Gordillo et al v. Sharabarin et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 3:02-cv-00054-BR

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Abelardo Hernandez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth Howard Ehlert +1 206 522 7378 ehlerte@yahoo.com
Space Ilene Virginia O'Malley +1 503 981 0336 +1 503 981 0373 ivo97205@yahoo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Legal Aid Services of Oregon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Mortland +1 503 373 7816 +1 503 373 7636 michael.mortland@lasoregon.org
No Logo Florida Gordillo, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth Howard Ehlert +1 206 522 7378 ehlerte@yahoo.com
Space Ilene Virginia O'Malley +1 503 981 0336 +1 503 981 0373 ivo97205@yahoo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Herbert A. Terrell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Spencer M. Neal +1 503 473 8325 +1 503 295 0676 spencerneal@justice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Legal Aid Services of Oregon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Mortland +1 503 373 7816 +1 503 373 7636 michael.mortland@lasoregon.org
No Logo Jaime Gordillo, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth Howard Ehlert +1 206 522 7378 ehlerte@yahoo.com
Space Ilene Virginia O'Malley +1 503 981 0336 +1 503 981 0373 ivo97205@yahoo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Herbert A. Terrell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Spencer M. Neal +1 503 473 8325 +1 503 295 0676 spencerneal@justice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Legal Aid Services of Oregon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Mortland +1 503 373 7816 +1 503 373 7636 michael.mortland@lasoregon.org
No Logo Taide Cortez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth Howard Ehlert +1 206 522 7378 ehlerte@yahoo.com
Space Ilene Virginia O'Malley +1 503 981 0336 +1 503 981 0373 ivo97205@yahoo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Herbert A. Terrell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Spencer M. Neal +1 503 473 8325 +1 503 295 0676 spencerneal@justice.com
v.
No Logo Anastas Sharabarin, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alan L. Gallagher +1 503 263 8420 +1 503 263 6298 gallagheralan@cs.com
No Logo Marfa Sharabarin, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alan L. Gallagher +1 503 263 8420 +1 503 263 6298 gallagheralan@cs.com
Office Portland
Filed 1/11/2002
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 790 - Labor: Other
Cause Section 29 U.S.C. § 1801 Farmworker Rights
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Marion
Terminated 11/20/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags FRC, TERMINATED
  Entries (44) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/20/2002, Entered: 11/26/2002 Judgment*Court Filing
Stipulated Judgment: The parties have resolved this action in favor of plaintiffs for a total amount of $8,000. Signed 11/20/02 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (ljl, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/20/2002, Entered: 11/22/2002 Certificate Of Service.
    Certificate of Service. Filed by Jaime Gordillo. (Related document(s)[42]) (ljl, )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/20/2002, Entered: 11/22/2002 ~Motion for Judgment
      Motion for Judgment. Filed by Jaime Gordillo. (ljl, )
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 41 Filed: 9/11/2002, Entered: 9/11/2002 SchedulingCourt Filing
        CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Proceeding (Status Conference) -- ORDER: Defendant's Motion (#34) to Dismiss is DENIED. Plaintiffs' Motion (#31) to Compel is GRANTED and Defendants shall provide supplemental written responses to Plaintiffs' Requests for Production as indicated by 9/25/2002. Deadline for completion of all Discovery and for filing amended pleadings/joining parties is extended to 10/31/2002. Pretrial Order due by 4/1/2003. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report due by 11/21/2002. Dispositive Motions due by 11/21/2002. Trial Documents due by Noon, 4/9/2003. Pretrial Conference and Jury Trial remain as previously set. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. Counsel Present for Plaintiff: Michael Mortland; Ilene O'Malley. Counsel Present for Defendant: Alan Gallagher. Court Reporter: Amanda LeGore. (sm, )
          LREF
          Blank 40 Filed: 9/5/2002, Entered: 9/9/2002 Attorney Substitution
          Notice of Appearance of Ilene O'Malley for plaintiffs. (ljl, ) Modified on 9/9/2002 (ljl, ).
