorneys' Fees Under the Equal Access to Justice Act ("EAJA") and the Endangered Species Act ("ESA")], Application for Fees Pursuant to EAJA. Filed by Washington Wildlife Federation, NW Energy Coalition, Federation of Fly Fishers, American Rivers, Inc., Sierra Club, Trout Unlimited, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, National Wildlife Federation, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Idaho Rivers United, Idaho Steelhead and Salmon United, Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association, Salmon for All, Columbia Riverkeeper, Idaho Wildlife Federation.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (True, Todd) (Entered: 06/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1769 Filed: 6/16/2010, Entered: 6/16/2010 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Filing Second Spill Implementation Report Filed by U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, National Marine Fisheries Service (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B (1 of 2), # 3 Exhibit B (2 of 2))Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (McNeil, Bridget) (Entered: 06/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1768 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: 6/14/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order for 2010 Summer Operations. Signed on 06/14/2010 by Judge James A. Redden. Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (pvh) (Entered: 06/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1767 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: 6/11/2010 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice Submission of Proposed Order on Summer Spill Operations Filed by United States Army Corps of Engineers, U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, National Marine Fisheries Service, NOAA Fisheries (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 2)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Howell, Coby) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1766 Filed: 6/8/2010, Entered: 6/8/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER. Having reviewed the parties' pleadings, the court ORDERS as follows: (1) Plaintiffs shall file motions for leave to file supplemental complaints along with proposed supplemental complaints no later than August 20, 2010. (2) Federal Defendants shall file the administrative records with the court no later than August, 27, 2010. (3) The parties shall not re-litigate issues raised in the summary judgment motions currently pending before the court unless the 2010 Supplemental Biological Opinion, its Administrative Record, and/or the Amended Records of Decision directly affect those previous arguments. The parties should limit their briefing to the issues raised by the 2010 Supplemental Biological Opinion, and whether it affects the validity of Federal Defendants' 2008 Biological Opinion. (4) Plaintiffs and allied parties shall file their supplemental summary judgment motions and memoranda forty-five (45) days after Federal Defendants file their administrative records. (5) Federal Defendants and allied parties shall file their cross-motions for summary judgment and opposition memoranda forty-five (45) days after Plaintiffs file their supplemental motions for summary judgment. (6) No further briefing will be allowed without permission of the court, and the court will set a hearing date for oral argument at its convenience. (7) All briefing shall be conducted in accordance with the page limits of Local Rule 7. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed on 06/08/2010 by Judge James A. Redden.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (pvh) (Entered: 06/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1765 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: 6/4/2010 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in Opposition Federal Defendants' Reply to Plaintiffs' Response on the Notice of Completion of Remand. Filed by United States Army Corps of Engineers, U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, NOAA Fisheries. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order A, # 2 Proposed Order B)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Howell, Coby) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1764 Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: 5/28/2010 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Unavailability Filed by State of OregonAssociated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (DeHoog, Roger) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1763 Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: 5/28/2010 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice re Notice, (836 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE) Plaintiffs' Response to Federal Defendants' Notice of Completion of Remand Filed by Washington Wildlife Federation, NW Energy Coalition, Federation of Fly Fishers, American Rivers, Inc., Sierra Club, Trout Unlimited, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, National Wildlife Federation, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Idaho Rivers United, Idaho Steelhead and Salmon United, Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association, Salmon for All, Columbia Riverkeeper, Idaho Wildlife Federation (Related document(s): Notice, (836 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (True, Todd) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1762 Filed: 5/20/2010, Entered: 5/20/2010 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Completion of Remand Filed by U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, National Marine Fisheries Service (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (McNeil, Bridget) (Entered: 05/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1761 Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: 5/17/2010 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Filing First 2010 Spill Implementation Report Filed by U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, National Marine Fisheries Service (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B (1 of 2), # 3 Exhibit B (2 of 2))Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (McNeil, Bridget) (Entered: 05/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1760 Filed: 4/21/2010, Entered: 4/21/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order for 2010 Spring Operations. Signed on 04/21/2010 by Judge James A. Redden.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (pvh) (Entered: 04/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1759 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: 4/20/2010 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Response [The State of Oregon and NWF Plaintiffs' Response Re Federal Defendants' 2010 Spring Fish Operations Plan Addendum]. Filed by Washington Wildlife Federation, NW Energy Coalition, Federation of Fly Fishers, American Rivers, Inc., Sierra Club, Trout Unlimited, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, National Wildlife Federation, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Idaho Rivers United, Idaho Steelhead and Salmon United, Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association, Salmon for All, Columbia Riverkeeper, Idaho Wildlife Federation. (Related document(s): Memorandum in Opposition, (1757 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 831 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (True, Todd) (Entered: 04/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1758 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: 4/20/2010 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Response to Federal Defendants' Notice of 2010 Spring Operations (Docket No. 1757). Filed by Northwest River Partners. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Ginsberg, Beth) (Entered: 04/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1757 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: 4/19/2010 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in Opposition Federal Defendants' Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition Memorandum on 2010 Spring Operations. Filed by United States Army Corps of Engineers, U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, National Marine Fisheries Service, NOAA Fisheries. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Howell, Coby) (Entered: 04/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1756 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order GRANTING Federal Defendants' request for an extension of time until April 19, 2010, to file their response to Plaintiffs' opposition memorandum. Signed on 4/12/2010 by Judge James A. Redden. (js) (Entered: 04/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1755 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: 4/9/2010 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Change of Address Filed by State of MontanaAssociated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Stermitz, Mark) (Entered: 04/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1754 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: 4/7/2010 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Response Nez Perce Tribe's Response to Federal Defendants' Notice and Proposed Order for Spring 2010 Operations. Filed by Nez Perce Tribe. (Related document(s): Notice, (827 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Cummings, David) (Entered: 04/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1753 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: 4/7/2010 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint Response of the State of Oregon and the NWF Plaintiffs to Federal Defendants' Notice and Proposed Order for Spring 2010 Operations. Filed by Washington Wildlife Federation, NW Energy Coalition, Federation of Fly Fishers, American Rivers, Inc., Sierra Club, Trout Unlimited, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, National Wildlife Federation, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Idaho Rivers United, Idaho Steelhead and Salmon United, Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association, Salmon for All, Columbia Riverkeeper, Idaho Wildlife Federation. (Related document(s): Notice, (827 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE, 1752 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE).) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D: Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (True, Todd) (Entered: 04/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1752 Filed: 3/31/2010, Entered: 3/31/2010 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice Federal Defendants Notice of 2010 Spring Operations Filed by United States Army Corps of Engineers, U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, National Marine Fisheries Service, NOAA Fisheries (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Howell, Coby) (Entered: 03/31/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1751 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: 3/24/2010 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Change of Address Filed by State of OregonAssociated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (DeHoog, Roger) (Entered: 03/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1750 Filed: 2/19/2010, Entered: 2/19/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER of Voluntary Remand. Signed on 02/19/2010 by Judge James A. Redden. Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (pvh) (Entered: 02/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1749 Filed: 2/10/2010, Entered: 2/10/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter to Counsel of Record; Re: Federal Defendants' Request for Voluntary Remand. Signed by Judge James A. Redden on 02/10/2010. (Attachment: # 1 Proposed Order.) Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (pvh) (Entered: 02/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1748 Filed: 1/29/2010, Entered: 1/29/2010 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum in Support Reply in Support of Federal Defendants' Supplemental Brief. Filed by United States Army Corps of Engineers, U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, National Marine Fisheries Service. Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Howell, Coby) (Entered: 01/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1747 Filed: 1/29/2010, Entered: 1/29/2010 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint Response to Intervenor-Defendants' and Amici Curiae's Response in Support of Federal Defendants' Request to Supplement Administrative Record. Filed by Washington Wildlife Federation, NW Energy Coalition, Federation of Fly Fishers, American Rivers, Inc., Sierra Club, Trout Unlimited, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, National Wildlife Federation, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Idaho Rivers United, Idaho Steelhead and Salmon United, Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association, Salmon for All, Columbia Riverkeeper, Idaho Wildlife Federation. (Related document(s): Response(818 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE, 1743 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Mashuda, Stephen) (Entered: 01/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1746 Filed: 1/15/2010, Entered: 1/16/2010 Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Amicus Brief in Response to Federal Defendants Supplemental Brief. Filed by Spokane Tribe of Indians. Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Funke, Howard) (Entered: 01/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1745 Filed: 1/15/2010, Entered: 1/15/2010 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Response to Federal Defendants' Supplemental Brief. Filed by State of Oregon.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (DeHoog, Roger) (Entered: 01/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1744 Filed: 1/15/2010, Entered: 1/15/2010 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Response Nez Perce Tribe's Response to Federal Defendants' Supplemental Brief. Filed by Nez Perce Tribe. (Related document(s): Brief(815 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Cummings, David) (Entered: 01/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1743 Filed: 1/15/2010, Entered: 1/15/2010 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Response of Intervenor-Defendants and Amici Curiae in Support of Federal Defendants' Request to Supplement Administrative Record. Filed by State of Idaho.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Smith, Clay) (Entered: 01/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1742 Filed: 1/15/2010, Entered: 1/15/2010 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Response to Federal Defendants' Supplemental Brief. Filed by Washington Wildlife Federation, NW Energy Coalition, Federation of Fly Fishers, American Rivers, Inc., Sierra Club, Trout Unlimited, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, National Wildlife Federation, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Idaho Rivers United, Idaho Steelhead and Salmon United, Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association, Salmon for All, Columbia Riverkeeper, Idaho Wildlife Federation. (Related document(s): Brief(815 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE, 1740 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (True, Todd) (Entered: 01/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1741 Filed: 1/11/2010, Entered: 1/11/2010 Withdrawal of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Attorney Withdrawal: Tim Weaver Filed by Confederated Tribes and Bands of the Yakama NationAssociated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Weaver, Tim) (Entered: 01/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1740 Filed: 12/21/2009, Entered: 12/21/2009 Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Supplemental Brief. Filed by U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, National Marine Fisheries Service. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (McNeil, Bridget) (Entered: 12/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1739 Filed: 12/10/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order Adopting the parties' agreed-upon Briefing Schedule. Federal Defendants' Supplemental Brief is due December 21, 2009. Any party may file a Response no later than January 15, 2010. Federal Defendants' Reply is due January 29, 2010. Plaintiffs may also file a Reply Brief on or before January 29, 2010, to respond to the briefs of Intervenor-Defendants and/or allied amici. Ordered by Judge James A. Redden. (pvh) (Entered: 12/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1738 Filed: 12/2/2009, Entered: 12/2/2009 Transcript of ProceedingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OFFICIAL COURT TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS FILED Status Conference held on November 23, 2009 before Judge James A. Redden, Court Reporter Dennis W. Apodaca, telephone number (503) 326-8182. Transcript may be viewed at Court's public terminal or purchased from the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. Afterwards it may be obtained through PACER-See Policy at ord.uscourts.gov. . Notice of Intent to Redact Transcript is due by 12/14/2009. Redaction Request due 12/28/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/5/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/5/2010. Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Apodaca, Dennis) (Entered: 12/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1737 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTES of Oral Argument Proceedings: Oral Argument held 11/23/2009. The following counsel made comments: Todd True for Plaintiffs, Coby Howell for Federal Defendants, Clay Smith for State of Idaho, Roger DeHoog for the State of Oregon, David Cummings for the Nez Perce Tribe, Mike Grossman for the State of Washingon, Brent Hall for the Confederated Tribes of the Umatilla Indian Reservation, John Ogan for the Warm Springs Tribe, John Arum for the Confederated Tribes of the Colville Reservation, Julie Weis for the Kootenai Tribe of Idaho, Howard Funke for the Spokane Tribe, John Arum for the Colville Tribe, Tim Weaver (by telephone) for the Confederated Tribes and Bands of the Yakama Nation, Jay Waldron for Inland Ports and Navigation Group. Judge James A. Redden presiding. (Court Reporter: Dennis Apodaca). (pvh) (Entered: 11/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1736 Filed: 11/18/2009, Entered: 11/18/2009 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter to Counsel of Record. Re: Additional Issues for November 23, 2009 - Oral Argument. Signed by Judge James A. Redden on 11/18/09. (pvh) (Entered: 11/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1735 Filed: 11/13/2009, Entered: 11/13/2009 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter to Counsel of Record; Re: November 23rd, 2009 - Oral Argument. Signed by Judge James A. Redden on 11/13/2009. (pvh) (Entered: 11/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1734 Filed: 11/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Scheduling Order by Judge James A. Redden. The 11/17/2009 In-Court Hearing is stricken and reset for 11/23/2009, at 10:00AM in Portland before Judge James A. Redden. Ordered by Judge James A. Redden. (js) (Entered: 11/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1733 Filed: 10/23/2009, Entered: 10/23/2009 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in Support Federal Defendants' Combined Reply to Plaintiffs' Response to the Adaptive Management Implementation Plan. Filed by United States Army Corps of Engineers, U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, National Marine Fisheries Service, NOAA Fisheries. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Howell, Coby) (Entered: 10/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1732 Filed: 10/23/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Scheduling Order by Judge James A. Redden. An In-Court Conference is set for 11/17/2009 at 10:00AM before Judge James A. Redden. Ordered by Judge James A. Redden. (lg) (Entered: 10/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1731 Filed: 10/23/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: Granting Sovereigns' Motion for Leave to File a Single and Joint Response to Federal Defendant's September 15, 2009 Filing 1729 . Ordered by Judge James A. Redden. (lg) (Entered: 10/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1730 Filed: 10/22/2009, Entered: 10/22/2009 Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Brief Response of Sovereigns to Federal Defendant's September 15 2009 Filing. Filed by State of Washington. (Related document(s): Motion for Leave(811 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Grossmann, Michael) (Entered: 10/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1729 Filed: 10/22/2009, Entered: 10/22/2009 Motion for Leave
