Hillecke v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 3:01-cv-01051-KI

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Carolyne R Hillecke, Petitioner
v.
United States of America United States of America, Respondent
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jian H. Grant +1 202 307 6422 +1 202 307 0054 jian.h.grant@usdoj.gov
Office Portland
Filed 7/9/2001
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 875 - Taxes: Customer Challenge
Cause Section 26 U.S.C. § 7609 IRS
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Baker
Terminated 10/25/2001
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags FRC, TERMINATED
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/25/2001, Entered: 10/25/2001 Judgment*Court Filing
Judgment: Based on record, IT IS ORDERED and ADJUDGED that this action is dismissed with prejudice. Signed 10/25/01 by Judge Garr M. King. (pvh, )
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/25/2001, Entered: 10/25/2001 OpinionCourt Filing
    Opinion and Order: The United States' motion to dismiss (#7) is granted. The action is dismissed with prejudice. Signed 10/25/01 by Judge Garr M. King. (Related document(s)[1], [7]) (pvh, )
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/1/2001, Entered: 10/4/2001 Memorandum in Opposition
      Memorandum in Opposition of Motion to Dismiss. Filed by pro se Carolyne R Hillecke. (Related motion(s)[7]) (pvh, )
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/19/2001, Entered: 9/20/2001 Certificate Of Service.
        Certificate of Service. Filed by USA. (Related document(s)[6], [7], [8]) (pvh, )
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/19/2001, Entered: 9/20/2001 Memorandum in Support
          Memorandum in Support of its Motion to Dismiss. Filed by USA. (Related document(s)[7]) (pvh, )
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/19/2001, Entered: 9/20/2001 Motion to Dismiss
            Motion to Dismiss. Filed by USA. (pvh, )
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/19/2001, Entered: 9/20/2001 Attorney Appearance
              Attorney Appearance. Filed by USA. (pvh, )
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/23/2001, Entered: 8/24/2001 Return of Service Executed as to USA
                Return of Service (Federal Defendant) Executed upon Internal Revenue Agent, Phil Marquardt on 07/23/01, by certified mail. (No certified mail receipt attached). Filed by pro se Carolyne R Hillecke. (pvh, )
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/23/2001, Entered: 8/24/2001 Return of Service Executed as to USA
                  Return of Service (Federal Defendant) Executed upon United States Attorney, Michael Mosman on 07/23/01 by certified mail. (No certified mail receipt attached). Filed by pro se Carolyne R Hillecke. (pvh, )
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/23/2001, Entered: 8/24/2001 Return of Service Executed
                    Return of Service Executed upon Attorney Genereal, John Ashcroft on 07/23/01 by certified mail. (No certified mail receipt attached). Filed by pro se Carolyne R Hillecke. (pvh, )
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/9/2001, Entered: 7/10/2001 Discovery Order
                      Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order and Notice of Case Assignment: Case assigned to the Honorable Garr M. King. Discovery to be completed by 11/6/2001. Joint ADR Report due by 12/6/2001. Pretrial Order due by 12/6/2001. (pvh, )
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/9/2001, Entered: 7/10/2001 Petition
                        Petition against USA. Proceeding to Quash Summons (26 USC Section 7609) Demand for Relief. Filing Fee collected. Receipt #: 438486 issued. Filed by Carolyne R Hillecke (pvh, )
                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 120 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?