            LREF
            Blank 39 Filed: 9/4/2002, Entered: 9/4/2002 SchedulingCourt Filing
            CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order -- Status Conference set for 9/11/2002 at 04:30PM. Counsel to appear in person. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (sm, )
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/15/2002, Entered: 8/19/2002 Response
              Response to Defendants' Report on Discovery. Filed by Jaime Gordillo. (Related document(s)[36]) (ljl, )
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/15/2002, Entered: 8/19/2002 Memorandum in Opposition
                Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss. Filed by Jaime Gordillo. (Related motion(s)[34]) (ljl, )
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/12/2002, Entered: 8/14/2002 Report
                  Report on discovery. Filed by all defendants. (ljl, )
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/12/2002, Entered: 8/14/2002 Affidavit
                    Affidavit of Defendants and agents in Support of Motion to Dismiss. Filed by all defendants. (Related document(s)[34]) (ljl, )
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/12/2002, Entered: 8/14/2002 Motion to Dismiss
                      Motion to Dismiss. Filed by all defendants. (ljl, )
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/26/2002, Entered: 7/31/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                        Certificate of Service. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related document(s)[31], [32]) (sm, )
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/26/2002, Entered: 7/31/2002 Memorandum in Support
                          Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related document(s)[31]) (sm, )
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/26/2002, Entered: 7/31/2002 Motion to Compel
                            Motion to Compel Production of Documents. Filed by all plaintiffs. (sm, )
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank 30 Filed: 7/26/2002, Entered: 7/26/2002 SchedulingCourt Filing
                              CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order -- Defendants' Motion for Substitution of Counsel (#29) is GRANTED. Alan Gallagher is substituted in place of John Michael Unfred as attorney of record for Defendants. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (sm, )
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/24/2002, Entered: 7/25/2002 Motion to Withdraw/Substitute Attorney
                                Motion to Withdraw or Substitute an Attorney Substituting Alan L. Gallagher for John Michael Unfred. Filed by Anastas Sharabarin, Marfa Sharabarin. (ljl, )
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/17/2002, Entered: 7/22/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                  Certification of Service by Fax of Plaintiffs' Request for Admissions. Filed by all plaintiffs. (ljl, )
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/11/2002, Entered: 7/11/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                    Certificate of Service. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related document(s)[26]) (ljl, )
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/11/2002, Entered: 7/11/2002 Notice
                                      Notice of Filing of Signature Page of Joint Statement Regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Order to Compel Porduction of Doucments. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related document(s)[24]) (ljl, )
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/1/2002, Entered: 7/2/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                        Certificate of Service. Filed by Taide Cortez, Florida Gordillo, Jaime Gordillo, Abelardo Hernandez. (Related document(s)[24]) (cib, )
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/24/2002, Entered: 6/26/2002 Report
                                          Joint Statement Regarding Plaintiffs' Motion for Order to Compel Produciton of Documents. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related document(s)[12]) (ljl, )
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/18/2002, Entered: 6/20/2002 Attorney Appearance
                                            Notice of Appearance by Attorney Spencer M. Neal for plaintiffs. Filed by Taide Cortez, Florida Gordillo, Jaime Gordillo, Abelardo Hernandez. (ljl, )
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/10/2002, Entered: 6/10/2002 SchedulingCourt Filing
                                              CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order -- Defendant's Motion (#18) to Enlarge Period for Response is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel (#12) is GRANTED IN PART. (See Minute Order for deadlines.) Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (sm, )
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/10/2002, Entered: 6/10/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                Certificate of Service. Filed by all defendants. (Related document(s)[18], [19], [20]) (ljl, )
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/10/2002, Entered: 6/10/2002 Response to Motion
                                                  Response to Motion to Compel. Filed by all defendants. (Related motion(s)[12]) (ljl, )
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/10/2002, Entered: 6/10/2002 Affidavit
                                                    Affidavit of John Unfred in Support of Motion to Enlarge Period for Response to Motion to Compel. Filed by all defendants. (Related document(s)[18]) (ljl, )
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/7/2002, Entered: 6/10/2002 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                      Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response/Reply to Motion # [12]. (to Compel). Filed by all defendants. (ljl, )
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Blank 17 Filed: 6/4/2002, Entered: 6/4/2002 SchedulingCourt Filing