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion for Leave to File Joint Response of Sovereigns to Federal Defendants September 15, 2009 Filing. Filed by State of Washington.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Grossmann, Michael) (Entered: 10/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1728 Filed: 10/16/2009, Entered: 10/16/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER striking from the record Federal Defendants' Response 1726 to the Oregon Chapter of American Fisheries Society's Letter to the Court, and striking Attachment A (Letter from Oregon Chapter of American Fisheries Society). See attached Letter to Counsel. Ordered by Judge James A. Redden. (pvh) (Entered: 10/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1727 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: 10/9/2009 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Response Re Oregon Chapter, American Fisheries Society Letter. Filed by Washington Wildlife Federation, NW Energy Coalition, Federation of Fly Fishers, American Rivers, Inc., Sierra Club, Trout Unlimited, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, National Wildlife Federation, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Idaho Rivers United, Idaho Steelhead and Salmon United, Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association, Salmon for All, Columbia Riverkeeper, Idaho Wildlife Federation. (Related document(s): Request, (809 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE, 1726 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (True, Todd) (Entered: 10/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1726 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: 10/8/2009 Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            (STRICKEN)***See Order 1728 Request Federal Defendants' Response to Oregon Chapter of American Fisheries Society's Letter to the Court. Filed by U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, National Marine Fisheries Service, NOAA Fisheries, D Robert Lohn. (Attachments (STRICKEN): # 1 Attachment A)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Howell, Coby) Modified pursuant to Order 1728 on 10/16/2009 (pvh). (Entered: 10/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1725 Filed: 10/7/2009, Entered: 10/7/2009 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Response to the Adaptive Management Implementation Plan. Filed by State of Oregon.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (DeHoog, Roger) (Entered: 10/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1724 Filed: 10/7/2009, Entered: 10/7/2009 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Response NEZ PERCE TRIBE's Response to Federal Defendants' September 15, 2009 Submission (Docket #1712). Filed by Nez Perce Tribe. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment, # 2 Attachment)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Cummings, David) (Entered: 10/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1723 Filed: 10/7/2009, Entered: 10/7/2009 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Response [NWF's Response to Federal Defendants' September 15, 2009, Filing]. Filed by Washington Wildlife Federation, NW Energy Coalition, Federation of Fly Fishers, American Rivers, Inc., Sierra Club, Trout Unlimited, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, National Wildlife Federation, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Idaho Rivers United, Idaho Steelhead and Salmon United, Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association, Salmon for All, Columbia Riverkeeper, Idaho Wildlife Federation. (Related document(s): Notice,, (797 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE, 1712 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE).) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (True, Todd) (Entered: 10/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1722 Filed: 10/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER: I GRANT the State of Oregon's Motion 1721 for Extension of Time. Oregon, the Nez Perce Tribe, and the National Wildlife Federation Plaintiffs have until Wednesday, October 7, 2009, to file their responses to Federal Defendants' September 15, 2009 submission. Federal Defendants have until October 23, 2009, to file a reply. I GRANT in part, and DENY in part, Plaintiffs' Joint Motion 1717 to Expedite and Compel Production of Documents. I agree with Plaintiffs that the material requested from Federal Defendants "appears likely to be relevant to assessing whether federal defendants' actions have been based on the best scientific and commercial data available." Additionally, it is not clear whether the court can effectively review the challenged agency action without considering the "independent scientific opinions," upon which the Action Agencies apparently relied in developing the Adaptive Management Implementation Plan. As Federal Defendants point out, however, discovery is generally inappropriate under Administrative Procedure Act record-review principles. Accordingly, the court will review the responsive documents in camera, as suggested by Federal Defendants, to determine whether any of them fall into any exception to the record review rule. If they do, I will issue an order explaining the exception that applies, and I may allow Plaintiffs to review the document(s) and file a supplemental brief to address the document(s). Federal Defendants will have an opportunity to reply. No later than October 16, 2009, Federal Defendants shall submit to the court for in camera review any and all documents responsive to Plaintiffs Request for Production No. 1. Signed on 10/2/2009 by Judge James A. Redden. (js) (Entered: 10/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1721 Filed: 10/1/2009, Entered: 10/1/2009 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion for Extension of Time. Filed by State of Oregon.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (DeHoog, Roger) (Entered: 10/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1720 Filed: 9/30/2009, Entered: 9/30/2009 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum in Opposition to Joint Motion to Compel Production of Documents (Expedited Hearing Requested)Joint Motion to Compel Production of Documents (Expedited Hearing Requested)Joint Motion to Compel Production of Documents (Expedited Hearing Requested)Joint Motion to Expedite or Accelerate Production of Documents (Expedited Hearing Requested)Joint Motion to Expedite or Accelerate Production of Documents (Expedited Hearing Requested)Joint Motion to Expedite or Accelerate Production of Documents (Expedited Hearing Requested)(1717 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE). Filed by U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, National Marine Fisheries Service.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (McNeil, Bridget) (Entered: 09/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1719 Filed: 9/29/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order. As requested, Federal Defendants have until September 30, 2009, to file a response to Plaintiffs Joint Motion to Expedite and Compel Production of Documents. The court will then decide whether a reply brief is warranted, and whether the current briefing schedule should be revised accordingly. Signed on 9/29/2009 by Judge James A. Redden. (js) (Entered: 09/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1718 Filed: 9/25/2009, Entered: 9/25/2009 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Joint Motion to Expedite and Compel Production of Documents. Filed by Washington Wildlife Federation, NW Energy Coalition, Federation of Fly Fishers, American Rivers, Inc., Sierra Club, Trout Unlimited, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, National Wildlife Federation, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Idaho Rivers United, Idaho Steelhead and Salmon United, Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association, Salmon for All, Columbia Riverkeeper, Idaho Wildlife Federation. (Related document(s): Motion to compel,,, Motion to Expedite,, (802 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE, 802 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (True, Todd) (Entered: 09/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1717 Filed: 9/25/2009, Entered: 9/25/2009 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint Motion to Compel Production of Documents (Expedited Hearing Requested), Joint Motion to Expedite or Accelerate Production of Documents (Expedited Hearing Requested). Filed by Washington Wildlife Federation, NW Energy Coalition, Federation of Fly Fishers, American Rivers, Inc., Sierra Club, Trout Unlimited, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, National Wildlife Federation, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Idaho Rivers United, Idaho Steelhead and Salmon United, Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association, Salmon for All, Columbia Riverkeeper, Idaho Wildlife Federation. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (True, Todd) (Entered: 09/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1716 Filed: 9/23/2009, Entered: 9/23/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter To Counsel. Signed on 9/23/09 by Judge James A. Redden. Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (tomg) (Entered: 09/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1715 Filed: 9/23/2009, Entered: 9/23/2009 Attorney Association
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Association of Attorney, Notice of Appearance of Patrick D. Spurgin appearing on behalf of Confederated Tribes and Bands of the Yakama Nation.Filed by on behalf of Confederated Tribes and Bands of the Yakama Nation.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Spurgin, Patrick) (Entered: 09/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1714 Filed: 9/22/2009, Entered: 9/22/2009 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice re Notice,, (797 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE) Errata to Exhibit 1 to Federal Defendants' Response to the Court's May 18, 2009 Letter.Filed by United States Army Corps of Engineers, U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, National Marine Fisheries Service, NOAA Fisheries, D Robert Lohn. (Related document(s): Notice,, (797 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).) (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A, # 2 Attachment B)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Howell, Coby) (Entered: 09/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1713 Filed: 9/16/2009, Entered: 9/16/2009 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Status Report (Fifth Spill Implementation Report) by U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, National Marine Fisheries Service. Filed by U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, National Marine Fisheries Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B (1 of2), # 3 Exhibit B (2 of 2))Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (McNeil, Bridget) (Entered: 09/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1712 Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: 9/15/2009 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Federal Defendants' Response to the Court's May 18, 2009, Letter.Filed by United States Army Corps of Engineers, U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, National Marine Fisheries Service, NOAA Fisheries, D Robert Lohn. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 1a, # 3 Exhibit 1b, # 4 Exhibit 1c, # 5 Exhibit 1d, # 6 Exhibit 1e, # 7 Exhibit 1f, # 8 Exhibit 2, # 9 Exhibit 3)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Howell, Coby) (Entered: 09/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1711 Filed: 8/17/2009, Entered: 8/17/2009 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Status Report (Fourth Spill Implementation Report) by U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, National Marine Fisheries Service. Filed by U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, National Marine Fisheries Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B (1 of 2), # 3 Exhibit B (2 of 2))Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (McNeil, Bridget) (Entered: 08/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1710 Filed: 8/12/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order. Plaintiffs' Joint Request for a Status Conference 1709 is DENIED. Signed on 8/12/2009, by Judge James A. Redden. (js) (Entered: 08/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1709 Filed: 8/11/2009, Entered: 8/11/2009 Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint Request for a Status Conference. Filed by Washington Wildlife Federation, NW Energy Coalition, Federation of Fly Fishers, American Rivers, Inc., Sierra Club, Trout Unlimited, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, National Wildlife Federation, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Idaho Rivers United, Idaho Steelhead and Salmon United, Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association, Salmon for All, Columbia Riverkeeper, Idaho Wildlife Federation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Mashuda, Stephen) (Entered: 08/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1708 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: 8/10/2009 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter from Federal Defendants. (js) (Entered: 08/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1707 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order granting Federal Defendants' August 10, 2009 request for additional time. Federal Defendants have until September 15, 2009, to provide their final position on the FCRPS BiOp to the Court. Signed on 8/10/2009, by Judge James A. Redden. (js) (Entered: 08/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1706 Filed: 7/15/2009, Entered: 7/15/2009 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Status Report (Third Spill Implementation Report) by U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, National Marine Fisheries Service. Filed by U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, National Marine Fisheries Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B (1 of 2), # 3 Exhibit B (2 of 2))Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (McNeil, Bridget) (Entered: 07/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1705 Filed: 6/22/2009, Entered: 6/22/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Correspondence. (Attachments: Attachment (1) Status Report Letter, Attachment (2) Schedule Agreement Letter) Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (tomg) (Entered: 06/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1704 Filed: 6/15/2009, Entered: 6/15/2009 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Status Report (Second Spill Report) by all defendants. Filed by all defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B (1 of 2), # 3 Exhibit B (2 of 2))Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (McNeil, Bridget) (Entered: 06/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1703 Filed: 6/15/2009, Entered: 6/15/2009 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Status Report (Letter to Court from Nez Perce Tribe, State of Oregon & NWF) by Nez Perce Tribe. Filed by Nez Perce Tribe. Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Cummings, David) (Entered: 06/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1702 Filed: 6/10/2009, Entered: 6/10/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order For 2009 Summer Spill Operations. Signed on 6/10/09 by Judge James A. Redden.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (tomg) (Entered: 06/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1701 Filed: 6/10/2009, Entered: 6/10/2009 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint Response to Submission of Proposed Order For 2009 Summer Spill Operations. Filed by State of Oregon. (Related document(s): Notice, (1700 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 788 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (DeHoog, Roger) (Entered: 06/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1700 Filed: 6/2/2009, Entered: 6/2/2009 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice Submission of Proposed Order for 2009 Summer Spill Operations.Filed by United States Army Corps of Engineers, U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, National Marine Fisheries Service, NOAA Fisheries, D Robert Lohn. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Attachment 1)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Howell, Coby) (Entered: 06/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1699 Filed: 5/18/2009, Entered: 5/18/2009 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter to Counsel of Record. Signed by Judge James A. Redden on 5/18/09. Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (tomg) (Entered: 05/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1698 Filed: 5/15/2009, Entered: 5/15/2009 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    First Status Report (2009 Spring Spill Implementation) by U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, National Marine Fisheries Service. Filed by U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, National Marine Fisheries Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B (1 of 2), # 3 Exhibit B (2 of 2))Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (McNeil, Bridget) (Entered: 05/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1697 Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: 5/12/2009 Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Correspondence. (Attachments: # 1 Status Report Letter, # 2 Request for Meeting Letter, # 3 Letter regarding meeting, # 4 Letter requesting additional time, # 5 Nez Perce Letter in Response, # 6 Earth Justice Letter, # 7 National Wildlife Federation Letter, # 8 May 1, Earth Justice Letter, # 9 Spokane Tribes letter)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (ljl) (Entered: 05/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1696 Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order directing the Clerk of the Court to docket and make available to the public the correspondence between parties and the court (see next entry). Signed on 5/12/09 by Judge James A. Redden.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (ljl) (Entered: 05/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1695 Filed: 5/1/2009, Entered: 5/4/2009 Transcript of ProceedingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Transcript of Proceedings held on 3/6/09 before Judge James A. Redden. Court Reporter: Dennis Grube.. Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (ljl) (Entered: 05/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1694 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: 4/10/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint Order for 2009 Spring Operations. Signed on 4/10/2009 by Judge James A. Redden. (See formal Order, 8-pages)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (ecp) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1693 Filed: 4/3/2009, Entered: 4/3/2009 Proposed Form of Order or Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Form of Order Submitted Joint Proposed Order for 2009 Spring Operations. Filed by U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, National Marine Fisheries Service, NOAA Fisheries, D Robert Lohn. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Howell, Coby) (Entered: 04/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1692 Filed: 3/24/2009, Entered: 3/24/2009 Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Appearance of Thomas Zeilman, Thomas Zeilman appearing on behalf of Confederated Tribes and Bands of the Yakama Nation, Notice of Association of Attorney Thomas Zeilman and Thomas Zeilman for Confederated Tribes and Bands of the Yakama Nation.Filed by on behalf of Confederated Tribes and Bands of the Yakama Nation.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Zeilman, Thomas) (Entered: 03/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1691 Filed: 3/6/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTES of Proceedings: Oral Argument held on Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment (doc. 1498), Intervenor-Plaintiff State of Oregon's Motion for Summary Judgment (doc. 1507), Northwest River Partners' Cross Motion for Summary Judgment (doc. 1539), Confederated Salish and Kootenai Tribes and Kootenai Tribe of Idaho's Joint Motion (and Cross Motion) for Summary Judgment (doc. 1551), States of Idaho, Montana and Washington's Motion for Summary Judgment (doc. 1553), Federal Defendants' Cross Motion for Summary Judgment (doc. 1556). The motions are taken under advisement as of 3/6/2009. The following counsel made comments: Todd True for Plaintiffs, Coby Howell and Bridget Kennedy McNeil for Federal Defendants, Beth Ginsberg for Northwest River Partners, Clay Smith for State of Idaho, Roger DeHoog for State of Oregon, David Cummings for Nez Perce Tribe, John Ogan for Warm Springs Tribe, Julie Weis for Kootenai Tribe, Stuart Levit for Confederated Salish and Kootenai Tribes, Howard Funke for Spokane Tribe, John Arum for Colville Tribe, Jay Waldron for Inland Ports. by Judge James A. Redden. (lg) (Entered: 03/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1690 Filed: 3/5/2009, Entered: 3/5/2009 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Summons Returned Executed. as to U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers served on 1/22/2009, answer due on 2/11/2009 (served on Lt. General Robert L. Van Antwerp) Filed by State of Oregon.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (DeHoog, Roger) (Entered: 03/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1689 Filed: 3/5/2009, Entered: 3/5/2009 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Summons Returned Executed. as to U.S. Bureau of Reclamation served on 1/22/2009, answer due on 2/11/2009 (served on Robert W. Johnson) Filed by State of Oregon.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (DeHoog, Roger) (Entered: 03/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1688 Filed: 3/5/2009, Entered: 3/5/2009 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Summons Returned Executed. as to U.S. Bureau of Reclamation served on 1/16/2009, answer due on 2/5/2009 (served J. William McDonald) Filed by State of Oregon.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (DeHoog, Roger) (Entered: 03/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1687 Filed: 3/5/2009, Entered: 3/5/2009 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Summons Returned Executed. as to National Marine Fisheries Service served on 1/23/2009, answer due on 2/12/2009 (served on US Attorney General) Filed by State of Oregon.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (DeHoog, Roger) (Entered: 03/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1686 Filed: 3/5/2009, Entered: 3/5/2009 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Summons Returned Executed. as to U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers served on 1/14/2009, answer due on 2/3/2009 (served on William E. Rapp) Filed by State of Oregon.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (DeHoog, Roger) (Entered: 03/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1685 Filed: 3/5/2009, Entered: 3/5/2009 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Summons Returned Executed. as to National Marine Fisheries Service served on 1/14/2009, answer due on 2/3/2009 (served on Stephen J. Odell) Filed by State of Oregon.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (DeHoog, Roger) (Entered: 03/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1684 Filed: 2/25/2009, Entered: 2/25/2009 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Affidavit in Opposition and Errata to and Corrected Declaration of William J. Bosch in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment(1553 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE), Joint Motion for Summary Judgment (and Cross Motion)(1551 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE), Cross Motion for Summary Judgment(1539 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE), Motion for Summary Judgment Federal Defendants' Cross Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment(1556 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE), Motion for Summary Judgment(1507 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE), Joint Motion for Summary Judgment (and Cross Motion)Joint Motion for Summary Judgment (and Cross Motion)(1542 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE), Motion for Summary Judgment(1498 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE). Filed by Confederated Tribes of the Warm Springs Reservation of Oregon, Confederated Tribes and Bands of the Yakama Nation, Confederated Tribes of the Umatilla Indian Reservation. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Corrected Declaration of Williams J. Bosch)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Weaver, Tim) (Entered: 02/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1683 Filed: 2/25/2009, Entered: 2/25/2009 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter to Counsel dated 2/25/09 from Judge James A. Redden. (kw) (Entered: 02/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1682 Filed: 2/18/2009, Entered: 2/18/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter to Counsel. Signed on 2/18/09 by Judge James A. Redden.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (ljl) (Entered: 02/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1681 Filed: 2/17/2009, Entered: 2/17/2009 Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Appearance of John T. Harrison appearing on behalf of Confederated Salish and Kootenai Tribes.Filed by on behalf of Confederated Salish and Kootenai Tribes.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Harrison, John) (Entered: 02/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1680 Filed: 1/29/2009, Entered: 1/29/2009 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Answer regarding Amended Complaint, (760 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE) IPNG's Answer to State of Oregon's Second Supplemental Complaint-In-Intervention for Declaratory Relief. Filed by Inland Ports and Navigation Group. (Related document(s): Amended Complaint, (760 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Waldron, Jay) (Entered: 01/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1679 Filed: 1/27/2009, Entered: 1/27/2009 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Answer to Complaint State of Oregon's Second Supplemental Complaint-in-Intervention for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief. Filed by Clarkston Golf & Country Club.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Norton, Rodney) (Entered: 01/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1678 Filed: 1/23/2009, Entered: 1/23/2009 Surresponse to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sur-Response Federal Defendants' Response to NWF's Surreply to Motion for Summary Judgment Federal Defendants' Cross Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment(1556 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE), Motion for Summary Judgment(1498 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE). Filed by United States Army Corps of Engineers, U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, National Marine Fisheries Service, NOAA Fisheries, D Robert Lohn.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Howell, Coby) (Entered: 01/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1677 Filed: 1/22/2009, Entered: 1/22/2009 Surresponse to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Amended Sur-Response of Northwest RiverPartners, State of Montana, the Confederated Tribes of the Colville Reservation, the Kootenai Tribe of Idaho, and the Confederated Salish and Kootenai Tribes to NWF's Surreply to Motion for Summary Judgment(1498 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE). Filed by Northwest River Partners.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Ginsberg, Beth) (Entered: 01/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1676 Filed: 1/22/2009, Entered: 1/22/2009 Surresponse to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint Sur-Response Joint Response of Northwest RiverPartners, State of Montana, the Confederated Tribes of the Colville Reservation, and the Confederated Salish and Kootenai Tribes to NWF'S Surreply to Motion for Summary Judgment(1498 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE). Filed by Northwest River Partners.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Ginsberg, Beth) (Entered: 01/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1675 Filed: 1/16/2009, Entered: 1/16/2009 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Answer to Amended Complaint Titled Answer to Oregon's Second Supplemental Complaint-In-Intervention for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief. Filed by Columbia Snake River Irrigators Association.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Buchal, James) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1674 Filed: 1/16/2009, Entered: 1/16/2009 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Answer to Amended Complaint of State of Oregon. Filed by Northwest River Partners.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Ginsberg, Beth) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1673 Filed: 1/16/2009, Entered: 1/16/2009 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of Service by State of Montana AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Filed by State of Montana.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Weiner, Jeremiah) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1672 Filed: 1/16/2009, Entered: 1/16/2009 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Answer by Intervenor-Defendant State of Montana to State of Oregon's Second Supplemental Complaint-in-Intervention for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief. Filed by State of Montana.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Weiner, Jeremiah) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1671 Filed: 1/16/2009, Entered: 1/16/2009 Surreply to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sur-Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment and in Opposition to Cross-Motions. Filed by Washington Wildlife Federation, NW Energy Coalition, Federation of Fly Fishers, American Rivers, Inc., Sierra Club, Trout Unlimited, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, National Wildlife Federation, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Idaho Rivers United, Idaho Steelhead and Salmon United, Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association, Salmon for All, Columbia Riverkeeper, Idaho Wildlife Federation.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (True, Todd) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1670 Filed: 1/15/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Surreply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment and in Opposition to Federal Defendants' and Defendant-Intervenors' Cross-Motions 1657 is GRANTED. If they wish, Federal Defendants and/or any of the parties aligned with Defendants may file a response (no more than 5 pages) to Plaintiffs' Surreply by January 23, 2009. Signed on 1/15/2009 by Judge James A. Redden. (js) (Entered: 01/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1669 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: 1/14/2009 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Answer to Amended Complaint Answer to State of Oregon's Second Supplemental Complaint-In-Intervention For Declaratory and Injunctive Relief By Intervenor-Defendant State of Washington. Filed by State of Washington.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Grossmann, Michael) (Entered: 01/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1668 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: 1/14/2009 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Response to Motion for Leave to File Surreply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment and in Opposition to Federal Defendants' and Defendant-Intervenors' Cross-Motions(1657 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE). Filed by United States Army Corps of Engineers, U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, National Marine Fisheries Service, NOAA Fisheries, D Robert Lohn.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Howell, Coby) (Entered: 01/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1667 Filed: 1/13/2009, Entered: 1/13/2009 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint Response in Opposition to Motion for Leave to File Surreply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment and in Opposition to Federal Defendants' and Defendant-Intervenors' Cross-Motions(1657 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 756 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE). Filed by Kootenai Tribe of Idaho, Confederated Tribes of the Colville Reservation, Northwest River Partners.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Arum, John) (Entered: 01/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1666 Filed: 1/13/2009, Entered: 1/13/2009 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in Opposition (Joint Response of Washington, Idaho and Montana in Opposition) to Motion for Leave to File Surreply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment and in Opposition to Federal Defendants' and Defendant-Intervenors' Cross-Motions(1657 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE). Filed by State of Montana, State of Washington, State of Idaho.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Smith, Clay) (Entered: 01/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1665 Filed: 1/12/2009, Entered: 1/12/2009 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Answer to Amended Complaint (Answer to State of Oregon's Second Supplemental Complaint-In-Intervention For Declaratory and Injunctive Relief By Intervenor-Defendant State of Idaho). Filed by State of Idaho.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Smith, Clay) (Entered: 01/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1664 Filed: 1/9/2009, Entered: 1/9/2009 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Supplemental Amended Complaint (titled State of Oregon's Second Supplemental Complaint-in-Intervention for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief).Filed by State of Oregon against all defendants.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Leith, David) (Entered: 01/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1663 Filed: 1/9/2009, Entered: 1/9/2009 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Filing Declaration of Joseph Bogaard in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment.Filed by Washington Wildlife Federation, NW Energy Coalition, Federation of Fly Fishers, American Rivers, Inc., Sierra Club, Trout Unlimited, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, National Wildlife Federation, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Idaho Rivers United, Idaho Steelhead and Salmon United, Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association, Salmon for All, Columbia Riverkeeper, Idaho Wildlife Federation. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Declaration of Joseph Bogaard in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Mashuda, Stephen) (Entered: 01/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1662 Filed: 1/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: Granting Columbia River Irrigators' Motion for Extension of Time 1660 . Because oral argument on the motions for summary judgment has been reset, the remainder of the briefing schedule for Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction is stricken. We will discuss a revised briefing schedule and oral argument date for the preliminary injunction motion at the March 6, 2009 oral argument. Signed on 1/9/2009 by Judge James A. Redden. (js) (Entered: 01/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1661 Filed: 1/8/2009, Entered: 1/8/2009 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in Support of Motion for Extension of Time Re: Preliminary Injunction Briefing Schedule. Filed by Columbia-Snake River Irrigators Association. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time(757 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE, 1660 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Buchal, James) (Entered: 01/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1660 Filed: 1/8/2009, Entered: 1/8/2009 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion for Extension of Time Re: Preliminary Injunction Briefing Schedule. Filed by Columbia-Snake River Irrigators Association.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Buchal, James) (Entered: 01/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1659 Filed: 1/8/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: Granting the State of Oregon's Motion for Leave 1628 to File Second Supplemental Complaint-in-Intervention. Signed on 1/8/2009 by Judge James A. Redden. (js) (Entered: 01/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1658 Filed: 1/6/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Scheduling Order by Judge James A. Redden. 2/20/2009 Oral Argument on the Cross Motions for Summary Judgment is reset for 3/6/2009 at 09:30AMbefore Judge James A. Redden. Ordered by Judge James A. Redden. (lg) (Entered: 01/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1657 Filed: 1/6/2009, Entered: 1/6/2009 Motion for Leave
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion for Leave to File Surreply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment and in Opposition to Federal Defendants' and Defendant-Intervenors' Cross-Motions. Filed by Washington Wildlife Federation, NW Energy Coalition, Federation of Fly Fishers, American Rivers, Inc., Sierra Club, Trout Unlimited, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, National Wildlife Federation, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Idaho Rivers United, Idaho Steelhead and Salmon United, Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association, Salmon for All, Columbia Riverkeeper, Idaho Wildlife Federation. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment NWF's Surreply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment and in Opposition to Cross-Motions)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (True, Todd) (Entered: 01/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1656 Filed: 12/19/2008, Entered: 12/19/2008 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Amended Notice Re Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Intervenor-Defendant Northwest RiverPartners 1539 .Filed by Northwest River Partners.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Ginsberg, Beth) (Entered: 12/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1655 Filed: 12/18/2008, Entered: 12/18/2008 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice re Amended Joint Summary Judgment Reply Brief.Filed by State of Montana, State of Washington, State of Idaho.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Stermitz, Mark) (Entered: 12/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1654 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: 12/17/2008 reply to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Amended Reply Memorandum in Support of Cross Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by State of Montana, State of Washington, State of Idaho.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Stermitz, Mark) (Entered: 12/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1653 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: 12/17/2008 reply to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint Reply Brief in Support of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by State of Montana, State of Washington, State of Idaho.