                                                        CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order -- Mark Wilk's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel (#16) is GRANTED. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (sm, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/30/2002, Entered: 6/3/2002 Motion to Withdraw/Substitute Attorney
                                                          Motion to Withdraw or Substitute an Attorney filed by Mark Wilk. Mark Wilk moves to withdraw as counsel for Jaime Gordillo, Abelardo Hernandez and Taide Cortez. Filed by all plaintiffs. (ljl, )
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/21/2002, Entered: 5/22/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                            Certificate of Service. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related document(s)[12], [13], [14]) (ljb, )
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/21/2002, Entered: 5/22/2002 Declaration
                                                              Declaration of Elizabeth Ehlert. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related document(s)[12]) (ljb, )
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/21/2002, Entered: 5/22/2002 Memorandum in Support
                                                                Memorandum in Support of Motion for Order to Compel Answers to Interragatories and Production of Documents. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related document(s)[12]) (ljb, )
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/21/2002, Entered: 5/22/2002 Motion to Compel
                                                                  Motion to Compel Answers to Interragatories and Production of Documents. Oral Argument Requested.. Filed by all plaintiffs. (ljb, )
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Blank 11 Filed: 5/20/2002, Entered: 5/21/2002 Attorney Substitution
                                                                    Notice of Substitution of Counsel. Michael Mortland in place of Attorney Mark J. Wilk on behalf of plaintiff Jaime Gordillo. Filed by Taide Cortez, Jaime Gordillo, Abelardo Hernandez. (ljb, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/3/2002, Entered: 4/4/2002 Rule 16 ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                      CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Proceedings (Rule 16 Conference) -- ORDER: Discovery to be completed by 8/16/2002. Pretrial Order due by 2/3/2003. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report due by 9/13/2002. Dispositive Motions due by 9/13/2002. Trial Documents due by Noon 3/24/2003. Pretrial Conference set for 4/28/2003 at 01:30PM. Jury Trial (4-days) set for 5/13/2003 at 09:00AM. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. Counsel Present for Plaintiff: Elizabeth Elhert. Counsel Present for Defendant: Mike Unfred. Court Reporter: Debra Cheney. (sm, )
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/22/2002, Entered: 3/27/2002 Reply
                                                                        Reply to Defendants' Counterclaim. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related document(s)[7]) (ljb, )
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/7/2002, Entered: 3/7/2002 SchedulingCourt Filing
                                                                          CIVIL MINUTES:Record of Order -- Rule 16 Conference set for 4/3/2002 at 09:30AM in Chambers. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (sm, )
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/7/2002, Entered: 3/7/2002 Answer
                                                                            Answer to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims (Related Doc # [1]). Filed by all defendants. (dls, )
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/15/2002, Entered: 2/20/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                              Certificate of Service. Filed by all plaintiffs. (Related document(s)[5]) (dls, )
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/15/2002, Entered: 2/20/2002 Description not available
                                                                                Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Agreement. Filed by all plaintiffs. (dls, )
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/13/2002, Entered: 2/15/2002 Return of Service Executed
                                                                                  Return of Service Executed upon Amastas Sjarabarom on 2/2/02. Filed by all plaintiffs. (ljb, )
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/13/2002, Entered: 2/15/2002 Return of Service Executed
                                                                                    Return of Service Executed upon Marfa Sharabarin on 2/2/02. Filed by all plaintiffs. (ljb, )
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: 1/14/2002 Discovery Order
                                                                                      Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order and Notice of Case Assignment: Case assigned to the Honorable Anna J. Brown. Discovery to be completed by 5/13/2002. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report due by 6/11/2002. Pretrial Order due by 6/11/2002. (ljb, )
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: 1/14/2002 Complaint
                                                                                        Complaint Migrant and Seasonal Agricultural Worker Protection Act, Oregon Wage Laws Filing Fee collected. Receipt #: 441774 issued Summons issued as to Anastas Sharabarin and Marfa Sharabarin. Filed by Taide Cortez, Florida Gordillo, Jaime Gordillo, Abelardo Hernandez against Anastas Sharabarin, Marfa Sharabarin. (ljb, )
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                          This case has been viewed 47 times.

                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                          Space
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                           
                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                          Need Password Help?