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Stermitz, Mark) (Entered: 12/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1652 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: 12/17/2008 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Rich Zabel 2008 Reply Declaration. Filed by United States Army Corps of Engineers, U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, National Marine Fisheries Service, NOAA Fisheries, D Robert Lohn. (Related document(s): Reply to Motion, (744 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Howell, Coby) (Entered: 12/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1651 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: 12/17/2008 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Robert Jones 2008 Reply Declaration. Filed by United States Army Corps of Engineers, U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, National Marine Fisheries Service, NOAA Fisheries, D Robert Lohn. (Related document(s): Reply to Motion, (744 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Howell, Coby) (Entered: 12/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1650 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: 12/17/2008 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Kim Kratz 2008 Reply Declaration. Filed by United States Army Corps of Engineers, U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, National Marine Fisheries Service, NOAA Fisheries, D Robert Lohn. (Related document(s): Reply to Motion, (744 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Howell, Coby) (Entered: 12/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1649 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: 12/17/2008 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Christopher Toole 2008 Reply Declaration. Filed by United States Army Corps of Engineers, U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, National Marine Fisheries Service, NOAA Fisheries, D Robert Lohn. (Related document(s): Reply to Motion, (744 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Howell, Coby) (Entered: 12/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1648 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: 12/17/2008 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Ritchie Graves 2008 Reply Declaration. Filed by United States Army Corps of Engineers, U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, National Marine Fisheries Service, NOAA Fisheries, D Robert Lohn. (Related document(s): Reply to Motion, (744 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Howell, Coby) (Entered: 12/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1647 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: 12/17/2008 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Rich Hinrichsen 2008 Reply Declaration. Filed by United States Army Corps of Engineers, U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, National Marine Fisheries Service, NOAA Fisheries, D Robert Lohn. (Related document(s): Reply to Motion, (744 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Howell, Coby) (Entered: 12/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1646 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: 12/17/2008 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Rock Peters 2008 Reply Declaration. Filed by United States Army Corps of Engineers, U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, National Marine Fisheries Service, NOAA Fisheries, D Robert Lohn. (Related document(s): Reply to Motion, (744 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).) (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2, # 3 Attachment 3, # 4 Attachment 4, # 5 Attachment 5, # 6 Attachment 6)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Howell, Coby) (Entered: 12/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1645 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: 12/17/2008 reply to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Reply in Support of Federal Defendants' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motions for Summary Judgment. Filed by United States Army Corps of Engineers, U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, National Marine Fisheries Service, NOAA Fisheries, D Robert Lohn. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 3)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Howell, Coby) (Entered: 12/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1644 Filed: 12/16/2008, Entered: 12/16/2008 reply to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Amended Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment [1539 Cross Motion for Summary Judgment]. Filed by Northwest River Partners. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Ginsberg, Beth) (Entered: 12/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1643 Filed: 12/16/2008, Entered: 12/16/2008 reply to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Reply to Summary Judgment. Filed by Northwest River Partners. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Ginsberg, Beth) (Entered: 12/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1642 Filed: 12/16/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Scheduling Order by Judge James A. Redden. The hearing for oral argument on Cross Motions for Summary Judgment currently scheduled for January 16, 2009, is stricken so that the court may adequately examine the extensive briefing. The court anticipates that final Reply briefs will be filed this week.All counsel will receive a list of questions to be addressed at oral argument.Oral argument is scheduled for Friday, February 20, 2009, at 9:30 a.m. If this date is unacceptable to any party or amici, counsel shall confer and advise the court of alternatives.At the close of oral argument we will discuss scheduling plaintiffs pending Motion for Injunctive Relief, as well as the 2009 spill, if appropriate. Ordered by Judge James A. Redden. (lg) (Entered: 12/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1641 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: 12/15/2008 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Amended Declaration of Charles E. Pace. Filed by Spokane Tribe of Indians. Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Funke, Howard) (Entered: 12/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1640 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: 12/15/2008 reply to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Amended Reply With Errata. Filed by Spokane Tribe of Indians.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Funke, Howard) (Entered: 12/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1639 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: 12/15/2008 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Amended Response to Motion for Summary Judgment(1553 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE), Joint Motion for Summary Judgment (and Cross Motion)(1551 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE), Cross Motion for Summary Judgment(1539 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE), Motion for Summary Judgment Federal Defendants' Cross Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment(1556 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE), Motion for Summary Judgment(1507 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE), Joint Motion for Summary Judgment (and Cross Motion)Joint Motion for Summary Judgment (and Cross Motion)(1542 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE), Motion for Summary Judgment(1498 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE). Filed by Spokane Tribe of Indians.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Funke, Howard) (Entered: 12/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1638 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: 12/12/2008 reply to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Amicus Reply Brief of Colville Confederated Tribes to Motion for Summary Judgment Federal Defendants' Cross Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment(1556 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE). Filed by Confederated Tribes of the Colville Reservation.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Arum, John) (Entered: 12/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1637 Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: 12/8/2008 Supplement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Supplement (titled Oregon's Description of Changes to Documents Pursuant to FRCP 15 and LR 15.1(c)(2)). Filed by State of Oregon. (Related document(s): Declaration, (628 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE, 1510 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE), Memorandum in Support of Motion, (1508 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 626 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (DeHoog, Roger) (Entered: 12/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1636 Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: Granting Federal Defendant's Motion 1635 for an Extension of Time and Leave to file an Over-Length Brief for their Reply in Support of Federal Defendants' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' and Plaintiff-Intervenor's Motions for Summary Judgment. Defendant-Intervenors and amici have joined in the motion for an extension of time to file a reply but did not join the request to file an over-length brief. The reply briefs are due 12/17/2008 and the Federal Defendants may file a brief of 55 pages in length. Ordered by Judge James A. Redden. (lg) (Entered: 12/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1635 Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: 12/8/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion for Extension of Time Federal Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time and Leave to File an Over-Length Brief. Filed by United States Army Corps of Engineers, U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, National Marine Fisheries Service, Donald L Evans, NOAA Fisheries, D Robert Lohn.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Howell, Coby) (Entered: 12/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1634 Filed: 12/4/2008, Entered: 12/4/2008 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice.Filed by Northwest Power Planning Council.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Hirotsu, Sandra) (Entered: 12/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1633 Filed: 12/1/2008, Entered: 12/1/2008 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Amended Declaration of Edward Bowles. Filed by State of Oregon. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment(625 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Leith, David) (Entered: 12/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1632 Filed: 12/1/2008, Entered: 12/1/2008 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum in Support (titled Amended Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment). Filed by State of Oregon. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment(625 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Leith, David) (Entered: 12/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1631 Filed: 11/25/2008, Entered: 11/25/2008 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum in Support of NWF Plaintiffs' and Oregon's Joint Motion for a Preliminary Injunction, or in the Alternative, a Permanent Injunction. Filed by Nez Perce Tribe. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction(1627 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 728 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE), Motion for Preliminary Injunction(1623 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 724 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Cummings, David) (Entered: 11/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1630 Filed: 11/25/2008, Entered: 11/25/2008 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Edward Bowles in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Injunctive Relief. Filed by State of Oregon. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction(728 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Leith, David) (Entered: 11/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1629 Filed: 11/25/2008, Entered: 11/25/2008 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in Support of Motion for Leave to File Second Supplemental Complaint-in-Intervention. Filed by State of Oregon. (Related document(s): Motion for Leave(729 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Leith, David) (Entered: 11/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1628 Filed: 11/25/2008, Entered: 11/25/2008 Motion for Leave
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion for Leave to File Second Supplemental Complaint-in-Intervention. Filed by State of Oregon.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Leith, David) (Entered: 11/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1627 Filed: 11/25/2008, Entered: 11/25/2008 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion for Preliminary Injunction or, in the Alternative, a Permanent Injunction (Corrected). Filed by State of Oregon.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Leith, David) (Entered: 11/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1626 Filed: 11/25/2008, Entered: 11/25/2008 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Frederick E. Olney in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction or, in the Alternative, a Permanent Injunction. Filed by Washington Wildlife Federation, NW Energy Coalition, Federation of Fly Fishers, American Rivers, Inc., Sierra Club, Trout Unlimited, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, National Wildlife Federation, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Idaho Rivers United, Idaho Steelhead and Salmon United, Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association, Salmon for All, Columbia Riverkeeper, Idaho Wildlife Federation. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction(1627 in CV 01-640; 724 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (True, Todd) Modified on 12/1/2008 (Lattz, L.). (Entered: 11/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1625 Filed: 11/25/2008, Entered: 11/25/2008 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in Support of Motion for a Preliminary Injunction or, in the Alternative, a Permanent Injunction. Filed by Washington Wildlife Federation, NW Energy Coalition, Federation of Fly Fishers, American Rivers, Inc., Sierra Club, Trout Unlimited, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, National Wildlife Federation, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Idaho Rivers United, Idaho Steelhead and Salmon United, Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association, Salmon for All, Columbia Riverkeeper, Idaho Wildlife Federation. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction(1627 in CV 01-640; 724 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (True, Todd) Modified on 12/1/2008 (Lattz, L.). (Entered: 11/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1624 Filed: 11/25/2008, Entered: 11/25/2008 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum in Support of Motion for Injunctive Relief. Filed by State of Oregon. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction(724 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Leith, David) (Entered: 11/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1623 Filed: 11/25/2008, Entered: 11/25/2008 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion for Preliminary Injunction or, in the Alternative, a Permanent Injunction. Filed by State of Oregon.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Leith, David) Modified on 8/2/2011 (pvh). (Entered: 11/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1622 Filed: 11/25/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: Granting Oregon's Motion for Leave 1533 to file amended memorandum and amended declaration of Edward Bowles. Signed on 11/25/2008 by Judge James A. Redden. (js) (Entered: 11/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1621 Filed: 11/25/2008, Entered: 11/25/2008 Summons Returned Executed - USA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers served on 10/8/2008 [Served on LTG. Robert L. Van Antwerp and Col. William E. Rapp] Answer is due by 1/26/2009. Filed by Washington Wildlife Federation; NW Energy Coalition; Federation of Fly Fishers; American Rivers, Inc.; Sierra Club; Trout Unlimited; Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations; National Wildlife Federation; Institute for Fisheries Resources; Idaho Rivers United; Idaho Steelhead and Salmon United; Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association; Salmon for All; Columbia Riverkeeper; Idaho Wildlife Federation.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (True, Todd) (Entered: 11/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1620 Filed: 11/25/2008, Entered: 11/25/2008 Summons Returned Executed - USA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Bureau of Reclamation served on 10/8/2008 [Served on J. William McDonald and Robert W. Johnson] Answer is due by 1/26/2009. Filed by Washington Wildlife Federation; NW Energy Coalition; Federation of Fly Fishers; American Rivers, Inc.; Sierra Club; Trout Unlimited; Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations; National Wildlife Federation; Institute for Fisheries Resources; Idaho Rivers United; Idaho Steelhead and Salmon United; Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association; Salmon for All; Columbia Riverkeeper; Idaho Wildlife Federation.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (True, Todd) (Entered: 11/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1619 Filed: 11/24/2008, Entered: 11/24/2008 Order on Motion to StrikeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: Denying Federal Defendants' Motions to Strike 1543 & 1616 . See attached Opinion and Order. Signed on 11/24/2008 by Judge James A. Redden. (js) (Entered: 11/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1618 Filed: 11/24/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Scheduling Order Re: Injunction Briefing Schedule. Plaintiffs' Motion for Injunctive Relief is due November 25, 2008. Federal Defendants' Response in Opposition is due February 13, 2009. Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of the motion for preliminary injunctive relief is due February 27, 2009. Ordered by Judge James A. Redden. (js) (Entered: 11/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1617 Filed: 11/21/2008, Entered: 11/21/2008 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in Support of Motion to Strike Additional Extra-Record Materials. Filed by U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, National Marine Fisheries Service. (Related document(s): Motion to Strike(1616 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 720 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Eitel, Michael) (Entered: 11/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1616 Filed: 11/21/2008, Entered: 11/21/2008 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion to Strike Additional Extra-Record Materials. Filed by U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, National Marine Fisheries Service.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Eitel, Michael) (Entered: 11/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1615 Filed: 11/21/2008, Entered: 11/21/2008 Surreply to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sur-Reply to Plaintiffs' Motion to Adjust the Injunction Briefing Schedule Re 2008 Biological Opinion. Filed by United States Army Corps of Engineers, U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, National Marine Fisheries Service, NOAA Fisheries, D Robert Lohn.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Howell, Coby) (Entered: 11/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1614 Filed: 11/20/2008, Entered: 11/20/2008 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Reply in Support of Motion to Adjust the Injunction Briefing Schedule Re 2008 Biological Opinion. Filed by Washington Wildlife Federation, NW Energy Coalition, Federation of Fly Fishers, American Rivers, Inc., Sierra Club, Trout Unlimited, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, National Wildlife Federation, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Idaho Rivers United, Idaho Steelhead and Salmon United, Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association, Salmon for All, Columbia Riverkeeper, Idaho Wildlife Federation. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time,, (692 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE, 1585 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (True, Todd) (Entered: 11/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1613 Filed: 11/19/2008, Entered: 11/20/2008 Administrative Record
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Excerpts of Administrative Record in Support of Plaintiffs' Summary Judgment. Filed by plaintiffs. Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE(CD of filing located with original notebooks) (ecp) (Entered: 11/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1612 Filed: 11/20/2008, Entered: 11/20/2008 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Affidavit in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment Federal Defendants' Cross Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment(1556 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE). Filed by Spokane Tribe of Indians.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Funke, Howard) (Entered: 11/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1611 Filed: 11/20/2008, Entered: 11/20/2008 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Response in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment Federal Defendants' Cross Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment(1556 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE). Filed by Spokane Tribe of Indians.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Funke, Howard) (Entered: 11/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1610 Filed: 11/19/2008, Entered: 11/19/2008 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Adjust the Injunction Briefing Schedule Re 2008 Biological Opinion. Filed by United States Army Corps of Engineers, U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, National Marine Fisheries Service, NOAA Fisheries, D Robert Lohn.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Howell, Coby) (Entered: 11/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1609 Filed: 11/19/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order. The parties are hereby directed to submit a paper copy of any documents filed with the court to the court's technical advisor, Dr. Howard Horton, Oregon State University, Department of Fisheries and Wildlife, 104 Nash Hall, Covallis, Oregon, 97331-3803. Signed on 11/19/2008 by Judge James A. Redden. (js) (Entered: 11/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1608 Filed: 11/19/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to File Excess Pages 1593 ; Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Document Conventionally 1596 ; Granting the Spokane Tribe's Motion to File Excess Pages 1599 ; Granting the Spokane Tribe's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply 1606 . Signed on 11/19/2008 by Judge James A. Redden. (js) (Entered: 11/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1607 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: 11/19/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion for Extension of Time Memo in Support Thereof. Filed by Spokane Tribe of Indians.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Funke, Howard) (Entered: 11/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1606 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: 11/18/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to a Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response/Reply to Motion to File Excess Pages Memorandum in Support Thereof(1602 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 708 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE). Filed by Spokane Tribe of Indians.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Funke, Howard) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1605 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: 11/18/2008 Response to Concise Statement of Material Facts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Response to Concise Statement of Material Facts regarding Motion for Summary Judgment Federal Defendants' Cross Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment(1556 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 663 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE), Motion for Summary Judgment(658 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE, 1551 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE), Motion for Summary Judgment(649 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE, 1542 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE), Motion for Summary Judgment(646 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE, 1539 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE), Motion for Summary Judgment(1553 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 660 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE) [Plaintiffs' Consolidated Response to Concise Statement of Material Facts and Reply to the Responses of Federal Defendants, Defendant-Intervenors States of Idaho, Washington, and Montana, The Kootenai Tribe of Idaho and Confederated Salish and Kootenai Tribes, and Northwest RiverPartners]. Filed by Washington Wildlife Federation, NW Energy Coalition, Federation of Fly Fishers, American Rivers, Inc., Sierra Club, Trout Unlimited, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, National Wildlife Federation, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Idaho Rivers United, Idaho Steelhead and Salmon United, Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association, Salmon for All, Columbia Riverkeeper, Idaho Wildlife Federation.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (True, Todd) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1604 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: 11/18/2008 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of William J. Sedivy in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by Washington Wildlife Federation, NW Energy Coalition, Federation of Fly Fishers, American Rivers, Inc., Sierra Club, Trout Unlimited, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, National Wildlife Federation, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Idaho Rivers United, Idaho Steelhead and Salmon United, Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association, Salmon for All, Columbia Riverkeeper, Idaho Wildlife Federation. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion,,,, (701 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE, 1595 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (True, Todd) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1603 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: 11/18/2008 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of William R. Redman in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by Washington Wildlife Federation, NW Energy Coalition, Federation of Fly Fishers, American Rivers, Inc., Sierra Club, Trout Unlimited, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, National Wildlife Federation, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Idaho Rivers United, Idaho Steelhead and Salmon United, Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association, Salmon for All, Columbia Riverkeeper, Idaho Wildlife Federation. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion,,,, (701 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE, 1595 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (True, Todd) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1602 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: 11/18/2008 Motion to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion to File Excess Pages Memorandum in Support Thereof. Filed by Spokane Tribe of Indians.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Funke, Howard) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1601 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: 11/18/2008 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Michael Garrity in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by Washington Wildlife Federation, NW Energy Coalition, Federation of Fly Fishers, American Rivers, Inc., Sierra Club, Trout Unlimited, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, National Wildlife Federation, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Idaho Rivers United, Idaho Steelhead and Salmon United, Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association, Salmon for All, Columbia Riverkeeper, Idaho Wildlife Federation. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion,,,, (701 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE, 1595 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (True, Todd) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1600 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: 11/18/2008 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Jack Williams [Reply Declaration of Jack Williams in Support of NWF's Motion for Summary Judgment]. Filed by Washington Wildlife Federation, NW Energy Coalition, Federation of Fly Fishers, American Rivers, Inc., Sierra Club, Trout Unlimited, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, National Wildlife Federation, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Idaho Rivers United, Idaho Steelhead and Salmon United, Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association, Salmon for All, Columbia Riverkeeper, Idaho Wildlife Federation. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (True, Todd) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1599 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: 11/18/2008 Motion to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion to File Excess Pages. Filed by Spokane Tribe of Indians.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Funke, Howard) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1598 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: 11/18/2008 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Steven Orzack, Ph.D [Reply Declaration of Steven Orzack, Ph.D., in Support of NWF's Motion for Summary Judgment]. Filed by Washington Wildlife Federation, NW Energy Coalition, Federation of Fly Fishers, American Rivers, Inc., Sierra Club, Trout Unlimited, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, National Wildlife Federation, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Idaho Rivers United, Idaho Steelhead and Salmon United, Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association, Salmon for All, Columbia Riverkeeper, Idaho Wildlife Federation. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion,,,, (701 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE, 1595 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE).) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (True, Todd) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1597 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: 11/18/2008 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Frederick E. Olney [Reply Declaration of Frederick E. Olney in Support of NWF's Motion for Summary Judgment]. Filed by Washington Wildlife Federation, NW Energy Coalition, Federation of Fly Fishers, American Rivers, Inc., Sierra Club, Trout Unlimited, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, National Wildlife Federation, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Idaho Rivers United, Idaho Steelhead and Salmon United, Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association, Salmon for All, Columbia Riverkeeper, Idaho Wildlife Federation. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1# 2 Attachment 2)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (True, Todd) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1596 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: 11/18/2008 MOTION - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion for Leave to File Document Conventionally. Filed by Washington Wildlife Federation, NW Energy Coalition, Federation of Fly Fishers, American Rivers, Inc., Sierra Club, Trout Unlimited, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, National Wildlife Federation, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Idaho Rivers United, Idaho Steelhead and Salmon United, Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association, Salmon for All, Columbia Riverkeeper, Idaho Wildlife Federation. (Attachments: # 1 Excerpts of Administrative Record Index)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (True, Todd) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1595 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: 11/18/2008 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Response in Opposition [NWF's Reply Memorandum in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment and in Opposition to Defendants' Cross-Motions] to Motion for Summary Judgment(1553 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE), Cross Motion for Summary Judgment(1539 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE), Motion for Summary Judgment(1498 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE), Joint Motion for Summary Judgment (and Cross Motion)Joint Motion for Summary Judgment (and Cross Motion)(1542 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE), Joint Motion for Summary Judgment (and Cross Motion)(1551 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE), Motion for Summary Judgment Federal Defendants' Cross Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment(1556 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE). Filed by Washington Wildlife Federation, NW Energy Coalition, Federation of Fly Fishers, American Rivers, Inc., Sierra Club, Trout Unlimited, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, National Wildlife Federation, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Idaho Rivers United, Idaho Steelhead and Salmon United, Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association, Salmon for All, Columbia Riverkeeper, Idaho Wildlife Federation.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (True, Todd) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1594 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: 11/18/2008 Response to Concise Statement of Material Facts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Response to Concise Statement of Material Facts regarding Motion for Summary Judgment Federal Defendants' Cross Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment(1556 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 663 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE). Filed by State of Oregon.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Leith, David) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1593 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: 11/18/2008 Motion to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion to File Excess Pages [Motion for Leave to File Overlength Brief]. Filed by Washington Wildlife Federation, NW Energy Coalition, Federation of Fly Fishers, American Rivers, Inc., Sierra Club, Trout Unlimited, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, National Wildlife Federation, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Idaho Rivers United, Idaho Steelhead and Salmon United, Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association, Salmon for All, Columbia Riverkeeper, Idaho Wildlife Federation.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (True, Todd) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1592 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: 11/18/2008 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Second Declaration of Edward Bowles in Support of Oregon's Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by State of Oregon. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment(625 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Leith, David) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1591 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: 11/18/2008 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Response (titled Response to Defense Motions for Summary Judgment and Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment) to Motion for Summary Judgment Federal Defendants' Cross Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment(1556 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE). Filed by State of Oregon.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Leith, David) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1590 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: 11/18/2008 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Second Response Memorandum. Filed by Northwest Power Planning Council.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Hirotsu, Sandra) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1589 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: 11/18/2008 reply to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Reply to Motion to Strike(1543 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE). Filed by U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, National Marine Fisheries Service.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (McNeil, Bridget) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1588 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: 11/18/2008 reply to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Reply Nez Perce Tribe's Reply Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendants' Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment --- to Motion for Summary Judgment(1507 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE), Motion for Summary Judgment(1498 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE). Filed by Nez Perce Tribe. (Attachments: # 1 Excerpts of Record)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Cummings, David) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1587 Filed: 11/12/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion 1584 to Adjust the Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule Re: 2008 Biological Opinion is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' reply in support of their motions for summary judgment and in opposition to the defendants cross-motions is due November 18, 2008. Defendants' reply in support of the cross-motions for summary judgment is due December 12, 2008. Plaintiffs' Motion 1585 to Adjust the Injuction Briefing Schedule Re: 2008 Biological Opinion is GRANTED, in part. Plaintiffs' motion for injunctive relief is due November 25, 2008. The parties shall continue to confer and attempt to agree to a schedule for filing any briefs in opposition and/or reply. If the parties are unable to agree to the remaining briefing schedule, they shall advise the court by December 22, 2008, and the court will set the remainder of the briefing schedule for the injunction motions. Signed on 11/12/2008 by Judge James A. Redden. (js) (Entered: 11/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1586 Filed: 11/7/2008, Entered: 11/7/2008 Administrative Record
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Administrative Record Errata to Reclamation's Administrative Record. Filed by U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, National Marine Fisheries Service, NOAA Fisheries, D Robert Lohn. Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Howell, Coby) (Entered: 11/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1585 Filed: 11/7/2008, Entered: 11/7/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion for Extension of Time [Plaintiffs' Motion to Adjust the Injunction Briefing Schedule Re 2008 Biological Opinion]. Filed by Washington Wildlife Federation, NW Energy Coalition, Federation of Fly Fishers, American Rivers, Inc., Sierra Club, Trout Unlimited, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, National Wildlife Federation, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Idaho Rivers United, Idaho Steelhead and Salmon United, Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association, Salmon for All, Columbia Riverkeeper, Idaho Wildlife Federation.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (True, Todd) (Entered: 11/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1584 Filed: 11/7/2008, Entered: 11/7/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to a Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response/Reply [Plaintiffs' Motion to Adjust the Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule Re 2008 Biological Opinion] to Motion for Summary Judgment(616 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE, 1498 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE). Filed by Washington Wildlife Federation, NW Energy Coalition, Federation of Fly Fishers, American Rivers, Inc., Sierra Club, Trout Unlimited, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, National Wildlife Federation, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Idaho Rivers United, Idaho Steelhead and Salmon United, Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association, Salmon for All, Columbia Riverkeeper, Idaho Wildlife Federation.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (True, Todd) (Entered: 11/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1583 Filed: 11/7/2008, Entered: 11/7/2008 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Response to Motion to Strike(1543 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE). Filed by State of Oregon.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Leith, David) (Entered: 11/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1582 Filed: 11/7/2008, Entered: 11/7/2008 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Response in Opposition to Motion to Strike(1543 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE). Filed by Washington Wildlife Federation, NW Energy Coalition, Federation of Fly Fishers, American Rivers, Inc., Sierra Club, Trout Unlimited, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, National Wildlife Federation, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Idaho Rivers United, Idaho Steelhead and Salmon United, Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association, Salmon for All, Columbia Riverkeeper, Idaho Wildlife Federation.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (True, Todd) (Entered: 11/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1581 Filed: 11/6/2008, Entered: 11/6/2008 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Response Nez Perce Tribe's Response to Motion to Strike(1543 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE). Filed by Nez Perce Tribe.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Cummings, David) (Entered: 11/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1580 Filed: 11/3/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: Granting Federal Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Overlength Brief in support of their Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' and Plaintiff-Intervenor's Motion for Summary Judgment 1569 . Ordered by Judge James A. Redden. (lg) (Entered: 11/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1579 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: 10/30/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order - The Clerk of the Court is hereby ORDERED to refund Ms. Hirotsu's $100.00 application fee. Signed on 10/24/2008 by Judge James A. Redden. (See formal order 2-pages.)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (ecp) (Entered: 10/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1578 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: 10/30/2008 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order - Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Sandra Hirotsu for Northwest Power Planning Council. Signed on 10/21/2008 by Judge James A. Redden.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (ecp) (Entered: 10/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1577 Filed: 10/28/2008, Entered: 10/28/2008 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice Nez Perce Tribe's Joinder in NWF's Objection to Motion to Expedite.Filed by Nez Perce Tribe.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Cummings, David) (Entered: 10/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1576 Filed: 10/28/2008, Entered: 10/28/2008 Joinder Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Joinder in Objection,, (682 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE) to Motion to Expedite.Filed by State of Oregon. (Related document(s): Objection,, (682 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Leith, David) (Entered: 10/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1575 Filed: 10/28/2008, Entered: 10/28/2008 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Objection(s) [NWF's Opposition to Federal Defendants' Request for an Expedited Hearing of Their Motion to Strike]. Filed by Washington Wildlife Federation, NW Energy Coalition, Federation of Fly Fishers, American Rivers, Inc., Sierra Club, Trout Unlimited, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, National Wildlife Federation, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Idaho Rivers United, Idaho Steelhead and Salmon United, Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association, Salmon for All, Columbia Riverkeeper, Idaho Wildlife Federation. (Related document(s): Motion to Strike(650 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE, 1543 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Mashuda, Stephen) (Entered: 10/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1574 Filed: 10/27/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order regarding Declaration, (680 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE, 1573 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE) filed by United States Army Corps of Engineers, NOAA Fisheries, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, D Robert Lohn, National Marine Fisheries Service for Administrative Correction of the Record. A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record. In accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(a), the Clerk is directed to make the following administrative corrections to the record and to notify all parties accordingly.This document is a duplicate of entry #1572 and STRIKEN from the record.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (ljl) (Entered: 10/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1573 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: 10/24/2008 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Robert Jones 2008 (Part 2)(STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD). Filed by United States Army Corps of Engineers, U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, National Marine Fisheries Service, NOAA Fisheries, D Robert Lohn. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment, (663 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Howell, Coby) Modified on 10/27/2008 (Lattz, L.). (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1572 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: 10/24/2008 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Robert Jones 2008 (Part 2). Filed by United States Army Corps of Engineers, U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, National Marine Fisheries Service, NOAA Fisheries, D Robert Lohn. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment, (663 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Howell, Coby) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1571 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: 10/24/2008 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Robert Jones 2008 (Part 1). Filed by United States Army Corps of Engineers, U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, National Marine Fisheries Service, NOAA Fisheries, D Robert Lohn. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment, (663 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Howell, Coby) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1570 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: 10/24/2008 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in Support. Filed by United States Army Corps of Engineers, U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, National Marine Fisheries Service, NOAA Fisheries, D Robert Lohn. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment, (663 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE), Motion to File Excess Pages, (676 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Howell, Coby) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1569 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: 10/24/2008 Motion to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion to File Excess Pages re Motion for Summary Judgment, (663 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE). Filed by United States Army Corps of Engineers, U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, National Marine Fisheries Service, NOAA Fisheries, D Robert Lohn.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Howell, Coby) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1568 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: 10/24/2008 Concise Statement of Material Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Concise Statement of Material Fact. Filed by United States Army Corps of Engineers, U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, National Marine Fisheries Service, NOAA Fisheries, D Robert Lohn. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment, (663 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Howell, Coby) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1567 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: 10/24/2008 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Rich Zabel 2008. Filed by United States Army Corps of Engineers, U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, National Marine Fisheries Service, NOAA Fisheries, D Robert Lohn. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment, (663 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Howell, Coby) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1566 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: 10/24/2008 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Christopher Toole 2008. Filed by United States Army Corps of Engineers, U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, National Marine Fisheries Service, NOAA Fisheries, D Robert Lohn. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment, (663 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Howell, Coby) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1565 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: 10/24/2008 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Rock Peters 2008. Filed by United States Army Corps of Engineers, U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, National Marine Fisheries Service, NOAA Fisheries, D Robert Lohn. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment, (663 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Howell, Coby) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1564 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: 10/24/2008 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Kim Kratz 2008. Filed by United States Army Corps of Engineers, U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, National Marine Fisheries Service, NOAA Fisheries, D Robert Lohn. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment, (663 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Howell, Coby) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1563 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: 10/24/2008 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Stephen H. Smith in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by Confederated Tribes of the Colville Reservation. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment(646 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE, 1539 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Arum, John) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1562 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: 10/24/2008 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Ritchie Graves 2008. Filed by United States Army Corps of Engineers, U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, National Marine Fisheries Service, NOAA Fisheries, D Robert Lohn. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment, (663 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Howell, Coby) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1561 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: 10/24/2008 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Joe Peone in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by Confederated Tribes of the Colville Reservation. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment(646 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE, 1539 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Arum, John) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1560 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: 10/24/2008 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Rich Hinrichsen 2008. Filed by United States Army Corps of Engineers, U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, National Marine Fisheries Service, NOAA Fisheries, D Robert Lohn. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment, (663 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Howell, Coby) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1559 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: 10/24/2008 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum in Support Federal Defendants' Cross Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by United States Army Corps of Engineers, U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, National Marine Fisheries Service, NOAA Fisheries, D Robert Lohn. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment, (663 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Howell, Coby) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1558 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: 10/24/2008 Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Amicus Brief of Colville Tribes in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by Confederated Tribes of the Colville Reservation. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment(646 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Arum, John) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1557 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: 10/24/2008 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in Support of States' Motion for Summary Judgment and in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by State of Montana, State of Washington, State of Idaho. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment(1507 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 625 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE), Motion for Summary Judgment(1553 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 660 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE), Motion for Summary Judgment,, (616 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE, 1498 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Stermitz, Mark) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1556 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: 10/24/2008 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion for Summary Judgment Federal Defendants' Cross Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by United States Army Corps of Engineers, U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, National Marine Fisheries Service, NOAA Fisheries, D Robert Lohn.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Howell, Coby) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1555 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: 10/24/2008 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum in Support of Cross Motion for Summary Judgment and in Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by Kootenai Tribe of Idaho, Confederated Salish and Kootenai Tribes. Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Weis, Julie) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1554 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: 10/24/2008 Concise Statement of Material Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint Concise Statement of Material Fact in Support of Joint Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by State of Montana, State of Washington, State of Idaho. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment(1553 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 660 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Stermitz, Mark) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1553 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: 10/24/2008 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by State of Montana, State of Washington, State of Idaho.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Stermitz, Mark) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1552 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: 10/24/2008 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Response to Plaintiffs' to Motion for Summary Judgment(1498 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE). Filed by Inland Ports and Navigation Group.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Waldron, Jay) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1551 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: 10/24/2008 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint Motion for Summary Judgment (and Cross Motion). Filed by Kootenai Tribe of Idaho, Confederated Salish and Kootenai Tribes.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Weis, Julie) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1550 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order for Administrative Correction of the Record regarding Joint Motion for Summary Judgment (and Cross Motion) (1542 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 649 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE) filed by Confederated Salish and Kootenai Tribes, Kootenai Tribe of Idaho. A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record. In accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(a), the Clerk is directed to make the following administrative corrections to the record and to notify all parties accordingly. NOTE: The PDF attached to this filing was incorrect and unrelated to this case. The filing party has indicated they will refile the event with a corrected PDF attachment. Please disregard this entry and refer to the Corrected Joint Motion for Summary Judgment. Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (eo) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1549 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: 10/24/2008 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Amicus Response to Motion for Summary Judgment(1498 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE). Filed by Northwest Power Planning Council.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Hirotsu, Sandra) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1548 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: 10/24/2008 Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Appearance of Stuart M. Levit appearing on behalf of Confederated Salish and Kootenai Tribes.Filed by on behalf of Confederated Salish and Kootenai Tribes.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Levit, Stuart) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1547 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: 10/24/2008 Response to Concise Statement of Material Facts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Response to Concise Statement of Material Facts regarding Motion for Summary Judgment(1507 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 625 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE). Filed by U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, National Marine Fisheries Service.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Eitel, Michael) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1546 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: 10/24/2008 Response to Concise Statement of Material Facts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Response to Concise Statement of Material Facts regarding Motion for Summary Judgment(616 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE, 1498 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE). Filed by U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, National Marine Fisheries Service.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Eitel, Michael) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1545 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: 10/24/2008 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in Support of Federal Defendants' Motion to Strike. Filed by U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, National Marine Fisheries Service. (Related document(s): Motion to Strike(650 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE, 1543 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Eitel, Michael) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1544 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: 10/24/2008 Concise Statement of Material Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Concise Statement of Material Fact. Filed by Kootenai Tribe of Idaho, Confederated Salish and Kootenai Tribes. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment(658 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Weis, Julie) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1543 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: 10/24/2008 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion to Strike. Filed by U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, National Marine Fisheries Service.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Eitel, Michael) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1542 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: 10/24/2008 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint Motion for Summary Judgment (and Cross Motion). Filed by Kootenai Tribe of Idaho, Confederated Salish and Kootenai Tribes.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Weis, Julie) Modified to modify PDF access on 10/24/2008. This entry has an incorrect PDF attachment, which is unrelated to this case. Please disregard this entry and refer to the corrected Joint Motion for Summary Judgment. (Oss, Eric). (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1541 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: 10/24/2008 Concise Statement of Material Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Concise Statement of Material Fact Joinder to Three States' Statement of Material Facts and Response to Plaintiffs' Statements of Material Facts. Filed by Northwest River Partners. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment(646 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE, 1539 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Ginsberg, Beth) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1540 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: 10/24/2008 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum in Support its Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Summary Judgment Motion. Filed by Northwest River Partners. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment(646 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE, 1539 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Ginsberg, Beth) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1539 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: 10/24/2008 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Cross Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by Northwest River Partners.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Ginsberg, Beth) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1538 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: 10/24/2008 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Gary James in Support of AMICI Opposition to Motions for Summary Judgment. Filed by Confederated Tribes of the Warm Springs Reservation of Oregon. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Brochure)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Ogan, John) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1537 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: 10/24/2008 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of William J. Bosch in Support of AMICI Opposition to Motions for Summary Judgment. Filed by Confederated Tribes of the Warm Springs Reservation of Oregon. Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Ogan, John) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1536 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: 10/24/2008 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Robert Rose in Support of Memorandum of AMICI Opposition to Motions for Summary Judgment. Filed by Confederated Tribes of the Warm Springs Reservation of Oregon. Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Ogan, John) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1535 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: 10/24/2008 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Amici in Opposition to Motions for Summary Judgment. Filed by Confederated Tribes of the Warm Springs Reservation of Oregon. Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Ogan, John) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1534 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: 10/21/2008 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Filing Supplement to NOAA's Administrative Record.Filed by National Marine Fisheries Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (McNeil, Bridget) (Entered: 10/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1533 Filed: 10/17/2008, Entered: 10/17/2008 Motion for Leave
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion for Leave to File Amended Memorandum and Amended Declaration of Edward Bowles. Filed by State of Oregon.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Leith, David) (Entered: 10/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1532 Filed: 10/17/2008, Entered: 10/17/2008 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Response (Letter to Court regarding visit to habitat mitigation projects). Filed by State of Oregon.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Leith, David) (Entered: 10/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1531 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: 10/16/2008 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Change of Attorney Information.Filed by State of Montana.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Stermitz, Mark) (Entered: 10/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1530 Filed: 10/10/2008, Entered: 10/14/2008 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jason T. Morgan for Northwest River Partners. Application Fee in amount of $100 collected. Receipt No. 23422 issued. Signed on 10/10/08 by Judge James A. Redden.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (ljl) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1529 Filed: 10/10/2008, Entered: 10/10/2008 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Answer to Amended Complaint (State of Oregon's Supplemental Complaint-In-Intervention for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief). Filed by Columbia-Snake River Irrigators Association.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Buchal, James) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1528 Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: 10/8/2008 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Answer to Complaint (State of Oregon's Supplemental Complaint-In-Intervention for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief). Filed by Kootenai Tribe of Idaho.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Weis, Julie) (Entered: 10/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1527 Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: 10/8/2008 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Answer to Complaint (Fifth Supplemental Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief). Filed by Kootenai Tribe of Idaho.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Weis, Julie) (Entered: 10/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1526 Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: 10/8/2008 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Change of Address.Filed by Kootenai Tribe of Idaho.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Weis, Julie) (Entered: 10/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1525 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: 10/7/2008 USCA Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order from USCA for the 9th Circuit re Notice of Appeal CA 06-35019 (379 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE) and CA 06-35011 (1212 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE): The National Wildlife Federation's motion to transfer consideration of petition for attorneys' fees and costs to the United States District Court For The District Of Oregon is granted. Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (tomg) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1524 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                The document, Answer(633 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE), Answer to Complaint(1523 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE), was conventionally filed in our court after the mandatory electronic filing deadline of September 1, 2006. Local Rule 100.1 clearly requires the electronic filing of all pleadings, documents, and other papers in all pending civil and criminal cases. The document(s) referenced above should not be re-filed electronically, but we ask that you conform to the requirements of LR 100.1 in future submissions to the court. Please refer to LR 100.4 for documents which must be filed conventionally. To learn more about this requirement and the CM/ECF system, visit the court's Internet website at: ord.uscourts.gov. There you will find links to rules and resources designed to assist you and your staff in quickly learning how to electronically file. If you have any questions or concerns regarding this matter, please contact any member of the Clerk's Office staff. Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (ljl) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1523 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: 10/6/2008 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Answer by Intervenor-Defendant Clarkston Golf & Country Club to Fifth Supplemental Complaint for Declaratiory and Injunctive Relief. Filed by Clarkston Golf & Country Club.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (ljl) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1522 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: 10/6/2008 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Answer to Amended Complaint Northwest RiverPartners Joinder To Inland Port And Navigation Groups Answer To State Of Oregons Supplemental Complaint Intervention For Declaratory And Injunctive Relief. Filed by Northwest River Partners.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Ginsberg, Beth) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1505 Filed: 9/19/2008, Entered: 9/19/2008 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by Nez Perce Tribe. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment,, (616 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE, 1498 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Cummings, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1521 Filed: 10/3/2008, Entered: 10/3/2008 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Answer to Amended Complaint Inland Port & Navigation Group's Answer to State of Oregon's Supplemental Complaint Intervention for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief. Filed by Inland Ports and Navigation Group.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Waldron, Jay) (Entered: 10/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1504 Filed: 9/19/2008, Entered: 9/19/2008 Concise Statement of Material Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Concise Statement of Material Fact in Support of NWF's Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by Washington Wildlife Federation, NW Energy Coalition, Federation of Fly Fishers, American Rivers, Inc., Sierra Club, Trout Unlimited, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, National Wildlife Federation, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Idaho Rivers United, Idaho Steelhead and Salmon United, Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association, Salmon for All, Columbia Riverkeeper, Idaho Wildlife Federation. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment,, (616 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE, 1498 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (True, Todd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1520 Filed: 10/2/2008, Entered: 10/2/2008 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Answer to Amended Complaint by Northwest RiverPartners Answer To Fifth Amended Complaint For Declaratory And Injunctive Relief. Filed by Northwest River Partners.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Ginsberg, Beth) (Entered: 10/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1503 Filed: 9/19/2008, Entered: 9/19/2008 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Jack Williams in Support of NWF's Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by Washington Wildlife Federation, NW Energy Coalition, Federation of Fly Fishers, American Rivers, Inc., Sierra Club, Trout Unlimited, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, National Wildlife Federation, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Idaho Rivers United, Idaho Steelhead and Salmon United, Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association, Salmon for All, Columbia Riverkeeper, Idaho Wildlife Federation. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment,, (616 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (True, Todd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1519 Filed: 10/2/2008, Entered: 10/2/2008 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Answer to Amended Complaint IPNG's Answer to Plaintiffs' Fifth Supplemental Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief. Filed by Inland Ports and Navigation Group.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Waldron, Jay) (Entered: 10/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1502 Filed: 9/19/2008, Entered: 9/19/2008 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Steven Orzack, Ph.D. in Support of NWF's Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by Washington Wildlife Federation, NW Energy Coalition, Federation of Fly Fishers, American Rivers, Inc., Sierra Club, Trout Unlimited, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, National Wildlife Federation, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Idaho Rivers United, Idaho Steelhead and Salmon United, Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association, Salmon for All, Columbia Riverkeeper, Idaho Wildlife Federation. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment,, (616 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (True, Todd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1518 Filed: 10/2/2008, Entered: 10/2/2008 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Answer by Intervenor to Fifth Supplemental Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief. Filed by Clarkston Golf & Country Club.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Norton, Rodney) (Entered: 10/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1501 Filed: 9/19/2008, Entered: 9/19/2008 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Frederick E. Olney in Support of NWF's Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by Washington Wildlife Federation, NW Energy Coalition, Federation of Fly Fishers, American Rivers, Inc., Sierra Club, Trout Unlimited, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, National Wildlife Federation, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Idaho Rivers United, Idaho Steelhead and Salmon United, Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association, Salmon for All, Columbia Riverkeeper, Idaho Wildlife Federation. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment,, (616 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A: Document List# (2) Exhibit A-2# (3) Exhibit A-3# (4) Exhibit A-4# (5) Exhibit A-5# (6) Exhibit A-6# (7) Exhibit A-9# (8) Exhibit A-10# (9) Exhibit A-15)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (True, Todd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1517 Filed: 10/2/2008, Entered: 10/2/2008 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Answer to Amended Complaint by Intervenor-Defendant State of Washington to Fifth Supplemental Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief. Filed by State of Washington.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Grossmann, Michael) (Entered: 10/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1500 Filed: 9/19/2008, Entered: 9/19/2008 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Patty Glick in Support of NWF's Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by Washington Wildlife Federation, NW Energy Coalition, Federation of Fly Fishers, American Rivers, Inc., Sierra Club, Trout Unlimited, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, National Wildlife Federation, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Idaho Rivers United, Idaho Steelhead and Salmon United, Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association, Salmon for All, Columbia Riverkeeper, Idaho Wildlife Federation. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment,, (616 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (True, Todd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1516 Filed: 9/30/2008, Entered: 9/30/2008 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Answer to Amended Complaint [Fifth Supplemental]. Filed by Columbia-Snake River Irrigators Association.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Buchal, James) (Entered: 09/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1499 Filed: 9/19/2008, Entered: 9/19/2008 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in Support of NWF's Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by Washington Wildlife Federation, NW Energy Coalition, Federation of Fly Fishers, American Rivers, Inc., Sierra Club, Trout Unlimited, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, National Wildlife Federation, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Idaho Rivers United, Idaho Steelhead and Salmon United, Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association, Salmon for All, Columbia Riverkeeper, Idaho Wildlife Federation. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment,, (616 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (True, Todd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1515 Filed: 9/29/2008, Entered: 9/29/2008 Order on Motion to InterveneCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: Granting Motion of State of Washington to Intervene as a Defendant(1513) in case 3:01-cv-00640-RE; Granting Motion to Intervene (630) in case 3:05-cv-00023-RE. Signed on 9/29/08 by Judge James A. Redden. Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (ljl) (Entered: 09/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1498 Filed: 9/19/2008, Entered: 9/19/2008 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion for Summary Judgment. Oral Argument requested. Filed by Washington Wildlife Federation, NW Energy Coalition, Federation of Fly Fishers, American Rivers, Inc., Sierra Club, Trout Unlimited, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, National Wildlife Federation, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Idaho Rivers United, Idaho Steelhead and Salmon United, Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association, Salmon for All, Columbia Riverkeeper, Idaho Wildlife Federation.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (True, Todd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1514 Filed: 9/26/2008, Entered: 9/26/2008 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in Support of Unopposed Motion for Leave to Intervene as Defendant. Related to 1513 . Filed by State of Washington. (Related document(s): Motion to intervene(630 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).) (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting State of Washington's Motion to Intervene as a Defendant)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Grossmann, Michael) Modified on 9/29/2008 (Lattz, L.). (Entered: 09/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1497 Filed: 9/19/2008, Entered: 9/19/2008 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in Support of NWF's Motion for Relief From Rule 56(a)(1). Filed by Washington Wildlife Federation, NW Energy Coalition, Federation of Fly Fishers, American Rivers, Inc., Sierra Club, Trout Unlimited, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, National Wildlife Federation, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Idaho Rivers United, Idaho Steelhead and Salmon United, Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association, Salmon for All, Columbia Riverkeeper, Idaho Wildlife Federation. (Related document(s): Motion,, (614 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (True, Todd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1513 Filed: 9/26/2008, Entered: 9/26/2008 Motion to Intervene
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed Motion to Intervene as Defendant. Filed by State of Washington.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Grossmann, Michael) (Entered: 09/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1496 Filed: 9/19/2008, Entered: 9/19/2008 Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion for Relief From Rule 56(a)(1). Filed by Washington Wildlife Federation, NW Energy Coalition, Federation of Fly Fishers, American Rivers, Inc., Sierra Club, Trout Unlimited, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, National Wildlife Federation, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Idaho Rivers United, Idaho Steelhead and Salmon United, Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association, Salmon for All, Columbia Riverkeeper, Idaho Wildlife Federation.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (True, Todd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1512 Filed: 9/23/2008, Entered: 9/23/2008 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Filing Administrative Records.Filed by U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (McNeil, Bridget) (Entered: 09/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1495 Filed: 9/17/2008, Entered: 9/17/2008 SchedulingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Scheduling Order by James A. Redden. Oral Argument on summary judgment motions is set for 1/16/2009 at 09:30AM before Judge James A. Redden. Ordered by Judge James A. Redden. (lg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1511 Filed: 9/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Relief From Time Limits of Rule 56(a)(1) 1496 . Ordered by Judge James A. Redden. (lg) (Entered: 09/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1494 Filed: 9/17/2008, Entered: 9/17/2008 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Answer to Amended Complaint. Filed by State of Idaho.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Smith, Clay)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1510 Filed: 9/19/2008, Entered: 9/19/2008 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Edward Bowles in Support of the State of Oregon's Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by State of Oregon. (Related document(s): Motion for Summary Judgment(625 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Leith, David) (Entered: 09/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1493 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: 9/15/2008 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Fifth Status Report (2008 Spill Implementation) by U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, National Marine Fisheries Service. Filed by U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, National Marine Fisheries Service. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B (Part 1 of 2)# (3) Exhibit B (Part 2 of 2))Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (McNeil, Bridget)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1509 Filed: 9/19/2008, Entered: 9/19/2008 Concise Statement of Material Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Concise Statement of Material Fact. Filed by State of Oregon. (Related document(s): 1507 Motion for Summary Judgment(625 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Leith, David) Modified on 9/22/2008 (Lattz, L.). (Entered: 09/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1492 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: 9/12/2008 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Fifth Amended Complaint [Fifth Supplemental Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief].Filed by Washington Wildlife Federation, NW Energy Coalition, Federation of Fly Fishers, American Rivers, Inc., Sierra Club, Trout Unlimited, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, National Wildlife Federation, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Idaho Rivers United, Idaho Steelhead and Salmon United, Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association, Salmon for All, Columbia Riverkeeper, Idaho Wildlife Federation against U.S. Army Corps Of Engineers, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, National Marine Fisheries Service. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (True, Todd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1508 Filed: 9/19/2008, Entered: 9/19/2008 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by State of Oregon. (Related document(s): 1507 Motion for Summary Judgment(625 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Leith, David) Modified on 9/22/2008 (Lattz, L.). (Entered: 09/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1491 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: 9/12/2008 Order on motion For Leave to File Amended ComplainCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Fifth Supplemental Complaint [1481]. See attached 2-page Order. Signed on 9/12/2008 by Judge James A. Redden. (js)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1507 Filed: 9/19/2008, Entered: 9/19/2008 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by State of Oregon.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Leith, David) (Entered: 09/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1490 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: 9/12/2008 Order on motion to file excess pagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: I hereby ADOPT the parties' Joint Revised Schedule Proposal for Review of the 2008 FCRPS Biological Opinion [1485]. GRANTING the parties' Joint Motion Regarding Length of Summary Judgment Briefs [1483]. Signed on 9/12/2008 by Judge James A. Redden. (See formal order, 2-pages)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (ecp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1506 Filed: 9/19/2008, Entered: 9/19/2008 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Emmit E. Taylor, Jr.. Filed by Nez Perce Tribe. (Related document(s): Memorandum in Support of Motion and 1498 , (1505 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 623 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).) (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Part 2 of E. Taylor Declaration)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Cummings, David) Modified on 9/22/2008 (Lattz, L.). (Entered: 09/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1489 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: 9/12/2008 reply to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Reply to Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint/Petition [Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Fifth Supplemental Complaint] Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint/Petition [Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Fifth Supplemental Complaint] Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint/Petition [Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Fifth Supplemental Complaint](1481 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE). Filed by Washington Wildlife Federation, NW Energy Coalition, Federation of Fly Fishers, American Rivers, Inc., Sierra Club, Trout Unlimited, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, National Wildlife Federation, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Idaho Rivers United, Idaho Steelhead and Salmon United, Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association, Salmon for All, Columbia Riverkeeper, Idaho Wildlife Federation.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (True, Todd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1488 Filed: 9/10/2008, Entered: 9/10/2008 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Response to Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint/Petition [Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Fifth Supplemental Complaint] Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint/Petition [Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Fifth Supplemental Complaint] Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint/Petition [Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Fifth Supplemental Complaint](1481 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE). Filed by all defendants.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Howell, Coby)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1487 Filed: 9/10/2008, Entered: 9/10/2008 Mandate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MANDATE of USCA for the 9th Circuit re 06-35011 Notice of Appeal (1212 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE; 379 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE) re 06-35019 Notice of Appeal (1214 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE; 381 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE). The judgment of this Court, entered 04/09/07 and amended 04/24/08, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. Cost awarded to Appellees in the amount of $608.80. Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (pvh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1486 Filed: 9/10/2008, Entered: 9/10/2008 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Answer to Complaint. Filed by Columbia-Snake River Irrigators Association.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Buchal, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1485 Filed: 9/10/2008, Entered: 9/10/2008, Terminated: 9/12/2008 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint Stipulation [Joint Revised Schedule Proposal for Review of the 2008 FCRPS Biological Opinion] by Washington Wildlife Federation, NW Energy Coalition, Federation of Fly Fishers, American Rivers, Inc., Sierra Club, Trout Unlimited, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, National Wildlife Federation, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Idaho Rivers United, Idaho Steelhead and Salmon United, Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association, Salmon for All, Columbia Riverkeeper, Idaho Wildlife Federation. Filed by Washington Wildlife Federation, NW Energy Coalition, Federation of Fly Fishers, American Rivers, Inc., Sierra Club, Trout Unlimited, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, National Wildlife Federation, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Idaho Rivers United, Idaho Steelhead and Salmon United, Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association, Salmon for All, Columbia Riverkeeper, Idaho Wildlife Federation. Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (True, Todd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1484 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: 9/9/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order.The Clerk of the Court is ORDERED to refund attorney, Mr. Weiner's,$100.00 pro hac vice application fee. (see order). Signed on 9/8/08 by Judge James A. Redden.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (ljl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1483 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: 9/5/2008, Terminated: 9/12/2008 Motion to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint Motion to File Excess Pages [Joint Motion Regarding Length of Summary Judgment Briefs]. Filed by Washington Wildlife Federation, NW Energy Coalition, Federation of Fly Fishers, American Rivers, Inc., Sierra Club, Trout Unlimited, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, National Wildlife Federation, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Idaho Rivers United, Idaho Steelhead and Salmon United, Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association, Salmon for All, Columbia Riverkeeper, Idaho Wildlife Federation.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (True, Todd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1482 Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: 9/3/2008 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Fifth Supplemental Complaint. Filed by Washington Wildlife Federation, NW Energy Coalition, Federation of Fly Fishers, American Rivers, Inc., Sierra Club, Trout Unlimited, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, National Wildlife Federation, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Idaho Rivers United, Idaho Steelhead and Salmon United, Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association, Salmon for All, Columbia Riverkeeper, Idaho Wildlife Federation. (Related document(s): Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint/Petition,, (603 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE, 1481 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE).) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A: [Proposed] Fifth Supplemental Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (True, Todd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1481 Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: 9/3/2008, Terminated: 9/12/2008 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint/Petiti
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint/Petition [Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Fifth Supplemental Complaint]. Filed by Washington Wildlife Federation, NW Energy Coalition, Federation of Fly Fishers, American Rivers, Inc., Sierra Club, Trout Unlimited, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, National Wildlife Federation, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Idaho Rivers United, Idaho Steelhead and Salmon United, Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association, Salmon for All, Columbia Riverkeeper, Idaho Wildlife Federation.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (True, Todd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1480 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: 9/2/2008 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Filing National Marine Fisheries Service Administrative Record.Filed by all defendants. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment 1)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Howell, Coby)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1479 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008 Order on Application for special admission pro hacCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jeremiah D. Weiner for State of Montana. FEE WAIVED pursuant to LR 83.4. Signed on 8/22/2008 by Judge James A. Redden. Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (ecp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1478 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTES of Proceedings: Status Conference held regarding Plaintiffs' request for a scientific panel, [1455]. The following made comments: Todd True for Plaintiffs, Coby Howell for Federal Defendants, David Leith for Intervenor-Plaintiff State of Oregon, David Cummings for Nez Perce Tribe, Jay Waldron for Inland Ports, Michael Grossman for State of Washington, Beth Ginsberg for Northwest River Partners, Howard Funke for Spokane Tribe, John Arum for Colville Tribes, Timothy Weaver for Yakama Nation and speaking on behalf of the Warm Springs and Umatilla Tribes, Mark Stermitz for State of Montana, Julie Weis for Kootenai Tribes. Court Reporter: Dennis Grube. James A. Redden presiding. (lg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1477 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: 8/20/2008 Order on Motion to InterveneCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: For the reasons in the 3 page Opinion and Order, and subject to the limitations set forth in this Opinion and Order, the Court Grants Irrigators Second Motion to Intervene (1466) in case 3:01-cv-00640-RE; Granting Motion to Intervene (591) in case 3:05-cv-00023-RE. Signed on 8/20/08 by Judge James A. Redden. Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (ljl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1476 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: 8/20/2008 Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Appearance of Geoffrey M. Whiting appearing on behalf of Nez Perce Tribe.Filed by on behalf of Nez Perce Tribe.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Whiting, Geoffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1475 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: 8/20/2008 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Answer to Amended Complaint (State of Oregon's Supplemental Complaint-In-Intervention for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief). Filed by State of Idaho.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Smith, Clay)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1474 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: 8/18/2008 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Response to Second Motion to Intervene [Renewed](1466 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE). Filed by State of Oregon.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Leith, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1473 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: 8/18/2008 reply to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Reply Memorandum in Support to Second Motion to Intervene [Renewed](1466 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE). Filed by Columbia-Snake River Irrigators Association. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Buchal, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1472 Filed: 8/15/2008, Entered: 8/15/2008 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Status Report Fourth 2008 Spill Status Report by all defendants. Filed by all defendants. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B1# (3) Exhibit B2)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Howell, Coby)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1471 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: 8/12/2008 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Response in Opposition to Second Motion to Intervene [Renewed](1466 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE). Filed by Washington Wildlife Federation, NW Energy Coalition, Federation of Fly Fishers, American Rivers, Inc., Sierra Club, Trout Unlimited, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, National Wildlife Federation, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Idaho Rivers United, Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association, Columbia Riverkeeper. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Mashuda, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1470 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: 8/11/2008 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Amended Complaint (titled as Supplemental Complaint-In-Intervention for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief).Filed by State of Oregon against all defendants.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Leith, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1469 Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: 8/7/2008 Order on Motion for LeaveCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: The State of Oregon's Unopposed Motion [1456] for Leave to File Supplemental Complaint-in-Intervention is GRANTED; The Unopposed Motion to Intervene as Defendant [1460] filed by Confederated Salish and Kootenai Tribes is GRANTED. Signed on 8/7/2008 by Judge James A. Redden. (js)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1468 Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: 8/7/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter to Counsel of Record regarding issues to be addressed at the in-court status conference of 8/21/08. (See letter for details) Signed on August 7, 2008 by Judge James A. Redden. Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (eo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1467 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: 8/4/2008 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum in Support of Second Renewed Motion to Intervene. Filed by Columbia-Snake River Irrigators Association. (Related document(s): Motion to intervene(1466 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 591 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Buchal, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1466 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: 8/4/2008, Terminated: 8/20/2008 Motion to Intervene
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Second Motion to Intervene [Renewed]. Filed by Columbia-Snake River Irrigators Association. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Buchal, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1465 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: 7/31/2008 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Appearance.Filed by Confederated Tribes of the Warm Springs Reservation of Oregon.Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Ogan, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1464 Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: 7/30/2008 SchedulingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Scheduling Order by James A. Redden. An in-court Status Conference is set for August 21, 2008, at 01:30PM, to discuss the issues raised by Plaintiffs' Request for a Status Conference (doc. 1455), and Federal Defendants' Response (doc. 1457) to that request. The court will contact counsel of record by letter regarding the issues to be addressed at the status conference. Ordered by Judge James A. Redden. (js)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1463 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: 7/29/2008 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Reply in Support of Request for Status Conference. Filed by State of Oregon. (Related document(s): Request, (582 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Leith, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1462 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Reply [NWF'S Reply to Federal Defendants' Response to Request for a Status Conference]. Filed by Washington Wildlife Federation, NW Energy Coalition, Federation of Fly Fishers, American Rivers, Inc., Sierra Club, Trout Unlimited, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, National Wildlife Federation, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Idaho Rivers United, Northwest Sport Fishing Industry Association, Columbia Riverkeeper. (Related document(s): Request, (1455 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 582 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Mashuda, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1461 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in Support of Motion for Leave to Intervene as Defendant. Filed by Confederated Salish and Kootenai Tribes. (Related document(s): Motion to intervene(1460 in 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 586 in 3:05-cv-00023-RE).)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Hovenkotter, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1460 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008, Terminated: 8/7/2008 Motion to Intervene
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion to Intervene. Filed by Confederated Salish and Kootenai Tribes. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment)Associated Cases: 3:01-cv-00640-RE, 3:05-cv-00023-RE (Hovenkotter, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1459 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order. The court adopts the Joint Stipulation (doc. 1454) of Plaintiffs and Federal Defendants Regarding Schedule for Review of the 2008 FCRPS Biological Opinion. Signed on 7/28/2008 by Judge James A. Redden. (js)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1458 Filed: 7/25/2008, Entered: 7/25/2008 Response to Motion